EMC Corporation, et al. v. Pure Storage Inc.
Plaintiff: EMC International Company, EMC Information Systems International and EMC Corporation
Defendant: Pure Storage Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01985
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2017 Filing 559 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Trial Exhibits returned, by Defendant. (nms)
November 7, 2017 Filing 558 Letter to Counsel, dated 11/7/2017, from the Court, regarding the return or disposal of jury trial exhibits (see D.I. #460 Exhibit List). (nms)
November 7, 2017 Remark: Local lead counsel's office for Plaintiffs has advised the Court via email that they do not wish to retrieve the trial exhibits (see letter at D.I. #558 ). Plaintiffs' trial exhibits have now been disposed of. (nms)
January 31, 2017 Filing 557 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of #556 Multi Media Document. (nmg)
January 31, 2017 Filing 556 Letter to Jack B. Blumenfeld from Clerk, dated 1/31/17, regarding return of multi-media disc (D.I. 495). (nmg) Modified on 1/31/2017 (nms).
October 21, 2016 Filing 555 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,904,556 B2; 6,915,475 B1; 7,373,464 B1; 7,434,015 B2; 8,375,187 B1. (Attachments: #1 Order)(nms)
October 21, 2016 Filing 554 MANDATE of USCA as to #543 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by EMC Corporation. USCA Decision: The appeal is herby REACTIVATED, and it is further, ORDERED that the appeal is dismissed under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Each party shall bear their own costs. (nms)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 553 SO ORDERED Granting #552 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/21/2016. (nms)
October 19, 2016 Filing 552 STIPULATION of Dismissal by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORAL ORDER: The MOTION for Leave to File a Reply (D.I. #550 ) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/14/2016. (nms)
October 13, 2016 Filing 550 MOTION for Leave to File Reply - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/14/2016 (nms).
October 11, 2016 Filing 549 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #540 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting a New Trial filed by Pure Storage Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/21/2016. (Fry, David)
October 7, 2016 Filing 548 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of 266 Multi Media Document. (rwc)
October 6, 2016 Filing 547 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company Transcripts Already on File (Blumenfeld, Jack)
October 3, 2016 Filing 546 NOTICE to the District Court: The parties in the above-captioned appeal have advised this court that a motion subject to Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4) has been filed. Please transmit a certified copy of the docket entries showing the disposition of the pending motion in the case. (nms)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER of USCA as to #543 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by EMC Corporation. Decision of USCA: The appeal is Deactivated. The appeal will be reactivated upon entry of the order disposing of the last such outstanding motion. (nms)
October 3, 2016 Filing 544 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #543 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by EMC Corporation. USCA Case Number 17-1004. (nms)
October 3, 2016 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #543 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (cna)
October 3, 2016 Notification regarding #543 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Dibbs. (cna)
September 30, 2016 Filing 543 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #534 Memorandum Opinion . Appeal filed by EMC Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 30, 2016 Filing 542 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding notice of appeal. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 30, 2016 Filing 541 Letter to Jeremy A. Tigan, Esq. from Clerk, dated 9/30/16, regarding return of 266 Multi Media Document. (rwc) Modified on 10/3/2016 (nms).
September 30, 2016 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #543 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by EMC Corporation. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2005787.) (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 22, 2016 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #540 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting a New Trial. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/11/2016. (nms)
September 22, 2016 Filing 540 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting a New Trial - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 9/23/2016 (nms).
September 15, 2016 Filing 539 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent EMC Corporation for EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company; Corporate Parent Dell Inc., Corporate Parent Denali Intermediate Inc., Corporate Parent Dell Technologies Inc. for EMC Corporation filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #536 MOTION for Extension of Time and Page Limits for Motion for Reconsideration. The request for more time is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion is due September 22, 2016. The request for more pages is denied. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2016. (nms)
September 15, 2016 Filing 537 RESPONSE to #536 MOTION for Extension of Time and Page Limits for Their Motion for Reconsideration, filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Russell, Andrew) Modified on 9/15/2016 (nms).
September 13, 2016 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #536 MOTION for Extension of Time and Page Limits for Their Motion for Reconsideration. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/30/2016. (nms)
September 13, 2016 Filing 536 MOTION for Extension of Time and Page Limits for Their Motion for Reconsideration - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/13/2016 (nms).
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER: #484 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, For a New Trial is DENIED IN PART with respect to Pure Storage's motion for JMOL and GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART with respect to Pure Storage's motion for a new trial. #491 MOTION for Permanent Injunction is DISMISSED as moot (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/1/2016. (ksr, )
September 1, 2016 Filing 534 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #484 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, For a New Trial and #491 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/1/2016. (ksr, )
August 12, 2016 Filing 533 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove William Clark as co-counsel.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 532 SO ORDERED Granting #530 Stipulation to Stay Execution or Enforcement of the Judgment Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/9/2016. (nms)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 531 SO ORDERED Granting #529 Stipulation Regarding EMC's Motion for an Accounting, Pre-Judgment Interest, and Post-Judgment Interest (D.I. #490 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/9/2016. (nms)
June 8, 2016 Filing 530 STIPULATION to Stay Execution or Enforcement of the Judgment Pending Appeal re #471 Order by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 8, 2016 Filing 529 STIPULATION re #490 MOTION for an Accounting, Pre-Judgment Interest, and Post-Judgment Interest by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 3, 2016 Filing 528 REDACTED VERSION of #523 Reply Brief by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 2, 2016 Filing 527 STIPULATION to Amend Briefing Schedule, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 6/2/2016 (nms).
June 2, 2016 Filing 526 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding stipulation to amend briefing schedule - re #473 Order,. (Tigan, Jeremy)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #527 Stipulation and Order extending briefing schedule, filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/2/2016. (nms)
May 27, 2016 Filing 525 DECLARATION Matthew M. Werdegar re #484 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, For a New Trial, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 5/31/2016 (nms).
May 27, 2016 Filing 524 REPLY BRIEF re #484 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, For a New Trial filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
May 27, 2016 Filing 523 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #491 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORAL ORDER: EMCs Motion to Seal (D.I. #475 ) is GRANTED with respect to pages 30, 31, 34, 35, 41, 43, and 59 of PTX-47. (See D.I. #515 , #520 ). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/26/2016. (nms)
May 20, 2016 Filing 521 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding PTX-211 - re #515 Order. (Shaw, John)
May 20, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The trial exhibits attached to D.I. #520 have been removed from that filing as trial exhibits are not to be filed on the docket. (nms)
May 19, 2016 Filing 520 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding replacement copies of trial exhibits.(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 5/20/2016 (nms).
May 17, 2016 Filing 519 REDACTED VERSION of #512 Appendix, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 5, #2 Part 3 of 5, #3 Part 4 of 5, #4 Part 5 of 5)(Fry, David)
May 17, 2016 Filing 518 REDACTED VERSION of #513 Declaration by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
May 17, 2016 Filing 517 REDACTED VERSION of #514 Declaration by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
May 17, 2016 Filing 516 REDACTED VERSION of #510 Declaration by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER On Motion to Seal Evidence. The MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits (D.I. #475 ) is DENIED in part and RESERVED in part (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/13/2016. (nms)
May 10, 2016 Filing 514 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Feng Wang, Ph.D. re #511 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 5/11/2016 (nms).
May 10, 2016 Filing 513 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Matthew M. Werdegar re #511 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 5/11/2016 (nms).
May 10, 2016 Filing 512 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #511 Answering Brief in Opposition by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Certificate of Service)(Fry, David)
May 10, 2016 Filing 511 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #491 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Pure Storage Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/20/2016. (Fry, David)
May 10, 2016 Filing 510 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dominguez re #509 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 5/11/2016 (nms).
May 10, 2016 Filing 509 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #484 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, For a New Trial filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/20/2016. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 9, 2016 Filing 508 REDACTED VERSION of #506 Reply Brief by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 2, 2016 Filing 507 DECLARATION of Jordan Bekier re #506 Reply Brief, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 5/3/2016 (nms).
May 2, 2016 Filing 506 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #475 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 26, 2016 Filing 505 REDACTED VERSION of #497 Appendix, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7)(Shaw, John) Modified on 4/27/2016 (nms).
April 26, 2016 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #497 . (nms)
April 22, 2016 Filing 504 DECLARATION of Adam Lauridsen re #502 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(Fry, David) Modified on 4/25/2016 (nms).
April 22, 2016 Filing 503 DECLARATION of Matthew Burr re #502 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 4/25/2016 (nms).
April 22, 2016 Filing 502 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #475 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits filed by Pure Storage Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/2/2016. (Fry, David)
April 22, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #495 has been replaced with an amended version. The NEF has been regenerated for Counsel. This disc lodged at D.I. 498 has now been placed under seal. (nms)
April 21, 2016 Filing 501 REDACTED VERSION of #494 Declaration by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 21, 2016 Filing 500 REDACTED VERSION of #493 Declaration by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-17)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 21, 2016 Filing 499 REDACTED VERSION of #492 Opening Brief in Support, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 15, 2016 Filing 498 SEALED MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company in the form of a CD containing Exhibit 1 to the Declaration found at D.I. #493 . (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (nms) Modified on 4/22/2016 (nms).
