Hawk Mountain LLC et al v. RAM Capital Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gigi Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq., Hawk Mountain LLC and Kim Jordan
Defendant: Atlas Respiratory Services Inc., Atlas Medical Equipment Inc., Renee M. Sigloch, Joseph Tropiano, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital II, LLC, Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Raymond A. Mirra, Jr., RAM Realty Holdings LLC, RAM Capital Group LLC, Patrick Walsh, Pridecare Inc., Mark Kovinsky, Bernard Eizen Esq., Bari Kuo, Advance Research Corporation Inc., Vasgene Therapeutics Inc., F. Gillis Green, Michael Bonventure, Bruce Kolleda, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Ted Greenberg, Shelly Demora, Danielle Stewart, Allion Healthcare Inc. a Delaware Corporation, presently doing business as Biomed Health Care Holdings Inc., Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC, Frederick Forte and Virginia L. Hall
Petitioner: Great Point Partners I LLC and Biomedical Value Fund
Respondent: Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2013cv02083
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 486 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Motion to Review Taxation of Costs (D.I. #483 ) is GRANTED (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/21/2018. (crb) Modified on 12/28/2018 (nms).
November 21, 2018 Filing 485 REPLY In Further Support of #483 MOTION to Review Taxation of Costs, filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq.. (Will, Thomas) Modified on 11/25/2018 (nms). Modified on 11/25/2018 (nms).
November 14, 2018 Filing 484 RESPONSE to #483 MOTION to Review Taxation of Costs, filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 11/15/2018 (nms).
November 7, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 7, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #483 MOTION to Review Taxation of Costs (nms)
October 31, 2018 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #483 MOTION to Review Taxation of Costs. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/14/2018. (nms)
October 31, 2018 Filing 483 MOTION for Review Taxation of Costs - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Nachbar, Kenneth) Modified on 11/1/2018 (lih). Modified on 11/7/2018 (nms). Modified on 11/7/2018 (nms).
October 24, 2018 Filing 482 Taxation of Costs in amount of $ 1985.00 against The Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell, and Kimberly Jordan (fms)
July 11, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 480 has been removed from the docket as the same document was filed at D.I. #481 using the correct docket event. (fms)
July 3, 2017 Filing 481 OBJECTIONS re #476 Bill of Costs by Hawk Mountain LLC. (Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 7/5/2017 (lih).
June 26, 2017 Filing 479 REDACTED VERSION of #478 Exhibits by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Will, Thomas) Modified on 6/27/2017 (lih).
June 19, 2017 Filing 478 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #476 Bill of Costs, #477 Declaration, by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Will, Thomas) Modified on 6/20/2017 (lih).
June 19, 2017 Filing 477 DECLARATION of Robert L. Raskopf re #476 Bill of Costs, by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Will, Thomas) Modified on 6/20/2017 (lih).
June 19, 2017 Filing 476 BILL OF COSTS by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Will, Thomas)
June 5, 2017 Filing 475 MANDATE of USCA as to #473 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit), filed by Kim Jordan, Gigi Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq., Hawk Mountain LLC. USCA Decision: affirmed. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Letter to District Court, #2 Opinion)(jk)
September 16, 2016 Filing 474 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re #473 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit), filed by Kim Jordan, Gigi Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq., Hawk Mountain LLC. USCA Case Number 16-3627. USCA Case Manager: James (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (jk)
September 14, 2016 Filing 473 NOTICE OF APPEAL of #472 Memorandum Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim. Appeal filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 9/15/2016 (lih).
September 14, 2016 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #473 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit), filed by Kim Jordan, Gigi Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq., Hawk Mountain LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-1996071.) (Allinson, Elihu)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 472 MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #457 denying #258 Motion for Sanctions. ; denying #305 Motion for Leave to File; granting #62 Motion to Dismiss granting #63 Motion to Dismiss; granting #67 Motion to Dismiss. (CASE CLOSED) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/31/2016. (nmfn)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER - granting request for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/8/2016. (lih)
July 20, 2016 Filing 470 RESPONSE re #466 STATEMENT of Accounting Of Attorneys' Fees by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 7/20/2016 (lih).
July 12, 2016 Filing 469 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Request for Oral Argument on Objections to Magistrate's Reports. (Will, Thomas)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: on or before 7/20/2016, plaintiffs may file a response re #466 Statement. The response must be limited to five (5) pages or less, responding only to the information contained in the accounting submitted by Defendants. Reargument of the merits of the motion for sanctions will not be considered. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/7/2016. (lih)
July 5, 2016 Filing 468 DECLARATION of Kenneth J. Nachbar re #466 Statement by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Will, Thomas) Modified on 7/6/2016 (lih).
July 5, 2016 Filing 467 DECLARATION of Robert L. Raskopf re #466 Statement by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Will, Thomas) Modified on 7/6/2016 (lih).
July 5, 2016 Filing 466 STATEMENT of Accounting Of Attorneys' Fees re #455 Memorandum and Order by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Thomas) Modified on 7/6/2016 (lih).
July 5, 2016 Filing 465 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano re #457 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #258 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Mark Kovinsky, Bruce Kolleda, Joseph Tropiano, Virginia L. Hall, Frederick Forte, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr., RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Capital Group LLC, Bari Kuo, RAM R, #459 Objections,, . (Will, Thomas)
July 5, 2016 Filing 464 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Patrick Walsh re #457 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #258 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Mark Kovinsky, Bruce Kolleda, Joseph Tropiano, Virginia L. Hall, Frederick Forte, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr., RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Capital Group LLC, Bari Kuo, RAM R, #459 Objections,, . (Cordrey, John)
July 5, 2016 Filing 463 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Bernard Eizen Esq. re #457 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #258 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Mark Kovinsky, Bruce Kolleda, Joseph Tropiano, Virginia L. Hall, Frederick Forte, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr., RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Capital Group LLC, Bari Kuo, RAM R, #459 Objections,, . (Bellew, Joseph)
June 30, 2016 Filing 462 REDACTED VERSION of #459 Objections,, by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Allinson, Elihu)
June 28, 2016 Filing 461 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Elihu E. Allinson III regarding Enclosing courtesy copies - re #73 Memorandum in Opposition, #80 Reply Brief, #66 Declaration, #74 Letter, #81 Reply Brief, #63 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon RAM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #65 MEMORANDUM in Support, #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #64 MEMORANDUM in Support, #79 Declaration, #68 Opening Brief in Support, #78 Reply Brief,. (Allinson, Elihu)
June 22, 2016 REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #459 . (lih)
June 17, 2016 Filing 460 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF JEFFREY E. GRELL by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Allinson, Elihu)
June 17, 2016 Filing 459 SEALED OBJECTIONS by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. to #457 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #258 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Mark Kovinsky, Bruce Kolleda, Joseph Tropiano, Virginia L. Hall, Frederick Forte, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr., RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Capital Group LLC, Bari Kuo, RAM R. (Attachments: #1 Brenner Certification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 6/17/2016 (fms). Modified on 6/21/2016 (lih).
June 17, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #459 has been placed under seal per request of filer. (fms)
June 9, 2016 Filing 458 REDACTED VERSION of #452 Exhibit to a Document, by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Will, Thomas)
June 3, 2016 Filing 457 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- DENYING #258 MOTION for Sanctions, GRANTING #63 MOTION to Dismiss, GRANTING #67 MOTION to Dismiss, GRANTING #62 MOTION to Dismiss, DENYING #305 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/20/2016. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/3/2016. (lih)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 MEMORANDUM ORDER- DENYING request to re-open the deposition of Mark Kovinsky re #359 Letter, #337 Letter. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/3/2016. (lih)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 455 MEMORANDUM ORDER- GRANTING RAM defendants' request for sanctions re #361 Letter, #292 Letter, #335 Letter. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/3/2016. (lih)
June 3, 2016 Filing 454 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allan L. Brenner regarding Letter-brief regarding discovery dispute - re #451 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Allinson, Elihu)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the discovery dispute hearings set for 6/7/2016 and 6/29/2016 are CANCELED. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/3/2016. (lih)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #453 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Discovery Dispute Hearing is set for 6/29/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Order regarding revised discovery dispute procedures entered in this matter on 12/8/2015 and the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than noon on 6/23/2016; Responsive Submission due by no later than noon on 6/24/2016.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/3/2016. (lih)
June 2, 2016 Filing 453 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Will, Thomas) Modified on 6/3/2016 (lih).
June 2, 2016 Filing 452 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #451 Letter by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Will, Thomas) Modified on 6/2/2016 (lih).
June 2, 2016 Filing 451 Letter to The Honorable Judge Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M, #2 Appendix)(Will, Thomas)
May 19, 2016 Filing 450 NOTICE of Subpoena to Rene Parisi to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Allinson, Elihu)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #446 Proposed Order, #445 Stipulation. Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2017.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/12/2016. (lih)
May 11, 2016 Filing 449 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Will, Thomas) Modified on 5/11/2016 (lih).
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #449 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Discovery Dispute Hearing is set for 6/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Order regarding revised discovery dispute procedures entered in this matter on 12/8/2015 and the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 10:00 AM on 6/2/2016; Responsive Submission due by no later than 10:00 AM on 6/3/2016.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/11/2016. (lih)
May 2, 2016 Filing 448 Letter to The Honorable Sherry L. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Plaintiffs' submission of documents for in camera review on April 29, 2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Will, Thomas)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #448 Letter. Plaintiff shall submit document 93 for in camera review ONLY. The court will not review or allow any additional briefing on the matter. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/2/2016. (lih)
April 29, 2016 Filing 447 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allan L. Brenner regarding "Woodhouse" documents for in camera review. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance A)(Allinson, Elihu)
April 29, 2016 Filing 446 PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Second Amended Scheduling Order re #406 Proposed Order, SO ORDERED, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas)
April 29, 2016 Filing 445 STIPULATION Regarding Extension Of The Case Schedule by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas)
April 28, 2016 Filing 444 Joint Letter to The Honorable Sherry L. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Letter Requesting In Camera Review of Documents Pursuant to the Courts Ruling at the April 21, 2016 Hearing. (WIll, Thomas)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #434 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. The transcript of the 4/25/2016 teleconference shall serve as the order of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/25/2016. (lih)
April 25, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 4/25/2016. (Court Reporter T. Carroll ( Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
April 22, 2016 Filing 443 REDACTED VERSION of #437 Letter by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8)(Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 4/25/2016 (lih).
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #414 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute. The transcript of the 4/21/2016 discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as the order of this court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/21/2016. (lih)
April 21, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2016. (Court Reporter T. Carroll ( Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
April 21, 2016 Filing 442 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from John C. Cordrey, Esq. regarding Submitting Exhibit C to D.I. 439 - re #439 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C to DI 439)(Cordrey, John)
April 21, 2016 Filing 441 REDACTED VERSION of #431 Exhibit by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas) Modified on 4/21/2016 (lih).
April 21, 2016 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #431 . (lih)
April 20, 2016 Filing 440 REDACTED VERSION of #432 Letter by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 4/21/2016 (lih).
April 20, 2016 Filing 439 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from John C. Cordrey, Esq. regarding #437 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cordrey, John) Modified on 4/20/2016 (lih).
April 20, 2016 Remark: Exhibit 3 has been attached to D.I. #437 . (lih)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #438 Letter Request to exceed page limitations. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/20/2016. (lih)
April 19, 2016 Filing 438 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allan L. Brenner regarding request to exceed page limitations re #437 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 4/20/2016 (lih).
April 19, 2016 Filing 437 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allan L. Brenner regarding in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion of Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, Part 1A, #5 Exhibit 7, Part 1B, #6 Exhibit 7, Part 2, #7 Exhibit 7, Part 3, #8 Exhibit 7, Part 4, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Certificate of Service)(Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 4/19/2016 (lih). (Main Document 437 replaced on 4/19/2016) (lih). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2016: #11 Exhibit 3) (lih).
