E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company v. Unifrax I LLC
Plaintiff: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Defendant: Unifrax I LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv01250
Filed: October 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Defendant's trial exhibits (see D.I. #365 ). (nms)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Plaintiff for Plaintiff's and the joint trial exhibits (see #365 ). (nms)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Letter to Counsel, dated February 25, 2020, from the Clerk of Court, regarding the return of trial exhibits (see Exhibit List at D.I. #365 ). (nms)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 404 SO ORDERED re #403 Stipulation of Satisfaction of Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2019. (nms)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 403 STIPULATION on Satisfaction of Judgment, by Unifrax I LLC. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 7/23/2019 (nms).
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 402 MANDATE of USCA as to #396 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Unifrax I LLC. USCA Decision: Affirmed. (Attachments: #1 Judgment, #2 Opinion)(nms)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER of USCA as to #396 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Unifrax I LLC. Decision of USCA: The petition for panel rehearing is denied. The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. The mandate of the court will issue on June 26, 2019. (nms)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 400 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christopher R. Hagale as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm of Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP. (Palapura, Bindu)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 399 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Unifrax I LLC Transcript Not Needed (Mowery, Katharine)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 398 STIPULATION to Correct the Record, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 9/26/2017 (nms).
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 397 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #396 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Unifrax I LLC. USCA Case Number 17-2575. (nms)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #91 Order, #394 Judgment, #294 Memorandum and Order, #346 Judgment, #86 Memorandum Opinion, #392 Memorandum Opinion, #391 Memorandum and Order . Appeal filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,607,926. (Attachments: #1 Final Judgment)(nms)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 FINAL JUDGMENT And Injunction (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/18/2017. (nms)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Notification regarding #396 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), sent to Reporter Dibbs (ceg)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #396 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (ceg)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #396 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Unifrax I LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2227287.) (Cottrell, Frederick)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 PROPOSED Final Judgment and Injunction, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 9/18/2017 (nms).
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 392 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding #367 Post-Trial Motion for a Permanent Injunction, Supplemental Damages, and Interest. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed final judgment consistent with this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/12/2017. (nms)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Defendant's renewed motions for judgment as a matter of law (D.I. #366 ) is DENIED. Defendant's request for a new trial is DENIED (D.I. #366 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/12/2017. (nms)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 REDACTED VERSION of #384 Declaration of Sharon Desh, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 7/31/2017 (nms).
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 REDACTED VERSION of #383 Reply Brief by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Katharine L. Mowery regarding enclosing 2 disks of electronic versions of briefs. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 7/27/2017 (nms).
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 387 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Unifrax I LLC re #366 Renewed Motions For Judgment As A Matter of Law That the Asserted Patent Claims Are Not Infringed or Invalid and, In the Alternative, For A New Trial, #367 Post-Trial Motion for a Permanent Injunction, Supplemental Damages, and Interest. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bindu A. Palapura, Esquire regarding enclosure of hyperlinked versions of Plaintiff's Post-Trial Briefs. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 7/25/2017 (nms).
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 385 REPLY BRIEF re #366 Renewed Motions For Judgment As A Matter of Law That the Asserted Patent Claims Are Not Infringed or Invalid and, In the Alternative, For A New Trial filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 384 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Sharon Desh re #383 Reply Brief, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 7/24/2017 (nms).
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 383 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #367 Post-Trial Motion for a Permanent Injunction, Supplemental Damages, and Interest filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 REDACTED VERSION of #375 Answering Brief in Opposition, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Moore, David)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 381 REDACTED VERSION of #378 Declaration of Alyssa N. Lawson, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G)(Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 7/17/2017 (nms).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 380 REDACTED VERSION of #377 Declaration of Stephen Juda, by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 7/17/2017 (nms).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Letter to the Hon. Richard G. Andrews, from Katharine L. Mowery, enclosing 2 disks of electronic versions of Answering Brief (D.I. #376 ). (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 7/14/2017 (nms).