April 14, 2016 Filing 497 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #484 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, For a New Trial, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 part 1, #7 Exhibit 6 part 2, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(Fry, David) Modified on 4/15/2016 (nms).
April 14, 2016 Filing 496 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #484 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, For a New Trial filed by Pure Storage Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/2/2016. (Fry, David)
April 14, 2016 Filing 495 NOTICE of Lodging of CD as Exhibit 1 to Dominguez Declaration by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company re #493 Declaration (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Main Document 495 replaced on 4/22/2016) (nms).
April 14, 2016 Filing 494 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Goldstein re #491 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/15/2016 (nms).
April 14, 2016 Filing 493 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dominguez re #491 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 2-17)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/15/2016 (nms).
April 14, 2016 Filing 492 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #491 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/2/2016. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 14, 2016 Filing 491 MOTION for Permanent Injunction - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 14, 2016 Filing 490 MOTION for an Accounting, Pre-Judgment Interest, and Post-Judgment Interest - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/14/2016 (nms).
April 12, 2016 Filing 489 REDACTED VERSION of #480 Declaration by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 12, 2016 Filing 488 REDACTED VERSION of #479 Declaration by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 12, 2016 Filing 487 REDACTED VERSION of #478 Declaration by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 12, 2016 Filing 486 REDACTED VERSION of #476 Opening Brief in Support, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 12, 2016 Filing 485 REDACTED VERSION of #474 Letter by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 12, 2016 Filing 484 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, For a New Trial - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1Proposed Order)(Fry, David) Modified on 4/12/2016 (nms).
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying letter (D.I. #474 ) seeking to prevent Defendant from using or disclosing trial exhibits produced by EMC under the Court's Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/12/2016. (nms)
April 7, 2016 Filing 482 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David M. Fry regarding Response to EMC's April 5, 2016 Letter (D.I. #474 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fry, David) Modified on 4/7/2016 (nms).
April 5, 2016 Filing 481 PROPOSED ORDER re #475 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/6/2016 (nms).
April 5, 2016 Filing 480 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #475 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/6/2016 (nms).
April 5, 2016 Filing 479 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #475 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/6/2016 (nms).
April 5, 2016 Filing 478 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #475 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/6/2016 (nms).
April 5, 2016 Filing 477 DECLARATION re #475 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/6/2016 (nms).
April 5, 2016 Filing 476 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #475 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/22/2016. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/6/2016 (nms).
April 5, 2016 Filing 475 MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/6/2016 (nms).
April 5, 2016 Filing 474 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding protectiver order dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 473 SO ORDERED Granting #472 Stipulation and Proposed Order regarding briefing on the motion for accounting and a determination of prejudgment interest, filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/4/2016. (nms)
April 1, 2016 Filing 472 STIPULATION regarding proposed briefing schedule for EMC's Motion for accounting and determination of prejudgment interest re #471 Order by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER Granting #468 Unopposed Motion for a Stay of Execution or Enforcement of Judgment Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(B). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2016. (nms)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #470 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Set Post-Trial Briefing Schedule (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2016. (nms)
March 28, 2016 Filing 470 STIPULATION to set post-trial briefing schedule by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 28, 2016 Filing 469 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #468 Unopposed Motion for a Stay of Execution or Enforcement of Judgment Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(B), filed by Pure Storage Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/14/2016. (Fry, David) Modified on 3/29/2016 (nms).
March 28, 2016 Filing 468 Unopposed Motion for a Stay of Execution or Enforcement of Judgment Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(B) - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fry, David) Modified on 3/29/2016 (nms).
March 25, 2016 Filing 467 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 7) held on 03-15-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dale C. Hawkins. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2016. (lad)
March 25, 2016 Filing 466 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 6) held on 03-14-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dale C. Hawkins. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2016. (lad)
March 25, 2016 Filing 465 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 5) held on 03-11-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dale C. Hawkins. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2016. (lad)
March 25, 2016 Filing 464 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 4) held on 03-10-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dale C. Hawkins. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2016. (lad)
March 25, 2016 Filing 463 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 3) held on 03-09-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dale C. Hawkins. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2016. (lad)
March 25, 2016 Filing 462 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 2) held on 03-08-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dale C. Hawkins. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2016. (lad)
March 25, 2016 Filing 461 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 1) held on 03-07-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dale C. Hawkins. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2016. (lad)
March 23, 2016 Filing 460 Exhibit List by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORAL ORDER: The parties are requested within one week to submit a proposed schedule for any further proceedings anticipated in this case. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2016. (nms)
March 17, 2016 Filing 458 REDACTED VERSION of #438 Letter by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
March 17, 2016 Filing 457 REDACTED VERSION of #437 Letter by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
March 17, 2016 Filing 456 JUDGMENT: On Count One of the Amended Complaint (D.I. #37 ) as to U.S. Patent No. 6,904,556 judgment is entered for Defendant Pure Storage Inc. and against Plaintiffs EMC Corporation, EMC International Company, and EMC Information Systems International;(2) On Count Three of the Amended Complaint (D.I. #37 ) as to U.S. Patent No. 7,373,464 judgment is entered for Defendant Pure Storage Inc. and against Plaintiffs EMC Corporation, EMC International Company, and EMC Information Systems International;(3) On Count Four of the Amended Complaint (D.I. 37) as to U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015 judgment is entered for Plaintiffs EMC Corporation, EMC International Company, and EMC Information Systems International and against Defendant Pure Storage Inc. in the amount of Fourteen Million Dollars ($14,000,000.00)(CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/17/2016. (nms)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER Denying #446 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, and Denying #445 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/17/2016. (nms)
March 16, 2016 Filing 454 Witness List from Jury Trial held 3/7/2016 - 3/15/2016. (ksr, )
March 16, 2016 Filing 453 REDACTED VERSION of #452 Jury Verdict. (ksr, )
March 16, 2016 Filing 452 [SEALED] JURY VERDICT. (ksr, )
March 16, 2016 Filing 451 Emails Relating to Jury Instructions. (nms)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER directing that jurors be provided lunch (cc: Finance). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/15/2016. (nms)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting #443 Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law That EMC Has Failed To Introduce Evidence Sufficient To Prove Infringement Of Claim 32 Of The '464 Patent Under The Doctrine Of Equivalents. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/15/2016. (nms)
March 15, 2016 Filing 448 Final Jury Instructions (read in open Court on March 15, 2016). (nms)
March 15, 2016 Filing 447 FINAL JURY VERDICT Form. (nms)
March 15, 2016 Filing 446 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 15, 2016 Filing 445 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fry, David)
March 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 7 completed on 3/15/2016. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins and Stacey Ingram - Hawkins Reporting Service.) (ksr, )
March 14, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 6 held on 3/14/2016. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins and Stacey Ingram - Hawkins Reporting Service.) (ksr, )
March 14, 2016 Filing 444 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #443 Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law That Emc Has Failed To Introduce Evidence Sufficient To Prove Infringement Of Claim 32 Of The '464 Patent Under The Doctrine Of Equivalents filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/24/2016. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 13, 2016 Filing 443 Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law That EMC Has Failed To Introduce Evidence Sufficient To Prove Infringement Of Claim 32 Of The '464 Patent Under The Doctrine Of Equivalents - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fry, David) Modified on 3/14/2016 (nms).
March 12, 2016 Filing 442 Proposed Jury Instructions by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company . (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 12, 2016 Filing 441 VERDICT SHEET by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company . (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 12, 2016 Filing 440 Proposed VERDICT SHEET by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 3/14/2016 (nms).
March 11, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 5 held on 3/11/2016. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins and Stacey Ingram - Hawkins Reporting Service.) (ksr, )
March 11, 2016 Filing 439 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Patterson testimony. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 11, 2016 Filing 438 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David M. Fry. (Attachments: #1 Tabs 1-5)(Fry, David)
March 10, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 4 held on 3/10/2016. (Court Reporter Court Reporter Dale Hawkins and Stacey Ingram - Hawkins Reporting Service.) (ksr, )
March 10, 2016 Filing 437 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David M. Fry regarding Hugo Patterson Designations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fry, David)
March 9, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 3 held on 3/9/2016. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins and Stacey Ingram - Hawkins Reporting Service.) (ksr, )
March 8, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 2 held on 3/8/2016. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins and Stacey Ingram - Hawkins Reporting Service.) (ksr, )
March 7, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 1 held on 3/7/2016. Appearances: Blumenfeld, Krevitt, Trochia, Rosenberg, Poppe, Dominguez, Kalogeras for Plaintiffs; Shaw, Fry, Van Nest, Werpegar, Lauridsen, Johanningmeier, Rizk for Defendant. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins and Stacy Ingram - Hawkins Reporting Service.) (ksr, )
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 436 Claim Construction Order (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/3/2016. (nms)
March 3, 2016 Filing 435 Revised Preliminary Jury Instructions (to be read in open court). (nms)
March 3, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William Clark, Krishnendu Gupta for EMC Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
March 2, 2016 Filing 434 REDACTED VERSION of #411 Reply Brief by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
March 2, 2016 Filing 433 PROPOSED Claim Construction Order, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 3/3/2016 (nms).
