Universal American Corp. v. Party Partners Healthcare Solutions Holdings LP et al

Plaintiff: Universal American Corp.
Defendant: Partners Healthcare Solutions Holdings LP, GTCR Golder Rauner II LLC, GTCR Partners IX LP, GTCR Fund IX/A LP, GTCR Fund IX/B LP, GTCR Co-Invest III LP, David Katz, Gregory Scott, Jerome Vaccaro and John McDonough
Case Number: 1:2013cv01741
Filed: October 22, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Motion To Dismiss First Amended and Supplemental Complaint (D.I. 44 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/31/2016. (nms)
December 28, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 63 MOTION to Deposit Funds (see order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/28/2015. (ksr, )
July 24, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 17 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/24/2014. (nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal American Corp. v. Party Partners Healthcare Solutions Holdings LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal American Corp.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Linda C. Goldstein
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Represented By: Paul C. Kingsbery
Represented By: Katharine Crawford Lester
Represented By: Andrew J. Levander
Represented By: Blake Rohrbacher
Represented By: Stuart T. Steinberg
Represented By: Elisa T. Wiygul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners Healthcare Solutions Holdings LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTCR Golder Rauner II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTCR Partners IX LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTCR Fund IX/A LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTCR Fund IX/B LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTCR Co-Invest III LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Vaccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?