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 378 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Alyssa N. Lawson re #376 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 7/7/2017 (nms).
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 377 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Stephen Juda re #376 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 7/7/2017 (nms).
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #367 Post-Trial Motion for a Permanent Injunction, Supplemental Damages, and Interest filed by Unifrax I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/14/2017. (Cottrell, Frederick)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 375 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #366 Renewed Motions For Judgment As A Matter of Law That the Asserted Patent Claims Are Not Infringed or Invalid and, In the Alternative, For A New Trial filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/14/2017. (Moore, David)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #374 Stipulation and Order Governing the Schedule and Page Limitations for Post-Trial Briefing on Motion for a Permanent Injunction, Supplemental Damages, and Interest (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #367 Post-Trial Motion for a Permanent Injunction, Supplemental Damages, and Interest. (Answering Brief due 7/8/2017, Reply Brief due 7/22/2017). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/28/2017. (nms)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 374 STIPULATION and Order Governing the Schedule and Page Limitations for Post-Trial Briefing on Dupont's Motion for a Permanent Injunction, Supplemental Damages, and Interest, by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 6/28/2017 (nms).
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 REDACTED VERSION of #369 Declaration of Sharon Desh, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 6/23/2017 (nms).
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 372 REDACTED VERSION of #368 Opening Brief in Support, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Katharine L. Mowery enclosing two disks containing electronic versions of D.I. #370 . (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 6/21/2017 (nms).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 370 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #366 Renewed Motions For Judgment As A Matter of Law That the Asserted Patent Claims Are Not Infringed or Invalid and, In the Alternative, For A New Trial, filed by Unifrax I LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/29/2017. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 6/16/2017 (nms).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 369 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Sharon Desh re #367 Post-Trial Motion for a Permanent Injunction, Supplemental Damages, and Interest, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 6/16/2017 (nms).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 368 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #367 Post-Trial Motion for a Permanent Injunction, Supplemental Damages, and Interest, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/29/2017. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 6/16/2017 (nms).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Post-Trial Motion for a Permanent Injunction, Supplemental Damages, and Interest - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 6/16/2017 (nms).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Renewed Motions For Judgment As A Matter of Law That the Asserted Patent Claims Are Not Infringed or Invalid and, In the Alternative, For A New Trial - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 6/16/2017 (nms).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Joint Notice of Lodging of Admitted Trial Exhibits, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 6/15/2017 (nms).
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 REDACTED VERSION of #356 Unopposed MOTION to Redact Limited Portions of Trial Transcripts by Lamart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kraman, Pilar)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 363 SO ORDERED, re #362 Stipulation Regarding Sealed Exhibits. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2017. (nms)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 STIPULATION Regarding Sealed Exhibits, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Moore, David) Modified on 6/12/2017 (nms).
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Redaction of #341 Transcript. (nms)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Redaction of #339 Transcript. (nms)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Redaction of #338 Transcript. (nms)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER Granting #356 Unopposed MOTION to Redact Limited Portions of Trial Transcripts. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/9/2017. (nms)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 EXHIBITS re #356 Unopposed MOTION to Redact Limited Portions of Trial Transcripts, by Lamart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1, #2 Exhibit B-2, #3 Exhibit B-3)(Kraman, Pilar) Modified on 6/9/2017 (nms).
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 357 has been removed from the docket. Counsel will refile the exhibits from that filing as discussed with Chambers. (nms)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 [SEALED] Unopposed MOTION to Redact Limited Portions of Trial Transcripts - filed by Lamart Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kraman, Pilar) Modified on 6/7/2017 (nms).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 355 REDACTED VERSION of #344 Sealed Exhibit List. (nms)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 REDACTED VERSION of #343 Sealed Exhibit List. (nms)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 353 REDACTED VERSION of #342 Sealed Exhibit List. (nms)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 SO ORDERED, re #348 Stipulation Regarding Exhibit Lists (D.I. Nos. #342 , #343 , and #344 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2017. (nms)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER re #350 Stipulation and Order Governing the Schedule and Page Limitations for Post-Trial Briefing (see footnote). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2017. (nms)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 STIPULATION and Order Governing the Schedule and Page Limitations for Post-Trial Briefing by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 349 NOTICE of Intent to Seal and Redact, by Katharine Lester Mowery. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 5/24/2017 (nms).
