Malone et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Malone and Charles D. Malone
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, Crane Co., Warren Pumps LLC, Trane US Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Flowserve Corporation, Riley Power Inc., FMC Corporation, Honeywell International Inc., Alfa Laval Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Nash Engineering Company, General Electric Company, Cleaver-Brooks Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Viad Corp., William Powell Company, CBS Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Cummins Inc., Ford Motor Company, Armstrong International Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., NAPA, Flowserve US Inc. Solely as Successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Pfizer Inc., IMO Industries Inc., York International Corporation, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Atwood & Morrill Company Inc., McNally Industries LLC, Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc., Flowserve US Inc., Zurn Industries LLC and John Crane Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00406
Filed: April 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M Sleet
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2016 Filing 439 JUDGMENT - entered in favor of defendants Cummins, Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, and CBS Corporation, and against the plaintiffs, Charles and Elizabeth Malone (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/22/2016. (mdb)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #437 Report and Recommendations - The Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (D.I. #377 , #379 , and #381 ) are GRANTED; the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Defendants, Cummins, Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, and CBS Corporation, and against the Plaintiffs, Charles and Elizabeth Malone. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/22/2016. (mdb)
August 29, 2016 Filing 437 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- granting #379 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #381 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 9/15/2016. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/29/2016. (lih)
May 25, 2016 Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
April 15, 2016 Filing 436 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re All Plaintiffs : Entry of appearance of attorney David W. deBruin. Attorney Michael L. Sensor, Esquire terminated. (deBruin, David)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #435 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by IMO Industries Inc., Party IMO Industries Inc. (individually and ) terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/22/2016. (nmfn)
January 21, 2016 Filing 435 STIPULATION of Dismissal between the parties with prejudice by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ). (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 1/21/2016 (lih).
November 23, 2015 Filing 434 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Sarah A. Fruehauf as co-counsel. Reason for request: left the firm. (Della Porta, Armand)
November 19, 2015 Filing 433 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Radiology Materials from Greensboro Imaging by Charles D. Malone (Sensor, Michael)
November 16, 2015 Filing 432 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christopher C. Popper as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer at firm. (Samis, Krista)
September 29, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, the proposed order, formerly filed as D.I. 432, has been deleted. (lih)
August 25, 2015 Party Hopeman Brothers Inc terminated per D.I. #431 . (fms)
August 25, 2015 Filing 431 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Hopeman Brothers, Inc. by Charles D. Malone. (Sensor, Michael) Modified on 8/25/2015 (lih).
July 30, 2015 Filing 430 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Radiology Materials filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.(Sensor, Michael)
July 2, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Oral Argument held on 7/2/2015 re #379 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #381 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #351 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter T. Carroll ( Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
July 1, 2015 Filing 429 NOTICE of IMO Industries, Inc.'s Withdrawal of Its Motion for Summary Judgement by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ) re #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #386 Opening Brief in Support, #424 Reply to Response to Motion (Ford, Eileen)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #426 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher G. Conley, Esq.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/1/2015. (lih)
June 26, 2015 Filing 428 Joint Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allison L. Texter, Esq. regarding Joint Agenda for Oral Arguments. (Martyniak, Shawn) Modified on 6/26/2015 (lih).
June 26, 2015 Filing 427 Letter to Magistrate Judge Fallon from Michael L. Sensor, Esquire regarding requesting permission to be excused from July 1, 2015 oral argument due to vacation. (Sensor, Michael)
June 26, 2015 Filing 426 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher G. Conley, Esq. - filed by CBS Corporation. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #423 Report and Recommendations. Granting #353 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #365 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #366 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #369 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #371 Motion for Summary Judgment ; terminating as moot #399 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/9/2015. (fms)
June 2, 2015 SECOND NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #424 . (lih)
May 28, 2015 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #424 . (lih)
May 27, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The oral order entered on 5/27/2015 has been deleted and re-filed. (lih)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall hear oral argument re #379 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #381 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #351 MOTION for Summary Judgment on 7/1/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel shall collectively have two hours and thirty minutes to present argument with defendants having fifteen minutes each. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: by no later than close of business on 6/29/2015, counsel shall submit a joint agenda that outlines the following items: division of time amongst the parties; order of presentation; amount of time needed by the plaintiff for argument and rebuttal. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/27/2015. (lih)
May 27, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the reply briefs formerly filed at D.I. numbers 424 and 425. Counsel shall re-file the correct version of the reply brief. It is requested that counsel wait to speak with someone in the clerks office prior to re-filing any future documents that may need to be corrected. (lih)
May 26, 2015 Filing 424 REPLY to Response to Motion re #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ford, Eileen) Modified on 5/27/2015 (lih).
May 22, 2015 Filing 423 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- recommending that the court grant #353 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #371 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #365 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/8/2015. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/22/2015. (lih)
May 21, 2015 Filing 422 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Cummins Inc.. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
May 21, 2015 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #417 and #418 . (lih)
May 20, 2015 Flowserve Corporation and Alfa Laval Inc. terminated per D.I. Nos. #419 and #420 . (fms)
May 18, 2015 Filing 421 REPLY to Response to Motion re #379 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Valocchi, Beth)
May 15, 2015 Filing 420 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Reno, Jessica) Modified on 5/18/2015 (lih).
May 15, 2015 Filing 419 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Flowserve Corporation. (Reno, Jessica) Modified on 5/18/2015 (lih).
May 15, 2015 Filing 418 APPENDIX re #417 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 18)(Sensor, Michael)
May 15, 2015 Filing 417 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/26/2015. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Sensor, Michael)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, granting #413 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Caterpillar Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/15/2015. (fms)
May 15, 2015 Filing 416 REPLY to Response to Motion re #381 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Valocchi, Beth)
May 14, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has modified the text of D.I. #415 to link the document to D.I. #377 . (lih)
May 14, 2015 Filing 415 REPLY BRIEF re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cummins Inc.. (Fruehauf, Barbara) Modified on 5/14/2015 (lih).
May 14, 2015 Filing 414 NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone re #365 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Sensor, Michael)
May 13, 2015 Filing 413 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Caterpillar Inc. with Prejudice by Caterpillar Inc.. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 5/14/2015 (lih).
May 13, 2015 Party Riley Power Inc terminated per D.I. #411 . (fms)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting #341 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #343 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #345 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #347 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #349 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #358 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #360 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #363 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #374 Motion for Summary Judgment ; adopting Report and Recommendations re #392 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/13/2015. (fms)
May 13, 2015 Filing 411 STIPULATION of Dismissal Between Defendant Riley Power Inc. and Plaintiffs by Riley Power Inc.. (Doner, Joel) Modified on 5/14/2015 (lih).
May 12, 2015 Filing 410 Letter from Daniel P Daly regarding Order of May 8, 2015 - re #405 Order Setting Briefing Schedule. (Daly, Daniel)
May 12, 2015 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #407 and #408 . (lih)
May 11, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has modified the text of D.I. #409 to link the document to D.I. #346 . (lih)
May 11, 2015 Filing 409 REPLY BRIEF re #346 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Riley Power Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R-1, #2 Exhibit R-2)(Doner, Joel) Modified on 5/11/2015 (lih).