March 2, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas A. Brown for EMC Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cna)
March 1, 2016 Filing 432 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David M. Fry. (Fry, David)
February 29, 2016 Filing 431 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding supplemental information re Pure MIL No. 1. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 3/1/2016 (nms).
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, the Court holds as a matter of law that EMC Corporation has standing to sue for infringement of the deduplication patents. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/29/2016. (nms)
February 29, 2016 Filing 429 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding standing as to U.S. Patent Nos. '464 and '015. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/29/2016. (nms)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 428 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting #376 MOTION to Strike Late-Produced Documents and Improper Expert Testimony, filed by Pure Storage Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/29/2016. (nms)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER regarding jury instructions (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/29/2016. (nms)
February 29, 2016 Filing 426 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Pure's February 29, 2016 Letter in Response to the Court's Proposed Jury Instruction - re #424 Letter. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 29, 2016 Filing 425 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Court's proposed instruction - re #416 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 29, 2016 Filing 424 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding the Court's Proposed Jury Instruction - re #416 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shaw, John)
February 26, 2016 Filing 423 REDACTED VERSION of #410 Reply Brief, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/29/2016 (nms).
February 26, 2016 Filing 422 REDACTED VERSION of #402 Declaration of Paul E. Torchia, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/29/2016 (nms).
February 26, 2016 Filing 421 REDACTED VERSION of #401 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/29/2016 (nms).
February 26, 2016 Filing 420 REDACTED VERSION of #391 Declaration of Stuart Rosenberg, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-L)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/29/2016 (nms).
February 26, 2016 Filing 419 REDACTED VERSION of #390 Opening Brief in Support, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/29/2016 (nms).
February 26, 2016 Filing 418 REDACTED VERSION of #404 Declaration, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
February 26, 2016 Filing 417 REDACTED VERSION of #403 Answering Brief in Opposition by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER regarding a proposed jury instruction relating to the '015 patent (the Court's proposal is attached). The parties are to submit any objections, corrections, or other comments by 8 a.m. on February 29, 2016 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/26/2016. (nms)
February 26, 2016 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI #390 and #391 . (nms)
February 25, 2016 Filing 415 DECLARATION of Laura Corbin re #414 Brief, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/26/2016 (nms).
February 25, 2016 Filing 414 Brief in Support of its Proposed Jury Instruction on Infringement of Claims 1, 7, and 16 of The '015 Patent, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/14/2016. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/26/2016 (nms).
February 25, 2016 Filing 413 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David M. Fry regarding Jury Instructions and the '015 Patent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Fry, David)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MEMORANDUM ORDER providing rulings on the unresolved motions in limine (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/25/2016. (nms)
February 24, 2016 Filing 411 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #376 MOTION to Strike Late-Produced Documents and Improper Expert Testimony filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
February 23, 2016 Filing 410 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF in further Support of #390 Opening Brief regarding Standing, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/24/2016 (nms).
February 22, 2016 Filing 409 REDACTED VERSION of #374 Proposed Pretrial Order, Volume 3 of 3, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 15-16, part 2)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/23/2016 (nms).
February 22, 2016 Filing 408 REDACTED VERSION of #373 Proposed Pretrial Order, Volume 2 of 3, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/23/2016 (nms).
February 22, 2016 Filing 407 REDACTED VERSION of #372 Proposed Pretrial Order, Volume 1 of 3, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, part 1, #3 Exhibit 6, part 2, #4 Exhibits 7-8, #5 Exhibits 9-10, #6 Exhibits 1-12)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/23/2016 (nms).
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 406 SO ORDERED, re #405 Stipulation Regarding Reduction of Asserted Claims and Prior Art References for Trial (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/22/2016. (nms)
February 22, 2016 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI #372 , #373 , #374 and #377 . (nms)
February 19, 2016 Filing 405 STIPULATION Regarding Reduction of Asserted Claims and Prior Art References for Trial by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 19, 2016 Filing 404 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #403 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 part 1, #9 Exhibit 8 part 2, #10 Exhibit 8 part 3, #11 Exhibit 8 part 4)(Fry, David) Modified on 2/22/2016 (nms).
February 19, 2016 Filing 403 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition To #390 Opening Brief Regarding Standing], filed by Pure Storage Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/29/2016. (Shaw, John) Modified on 2/22/2016 (nms).
February 19, 2016 Filing 402 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Paul E. Torchia re #401 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/22/2016 (nms).
February 19, 2016 Filing 401 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #376 MOTION to Strike Late-Produced Documents and Improper Expert Testimony filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/29/2016. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 18, 2016 Filing 400 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David M. Fry regarding proposed order concerning EMC's Motion in Limine No. 3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fry, David)
February 18, 2016 Filing 399 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding EMC's Motion in Limine #3. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/18/2016. (nms)
February 17, 2016 Filing 397 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Pure Storage's Motion In Limine No. 3. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORAL ORDER: The Court is agreeable to the deadlines put forth in the letter filed at D.I. #394 . Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/17/2016. (nms)
February 17, 2016 Filing 395 Official Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on 02-12-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2016. (lad)
February 16, 2016 Filing 394 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding follow-up to issues discussed at the February 12, 2016 pretrial conference. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/17/2016 (nms).
February 16, 2016 Filing 393 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion in Limine No. 2 by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 16, 2016 Filing 392 REDACTED VERSION of #377 Opening Brief in Support, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H)(Fry, David) Modified on 2/17/2016 (nms).
February 16, 2016 Filing 391 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Stuart Rosenberg re #390 Opening Brief in Support, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-L, part 1, #2 Exhibits A-L, part 2)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/17/2016 (nms).
February 16, 2016 Filing 390 [SEALED] Opening Brief Regarding EMC Corporation's Standing, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/4/2016. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/17/2016 (nms).
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER After Pretrial Conference (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/16/2016. (nms)
February 12, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/12/2016. Details regarding upcoming trial discussed and finalized. Each side is given 16 hours to present their cases. Appearances: Blumenfeld, Krevitt, Rosenberg, Torchia, Gupta, Brown for Plaintiffs; Shaw, Fry, Van Nest, Werdegar, Johanningmeier, Risk for Defendant. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The submissions on standing ordered at the pretrial conference should include, if there were an evidentiary hearing, which witnesses would be called and a proffer of what they would say. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/12/2016. (ksr, )
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER, Granting in part and Denying in part #198 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Denying #204 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions And Testimony, Denying #302 MOTION to Strike Untimely Evidence And Expert Opinions, Granting #214 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Direct Infringement of Claims 1, 7, and 16 of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015, Granting #317 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015, Granting in part and Denying in part #211 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. James Plank, and Denying #206 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and to Exclude Expert Testimony, Regarding Pure Storage's Hypothetical Non-Infringing Alternatives. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/11/2016. (ksr, )
February 11, 2016 Filing 387 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion in limine No. 3, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/16/2016 (nms).
February 11, 2016 Filing 386 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion in limine No. 2, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/16/2016 (nms).
February 11, 2016 Filing 385 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion in limine No. 1, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/16/2016 (nms).
February 11, 2016 Filing 384 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion In Limine No. 3 Regarding Improper Testimony and Witnesses, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 2/16/2016 (nms).
February 11, 2016 Filing 383 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion In Limine No. 2 Regarding Irrelevant and Prejudicial Financial Information, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 2/16/2016 (nms).
February 11, 2016 Filing 382 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion In Limine No. 1 Regarding Pre-Suit Knowledge of the Patents or Technology, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 2/16/2016 (nms).
February 11, 2016 Filing 381 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #198 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #204 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions And Testimony, #302 MOTION to Strike Untimely Evidence And Expert Opinions, #206 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and to Exclude Expert Testimony, Regarding Pure Storage's Hypothetical Non-Infringing Alternatives, #211 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. James Plank, #214 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Direct Infringement of Claims 1, 7, and 16 of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015, #317 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/11/2016. (ksr, )
February 11, 2016 Filing 380 Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions. (ksr, )
February 11, 2016 Filing 379 Voir Dire (to be read at trial). (nms)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORAL ORDER: Each party is requested to file by 4 p.m. a proposed order for each of its three motions in limine specifying exactly what it would have the court order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/11/2016. (nms)
February 9, 2016 Filing 377 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #376 MOTION to Strike Late-Produced Documents and Improper Expert Testimony, filed by Pure Storage Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/26/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Fry, David) Modified on 2/10/2016 (nms).
February 9, 2016 Filing 376 MOTION to Strike Late-Produced Documents and Improper Expert Testimony - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fry, David) Modified on 2/10/2016 (nms).
February 9, 2016 Filing 375 OBJECTIONS to Notices of Deposition of Ken Cherry and Jon Jordan, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fry, David) Modified on 2/10/2016 (nms).
