SRI International Inc. v. Cisco Systems Inc.
Plaintiff: SRI International Inc.
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01534
Filed: September 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MEMORANDUM: The motion to amend the willfulness judgment (D.I. 427 ) is DENIED. The motion for attorney's fees and expenses (D.I. 428 ) is GRANTED. The parties are directed to meet and confer and to submit an agreed-upon final judgment implementing this memorandum within two weeks (see Memorandum for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2020. (nms)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 420 REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION re: D.I. 415 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/25/2017. (nmfn)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: evidentiary disputes. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/9/2016. (nmfn)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: pretrial evidentiary disputes. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/22/2016. (nmfn)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/11/2016. (nmfn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SRI International Inc. v. Cisco Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SRI International Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Lee Halkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?