ViaTech Technologies Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: ViaTech Technologies Inc.
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 1:2014cv01226
Filed: September 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding pending motions (D.I. 209 , 212 , 214 , 218 , 221 , 224 , 226 , 232 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2017. (nms)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying MOTION to Alter or Amend the Court's January 5th Memorandum Order (D.I. 206 in 14-cv-1226-RGA, and D.I. 30 in 16-mc-232-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/2/2017. (nms)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM ORDER ruling on a document production dispute (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/5/2017. (nms)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 AMENDED MEMORANDUM ORDER ruling on a document production dispute. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/1/2016. (nms)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM ORDER ruling on a document production dispute (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/30/2016. (nms)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction of ten terms in U.S. Patent No. 6,920,567. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/14/2016. (nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ViaTech Technologies Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ViaTech Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Lennon
Represented By: Sheila Mortazavi
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Kurt L. Glitzenstein
Represented By: Steven R. Katz
Represented By: Warren K. Mabey, Jr.
Represented By: Frank E. Scherkenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?