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #434 MOTION forTeleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 4/25/2016 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Order regarding revised discovery dispute procedures entered in this matter on 12/8/2015 and the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than noon on 4/19/2016; Responsive Submission due by no later than noon on 4/20/2016.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/19/2016. (lih)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- The discovery dispute letter previously filed as D.I. 436 has been deleted due to the document not being filed in accordance with the revised discovery dispute procedures. Counsel shall refer to the oral order entered on 12/8/2015 and re-file the document by no later than the noon deadline. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/19/2016. (lih)
April 19, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, the letter application previously filed as D.I. 436 has been deleted and shall be re-filed at a later time. (lih)
April 19, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. #437 has been replaced with a revised version of the document. (lih)
April 18, 2016 Filing 435 Letter to The Honorable Sherry L. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Copies of a Brief filed on April 15, 2016 in the Northern District of California relating to the RAM Defendants March 3, 2015 Subpoena to Farella Braun + Martel LLP. (Attachments: #1 Enclosure)(WIll, Thomas)
April 15, 2016 Filing 434 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 4/18/2016 (lih).
April 15, 2016 Filing 433 DECLARATION of Service re #432 Letter by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 4/15/2016 (lih).
April 15, 2016 Filing 432 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allan L. Brenner regarding regarding Discovery Dispute - re #430 Letter, #431 Exhibit to a Document,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Allinson, Elihu)
April 14, 2016 Filing 431 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #430 Letter by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas) Modified on 4/14/2016 (lih).
April 14, 2016 Filing 430 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(WIll, Thomas)
April 13, 2016 Filing 429 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RAM Defendants' Amended and Supplemental Disclosures re #91 Notice of Service, filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Nachbar, Kenneth)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #401 Joint MOTION For Teleconference To Resolve Discovery Dispute. The transcript of the 4/13/2016 discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as the order of this court. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/13/2016. (lih)
April 13, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 4/13/2016. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lih)
April 12, 2016 Filing 428 REDACTED VERSION of #420 Exhibit to a Document, by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 - 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12)(Allinson, Elihu)
April 8, 2016 Filing 427 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Copies of a Brief filed on April 7, 2016 in the Northern District of California relating to the RAM Defendants March 3, 2015 Subpoena to Farella Braun + Martel LLP. (Attachments: #1 Enclosure)(WIll, Thomas)
April 8, 2016 Filing 426 NOTICE of Service of Document Request Directed to Virginia Hall Pursuant to F.R. Civ. P. 34 by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Allinson, Elihu)
April 7, 2016 Filing 425 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar - re #424 Letter. (WIll, Thomas) Modified on 4/8/2016 (lih).
April 7, 2016 Filing 424 Letter to The Honorable Sherry L. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Copies of Papers Filed on April 6, 2016 in the Northern District of California relating to the RAM Defendants' March 3, 2015 Subpoena to Farella Braun + Martel LLP. (Attachments: #1 Enclosures)(WIll, Thomas)
April 7, 2016 Filing 423 Letter to the Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esq. regarding Opposition to Defendants' Motion for an Order Compelling Plaintiff Gigi Jordan to Answer All Twenty-Two Interrogatories Served by the RAM Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Allinson, Elihu)
April 6, 2016 Filing 422 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from John C. Cordrey, Esq. joining in #421 Letter. (Cordrey, John) Modified on 4/6/2016 (lih).
April 6, 2016 Filing 421 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Resolution of Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(WIll, Thomas)
April 6, 2016 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #419 and #420 . (lih)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Pursuant to the joint email request of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the discovery dispute hearings set in this matter for 4/13/2016 and 4/21/2016 are converted into teleconferences. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the calls to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/6/2016. (lih)
April 4, 2016 Filing 420 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #419 Letter by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit 5 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 6 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit 7 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit 8 (sealed), #9 Exhibit 9 (sealed), #10 Exhibit 10 (sealed), #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 4/5/2016 (lih).
April 4, 2016 Filing 419 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Elihu E. Allinson III regarding Northern District of California filing. (Allinson, Elihu)
March 30, 2016 Filing 418 REDACTED VERSION of #416 Exhibit to a Document, by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas)
March 24, 2016 Filing 417 NOTICE of Withdrawal of appearance of Leslie A. Polizoti by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Polizoti, Leslie)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #414 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Discovery Dispute Hearing is set for 4/21/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Order regarding revised discovery dispute procedures entered in this matter on 12/8/2015 and the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 10:00 AM on 4/14/2016; Responsive Submission due by no later than 10:00 AM on 4/15/2016.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/24/2016. (lih)
March 23, 2016 Filing 416 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #415 Letter, by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas)
March 23, 2016 Filing 415 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Copies of Motions Papers Filed on March 22, 2016 in the Northern District of California relating to March 3, 2015 Subpoena to Farella Braun + Martel LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(WIll, Thomas)
March 23, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. #414 has been replaced with a revised version of the document to correct the type of hearing requested. (lih)
March 22, 2016 Filing 414 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(WIll, Thomas) Modified on 3/23/2016 (lih). (Main Document 414 replaced on 3/23/2016) (lih).
March 21, 2016 Filing 413 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Directed To Farella Braun & Martel LLP filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(WIll, Thomas)
March 16, 2016 Filing 412 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Patrick Walsh's Supplemental Initial Disclosures re #411 Notice of Service filed by Patrick Walsh.(Cordrey, John)
March 16, 2016 Filing 411 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Patrick Walsh's Supplemental Initial Disclosures re #90 Notice of Service filed by Patrick Walsh.(Cordrey, John)
March 13, 2016 Filing 410 NOTICE of Re-Notice of Deposition by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 3/15/2016 (lih).
March 12, 2016 Filing 409 Notice of Deposition by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 3/15/2016 (lih).
March 10, 2016 Filing 408 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. re #404 Notice (Other), #407 Notice (Other), #403 Notice (Other), (Allinson, Elihu)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #406 PROPOSED Amended Scheduling Order. Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Dispositive Motions due by 11/11/2016.) (SEE PROPOSED ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/9/2016. (lih)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #405 Stipulation. Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Dispositive Motions due by 11/11/2016.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/4/2016. (lih)
March 3, 2016 Filing 407 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Pakash Gill, M.D. by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Allinson, Elihu)
March 3, 2016 Filing 406 PROPOSED Amended Scheduling Order by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas) Modified on 3/3/2016 (lih).
March 3, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the third amended scheduling order attached to D.I. #405 . Counsel is advised that the documents are two separate filings and must be e-filed as such. Counsel shall re-file the document using the PROPOSED ORDER event code. (lih)
March 2, 2016 Filing 405 STIPULATION To Adjourn the Deposition of Gigi Jordan by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas) Modified on 3/3/2016 (lih).
February 26, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2016. (Court Reporter provided by counsel.) (lih)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- The transcript of the 2/26/2016 discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as the order of this court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/26/2016. (lih)
February 26, 2016 Filing 404 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Thomas Hochadel by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Allinson, Elihu)
February 26, 2016 Filing 403 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Stephen Horohonich by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Allinson, Elihu)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #399 STIPULATION Allowing for Depositions to Take Place After the 2/29/16 Fact Discovery Deadline. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/26/2016. (lih)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #402 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cory D. Struble. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/25/2016. (lih)
February 24, 2016 Filing 402 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cory D. Struble - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(WIll, Thomas)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - re #401 Joint MOTION For Hearing To Resolve Discovery Dispute. An In Person Discovery Dispute Hearing is set for 4/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Order regarding revised discovery dispute procedures entered in this matter on 12/8/2015 and the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submissions due by no later than noon on 4/6/2016; Responsive Submission due by no later than noon on 4/7/2016.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/23/2016. (lih)
February 22, 2016 Filing 401 Joint MOTION For Teleconference To Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(WIll, Thomas) Modified on 2/23/2016 (lih).
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MEMORANDUM ORDER - re #386 Joint MOTION for Hearing To Resolve Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/19/2016. (lih)
February 17, 2016 Filing 399 STIPULATION Allowing for Depositions to Take Place After the 2/29/16 Fact Discovery Deadline by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas) Modified on 2/18/2016 (lih).
February 17, 2016 Filing 398 REDACTED VERSION of #395 Exhibit to a Document, by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #386 Joint MOTION for Hearing To Resolve Discovery Dispute. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the transcript of the 2/16/2016 discovery dispute hearing shall serve as the order of this court regarding the production of corporate records documents. The court shall issue a written order regarding the attorney-client privilege dispute. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/16/2016. (lih)
February 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 2/16/2016. (Court Reporter D. Bowers (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
February 16, 2016 Filing 397 REDACTED VERSION of #392 Letter by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 2/17/2016 (lih).
February 16, 2016 Filing 396 REDACTED VERSION of #391 Exhibit to a Document, by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
February 10, 2016 Filing 395 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #394 Letter by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas) Modified on 2/10/2016 (lih).
February 10, 2016 Filing 394 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Elihu E. Allinson III re #390 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 COS)(Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 2/10/2016 (lih).
February 10, 2016 Filing 393 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar, Esquire re #392 Letter,. (WIll, Thomas) Modified on 2/10/2016 (lih).
February 9, 2016 Filing 392 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allan L. Brenner regarding Letter-Motion to Compel the Defendants to Produce Documents with Exhibits 1 - 8. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 COS)(Allinson, Elihu)
February 9, 2016 Filing 391 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #390 Letter by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas) Modified on 2/9/2016 (lih).
February 9, 2016 Filing 390 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Discovery Dispute. (WIll, Thomas)
February 3, 2016 Filing 389 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Mark L. Morris by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Allinson, Elihu)
January 29, 2016 Filing 388 NOTICE of Subpoena To Interfor International by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Ad Testificandum, #2 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order Governing The Production And Exchange Of Confidential Information)(WIll, Thomas)
January 29, 2016 Filing 387 NOTICE of Subpoena To Jeanette Walsh by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Ad Testificandum, #2 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order Governing The Production and Exchange of Confidential Information)(WIll, Thomas)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #386 Joint MOTION for Hearing To Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Discovery Dispute Hearing is set for 2/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Order regarding revised discovery dispute procedures entered in this matter on 12/8/2015 and the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submissions due by no later than 10:00 AM on 2/9/2016; Responsive Submission due by no later than 10:00 AM on 2/10/2016.) Submissions must be at least 1 inch margins and include page numbers. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/27/2016. (lih)
January 26, 2016 Filing 386 Joint MOTION for Hearing To Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(WIll, Thomas) Modified on 1/26/2016 (lih).
January 26, 2016 Filing 385 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action to Morris J. Cohen & Co., P.C. by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Allinson, Elihu)
January 21, 2016 Filing 384 NOTICE of Subpoena to Rene Parisi to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Allinson, Elihu)
January 21, 2016 Filing 383 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Mark L. Silow by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Allinson, Elihu)
January 21, 2016 Filing 382 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Jerald D. August by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Allinson, Elihu)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #381 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF THE CASE SCHEDULE. Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Discovery due by 2/29/2016., Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2016.) (PLEASE REFER TO STIPULATION FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/20/2016. (lih)
January 15, 2016 Filing 381 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF THE CASE SCHEDULE by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WIll, Thomas) Modified on 1/19/2016 (lih).
