Bond et al v. American Biltrite Co. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Bond and Ann Bond
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc., CBS Corporation, Georgia Pacific LLC, Goodrich Corporation, Honeywell International Inc., National Service Industries, Inc., Soco-West Inc., American Biltrite Co., Autozone Inc., Boeing Co., Borg-Warner Corporation, Viacom Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corp., Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc., Elliott Company, Ericsson Inc., Ford Motor Company, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Georgia Pacific Corporation, B.F. Goodrich Company, Allied Signal Inc., Bendix Corporation, John K. Bice Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc., Karnak Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corp., Murco Wall Products Inc., National Automotive Parts Assocation, North Brothers, Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of Delaware Inc., Robert Bosch LLC, Sears Roebuck and Co., Brenntag West Inc., Soco-Lynch Corporation and Union Carbide Corporation
Cross Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Pneumo Abex Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv01340
Filed: July 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Christopher J Burke
Referring Judge: Sue L Robinson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc..(Donelson, Matthew)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #91 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Lockheed Martin Corp., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/30/2014. (fms)
July 29, 2014 Filing 91 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Roberts, Sarah)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #90 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ford Motor Company. Ford Motor Company terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/22/2014. (fms)
July 17, 2014 Filing 90 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiffs of Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #89 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of Delaware Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/16/2014. (fms)
July 15, 2014 Filing 89 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of Delaware Inc.. (Reese, C.)
July 14, 2014 Filing 88 Witness List by Robert Bosch LLC. (Culley, David)
July 14, 2014 Filing 87 Witness List by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Roberts, Sarah)
July 1, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Levitsky on behalf of Murco Wall Products Inc. (Levitsky, Stephanie)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #85 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE JOINT WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST (FACTUAL, MEDICAL, AND EXPERT) AND FOR PLAINTIFFS TO PRODUCE MEDICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC MATERIALS to JULY 14, 2014 filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/1/2014. (dlk)
June 30, 2014 Filing 85 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE JOINT WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST (FACTUAL, MEDICAL, AND EXPERT) AND FOR PLAINTIFFS TO PRODUCE MEDICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC MATERIALS to JULY 14, 2014 - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Tyler, Jessica)
June 26, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack's Individual Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of Delaware Inc..(Reese, C.)
June 26, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC's Individual Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation.(Reese, C.)
June 25, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Pierce on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Pierce, Matthew)
May 30, 2014 Filing 81 Exhibit List by Stephen Bond. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Witness and Exhibit List)(Coffey, Diane)
May 13, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Andrew R. Silverman as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer With Firm. (Smiertka, Stephanie)
May 9, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Andrew R. Silverman as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer With Firm. (Larson, William)
May 9, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Andrew R. Silverman as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer With Firm. (Smith, Bryan)
April 7, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Karnak Corporation, Sears Roebuck and Co. (Faben, Peter)
April 3, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Georgia Pacific LLC.(Smiertka, Stephanie)
April 2, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Goodrich Corporation.(Reid, Donald)
April 2, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by American Biltrite Co. (Larson, William)
March 31, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Murco Wall Products Inc..(Harmon, Mary Kathryn)
March 31, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Boeing Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Boeing Co..(Smith, Bryan)
March 31, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT AUTOZONE, INC.'S FEDERAL RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Autozone Inc..(Murphy, Peter)
March 31, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc..(Donelson, Matthew)
March 27, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Assocation.(Bradley, Paul)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 4/28/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2014. Final Discovery Requests due by 7/30/2014. A Status Teleconference is set for 11/3/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke; Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2014. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/26/2014. (dlk)
March 26, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Scheduling Conference held on 3/26/2014 to discuss proposed Scheduling Order (D.I. 67). A written Order will be issued. (Court Reporter Deanna Warner (Hawkins)) (dlk)
March 21, 2014 Filing 67 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Sarah A. Roberts, Esquire regarding Enclosing Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberts, Sarah)
March 18, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF JENNIFER D. DAVIS OLIVA AS COUNSEL FOR AMERICAN BILTRITE INC. by American Biltrite Co. (Larson, William)
March 18, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jennifer D. Davis Oliva as Counsel for The Boeing Company by Boeing Co. (Barillo, Nathan)
March 18, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jennifer D. Davis Oliva as Counsel for Georgia-Pacific LLC by Georgia Pacific LLC (Smiertka, Stephanie)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ( #60 ) denying #34 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/13/2014. (nmfn)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #62 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Honeywell International Inc. Honeywell International Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/6/2014. (nmfn)
March 4, 2014 Filing 62 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Honeywell International Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
February 24, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re All Plaintiffs : Entry of appearance of attorney Diane M. Coffey. Attorney Kara Hager terminated. (Coffey, Diane)