May 8, 2015 Filing 408 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #381 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37)(Sensor, Michael)
May 8, 2015 Filing 407 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #379 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 Part 1, #7 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #8 Exhibit 5 Part 3, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40)(Sensor, Michael)
May 8, 2015 Filing 406 REPLY BRIEF re #351 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Unreported Case Law)(Levitsky, Stephanie)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #404 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set Briefing Schedule: re #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Answering Brief due 5/15/2015.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/8/2015. (lih)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER setting briefing schedule re #365 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Answering Brief due 5/14/2015. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/8/2015. (lih)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting #403 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/8/2015. (fms)
May 7, 2015 Filing 404 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment [D.I. 385] to May 15, 2015 - filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 6, 2015 Filing 403 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Valocchi, Beth)
May 5, 2015 Party York International Corporation terminated per D.I. #402 . (fms)
May 5, 2015 Filing 402 STIPULATION of Dismissal by York International Corporation. (Murphy, Peter)
May 5, 2015 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #397 , #398 and #401 . (lih)
May 4, 2015 Filing 401 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/14/2015. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Sensor, Michael) Modified on 5/5/2015 (lih).
May 4, 2015 Filing 400 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Certain Motions for Summary Judgment by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone re #353 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #371 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Sensor, Michael)
May 4, 2015 Filing 399 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiff's failure to oppose summary judgment - filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Martyniak, Shawn)
May 1, 2015 Filing 398 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #346 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/11/2015. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhbit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Sensor, Michael) Modified on 5/4/2015 (lih).
May 1, 2015 Filing 397 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #351 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/11/2015. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2Exhibit 1, #3Exhibit 2, #4Exhibit 3, #5Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13Exhibit 12)(Sensor, Michael) Modified on 5/4/2015 (lih).
May 1, 2015 Filing 396 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Motion to Dismiss All Claims and Cross-Claims due to Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment - filed by Blackmer Pump Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Popper, Christopher)
April 28, 2015 Filing 395 OBJECTION to #387 Report and Recommendations by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Valocchi, Beth)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #394 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Motions for Summary Judgment. Set Briefing Schedule: re #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #383 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Answering Brief due 5/11/2015.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/27/2015. (lih)
April 27, 2015 Filing 394 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Motions for Summary Judgment Filed by Caterpillar, Inc. and IMO Industries, Inc. to May 11, 2015 - filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2015 Filing 393 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Defendant Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss all Claims and Crossclaims - filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ahern, Andrew)
April 24, 2015 Filing 392 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- recommending that the court grant #349 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #363 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #341 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #374 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #345 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #358 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #347 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #360 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #343 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 5/11/2015. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/24/2015. (lih)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #391 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Viad Corp. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/23/2015. (fms)
April 21, 2015 Filing 391 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Viad Corp.(individually and). (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 4/22/2015 (lih).
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting #373 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon ALL CROSS-CLAIMS BASED UPON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS filed by Warren Pumps LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/21/2015. (fms)
April 17, 2015 Set Briefing Schedule: re #379 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #381 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Answering Brief due 5/8/2015. (lih)
April 17, 2015 Set Briefing Schedule: re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Answering Brief due 5/4/2015. (lih)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #388 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND. Set Briefing Schedule: re #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #346 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #351 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #371 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #353 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #365 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Answering Brief due 5/1/2015.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/17/2015. (lih)
April 17, 2015 Filing 389 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to #349 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #363 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #341 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #374 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #345 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #358 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #347 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #360 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #343 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone (Sensor, Michael) Modified on 4/17/2015 (lih).
April 16, 2015 Filing 388 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Motions for Summary Judgment - filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael) Modified on 4/16/2015 (lih).
April 15, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the Stipulation to Extend Time, formerly filed as D.I. 388, due to improper event code being used at the time of filing. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME event code rather than the motion to stay event code. (lih)
April 14, 2015 Filing 387 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- Recommending that the court convert #160 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim into a Motion for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 5/1/2015. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/14/2015. (lih)
April 10, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, D.I. numbers 387-394 have been deleted and will be re-filed at a later time. (lih)
April 9, 2015 Filing 386 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through E)(Ford, Eileen)
April 9, 2015 Filing 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen)
April 9, 2015 Filing 384 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #383 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Caterpillar Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A Through C, #2 Exhibits D Through H)(Ford, Eileen)
April 9, 2015 Filing 383 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen)
April 9, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The main document of D.I. #343 has been replaced with a revised version of the document to correct the case caption. (lih)
April 8, 2015 THIRD NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #345 and #347 . (lih)
April 8, 2015 SECOND NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #377 and one copy of D.I. #378 . (lih)
April 7, 2015 Filing 382 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #381 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/24/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C1, #4 Exhibit C2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Martyniak, Shawn)
April 7, 2015 Filing 381 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Martyniak, Shawn)
April 7, 2015 Filing 380 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #379 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/24/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit J1, #12 Exhibit J2, #13 Exhibit J3, #14 Exhibit J4, #15 Exhibit J5, #16 Exhibit J6, #17 Exhibit J7, #18 Exhibit J8)(Martyniak, Shawn)
April 7, 2015 Filing 379 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Martyniak, Shawn)
April 7, 2015 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #377 and #378 . (lih)
April 7, 2015 SECOND NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #345 , #347 , #353 , and #365 . (lih)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #376 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/6/2015. (lih)
April 3, 2015 Filing 378 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cummins Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fruehauf, Barbara)
April 3, 2015 Filing 377 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Cummins Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Fruehauf, Barbara)
April 2, 2015 Filing 376 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to FILE motion for summary judgment to April 3, 2015 - filed by Cummins Inc.. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #356 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by McNally Industries LLC, #355 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by FMC Corporation, #357 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/2/2015. (fms)
April 1, 2015 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #341 , #342 , #343 , #344 , #345 , #347 , #351 , #352 , #353 , #358 , #360 , #361 , #362 , #363 , #364 , #365 , #369 and #370 . (lih)
April 1, 2015 Filing 375 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #374 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fruehauf, Barbara)
April 1, 2015 Filing 374 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Fruehauf, Barbara)
April 1, 2015 Filing 373 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon ALL CROSS-CLAIMS BASED UPON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS - filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
April 1, 2015 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #353 and #365 . (lih)
April 1, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted and attached the certificates of service, formerly filed as D.I. numbers 373 and 374, to the appropriate motions. It is requested that counsel file all certificates of service as an attachment to the document that they are filing and not as a separate docket entry. (lih)
April 1, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the opening brief formerly filed as D.I. 373 due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the appropriate event code and not the motion for summary judgment event code. Counsel is also advised that an opening brief must be preceded with a motion. (lih)
March 31, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, the letter regarding courtesy copies, formerly filed as D.I. 373, has been removed from the docket. (lih)
March 31, 2015 Filing 372 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #371 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Velan Valve Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(Bradley, Paul)
March 31, 2015 Filing 371 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Bradley, Paul)
March 31, 2015 Filing 370 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #369 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ingersoll Rand Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Tyler, Jessica)
March 31, 2015 Filing 369 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Ingersoll Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2015: #2 Certificate of Service) (lih).
March 31, 2015 Filing 368 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #365 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pfizer Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Daly, Daniel)
March 31, 2015 Filing 367 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #366 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Co..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Martyniak, Shawn)
March 31, 2015 Filing 366 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Martyniak, Shawn)
March 31, 2015 Filing 365 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Daly, Daniel)
March 31, 2015 Filing 364 MEMORANDUM in Support re #363 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Trane US Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Tyler, Jessica)
March 31, 2015 Filing 363 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Trane US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2015: #2 Certificate of Service) (lih).
