Selene Communication Technologies LLC v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Selene Communication Technologies LLC
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00534
Filed: April 23, 2014
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2014 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00533-SLR, 1:14-cv-00534-SLR, 1:14-cv-00535-SLR, 1:14-cv-00536-SLR, 1:14-cv-00537-SLR (rjb)
April 29, 2014 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. Google Inc. served on 4/24/2014, answer due 5/15/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen)
April 24, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Google Inc. on 4/24/2014. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (cla, )
April 23, 2014 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,363,377;. (cla, )
April 23, 2014 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cla, )
April 23, 2014 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Google Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1503856.) - filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, part 3, # 4 Exhibit A, part 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(cla, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selene Communication Technologies LLC v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selene Communication Technologies LLC
Represented By: Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Represented By: Sara E. Bussiere
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?