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 STIPULATION Regarding Exhibit Lists, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Redaction of D.I. 342, #2 Redaction of D.I. 343, #3 Redaction of D.I. 344)(Moore, David) Modified on 5/23/2017 (nms).
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORAL ORDER: The motion to preclude further reference (D.I. #315 ) is RESOLVED as stated on the record at trial. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/19/2017. (nms)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 346 JUDGMENT is entered for Plaintiff and against Defendant on Count I of the Complaint (D.I. #1 ). Judgment is entered for Plaintiff and against Defendant on Counterclaim I of the Third Amended Answer(D.I. #206 ). Damages are awarded to Plaintiff against Defendant in the amount of $3,272,000.00. Judgment is entered for Plaintiff and against Defendant on Counterclaim II of the Third Amended Answer (see Judgment for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/18/2017. (nms)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #297 has been replaced with a corrected version. A reference to one of the parties has been corrected in the first paragraph of page 6. (nms)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 345 REDACTED VERSION of #279 Proposed Pretrial Order, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/19/2017 (nms).
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 344 SEALED Defendant's Exhibit List from Jury Trial held 5/8/2017 thru 5/16/2017. (ksr, ) Modified on 5/30/2017 (nms).
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 343 SEALED Joint Exhibit List from Jury Trial held 5/8/2017 thru 5/16/2017. (ksr, ) Modified on 5/30/2017 (nms).
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 SEALED Plaintiff's Exhibit List from Jury Trial held 5/8/2017 thru 5/16/2017. (ksr, ) Modified on 5/30/2017 (nms).
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 341 SEALED Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 6) Jury Instructions & Closing Arguments held on 05-15-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. (lad) Modified on 6/9/2017 (nms).
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 5) held on 05-12-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2017. (lad)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 339 SEALED Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 4) held on 05-11-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. (lad) Modified on 6/9/2017 (nms).
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 SEALED Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 3) held on 05-10-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. (lad) Modified on 6/9/2017 (nms).
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 2) held on 05-09-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2017. (lad)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Official Transcript of Jury Trial (Day 1) held on 05-08-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2017. (lad)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Official Transcript of Verdict held on 05-16-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2017. (lad)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER directing that jurors be provided lunch (cc: Finance). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/16/2017. (nms)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Witness List from Jury Trial held 5/8/2017 thru 5/16/2017. (ksr, )
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 REDACTED VERSION of #331 Jury Verdict. (ksr, )
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 [SEALED] JURY VERDICT. (ksr, ) (rwc).
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Jury Notes [Sealed]. (ksr, ) (rwc).
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 REDACTED VERSION of #301 Declaration of Sharon Desh, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-27)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/17/2017 (nms).
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 328 REDACTED VERSION of #300 Statement by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 7 completed on 5/16/2017. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 6 held on 5/15/2017. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning.) (ksr, )
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 REDACTED VERSION of #292 Letter by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8-9)(Palapura, Bindu)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 326 REDACTED VERSION of #288 Letter by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Palapura, Bindu)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Final Jury Instructions (as read in open court). (nms) Modified on 5/16/2017 (nms).
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 324 REDACTED VERSION of #305 Declaration by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 323 SO ORDERED, re #313 Stipulation Regarding the Person of Ordinary Skill in the Art. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/15/2017. (nms)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 322 REDACTED VERSION of #304 Statement by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 FINAL JURY VERDICT Form. (nms)
May 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Proposed Final Jury Instructions, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/15/2017 (nms).
May 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kelly Farnan regarding Objection to Date of Invention Jury Instruction. (Farnan, Kelly)
May 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Final VERDICT SHEET, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/15/2017 (nms).