March 31, 2015 Filing 362 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #358 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Armstrong International Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Ranieri, Robert) Modified on 3/31/2015 (lih).
March 31, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the motion for summary judgment formerly filed as D.I. 362 due to document already being filed on the docket as D.I. #358 . (lih)
March 31, 2015 Filing 361 MEMORANDUM in Support re #360 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ahern, Andrew)
March 31, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the opening brief formerly filed as D.I. 359 due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the appropriate event code and not the motion to dismiss event code. Counsel is also advised that an opening brief must be preceded with a motion. (lih)
March 31, 2015 Filing 360 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ahern, Andrew)
March 31, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has removed the opening brief attached to D.I. #358 due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document separately using the appropriate event code. (lih)
March 31, 2015 Filing 358 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Armstrong International Inc.. (Attachments: #2 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ranieri, Robert) Modified on 3/31/2015 (lih).
March 31, 2015 Filing 357 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. (Daly, Daniel)
March 31, 2015 Filing 356 STIPULATION of Dismissal by McNally Industries LLC. (Daly, Daniel)
March 31, 2015 Filing 355 STIPULATION of Dismissal by FMC Corporation. (Daly, Daniel)
March 31, 2015 Filing 354 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #353 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Zurn Industries LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Daly, Daniel)
March 31, 2015 Filing 353 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Zurn Industries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Daly, Daniel)
March 31, 2015 Filing 352 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #351 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Levitsky, Stephanie)
March 31, 2015 Filing 351 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Levitsky, Stephanie)
March 31, 2015 Filing 350 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #349 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Flowserve US Inc. Solely as Successor to Edward Valves, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Preston, Willard)
March 31, 2015 Filing 349 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Flowserve US Inc. Solely as Successor to Edward Valves, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Preston, Willard)
March 31, 2015 Filing 348 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #346 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Riley Power Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Doner, Joel)
March 31, 2015 Filing 347 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Nash Engineering Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Thompson, Eric)
March 31, 2015 Filing 346 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Riley Power Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Doner, Joel)
March 31, 2015 Filing 345 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Atwood & Morrill Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Thompson, Eric)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #340 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME, #336 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME, #337 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/30/2015. (lih)
March 31, 2015 Filing 344 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #343 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Blackmer Pump Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Popper, Christopher)
March 31, 2015 Filing 343 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Blackmer Pump Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed form of Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Popper, Christopher) (Main Document 343 replaced on 4/9/2015) (lih).
March 31, 2015 Filing 342 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #341 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Powell Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/17/2015. (Seelaus, Anne)
March 31, 2015 Filing 341 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Seelaus, Anne)
March 30, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of counsel, pdf of D.I. #336 has been replaced with a revised version of the document. (lih)
March 30, 2015 Filing 340 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's motion for summary judgment, Plaintiff's opposition, and Defendant's reply to 04/07/2015, 04/21/15, 04/28/15 - filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Martyniak, Shawn)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #339 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by John Crane Inc., John Crane Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/27/2015. (fms)
March 27, 2015 Filing 339 STIPULATION of Dismissal of John Crane Inc. by John Crane Inc.. (Parshall, Jonathan) Modified on 3/27/2015 (lih).
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #338 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Warren Pumps LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/26/2015. (fms)
March 25, 2015 Filing 338 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Warren Pumps, LLC by Warren Pumps LLC. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 3/26/2015 (lih).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 337 STIPULATION and Order For Extension of Due Date For IMO Industries, Inc. To File Case Dispositive Motions re #186 Proposed Order by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ). (Ford, Eileen)
March 24, 2015 Filing 336 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's Response, and Defendant's Reply to April 7, 2015, April 21, 2015, and April 28, 2015 - filed by CBS Corporation. (Martyniak, Shawn) (Main Document 336 replaced on 3/30/2015) (lih).
March 18, 2015 Filing 335 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (along with Verification); Requests for Production; and Request for Admission re #321 Notice of Service filed by Caterpillar Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #334 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cleaver-Brooks Inc., Cleaver-Brooks terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/17/2015. (fms)
March 16, 2015 Filing 334 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cleaver-Brooks Inc.. (Levitsky, Stephanie)
March 16, 2015 Filing 333 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Verification of Riley Power Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission re #329 Notice of Service filed by Riley Power Inc..(Doner, Joel)
March 9, 2015 Filing 332 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.'s (incorrectly sued, individually and as successor-in-interest to DeLaval Turbine Inc. and as successor-in-interest to C.H. Wheeler Manufacturing Company) Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (along with Verification); Requests for Production; and Request for Admission re #321 Notice of Service filed by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ).(Ford, Eileen)
March 9, 2015 Filing 331 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Crane Co.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission re #321 Notice of Service filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
March 9, 2015 Filing 330 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections, Answers and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc..(Nolte, R.)
March 9, 2015 Filing 329 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission filed by Riley Power Inc..(Doner, Joel)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #328 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Request for Production and Request for Admissions to 3/16/2015. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/9/2015. (lih)
March 6, 2015 Filing 328 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Request for Production and Request for Admissions to March 16, 2015 - filed by Cleaver-Brooks Inc.. (Levitsky, Stephanie)
March 6, 2015 Filing 327 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission filed by Velan Valve Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #323 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For Caterpillar Inc. To Respond and/or Object To Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Request For Production & Request For Admission To 03/18/15 and Extension of Case Dispositive Motions Due Date to 04/09/15. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/6/2015. (lih)
March 6, 2015 Filing 326 NOTICE of Ingersoll Rand Company's Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Ingersoll Rand Company (Tyler, Jessica)
March 6, 2015 Filing 325 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's responses to Plaintiff's interrogatories, requests for production, and requests for admission re #321 Notice of Service filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Martyniak, Shawn)
March 6, 2015 Filing 324 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's responses to Plaintiff's interrogatories, requests for production, and requests for admission re #321 Notice of Service filed by CBS Corporation.(Martyniak, Shawn)
March 6, 2015 Filing 323 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For Caterpillar Inc. To Respond and/or Object To Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Request For Production & Request For Admission To 03/18/15 and Extension of Case Dispositive Motions Due Date to 04/09/15 - filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ford, Eileen)
March 6, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to request of counsel, the stipulations previously filed at D.I. numbers 323 and 324 have been deleted. (lih)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Denying as moot #318 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the completion of its Initial Witness and Exhibit List to an open-ended date pending resolution with Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/2/2015. (lih)
March 2, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 3/2/2015. (Court Reporter H. Triozzi (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
February 27, 2015 Filing 322 Joint STATUS REPORT by Crane Co.. (Martyniak, Shawn)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the joint status report that is due in this matter on 2/27/2015 shall be filed by no later than noon on 2/27/2015. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/25/2015. (lih)
February 6, 2015 Filing 321 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Discovery Requests Directed to Defendants filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.(Sensor, Michael)
January 28, 2015 Filing 320 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Blackmer Pump Company: Entry of appearance of attorney Christopher C. Popper. Attorney Penelope B. O'Connell, Esq. terminated. (Popper, Christopher)