January 14, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The certificate of service formerly filed as D.I. 381 has been deleted pursuant to L.R. 5.2(a). (lih)
January 13, 2016 Filing 380 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. as to Defendant Joseph T. Molieri (Allinson, Elihu)
January 8, 2016 Filing 379 NOTICE of Subpoena to Testify At A Deposition by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(WIll, Thomas)
January 7, 2016 Filing 378 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Allinson, Elihu)
January 7, 2016 Filing 377 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Document Production Request in Connection with Deposition Scheduled for January 11, 2016 filed by Gigi Jordan.(Allinson, Elihu)
January 5, 2016 Filing 376 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Jerry N. Paul on December 30, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(Allinson, Elihu)
January 5, 2016 Filing 375 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Jerry N. Paul on December 28, 2015 (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(Allinson, Elihu)
January 5, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the proofs of service, formerly filed as D.I. numbers 375 and 376, due to documents being filed using the wrong event code. Counsel shall re-file the documents using the appropriate event code. (lih)
January 4, 2016 Filing 374 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RAM Defendants' First Set of Requests for Admission Directed to Plaintiffs filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(WIll, Thomas)
December 31, 2015 Filing 373 NOTICE of SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF GIGI JORDAN by Patrick Walsh (Cordrey, John)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #371 Joint STIPULATION Concerning Pre-trial Depositions of Trial Witnesses Not Previously Deposed. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/30/2015. (lih)
December 29, 2015 Filing 372 REDACTED VERSION of #360 Exhibit to a Document by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Allinson, Elihu)
December 29, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the redacted version of D.I. #360 formerly filed as D.I. number 372 due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the appropriate event code. (lih)
December 28, 2015 Filing 371 Joint STIPULATION Concerning Pre-trial Depositions of Trial Witnesses Not Previously Deposed re Discovery Hearing by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (WIll, Thomas)
December 28, 2015 Filing 370 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Allinson, Elihu)
December 28, 2015 SECOND REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #360 . (lih)
December 28, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has revised the text of D.I. #369 to reflect that the document is a NOTICE of subpoena. Counsel is advised to use the correct event code when filing a document of this nature in the future. (lih)
December 23, 2015 Filing 369 Notice of SUBPOENA filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. directed to Jerry N. Paul for January 16, 2016, at the law offices of Allan L. Brenner, 536 West Penn Street 2nd floor, Long Beach NY 11561 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Allinson, Elihu) Modified on 12/28/2015 (lih).
December 23, 2015 Filing 368 REDACTED VERSION of #364 Exhibit to a Document, by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
December 22, 2015 Filing 367 NOTICE of Subpoena by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena Directed to Lara Gilman, #2 Exhibit B - Stipulation and (proposed) Protective Order Governing The Production and Exchange of Confidential Information)(WIll, Thomas)
December 21, 2015 Filing 366 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.: Entry of appearance of attorney Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III. Attorney Rick S. Miller terminated. (Allinson, Elihu)
December 21, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #360 . (lih)
December 18, 2015 Filing 365 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RAM Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Gigi Jordan filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(WIll, Thomas)
December 16, 2015 Filing 364 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #363 Letter by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WIll, Thomas) Modified on 12/16/2015 (lih).
December 16, 2015 Filing 363 Letter to The Honorable Judge Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Response to Plaintiffs' December 11, 2015 Letter - re #359 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(WIll, Thomas)
December 16, 2015 Filing 362 Letter to Hon. Sherry Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esq. regarding Response to RAM Defendants Letter Requesting Sanctions - re #361 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 12/16/2015 (lih).
December 14, 2015 Filing 361 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar re #335 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(WIll, Thomas) Modified on 12/15/2015 (lih).
December 11, 2015 Filing 360 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #359 Letter by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Miller, Rick)
December 11, 2015 Filing 359 [SEALED] Letter to Hon. Sherry Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esq. regarding Supplemental Submission Re Kovinsky Deposition Dispute - re Oral Order,. (Miller, Rick)
December 10, 2015 Filing 358 REDACTED VERSION of #343 Letter by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Miller, Rick)
December 10, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #354 has been corrected to reflect that the document is the redacted version of D.I. #347 only.(lih)
December 9, 2015 Filing 357 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Parker WIll on behalf of Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (WIll, Thomas)
December 9, 2015 Filing 356 REDACTED VERSION of #342 Exhibit to a Document,,, by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit)(Miller, Rick)
December 9, 2015 Filing 355 REDACTED VERSION of #345 Exhibit to a Document by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5)(Miller, Rick)
December 9, 2015 Filing 354 REDACTED VERSION of #347 Letter by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 12/10/2015 (lih).
December 9, 2015 SECOND REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #342 . (lih)
December 9, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #343 and #346 . (lih)
December 8, 2015 Filing 353 REDACTED VERSION of #346 Exhibit to a Document by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Nachbar, Kenneth) Modified on 12/8/2015 (lih). Modified on 12/9/2015 (lih).
December 8, 2015 Filing 352 REDACTED VERSION of #337 Letter by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Miller, Rick)
December 8, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #337 and #342 . (lih)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER REGARDING REVISED DISCOVERY DISPUTE PROCEDURES- As of 12/7/2015, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: going forward, the parties are limited to presentation of one issue per side per discovery dispute. Attached exhibits are limited to no more than fifty pages absent leave of the court. All of the other provisions of the courts standard discovery dispute procedures are incorporated herein by reference. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/8/2015. (lih)
December 7, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 12/7/2015. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: counsel shall submit supplemental briefing re #333 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute. Set Deadlines: (Supplemental Moving Submissions due by no later than noon on 12/11/2015; Supplemental Responsive Submissions due by no later than noon on 12/16/2015.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: the transcript of the 12/7/2015 discovery dispute hearing shall serve as the order of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/7/2015. (lih)
December 7, 2015 Filing 351 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Nachbar, Kenneth)
December 7, 2015 Filing 350 REDACTED VERSION of #336 Exhibit to a Document by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Nachbar, Kenneth) Modified on 12/7/2015 (lih). Modified on 12/7/2015 (lih).
December 7, 2015 Filing 349 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Sharon Morgan) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
December 4, 2015 Filing 348 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Lauren K. Neal as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell. (Neal, Lauren)
December 2, 2015 Filing 347 [SEALED] Amended Letter to Hon. Sherry Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esq. regarding Corrected Response to RAM Defendants' Letter dtd 11/30/15 - re Oral Order,, #343 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Rick)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: by no later than 10:00 AM on 12/3/2015, plaintiffs shall file a corrected version of #343 Letter. The corrected version of the letter shall refer to the correct exhibits in Section 2 regarding defendants' motion to compel production of post-March 2009 financial statements. The corrected letter shall be accompanied by a redline version, attached as Exhibit A, which will reflect that the changes are limited to those authorized under this Order. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/2/2015. (lih)
December 1, 2015 Filing 346 [SEALED] EXHIBITs re #344 Letter by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 12/1/2015 (lih).
December 1, 2015 Filing 345 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #343 Letter by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 12/1/2015 (lih).
December 1, 2015 Filing 344 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of RAM Defendants re #337 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6-7, #3 Exhibit 8-9, #4 Exhibit 10-14)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 12/1/2015 (lih).
December 1, 2015 Filing 343 [SEALED] Letter to Hon. Sherry Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esq. re #335 . (Miller, Rick) Modified on 12/1/2015 (lih).
November 30, 2015 Filing 342 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #337 Letter by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4, #5 Part 5, #6 Part 6, #7 Part 7, #8 Part 8, #9 Part 9, #10 Part 10, #11 Part 11, #12 Part 12, #13 Part 13, #14 Part 14, #15 Part 15, #16 Part 16, #17 Part 17, #18 Part 18, #19 Part 19 (part 1), #20 Part 19 (part 2), #21 Part 19 (par 3), #22 Part 20 (part 1), #23 Part 20 (part 2), #24 Part 20 (part 3), #25 Part 21 (part 1), #26 Part 21 (part 2), #27 Part 21 (part 3), #28 Part 22, #29 Part 23 (part 1), #30 Part 23 (part 2), #31 Part 23 (part 3), #32 Part 24, #33 Part 25, #34 Part 26 (part 1), #35 Part 26 (part 2), #36 Part 26 (part 3), #37 Part 27, #38 Part 28, #39 Part 29)(Miller, Rick)
November 30, 2015 Filing 337 [SEALED] Letter to Hon. Sherry Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esq. regarding Pending Discovery Disputes. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 11/30/2015 (lih).
November 30, 2015 Filing 336 [SEALED] EXHIBITS re #335 Letter by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 11/30/2015 (lih).
November 30, 2015 Filing 335 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of RAM Defendants regarding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit B through Z, #4 Exhibit AA through II, #5 Exhibit JJ, #6 Exhibit KK through MM, #7 Exhibit NN through ZZ, #8 Exhibit AAA through EEE)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 11/30/2015 (lih).
November 30, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to the request of counsel, docket clerk has deleted the exhibits formerly filed as D.I. numbers 338-341 due to documents being filed improperly. Counsel was advised that in the future they should contact the clerks office prior to re-filing the corrected version of any document. (lih)
November 25, 2015 Filing 334 Joint Letter regarding pending discovery disputes. (Neal, Lauren) Modified on 11/30/2015 (lih).
November 23, 2015 Filing 333 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 11/23/2015 (lih).
November 23, 2015 Filing 332 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Non-Party Merrill Lynch's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Subpoena and (ii) Non-Party Merrill Lynch's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Rule 34 Notice re #326 Notice (Other), #331 Notice (Other) filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated.(Cordrey, John)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #333 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Discovery Dispute Hearing is set for 12/7/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: on or before 11/25/2015, counsel shall submit a joint letter to the court identifying which discovery disputes are still pending. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submissions due by no later than noon 11/30/2015; Responsive Submission due by no later than noon on 12/1/2015.) Submissions must be at least 1 inch margins and include page numbers. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/23/2015. (lih)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #330 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Extension of the Case Schedule. Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Discovery due by 6/6/2016., Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2016.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/17/2015. (lih)
November 13, 2015 Filing 331 NOTICE of Rule 34 (to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
November 12, 2015 Filing 330 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Extension of the Case Schedule by Shelly Demora, Bernard Eizen Esq., Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano, Patrick Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 11/13/2015 (lih).
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: briefing re #305 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply is complete. The court will not review or allow any additional briefing on the motion. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/12/2015. (lih)
November 11, 2015 Filing 329 REDACTED VERSION of #320 Declaration by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28-35)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 11/12/2015 (lih).
November 11, 2015 Filing 328 REDACTED VERSION of #319 Response to Motion by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 11/12/2015 (lih).
November 10, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 11/10/2015. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
November 9, 2015 Filing 326 NOTICE of Subpoena to Testify at Deposition to Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
November 6, 2015 Filing 325 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Patrick Walsh's Amended First Interrogatory to Plaintiffs filed by Patrick Walsh.(Cordrey, John)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Letter briefing pertaining to the discovery dispute to be heard on 11/10/15 is complete. Additional submissions filed prior to the hearing on 11/10/15 will not be considered by the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/6/2015. (lih)
November 5, 2015 Filing 324 Letter to Hon. Sherry Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esq. regarding Response to RAM Defendants Nov. 5, 2015 Letter - re #323 Letter. (Miller, Rick)
November 5, 2015 Filing 323 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Response to Paintiffs' November 4, 2015 Letter-Motion to Compel MOrris J. Cohen & Co., P.C. - re #316 Letter,. (Neal, Lauren)
November 5, 2015 Filing 322 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren A. Moser - filed by Michael Bonventure. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Aranilla, Artemio)
November 5, 2015 Filing 321 Letter to Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Wilhelm Dingler - re #316 Letter regarding motion to compel document production from third-party. (lih)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #322 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lauren A. Moser. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/5/2015. (lih)
November 4, 2015 Filing 320 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Robert L. Raskopf re #319 Response to Motion by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28 through 35, #2 Certificate of Service)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 11/5/2015 (lih).
November 4, 2015 Filing 319 [SEALED] RESPONSE to Motion re #305 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Statement, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 11/5/2015 (lih).
November 4, 2015 Filing 318 REDACTED VERSION of #306 Declaration by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C part 1, #4 Exhibit C part 2, #5 Exhibit C part 3, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E (Redacted))(Miller, Rick) Modified on 11/4/2015 (lih).
November 4, 2015 Filing 317 REDACTED VERSION of #305 MOTION for Leave to File by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 11/4/2015 (lih).