February 9, 2016 Filing 374 [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order, Volume 3 of 3, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15-Part 1, #2 Exhibit 15-Part 2, #3 Exhibit 15-Part 3, #4 Exhbit 16)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/10/2016 (nms).
February 9, 2016 Filing 373 [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order, Volume 2 of 3, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13-Part 1, #2 Exhibit 13-Part 2, #3 Exhibit 14-Part 1, #4 Exhibit 14-Part 2, #5 Exhibit 14-Part 3)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/10/2016 (nms).
February 9, 2016 Filing 372 [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order, Volume 1 of 3, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12-Part 1, #4 Exhibit 12-Part 2, #5 Exhibit 12-Part 3)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 2/10/2016 (nms).
February 9, 2016 Filing 371 Proposed Jury Instructions by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company . (Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 9, 2016 Filing 370 VERDICT SHEET by Pure Storage Inc. . (Fry, David)
February 9, 2016 Filing 369 VERDICT SHEET by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company . (Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 9, 2016 Filing 368 Proposed Voir Dire by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 367 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/9/2016. (nms)
February 8, 2016 Filing 366 PROPOSED Claim Construction Order, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms).
February 5, 2016 Filing 365 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Pure Storage, Inc.'s Notice Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. 282 filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
February 2, 2016 Filing 364 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken Cherry on February 10, 2016 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 2, 2016 Filing 363 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jon Jordan on February 10, 2016 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding supplemental claim construction of two terms in U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015 and U.S. Patent No. 7,373,464. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/2/2016. (nms)
February 1, 2016 Filing 361 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Report of Brian W. Napper filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 29, 2016 Filing 360 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 01-28-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2016. (lad)
January 28, 2016 Filing 359 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding source code dispute. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/28/2016 (nms).
January 28, 2016 Filing 358 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw - re 357 Oral Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shaw, John) Modified on 1/28/2016 (nms).
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring Court attention. A Telephone Conference is now set for 1/28/2016, at 3:00 PM before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. The parties shall either file a short joint letter, or short separate letters (1-2 pages in length) one hour prior to the start of the conference. The parties shall mutually coordinate the call to the Court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2016. (nms)
January 28, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: Jordan H. Bekier added to Dkt #344 as Pro Hac attorney (nmb)
January 28, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jordan H. Bekier for EMC Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
January 28, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Telephone Conference held on 1/28/2016. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (nms)
January 27, 2016 Filing 356 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken Cherry on February 10, 2016 filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
January 27, 2016 Filing 355 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kai Li on January 29, 2016 filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
January 27, 2016 Filing 354 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jon Jordan on February 10, 2016 filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
January 27, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul E. Torchia for EMC Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
January 27, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven Kalogeras,Laura Corbin for EMC Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
January 26, 2016 Filing 353 Official Transcript of Supplemental Markman Hearing held on 01-08-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stacey Ingram. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2016. (lad)
January 21, 2016 Filing 352 REDACTED VERSION of #347 Letter, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/22/2016 (nms).
January 20, 2016 Filing 351 REDACTED VERSION of #345 Letter, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
January 19, 2016 Filing 350 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vinay Perneti on January 21, 2016 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 19, 2016 Filing 349 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andrew Kleinerman on January 21, 2016 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 13, 2016 Filing 348 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding claim construction - re #346 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 13, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kate Dominguez for EMC Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
January 12, 2016 Filing 347 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding EMC's response to Pure Storage's January 11, 2016 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/13/2016 (nms).
January 12, 2016 Filing 346 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding proposed constructions of terms. (Shaw, John) Modified on 1/13/2016 (nms).
January 11, 2016 Filing 345 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding Motion to Strike (D.I. #302 ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibits E-F, #4 Exhibits G-H, #5 Certificate of Service)(Shaw, John) Modified on 1/11/2016 (nms).
January 8, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 1/8/2016. (Court Reporter Stacey Ingram - Hawkins Reporting Service.) (ksr, )
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #344 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Corbin, Kate Dominguez, Steven Kalogeras and Jordan Bekier filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/7/2016. (nms)
January 6, 2016 Filing 344 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Corbin, Kate Dominguez, Steven Kalogeras and Jordan Bekier - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORAL ORDER: Oral Argument is set for 1/8/2016, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up supplemental claim construction issues. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/5/2016. (nms)
January 5, 2016 Filing 342 REDACTED VERSION of #335 Claim Construction Reply Brief by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
January 4, 2016 Filing 341 REDACTED VERSION of #336 Appendix, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10, #2 Exhibits A-S)(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 4, 2016 Filing 340 REDACTED VERSION of #334 Claim Construction Answering Brief by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 4, 2016 Filing 339 REDACTED VERSION of #333 Claim Construction Opening Brief by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 4, 2016 Filing 338 REDACTED VERSION of #332 Claim Construction Opening Brief by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
January 4, 2016 Filing 337 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Kai Li on 12-22-2015 (Fry, David)
December 31, 2015 Filing 336 [SEALED] Joint Appendix re Supplemental Claim Construction Briefing (see D.I. #332 , #333 , #334 , #335 ), by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10, #2 Exhibits A-S)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/4/2016 (nms).
December 30, 2015 Filing 335 [SEALED] Reply Brief in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction, filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 1/4/2016 (nms).
December 30, 2015 Filing 334 [SEALED] Responsive Brief Regarding Claim Construction Issues Raised in Connection with Summary Judgment, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/4/2016 (nms).
December 23, 2015 Filing 333 [SEALED] Brief Regarding Claim Construction Issues Raised in Connection with Summary Judgment, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/4/2016 (nms).
December 23, 2015 Filing 332 [SEALED] Opening Brief in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction, filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Shaw, John) Modified on 1/4/2016 (nms).
December 18, 2015 Filing 331 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's Notice of Subpoena to Kai Li filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
December 18, 2015 Filing 330 REDACTED VERSION of #325 Declaration, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
December 18, 2015 Filing 329 REDACTED VERSION of #324 Reply Brief by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
December 15, 2015 Filing 328 REDACTED VERSION of #322 Declaration by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 15, 2015 Filing 327 Official Transcript of Motions Hearing held on 12-14-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2016. (lad)
December 15, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #322 . (nms)
December 14, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 12/14/2015. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning.) (ksr, )
December 10, 2015 Filing 326 RESPONSE to #317 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015, filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fry, David) Modified on 12/11/2015 (nms).
December 10, 2015 Filing 325 [SEALED] Reply DECLARATION of Matthew M. Werdegar re #302 MOTION to Strike Untimely Evidence And Expert Opinions, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 26, #5 Exhibit 27, #6 Exhibit 28, #7 Exhibit 29, #8 Exhibit 30, #9 Exhibit 31)(Fry, David) Modified on 12/11/2015 (nms).
December 10, 2015 Filing 324 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #302 MOTION to Strike Untimely Evidence And Expert Opinions filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
December 10, 2015 Filing 323 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding order for argument presentation at December 14, 2015 hearing. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 3, 2015 Filing 322 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Steven Kalogeras re #321 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-8)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 12/4/2015 (nms).
December 3, 2015 Filing 321 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #302 MOTION to Strike Untimely Evidence And Expert Opinions filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/14/2015. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 3, 2015 Filing 320 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Surreply Expert Report of Mark T. Jones Concerning U.S. Patent 6,904,556 and (2) Suppemental Expert Report of Daniel A. Menasce, Ph.D. Regarding the Validity of U.S. Patent 8,375,187 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORAL ORDER: The request for additional time at the hearing schedule for 12/14/2015, is Granted. The Court will allot two hours for the hearing. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/3/2015. (nms)
December 2, 2015 Filing 318 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David M. Fry regarding request for additional time for Oral Argument. (Fry, David) Modified on 12/3/2015 (nms).
November 24, 2015 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #317 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/11/2015. (nms)
November 24, 2015 Filing 317 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015 - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms).
November 19, 2015 Filing 316 REDACTED VERSION of #304 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/20/2015 (nms).
November 19, 2015 Filing 315 REDACTED VERSION of #303 Opening Brief in Support by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
November 17, 2015 Filing 314 REDACTED VERSION of #301 Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/18/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 Filing 313 REDACTED VERSION of #300 Reply Brief, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/18/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 Filing 312 REDACTED VERSION of #295 Declaration of Matthew H. Poppe, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/18/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 Filing 311 REDACTED VERSION of #294 Reply Brief, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/18/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 Filing 310 REDACTED VERSION of #293 Declaration of Stuart M. Rosenberg, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/18/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 Filing 309 REDACTED VERSION of #292 Reply Brief, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/18/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 Filing 308 REDACTED VERSION of #299 Declaration of Corey Johanningmeier, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/18/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 Filing 307 REDACTED VERSION of #298 Reply Brief by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
November 17, 2015 Filing 306 REDACTED VERSION of #297 Declaration of R. Adam Lauridsen, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/18/2015 (nms).