May 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bindu A. Palapura, Esq. regarding jury instructions. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/15/2017 (nms).
May 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 316 RESPONSE to #315 MOTION to Preclude Further Reference to the '500 Patent or the Angstrom Scale, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/15/2017 (nms).
May 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MOTION to Preclude Further Reference to the '500 Patent or the Angstrom Scale - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 5/15/2017 (nms).
May 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding response to DuPont's letter of May 13, 2017 - re #311 Letter. (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 313 STIPULATION Regarding the Person of Ordinary Skill in the Art, by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 5/15/2017 (nms).
May 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Proposed Final Jury Instructions, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/15/2017 (nms).
May 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bindu A. Palapura, Esq. regarding conception and reduction to practice. (Attachments: #1 JTX 001, #2 PTX 046, #3 DTX 100)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/15/2017 (nms).
May 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 310 VERDICT SHEET by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company . (Palapura, Bindu)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 5 held on 5/12/2017. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning/Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #307 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file redacted versions of certain sealed documents to May 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/12/2017. (nms)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 4 held on 5/11/2017. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning/Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Proposed Final Jury Instructions, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/12/2017 (nms).
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Proposed Verdict Forms, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/12/2017 (nms).
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 307 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file redacted versions of certain sealed documents to May 17, 2017 - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 3 held on 5/10/2017. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs/Valerie Gunning.) (ksr, )
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 REDACTED VERSION of #289 Letter by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Mowery, Katharine)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 2 held on 5/9/2017. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning/Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Katharine L. Mowery re #304 Response, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-O)(Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 5/9/2017 (nms).
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 [SEALED] RESPONSE to #300 Proffer, by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 5/9/2017 (nms).
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Jury Trial, Day 1 held on 5/8/2017. Appearances: D. Moore, B. Palapura, C. Landgraft, M. Levine, N. Martinez, C. Hagale, S. Desh for Plaintiff; F. Cottrell, J. Holdreith, D. Prange, A. Lawson, E. Niles for Defendant. (Court Reporter Valerie Gunning and Stacey Ingram (Hawkins Reporting Service).) (ksr, )
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 REDACTED VERSION of #284 Reply in support, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/9/2017 (nms).
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mowery, Katharine)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #279 . (nms)
May 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Sharon Desh re #300 Offer of Proof regarding Copying, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-27)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/8/2017 (nms).
May 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 [SEALED] Offer of Proof regarding Copying, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/8/2017 (nms).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 REDACTED VERSION of #280 Response to Motion by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER: The Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Alternatively of Invalidity (D.I. #183 ) is DENIED as to direct infringement; GRANTED as to indirect infringement; and DENIED as to invalidity. The Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (D.I. #243 ) is DENIED. The Amended Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment (D.I. #259 ) is DENIED as to Defendant's Counterclaim II as it relates to Defendant's inventorship claim; and DENIED as to Defendant's related defenses. Inequitable conduct will be addressed after the jury trial. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/5/2017. (nms)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Alternatively of Invalidity (D.I. #183 , Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (D.I. #243 ), and Amended Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment (D.I. #259 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/5/2017. (nms) (Main Document 297 replaced on 5/19/2017) (nms).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER On Motions in Limine (D.I. 279, Exh. 17) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/5/2017. (nms)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting #276 MOTION to Preclude Argument and Evidence Related to Prior Art Disclosed on April 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/5/2017. (nms)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM ORDER providing claim construction for the term "adhesive layer capable of activation" found in U.S. Patent No. 8,607,926. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/5/2017. (nms)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER RE Introduction to Deposition Testimony (*The Court will give DuPont's proposed additional instruction). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/5/2017. (nms)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 292 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bindu A. Palapura regarding response to defendant's claim construction submission dated May 2, 2017 - re #289 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8-9)(Palapura, Bindu)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding response to DuPont's claim construction submission - re #288 Letter. (Cottrell, Frederick)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena served upon Chad Garvey to Appear and Testify at a Hearing or Trial in a Civil Action filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mowery, Katharine)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding claim construction issue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Cottrell, Frederick)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bindu A. Palapura regarding initial submission regarding Claim Construction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7)(Palapura, Bindu)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER After Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2017. (nms)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #285 Stipulation regarding letters relating to claim construction issue. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/2/2017. (nms)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 286 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Introduction to Deposition Testimony by Unifrax I LLC. (Rawnsley, Jason)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 STIPULATION and Order to set Letter Briefing Schedule for Claim Construction Issue, by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 5/2/2017 (nms).