February 20, 2014 Filing 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending DENYING D.I. #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Stephen Bond, Ann Bond. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2014. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 02/20/2014. (mlc)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) TELECONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 3/26/2014 at 11:00 AM. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to Chambers of Judge Christopher J. Burke by dialing 302-573-4595.(2) For the purpose of being prepared the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal to the Court no later than March 21, 2014. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Burke, Forms). (3) If there are disputed issues between the parties regarding the content of the Scheduling Order, the parties should note those areas of dispute in the Proposed Order, along with their proposals for the language the Court should adopt as to that issue. In addition, the parties may each separately file a letter (of no more than two single-spaced pages) setting forth their position as to these disputed issues.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 02/20/2014. (mlc)
February 19, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Miscellaneous Hearing held on 2/19/2014. For the reasons discussed in Court, the Court cancelled the Oral Argument scheduled for 2/19/2014 regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (D.I. 34). Written decision to follow. (Court Reporter Taneha Carroll (Hawkins).) (mlc)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #59 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Guy P. Glazier filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 02/19/2014. (mlc)
February 18, 2014 Remark: The oral argument scheduled for 2/19/2014 at 2:00pm will be held in Courtroom 2A with Judge Burke. (mlc)
February 14, 2014 Filing 59 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Guy P. Glazier - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Roberts, Sarah)
February 7, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan David Barillo on behalf of Boeing Co. (Barillo, Nathan)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER Setting Hearing re D.I. #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court: A Motion Hearing is set for 2/19/2014 at 02:00 PM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Courtroom to be determined. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/28/2014. (dlk)
January 24, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Honeywell International Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
December 9, 2013 Filing 56 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service to Defendant's Request for Oral Argument)(Roberts, Sarah)
November 4, 2013 Filing 55 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Elliott Company. (Costello, Kelly)
November 1, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Elizabeth Smiertka on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Smiertka, Stephanie)
October 15, 2013 Filing 53 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/25/2013. (Attachments: #1 ORDER)(Roberts, Sarah)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Court, having received no indication of an objection by Plaintiff to D.I. #49 MOTION for Leave to File an Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Lockheed Martin Corp., and finding that the motion is permissible pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(b) and for the reasons set out in the motion (D.I. 49-1), the Court hereby GRANTS the motion. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/11/2013. (mlc)
October 1, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLCs Initial Disclosures by Georgia Pacific LLC.(Larson, William)
October 1, 2013 Filing 51 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Georgia Pacific LLC identifying Corporate Parent Georgia-Pacific Holdings LLC for Georgia Pacific LLC.. (Larson, William)
October 1, 2013 Filing 50 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by American Biltrite Co.. (Larson, William)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: ORAL ORDER: Plaintiffs shall inform the Court by no later than Monday, October 7, 2013 whether they have any objection to Defendant Lockheed Martin Corp.'s Motion for Leave to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (D.I. 49), and if so, shall file an answering brief by that date. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/30/2013. (dlk)
September 27, 2013 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File an Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Sarah A. Roberts, Esquire, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jessica L. Tyler, Esquire)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Roberts, Sarah)
September 26, 2013 Filing 48 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc..(Roberts, Sarah)
September 26, 2013 Filing 47 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. for Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc... (Roberts, Sarah)
September 26, 2013 Filing 46 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Roberts, Sarah)
September 26, 2013 Filing 45 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Roberts, Sarah)
September 25, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bruce Larson, Jr on behalf of American Biltrite Co., Boeing Co., Georgia Pacific LLC (Larson, William)
September 3, 2013 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Boeing Co. identifying Other Affiliate State Street Bank and Trust Company for Boeing Co... (Oliva, Jennifer)
September 3, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Danella Oliva on behalf of Boeing Co. (Oliva, Jennifer)
August 29, 2013 Filing 41 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Elliott Company identifying Corporate Parent Elliott Group Holdings, Inc., a Japanese Corporation, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Ebara Corporation, a Japanese Public Corporation for Elliott Company.. (Costello, Kelly)
August 29, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Elliott Company (Costello, Kelly)
August 28, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald E. Reid on behalf of Goodrich Corporation (Reid, Donald)
August 26, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc..(Ahern, Andrew)
August 26, 2013 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holding, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc... (Ahern, Andrew)
August 23, 2013 Filing 36 DECLARATION re #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #35 MEMORANDUM in Support by Ann Bond, Stephen Bond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Hager, Kara)
August 23, 2013 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ann Bond, Stephen Bond.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/9/2013. (Hager, Kara)
August 23, 2013 Filing 34 MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Ann Bond, Stephen Bond. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Hager, Kara)
August 22, 2013 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
August 21, 2013 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle)
August 21, 2013 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Honeywell International Inc. identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Honeywell International Inc... (Florax, Joelle)
August 21, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Florax, Joelle)
August 20, 2013 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Daugherty, Sally)
August 20, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally J. Daugherty on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Daugherty, Sally)
August 20, 2013 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Daugherty, Sally)
August 14, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Murphy on behalf of Autozone Inc. (Murphy, Peter)
August 8, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Marina McCann on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc. (McCann, Ana)
August 7, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter John Faben on behalf of Sears Roebuck and Co. (Faben, Peter)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/5/2013. (nmfn)
August 2, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Culley on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC (Culley, David)
August 2, 2013 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Murco Wall Products Inc.. (Nolte, R.)