November 17, 2015 Filing 305 REDACTED VERSION of #296 Reply Brief by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
November 12, 2015 Filing 304 [SEALED] DECLARATION Matthew M. Werdegar re #302 MOTION to Strike Untimely Evidence And Expert Opinions, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Fry, David) Modified on 11/13/2015 (nms).
November 12, 2015 Filing 303 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #302 MOTION to Strike Untimely Evidence And Expert Opinions, filed by Pure Storage Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/30/2015. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/13/2015 (nms).
November 12, 2015 Filing 302 MOTION to Strike Untimely Evidence And Expert Opinions - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fry, David) Modified on 11/13/2015 (nms).
November 10, 2015 Filing 301 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Kalogeras re #300 Reply Brief, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/12/2015 (nms).
November 10, 2015 Filing 300 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #214 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Direct Infringement of Claims 1, 7, and 16 of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 10, 2015 Filing 299 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Corey Johanningmeier re #298 Reply Brief, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 33, #2 Exhibit 34, #3 Exhibit 35, #4 Exhibit 36, #5 Exhibit 37, #6 Exhibit 38, #7 Exhibit 39, #8 Exhibit 40)(Fry, David) Modified on 11/12/2015 (nms).
November 10, 2015 Filing 298 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #198 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
November 10, 2015 Filing 297 [SEALED] DECLARATION of R. Adam Lauridsen re #296 Reply Brief, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit K, #5 Exhibit L)(Fry, David) Modified on 11/12/2015 (nms).
November 10, 2015 Filing 296 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #204 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions And Testimony filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
November 10, 2015 Filing 295 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #294 Reply Brief, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/10/2015 (nms).
November 10, 2015 Filing 294 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #211 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. James Plank filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 10, 2015 Filing 293 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Rosenberg re #292 Reply Brief, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/10/2015 (nms).
November 10, 2015 Filing 292 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #206 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and to Exclude Expert Testimony, Regarding Pure Storage's Hypothetical Non-Infringing Alternatives, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/17/2016 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 291 REDACTED VERSION of #263 Declaration of Dr. Kai Li, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 290 REDACTED VERSION of #262 Declaration of Dr. Daniel A. Menasce, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Y)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 289 REDACTED VERSION of #261 Declaration of Dr. Mark Jones, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 288 REDACTED VERSION of #260 Declaration of Ian Jestice, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 287 REDACTED VERSION of #259 Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-20)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 286 REDACTED VERSION of #258 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 285 REDACTED VERSION of #242 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 284 REDACTED VERSION of #241 Declaration of Paul E. Torchia, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-12)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 283 REDACTED VERSION of #240 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 282 REDACTED VERSION of #257 Declaration of James S. Plank, PH.D., by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 281 REDACTED VERSION of #256 Declaration of Corey Johanningmeier, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 280 REDACTED VERSION of #252 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
November 4, 2015 Filing 279 REDACTED VERSION of #255 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 278 REDACTED VERSION of #254 Declaration of Erez Zadok, PH.D., by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 277 REDACTED VERSION of #253 Declaration of Corey Johanningmeier, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 276 REDACTED VERSION of #251 Declaration of Feng Wang, PH.D., by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 275 REDACTED VERSION of #250 Declaration of Bo Hong, PH.D., by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 274 REDACTED VERSION of #249 Declaration of Neil Vachharajani, PH.D., by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 273 REDACTED VERSION of #248 Declaration of Erez Zadok, PH.D., by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 272 REDACTED VERSION of #247 Declaration of Steven Swanson, Ph.D., by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 271 REDACTED VERSION of #246 Declaration of James S. Plank, PH.D., by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 270 REDACTED VERSION of #245 Declaration of Laura B. Stamm, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 269 REDACTED VERSION of #244 Declaration of R. Adam Lauridsen, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 11/5/2015 (nms).
November 4, 2015 Filing 268 REDACTED VERSION of #243 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
November 3, 2015 Filing 267 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file reply briefs in support of their respective Daubert and case-dispositive motions to November 10, 2015 - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #267 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file reply briefs in support of their respective Daubert and case-dispositive motions to November 10, 2015, filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/3/2015. (nms)
October 30, 2015 Filing 266 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT (DVD - video files), filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company in the form of a DVD. Filing related to #265 Notice of Lodging regarding #262 Declaration. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (nms)
October 30, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE of Lodging re: disk containing Exhibits O, R, and T (video files in native format) to the Declaration of Dr. Daniel A. Menasce (D.I. #262 ), by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/30/2015 (nms).
October 30, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for part 3 of D.I. #262 has been replaced with an amended version. Notations to exhibits O, R, and T have been removed. (nms)
October 28, 2015 Filing 264 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Third Supplemental Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 28, 2015 Filing 263 [SEALED] DECLARATION Dr. Kai Li re #258 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-R, Part 1, #2 Exhibits A-R, Part 2)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 262 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dr. Daniel A. Menasce re #258 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Y Part 1, #2 Exhibits A-Y Part 2, #3 Exhibits A-Y Part 3, #4 Exhibits A-Y Part 4)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nms). (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/30/2015) (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 261 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dr. Mark Jones re #258 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 260 [SEALED] DECLARATION Ian Jestice re #258 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 259 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Steven Kalogeras re #258 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-20)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 258 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #198 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/9/2015. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 28, 2015 Filing 257 [SEALED] DECLARATION of James S. Plank re #255 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 256 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Corey Johanningmeier re #255 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 255 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #211 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. James Plank filed by Pure Storage Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/9/2015. (Fry, David)
October 28, 2015 Filing 254 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Erez Zadok, PH.D. re #252 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 253 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Corey Johanningmeier re #243 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/29/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 252 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #214 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Direct Infringement of Claims 1, 7, and 16 of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015 filed by Pure Storage Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/9/2015. (Fry, David)
October 28, 2015 Filing 251 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Feng Wang, PH.D. re #243 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 250 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Bo Hong, PH.D. re #243 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 249 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Neil Vachharajani, PH.D. re #243 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 248 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Erez Zadok, PH.D. re #243 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 247 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Steven Swanson, PH.D. re #243 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 246 [SEALED] DECLARATION of James S. Plank, PH.D. re #243 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 245 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Laura B. Stamm re #243 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 244 [SEALED] DECLARATION of R. Adam Lauridsen re #243 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 243 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #206 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and to Exclude Expert Testimony, Regarding Pure Storage's Hypothetical Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by Pure Storage Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/9/2015. (Fry, David)
October 28, 2015 Filing 242 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #204 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions And Testimony of Ian Jestice, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/9/2015. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 241 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Paul E. Torchia re #240 Answering Brief in Opposition, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-12 - Part 1, #2 Exhibits 1-12 - Part 2)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 28, 2015 Filing 240 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #204 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions And Testimony of Brian Napper, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/9/2015. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/28/2015 (nms).
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORAL ORDER: The mediation with Judge Thynge has been rescheduled to 2/8/16 at 10:00 AM. Submissions of the parties shall now be due on or before 12:00 Noon 1/28/16. All other provisions of the Court's 4/20/15 Order remain in full force and effect. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/27/15. (cak)
October 20, 2015 Filing 238 REDACTED VERSION of #199 Opening Brief in Support by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
October 20, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. #230 has been corrected to reflect the filing is a Redacted Version of D.I. 205 and not D.I. 199. (nms)
October 20, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #205 . (nms)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the summary judgment applications on 12/14/2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/19/2015. (nms)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORAL ORDER: The mediation scheduled for 10/22/15 at 10:00 AM with Judge Thynge is cancelled. A teleconference has been scheduled for 10/22/15 at 10:00 AM EASTERN TIME with Judge Thynge. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/16/15. (cak)
October 13, 2015 Filing 235 REDACTED VERSION of #200 Declaration of Corey Johanningmeier, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/14/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 234 REDACTED VERSION of #208 Declaration of R. Adam Lauridsen, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 233 REDACTED VERSION of #203 Declaration of Steven Swanson, Ph.D., by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 232 REDACTED VERSION of #202 Declaration of James S. Plank, Ph.D., by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 231 REDACTED VERSION of #201 Declaration of Erez Zadok, Ph.D., by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 230 REDACTED VERSION of #205 Opening Brief in Support, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms). Modified on 10/20/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 229 REDACTED VERSION of #217 Declaration of Ian Jestice, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 228 REDACTED VERSION of #216 Declaration of Stuart M. Rosenberg, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-17)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 227 REDACTED VERSION of #215 Opening Brief in Support, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 226 REDACTED VERSION of #213 Declaration of T. Vann Pearce, Jr., by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-O)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 225 REDACTED VERSION of #212 Opening Brief in Support, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 224 REDACTED VERSION of #210 Declaration of Brian W. Napper, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 223 REDACTED VERSION of #209 Declaration of Paul Torchia, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-11)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 13, 2015 Filing 222 REDACTED VERSION of #207 Opening Brief in Support, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/13/2015 (nms).
October 8, 2015 Filing 221 REDACTED VERSION of #194 Letter, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-J)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/9/2015 (nms).
October 8, 2015 Filing 220 REDACTED VERSION of #193 Letter, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
October 7, 2015 Filing 219 REDACTED VERSION of #192 Letter, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-N)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/8/2015 (nms).
