Andover Healthcare Inc. v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: Andover Healthcare Inc.
Defendant: 3M Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00843
Filed: May 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2016 Filing 322 VERDICT SHEET by Andover Healthcare Inc. [Joint Proposed Verdict Form]. (Newell, Ryan)
October 25, 2016 Filing 321 Proposed Jury Instructions by Andover Healthcare Inc. [Joint Proposed Final Jury Instructions]. (Newell, Ryan)
October 25, 2016 Filing 320 Proposed Jury Instructions by Andover Healthcare Inc. . (Newell, Ryan)
October 25, 2016 Filing 319 Proposed Voir Dire by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Newell, Ryan)
October 25, 2016 Remark: The Court adopts the proposed redacted version of the Memorandum Opinion as the "Public Version" (See D.I. #312 ). (ntl)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #313 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J.F. Gross, Chad Drown, Timothy E. Grimsrud, Lauren J. Frank, and Eva B. Stensvad filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/16. (ntl)
October 24, 2016 Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Farnan on behalf of 3M Company (Farnan, Kelly)
October 21, 2016 Filing 317 REDACTED VERSION of #302 Response to Motion, to Sever Defendant 3M Company's Motion for a Phased Trial by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Newell, Ryan)
October 21, 2016 Filing 316 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #315 Proposed Pretrial Order [Exhibit 6 to Proposed Final Pretrial Order] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 6 Part 2 of Part 1, #3 Exhibit 6 Part 3 of Part 1, #4 Exhibit 6 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 6 Part 3)(Connolly, Arthur)
October 21, 2016 Filing 315 [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 Part 1, #6 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #7 Exhibit 5 Part 3)(Connolly, Arthur)
October 21, 2016 Filing 314 REPLY BRIEF re #297 MOTION to Sever Defendant 3M Company's Motion for a Phased Trial filed by 3M Company. (McCann, Douglas)
October 21, 2016 Filing 313 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J.F. Gross, Chad Drown, Timothy E. Grimsrud, Lauren J. Frank, and Eva B. Stensvad - filed by 3M Company. (McCann, Douglas)
October 20, 2016 Filing 312 REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION of #306 Memorandum Opinion by 3M Company. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 10/25/2016 (ntl).
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Defendant's request to submit a questionnaire to potential jurors (D.I. 310), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the request is GRANTED, subject to the following: (i) the proposed questionnaire shall be edited to delete questions 10, 11, 12(b), 12(c), 16, 17, 18, 25, 26, 27, and 28; (ii) Defendant shall confer with the Court's jury administrator, Ms. Debra Bonselaar (tel: 302-573-6172), by October 21, 2016, regarding the steps necessary to disseminate the questionnaires in a timely fashion; (iii) Defendant shall provide the necessary number of copies, as well as stamped envelopes and any other materials required by Ms. Bonselaar, and should be prepared to do so by October 24, 2016; (iv) upon receiving completed questionnaires from potential jurors, Defendant shall immediately provide electronic or hard copies of the same to Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial schedule (see D.I. 144) is amended as follows: (i) the parties shall be present in Courtroom 6B at 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, November 10, 2016; and (ii) jury selection will commence at 9:30 a.m. on the same day. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/20/16. (ntl)
October 18, 2016 Filing 310 Letter to Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from Douglas E. McCann and Juanita Brooks regarding proposed jury questionnaire. (Attachments: #1 proposed jury questionnaire)(McCann, Douglas)
October 18, 2016 Filing 309 NOTICE of Appearance by Nitika Gupta on behalf of All Defendants (Gupta, Nitika)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORAL ORDER: Recognizing that this case is currently scheduled for a seven-day jury trial beginning November 14, and in light of the fact that due to other commitments the Court may not be available on November 18, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall include in the joint proposed final pretrial order due on October 21 their specific request for the number of hours needed for their trial presentations. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/16. (ntl)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER re #306 Memorandum Opinion -- #218 MOTION to Preclude is DENIED; #215 MOTION to Preclude is DENIED; #227 MOTION for Summary Judgment is DENIED; #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment is DENIED; #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/16. (ntl)
October 18, 2016 Filing 306 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM OPINION re pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/16. This order has been emailed to local counsel. (ntl)
October 18, 2016 Filing 305 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah A. Edelman - filed by 3M Company. (McCann, Douglas)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #305 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leah A. Edelman filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/16. (ntl)
October 17, 2016 Filing 304 Joint Letter to Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark from Douglas E. McCann regarding Andover will no longer be asserting Claim 5 of United States Patent No. 6,156,424 against 3M in this action. (McCann, Douglas)
October 14, 2016 Filing 303 NOTICE of 3M Company Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 by 3M Company (McCann, Douglas)
October 14, 2016 Filing 302 [SEALED] RESPONSE to Motion re #297 MOTION to Sever Defendant 3M Company's Motion for a Phased Trial [Andover's Response to 3M's Motion to Bifurcate] filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Newell, Ryan)
October 3, 2016 Filing 301 REDACTED VERSION of #299 Declaration in Support of its Motion for a Phased Trial by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(McCann, Douglas)
October 3, 2016 Filing 300 REDACTED VERSION of #298 Opening Brief in Support of its Motion for a Phased Trial by 3M Company. (McCann, Douglas)
September 26, 2016 Filing 299 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #298 Opening Brief in Support Declaration of Douglas E. McCann by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McCann, Douglas)
September 26, 2016 Filing 298 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #297 MOTION to Sever Defendant 3M Company's Motion for a Phased Trial filed by 3M Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (McCann, Douglas)
September 26, 2016 Filing 297 MOTION to Sever Defendant 3M Company's Motion for a Phased Trial - filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCann, Douglas)
September 21, 2016 Filing 296 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Reidel on September 23, 2016 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
September 21, 2016 Filing 295 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peggy Jean Flanigan on September 22, 2016 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
September 9, 2016 Filing 294 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Reidel on September 23, 2016 filed by 3M Company.(McCann, Douglas)
September 9, 2016 Filing 293 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Reidel on September 21, 2016 filed by 3M Company.(McCann, Douglas)
August 29, 2016 Filing 292 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by 3M Company re #224 Opening Brief in Support, of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(McCann, Douglas)
August 15, 2016 Filing 291 Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on August 2, 2016 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. (bpg)
August 2, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 8/2/2016. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
August 1, 2016 Filing 290 Letter to Chief Judge Stark from Arthur G. Connolly III regarding Oral Argument on Pending Motions - re 279 Order,, Set Hearings,. (Connolly, Arthur)
July 20, 2016 Filing 289 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Arthur G. Connolly, III regarding enclosure of copies of accused 3M products - re #244 Answering Brief in Opposition,. (Connolly, Arthur)