November 4, 2015 Filing 316 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esquire regarding motion to compel document production from third-party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (part 1), #2 Exhibit 1 (part 2), #3 Exhibit 2-4, #4 Exhibit 5-8)(Miller, Rick)
November 4, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the letter re-filed as D.I. 316 due to improper event code being used. Counsel is advised to re-file the letter using the appropriate event code. (lih)
November 4, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the letter formerly filed as D.I. 316 due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the letter event code rather than motion event code. (lih)
November 3, 2015 Filing 315 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Deborah Touni on December 8, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
November 3, 2015 Filing 314 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Virginia Hall on December 8, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
November 3, 2015 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #305 and #306 . (lih)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #311 STIPULATION Regarding Leave to Depose Plaintiff Gigi Jordan. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/3/2015. (lih)
November 2, 2015 Filing 313 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Cross Notice of Subpoena to Brian Donnelly to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
November 2, 2015 Filing 312 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Cross Notice of Subpoena to Mark Petersen to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
November 2, 2015 Filing 311 STIPULATION Regarding Leave to Depose Plaintiff Gigi Jordan by Shelly Demora, Bernard Eizen Esq., Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano, Patrick Walsh. (Neal, Lauren)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #310 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute Between Plaintiffs and Third-Party Morris J. Cohen & Co., PC. A Discovery Dispute Hearing is set for 11/10/2015 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: ( Moving Submission due by no later than noon on 11/4/2015., Responsive submissions due by no later than noon on 11/5/2015.). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/29/2015. (lih)
October 28, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 10/28/2015. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lih)
October 28, 2015 Filing 310 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute Between Plaintiffs and Third-Party Morris J. Cohen & Co., PC - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/28/2015 (lih).
October 27, 2015 Filing 309 Letter to Hon. Sherry Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esq. regarding Topics for Discovery Hearing on October 28, 2015. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/28/2015 (lih).
October 26, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the exhibits formerly filed separately as D.I. 301. The exhibits are now attached to D.I. #300 . Counsel is advised that it is preferred that all exhibits be attached to the document that they are filed in support of unless the file size is too large. (lih)
October 23, 2015 Filing 308 REDACTED VERSION of #285 Declaration by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23-27)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih).
October 23, 2015 Filing 307 REDACTED VERSION of #284 Reply Brief by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Neal, Lauren) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih).
October 23, 2015 Filing 306 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Max Gershenoff, Esq. re #305 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, part 1, #4 Exhibit C, part 2, #5 Exhibit C, part 3, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih).
October 23, 2015 Filing 305 [SEALED] MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re #258 [SEALED] MOTION for Sanctions - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Statement Under LR 7.1.1)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih).
October 23, 2015 Filing 304 NOTICE of Subpoena to William Jones by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
October 23, 2015 Filing 303 NOTICE of Subpoena to Michael Bonventure by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
October 23, 2015 Filing 302 NOTICE of (Rule 34) directed to Renee Sigloch and Danielle Stewart by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
October 23, 2015 Filing 300 Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from John C. Cordrey, Esq. regarding Response to re #293 Letter. (Cordrey, John) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2015: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (lih).
October 23, 2015 Filing 299 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih).
October 23, 2015 Filing 298 Letter to Hon. Sherry Fallon from David J. Ferry, Jr., Esq. regarding Response to Defendant Walsh's Letter - re #294 Letter,. (Coggins, Lisa)
October 23, 2015 Filing 297 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esquire regarding Opposition to #292 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih).
October 23, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I 307 Stipulation has been deleted per request of counsel. (Polito, Rebecca)
October 22, 2015 Filing 296 NOTICE of Subpoena to Gay Woodhouse, Esq. by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Neal, Lauren)
October 22, 2015 Filing 295 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esquire regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3-4, #3 Exhibit 5 pt 1, #4 Exhibit 5 pt 2, #5 Exhibit 6-14)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih).
October 22, 2015 Filing 294 Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from John C. Cordrey, Esq. regarding Discovery Disputes Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cordrey, John) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih).
October 22, 2015 Filing 293 Letter to Hon. Sherry Fallon from David J. Ferry, Jr., Esq. regarding Walsh Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B part 1, #3 Exhibit B part 2, #4 Exhibit C part 1, #5 Exhibit C part 2, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Coggins, Lisa) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih).
October 22, 2015 Filing 292 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Resolution of Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2), #3 Exhibit B through U)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 10/26/2015 (lih).
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- denying #286 Request for Oral Argument. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/20/2015. (lih)
October 19, 2015 Filing 291 NOTICE of Subpoena to Buechler & Associates by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Subpoena, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Neal, Lauren)
October 19, 2015 Filing 290 NOTICE of Subpoena to Keith Barna by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Neal, Lauren)
October 19, 2015 Filing 289 NOTICE of Subpoena to J.D. Hicks & Associates Detective Agency by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Neal, Lauren)
October 19, 2015 Filing 288 NOTICE of Subpoena to Guidepost Solutions by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Neal, Lauren)
October 19, 2015 Filing 287 NOTICE of Subpoena to Interfor International by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Neal, Lauren)
October 19, 2015 Filing 286 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano re #258 MOTION for Sanctions . (Neal, Lauren)
October 19, 2015 Filing 285 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Robert L. Raskopf re #284 Reply Brief by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23-26, #2 Exhibit 27)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 10/19/2015 (lih).
October 19, 2015 Filing 284 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #258 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Neal, Lauren)
October 19, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, D.I. numbers 284-287 have been deleted and will be re-filed at a later time. (lih)
October 16, 2015 Filing 283 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Disputes - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/16/2015 (lih).
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #283 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Disputes. Upon review of the parties joint submissions (D.I. #281 , D.I. #282 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: a discovery dispute hearing is set for 10/28/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: the proposed briefing schedule submitted by the parties is modified as follows: all moving Submissions are due by no later than 10:00 AM on 10/22/2015; all responsive submissions are due by no later than 10:00 AM on 10/23/2015. By no later than noon on 10/27/2015, the parties shall submit a joint letter to the court identifying which discovery disputes are still pending and a proposed agenda for the 10/28/2015 discovery dispute hearing. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/16/2015. (lih)
October 14, 2015 Filing 282 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Plaintiffs' Counsel and Defendant Patrick Walsh's Counsel regarding Identifying Current Discovery Disputes that Parties Anticipate to be Subject of Forthcoming Discovery Motion Practice. (Cordrey, John)
October 14, 2015 Filing 281 Letter to Judge Fallon from Plaintiffs and Defendants Raymond A. Mirra, Jr., RAM Capital Group, LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Joseph A. Troilo, Jr., Joseph T. Molieri, Bruce Kolleda, Mark A. Kovinsky, Joseph J. Tropiano, Jr., Danielle Stewart, Renee M. Sigloch, Bari Kuo, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, and Shelly Demora regarding Discovery Disputes. (Neal, Lauren)
October 14, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the letter formerly filed as D.I. 281 due to document not having a case caption. Counsel is advised to re-file the document with an appropriate case caption. (lih)
October 13, 2015 Filing 280 REDACTED VERSION of #272 Exhibit to a Document by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/14/2015 (lih).
October 13, 2015 Filing 279 REDACTED VERSION of #271 Declaration by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/14/2015 (lih).
October 13, 2015 Filing 278 REDACTED VERSION of #270 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Miller, Rick)
October 13, 2015 Filing 277 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gigi Jordan on 12/02/2015 filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Neal, Lauren)
October 13, 2015 Filing 276 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michelle Mitchell on 11/02/2015 filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Neal, Lauren)
October 13, 2015 Filing 275 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kimberly Jordan on 11/12/2015 filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Neal, Lauren)
October 13, 2015 Filing 274 NOTICE of Subpoena to Carlyn McCaffrey by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Carlyn McCaffrey, #2 Exhibit B)(Neal, Lauren)
October 13, 2015 Filing 273 NOTICE of Subpoena to Benjamin Elliott by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Benhamin Elliott, #2 Exhibit B)(Neal, Lauren)
October 6, 2015 Filing 272 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #271 Declaration by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4 (part 1), #4 Exhibit 4 (part 2), #5 Exhibit 5-9, #6 Exhibit 10 (part 1), #7 Exhibit 10 (part 2), #8 Exhibit 10 (part 3), #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Rick)
October 5, 2015 Filing 271 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Allan L. Brenner, Esquire re #270 Answering Brief in Opposition by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/6/2015 (lih).
October 5, 2015 Filing 270 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #258 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Rick)
October 5, 2015 Filing 269 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Response and Objections to Defendant Patrick Walsh's First Interrogatory filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
September 30, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 9/30/2015. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #262 Joint Motion for a Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. The transcript of the 9/30/2015 teleconference shall serve as the order of the court in this matter. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/30/2015. (lih)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the discovery dispute teleconference set in this matter for 1:30 PM today is RESCHEDULED to 2:00 PM today. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/30/2015. (lih)
September 28, 2015 Filing 268 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rita Cristman on November 17, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena with Rider A and Copy of Stipulation and Protective Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information)(Miller, Rick)
September 25, 2015 Filing 267 REDACTED VERSION of #260 Declaration,, by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 22)(Neal, Lauren)
September 25, 2015 Filing 266 REDACTED VERSION of #259 MEMORANDUM in Support,, by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Neal, Lauren)
September 25, 2015 Filing 265 REDACTED VERSION of #258 MOTION for Sanctions by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Statement Under Local Rule 7.1.1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Neal, Lauren)
September 24, 2015 Filing 264 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding - re #263 Letter regarding discovery dispute.(Nachbar, Kenneth) Modified on 9/25/2015 (lih).
September 23, 2015 Filing 263 Letter to Hon. Sherry R. Fallon from Rick S. Miller, Esq. regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 9/23/2015 (lih).
September 22, 2015 Filing 262 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Miller, Rick) Modified on 9/22/2015 (lih).
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #262 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 9/30/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: ( Moving Submission due by no later than noon on 9/23/2015., Responsive submissions due by no later than noon on 9/24/2015.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/22/2015. (lih)
September 21, 2015 Filing 261 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Patrick Walsh's Response to Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Production of Documents filed by Patrick Walsh.(Cordrey, John)
September 21, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, docket clerk has deleted the memorandum of law attached to D.I. #258 due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document separately using the appropriate event code. Docket clerk has also deleted the declaration formerly filed as D.I. 259. Document will be re-filed in the appropriate order at a later time. (lih)
September 18, 2015 Filing 260 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Robert L. Raskopf re #258 MOTION for Sanctions , #259 MEMORANDUM in Support by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3-10 , #3 Exhibit 11-18, #4 Exhibit 19-20, #5 Exhibit 21-22, #6 Certificate of Service)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 9/21/2015 (lih). Modified on 9/21/2015 (lih).
September 18, 2015 Filing 259 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Support re #258 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 9/21/2015 (lih).
September 18, 2015 Filing 258 [SEALED] MOTION for Sanctions - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 7.1.1 Statement,#3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 9/21/2015 (lih).
