Mondero et al v. Lewes Surgical & Medical Associates P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Mondero, Judy L. Howett NP, Margaret M. Sawyer, Tanikka R. Miller and Marian L. Long
Defendant: Lewes Surgical & Medical Associates P.A., Semaan M. Abboud M.D. and Beth E. Bittner
Case Number: 1:2014cv00588
Filed: May 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: Sussex
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2018. (nms)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 73 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/19/2017. (nms)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting 74 MOTION to Amend Pleadings (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/17/2017. (nms)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 75 MOTION for Reargument. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/17/2017. (nms)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM regarding Motions for Summary Judgment (D.I. 55 and D.I. 61 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/3/2016. (nms)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Semaan M. Abboud M.D., Lewes Surgical & Medical Associates P.A., Beth E. Bittner. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing co nsists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2014. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/9/14. (cak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mondero et al v. Lewes Surgical & Medical Associates P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Mondero
Represented By: Dean A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy L. Howett NP
Represented By: Dean A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret M. Sawyer
Represented By: Dean A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanikka R. Miller
Represented By: Dean A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian L. Long
Represented By: Dean A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewes Surgical & Medical Associates P.A.
Represented By: Allyson Britton DiRocco
Represented By: James H. McMackin, III
Represented By: David H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Semaan M. Abboud M.D.
Represented By: Allyson Britton DiRocco
Represented By: James H. McMackin, III
Represented By: David H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth E. Bittner
Represented By: Allyson Britton DiRocco
Represented By: James H. McMackin, III
Represented By: David H. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?