January 26, 2015 Filing 319 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Alfa Laval Inc..(Reno, Jessica)
January 23, 2015 Filing 318 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the completion of its Initial Witness and Exhibit List to an open-ended date pending resolution with Plaintiffs - filed by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Reno, Jessica)
January 23, 2015 Filing 317 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Flowserve Corporation's Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Flowserve Corporation.(Reno, Jessica)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #308 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Deadline for Flowserve Corporation's Initial Witness and Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/13/2015. (lih)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #311 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of Alfa Laval Inc.'s deadline to complete its Initial Witness and Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/13/2015. (lih)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #305 Joint STIPULATION and Order to set briefing to establish applicable substantive law. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/12/2015. (lih)
January 9, 2015 Filing 316 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC's Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.(Daly, Daniel)
January 9, 2015 Filing 315 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant McNally Industries, Inc.'s Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by McNally Industries LLC.(Daly, Daniel)
January 9, 2015 Filing 314 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump and Peerless Pump businesses Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
January 9, 2015 Filing 313 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List filed by Velan Valve Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
January 9, 2015 Filing 312 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Pfizer Inc..(Daly, Daniel)
January 9, 2015 Filing 311 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of Alfa Laval Inc.'s deadline to complete its Initial Witness and Exhibit List to be extended to January 23, 2015 - filed by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Reno, Jessica)
January 9, 2015 Filing 310 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service of Individual Witness and Exhibit List filed by Flowserve US Inc..(Preston, Willard)
January 9, 2015 Filing 309 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant York International Corporation's Lay and Expert Witness List and Exhibit List filed by York International Corporation.(Murphy, Peter)
January 9, 2015 Filing 308 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Deadline for Flowserve Corporation's Initial Witness and Exhibit List to January 23, 2015 - filed by Flowserve Corporation. (Reno, Jessica)
January 9, 2015 Filing 307 NOTICE OF SERVICE of WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Fruehauf, Barbara)
January 9, 2015 Filing 306 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Blackmer Pump Company's Designation of Fact and Expert Witnesses and Exhibit List filed by Blackmer Pump Company.(O'Connell, Penelope)
January 9, 2015 Filing 305 Joint STIPULATION and Order to set briefing to establish applicable substantive law by Crane Co.. (Martyniak, Shawn)
January 9, 2015 Filing 304 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Any and all pleadings/discovery on behalf of Huntington Ingalls Industries to resolution of Motion to Dismiss - filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Martyniak, Shawn)
January 9, 2015 Filing 303 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc..(Ahern, Andrew)
January 9, 2015 Filing 302 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zurn Industries LLC's Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Zurn Industries LLC.(Daly, Daniel)
January 9, 2015 Filing 301 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness and Exhibit list filed by John Crane Inc..(Parshall, Jonathan)
January 9, 2015 Filing 300 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Riley Power Inc..(Doner, Joel)
January 9, 2015 Filing 299 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by William Powell Company.(Seelaus, Anne)
January 9, 2015 Filing 298 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Armstrong International, Inc.'s Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Armstrong International Inc..(Ranieri, Robert)
January 9, 2015 Filing 297 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Warren Pumps LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
January 9, 2015 Filing 296 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Ingersoll Rand Company filed by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Tyler, Jessica)
January 9, 2015 Filing 295 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Trane U.S., Inc. filed by Trane US Inc..(Tyler, Jessica)
January 9, 2015 Filing 294 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.'s Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ).(Ford, Eileen)
January 9, 2015 Filing 293 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Viad Corp's Initial Witness And Exhibit Lists filed by Viad Corp.(individually and).(Ford, Eileen)
January 9, 2015 Filing 292 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit filed by Atwood & Morrill Company Inc..(Thompson, Eric)
January 9, 2015 Filing 291 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit filed by Nash Engineering Company.(Thompson, Eric)
January 9, 2015 Filing 290 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Caterpillar Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
January 9, 2015 Filing 289 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Hopeman Brothers, Inc.'s Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc..(Nolte, R.)
January 9, 2015 Filing 288 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.'s Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Cleaver-Brooks Inc..(Nolte, R.)
January 9, 2015 Filing 287 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List filed by Crane Co..(Skiles, Nicholas)
January 9, 2015 Filing 286 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List filed by CBS Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
January 9, 2015 Filing 285 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #284 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Union Carbide Corporation. Union Carbide Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/17/2015. (fms)
December 15, 2014 Filing 284 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Union Carbide Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #283 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel Habeeb. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/8/2014. (lih)
December 8, 2014 Filing 283 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel Habeeb - filed by Warren Pumps LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Della Porta, Armand)
December 5, 2014 Filing 282 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shafter Dunham on December 9, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Atwood & Morrill Company Inc..(Thompson, Eric)
December 5, 2014 Filing 281 NOTICE of Vacation of Deposition of Cecil Dunham on December 9, 2014 by Atwood & Morrill Company Inc. (Thompson, Eric)
December 3, 2014 Filing 280 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Reno on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (Reno, Jessica)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #279 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel D. Habeeb, Esq.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/3/2014. (lih)
December 2, 2014 Filing 279 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samuel D. Habeeb, Esquire - filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Bradley, Paul)
December 2, 2014 Filing 278 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cecil and Shafter Dunham on December 9, 2014 filed by Atwood & Morrill Company Inc..(Thompson, Eric)
November 24, 2014 Filing 277 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Reno on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Reno, Jessica)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the status teleconference set in this matter for 3/11/2015 is RESCHEDULED to 3/2/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/12/2014. (lih)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #275 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Honeywell International Inc. Honeywell International Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/26/2014. (fms)
September 26, 2014 Filing 276 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Joint Witness and Exhibit List filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Martyniak, Shawn)
September 25, 2014 Filing 275 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Honeywell International Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
September 3, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Witness & Exhibit Lists filed by Charles D. Malone.(Sensor, Michael)
September 2, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted D.I. numbers 274 and 275 pursuant to L.R. 5.4 (b) Service Without Filing. (lih)
August 20, 2014 Filing 273 REPLY to Response to Motion re #160 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Valocchi, Beth)
August 13, 2014 Filing 272 RESPONSE in Non-Opposition to to #160 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sensor, Michael) Modified on 8/13/2014 (lih).
August 6, 2014 Filing 271 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pathology Materials filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.(Sensor, Michael)
July 31, 2014 Filing 270 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allison L. Texter, Esq. regarding Defendants' response to Plaintiff's motion to withdraw - re #268 Notice (Other). (Martyniak, Shawn)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Setting Briefing Schedule: re #160 MOTION to Dismiss. On or before 8/13/2014, plaintiffs shall file their answering brief re #160 Motion to Dismiss. Should plaintiffs fail to file their answering brief, the Court shall rule on the papers submitted. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/30/2014. (lih)
July 30, 2014 Filing 269 NOTICE OF SERVICE of FRCP 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by William Powell Company.(Seelaus, Anne)
July 28, 2014 Filing 268 NOTICE of Withdrawal re #184 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint (Sensor, Michael) Modified on 7/28/2014 (lih).
July 28, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted D.I. numbers 268 and 269 due to documents being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the answer to the amended complaint using the ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT event code. Counsel is also advised to re-file the notice of withdrawal of motion using the NOTICE OF WITHDRAW event code rather than the motion event code. (lih)
July 24, 2014 Filing 267 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Radiology Materials filed by Charles D. Malone.(Sensor, Michael)
July 23, 2014 Filing 266 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by William Powell Company.(Seelaus, Anne) Modified on 7/23/2014 (lih).