August 2, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Stokes Nolte on behalf of Murco Wall Products Inc. (Nolte, R.)
August 1, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Patrick Smith on behalf of Boeing Company, Boeing Co., Boeing Co, Boeing Company, The Boeing Company (Smith, Bryan)
August 1, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Donelson on behalf of BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc. (Donelson, Matthew)
July 31, 2013 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Other Affiliate The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation.. (Valocchi, Beth)
July 31, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Valocchi, Beth)
July 31, 2013 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by General Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate NBC Universal Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate ValueVision Media, Inc for General Electric Company.. (Valocchi, Beth)
July 31, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of General Electric Company (Valocchi, Beth)
July 31, 2013 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CBS Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate Viacom Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Valocchi, Beth)
July 31, 2013 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of Delaware Inc.. (Reese, C.)
July 31, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of CBS Corporation (Valocchi, Beth)
July 31, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Reese on behalf of Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of Delaware Inc. (Reese, C.)
July 31, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Reese on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation (Reese, C.)
July 31, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 29, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Ann Fox on behalf of National Automotive Parts Assocation (Fox, Stephanie)
July 29, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Ann Fox on behalf of Genuine Parts Company (Fox, Stephanie)
July 29, 2013 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by National Automotive Parts Assocation. (Bradley, Paul)
July 29, 2013 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Bradley, Paul)
July 29, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of National Automotive Parts Assocation (Bradley, Paul)
July 29, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of Genuine Parts Company (Bradley, Paul)
July 26, 2013 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
July 26, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents - from DE Superior Ct - Case Number N12C-11-064 (ASB) (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0311-1336752)- filed by Lockheed Martin Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 2B, #4 Exhibit 2C, #5 Exhibit 2D, #6 Exhibit 2E, #7 Exhibit 2F, #8 Exhibit 2G, #9 Exhibit 2H, #10 Exhibit 2I, #11 Exhibit 2J, #12 Exhibit 2K, #13 Exhibit 2L, #14 Exhibit 2M, #15 Exhibit 2N, #16 Exhibit 2O, #17 Exhibit 2P, #18 Exhibit 2Q, #19 Exhibit 3 Bond Removal, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bond et al v. American Biltrite Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Danella Oliva
Represented By: Matthew Robert Pierce
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: Andrew Ross Silverman
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Marc J. Phillips
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Donald E. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Service Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-West Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Biltrite Co.
Represented By: Marc J. Phillips
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Andrew Ross Silverman
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Smith
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Jennifer Danella Oliva
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Inc.
Represented By: Peter S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Co.
Represented By: Jennifer Danella Oliva
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Marc J. Phillips
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Andrew Ross Silverman
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Smith
Represented By: Nathan David Barillo
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Ahern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Smith
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Marc J. Phillips
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Andrew Ross Silverman
Represented By: Jennifer Danella Oliva
Represented By: Matthew Robert Pierce
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.F. Goodrich Company
Represented By: Donald E. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Signal Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John K. Bice Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Fruehauf
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karnak Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corp.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Fruehauf
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murco Wall Products Inc.
Represented By: Kate Harmon
Represented By: Stephanie S. Levitsky
Represented By: R. Stokes Nolte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Assocation
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of Delaware Inc.
Represented By: C. Scott Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: David G. Culley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Roebuck and Co.
Represented By: Peter John Faben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag West Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-Lynch Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bond
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Represented By: Kara Anne Hager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Bond
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Represented By: Kara Anne Hager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sally J. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: C. Scott Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?