October 7, 2015 Filing 218 REDACTED VERSION of #191 Letter by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
October 7, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 215 was placed under seal per voicemail request of filer. (rwc)
October 7, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 218 has been removed from the docket as it was a duplicate of D.I. 215. (nms)
October 6, 2015 Filing 217 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #214 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Direct Infringement of Claims 1, 7, and 16 of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 216 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #214 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Direct Infringement of Claims 1, 7, and 16 of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-17)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 215 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #214 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Direct Infringement of Claims 1, 7, and 16 of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/23/2015. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2015 (rwc). Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 214 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Direct Infringement of Claims 1, 7, and 16 of U.S. Patent No. 7,434,015 - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 213 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #212 Opening Brief in Support, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-M, #2 Exhibit N, #3 Exhibit O)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms). Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 212 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #211 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. James Plank, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/23/2015. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 211 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. James Plank - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Statement, #2 Proposed Order)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 210 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #207 Opening Brief in Support, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 209 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #207 Opening Brief in Support, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-11)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 208 [SEALED] DECLARATION of R. Adam Lauridsen re #204 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions And Testimony, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibt D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 207 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #206 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and to Exclude Expert Testimony, Regarding Pure Storage's Hypothetical Non-Infringing Alternatives, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/23/2015. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 206 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and to Exclude Expert Testimony, Regarding Pure Storage's Hypothetical Non-Infringing Alternatives - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 7.1.1 Statement, #2 Proposed Order)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 205 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #204 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions And Testimony, filed by Pure Storage Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/23/2015. (Fry, David) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 204 MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions And Testimony - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 203 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Steven Swanson, Ph.D. re #198 MOTION for Summary Judgment, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibt D)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 202 [SEALED] DECLARATION of James S. Plank re #198 MOTION for Summary Judgment, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibt B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibt D)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 201 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Erez Zadok, Ph.D. re #198 MOTION for Summary Judgment, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-6)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 200 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Corey Johanningmeier re #198 MOTION for Summary Judgment, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17 - part 1 of 2, #18 Exhibit 17 - part 2 of 2, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 199 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #198 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Pure Storage Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/23/2015. (Fry, David) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Filing 198 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/7/2015 (nms).
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER Granting #195 Unopposed MOTION for Permission to File Individual Briefs for Case Dispositive and Daubert Motions withing Existing Page Limits, filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/5/2015. (nms)
October 5, 2015 Filing 196 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 10-02-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2016. (lad)
October 5, 2015 Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION for Permission to File Individual Briefs for Case Dispositive and Daubert Motions withing Existing Page Limits - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/5/2015 (nms).
October 2, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 10/2/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (nms)
October 1, 2015 Filing 194 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-J)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/1/2015 (nms).
October 1, 2015 Filing 193 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David M. Fry regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K, #2 Exhibit L Part 1, #3 Exhibit L Part 2, #4 Exhibit L Part 3, #5 Exhibit L Part 4, #6 Exhibits M-U)(Fry, David) Modified on 10/1/2015 (nms).
September 30, 2015 Filing 192 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-N)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/30/2015 (nms).
September 30, 2015 Filing 191 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David M. Fry regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-K)(Fry, David) Modified on 9/30/2015 (nms).
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a discovery conference on 10/2/2015, at 1:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall file the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/22/2015. (nms)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER re #187 Unopposed Motion to Extend Page Limits for Case-Dispositive Motions. No more than a total of forty (40) pages of combined opening briefs, no more than forty (40) pages of combined answering briefs in opposition, and no more than twenty (20) pages of combined reply briefs. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/18/2015. (nms)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #188 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Daubert and Case-Dispositive Motions, filed by Pure Storage Inc. (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/18/2015. (nms)
September 17, 2015 Filing 188 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule for Daubert and Case-Dispositive Motions by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
September 17, 2015 Filing 187 Unopposed Motion to Extend Page Limits for Case-Dispositive Motions - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fry, David) Modified on 9/18/2015 (nms).
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SO ORDERED Granting #185 Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition of Laura Stamm on September 11, 2015. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/9/2015. (nms)
September 8, 2015 Filing 185 MOTION to Take Deposition of Laura Stamm on September 11, 2015 - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 14, 2015 Filing 184 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Plank on September 4, 2015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 14, 2015 Filing 183 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Erez Zadok on September 1, 2015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 14, 2015 Filing 182 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Swanson on August 25, 2015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 14, 2015 Filing 181 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Laura Stamm on August 25, 2015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 13, 2015 Filing 180 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Jones on August 18, 2015 filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
August 13, 2015 Filing 179 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ian Jestice on August 21, 2015 filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
August 13, 2015 Filing 178 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daniel Menasce on August 20, 2015 filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
August 13, 2015 Filing 177 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brian Napper on September 2, 2015 filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
August 7, 2015 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Reply Expert Report of Brian Napper; (2) Reply Expert Report of Mark Jones; (3) Reply Expert Report of Daniel Menasce; and (4) Reply Expert Report of Ian Jestice filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 7, 2015 Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Reply Expert Report of James S. Plank, Ph.D. Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,904,556; 2. Reply Expert Report of Steven Swanson, Ph.D. Regarding Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 8,375,187; and 3. Reply Expert Report of Erez Zadok, Ph.D. Regarding U.S. Patent Nos. 7,373,464 and 7,434,015 filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #174 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Certain Scheduling Deadlines, filed by Pure Storage Inc. (Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 10/6/2015). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2015. (nms)
June 30, 2015 Filing 174 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Ceratin Scheduling Deadlines - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 7/1/2015 (nms).
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #173 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Josh A. Krevitt, Paul E. Torchia and Stuart M. Rosenberg filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/17/2015. (nms)
June 16, 2015 Filing 173 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Josh A. Krevitt, Paul E. Torchia and Stuart M. Rosenberg - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 5, 2015 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance (Joshua Krevitt, Stuart Rosenberg and Paul Torchia) by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company (Blumenfeld, Jack)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: Per the letter filed at D.I. #171 , the Discovery Conference scheduled for 6/2/2015 at 3:00 PM is CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/26/2015. (ksr, )
May 22, 2015 Filing 171 Joint Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David M. Fry regarding joint request to cancel the June 2, 2015 discovery conference - re 168 Oral Order,, Set Hearings,. (Fry, David)
May 19, 2015 Filing 170 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Corrected Expert Report of Dr. Mark T. Jones re U.S. Patent Nos. 6,904,556 and 6,915,475 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 5/19/2015 (nms).
May 18, 2015 Filing 169 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of Ian Jestice Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,373,464 and 7,424,015; (2) Expert Report of Dr. Mark T. Jones re U.S. Patent Nos. 6,904,556 and 6,915,475; (3) Expert Report of Brian W. Napper; and (4) Expert Report of Daniel A. Menasc, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,375,187 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a discovery conference on 6/2/2015, at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall file the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/15/2015. (nms)
May 8, 2015 Filing 167 Authenticity Stipulation, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 5/11/2015 (nms).
April 30, 2015 Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiff EMC Corporations Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 12) filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #165 Stipulation Extending Expert Deadlines, filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/27/2015. (nms)
April 24, 2015 Filing 165 STIPULATION Extending Expert Deadlines by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 24, 2015 Filing 164 REDACTED VERSION of #157 Letter, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/24/2015 (nms).
April 23, 2015 Filing 163 REDACTED VERSION of #158 Letter by Pure Storage Inc.. (Shaw, John)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 SO ORDERED, re #161 Stipulation Regarding the Deposition of William Strugger, filed by Pure Storage Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/22/2015. (nms)
April 22, 2015 Filing 161 STIPULATION Regarding The Deposition of William Strugger, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 4/22/2015 (nms).
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 10/22/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/20/15. (kjk)
April 17, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 4/17/2015. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning.) (ksr, )
April 16, 2015 Filing 159 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding discovery dispute - re #156 Letter. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 16, 2015 Filing 158 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding Discovery Dispute - re 155 Oral Order,, Set Hearings,. (Shaw, John)
April 15, 2015 Filing 157 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/15/2015 (nms).
April 15, 2015 Filing 156 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding Outlining Issues for the April 17, 2015 Discovery Dispute Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Shaw, John) Modified on 4/15/2015 (nms).