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #264 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set Briefing Schedule: re #184 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. (Reply Brief due 7/28/2014.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/21/2014. (lih)
July 18, 2014 Filing 265 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with jury demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cleaver-Brooks Inc..(Levitsky, Stephanie) Modified on 7/21/2014 (lih).
July 18, 2014 Filing 264 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME - filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael) Modified on 7/21/2014 (lih).
July 18, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted stipulation to extend time (formerly D.I. 264) due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME event code rather than using the motion event code. (lih)
July 11, 2014 Filing 263 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Ingalls Shipbuilding, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Valocchi, Beth)
July 11, 2014 Filing 262 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Huntington Ingalls Incorporated for Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Valocchi, Beth)
July 11, 2014 Filing 261 RESPONSE to Motion re #184 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 7/11/2014 (lih).
July 10, 2014 Filing 260 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Trane US Inc. filed by Trane US Inc.. (Tyler, Jessica)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #249 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set Briefing Schedule: re #184 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. (Answering Brief due 7/11/2014., Reply Brief due 7/21/2014.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/9/2014. (lih)
July 10, 2014 Filing 259 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries, Inc. for Warren Pumps LLC filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
July 10, 2014 Filing 258 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll Rand Company filed by Ingersoll Rand Company. (Tyler, Jessica)
July 9, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted D.I. 256 pursuant to L.R. 5.4 (b) Service Without Filing. (lih)
July 9, 2014 Filing 257 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Trane US Inc..(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 7/9/2014 (lih).
July 9, 2014 Filing 255 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by William Powell Company. (Seelaus, Anne)
July 9, 2014 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE re #246 : In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action, corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (lih)
July 9, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted D.I. 240 pursuant to L.R. 5.4 (b) Service Without Filing. Counsel is advised that when filing a notice of service regarding discovery documents, the actual discovery documents are not to be filed along with a notice of service re #244 . (lih)
July 9, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted D.I. 234 pursuant to L.R. 5.4 (b) Service Without Filing. (lih)
July 9, 2014 Filing 254 ANSWER #8 Amended Complaint with jury demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants against All Defendants by Warren Pumps LLC.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 7/9/2014 (lih).
July 9, 2014 Filing 253 ANSWER #8 Amended Complaint with jury demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 7/9/2014 (lih).
July 8, 2014 Filing 252 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Armstrong International Inc.. (Ranieri, Robert)
July 8, 2014 Filing 251 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Employment Records filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.(Sensor, Michael)
July 8, 2014 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Della Porta, Armand)
July 7, 2014 Filing 249 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME briefing deadlines re #184 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 7/9/2014 (lih).
July 3, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure of Defendant Caterpillar Inc. filed by Caterpillar Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
July 3, 2014 Filing 247 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure of Defendant VIAD Corporation filed by Viad Corp.(individually and).(Ford, Eileen)
July 3, 2014 Filing 246 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Flowserve US Inc. Solely as Successor to Edward Valves, Inc.. (Preston, Willard)
July 3, 2014 Filing 245 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Flowserve US Inc. Solely as Successor to Edward Valves, Inc..(Preston, Willard)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #243 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Genuine Parts Company. Genuine Parts Company terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/3/2014. (fms)
July 2, 2014 Filing 244 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant York International Corporation's Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by York International Corporation.(Murphy, Peter) Modified on 7/9/2014 (lih).
July 2, 2014 Filing 243 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Genuine Parts Company. (Bradley, Paul)
July 2, 2014 Filing 242 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure of Defendant Flowserve Corporation filed by Flowserve Corporation.(Barillo, Nathan)
July 1, 2014 Filing 241 NOTICE of of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Daugherty, Sally)
July 1, 2014 Filing 239 NOTICE OF SERVICE of FRCP 26 (a) (1) Initial Disclosure filed by General Electric Company.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 7/9/2014 (lih).
July 1, 2014 Filing 238 NOTICE OF SERVICE of FRCP 26 (a) (1) Initial Disclosure filed by CBS Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 7/9/2014 (lih).
July 1, 2014 Filing 237 NOTICE OF SERVICE of FRCP 26 (a) (1) Initial Disclosure filed by Union Carbide Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 7/9/2014 (lih).
July 1, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE OF SERVICE of FRCP 26 (a) (1) Initial Disclosure re SO ORDERED, Scheduling Order,, filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
July 1, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE OF SERVICE of FRCP 26 (a) (1) Initial Disclosure filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
July 1, 2014 Filing 233 NOTICE of Service of Initial Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by John Crane Inc. (Parshall, Jonathan)
July 1, 2014 Filing 232 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(A)(1) disclosure of Defendant Armstrong International Inc. filed by Armstrong International Inc..(Ranieri, Robert)
July 1, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Riley Power Inc..(Doner, Joel)
June 30, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Alfa Laval Inc..(Smiertka, Stephanie)
June 30, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
June 30, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by McNally Industries LLC.(Daly, Daniel)
June 30, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.(Daly, Daniel)
June 30, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Genuine Parts Company.(Bradley, Paul)
June 30, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Pfizer Inc..(Daly, Daniel)
June 30, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Zurn Industries LLC.(Daly, Daniel)
June 30, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Velan Valve Corporation.(Bradley, Paul)
June 30, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc..(Levitsky, Stephanie)
June 30, 2014 Filing 221 NOTICE OF SERVICE of of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure filed by Cleaver-Brooks Inc..(Levitsky, Stephanie)
June 30, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures filed by Nash Engineering Company.(Thompson, Eric)
June 30, 2014 Filing 219 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures filed by Atwood & Morrill Company Inc..(Thompson, Eric)
June 30, 2014 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Levitsky on behalf of Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Levitsky, Stephanie)
June 30, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Levitsky on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks Inc. (Levitsky, Stephanie)
June 30, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted D.I. numbers 213 and 214 pursuant to L.R. 5.4 (b) Service Without Filing. (lih)
June 30, 2014 Filing 216 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pfizer Inc..(Daly, Daniel)
June 30, 2014 Filing 215 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Zurn Industries LLC.(Daly, Daniel)
June 30, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.(Sensor, Michael)
June 30, 2014 Filing 211 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Blackmer Pump Company.(O'Connell, Penelope) Modified on 6/30/2014 (lih).
June 30, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notice of service filed previously as D.I. 211 due to improper event code being used during filing. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the NOTICE OF SERVICE event code rather than the initial disclosures event code. (lih)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #210 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pneumo Abex LLC, Pneumo Abex LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/27/2014. (fms)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #207 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ford Motor Company. Ford Motor Company terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/27/2014. (fms)
June 27, 2014 Filing 210 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Reese, C.)
