TQ Delta LLC v. Pace Americas Inc.

Plaintiff: TQ Delta LLC
Defendant: Pace Americas Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01835
Filed: November 4, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 550 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 7,451,379, 8,516,337, 7,979,778, and 7,925,958. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with the Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/24/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01835-RGA, 1:13-cv-02013-RGA, 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 535 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 8,462,835, and 8,594,162. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/3/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01835-RGA, 1:13-cv-02013-RGA, 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 486 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 7,453,881, 7,809,028, 7,978,706, and 8,422,511 (the "Family 2" patents). Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/7/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01835-RGA, 1:13-cv-02013-RGA, 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 477 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 7,570,686, 7,835,430, 7,889,784, 8,238,412, and 9,432,956 (the "Family 1" patents). Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/30/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01835-RGA, 1:13-cv-02013-RGA, 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 473 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 7,292,627, 8,073,041, 8,090,008, 8,218,610, and 8,355,427 (the "Family 4" patents). Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consisten t with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2018. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01835-RGA, 1:13-cv-02013-RGA, 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms) (Main Document 473 replaced on 1/29/2018) (nms).
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order 445 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 7,831,890, 7,836,381, 7,844,882, 8,276,048, 8,495,473, and 8,607,126. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01835-RGA, 1:13-cv-02013-RGA, 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 340 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying Broadcom's request for attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/9/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01835-RGA, 1:13-cv-01836-RGA, 1:13-cv-02013-RGA, 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 322 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying MOTION to Compel Production of Engineering Documents from Third-Party Broadcom (see 285 in 13-cv-2013-RGA, 301 in 13-cv-1835-RGA, 262 in 13-cv-1836-RGA, 129 in 14-cv-954-RGA, 132 in 15-cv-121-RGA). Plaintiff is DIRECTED to f ile a three-page letter brief addressing Broadcom's request for attorney's fees within one week of this Order. Broadcom is DIRECTED to file a responsive three-page letter brief within one week of Plaintiff's letter. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/13/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01835-RGA, 1:13-cv-01836-RGA, 1:13-cv-02013-RGA, 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 254 MEMORANDUM ORDER addressing the disputes raised in the joint report. The parties are directed to meet-and-confer, and to the extent there are gaps or ambiguities in the procedures set forth above, submit a further status report identifying them, with proposed resolutions. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/5/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01835-RGA, 1:13-cv-01836-RGA, 1:13-cv-02013-RGA(nms)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order 238 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Motion for Clarification Regarding Allegations of a Law Firm Conflict of Interest, Cross-MOTION to Disqualify TQ Delta's Counsel, and Sealed Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/26/2016. Associated Cases: 13-cv-1835-RGA, 13-cv-1836-RGA, 13-cv-2013-RGA(nms)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order 211 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying as submitted (194 in 13-cv-1836-RGA, 209 in 13-cv-1835-RGA, 209 in 13-cv-02013-RGA) Unopposed MOTION to Redact April 6, 2016 Hearing Transcript (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/28/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01835-RGA, 1:13-cv-01836-RGA, 1:13-cv-02013-RGA(nms)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order 115 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying Plaintiff's discovery request (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/28/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01835-RGA, 1:13-cv-01836-RGA, 1:13-cv-02013-RGA(nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TQ Delta LLC v. Pace Americas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TQ Delta LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pace Americas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?