July 15, 2016 Filing 288 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #287 Sur-Reply Brief [Declaration of Mark M. Grossman] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34-51, #2 Exhibit 52-60)(Newell, Ryan)
July 15, 2016 Filing 287 [SEALED] SUR-REPLY BRIEF re #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, Indefiniteness, and No Willfulness filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Newell, Ryan)
July 13, 2016 Filing 286 REDACTED VERSION of #284 Sur-Reply Brief, by 3M Company. (McCann, Douglas)
July 7, 2016 Filing 285 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #284 Sur-Reply Brief, of Douglas E. McCann in Support of Defendant 3M's Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of No Willfulness by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24-25, #2 Exhibit 26 Part 1 of 4, #3 Exhibit 26 Part 2 of 4, #4 Exhibit 26 Part 3 of 4, #5 Exhibit 26 Part 4 of 4, #6 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas)
July 7, 2016 Filing 284 [SEALED] SUR-REPLY BRIEF re #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, Indefiniteness, and No Willfulness filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas)
July 5, 2016 Filing 283 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M Company's Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initital Disclosures filed by 3M Company.(McCann, Douglas)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the briefing schedule set forth in the letter dated June 28 (D.I. 281) is ADOPTED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/30/16. (ntl)
June 28, 2016 Filing 281 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Susan Morrison Coletti regarding Parties' Proposed Briefing Schedule Regarding 3M's MSJ of No Willfulness - re #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, Indefiniteness, and No Willfulness. (Coletti, Susan)
June 3, 2016 Filing 280 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Surreply Expert Reports of Haskell Beckham, Ph.D. and David Bucknall, Ph.D. filed by 3M Company.(Coletti, Susan)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on all pending motions on August 2, 2016 beginning at 10:00 a.m. Each side will be allocated up to one (1) hour to present its argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/10/16. (ntl)
April 25, 2016 Filing 278 REQUEST for Oral Argument by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
April 18, 2016 Filing 277 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Andover Healthcare Inc. re #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding 3M's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel, #218 MOTION to Preclude Defendant 3M's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Andover's CEO Mr. Thomas Murphy, #215 MOTION to Preclude Defendant 3M Company's Motion to Exclude Arthur H. Cobb's Opinion on Price Erosion, #227 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M Company's Motion for Summary Judgment of Laches and Equitable Estoppel, #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, Indefiniteness, and No Willfulness. (Newell, Ryan)
April 18, 2016 Filing 276 REDACTED VERSION of #264 Declaration, [Declaration of Arthur G. Connolly, III in Support of Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 48)(Newell, Ryan)
April 18, 2016 Filing 275 REDACTED VERSION of #263 Reply Brief [Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Andover's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issues of Laches and Estoppel] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Newell, Ryan)
April 18, 2016 Filing 274 REDACTED VERSION of #269 Reply Brief by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
April 18, 2016 Filing 273 REDACTED VERSION of #268 Declaration of Susan M. Coletti by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
April 18, 2016 Filing 272 REDACTED VERSION of #267 Reply Brief by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
April 18, 2016 Filing 271 REDACTED VERSION of #266 Reply Brief by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
April 18, 2016 Filing 270 REDACTED VERSION of #265 Reply Brief by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
April 11, 2016 Filing 269 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #227 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M Company's Motion for Summary Judgment of Laches and Equitable Estoppel filed by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
April 11, 2016 Filing 268 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #267 Reply Brief Declaration of Susan M. Coletti by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit 23)(Coletti, Susan)
April 11, 2016 Filing 267 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, Indefiniteness, and No Willfulness filed by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
April 11, 2016 Filing 266 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #218 MOTION to Preclude Defendant 3M's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Andover's CEO Mr. Thomas Murphy filed by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
April 11, 2016 Filing 265 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #215 MOTION to Preclude Defendant 3M Company's Motion to Exclude Arthur H. Cobb's Opinion on Price Erosion filed by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
April 11, 2016 Filing 264 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #263 Reply Brief, #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding 3M's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel [Declaration of Arthur G. Connolly, III in Support of Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 48)(Newell, Ryan)
April 11, 2016 Filing 263 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding 3M's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Newell, Ryan)
April 7, 2016 Filing 262 REDACTED VERSION of #248 Exhibit to a Document, #253 Exhibit to a Document, #246 Declaration,, of Mark M. Grossman in Support of Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Response to 3M's Motion for Summary Judgment for Noninfringement, Invalidity and No Willfulness by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4-7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11-12, #9 Exhibit 13, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 17, #14 Exhibit 18, #15 Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit 20, #17 Exhibit 21-22, #18 Exhibit 23, #19 Exhibit 24, #20 Exhibit 25, #21 Exhibit 26, #22 Exhibit 27, #23 Exhibit 28, #24 Exhibit 29, #25 Exhibit 30, #26 Exhibit 31-33)(Newell, Ryan)
April 7, 2016 Filing 261 REDACTED VERSION of #244 Answering Brief in Opposition, [Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Brief in Response to 3M Company's Motion for Summary Judgment on Invalidity, Noninfringement and Willfulness] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Newell, Ryan)
April 7, 2016 Filing 260 REDACTED VERSION of #250 Exhibit to a Document, #251 Exhibit to a Document,, #249 Declaration, of Mark M. Grossman in Support of Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Response to 3M's Motion for Summary Judgment for Laches and Equitable Estoppel by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6-10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14-25, #9 Exhibit 26, #10 Exhibit 27, #11 Exhibit 28, #12 Exhibit 29, #13 Exhibit 30-33, #14 Exhibit 34, #15 Exhibit 35-43, #16 Exhibit 44, #17 Exhibit 45, #18 Exhibit 46, #19 Exhibit 47)(Newell, Ryan)
April 7, 2016 Filing 259 REDACTED VERSION of #245 Answering Brief in Opposition, to Andover's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding 3M's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
April 7, 2016 Filing 258 REDACTED VERSION of #247 Answering Brief in Opposition, [Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Response to 3M Company's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issues of Laches and Estoppel] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Newell, Ryan)
April 7, 2016 Filing 257 REDACTED VERSION of #254 Declaration, #255 Exhibit to a Document, [Declaration of Mark Grossman in Support of Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Response to 3M's Motion to Preclude Arthur Cobbs Testimony on Price Erosion Damages] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 18, #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 20-33)(Newell, Ryan)