June 27, 2014 Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Willard F. Preston, III on behalf of Flowserve US Inc. Solely as Successor to Edward Valves, Inc. (Preston, Willard)
June 27, 2014 Filing 208 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Flowserve US Inc. Solely as Successor to Edward Valves, Inc..(Preston, Willard)
June 26, 2014 Filing 207 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #206 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Travis Martin, Esq. #200 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frederick R. McGowen, Esq.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/26/2014. (lih)
June 26, 2014 Filing 206 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Travis Martin - filed by Trane US Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Della Porta, Armand)
June 26, 2014 Filing 205 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Honeywell International Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
June 25, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc..(Ahern, Andrew)
June 25, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk deleted notice of filed (formerly D.I. 204) due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the NOTICE OF SERVICE event code. (lih)
June 25, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Blackmer Pump Company.(O'Connell, Penelope)
June 25, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Amaryah K. Bocchino on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Bocchino, Amaryah)
June 25, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Cincilla on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Cincilla, Jason)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #186 Proposed Scheduling Order. Set SCHEDULING ORDER Deadlines: ( Joinder of Parties due by 8/25/2014., Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2014., Discovery due by 3/13/2015., Status Report due by 2/27/2015., A Status Conference is set for 3/11/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon, Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2015.) (PLEASE REFER TO STIPULATION FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/24/2014. (lih)
June 24, 2014 Filing 200 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frederick R. McGowen, Esq. - filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
June 24, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ingalls Shipyard records filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.(Sensor, Michael)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #196 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael T. Hamilton, Esq., #195 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua H. Bennett, Esq.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/23/2014. (lih)
June 23, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. #196 has been replaced with a revised version of the document to list each defendant being represented. (lih)
June 23, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Scheduling Conference held on 6/23/2014. (Court Reporter H. Triozzi (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
June 23, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the pro hac motion for Michael Hamilton (formerly D.I. 199) due to document being present on the docket at D.I. #196 . (lih)
June 20, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the second pro hac motion for Michael Hamilton (formerly D.I. 197) due to document being present on the docket at D.I. #196 . (lih)
June 20, 2014 Filing 198 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with jury demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Hopeman Brothers Inc..(Nolte, R.) Modified on 6/20/2014 (lih).
June 20, 2014 Filing 196 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael T. Hamilton, Esquire - filed by Viad Corp.(individually and). Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen) (Main Document 196 replaced on 6/23/2014) (lih).
June 20, 2014 Filing 195 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua H. Bennett, Esquire - filed by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ). Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen)
June 20, 2014 Filing 194 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cummins Inc.. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
June 20, 2014 Filing 193 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
June 20, 2014 Filing 192 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cummins Inc..(Fruehauf, Barbara) Modified on 6/20/2014 (lih).
June 20, 2014 Filing 191 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Fruehauf, Barbara) Modified on 6/20/2014 (lih).
June 20, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Charles Malone on 6/25/14 filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.(Sensor, Michael)
June 19, 2014 Filing 189 NOTICE to Take Deposition of CHARLES MALONE on 6/25/14 filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
June 19, 2014 Filing 188 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Allison L. Texter regarding Intent to oppose Plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint - re #184 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. (Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 6/20/2014 (lih).
June 19, 2014 Filing 187 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Michael L. Sensor, Esquire regarding Teleconference Information. (Sensor, Michael) Modified on 6/19/2014 (lih).
June 18, 2014 Set Answering Brief Deadline re #184 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/7/2014. (lih)
June 18, 2014 Filing 186 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order re #185 Letter by Crane Co.. (Martyniak, Shawn) Modified on 6/19/2014 (lih).
June 18, 2014 Filing 185 Letter to Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Shawn E. Martyniak regarding Joint Proposed Scheduling. (Martyniak, Shawn) Modified on 6/19/2014 (lih).
June 18, 2014 Filing 184 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint- filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Amended Complaint Redlined Version of Amended Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint Amended Complaint)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Sensor, Michael) Modified on 6/18/2014 (lih).
June 18, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Discovery Responses filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.(Sensor, Michael)
June 18, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Michelle Smith on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Smith, Stephanie)
June 17, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE to Take Deposition of CHARLES MALONE on JUNE 26, 2014 filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
June 12, 2014 Filing 180 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Daugherty, Sally)
June 12, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally J. Daugherty on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Daugherty, Sally)
June 12, 2014 Filing 178 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Daugherty, Sally) Modified on 6/12/2014 (lih).
June 10, 2014 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Kai Seelaus on behalf of William Powell Company (Seelaus, Anne)
May 29, 2014 Filing 176 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Atwood & Morrill Company Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, CBS Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., Cleaver-Brooks Inc., Crane Co., Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc., Cummins Inc., FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, John Crane Inc., McNally Industries LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Nash Engineering Company, Pfizer Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Riley Power Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Trane US Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc., William Powell Company, York International Corporation, Zurn Industries LLC by Armstrong International Inc..(Ranieri, Robert) Modified on 5/30/2014 (lih).
May 27, 2014 Filing 175 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with jury demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Alfa Laval Inc..(Smiertka, Stephanie) Modified on 5/27/2014 (lih).
May 27, 2014 Filing 174 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Blackmer Pump Company on 5/12/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 173 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on The William Powell Company on May 2, 2014, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 172 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. on May 1, 2014, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 171 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on Viad Corporation on May 1, 2014, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 170 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on The Nash Engineering Company on May 1, 2014, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 169 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on Hopeman Brothers, Inc. on May 1, 2014, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 168 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on Flowserve Corporation on April 29, 2014, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 167 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on Cummins, Inc. on May 1, 2014, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 166 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. on May 2, 2014, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone, McNally Industries LLC(individually and ). (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 165 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on Armstrong International, Inc. on May 1, 2014, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 164 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on Alfa Laval, Inc. on May 1, 2014, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 163 AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on Air & Liquid Systems Corporation on May 5, 2014, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 162 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Valocchi, Beth)
May 21, 2014 Filing 161 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #160 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/9/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Valocchi, Beth)
May 21, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the memorandum in support and exhibits attached to D.I. #106 due to documents being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the documents separately using the OPENING BRIEF event code. (lih)
May 21, 2014 Filing 160 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Attachments: #2 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 5/21/2014 (lih).
May 20, 2014 Filing 159 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc..(Ahern, Andrew) Modified on 5/21/2014 (lih).
May 20, 2014 Filing 158 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cleaver-Brooks Inc..(Harmon, Mary Kathryn) Modified on 5/21/2014 (lih).
May 19, 2014 Filing 157 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings, Inc., for Cleaver-Brooks Inc. filed by Cleaver-Brooks Inc.. (Nolte, R.)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #156 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc. answer due 5/21/2014. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/15/2014. (lih)
May 14, 2014 Filing 156 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME answer, move against or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint to May 21, 2014 - filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Valocchi, Beth)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on Monday, June 23, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than June 18, 2014. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/13/2014. (lih)
May 9, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The text of D.I. #153 has been modified to link the filing to the complaint. Counsel is advised to link the documents at the time of filing. (lih)
May 9, 2014 Filing 155 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Bradley, Paul)
May 9, 2014 Filing 154 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Genuine Parts Company.(Bradley, Paul) Modified on 5/9/2014 (lih).
May 9, 2014 Filing 153 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by McNally Industries LLC.(Daly, Daniel) Modified on 5/9/2014 (lih).
May 9, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted Answer to Complaint (formerly D.I. 151) due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the document using the ANSWER TO COMPLAINT event code rather than the answer to counterclaim event code. (lih)
May 8, 2014 Filing 152 STATUS REPORT by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael) Modified on 5/9/2014 (lih).
May 8, 2014 Filing 150 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 5/8/2014 (lih).
