Holmes v. City of Wilmington et al
Plaintiff: Medford Holmes
Defendant: City of Wilmington, Kimberly Pfaff, Randy Nowell and John Doe 1-10
Case Number: 1:2013cv00842
Filed: May 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM regarding dismissal of complaint.. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 7/11/2017. (bkb)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/19/2017. (nmfn)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/29/2015. (fms)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/4/2015. (nmfn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. City of Wilmington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medford Holmes
Represented By: L. Kenneth Chotiner
Represented By: S. Harold Lankenau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wilmington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Pfaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Nowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?