Priceplay.com Inc. v. Facebook Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Priceplay.com Inc.
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00512
Filed: April 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2014 Remark : Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:14-cv-04830, filed 10/30/2014. (rwc)
October 30, 2014 Filing 30 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,050,982; 8,494,917. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms)
October 29, 2014 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of California. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (nms)
October 19, 2014 Filing 29 Official Transcript of Motion to Transfer held on 10-15-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2015. (lad)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting (D.I. 12 in 14-cv-00386-RGA, D.I. 14 in 14-cv-00267-RGA, D.I. 11 in 14-cv-00512-RGA) MOTION to Transfer Case to The Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/16/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00267-RGA, 1:14-cv-00386-RGA, 1:14-cv-00512-RGA(nms)
October 15, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 10/15/2014. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00267-RGA, 1:14-cv-00386-RGA, 1:14-cv-00512-RGA(ksr, )
September 25, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Heidi L. Keefe for Facebook Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
September 24, 2014 Filing 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heidi L. Keefe - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Heidi Keefe)(Caponi, Steven)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heidi L. Keefe filed by Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/24/2014. (nms)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORAL ORDER: The Court will hear oral argument on the MOTIONS to Transfer Case to Northern District of California on 10/15/2014, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/12/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00267-RGA, 1:14-cv-00386-RGA, 1:14-cv-00512-RGA(nms)
September 12, 2014 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scott M. Daniels for Priceplay.com Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00092-RGA, 1:14-cv-00267-RGA, 1:14-cv-00386-RGA, 1:14-cv-00512-RGA(dmp, )
September 9, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott M. Daniels - filed by Priceplay.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Scott M. Daniels)(Brauerman, Stephen)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (29 in 1:14-cv-00386-RGA, 31 in 1:14-cv-00092-RGA, 29 in 1:14-cv-00267-RGA, 25 in 1:14-cv-00512-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott M. Daniels filed by Priceplay.com Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/9/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00092-RGA, 1:14-cv-00267-RGA, 1:14-cv-00386-RGA, 1:14-cv-00512-RGA(nms)
August 28, 2014 Filing 24 REPLY BRIEF re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to The Northern District of California filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Horwitz, Richard)
August 25, 2014 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants' to file their reply to their Motion to Transfer Case (D.I. 12) to August 28, 2014 (also filed on behalf of Facebook, Inc.) - filed by Linkedin Corporation, Google Inc.. (Horwitz, Richard)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (23 in 1:14-cv-00512-RGA, 27 in 1:14-cv-00386-RGA, 27 in 1:14-cv-00267-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file their reply to their Motion to Transfer Case to August 28, 2014. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/25/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00267-RGA, 1:14-cv-00386-RGA, 1:14-cv-00512-RGA(nms)
August 15, 2014 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Gina Monteith re 21 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Priceplay.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
August 15, 2014 Filing 21 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to The Northern District of California, filed by Priceplay.com Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/25/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 8/15/2014 (nms).
July 30, 2014 Filing 20 ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 7/30/2014 (nms).
July 30, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: A link to D.I. 9 has been added to D.I. 20 . (nms)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (22 in 1:14-cv-00386-RGA, 19 in 1:14-cv-00512-RGA, 22 in 1:14-cv-00267-RGA) Stipulation and Order Extending Time, filed by Priceplay.com Inc. (Reset Briefing Schedule: re (D.I. 12 in 14-cv-00386-RGA, D.I. 14 in 14-cv-00267-RGA, D.I. 11 in 14-cv-00512-RGA) MOTIONS to Transfer Case to The Northern District of California. Answering Brief due 8/15/2014). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/18/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00267-RGA, 1:14-cv-00386-RGA, 1:14-cv-00512-RGA(nms)
July 17, 2014 Filing 19 Stipulation and Order Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California to August 15, 2014, by Priceplay.com Inc.. (Bussiere, Sara) Modified on 7/18/2014 (nms).
July 14, 2014 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to July 29, 2014 - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to July 29, 2014, filed by Facebook Inc. (Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 7/29/2014). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/14/2014. (nms)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORAL ORDER: Defendant has advised that they will not be pursuing their MOTION to Dismiss (D.I. 6 ) in light of the Amended Complaint filed (D.I. 9 ). The Motion to Dismiss is now Dismissed as Moot. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/10/2014. (nms)
July 8, 2014 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Ashvin Kannan re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to The Northern District of California, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 7/9/2014 (nms).
July 8, 2014 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jeremy Jordan re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to The Northern District of California, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 7/9/2014 (nms).
July 8, 2014 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Abeer Dubey re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to The Northern District of California, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 7/9/2014 (nms).
July 8, 2014 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Robin L. Brewer 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to The Northern District of California, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A Part 3, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 7/9/2014 (nms).
July 8, 2014 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to The Northern District of California filed by Facebook Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/25/2014. (Caponi, Steven)
July 8, 2014 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to The Northern District of California - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 30, 2014 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 9 has been corrected to reflect the filing is against the Defendant Facebook Inc. and NOT Plaintiff Priceplay.com Inc.. (nms)
June 27, 2014 Filing 10 RESPONSE to 6 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Priceplay.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 6/30/2014 (nms).
June 27, 2014 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc. - filed by Priceplay.com Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen) Modified on 6/30/2014 (nms).
June 13, 2014 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 13, 2014 Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Facebook Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2014. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/13/2014 (nms).
June 13, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/13/2014 (nms).
May 9, 2014 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 13, 2014 - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 13, 2014, filed by Facebook Inc. (Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 6/13/2014). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/9/2014. (nms)
April 30, 2014 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 23, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Priceplay.com Inc.. Facebook Inc. served on 4/23/2014, answer due 5/14/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen)
April 23, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Facebook Inc. on 4/23/2014. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mdb)
April 22, 2014 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,050,982; 8,494,917;. (mdb)
April 22, 2014 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mdb)
April 22, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Facebook Inc. Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1503008.) filed by Priceplay.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Priceplay.com Inc. v. Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priceplay.com Inc.
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Sara E. Bussiere
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Represented By: Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?