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 [SEALED] REPLY to #276 MOTION to Preclude Argument and Evidence Related to Prior Art Disclosed on April 11, 2017, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 5/2/2017 (nms).
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 REDACTED VERSION of #276 MOTION to Preclude Argument and Evidence Related to Prior Art Disclosed on April 11, 2017 by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Palapura, Bindu)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Official Transcript of Motions Hearing held on 04-18-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Taneha Carroll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2017. (lad)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Official Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on 04-28-17 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2017. (lad)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/28/2017. Appearances: B. Palapura, C. Landgraff, M. Levine, C. Hagale, S. Desh, T. Stevens for Plaintiff; F. Cottrell, J. Holdreith, D. Prange, A. Lawson, E. Niles, G. Ashenmacher for Defendant. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 [SEALED] RESPONSE to #276 MOTION to Preclude Argument and Evidence Related to Prior Art Disclosed on April 11, 2017, filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 4/27/2017 (nms).
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #278 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey T. LaRosa, filed by Lamart Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/26/2017. (nms)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey T. LaRosa - filed by Lamart Corporation. (Poff, Adam)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORAL ORDER: Defendant shall respond to the MOTION to Preclude Argument and Evidence Related to Prior Art Disclosed on April 11, 2017 (D.I. #276 ) by 4:00 p.m. on 4/27/2017. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2017. (nms)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 [SEALED] MOTION to Preclude Argument and Evidence Related to Prior Art Disclosed on April 11, 2017 - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 4/25/2017 (nms).
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 4/18/2017. Appearances: B. Palapura, C. Laudgraft, M. Levine, C. Hagale, S. Desh for Plaintiff; F. Cottrell, K. Farnan, J. Holdreith, A. Lawson for Defendant. (Court Reporter Stacey Ingram - Hawkins Reporting Service.) (ksr, )
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #275 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Emily E. Niles, Brenda L. Joly and George Ashenmacher, filed by Unifrax I LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/3/2017. (nms)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Emily E. Niles for Unifrax I LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brenda L. Joly for Unifrax I LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney George Ashenmacher for Unifrax I LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Emily E. Niles, Brenda L. Joly and George Ashenmacher - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark L. Levine for E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 REDACTED VERSION of #268 Declaration of Sharon Desh, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 36-38)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 3/28/2017 (nms).
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 273 REDACTED VERSION of #267 Reply Brief by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORAL ORDER: Oral argument on the pending motions (D.I. #183 , #243 , and #259 ) is now set for 4/18/2017, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2018. (nms)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #268 . (nms)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Unifrax I LLC re #259 Amended MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. (Rawnsley, Jason)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 REDACTED VERSION of #266 Declaration by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-O)(Mowery, Katharine)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 REDACTED VERSION of #265 Answering Brief in Opposition by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Sharon Desh re #267 Reply Brief, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 36-38)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 3/20/2017 (nms).
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #259 Amended MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Kelly Farnan re #265 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-O)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 3/13/2017 (nms).
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #259 Amended MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment filed by Unifrax I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/17/2017. (Farnan, Kelly)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 264 REDACTED VERSION of #261 Declaration of Sharon Desh, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-35)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 3/6/2017 (nms).
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 REDACTED VERSION of #260 Opening Brief in Support, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark L. Levine of Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #262 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark L. Levine of Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/1/2017. (nms)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Sharon Desh re #260 Opening Brief in Support, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-15, #2 Exhibits 16-35)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 2/27/2017 (nms).