May 8, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted Answer to Complaint (formerly D.I. 147) due to document being an incomplete filing. Counsel is advised that the filing was a one page version of the signature page of the filing. It is requested that counsel re-file the correct document. It is further requested that counsel provide an updated telephone number to the clerks office. (lih)
May 8, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has modified the text of D.I. #8 to link the filing to the amended complaint. Counsel is advised to link documents in the future. (lih)
May 7, 2014 Filing 149 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holdings Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc. filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc.. (Ahern, Andrew)
May 7, 2014 Filing 148 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc..(Ahern, Andrew) Modified on 5/8/2014 (lih).
May 7, 2014 Filing 146 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.(Daly, Daniel) Modified on 5/8/2014 (lih).
May 7, 2014 Filing 145 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel) Modified on 5/8/2014 (lih).
May 7, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Ahern, III on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc. (Ahern, Andrew)
May 7, 2014 Filing 143 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crane Co.. (Skiles, Nicholas)
May 7, 2014 Filing 142 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Crane Co..(Skiles, Nicholas) Modified on 5/8/2014 (lih).
May 7, 2014 Filing 141 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 5/8/2014 (lih).
May 7, 2014 Filing 140 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Flowserve Corporation.(Barillo, Nathan) Modified on 5/8/2014 (lih).
May 6, 2014 Filing 139 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Viad Corp.(individually and). (Ford, Eileen)
May 6, 2014 Filing 138 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Viad Corp.(individually and).(Ford, Eileen) Modified on 5/7/2014 (lih).
May 6, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of Viad Corp.(individually and) (Ford, Eileen)
May 6, 2014 Filing 136 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Riley Power Inc..(Doner, Joel) Modified on 5/6/2014 (lih).
May 5, 2014 Filing 135 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Zurn Industries LLC served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 134 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. York International Corporation served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 133 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Warren Pumps LLC served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 132 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Velan Valve Corporation served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 131 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Union Carbide Corporation served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 130 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Trane US Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 129 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 128 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Riley Power Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 127 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Pneumo Abex LLC served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 126 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Pfizer Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 125 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 124 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. McNally Industries LLC served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 123 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. John Crane Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 122 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Ingersoll Rand Company served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 121 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. IMO Industries Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 120 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 119 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Honeywell International Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 118 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Genuine Parts Company served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 117 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. General Electric Company served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 116 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 115 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Ford Motor Company served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 114 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. FMC Corporation served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 113 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Flowserve US Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 112 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Crane Co. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 111 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Cleaver-Brooks Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 110 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. CBS Corporation served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 109 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Caterpillar Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
May 5, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Ann Fox on behalf of Genuine Parts Company (Fox, Stephanie)
May 5, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of Genuine Parts Company (Bradley, Paul)
May 2, 2014 Filing 106 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for Alfa Laval Inc. filed by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Smiertka, Stephanie)
May 2, 2014 Filing 105 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by General Electric Company.(Valocchi, Beth)
May 1, 2014 Filing 104 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Hopeman Brothers Inc.. (Nolte, R.)
May 1, 2014 Filing 103 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with jury demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Hopeman Brothers Inc..(Nolte, R.) Modified on 5/2/2014 (lih).
May 1, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Stokes Nolte on behalf of Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Nolte, R.)
April 30, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Ranieri on behalf of Armstrong International Inc. (Ranieri, Robert)
April 30, 2014 Filing 100 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Armstrong International Inc..(Ranieri, Robert) Modified on 4/30/2014 (lih).
April 29, 2014 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE re #99 : In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action, corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (lih)
April 29, 2014 Filing 99 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
April 29, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Partick Daly on behalf of McNally Industries LLC (Daly, Daniel)
April 29, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Partick Daly on behalf of Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Daly, Daniel)
April 29, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Partick Daly on behalf of FMC Corporation (Daly, Daniel)
April 29, 2014 Filing 95 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pfizer Inc..(Daly, Daniel) Modified on 4/29/2014 (lih).
April 29, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Partick Daly on behalf of Pfizer Inc. (Daly, Daniel)
April 29, 2014 Filing 93 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Zurn Industries LLC.(Daly, Daniel) Modified on 4/29/2014 (lih).
April 29, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Partick Daly on behalf of Zurn Industries LLC (Daly, Daniel)
April 29, 2014 Filing 91 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by John Crane Inc..(Parshall, Jonathan) Modified on 4/29/2014 (lih).
April 29, 2014 Filing 90 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dover Corporation for Blackmer Pump Company filed by Blackmer Pump Company. (O'Connell, Penelope)
April 29, 2014 Filing 89 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Blackmer Pump Company.(O'Connell, Penelope) Modified on 4/29/2014 (lih).
April 29, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Penelope B. O'Connell on behalf of Blackmer Pump Company (O'Connell, Penelope)
April 28, 2014 Filing 87 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Alfa Laval Inc..(Smiertka, Stephanie) Modified on 4/28/2014 (lih).
April 28, 2014 Filing 86 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle) Modified on 4/28/2014 (lih).
April 25, 2014 Filing 85 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Bradley, Paul) Modified on 4/25/2014 (lih).
April 25, 2014 Filing 84 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate GAMCO Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation filed by CBS Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
April 25, 2014 Filing 83 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CBS Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 4/25/2014 (lih).
April 24, 2014 Filing 82 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Honeywell International Inc. filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
April 24, 2014 Filing 81 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle) Modified on 4/24/2014 (lih).
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #64 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc. answer due 5/14/2014. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/24/2014. (lih)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Set deadline: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 5/8/2014.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/24/2014. (lih)
April 24, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Florax, Joelle)
April 24, 2014 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Weir Valve & Controls USA, Inc. on 4/9/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Viad Corporation on 4/8/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on The William Powell Company on 4/7/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on The Nash Engineering Company on 4/7/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Hopeman Brothers, Inc. on 4/8/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Flowserve Corporation on 4/7/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Cummins, Inc. on 4/7/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Crown Cork & Seal Company on 4/7/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Blackmer Pump Company on 4/7/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Armstrong International, Inc. on 4/7/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Alfa Laval, Inc. on 4/8/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Air & Liquid Systems on 4/8/14, filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Sensor, Michael)
April 23, 2014 Filing 66 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Bradley, Paul)
April 23, 2014 Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Bradley, Paul) Modified on 4/24/2014 (lih).
April 23, 2014 Filing 64 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. to answer, move against or otherwise respond to complaint - filed by Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.. (Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 4/24/2014 (lih).
April 23, 2014 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by York International Corporation.(Murphy, Peter) Modified on 4/24/2014 (lih).
April 23, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Murphy on behalf of York International Corporation (Murphy, Peter)
April 22, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Partick Daly on behalf of Zurn Industries LLC (Daly, Daniel)
April 22, 2014 Filing 60 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Riley Power Inc..(Doner, Joel) Modified on 4/23/2014 (lih).
April 22, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M. Doner on behalf of Riley Power Inc. (Doner, Joel)
April 22, 2014 Filing 58 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate NBC Universal Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capital, Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate ValueVision Media, Inc. for General Electric Company filed by General Electric Company. (Valocchi, Beth)
April 22, 2014 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 4/23/2014 (lih).