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a discovery conference on 4/17/2015, at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall file the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/8/2015. (nms)
March 31, 2015 Filing 154 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Second Set of Requests for Admission (2) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Corrected Objections and Responses to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Second Set of Requests for Admission (3) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Second Corrected Objections and Responses to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Second Set of Requests for Admission (4) Pure Storage, Inc.'s Privilege Log (Volume 1) (5) Pure Storage, Inc.'s Redaction Log (Volume 1) filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
March 30, 2015 Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Response to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Admission (30-81) filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Granting #151 MOTION to Amend Infringement Contentions, filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/27/2015. (nms)
March 26, 2015 Filing 151 MOTION to Amend Infringement Contentions - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 3/27/2015 (nms).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORAL ORDER: The mediation scheduled for 4/14/15 at 10:00 AM with Judge Thynge is cancelled. A teleconference has been scheduled for 4/14/15 at 4:00 PM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge to discuss the status of the case and mediation. David Fry, Esquire shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/25/15. (cak)
March 17, 2015 Filing 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
March 16, 2015 Filing 148 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Set of Requests for Admission (2) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Third Set of Interrogatories filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
March 13, 2015 Filing 147 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Second Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
March 13, 2015 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Second Supplemental Response to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 4); and (2) Plaintiffs' Third Amended Initial Infringement Contentions filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 13, 2015 Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Request for Inspection of Tangible Things under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34 filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
March 12, 2015 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission and (2) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 10, 2015 Filing 143 NOTICE of SUBPOENA (as to R. Hugo Patterson) by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #142 Stipulation and Proposed Order extending discovery dates, filed by Pure Storage Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/6/2015. (nms)
March 4, 2015 Filing 142 STIPULATION and proposed Order concerning fact discovery cut-off and depositions, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) Modified on 3/6/2015 (nms).
February 27, 2015 Filing 141 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Strugger on March 11, 2015 filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
February 25, 2015 Filing 140 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kate Gladziszewski Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b) on March 13, 2015, filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David) Modified on 2/26/2015 (nms).
February 25, 2015 Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
February 25, 2015 Filing 138 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Feng Wang on March 13, 2015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 25, 2015 Filing 137 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bo Hong on March 11, 2015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 23, 2015 Filing 136 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Second Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc. filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 23, 2015 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff EMC Corporation filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
February 20, 2015 Filing 134 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pure Storage, Inc. on March 5, 2015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 19, 2015 Filing 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 9) filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 17, 2015 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Fourth Requests For Production (No. 158) filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
February 12, 2015 Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Fifth Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); (2) Plaintiff EMC Information Systems International's Third Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); and (3) Plaintiff EMC International Company's Third Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 12, 2015 Filing 130 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stuart L. Gasner - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #130 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stuart L. Gasner filed by Pure Storage Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/12/2015. (nms)
February 11, 2015 Filing 129 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.; and (2) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Third Set of Interrogatories filed by EMC Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 11, 2015 Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 10, 2015 Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Request For Inspection Of Tangible Things To Pure Storage, Inc. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 34 filed by EMC Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 6, 2015 Filing 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff EMC Corporation and 2. Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff EMC Corporation filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
February 2, 2015 Filing 125 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Pure Storage Inc.'s Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories (No. 7) (2) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Corrected First Supplemental Response to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos.1, 3, 4, 5, 7, 8, And 9) filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Shaw, John)
January 29, 2015 Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Third Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 152-157) filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
January 23, 2015 Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections to Subpoena to Victor Tung filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 20, 2015 Filing 122 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections to Subpoena to R. Hugo Patterson filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Claim Construction Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2015. (nms)
January 20, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David W Rizk for Pure Storage Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas, )
January 16, 2015 Filing 120 PROPOSED Claim Construction Order, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 1/16/2015 (nms).
January 16, 2015 Filing 119 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Krishnendu Gupta, William Clark, and Thomas A. Brown - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #119 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Krishnendu Gupta, William Clark, and Thomas A. Brown filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/16/2015. (nms)
January 15, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Fourth Set of Requests for Production filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #117 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit the proposed claim construction order to January 16, 2015, filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/15/2015. (nms)
January 14, 2015 Filing 117 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit the proposed claim construction order to January 16, 2015 - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 12, 2015 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections to Deposition Subpoena to Eric Herzog filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for terms in dispute. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/9/2015. (nms)
December 29, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 5, 9, 11) filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 29, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Third Set of Requests for Production filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 22, 2014 Filing 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Sixth Set of Requests for Production filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 19, 2014 Filing 111 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs EMC Corporation's, EMC International Company's, and EMC Information Systems International's Objections and Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 19, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc,'s Fifth Set of Requests for Production filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 19, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's Subpoena to Eric Herzog (2) Defendant's Subpoena to Victor Tung (3) Defendant's Subpoena to R. Hugo Patterson filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
December 18, 2014 Filing 108 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 12-16-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2015. (lad)
December 17, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sam Marraccini on March 3, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
December 17, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Lawrence Scaringella on February 26, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
December 17, 2014 Filing 105 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Barbara Robidoux on February 24, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
December 17, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Josh Goldstein on February 20, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
December 17, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jonathan Siegal on February 12, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
December 17, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Wing on February 10, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
December 17, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robin Ren on January 27, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
December 17, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daniel Cobb on January 22, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
December 17, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Fitzgerald on January 20, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
December 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 12/16/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
December 5, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The attorney certification has been added to D.I. #98 . The document was inadvertently omitted in the first instance. (nms)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #98 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David W. Rizk filed by Pure Storage Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/5/2014. (nms)
December 4, 2014 Filing 98 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David W. Rizk - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2014: #1 Certification) (nms).
December 4, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiffs Emc Corporation, EMC International Company, and EMC Information Systems International (30(b)(6)) on December 19, 2014, filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David) Modified on 12/4/2014 (nms).
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORAL ORDER: The procedure discussed in D.I. #95 is APPROVED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/4/2014. (nms)
December 3, 2014 Filing 95 Amended Joint Claim Construction Chart, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F, #2 Exhibits G-K, #3 Exhibits L-M, #4 Letter)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 12/3/2014 (nms).
December 2, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Frank Slootman on January 20, 2015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 24, 2014 Filing 93 Joint APPENDIX re #92 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 JA1-JA10, #2 JA11-JA14, #3 JA15-JA22, #4 JA23-JA26, #5 JA27-JA35)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/25/2014 (nms).
November 24, 2014 Filing 92 Joint Claim Construction Brief, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/25/2014 (nms).
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 4/14/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/24/14. (cak)
November 20, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Sixth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff EMC Corporation (2) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiffs' First Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Shaw, John)
November 19, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 3, 12) filed by EMC Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 14, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Fifth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff EMC Corporation filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
November 11, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ethan Miller on January 16, 2015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 11, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Matt Burr on January 8, 2015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 11, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott Dietzen on January 7, 2015 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 11, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Matt Kixmoeller on December 22, 2014 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 11, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Neil Vachharajani on December 18, 2014 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 11, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Hayes on December 3, 2014 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 11, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Colgrove on December 2, 2014 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 7, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pure Storage, Inc. on November 21, 2014 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 7, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Daniel W. Gordon as co-counsel.. (Fry, David)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #54 MOTION to Strike Pure Storage's Affirmative Defenses of Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/5/2014. (nms)
November 3, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Fourth Set of Requests for Production filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 3, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Supplemental Response to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1, 3, 4, 5, 7, 8, and 9) (2) Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 122-151) filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Shaw, John)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting #74 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/31/2014. (nms)
October 30, 2014 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Infringement Contentions - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/30/2014 (nms).
October 24, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Initial Infringement Contentions filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 20, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff EMC International Company's Second Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); (2) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Third Set of Requests for Production; (3) Plaintiff EMC Information Systems International's Second Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); and (4) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Fourth Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 3, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Supplemental Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1, 4, and 7) filed by EMC Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 1, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporatin's Second Set of Requests for Production filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 1, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.s Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff EMC Corporation filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Shaw, John)
September 26, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Asserted Claims filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 25, 2014 Filing 67 REPLY BRIEF re #54 MOTION to Strike Pure Storage's Affirmative Defenses of Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER regarding the reduction of Plaintiff's number of asserted claims (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/19/2014. (nms)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #65 Stipulation Extending Claim Construction Briefing, filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/18/2014. (ksr, ) Modified on 9/19/2014 (nms).
September 17, 2014 Filing 65 STIPULATION to Extend Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 9/19/2014 (nms).
September 17, 2014 Filing 64 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Plaintiffs' response to the Court's September 15, 2014 Order - re #60 Order. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 17, 2014 Filing 63 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding response to the Court's Order of September 15, 2014 (D.I. #60 ). (Shaw, John) Modified on 9/19/2014 (nms).
September 15, 2014 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Daniel W. Gordon re #61 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Pure Storage Inc.. (Shaw, John) Modified on 9/16/2014 (nms).
September 15, 2014 Filing 61 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #54 MOTION to Strike Pure Storage's Affirmative Defenses of Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands filed by Pure Storage Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/25/2014. (Shaw, John)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER regarding the number of disputed claim terms, and asserted claims (see #59 & #57 ) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2014. (nms)
September 12, 2014 Filing 59 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding EMC's Letter of September 11, 2014 re: Claim Terms - re #57 Letter. (Shaw, John)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORAL ORDER: Pure Storage shall respond to the Letter filed at D.I. #57 by the COB today, September 12, 2014. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 13cv1985. (nms)
September 11, 2014 Filing 57 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding the number of claim terms to be construed. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 3, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main pdf for D.I. #56 has been replaced with a corrected version per counsel's request. (nms)
August 29, 2014 Filing 56 Joint CLAIM Construction Chart, by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibits G-H, #4 Exhibits I-K, #5 Exhibit L, Part1, #6 Exhibit L,Part2, #7 Exhibits M-N)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 9/2/2014 (nms). (Main Document 56 replaced on 9/3/2014) (nms).