April 7, 2016 Filing 256 REDACTED VERSION of #252 Answering Brief in Opposition, to 3M Company's Motion to Preclude Arthur Cobb's Testimony Regarding Price Erosion Damages by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 255 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #254 Declaration, [Exhibit 16-33 to Declaration of Mark Grossman] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24, #10 Exhibit 25, #11 Exhibit 26, #12 Exhibit 27, #13 Exhibit 28, #14 Exhibit 29, #15 Exhibit 30, #16 Exhibit 31, #17 Exhibit 32, #18 Exhibit 33)(Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 254 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #252 Answering Brief in Opposition, [Declaration of Mark M. Grossman] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 253 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #246 Declaration,, by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 33 part 1 of 7, #2 Exhibit 33 part 2 of 7, #3 Exhibit 33 part 3 of 7, #4 Exhibit 33 part 4 of 7, #5 Exhibit 33 part 5 of 7, #6 Exhibit 33 part 6 of 7, #7 Exhibit 33 part 7 of 7)(Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 252 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #215 MOTION to Preclude Defendant 3M Company's Motion to Exclude Arthur H. Cobb's Opinion on Price Erosion filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/11/2016. (Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 251 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #250 Exhibit to a Document, #249 Declaration, [Exhibits 31 through 47 to the Declaration of Mark M. Grossman] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 36, #7 Exhibit 37, #8 Exhibit 38, #9 Exhibit 39, #10 Exhibit 40, #11 Exhibit 41, #12 Exhibit 42, #13 Exhibit 43, #14 Exhibit 44, #15 Exhibit 45, #16 Exhibit 46, #17 Exhibit 47)(Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 250 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #249 Declaration, [Exhibits 16 through 30 to Declaration of Mark M. Grossman] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24, #10 Exhibit 25, #11 Exhibit 26, #12 Exhibit 27, #13 Exhibit 28, #14 Exhibit 29, #15 Exhibit 30)(Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 249 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #247 Answering Brief in Opposition, [Declaration of Mark M. Grossman] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 248 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #246 Declaration,, by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 26, #5 Exhibit 27, #6 Exhibit 28, #7 Exhibit 29, #8 Exhibit 30, #9 Exhibit 31, #10 Exhibit 32)(Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 247 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #227 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M Company's Motion for Summary Judgment of Laches and Equitable Estoppel filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/11/2016. (Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 246 SEALED DECLARATION re #244 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 245 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding 3M's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by 3M Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/11/2016. (Coletti, Susan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 244 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, Indefiniteness, and No Willfulness filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/11/2016. (Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 243 DECLARATION re #242 Answering Brief in Opposition, [Declaration of Mark M. Grossman] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 242 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #218 MOTION to Preclude Defendant 3M's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Andover's CEO Mr. Thomas Murphy filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/11/2016. (Newell, Ryan)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed 3M's motion to strike several expert reports served by Andover (D.I. 193) and the materials submitted in connection with the motion (see D.I. 198, 200, 201), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 3M's motion (D.I. 193) is DENIED, although IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: (i) 3M may serve a sur-rebuttal report, and (ii) 3M may use the Court's discovery matters procedure to seek reimbursement for all or part of the costs associated with preparation of a sur-rebuttal report and any expert discovery. It appears that Andover served the reports beyond the deadline for doing so under the Scheduling Order. However, it also appears that the portions of the reports about which 3M complains constitute proper rebuttal, as they respond directly to the analyses contained in 3M's experts reports; it further appears that Andover and its experts acted diligently in putting together their supplemental reports. While there is prejudice to 3M from being served with supplemental reports after the deadline imposed by the Court, that prejudice can be largely or entirely eliminated by the opportunity to serve a sur-rebuttal expert report and to seek reimbursement of costs. Application of the "Pennypack factors" supports the Court's conclusion: the supplemental reports are important evidence of infringement; there is little cognizable prejudice to 3M in being made to address whether DSC, MDSC, and XRD analyses support infringement; there is no likelihood of disrupting trial, which is scheduled for November; any prejudice to 3M is cured by the opportunity to file a sur-reply report and the possibility the Court will shift some costs; Andover's explanation for why it took so long for it to prepare and serve its supplemental reports is credible and shows diligence (although its failure to explain why it did not seek leave to extend the deadline is troubling and contributes to the Court's willingness to consider shifting costs); and the record does not show bad faith or willfulness (although it does suggest "serial disregard for the Scheduling Order," as 3M argues (D.I. 200 at 1)). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/25/16. (ntl)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 4/18/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/23/2016. (dlk)
March 18, 2016 Filing 239 REDACTED VERSION of #225 Declaration, by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-34)(Connolly, Arthur)
March 18, 2016 Filing 238 REDACTED VERSION of #222 Opening Brief in Support, by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 18, 2016 Filing 237 REDACTED VERSION of #229 Declaration,, by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exs 1-31)(Coletti, Susan)
March 18, 2016 Filing 236 REDACTED VERSION of #228 Opening Brief in Support, by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
March 18, 2016 Filing 235 REDACTED VERSION of #226 Declaration, by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exs 1-21)(Coletti, Susan)
March 18, 2016 Filing 234 REDACTED VERSION of #224 Opening Brief in Support, by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
March 18, 2016 Filing 233 REDACTED VERSION of #220 Declaration by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exs A-E)(Coletti, Susan)
March 18, 2016 Filing 232 REDACTED VERSION of #219 Opening Brief in Support, by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
March 18, 2016 Filing 231 REDACTED VERSION of #217 Declaration by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exs A-B)(Coletti, Susan)
March 18, 2016 Filing 230 REDACTED VERSION of #216 Opening Brief in Support, by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 229 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #228 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Susan M. Coletti by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10 Part 1 of 2, #4 Exhibit 10 Part 2 of 2, #5 Exhibit 11-17, #6 Exhibit 18-21, #7 Exhibit 22-27, #8 Exhibit 28-29, #9 Exhibit 30, #10 Exhibit 31 Part 1 of 5, #11 Exhibit 31 Part 2 of 5, #12 Exhibit 31 Part 3 of 5, #13 Exhibit 31 Part 4 of 5, #14 Exhibit 31 Part 5 of 5)(Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 228 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #227 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M Company's Motion for Summary Judgment of Laches and Equitable Estoppel filed by 3M Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/31/2016. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service)(Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 227 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M Company's Motion for Summary Judgment of Laches and Equitable Estoppel - filed by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 226 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #224 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Susan M. Coletti by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Exhibit 8-12, #3 Exhibit 13-16, #4 Exhibit 17 Part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit 17 Part 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit 18-20, #7 Exhibit 21 Part 1 of 2, #8 Exhibit 21 Part 2 of 2, #9 Cert of Service)(Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 225 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding 3M's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel [Declaration of Mark M. Grossman] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-20, #3 Exhibit 21-27, #4 Exhibit 28-34)(Newell, Ryan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 224 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #223 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, Indefiniteness, and No Willfulness filed by 3M Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/31/2016. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service)(Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 223 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant 3M's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, Indefiniteness, and No Willfulness - filed by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 222 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding 3M's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/31/2016. (Newell, Ryan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding 3M's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Estoppel - filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Newell, Ryan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 220 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #219 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Susan M. Coletti by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Cert of Service)(Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 219 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #218 MOTION to Preclude Defendant 3M's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Andover's CEO Mr. Thomas Murphy filed by 3M Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/31/2016. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service)(Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 218 MOTION to Preclude Defendant 3M's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Andover's CEO Mr. Thomas Murphy - filed by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 217 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #216 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Susan M. Coletti by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Cert of Service)(Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 216 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #215 MOTION to Preclude Defendant 3M Company's Motion to Exclude Arthur H. Cobb's Opinion on Price Erosion filed by 3M Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/31/2016. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service)(Coletti, Susan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 215 MOTION to Preclude Defendant 3M Company's Motion to Exclude Arthur H. Cobb's Opinion on Price Erosion - filed by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #214 Joint Stipulation and Order regarding page limitations. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/9/16. (ntl)
March 8, 2016 Filing 214 Joint STIPULATION regarding page limitation with respect to summary judgment and motions to exclude expert testimony re #53 Scheduling Order,, by 3M Company. (Coletti, Susan)
February 26, 2016 Filing 213 Joint Letter to Magistrate Judge Burke from Andover Healthcare, Inc. and 3M Company regarding Deposition of Inge Thulin - re Discovery Conference, #181 Letter, #182 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Newell, Ryan)
February 26, 2016 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Morrison Coletti on behalf of 3M Company (Coletti, Susan)
February 16, 2016 Filing 211 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alfred Crosby on February 17, 2016 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
February 15, 2016 Filing 210 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas Duces Tecum directed to Haskell Beckham, David Bucknall, and Lance Christell filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
February 11, 2016 Filing 209 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M's Objections and Responses to Andover Healthcare's Subpoena to Haskell Beckham To Produce Documents, 3M's Objections and Responses to Andover Healthcare's Subpoena to David Bucknall to Produce Documents; and 3M's Objections and Responses to Andover Healthcare's Subpoena to Lance Christell to Produce Documents. filed by 3M Company.(McCann, Douglas)
February 5, 2016 Filing 208 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Murphy on February 10, 2016 filed by 3M Company.(McCann, Douglas)
February 5, 2016 Filing 207 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Mackay on February 12, 2016 filed by 3M Company.(McCann, Douglas)
February 5, 2016 Filing 206 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Production Supoenas to E. Bryan Coughlin and Michael E. Mackay filed by 3M Company.(McCann, Douglas)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The ADR teleconference set for 2/8/16 is cancelled and will be rescheduled for a date to be determined. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/5/2016. (dlk)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #204 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juanita R. Brooks filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/28/16. (ntl)
January 26, 2016 Filing 205 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Haskell Beckham on January 28, 2016 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
January 26, 2016 Filing 204 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Juanita R. Brooks - filed by 3M Company. (McCann, Douglas)
January 14, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jason M. Zucchi for 3M Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #203 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason M. Zucchi filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/13/16. (ntl)
January 12, 2016 Filing 203 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason M. Zucchi - filed by 3M Company. (McCann, Douglas)
January 11, 2016 Filing 202 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Arthur H. Cobb on January 12, 2016 filed by 3M Company.(McCann, Douglas)
December 28, 2015 Filing 201 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Douglas E. McCann regarding Requesting Teleconference Regarding 3M's Motion to Strike (D.I. 193). (McCann, Douglas)
December 28, 2015 Filing 200 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Douglas E. McCann regarding reply to 3M's motion to strike expert reports - re #193 Letter,. (McCann, Douglas)
December 28, 2015 Filing 199 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lance Christell on December 29, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
December 23, 2015 Filing 198 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Arthur G. Connolly, III regarding Response to 3M's Motion to Strike - re #193 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17)(Connolly, Arthur)
December 23, 2015 Filing 197 REDACTED VERSION of #193 Letter, by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3 Part 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit 3 Part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit 4-11)(McCann, Douglas)
December 21, 2015 Filing 196 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. E. Bryan Coughlin on January 6, 2016 filed by 3M Company.(McCann, Douglas)
December 18, 2015 Filing 195 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Report of Dr. Michael E. Mackay, Ph.D. and Summary of Thomas Murphy's Supplemental Rebuttal to 3M's Experts' Reports re #194 Notice of Service filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
December 18, 2015 Filing 194 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Dr. Michael E. Mackay, Ph.D., Summary of Thomas Murphy's Reply to 3M's Experts' Reports, and Expert Report of E. Bryan Coughlin, Ph.D. filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
December 18, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected Exhibits 4-11 added to D.I. #193 per request of counsel. (ntl)
December 17, 2015 Filing 193 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Douglas E. McCann regarding Striking Andover's Supplemental Expert Reports. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3 Part 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit 3 Part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit 4-11)(McCann, Douglas) (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/18/2015) (ntl).