September 17, 2015 Filing 257 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RAM Defendants Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Amended First Request for Production of Documents filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Neal, Lauren)
September 9, 2015 Filing 256 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (J.H. Whitney & Co.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Rick)
September 9, 2015 Filing 255 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (MedImmune LLC) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Rick)
September 9, 2015 Filing 254 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Mark Clein) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Rick)
September 3, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Deborah k. Brown for Shelly Demora added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-02083-SLR-SRF, 1:14-cv-01485-SLR-SRF(cna)
September 2, 2015 Filing 253 NOTICE of Subpoena to Gay Woodhouse by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
September 2, 2015 Filing 252 NOTICE of Subpoena to Ethan Leder to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena with Rider A and Copy of Stipulation and Protective Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information)(Miller, Rick)
September 2, 2015 Filing 251 NOTICE of Subpoena to Jeffrey Jay to Testify at a Deposition in Civil Action by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena with Rider A and Copy of Stipulation and Protective Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information)(Miller, Rick)
September 2, 2015 Filing 250 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Patrick Walsh's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Corrected) filed by Patrick Walsh.(Cordrey, John)
September 2, 2015 Filing 249 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deborah K. Brown - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Neal, Lauren)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #249 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deborah K. Brown. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/2/2015. (lih)
August 27, 2015 Filing 248 NOTICE of Vacation of Deposition and Withdrawal of Subpoena re: Michael Bonventure by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. re #245 Notice (Other) (Miller, Rick)
August 26, 2015 Filing 247 NOTICE of of Subpoena to Parkash Gill to Testify at a Deposition by Hawk Mountain LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Miller, Rick)
August 26, 2015 Filing 246 NOTICE of of Subpoena to Victor Battaglia to Testify at a Deposition by Hawk Mountain LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Miller, Rick)
August 26, 2015 Filing 245 NOTICE of of Subpoena to Michael Bonventure to Testify at Deposition by Hawk Mountain LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Miller, Rick)
August 19, 2015 Filing 244 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Kovinsky on Oct. 27, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
August 19, 2015 Filing 243 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Raymond A. Mirra, Jr. on Oct. 6, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
August 19, 2015 Filing 242 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Renee Sigloch on Nov. 5, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
August 19, 2015 Filing 241 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patrick Walsh on Oct. 19, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
August 19, 2015 Filing 240 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Tropiano on Oct. 22, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
August 19, 2015 Filing 239 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph A. Troilo, Jr. on Oct. 1, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
August 19, 2015 Filing 238 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph T. Molieri on Oct. 30, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
August 19, 2015 Filing 237 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Danielle Stewart on Nov. 5, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
August 19, 2015 Filing 236 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bruce Kolleda on Oct. 12, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
August 18, 2015 Filing 235 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Production of Documents to the RAM Defendants and Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Production of Documents to Patrick Walsh filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
August 17, 2015 Filing 234 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Defendant Patrick Walsh's First Request for Production of Documents by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
August 12, 2015 Filing 233 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RAM Defendants' First Interrogatory to Plaintiff Gigi Jordan filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Neal, Lauren)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #201 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. The transcript of the 8/10/2015 teleconference shall serve as the order of the court in this matter. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/10/2015. (lih)
August 10, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 8/10/2015. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
July 30, 2015 Filing 232 Joint STATUS REPORT by Shelly Demora, Bernard Eizen Esq., Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano, Patrick Walsh. (Neal, Lauren) Modified on 7/31/2015 (lih).
July 29, 2015 Filing 231 Letter to Judge Fallon from David J. Ferry, Jr. regarding Pending Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA)(Miller, Rick)
July 29, 2015 Filing 230 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Response on Discovery Disputes - re #227 Letter, Oral Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 26)(Neal, Lauren)
July 29, 2015 Filing 229 Letter to Judge Fallon from John C. Cordrey, Esq. regarding re #227 Letter. (Cordrey, John) Modified on 7/29/2015 (lih).
July 29, 2015 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies and the Order regarding discovery matters, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of the letters to be delivered to the clerks office within one hour of e-filing, counsel shall submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #230 and one copy of D.I. #229 by no later than 3:30 today. (lih) Modified on 7/29/2015 (lih).
July 27, 2015 Filing 228 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar regarding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Exhibit A through H, #3 Exhibit I through M, #4 Exhibit N through Z, #5 Exhibit AA through DD)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 7/28/2015 (lih).
July 27, 2015 Filing 227 Letter to Magistrate Fallon from Plaintiffs' Counsel regarding Pending Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A- Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D Part 1, #6 Exhibit D Part 2, #7 Exhibit D Part 3, #8 Exhibit D Part 4, #9 Exhibit D Part 5)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 7/27/2015 (lih).
July 27, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, D.I. numbers 228 and 229 have been deleted and will be re-filed at a later time. (lih)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #226 Letter Request. Set Deadlines: Responsive submissions due by no later than 11:00 AM on 7/29/2015. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/23/2015. (lih)
July 22, 2015 Filing 226 Joint Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon regarding pending Discovery Disputes. (Neal, Lauren) Modified on 7/22/2015 (lih).
July 22, 2015 Filing 225 Letter to Magistrate Fallon from David J. Ferry, Jr., Esq. regarding resolution of non-party discovery dispute. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 7/22/2015 (lih).
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the teleconference set in this matter for 8/10/2015 at 12:30 PM is RESCHEDULED to 1:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/22/2015. (lih)
July 15, 2015 Filing 224 NOTICE of Service of First Request for the Production of Documents by Patrick Walsh (Cordrey, John)
July 13, 2015 Filing 223 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in Civil Action to Abraham Weiss and Company by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
July 13, 2015 Filing 222 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in Civil Action to Carlyn McCaffrey, c/o McDermott Will & Emery by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
July 13, 2015 Filing 221 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in Civil Action to Gay Woodhouse by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
July 13, 2015 Filing 220 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in Civil Action to Comyns Smith, McCleary & Deaver, LLP by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
July 13, 2015 Filing 219 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in Civil Action to Karen Balmer by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
July 13, 2015 Filing 218 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in Civil Action to Kostelanetz & Fink, LLP by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
July 10, 2015 Filing 217 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Demand for Handwriting Exemplars to Defendant Kolleda filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan.(Miller, Rick)
July 10, 2015 Filing 216 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Demand for Handwriting Exemplars to Defendant Tropiano filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan.(Miller, Rick)
July 10, 2015 Filing 215 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Demand for Handwriting Exemplars to Defendant Troilo filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan.(Miller, Rick)
July 10, 2015 Filing 214 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Demand for Handwriting Exemplars to Defendant Mirra filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan.(Miller, Rick)
July 7, 2015 Filing 213 NOTICE of Vacation of Deposition of Joseph Tropiano by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
July 7, 2015 Filing 212 NOTICE of Vacation of Deposition of Patrick Walsh by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
July 7, 2015 Filing 211 NOTICE of Vacation of Deposition of Joseph A. Troilo, Jr. by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
July 7, 2015 Filing 210 NOTICE of Vacation of Deposition of Bruce Kolleda by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
July 1, 2015 Filing 209 NOTICE of Vacation of Deposition of Raymond A. Mirra, Jr. by Hawk Mountain LLC re #204 Notice to Take Deposition (Miller, Rick)
June 24, 2015 Filing 208 Amended NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Dr. Ivor Royston) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
June 24, 2015 Filing 207 Amended NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (John George Pappajohn) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
June 19, 2015 Filing 206 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Tropiano on July 22, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
June 19, 2015 Filing 205 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patrick Walsh on July 20, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
June 19, 2015 Filing 204 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Raymond A. Mirra, Jr. on July 6, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
June 19, 2015 Filing 203 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph A. Troilo, Jr. on July 15, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
June 19, 2015 Filing 202 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bruce Kolleda on July 14, 2015 filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #201 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the discovery dispute and status teleconference set in this matter for 8/10/2015 is RESCHEDULED to 12:30 PM. Counsel for the defendants shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: on or before 7/22/2015, counsel shall submit a joint letter to the court identifying which discovery disputes are still pending. Set Deadlines: (ALL Moving Submissions for the discovery disputes being heard on 8/10/2015 are due by no later than 11:00 AM on 7/27/2015., ALL Responsive submissions for the discovery disputes being heard on 8/10/2015 are due by no later than 11:00 AM on 7/28/2015.). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/19/2015. (lih)
June 18, 2015 Filing 201 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Miller, Rick) Modified on 6/19/2015 (lih).
June 17, 2015 Filing 200 NOTICE of Subpoena to Brian Donnelly by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B - Protective Order)(Neal, Lauren)
June 17, 2015 Filing 199 NOTICE of Subpoena to Mark Petersen to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B - Protective Order)(Neal, Lauren)
June 11, 2015 Filing 198 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mary E. Flynn - filed by Biomedical Value Fund, Great Point Partners I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Cronin, Laurence)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #198 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mary E. Flynn. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/11/2015. (lih)
June 8, 2015 Filing 197 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey E. Grell - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification By Jeffrey E. Grell, Esquire)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Miller, Rick)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #197 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey E. Grell. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/8/2015. (lih)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #196 Joint Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 8/10/2015 at 11:30 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the movant shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 11:30 AM on 8/4/2015., Responsive submission due by no later than 11:30 AM on 8/5/2015.). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/5/2015. (lih) Modified on 6/19/2015 (lih).
June 4, 2015 Filing 196 Joint Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Biomedical Value Fund, Great Point Partners I LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Cronin, Laurence) Modified on 6/4/2015 (lih).
June 4, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the joint motion for a teleconference due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the MOTION event code rather than the notice event code. (lih)
June 3, 2015 Filing 195 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Shelly Demoras Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Amended First Requests for Admission to Defendant Shelly Demora; (2) Defendant Bruce Kolledas Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Amended First Requests for Admission to Defendant Bruce Kolleda; (3) Defendant Raymond A. Mirra, Jr.s Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Amended First Requests for Admission to Defendant Raymond A. Mirra, Jr.; (4) Defendant Danielle Stewarts Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Amended First Requests for Admission to Defendant Danielle Stewart; and (5) Defendant Joseph J. Tropiano Jr.s Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Amended First Requests for Admission to Defendant Joseph J. Tropiano, Jr. filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Neal, Lauren)
June 3, 2015 Filing 194 NOTICE of Subpoena to TracFone Wireless Inc. for the Production of Documents and Things by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
June 3, 2015 Filing 193 NOTICE of Subpoena to CellCo Partnership for the Production of Documents or Things by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
June 3, 2015 Filing 192 NOTICE of Subpoena to MetroPCS for the Production of Documents or Things by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
June 2, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the motion to quash and documents filed in support, formerly filed as D.I. numbers 191-193. Counsel is directed to follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. (lih)
May 29, 2015 Filing 190 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Amended Responses and Objections to Defendant Bernard Eizen's First Request for the Production of Documents filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
May 26, 2015 Filing 189 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Defendant Bernard Eizen's First Request for the Production of Documents filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
May 21, 2015 Filing 188 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Production of Documents to the RAM Defendants filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
May 15, 2015 Filing 187 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended First Requests and Second Amended First Requests for Admission to Defendants re #172 Notice of Service, filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Neal, Lauren)
May 5, 2015 Filing 186 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Allion Healthcare, Inc.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
April 29, 2015 Filing 185 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document Entered in Error (Re: Docket No. 182) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
April 29, 2015 Filing 184 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document Entered in Error (Re: Docket No. 181) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
April 29, 2015 Filing 183 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document Entered in Error (Re: Docket No. 180) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
April 28, 2015 Filing 182 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Bob Leonard, The Braff Group) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
April 28, 2015 Filing 181 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Whitney V, L.P.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
April 28, 2015 Filing 180 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Allion Healthcare, Inc.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
April 22, 2015 Filing 179 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Bernard Eizen's First Request for Production of Documents Addressed to Plaintiffs filed by Bernard Eizen Esq..(Bellew, Joseph)
April 17, 2015 Filing 178 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Bernard Eizen's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents filed by Bernard Eizen Esq..(Bellew, Joseph)
April 14, 2015 Filing 177 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Dr. Ivor Royston) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the status teleconference set in this matter for 8/4/2015 is RESCHEDULED to 8/10/2015 at 11:30 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/14/2015. (lih)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Whereas the parties have not submitted a form of order to court regarding the discovery dispute discussed during the 4/6/2015 discovery dispute teleconference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court will consider the discovery dispute resolved by the parties. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/13/2015. (lih)
April 10, 2015 Filing 176 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Morgan Stanley) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
April 9, 2015 Filing 175 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Morgan Stanley) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
April 6, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 4/6/2015. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lih)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #165 Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. Counsel shall submit a proposed order to the court in accordance with what was discussed on the transcript of the 4/6/2015 discovery dispute teleconference. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/6/2015. (lih)
April 2, 2015 Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Patrick Walsh's Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended First Request for Admissions to filed by Patrick Walsh.(Cordrey, John)
April 2, 2015 Filing 173 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar re #170 Letter. (Nachbar, Kenneth) Modified on 4/2/2015 (lih).