August 28, 2014 Filing 55 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #54 MOTION to Strike Pure Storage's Affirmative Defenses of Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands, filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I (Part 1), #2 Exhibits A-I (Part 2), #3 Exhibits A-I (Part 3), #4 Exhibits A-I (Part 4))(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/29/2014 (nms).
August 28, 2014 Filing 54 MOTION to Strike Pure Storage's Affirmative Defenses of Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 8/29/2014 (nms).
August 27, 2014 Filing 53 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Corey A. Johanningmeier - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #53 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Corey A. Johanningmeier filed by Pure Storage Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/27/2014. (nms)
August 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Corey A Johanningmeier for Pure Storage Inc. added for electronic noticing. (mas)
August 19, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of EMC's Proposed Claim Constructions filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 14, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Third Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); (2) Plaintiff EMC International Company's Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); (3) Plaintiff EMC Information Systems International's Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); and (4) Plaintiff EMC Information Systems International's Amended Disclosures Pursuant To Delaware Default Standard For Discovery Paragraph 3 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 13, 2014 Filing 50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney T. Vann Pearce Jr. - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney T. Vann Pearce Jr., filed by EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company, EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/13/2014. (nms)
August 5, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE of Subpoena (as to Avnet, Inc.) by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 4, 2014 Filing 48 SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to #37 Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages, by Pure Storage Inc.. (nms)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting #45 MOTION to Amend Answer, filed by Pure Storage Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. (nms)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #44 Unopposed Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions. EMC's Amended Infringement Contentions are deemed effective as of the date they were served. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2014. (ksr, )
August 1, 2014 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Answer - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shaw, John) Modified on 8/4/2014 (nms).
July 24, 2014 Filing 44 Unopposed Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 7/25/2014 (nms).
July 21, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Production; and (2) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
July 14, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of EMC's Amended Infringement Contentions filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Smith, Rodger)
July 7, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff EMC Information Systems International's Disclosures Pursuant to Delaware Default Standard for Discovery Paragraph 3; (2) Plaintiff EMC Information Systems International's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); (3) Plaintiff EMC International Company's Disclosures Pursuant to Delaware Default Standard for Discovery Paragraph 3; and (4) Plaintiff EMC International Company's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company.(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 19, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff EMC Corporation, 2. Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Supplemental Response to Plaintiff EMC Corporations First Set of Interrogatories (No. 6), 3. Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, and 4. Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff EMC Corporation filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Shaw, John)
June 13, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Second Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by EMC Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 13, 2014 Filing 38 ANSWER to #37 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND, by Pure Storage Inc..(Shaw, John) Modified on 6/16/2014 (nms).
June 6, 2014 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pure Storage Inc. - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC Information Systems International, EMC International Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 D-E)(ksr, )
June 6, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 11) filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Keller, Karen)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #35 Stipulation, filed by EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/6/2014. (ksr, )
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and Order to File Amended Complaint, by EMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits A-C to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibits D-E to Amended Complaint)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 6/10/2014 (nms).
May 5, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Second Set of Interrogatories filed by EMC Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy)
May 2, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of EMC Corporation's Initial Infringement Contentions filed by EMC Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 24, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Responses to Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production filed by EMC Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 14, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1 10) and 2. Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production, Set One (Nos. 1 121) filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
April 4, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); and (2) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Amended Disclosures Pursuant to Delaware Default Standard for Discovery Paragraph 3 filed by EMC Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for Pure Storage to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 11/20/2014 at 03:30 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the status of the case and scheduling a mediation in 2015. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/25/14. (cak)
March 24, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosures Pursuant to Delaware Default Standard for Discovery Paragraph 3 filed by EMC Corporation.(Smith, Rodger)
March 24, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1. Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff EMC Corporation and 2.Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff EMC Corporation filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Shaw, John)
March 14, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production; and 2) Plaintiff EMC Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories filed by EMC Corporation.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #24 Proposed Protective Order, filed by EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/5/2014. (nms)
March 4, 2014 Filing 24 PROPOSED Protective Order, by EMC Corporation. (Smith, Rodger) Modified on 3/5/2014 (nms).
February 28, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of EMC Corporation's Identification of Accused Products and Asserted Patents Pursuant to Paragraph 2(a) of the Case Management and Scheduling Order filed by EMC Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 27, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pure Storage, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #19 Amended Order For Electronically Stored Information, filed by EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/27/2014. (nms)
February 26, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff EMC Corporation's Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by EMC Corporation.(Blumenfeld, Jack)
February 26, 2014 Filing 19 Amended PROPOSED ORDER for Electronically Stored Information by EMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(Smith, Rodger)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 3/19/2014 at 03:30 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/25/14. (cak)
February 25, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Judge Thynge for Mediation. (cak)
February 24, 2014 Filing 17 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 02-21-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2014. (lad) (Main Document 17 replaced on 2/25/2014) (ksr, ).
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 6/13/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2014. All Discovery due by 3/13/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2015. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 11/19/2014. A Markman Hearing is set for 12/16/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 2/12/2016, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 5 day Jury Trial is set for 3/7/2016, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/21/2014. (nms)
February 21, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SO ORDERED Granting #13 Proposed Order for Electronically Stored Information, filed by EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/20/2014. (nms)
February 19, 2014 Filing 14 PROPOSED Case Management and Scheduling Order, by EMC Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/20/2014 (nms).
February 19, 2014 Filing 13 PROPOSED Order for Electronically Stored Information, by EMC Corporation. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 2/20/2014 (nms).
February 4, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Chris R. Ottenweller for EMC Corporation added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 3, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Matthew H. Poppe,Jesse Y. Cheng,Alyssa M. Caridis for EMC Corporation added for electronic noticing. (els)
January 29, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel W. Gordon,Adam Lauridsen,Robert A. Van Nest,Matthew Werdegar,Ashok Ramani for Pure Storage Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/21/2014, at 2:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/24/2014. (nms)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Van Nest, Matthew M. Werdegar, Ashok Ramani, R. Adam Lauridsen, and Daniel W. Gordon filed by Pure Storage Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/21/2014. (nms)
January 20, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Pure Storage Inc. : Entry of appearance of attorney John W. Shaw. Attorney Gregory P. Williams and the law firm of Richards, Layton, & Finger, P.A. terminated. (Shaw, John)
January 17, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert A. Van Nest, Matthew M. Werdegar, Ashok Ramani, R. Adam Lauridsen, and Daniel W. Gordon - filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
January 17, 2014 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Pure Storage Inc.. (Fry, David)
January 17, 2014 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Pure Storage Inc..(Fry, David)
January 9, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chris R. Ottenweller, Matthew Poppe, Jesse Y. Cheng and Alyssa M. Caridis of ORRICK, HERRINGTON, & SUTCLIFFE LLP - filed by EMC Corporation. (Smith, Rodger)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chris R. Ottenweller, Matthew Poppe, Jesse Y. Cheng and Alyssa M. Caridis of ORRICK, HERRINGTON, & SUTCLIFFE LLP filed by EMC Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/9/2014. (nms)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to January 17, 2014, filed by Pure Storage Inc., EMC Corporation (Reset Answer Deadlines: Pure Storage Inc. answer due 1/17/2014). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2013. (nms)
December 16, 2013 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to January 17, 2014 - filed by EMC Corporation, Pure Storage Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 4, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 27, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMC Corporation. Pure Storage Inc. served on 11/27/2013, answer due 12/18/2013. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 27, 2013 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Pure Storage Inc. on 11/27/2013. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (jeb, )
November 26, 2013 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by EMC Corporation. (jeb, )
November 26, 2013 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,904,556 B2; 6,915,475 B2; 7,373.464 B2; 7,434,015 B2; 8,375,187 B1;. (jeb, )
November 26, 2013 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jeb, )
November 26, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES filed with Jury Demand against Pure Storage Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1415821.) - filed by EMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-E, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jeb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMC Corporation, et al. v. Pure Storage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pure Storage Inc.
Represented By: Adam Lauridsen
Represented By: David W Rizk
Represented By: David M. Fry
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Daniel W. Gordon
Represented By: Robert A. Van Nest
Represented By: Matthew Werdegar
Represented By: Corey A. Johanningmeier
Represented By: Ashok Ramani
Represented By: Gregory P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMC International Company
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Stephen J. Kraftschik
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMC Information Systems International
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Stephen J. Kraftschik
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMC Corporation
Represented By: Steven Kalogeras
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: William Clark
Represented By: Chris R. Ottenweller
Represented By: Stephen J. Kraftschik
Represented By: Kate Dominguez
Represented By: Thomas A. Brown
Represented By: Krishnendu Gupta
Represented By: Matthew H. Poppe
Represented By: Jesse Y. Cheng
Represented By: Jordan H. Bekier
Represented By: Alyssa M. Caridis
Represented By: Laura Corbin
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Paul E. Torchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?