Andrulis Pharmaceuticals Corp. v. Celgene Corp.

Plaintiff: Andrulis Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Defendant: Celgene Corp.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01644
Filed: October 2, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2015 155 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 85 DENYING MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of Counterclaims and Strike Ninth Affirmative Defense filed by Andrulis Pharmaceuticals Corp.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2015. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/16/15. (kjk)
June 26, 2015 149 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for terms in dispute. Within five days the parties shall submit a status report. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/26/2015. (nms)
April 10, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 17 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/10/2014. (nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrulis Pharmaceuticals Corp. v. Celgene Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrulis Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celgene Corp.
Represented By: Mary B. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?