April 1, 2015 Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended First Requests for Admission to Defendants re #139 Notice of Service,, filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Neal, Lauren)
April 1, 2015 Filing 171 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas M. Monahan - filed by Patrick Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Cordrey, John)
April 1, 2015 Filing 170 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Rick S. Miller, Esquire regarding discovery dispute among the parties relating to a subpoena that RAM Defendants served on Farella Braun + Martel LLP - re #148 Notice (Other),. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3))(Miller, Rick)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #171 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas M. Monahan. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/1/2015. (lih)
April 1, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas M. Monahan for Patrick Walsh added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
March 31, 2015 Filing 169 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Patrick Walsh's Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents filed by Patrick Walsh.(Cordrey, John)
March 30, 2015 Filing 168 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendants re #126 Notice of Service filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Neal, Lauren)
March 27, 2015 Filing 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to RAM Defendants' First Request for the Production of Documents and Second Request for the Production of Documents filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
March 24, 2015 Filing 166 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Great Point Partners, LLC) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 19, 2015 Filing 165 Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Miller, Rick) Modified on 3/19/2015 (lih).
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #165 Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 4/6/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 4/1/2015., Responsive submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 4/2/2015.). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/19/2015. (lih)
March 18, 2015 Filing 164 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (M&T Bank) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 18, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, the motion for a teleconference, formerly filed as D.I. 165, has been deleted and will be re-filed at a later time. (lih)
March 10, 2015 Filing 163 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (American Express Datamark) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 10, 2015 Filing 162 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Citibank, N.A.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 10, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Peoples United Bank) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 10, 2015 Filing 160 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (JP Morgan Chase) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 10, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 10, 2015 Filing 158 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (PNC Bank) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 10, 2015 Filing 157 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (William A. Jones) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 10, 2015 Filing 156 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (John George Pappajohn) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 10, 2015 Filing 155 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Silicon Valley Bank) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 10, 2015 Filing 154 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (SunTrust Bank) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 10, 2015 Filing 153 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Wells Fargo Bank, NA) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 10, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Julia Beskin for RAM Capital Group LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Response To Non-Party Subpoena To Produce Documents, Information, Or Objects Or To Permit Inspection Of Premises In A Civil Action By Non-Party Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated and (ii) Response To Non-Party Subpoena To Produce Documents, Information, Or Objects Or To Permit Inspection Of Premises In A Civil Action By Non-Party Bank of America, N.A. re #128 Notice (Other), #129 Notice (Other), #127 Notice (Other), #130 Notice (Other) filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Bank of America, N.A..(Cordrey, John)
March 6, 2015 Filing 151 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (J..P. Morgan Securities LLC) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 4, 2015 Filing 150 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Directed to Lobello & Black) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 4, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, D.I. numbers 144 and 147 have been deleted. Counsel was advised to contact the clerks office in the future if a document needs to be removed from the docket prior to filing a notice of error. (lih)
March 3, 2015 Filing 149 NOTICE of Subpoena To Source Communications For The Production Of Documents Or Things by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
March 3, 2015 Filing 148 NOTICE of Subpoena To Farella Braun & Martel LLP For The Production Of Documents Or Things by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Neal, Lauren)
March 3, 2015 Filing 146 NOTICE of Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Directed to Amerisource Bergen Corporation) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 3, 2015 Filing 145 NOTICE of Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Directed to Morris J. Cohen & Co., P.C.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 3, 2015 Filing 143 NOTICE of Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Directed to Duke Law Firm) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 3, 2015 Filing 142 NOTICE of Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Directed to Thomas W. Lawson, Attorney At Law) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 3, 2015 Filing 141 NOTICE of Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Directed to Vasgene Therapeutics, Inc.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
March 2, 2015 Filing 140 NOTICE of Service of RAM Defendants Second Request For The Production Of Documents by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Neal, Lauren)
March 2, 2015 Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended First Requests for Admission to Defendant Shelly Demora, Defendant Virginia L. Hall, Defendant Bruce Kolleda, Defendant Raymond A. Mirra, Jr., Defendant Joseph T. Molieri, Jr., Defendant Renee M. Sigloch, Defendant Danielle Stewart, Defendant Joseph A. Troilo, Jr., Esq., Defendant Patrick J. Walsh and Plaintiffs' First Requests for Admission to Defendant Mark A. Kovinsky filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
February 27, 2015 Filing 138 NOTICE of Notice of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Directed to Morris J. Cohen & Co., P.C.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 24, 2015 Filing 137 NOTICE of Service of the RAM Defendants First Request for the Production of Documents by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Neal, Lauren)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #109 Motion for a Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. The transcript of the 2/23/2015 teleconference shall serve as the order of the court in this matter. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/24/2015. (lih)
February 23, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 2/23/2015. (Court Reporter H Triozzi (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
February 23, 2015 Filing 136 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Directed to Citibank, N.A.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 2/23/2015 (lih).
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #134 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julia Beskin. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/23/2015. (lih)
February 20, 2015 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Requests for Admission Directed to Defendants Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Bari Kuo, Joseph T. Molieri, Jr., Renee M. Sigloch and Danielle Stewart filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
February 19, 2015 Filing 134 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julia Beskin - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Julia Beskin)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Neal, Lauren)
February 19, 2015 Filing 133 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Max Gershenoff, Esquire regarding Response to Mr. Nachbar's February 18, 2015 correspondence regarding discovery matters - re #131 Letter. (Miller, Rick)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER - granting #55 Motion to Intervene for the limited purpose of seeking a stay of discovery; denying w/out prejudice #55 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 13cv2083. (rwc)
February 18, 2015 Filing 131 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar, Esquire regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 2/23/2015 (lih).
February 12, 2015 Filing 130 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Bank of America, NA) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 12, 2015 Filing 129 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Bank of America, NA) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 12, 2015 Filing 128 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 12, 2015 Filing 127 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 12, 2015 Filing 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
February 12, 2015 Filing 125 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
February 11, 2015 Filing 124 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Directed to JP Morgan Chase) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 11, 2015 Filing 123 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document Entered in Error (Re: Docket No. 122) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. re #122 Notice (Other) (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 122 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to JP Morgan Chase by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 121 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to PNC Bank by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 120 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (f/k/a Wachovia Bank, N.A.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 119 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Northern Trust Company by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 117 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Chemical Bank by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 116 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Vanguard Group, Inc. by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 115 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Stifel Financial Corp. by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 114 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Invesco, Ltd. by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 113 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to AXA Financial, Equivest by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 112 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to T. Rowe Price by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 111 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Citibank, N.A. by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Filing 110 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action Directed to Morgan Stanley Smith Barney by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #109 Motion for a Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 2/23/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the defendants shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due 2/18/2015., Responsive submission due 2/19/2015.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/10/2015. (lih)
February 9, 2015 Filing 109 MOTION for a Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 2/10/2015 (lih).
January 30, 2015 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended First Requests for Admissions to Defendant Patrick J. Walsh and Plaintiffs' Amended First Requests for Admissions to Defendant Raymond A. Mirra, Jr. filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
January 29, 2015 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Requests for Admissions to Defendant Joseph A. Troilo, Jr., Esquire filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
January 26, 2015 Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions to Defendant Patrick J. Walsh; (2) Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions to Defendant Raymond A. Mirra, Jr.; and (3) Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions to Defendant Joseph J. Tropiano, Jr. filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..(Miller, Rick)
January 26, 2015 Filing 105 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (PHH Mortgage) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena with Rider A and Copy of Stipulation and Protective Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information)(Miller, Rick)
January 23, 2015 Filing 104 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (First Trust Bank) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena with Rider A and Copy of Stipulation and Protective Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information)(Miller, Rick)
January 23, 2015 Filing 103 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions to Defendant Joseph J. Tropiano, Jr. by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
January 23, 2015 Filing 102 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions to Defendant Raymond A. Mirra, Jr. by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
January 23, 2015 Filing 101 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions to Defendant Patrick J. Walsh by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
January 22, 2015 Filing 100 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (lih)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #100 Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/22/2015. (lih)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Upon consideration of the Motion for Entry of a Protective Order, based upon the written submissions of the parties, a Protective Order is entered in the form attached as Exhibit "A" to Defendants Joint Submission #93 It is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/22/2015. (lih)
January 21, 2015 Filing 99 NOTICE of Request to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Merrill Lynch & Co.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
January 21, 2015 Filing 98 NOTICE of Request to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Merrill Lynch & Co.) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
January 21, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE of Request to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Bank of America) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
January 21, 2015 Filing 96 NOTICE of Request to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (Bank of America) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
January 21, 2015 Filing 95 NOTICE of Request to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (First Trust Bank) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
January 21, 2015 Filing 94 NOTICE of Request to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (JP Morgan Chase) by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. (Miller, Rick)
January 20, 2015 Filing 93 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kenneth J. Nachbar, Esq. regarding Court's Scheduling Order - re #87 Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Nachbar, Kenneth) Modified on 1/21/2015 (lih).
January 20, 2015 Filing 92 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esquire regarding Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information. (Attachments: #1Proposed Protective Order)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 1/20/2015 (lih).
January 15, 2015 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RAM Defendants' Initial Disclosures filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 1/20/2015 (lih).
January 15, 2015 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Patrick Walsh's Intitial Disclosures filed by Patrick Walsh.(Cordrey, John)
January 15, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant, Bernard Eizen's Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures filed by Bernard Eizen Esq..(Bellew, Joseph)
January 14, 2015 Filing 88 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Automatic Disclosures by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan (Miller, Rick)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SO ORDERED- re #86 Joint Revised Proposed Scheduling Order. Set SCHEDULING ORDER deadlines: ( Joinder of Parties due by 1/30/2015., Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2015., Discovery due by 4/22/2016., Status Report due by 7/30/2015., A Status Conference is set for 8/4/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon, Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2016.) (PLEASE REFER TO PROPOSED ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/16/2014. (lih)
December 16, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 12/16/2014. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
December 15, 2014 Filing 86 Joint Revised Proposed Scheduling Order by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 12/15/2014 (lih).
December 11, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Oral Argument held on 12/11/2014 re #55 MOTION to Intervene, #63 MOTION to Dismiss, #67 MOTION to Dismiss, #62 MOTION to Dismiss. (Court Reporter T. Carroll ( Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) on 12/16/2014 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/11/2014. (lih)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: counsel shall submit a revised joint proposed scheduling order by no later than noon on 12/15/2014. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/11/2014. (lih)
December 10, 2014 Filing 85 Fourth Joint STATUS REPORT by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 12/10/2014 (lih).
December 10, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to the request of counsel, the pdf of D.I. #183 has been replaced with the correct version of the document. (lih)
December 10, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert V. Dell'Osa for Bernard Eizen Esq. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
December 9, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The CM/ECF Help Desk corrected DI# 84 (incorrect name). (rwc)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Robert V. Dell'Osa. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/9/2014. (lih)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the oral order dated 11/18/2014 is amended as follows: counsel shall submit a joint status report by no later than noon on 12/10/2014. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/9/2014. (lih)
December 8, 2014 Filing 84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert Dell'osa - filed by Bernard Eizen Esq.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Bellew, Joseph) Modified on 12/9/2014 (rwc).
December 8, 2014 Filing 83 Joint PROPOSED Rule 16 Scheduling Order by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 12/8/2014 (lih). (Main Document 83 replaced on 12/10/2014) (lih).
December 8, 2014 Filing 82 Letter to Magistrate Fallon from Allan L. Brenner, Esquire regarding Proposed Scheduling Order. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 12/8/2014 (lih).
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #82 Letter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: counsel shall file a joint proposed scheduling order that outlines their respective positions. Counsel shall highlight the disputed language within the proposed scheduling order. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/8/2014. (lih)
December 2, 2014 Filing 81 REPLY BRIEF re #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Patrick Walsh. (Cordrey, John)
December 2, 2014 Filing 80 REPLY BRIEF re #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bernard Eizen Esq.. (Bellew, Joseph)
December 2, 2014 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Robert L. Raskopf re #78 Reply Brief by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 12/3/2014 (lih).
December 2, 2014 Filing 78 REPLY BRIEF re #63 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Neal, Lauren) Modified on 12/3/2014 (lih).
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) on 12/11/2014 at 10:00 AM immediately after the oral argument set in this matter on the same date. The parties are required to prepare for the conference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than December 8, 2014. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before 12/11/2014. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/18/2014. (lih)
November 17, 2014 Filing 77 Third Joint STATUS REPORT by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 11/17/2014 (lih).