December 17, 2015 Filing 192 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Inge Thulin on February 29, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
November 2, 2015 Filing 191 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Summary of Thomas Murphy's Rebuttal to 3M's Expert Reports and Expert Report of E. Bryan Coughlin, Ph.D filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
October 30, 2015 Filing 190 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Expert Reports of Haskell Beckham, Ph.D., David Bucknall, Ph.D. and W. Todd Schoettelkotte filed by 3M Company.(McCann, Douglas)
October 14, 2015 Filing 189 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on September 11, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2016.(bpg)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #188 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit Rebuttal and Reply Expert Reports to 10/30/15 and 12/4/15 filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/13/15. (ntl)
October 8, 2015 Filing 188 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit Rebuttal and Reply Expert Reports to 10/30/15 and 12/4/15 - filed by 3M Company. (McCann, Douglas)
October 8, 2015 Filing 187 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Finnegan, Henderson and Morris, Nichols) by 3M Company (Noreika, Maryellen)
October 6, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph A. Herriges, John C. Adkisson for 3M Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cna)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 2/8/2016 at 11:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/5/2015. (dlk)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #185 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John C. Adkisson and Joseph A. Herriges filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/29/15. (ntl)
September 28, 2015 Filing 185 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John C. Adkisson and Joseph A. Herriges - filed by 3M Company. (McCann, Douglas)
September 28, 2015 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Edward McCann on behalf of 3M Company (McCann, Douglas)
September 14, 2015 Filing 183 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Report of Cobb & Associates, Ltd. and Expert Report of Dr. E. Bryan Coughlin Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent 6,156,424 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
September 11, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 9/11/2015. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
September 10, 2015 Filing 182 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Arthur G. Connolly, III regarding discovery dispute - re 180 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Connolly, Arthur)
September 9, 2015 Filing 181 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1&2)(Noreika, Maryellen)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for September 11, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than September 9, 2015, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than September 10, 2015, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/8/15. (ntl)
September 2, 2015 Filing 179 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M's Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's Interrogatory No. 13 to Defendant 3M filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
August 28, 2015 Filing 178 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding request for discovery teleconference. (Noreika, Maryellen)
August 7, 2015 Filing 177 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Responses to Defendant's Third Requests for Admisson (Nos. 38-49) re #167 Notice of Service filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
July 31, 2015 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Andover Healthcare, Inc.s Third Supplemental Response to Defendants Interrogatory No. 7 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
July 17, 2015 Filing 175 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Greg Anderson on July 31, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
July 17, 2015 Filing 174 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Bauld on August 5, 2015 filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
July 15, 2015 Filing 173 NOTICE to Take Deposition of PJ Flanigan on July 31, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
July 15, 2015 Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Supplemental Response to Defendant's Interrogatory Nos. 6 and 23 re #50 Notice of Service, #29 Notice of Service, #132 Notice of Service filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Grandy, Michael)
July 14, 2015 Filing 171 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Andover Healthcare, Inc.s Second Supplemental Response to Defendant's Interrogatory No. 1 re #50 Notice of Service, #29 Notice of Service, #132 Notice of Service filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Grandy, Michael)
July 14, 2015 Filing 170 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M's Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's Interrogatory No. 9 to Defendant 3M filed by 3M Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 14, 2015 Filing 169 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Andover's Objections to 3M's Notice of Deposition Notice Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
July 8, 2015 Filing 168 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M's Third Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant 3M (Interrogatory No. 4) filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
July 8, 2015 Filing 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Third Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 38-49) filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
July 8, 2015 Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M's Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant 3M (Interrogatory Nos. 3, 6, and 12) filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
July 7, 2015 Filing 165 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Khaled El-Tahlawy, Ph.D. on August 4, 2015 filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
July 7, 2015 Filing 164 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Murphy on July 15-16, 2015 (AMENDED) filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
July 2, 2015 Filing 163 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Rizzardi on July 9, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
July 2, 2015 Filing 162 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 3M Company on July 9, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
June 30, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Andover's Supplemental Response to Defendant's Interrogatory No. 17 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
June 29, 2015 Filing 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant 3M filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
June 29, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Andover's Second Supplemental Response to Defendant's Interrogatory No. 7 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
June 24, 2015 Filing 158 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Amended Interrogatory No. 19 to Defendant 3M Company re #146 Notice of Service filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
June 15, 2015 Filing 157 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Maki on July 9, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
June 15, 2015 Filing 156 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mindy Geiselman on July 8, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
June 15, 2015 Filing 155 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brent Ashton on July 14, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
June 15, 2015 Filing 154 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Rizzardi on July 7, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
June 15, 2015 Filing 153 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 3M Company on July 7, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
June 15, 2015 Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to Patricia Oatman filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
June 15, 2015 Filing 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to John Reidel filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
June 15, 2015 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to Eugene Joseph filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
June 15, 2015 Filing 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena directed to Charlie Hentzen filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
June 15, 2015 Filing 148 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Julie Gatto on June 18, 2015 filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SO ORDERED, re #145 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER -- Fact Discovery due by 8/7/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2016. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/28/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A 7-day Jury Trial is set for 11/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/1/15. (ntl)
May 26, 2015 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Andover Healthcare Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant 3M filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
May 18, 2015 Filing 145 Joint STIPULATION Amending Scheduling Order re 144 Oral Order,,,,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,,,,, by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Newell, Ryan)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters regarding disputes over scheduling and discovery (D.I. 138, 139, 140, 141) and accompanying materials, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Andover's request for a 90-day extension of fact discovery (including the opportunity for each side to serve new deposition notices) is GRANTED and all subsequent dates in the scheduling order will be extended by a similar amount (or as otherwise agreed between the parties); (2) the pretrial conference is RESCHEDULED for October 28, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (with the proposed final pretrial order due October 21); (3) trial is RESCHEDULED to begin on November 14, 2016; (4) the parties shall, no later than May 18, SUBMIT a proposed amended scheduling order consistent with this Order; and (5) the teleconference scheduled for tomorrow is CANCELLED. The Court is exercising its discretion to modify the schedule in a manner requested by Andover as this request is reasonable under the circumstances, which include Andover's recent retention of new counsel, 3M's production of significant amounts of documents at the very end of the previously-scheduled fact discovery period (and after the passage of the date for substantial completion of document production), and that time will be required for the parties to exchange redaction logs and take depositions, all of which is necessary for the completion of fact discovery. Any purported prejudice to 3M from "delay" in getting to summary judgment is lessened by the fact that much of the first year of this case was devoted to resolving motions arising from 3M's filing suit against Andover in another District and claim construction, as well as the fact that the Court has today issued its claim construction opinion. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/11/15. (ntl)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER re #142 Memorandum Opinion re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/11/15. (ntl)
May 11, 2015 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/11/15. (ntl)
May 7, 2015 Filing 141 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Arthur G. Connolly III regarding response to 3M's letter dated May 6, 2015. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 7, 2015 Filing 140 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding response to Andover's May 6, 2015 letter regarding the May 12, 2015 teleconference. (Noreika, Maryellen)
May 6, 2015 Filing 139 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Noreika, Maryellen)
May 6, 2015 Filing 138 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Arthur G. Connolly III regarding discovery dispute. (Connolly, Arthur)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for May 12, 2015 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than May 6, 2015, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than May 7, 2015, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/30/15. (ntl)
April 24, 2015 Filing 136 Joint Letter to Judge Stark from Parties regarding Request for a Discovery Teleconference - re #53 Scheduling Order,,. (Newell, Ryan)
April 24, 2015 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Andover's Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories, (2) Andover's Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 93-113) and (3) Andover's Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 17-37) filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
April 22, 2015 Filing 134 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding update of 3M's inter partes review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Noreika, Maryellen)
April 17, 2015 Filing 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant 3M filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
April 17, 2015 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Andover Supplemental Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Newell, Ryan)
March 31, 2015 Filing 131 Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing held on March 6, 2015 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Taneha Carroll of Hawkins Reporting Service, Telephone (302) 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2015. (bpg)
March 26, 2015 Filing 130 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Inge Thulin on April 15, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
March 26, 2015 Filing 129 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 3M Company on April 13, 2015 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(Connolly, Arthur)