April 22, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Crane Co. on 4/22/2014; Genuine Parts Company on 4/22/2014; Trane US Inc. on 4/22/2014. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (cla, )
April 22, 2014 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Armstrong International Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, CBS Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., Cleaver-Brooks Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc., Cummins Inc., FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Honeywell International Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, John Crane Inc., McNally Industries LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Nash Engineering Company, Pfizer Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Riley Power Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc., William Powell Company, York International Corporation, Zurn Industries LLC. (cla, )
April 21, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anne Fruehauf on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Fruehauf, Barbara)
April 21, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anne Fruehauf on behalf of Cummins Inc. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
April 18, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J. Singewald on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
April 17, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Kathryn Hodges Harmon on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks Inc. (Harmon, Mary Kathryn)
April 17, 2014 Filing 52 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries Inc., IMO Industries Inc., IMO Industries Inc., IMO Industries Inc., IMO Industries Inc., IMO Industries Inc., IMO Industries Inc., IMO Industries Inc., IMO Industries Inc. filed by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ). (Ford, Eileen)
April 17, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. filed by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ).(Ford, Eileen)
April 16, 2014 Filing 50 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ).(Ford, Eileen) Modified on 4/21/2014 (lih).
April 16, 2014 Filing 49 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Caterpillar Inc..(Ford, Eileen) Modified on 4/21/2014 (lih).
April 16, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
April 15, 2014 Filing 47 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pneumo Abex LLC.(Reese, C.) Modified on 4/16/2014 (lih).
April 15, 2014 Filing 46 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
April 15, 2014 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 4/15/2014 (lih).
April 15, 2014 Filing 44 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler LLC, Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler Ltd., Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler AG (Switzerland) for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
April 15, 2014 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 4/15/2014 (lih).
April 14, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Robert Kinsley on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Kinsley, Donald)
April 14, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Bradley, Paul)
April 14, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Reese on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Reese, C.)
April 11, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries Inc.(individually and ) (Ford, Eileen)
April 11, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles E. Soechting, Jr for Charles D. Malone added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
April 11, 2014 Filing 38 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Flowserve Corporation served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 37 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. FMC Corporation served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 36 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Ford Motor Company served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 35 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 34 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. General Electric Company served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 33 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc. served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 32 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. IMO Industries Inc. served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 31 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Ingersoll Rand Company served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 30 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. John Crane Inc. served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 29 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Pfizer Inc. served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Riley Power Inc. served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Union Carbide Corporation served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Warren Pumps LLC served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. York International Corporation served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Zurn Industries LLC served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Honeywell International Inc. served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Pneumo Abex LLC served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Velan Valve Corporation served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. McNally Industries LLC served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Cleaver-Brooks Inc. served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. CBS Corporation served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 11, 2014 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. Caterpillar Inc. served on 4/2/2014, answer due 4/23/2014. (Sensor, Michael)
April 10, 2014 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Flowserve Corporation.(Barillo, Nathan) Modified on 4/11/2014 (lih). Modified on 4/11/2014 (lih).
April 10, 2014 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Nash Engineering Company. (Thompson, Eric)
April 10, 2014 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Nash Engineering Company.(Thompson, Eric) Modified on 4/11/2014 (lih). Modified on 4/11/2014 (lih).
April 10, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Scott Thompson on behalf of Nash Engineering Company (Thompson, Eric)
April 10, 2014 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Atwood & Morrill Company Inc.. (Thompson, Eric)
April 10, 2014 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Atwood & Morrill Company Inc..(Thompson, Eric) Modified on 4/11/2014 (lih). Modified on 4/11/2014 (lih).
April 10, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Scott Thompson on behalf of Atwood & Morrill Company Inc. (Thompson, Eric)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles E. Soechting, Jr., Esquire. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/10/2014. (lih)
April 9, 2014 Remark: Trane US Inc. added per amended complaint. (lih)
April 8, 2014 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone.(Sensor, Michael) Modified on 4/9/2014 (lih).
April 8, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the amended complaint (formerly D.I. 6), pursuant to F.R.C.P. 15 (a)(2). Counsel is also advised that when filing an amended complaint, the summons forms are not to be uploaded with the filing. (lih)
April 8, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Charles E. Soechting, Jr., Esquire - filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Charles E. Soechting, Jr., Esquire)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Sensor, Michael)
April 7, 2014 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group PLC for John Crane Inc. filed by John Crane Inc.. (Parshall, Jonathan)
April 7, 2014 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by John Crane Inc..(Parshall, Jonathan) Modified on 4/8/2014 (lih). Modified on 4/11/2014 (lih).
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/2/2014. (nmfn)
April 2, 2014 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 1, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation on 4/1/2014; Alfa Laval Inc. on 4/1/2014; Armstrong International Inc. on 4/1/2014; Blackmer Pump Company on 4/1/2014; CBS Corporation on 4/1/2014; Caterpillar Inc. on 4/1/2014; Cleaver-Brooks Inc. on 4/1/2014; Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc. on 4/1/2014; Cummins Inc. on 4/1/2014; FMC Corporation on 4/1/2014; Flowserve Corporation on 4/1/2014; Flowserve US Inc. on 4/1/2014; Ford Motor Company on 4/1/2014; Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation on 4/1/2014; General Electric Company on 4/1/2014; Honeywell International Inc. on 4/1/2014; Hopeman Brothers Inc. on 4/1/2014; Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc. on 4/1/2014; IMO Industries Inc. on 4/1/2014; Ingersoll Rand Company on 4/1/2014; John Crane Inc. on 4/1/2014; McNally Industries LLC on 4/1/2014; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company on 4/1/2014; Nash Engineering Company on 4/1/2014; Pfizer Inc. on 4/1/2014; Pneumo Abex LLC on 4/1/2014; Riley Power Inc. on 4/1/2014; Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC on 4/1/2014; Union Carbide Corporation on 4/1/2014; Velan Valve Corporation on 4/1/2014; Viad Corp. on 4/1/2014; Warren Pumps LLC on 4/1/2014; Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc. on 4/1/2014; William Powell Company on 4/1/2014; York International Corporation on 4/1/2014; Zurn Industries LLC on 4/1/2014. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (cla, )
April 1, 2014 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cla, )
April 1, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Armstrong International Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, CBS Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., Cleaver-Brooks Inc., Crane Co., Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc., Cummins Inc., FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, John Crane Inc., McNally Industries LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Nash Engineering Company, Pfizer Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Riley Power Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corp., Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc., William Powell Company, York International Corporation, Zurn Industries LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1489431.) - filed by Charles D. Malone, Elizabeth Malone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cla, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Ahern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Shawn Edward Martyniak
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie S. Levitsky
Represented By: R. Stokes Nolte
Represented By: Kate Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Christopher C. Popper
Represented By: Krista M. Reale
Represented By: Penelope B. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Nathan David Barillo
Represented By: Jessica L. Reno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power Inc.
Represented By: Joel M. Doner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Jessica L. Reno
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Eric Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie S. Levitsky
Represented By: R. Stokes Nolte
Represented By: Kate Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Christopher H. Lee
Represented By: C. Scott Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Shawn Edward Martyniak
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: Anne Kai Seelaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Shawn Edward Martyniak
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Donald Robert Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc.
Represented By: Robert Alexander Ranieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPA
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc. Solely as Successor to Edward Valves, Inc.
Represented By: Willard F. Preston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Peter S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sally J. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Company Inc.
Represented By: Eric Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNally Industries LLC
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc.
Represented By: Shawn Edward Martyniak
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries LLC
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Malone
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D. Malone
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Represented By: Charles E. Soechting, Jr.
Represented By: Michael L. Sensor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?