November 14, 2014 Filing 76 Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from Assistant District Attorney Christina Ante regarding Continuance of Stay. (Ante, Christina) Modified on 11/17/2014 (lih).
November 13, 2014 Filing 75 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Max GErshenoff - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ferry, David)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #75 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Max GErshenoff. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/13/2014. (lih)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the oral argument set in this matter for 12/11/2014 at 11:00 AM is RESCHEDULED to 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/13/2014. (lih)
November 12, 2014 Filing 74 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from David J. Ferry, Jr., Esquire enclosing courtesy copies. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 11/12/2014 (lih).
November 11, 2014 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Dismiss, #67 MOTION to Dismiss , #62 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/21/2014. (Coggins, Lisa) Modified on 11/12/2014 (lih).
October 21, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 10/21/2014. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #70 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time. Consistent with the court's ruling on the record during the teleconference held on this same date, the briefing schedule on the defendants' motions to dismiss [D.I. 62, 63, 67] is modified as follows: Answering brief due 11/11/14. Reply briefs due 12/2/14. The oral argument date previously scheduled to address the pending motions will remain the same. Set Briefing Schedule: (Answering Brief due 11/11/2014., Reply Brief due 12/2/2014.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/21/2014. (lih)
October 17, 2014 Filing 72 RESPONSE to Motion re #70 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shelly Demora, Bernard Eizen Esq., Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano, Patrick Walsh. (Neal, Lauren) Modified on 10/20/2014 (lih).
October 17, 2014 Filing 71 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Rick S. Miller, Esq. re #70 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time (Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/17/2014 (lih).
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a Telephone Conference on 10/21/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon re #70 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time. Counsel for the plaintiffs shall initiate the call to (302) 573-4551. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/17/2014. (lih)
October 16, 2014 Filing 70 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss, #67 MOTION to Dismiss, #62 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Miller, Rick) Modified on 10/17/2014 (lih).
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: discovery is stayed in this matter until 11/14/2014. On or before 11/17/2014, counsel shall submit a joint status report. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: the court shall hear oral argument re #63 MOTION to Dismiss, #67 MOTION to Dismiss, #62 MOTION to Dismiss on 12/11/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel shall collectively have one hour and thirty minutes to present argument. Set deadlines: ( Status Report due by 11/17/2014.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/1/2014. (lih)
September 30, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 9/30/2014. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih) Modified on 10/21/2014 (lih).
September 25, 2014 Filing 69 Second Joint STATUS REPORT by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 9/30/2014 (lih).
September 17, 2014 Filing 68 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Patrick Walsh.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cordrey, John)
September 17, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Patrick Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Cordrey, John)
September 17, 2014 Filing 66 DECLARATION OF ROBERT L. RASKOPF re #64 MEMORANDUM in Support by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 9/18/2014 (lih).
September 17, 2014 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Support re #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bernard Eizen Esq..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/6/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Bellew, Joseph)
September 17, 2014 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/6/2014. (Neal, Lauren) Modified on 9/18/2014 (lih).
September 17, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint- filed by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Neal, Lauren) Modified on 9/18/2014 (lih).
September 17, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Bernard Eizen Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Bellew, Joseph)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #61 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/3/2014. (lih)
August 29, 2014 Filing 61 STIPULATION Briefing on Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint re #47 Amended Complaint,, by Shelly Demora, Frederick Forte, Virginia L. Hall, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: all discovery in this matter is temporarily stayed until 9/30/2014. The court shall conduct a status teleconference on 9/30/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. On or before 9/25/2014, counsel shall submit a joint status report to the court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: any response to #55 MOTION to Intervene, MOTION to Stay, limited to fifteen pages, shall be filed on or before 9/19/2014 and Reply Brief, limited to five pages, shall be filed on or before 9/26/2014. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/14/2014. (lih)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER- GRANTING #59 MOTION to Appear without Local Counsel filed by Cyrus R Vance, Jr.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/12/2014. (lih)
August 12, 2014 Filing 59 MOTION to Appear without Local Counsel - filed by Cyrus R Vance, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(lih)
August 12, 2014 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #59 MOTION to Appear without Local Counsel. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/29/2014. (lih)
August 11, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Status Conference held on 8/11/2014. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
August 8, 2014 Filing 58 Letter to Clerk of Court from Christina Ante regarding enclosing #56 Opening Brief in Support, #55 MOTION to Intervene and Stay, #57 Declaration. (lih)
August 8, 2014 Filing 57 DECLARATION re #56 Opening Brief in Support by Cyrus R Vance, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(lih)
August 8, 2014 Filing 56 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #55 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Stay filed by Cyrus R Vance, Jr.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/25/2014. (lih) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2014: #1 certificates of service) (lih).
August 8, 2014 Filing 55 MOTION to Intervene, MOTION to Stay Discovery - filed by Cyrus R Vance, Jr. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(lih)
August 4, 2014 Filing 54 Joint STATUS REPORT by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Miller, Rick)
August 4, 2014 Filing 53 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Capital II, LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
August 4, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of Virginia L. Hall (Nachbar, Kenneth)
July 29, 2014 Filing 51 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hawk Mountain LLC. Virginia L. Hall served on 7/17/2014, answer due 9/17/2014. (Coggins, Lisa)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- DENYING #49 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the in person rule 16 scheduling conference set in this matter for 8/11/2014 is converted into an in person status conference. Counsel shall submit a joint status report on or before 8/4/2014. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/28/2014. (lih)
July 22, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of Shelly Demora, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital II, LLC (Nachbar, Kenneth)
July 21, 2014 Filing 49 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report and to Continue Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Miller, Rick) Modified on 7/22/2014 (lih).
July 21, 2014 Filing 48 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Rick S. Miller, Esquire regarding request for enlargement of time to file joint status report. (Miller, Rick) Modified on 7/22/2014 (lih).
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #46 STIPULATION Regarding Second Amended Complaint. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Shelly Demora answer due 9/17/2014; Bernard Eizen Esq. answer due 9/17/2014; Frederick Forte answer due 9/17/2014; Virginia L. Hall answer due 9/17/2014; Bruce Kolleda answer due 9/17/2014; Mark Kovinsky answer due 9/17/2014; Bari Kuo answer due 9/17/2014;Joseph T. Molieri Esq. answer due 9/17/2014; RAM Capital Group LLC answer due 9/17/2014; RAM Capital II, LLC answer due 9/17/2014; RAM Realty Holdings LLC answer due 9/17/2014; Renee M. Sigloch answer due 9/17/2014; Danielle Stewart answer due 9/17/2014; Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq. answer due 9/17/2014; Joseph Tropiano answer due 9/17/2014; Patrick Walsh answer due 9/17/2014; Raymond A. Mirra, Jr. answer due 9/17/2014. (AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY COUNSEL AT D.I. #47 ) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/16/2014. (lih) Modified on 7/17/2014 (lih).
July 17, 2014 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Virginia L. Hall. (cla, )
July 16, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert L. Raskopf for RAM Capital Group LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
July 14, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Shelly Demora on 7/14/2014; Virginia L. Hall on 7/14/2014; Raymond A. Mirra, Jr on 7/14/2014; RAM Capital II, LLC on 7/14/2014. (cla, )
July 9, 2014 Filing 47 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bernard Eizen Esq., Frederick Forte, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano, Patrick Walsh, Raymond A. Mirra, Jr, RAM Capital II, LLC, Virginia L. Hall, Shelly Demora- filed by Michelle E. Mitchell Esq., Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Miller, Rick)
July 9, 2014 Filing 46 STIPULATION Regarding Second Amended Complaint by Advance Research Corporation Inc., Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Frederick Forte, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., Pridecare Inc., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #45 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME time for all Defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Advance Research Corporation Inc. answer due 7/21/2014; Allion Healthcare Inc. answer due 7/21/2014; Michael Bonventure answer due 7/21/2014; Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 7/21/2014; Bernard Eizen Esq. answer due 7/21/2014; Frederick Forte answer due 7/21/2014; Ted Greenberg answer due 7/21/2014; Bruce Kolleda answer due 7/21/2014; Mark Kovinsky answer due 7/21/2014; Bari Kuo answer due 7/21/2014; Joseph T. Molieri Esq. answer due 7/21/2014; Pridecare Inc. answer due 7/21/2014; RAM Capital Group LLC answer due 7/21/2014; RAM Realty Holdings LLC answer due 7/21/2014; Renee M. Sigloch answer due 7/21/2014; Danielle Stewart answer due 7/21/2014; Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC answer due 7/21/2014; Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq. answer due 7/21/2014; Joseph Tropiano answer due 7/21/2014; Vasgene Therapeutics Inc. answer due 7/21/2014; Patrick Walsh answer due 7/21/2014. (REFER TO STIPULATION FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/18/2014. (lih)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: on or before 7/21/2014 counsel shall file a joint status report. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on Monday, August 11, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than August 6, 2014. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/19/2014. (lih)
June 18, 2014 Filing 45 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME time for all Defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint to July 21, 2014 - filed by Advance Research Corporation Inc., Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Frederick Forte, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., Pridecare Inc., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
May 29, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sarah Aberg for Patrick Walsh added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 27, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah Aberg - filed by Patrick Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Cordrey, John)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah Aberg. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/27/2014. (lih)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Advance Research Corporation Inc. answer due 6/19/2014; Allion Healthcare Inc. answer due 6/19/2014; Michael Bonventure answer due 6/19/2014; Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 6/19/2014; Bernard Eizen Esq. answer due 6/19/2014; Frederick Forte answer due 6/19/2014; Ted Greenberg answer due 6/19/2014; Bruce Kolleda answer due 6/19/2014; Mark Kovinsky answer due 6/19/2014; Bari Kuo answer due 6/19/2014; Joseph T. Molieri Esq. answer due 6/19/2014; Pridecare Inc. answer due 6/19/2014; RAM Capital Group LLC answer due 6/19/2014; RAM Realty Holdings LLC answer due 6/19/2014; Renee M. Sigloch answer due 6/19/2014; Danielle Stewart answer due 6/19/2014; Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC answer due 6/19/2014; Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq. answer due 6/19/2014; Joseph Tropiano answer due 6/19/2014; Vasgene Therapeutics Inc. answer due 6/19/2014; Patrick Walsh answer due 6/19/2014. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/1/2014. (lih)
April 30, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wilhelm X. Dingler for Michael Bonventure added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 28, 2014 Filing 43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Second Amended Complaint to June 19, 2014 - filed by Advance Research Corporation Inc., Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Frederick Forte, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., Pridecare Inc., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
April 15, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert S. Friedman for Patrick Walsh added for electronic noticing. (els)
April 11, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeff Kern for Patrick Walsh added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 3, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Patrick Walsh: Entry of appearance of attorney John C. Cordrey. Attorney John A. Sensing terminated. (Cordrey, John)
March 19, 2014 Filing 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert S. Friedman and Jeff Kern - filed by Patrick Walsh. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Sensing, John)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert S. Friedman and Jeff Kern. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/19/2014. (lih)
March 17, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nicholas A.S. Hoy for RAM Capital Group LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
March 13, 2014 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle E. Mitchell Esq., Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Miller, Rick)
March 13, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the summons returned as executed (formerly D.I. 40) due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document with the caption page. (lih)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #39 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Advance Research Corporation Inc. answer due 5/5/2014; Allion Healthcare Inc. answer due 5/5/2014; Michael Bonventure answer due 5/5/2014; Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 5/5/2014; Bernard Eizen Esq. answer due 5/5/2014; Frederick Forte answer due 5/5/2014; Ted Greenberg answer due 5/5/2014; Bruce Kolleda answer due 5/5/2014; Mark Kovinsky answer due 5/5/2014; Bari Kuo answer due 5/5/2014; Joseph T. Molieri Esq. answer due 5/5/2014; Pridecare Inc. answer due 5/5/2014; RAM Capital Group LLC answer due 5/5/2014; RAM Realty Holdings LLC answer due 5/5/2014; Renee M. Sigloch answer due 5/5/2014; Danielle Stewart answer due 5/5/2014; Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC answer due 5/5/2014; Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq. answer due 5/5/2014; Joseph Tropiano answer due 5/5/2014; Vasgene Therapeutics Inc. answer due 5/5/2014; Patrick Walsh answer due 5/5/2014. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/11/2014. (lih)
March 11, 2014 Filing 39 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to First Amended Complaint to May 5, 2014 - filed by Advance Research Corporation Inc., Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Frederick Forte, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., Pridecare Inc., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Polizoti, Leslie)
February 27, 2014 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Vasgene Therapeutics Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Patrick Walsh answer due 3/19/2014. (PLEASE REFER TO STIPULATION FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/25/2014. (lih)
February 26, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jason A. Snyderman for Vasgene Therapeutics Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 25, 2014 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint served on Ted M. Greenberg on 2/11/14, filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Miller, Rick)
February 25, 2014 Filing 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to 03/19/14 - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Miller, Rick) Modified on 2/25/2014 (lih).