March 25, 2015 Filing 128 NOTICE of Subpoena on Paul Taylor, Ph.D. by 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Noreika, Maryellen)
March 25, 2015 Filing 127 NOTICE of Subpoena on Keum J. Park by 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Noreika, Maryellen)
March 25, 2015 Filing 126 NOTICE of Subpoena on John Connolly, Ph.D. by 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Noreika, Maryellen)
March 25, 2015 Filing 125 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas Murphy on April 7, 2015 filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
March 25, 2015 Filing 124 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Julie Gatto on April 21, 2015 filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
March 25, 2015 Filing 123 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andover Healthcare, Inc. on April 16, 2015 filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noreika, Maryellen)
March 25, 2015 Filing 122 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 16-24), (2) Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 93-113) and (3) Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 17-37) filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
March 20, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lee F. Grossman,Mark M. Grossman for Andover Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
March 19, 2015 Filing 121 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Robert Altherr, Jr., Esq., Christopher B. Roth, Esq., John Iwanicki, Esq. as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer represents Plaintiff. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 19, 2015 Filing 120 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark M. Grossman and Lee F. Grossman - filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 19, 2015 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of Andover Healthcare Inc. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #120 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark M. Grossman and Lee F. Grossman filed by Andover Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/19/15. (ntl)
March 18, 2015 Filing 118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jill K. MacAlpine - filed by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #118 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jill K. MacAlpine filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/18/15. (ntl)
March 17, 2015 Filing 117 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Casey L. Dwyer as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with Finnegan Henderson. (Noreika, Maryellen)
March 11, 2015 Filing 116 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorneys David Brafman, Esq., Peter A. Chiabotti, Esq., Patricia Carlson, Esq., and Amy Price, Esq. by Andover Healthcare Inc. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 6, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Markman Hearing held on 3/6/2015. (Court Reporter -- Hawkins Rptg.) (ntl)
February 13, 2015 Filing 115 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Andrew P. Gold as co-counsel. Reason for request: matter being handled by others in the firm. (Connolly, Arthur)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #114 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert F. Altherr, Jr., John Iwanicki, and Christopher B. Roth filed by Andover Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/11/15. (ntl)
February 11, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert F. Altherr, Jr,John Iwanicki,Christopher Roth for Andover Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
February 10, 2015 Filing 114 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert F. Altherr, Jr., John Iwanicki, and Christopher B. Roth - filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
February 10, 2015 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of Andover Healthcare Inc. (Connolly, Arthur)
February 6, 2015 Filing 112 NOTICE of Subpoena of Wilsonart Americas by 3M Company (Noreika, Maryellen)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #111 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gerald F. Ivey filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/3/15. (ntl)
February 2, 2015 Filing 111 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gerald F. Ivey - filed by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
February 2, 2015 Filing 110 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Michael A. Morin as co-counsel.. (Noreika, Maryellen)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters relating to a discovery dispute (D.I. 98, 105), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Andover's request for an order compelling 3M to search and produce ESI dated more than six years before the complaint was filed, concerning 3M's research and development of the accused products, is DENIED. 3M represents that it has agreed to produce thousands of pages of hard copy and non-email documents, including lab notebooks, that are older than six years before the complaint was filed and Andover has failed to provide any reason why these non-ESI documents will be insufficient to satisfy Andover's requests. The record does not reveal good cause to deviate from the Court's Default Standard for Discovery, which is incorporated into the scheduling order in this case. (D.I. 53) The teleconference scheduled for January 23 is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/22/15. (ntl)
January 22, 2015 Filing 108 REDACTED VERSION of #100 Claim Construction Answering Brief by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U)(Noreika, Maryellen)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letter of January 15 (D.I. 103), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each side will be allocated 100 minutes for its presentation at the Markman hearing on March 6, to be used for argument and/or examination of the expert(s), as each side wishes. Any time a side is examining an expert will be charged to that side conducting the examination. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/22/15. (ntl)
January 20, 2015 Filing 106 REDACTED VERSION of #102 Claim Construction Answering Brief, [Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's Answering Markman Brief] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Connolly, Arthur)
January 16, 2015 Filing 105 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding 3M's response to Andover's January 15, 2015 letter - re #98 Letter. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 16, 2015 Filing 104 REDACTED VERSION of #84 Claim Construction Opening Brief, by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Exhibits F-L, #3 Exhibits M-N, #4 Exhibits O-T)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 15, 2015 Filing 103 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Arthur G. Connolly, III and Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding claim construction hearing - re #53 Scheduling Order,,. (Connolly, Arthur)
January 15, 2015 Filing 102 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re #84 Claim Construction Opening Brief, filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Connolly, Arthur)
January 15, 2015 Filing 101 EXHIBIT re #100 Claim Construction Answering Brief by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits V-W, #2 Exhibits X-Z, #3 Exhibits AA-AD)(Noreika, Maryellen)
January 15, 2015 Filing 100 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re #85 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U)(Noreika, Maryellen)
January 15, 2015 Filing 99 STATEMENT -- 3M's Comments on Andovers Technology Tutorial -- by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits AE-AF)(Noreika, Maryellen)
January 15, 2015 Filing 98 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Arthur G. Connolly, III regarding Discovery Dispute - re 95 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Connolly, Arthur)
January 12, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M's Objections and Responses to Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 17 and 18) filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
January 9, 2015 Filing 96 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on April 30, 2014 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/30/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2015. (bpg)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff and Defendant of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for January 23, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than January 15, 2015, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than January 16, 2015, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/6/15. (ntl)
December 19, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Defendant's Technology Tutorial. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Maryellen Noreika on behalf of 3M Company (Noreika, Maryellen)
December 19, 2014 Filing 93 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding DVD of Defendant's Technology Tutorial. (Noreika, Maryellen)
December 15, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE of Subpoena by 3M Company (Noreika, Maryellen)
December 12, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant 3M filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
December 10, 2014 Filing 90 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Arthur G. Connolly III and Maryellen Noreika regarding request for scheduling of a discovery dispute. (Connolly, Arthur)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Markman Hearing scheduled for 2/5/15 is CANCELLED and is hereby re-scheduled for 3/6/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/9/14. (ntl)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #88 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Technical Tutorial (Unopposed) filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/9/14. (ntl)
December 8, 2014 Filing 88 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Technical Tutorial (Unopposed) - filed by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
December 8, 2014 Filing 87 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding 3M's technical tutorial. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 5, 2014 Filing 86 DECLARATION re #85 Claim Construction Opening Brief [Declaration of Robson F. Storey, Ph.D] by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Connolly, Arthur)
December 5, 2014 Filing 85 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Connolly, Arthur)
December 5, 2014 Filing 84 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF FOR U.S. PATENT NO. 6,156,424 filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-T (Part 1 of 4), #2 Exhibits A-T (Part 2 of 4), #3 Exhibits A-T (Part 3 of 4), #4 Exhibits A-T (Part 4 of 4))(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 26, 2014 Filing 83 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Maryellen Noreika regarding request that the Markman hearing be rescheduled - re #53 Scheduling Order,,. (Noreika, Maryellen)
November 24, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M's Objections and Responses to Andover Healthcare's Second Requests for Production (Nos. 91-103) filed by 3M Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 24, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Justin A. Hendrix for 3M Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #81 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Justin A. Hendrix of FINNEGAN, HENDERSON, FARABOW, GARRETT & DUNNER, LLP, filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/21/14. (ntl)
November 20, 2014 Filing 81 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Justin A. Hendrix of FINNEGAN, HENDERSON, FARABOW, GARRETT & DUNNER, LLP, - filed by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
November 10, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Subpoena (directed to Paul Taylor) by 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noreika, Maryellen)
November 10, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Subpoena (directed to Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP) by 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noreika, Maryellen)
November 3, 2014 Filing 78 CLAIM Construction Chart by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Andover, #2 Exhibit 2 - Andover, #3 Exhibit 3 - Andover, #4 Exhibit 4 - Andover, #5 Exhibit 5 - Andover, #6 Exhibit 6 - Andover, #7 Exhibit A - 3M, #8 Exhibit B - 3M, #9 Exhibit C - 3M, #10 Exhibit D - 3M, #11 Exhibit E - 3M, #12 Exhibit F - 3M, #13 Exhibit G - 3M, #14 Exhibit H - 3M, #15 Exhibit I - 3M)(Connolly, Arthur)
October 27, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Andover Healthcare Inc.'s Second Requests for Production to Defendant 3M Company filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORAL ORDER: Having been advised by the parties that Defendant's request for inter partes review has been denied (D.I. 73), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to stay (D.I. 32) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renew should Defendant's anticipated motion for reconsideration be granted. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/23/14. (ntl)
October 23, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's identification of proposed claim terms for construction and preliminary proposed constructions filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
October 23, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M's Identification of Proposed Claim Terms for Construction and Preliminary Constructions Thereof filed by 3M Company.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 20, 2014 Filing 73 Joint STATUS REPORT by 3M Company and by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
September 22, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE of Change of Address by Arthur G. Connolly, III (Connolly, Arthur)
September 11, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE of Subpoena (directed to Dritac Flooring Products, LLC) by 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/11/2014) (ntl).
September 11, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected Exhibit 1 added to D.I. #71 per request of counsel. (ntl)
August 8, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE of Subpoenas (directed to Basic Adhesives, Inc.; Bayer MaterialScience; Carlisle; H.B. Fuller Co.; Helmitin; Potomac Rubber Company, Inc.; and Wilsonart Americas) by 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 10/27/2014 at 10:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/8/2014. (dlk)
July 30, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Invalidity Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 6,156,424 filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
July 1, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Section 4(c) of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery to Defendant 3M filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
June 30, 2014 Filing 66 REDACTED VERSION of #61 Letter by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/30/14. (ntl)
June 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' submissions regarding the sole disputed provision of the protective order (D.I. 60, 61, 62 and Exhs.), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will adopt Defendant's version of paragraph 4.4 and DENIES Plaintiff's request for an order to permit it to use Defendant's highly confidential information in related proceedings pending in Germany. The Court understands that both German law and U.S. law (see 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1782) provide other, appropriate mechanisms for Plaintiff to seek the relief it is requesting. Given the sensitivity to Defendant of the information Plaintiff seeks to use in Germany, and given that Plaintiff may have opportunities to present the evidence at issue to the German proceeding even after Plaintiff files a brief in Germany due June 30, it is reasonable to require Plaintiff to pursue the other mechanisms for the relief it is seeking. The Court will enter the parties' proposed protective order (D.I. 62 Exh. C), including Defendant's version of the disputed provision. The teleconference scheduled for July 1, 2014 is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/29/14. (ntl)
June 27, 2014 Filing 63 REDACTED VERSION of #60 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Arthur G. Connolly dated June 20, 2014 by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
June 26, 2014 Filing 62 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Andover Healthcare Inc. and 3M Company regarding dispute over proposed protective order - re 59 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Connolly, Arthur)
June 23, 2014 Filing 61 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Andover's June 20, 2014 letter - re #60 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 20, 2014 Filing 60 SEALED Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Arthur G. Connolly III regarding assistance resolving a protective order dispute - re 59 Order Setting Teleconference. (Connolly, Arthur) Modified on 6/20/2014 (rpg).
June 20, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #60 placed under seal per counsel's request on 6/20/2014. (rpg)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff and Defendant of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for July 1, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than June 26, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than June 27, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Should any document(s) be filed under seal, a courtesy copy of the sealed document(s) must be provided to the Court within one (1) hour of e-filing the document(s). Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/18/14. (ntl)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 6/30/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/17/2014. (dlk) (Main Document 58 replaced on 6/17/2014) (dlk).
June 9, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M Company's Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
June 6, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A) filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
June 4, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
May 30, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3M Company's Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by 3M Company.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 4/24/2015. Status Report due by 10/20/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2015. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 12/5/2014. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 1/15/2015. A Markman Hearing is set for 2/5/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/28/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A 7-day Jury Trial is set for 4/11/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/23/14. (Attachment: #1 Form of Pretrial Order) (ntl)
May 23, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. (dlk)
May 16, 2014 Filing 52 DECLARATION re #51 Reply Brief [Declaration of M. David Weingarten in Support of 3M's Reply in Support of its Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Noreika, Maryellen)
May 16, 2014 Filing 51 REPLY BRIEF re #32 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit filed by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
May 16, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-92) filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
May 14, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jeffrey W. Abraham as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with firm. (Noreika, Maryellen)
May 13, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Andover's Objections and Responses To Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Andover Healthcare, Inc.'s Objections and Responses To Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admissions filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
May 12, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) 3M's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant 3M; and (2) 3M's Objections and Responses to Andover Healthcare's First Requests for Production (Nos. 1-90) filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
May 8, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. #46 per request of counsel. (ntl)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #46 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file a reply in support of motion to stay pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-in-Suit to May 16, 2014 filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/8/14. (ntl)
May 7, 2014 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file a reply in support of motion to stay pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-in-Suit to May 16, 2014 - filed by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen) (Main Document 46 replaced on 5/8/2014) (ntl). Modified on 5/8/2014 (ntl).