February 25, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anderson Sensing on behalf of Patrick Walsh (Sensing, John)
February 25, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bridget Mayer for Vasgene Therapeutics Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
February 25, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #36 has been modified to reflect that the document is a stipulation to extend time rather than a motion. Counsel is advised that it is only necessary to select the stipulation to extend time event code when filing a document of this nature in the future. (lih)
February 24, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Susy O. Cho - filed by Ted Greenberg. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Abrams, Richard)
February 24, 2014 Filing 33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David S. Cohen - filed by Ted Greenberg. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Abrams, Richard)
February 24, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Dennis Abrams on behalf of Ted Greenberg (Abrams, Richard)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Susy O. Cho, #33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David S. Cohen. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/24/2014. (lih)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bridget Mayer and Jason Snyderman. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/24/2014. (lih)
February 21, 2014 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bridget Mayer and Jason Snyderman - filed by Vasgene Therapeutics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification by Jason Snyderman, #3 Certification by Bridget Mayer)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Caponi, Steven)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Advance Research Corporation Inc. answer due 3/19/2014; Allion Healthcare Inc. answer due 3/19/2014; Michael Bonventure answer due 3/19/2014; Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 3/19/2014; Bernard Eizen Esq. answer due 3/19/2014; Frederick Forte answer due 3/19/2014; Bruce Kolleda answer due 3/19/2014; Mark Kovinsky answer due 3/19/2014; Bari Kuo answer due 3/19/2014; Joseph T. Molieri Esq. answer due 3/19/2014; Pridecare Inc. answer due 3/19/2014; RAM Capital Group LLC answer due 3/19/2014; RAM Realty Holdings LLC answer due 3/19/2014; Renee M. Sigloch answer due 3/19/2014; Danielle Stewart answer due 3/19/2014; Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC answer due 3/19/2014; Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq. answer due 3/19/2014; Joseph Tropiano answer due 3/19/2014; Vasgene Therapeutics Inc. answer due 3/19/2014. Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule as to stipulating defendants only: (Opening Brief due 3/19/2014., Answering Brief due 4/18/2014., Reply Brief due 5/5/2014.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/20/2014. (lih)
February 19, 2014 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Amended Complaint to March 19, 2014 - filed by Advance Research Corporation Inc., Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Frederick Forte, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., Pridecare Inc., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
February 19, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Caponi on behalf of Vasgene Therapeutics Inc. (Caponi, Steven)
February 18, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph James Bellew on behalf of Bernard Eizen Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service of Entry of Appearance of Joseph J. Bellew)(Bellew, Joseph)
February 18, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of Frederick Forte (Nachbar, Kenneth)
February 18, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Patrick Walsh. (rwc)
February 14, 2014 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michelle E. Mitchell Esq., Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan: For Ted Greenberg waiver sent on 2/4/2014, answer due 4/7/2014. (Miller, Rick)
February 11, 2014 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint served on Defendant Frederick Forte on 2/6/2014, filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Return Receipt)(Miller, Rick)
February 6, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Amended RICO Complaint [D.I. 20] by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. re #20 Amended Complaint,, (Miller, Rick) Modified on 2/6/2014 (lih).
February 6, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #24 has been modified to reflect that the document is a Notice of Service. It is requested that counsel use the NOTICE OF SERVICE event code when filing a document of this nature in the future. (lih)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #16 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Michael Bonventure answer due 2/14/2014. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/3/2014. (lih)
February 4, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dee Dee Fischer for Allion Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 3, 2014 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Bernard Eizen on 2/3/2014, filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Miller, Rick)
February 3, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jason S. Oletsky for Allion Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
February 3, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Frederick Forte on 2/3/2014; Ted Greenberg on 2/3/2014; Patrick Walsh on 2/3/2014. (cla, )
February 3, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scott M. Kessler for Allion Healthcare Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
January 31, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Nachbar, Kenneth)
January 31, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allan L. Brenner, Esquire - filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Miller, Rick)
January 31, 2014 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Advance Research Corporation Inc., Allion Healthcare Inc., Michael Bonventure, Bernard Eizen Esq., Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., Pridecare Inc., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano, Vasgene Therapeutics Inc., Frederick Forte, Ted Greenberg, Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc.- filed by Michelle E. Mitchell Esq., Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Rick)
January 31, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. as to F. Gillis Green ONLY (Miller, Rick)
January 31, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 1/31/2014. (cla, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason S. Oletsky, Scott M. Kessler and Dee Dee Fischer, #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wilhelm Dingler, #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Allan L. Brenner. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/31/2014. (lih)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #12 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set Answer Deadlines: Allion Healthcare Inc. answer due 2/18/2014. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/31/2014. (lih)
January 30, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan as to Atlas Respiratory Services, Inc. ONLY (Miller, Rick)
January 29, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason S. Oletsky, Scott M. Kessler and Dee Dee Fischer - filed by Allion Healthcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jason S. Oletsky, #2 Certification of Scott M. Kessler, #3 Certifiation of Dee Dee Fischer)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Brown, Daniel)
January 29, 2014 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to COMPLAINT to February 14, 2014 - filed by Michael Bonventure, Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan, Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.. (Aranilla, Artemio)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert L. Raskopf, Jennifer D. Bishop and Nicholas A.S. Hoy. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/29/2014. (lih)
January 28, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert L. Raskopf, Jennifer D. Bishop and Nicholas A.S. Hoy - filed by Advance Research Corporation Inc., Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., Pridecare Inc., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Nachbar, Kenneth)
January 28, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Nachbar on behalf of Advance Research Corporation Inc., Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., Pridecare Inc., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano (Nachbar, Kenneth)
January 28, 2014 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Vasgene Therapeutics, Inc. on 1/21/14, filed by Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Miller, Rick)
January 28, 2014 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or otherwise Respond to Plainitff's Complaint to February 18, 2014 - filed by Allion Healthcare Inc.. (Brown, Daniel)
January 27, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Brown on behalf of Allion Healthcare Inc. (Brown, Daniel)
January 27, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Freebery, IV on behalf of Allion Healthcare Inc. (Freebery, James)
January 21, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wilhelm Dingler - filed by Michael Bonventure. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Wilhelm Dingler)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Aranilla, Artemio)
January 21, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Artemio C. Aranilla, II on behalf of Michael Bonventure (Aranilla, Artemio)
January 21, 2014 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendants Bonventure and Green on 1/11/14 and 1/16/14, filed by Hawk Mountain LLC. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipt - Bonventure, #2 Return Receipt- Green)(Miller, Rick)
January 14, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Judge Fallon for Mediation. (lih)
January 8, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hawk Mountain LLC. Allion Healthcare Inc. served on 1/7/2014, answer due 1/28/2014. (Miller, Rick)
January 8, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hawk Mountain LLC. Atlas Respiratory Services Inc. served on 1/7/2014, answer due 1/28/2014. (Miller, Rick)
January 6, 2014 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Hawk Mountain LLC. (Miller, Rick)
January 6, 2014 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement:. (Miller, Rick)
January 2, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Biomed Healthcare Holdings Inc. (rwc)
January 2, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Advance Research Corporation Inc. on 1/2/2014; Atlas Respiratory Services Inc. on 1/2/2014; Michael Bonventure on 1/2/2014; Bernard Eizen Esq. on 1/2/2014; F. Gillis Green on 1/2/2014; Bruce Kolleda on 1/2/2014; Mark Kovinsky on 1/2/2014; Bari Kuo on 1/2/2014; Michelle E. Mitchell Esq. on 1/2/2014; Pridecare Inc. on 1/2/2014; RAM Capital Group LLC on 1/2/2014; RAM Realty Holdings LLC on 1/2/2014; Renee M. Sigloch on 1/2/2014; Danielle Stewart on 1/2/2014; Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC on 1/2/2014; Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq. on 1/2/2014; Joseph Tropiano on 1/2/2014; Vasgene Therapeutics Inc. on 1/2/2014. (rwc)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/30/2013. (nmfn)
December 27, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 26, 2013 No Summons Issued. (mdb)
December 23, 2013 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mdb)
December 23, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Advance Research Corporation Inc., Allion Healthcare Inc., Atlas Respiratory Services Inc., Michael Bonventure, Bernard Eizen Esq., F. Gillis Green, Bruce Kolleda, Mark Kovinsky, Bari Kuo, Joseph T. Molieri Esq., Pridecare Inc., RAM Capital Group LLC, RAM Realty Holdings LLC, Renee M. Sigloch, Danielle Stewart, Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC, Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq., Joseph Tropiano, Vasgene Therapeutics Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1431032.) - filed by Michelle E. Mitchell Esq., Hawk Mountain LLC, Gigi Jordan, Kim Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawk Mountain LLC et al v. RAM Capital Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Respiratory Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Medical Equipment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee M. Sigloch
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Tropiano
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph T. Molieri Esq.
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAM Capital II, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond A. Mirra, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAM Realty Holdings LLC
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAM Capital Group LLC
Represented By: Nicholas A.S. Hoy
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Robert L. Raskopf
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Represented By: Julia Beskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Walsh
Represented By: Sarah Aberg
Represented By: Robert S. Friedman
Represented By: Jeff Kern
Represented By: John C. Cordrey
Represented By: John Anderson Sensing
Represented By: Thomas M. Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pridecare Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kovinsky
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Eizen Esq.
Represented By: Robert V. Dell'Osa
Represented By: Joseph J. Bellew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bari Kuo
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Research Corporation Inc.
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasgene Therapeutics Inc.
Represented By: Bridget Mayer
Represented By: Jason A. Snyderman
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Sloan
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Gillis Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bonventure
Represented By: Wilhelm X. Dingler
Represented By: Artemio C. Aranilla, II
Represented By: Joseph S. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Kolleda
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Troilo Jr. Esq.
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Greenberg
Represented By: Richard Dennis Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Demora
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Deborah k. Brown
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Stewart
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allion Healthcare Inc. a Delaware Corporation, presently doing business as Biomed Health Care Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Dee Dee Fischer
Represented By: James J. Freebery, IV
Represented By: Jason S. Oletsky
Represented By: Daniel J. Brown
Represented By: Scott M. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Ridge Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Forte
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia L. Hall
Represented By: Lauren Neal
Represented By: Thomas Parker Will
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gigi Jordan
Represented By: Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III
Represented By: William D. Sullivan
Represented By: David J. Ferry, Jr.
Represented By: Rick S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle E. Mitchell Esq.
Represented By: Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III
Represented By: David J. Ferry, Jr.
Represented By: William D. Sullivan
Represented By: Rick S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawk Mountain LLC
Represented By: Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III
Represented By: William D. Sullivan
Represented By: David J. Ferry, Jr.
Represented By: Rick S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Jordan
Represented By: Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III
Represented By: William D. Sullivan
Represented By: David J. Ferry, Jr.
Represented By: Rick S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Great Point Partners I LLC
Represented By: Laurence V. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Biomedical Value Fund
Represented By: Laurence V. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?