May 5, 2014 Filing 45 PROPOSED ORDER -- Scheduling Order [Patent] -- by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Stark)(Connolly, Arthur)
May 5, 2014 Filing 44 REDACTED VERSION of #41 Declaration of T. Murphy in Support of Answering Brief in Opposition to 3M's Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of Patent-In-Suit by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 5, 2014 Filing 43 REDACTED VERSION of #40 Answering Brief in Opposition to 3M's Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 2, 2014 Filing 42 DECLARATION re #40 Answering Brief in Opposition Declaration of David Brafman by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Connolly, Arthur)
May 2, 2014 Filing 41 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #40 Answering Brief in Opposition Declaration of T. Murphy by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 2, 2014 Filing 40 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/12/2014. (Connolly, Arthur)
April 30, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Default Standard Paragraph 4(a) filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
April 30, 2014 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas for Documents to Bayer MaterialScienceLLC; Synthomer LLC; Vanderbilt Chemicals, LLC; and Showa Denko America, Inc. filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena for Documents to Bayer MaterialScience, #2 Subpoena for Documents to Showa Denko America, Inc., #3 Subpoena for Documents to Synthomer LLC, #4 Subpoena for Documents to Vanderbilt Chemicals, LLC)(Connolly, Arthur)
April 30, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amy Price,Andrew P. Gold,Patricia M. Carlson for Andover Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
April 30, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2014. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
April 29, 2014 Filing 37 Official Transcript of Hearing held on March 31, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2014. (bpg)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for April 30, 2014 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4573. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/28/14. (ntl)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrcia M. Carlson, Amy Price, and Andrew P. Gold filed by Andover Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/25/14. (ntl)
April 24, 2014 Filing 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrcia M. Carlson, Amy Price, and Andrew P. Gold - filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
April 15, 2014 Filing 34 DECLARATION re #32 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit, #33 Opening Brief in Support Declaration of M. David Weingarten by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Noreika, Maryellen)
April 15, 2014 Filing 33 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #32 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit filed by 3M Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/2/2014. (Noreika, Maryellen)
April 15, 2014 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of the Patent-In-Suit - filed by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
April 15, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
April 14, 2014 Filing 30 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
April 11, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and (2) Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission filed by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
April 11, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant 3M; and (2) Plaintiff Andover Healthcare's First Requests For Production To Defendant 3M Company filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
April 1, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove David J. F. Gross; James W. Poradek; Theodore M. Budd; Timothy E. Grimsrud; Timothy M. Sullivan; Linzey A. Erickson; and the law firm of Faegre Baker Daniels LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with case. (Noreika, Maryellen)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated in Court at the hearing this same date, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to transfer venue to the District of Minnesota (D.I. #11 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit, no later than April 14, 2014, a proposed scheduling order to govern further proceedings in this matter. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/31/14. (ntl)
March 31, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 3/31/2014. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
March 28, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey W. Abraham for 3M Company added for electronic noticing. (els)
March 28, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael A. Morin,M. David Weingarten,Mark J. Feldstein,Casey L. Dwyer for 3M Company added for electronic noticing. (els)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Morin; Mark J. Feldstein; Jeffrey W. Abraham; Casey L. Dwyer; and M. David Weingarten filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/27/14. (ntl)
March 26, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Morin; Mark J. Feldstein; Jeffrey W. Abraham; Casey L. Dwyer; and M. David Weingarten - filed by 3M Company. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on the pending motion on March 31, 2014 beginning at 12:00 p.m. Each side will be allocated up to 15 minutes to present its argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/6/14. (ntl)
February 14, 2014 Filing 23 STATEMENT re #22 Notice (Other) /Response to Notice of Subsequent Authority by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
February 7, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by Andover Healthcare Inc. re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Connolly, Arthur)
December 31, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Subsequent Events by Andover Healthcare Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Connolly, Arthur)
September 20, 2013 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #19 Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue of Theodore M. Budd by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
September 20, 2013 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota filed by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
August 29, 2013 Filing 18 DECLARATION re #16 Answering Brief in Opposition of MIchael Chiabotti by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Connolly, Arthur)
August 29, 2013 Filing 17 DECLARATION re #16 Answering Brief in Opposition of Thomas Murphy by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
August 29, 2013 Filing 16 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota filed by Andover Healthcare Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/9/2013. (Connolly, Arthur)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file answering brief and to file reply brief to August 29, 2013 and September 20, 2013 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/19/13. (ntl)
August 16, 2013 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file answering brief and to file reply brief to August 29, 2013 and September 20, 2013 - filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
August 13, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James W. Poradek for 3M Company added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
August 1, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy E. Grimsrud for 3M Company added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 31, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Theodore M. Budd,David J.F. Gross,Timothy M. Sullivan,Linzey A. Erickson for 3M Company added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 30, 2013 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #12 Opening Brief in Support, #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota -- Declaration of Timothy M. Sullivan -- by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Noreika, Maryellen)
July 30, 2013 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #12 Opening Brief in Support, #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota -- Declaration of Brent Ashton -- by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
July 30, 2013 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota filed by 3M Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/16/2013. (Noreika, Maryellen)
July 30, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Minnesota - filed by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
July 29, 2013 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #9 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by 3M Company.(Noreika, Maryellen)
July 5, 2013 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M Company- filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Connolly, Arthur)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J.F. Gross, James W. Poradek, Theodore M. Budd, Timothy E. Grimsrud, Timothy M. Sullivan and Linzey A. Erickson filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/28/13. (ntl)
June 27, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David J.F. Gross, James W. Poradek, Theodore M. Budd, Timothy E. Grimsrud, Timothy M. Sullivan and Linzey A. Erickson - filed by 3M Company. (Noreika, Maryellen)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for 3M Company to answer complaint to July 5, 2013 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/30/13. (ntl)
May 29, 2013 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for 3M Company to answer complaint to July 5, 2013 - filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 23, 2013 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 17, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David S. Brafman,Peter A. Chiabotti for Andover Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David S. Brafman and Peter A. Chiabotti filed by Andover Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/16/13. (ntl)
May 15, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David S. Brafman and Peter A. Chiabotti - filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 15, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 14, 2013 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. 3M Company served on 5/14/2013, answer due 6/4/2013. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 14, 2013 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6156424;. (mdb)
May 14, 2013 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (mdb)
May 14, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against 3M Company. Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1288933.) - filed by Andover Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mdb)
May 14, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to 3M Company on 5/14/2013. (mdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andover Healthcare Inc. v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andover Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Lee F. Grossman
Represented By: Amy Price
Represented By: Patricia M. Carlson
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Newell
Represented By: Robert F. Altherr, Jr.
Represented By: Mark M. Grossman
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Mary I. Akhimien
Represented By: John Iwanicki
Represented By: Christopher Roth
Represented By: David S. Brafman
Represented By: Peter A. Chiabotti
Represented By: Andrew P. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Abraham
Represented By: David J.F. Gross
Represented By: John C. Adkisson
Represented By: James W. Poradek
Represented By: Michael A. Morin
Represented By: Timothy M. Sullivan
Represented By: Timothy E. Grimsrud
Represented By: Joseph A. Herriges
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Mark J. Feldstein
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jason M. Zucchi
Represented By: M. David Weingarten
Represented By: Justin A. Hendrix
Represented By: Casey L. Dwyer
Represented By: Susan Morrison Coletti
Represented By: Linzey A. Erickson
Represented By: Nitika Gupta
Represented By: Theodore M. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?