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 260 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #259 Amended MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/10/2017. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 2/27/2017 (nms).
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Amended MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 2/27/2017 (nms).
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 REDACTED VERSION of #255 Declaration of Sharon Desh, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 21-28)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 2/23/2017 (nms).
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 257 REDACTED VERSION of #254 Reply Brief by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
February 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Unifrax I LLC re #243 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint. (Mowery, Katharine)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Sharon Desh re #254 Reply Brief, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 21-28)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 2/21/2017 (nms).
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #243 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 REDACTED VERSION of #249 Declaration by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L)(Mowery, Katharine)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 REDACTED VERSION of #248 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ley Richardson on February 16, 2017 filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dariusz Wlodzimierz Kawka on February 16, 2017 filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Katharine L. Mowery re #248 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-L, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 2/10/2017 (nms).
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #243 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint filed by Unifrax I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cottrell, Frederick)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 REDACTED VERSION of #245 Declaration of Sharon Desh, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-20)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 2/3/2017 (nms).
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 REDACTED VERSION of #244 Opening Brief in Support by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Sharon Desh re #244 Opening Brief in Support, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-20)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 1/27/2017 (nms).
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #243 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/9/2017. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 1/27/2017 (nms).
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 1/27/2017 (nms).
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andrew Golian on January 25, 2017 filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 SO ORDERED Granting #240 Stipulation and Order Regarding Further Discovery and Completion of Briefing (*Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery completed by 2/17/2017, Amended Dispositive Motions due by 2/24/2017). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2017. (nms)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Further Discovery and Completion of Briefing, by Unifrax I LLC. (Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 1/6/2017 (nms).
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 239 REDACTED VERSION of #235 Letter by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Palapura, Bindu)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 238 REDACTED VERSION of #233 Letter, by Unifrax I LLC. (Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 12/6/2016 (nms).
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 11-30-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2017. (lad)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #236 Stipulation and Order Extending Briefing Deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/1/2016. (nms)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 11/30/2016. Counsel present for Plaintiff: S. Desh, B. Palapura. Counsel present for Defendant: K. Farnan, F. Cottrell. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (nms)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 STIPULATION and Order Extending Briefing Deadlines, by Unifrax I LLC. (Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 12/1/2016 (nms).
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 235 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bindu A. Palapura, Esquire regarding response to Unifrax's letter dated November 28, 2016 - re #233 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Palapura, Bindu)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 STIPULATION and Order Extending Briefing Deadlines by Unifrax I LLC. (Rawnsley, Jason)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kelly E. Farnan regarding Additional Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 11/28/2016 (nms).
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #234 Stipulation and Order Extending Briefing Deadline, filed by Unifrax I LLC (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #218 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. Answering Brief due 12/1/2016, Reply Brief due 12/14/2016). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/28/2016. (nms)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a conference on 11/30/2016, at 2:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews, to take up this issue. In preparation for this conference the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/22/2016. (nms)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #231 Stipulation and Order Extending Briefing Deadlines, filed by Unifrax I LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: re #218 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. Answering Brief due 11/29/2016, Reply Brief due 12/12/2016). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/14/2016. (nms)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 STIPULATION and Order Extending Briefing Deadlines, by Unifrax I LLC. (Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 11/14/2016 (nms).
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 REDACTED VERSION of #222 Declaration of Jason J.Rawnsley, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits LL-SS)(Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 11/9/2016 (nms). Modified on 11/9/2016 (nms).
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 REDACTED VERSION of #221 Reply Brief, by Unifrax I LLC. (Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 11/9/2016 (nms).
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 228 REDACTED VERSION of #220 Declaration of Sharon Desh, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-30)(Moore, David) Modified on 11/9/2016 (nms).
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 REDACTED VERSION of #219 Opening Brief in Support, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Moore, David) Modified on 11/9/2016 (nms).
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Unifrax I LLC re #183 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Alternatively of Invalidity. (Rawnsley, Jason)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 REDACTED VERSION of #217 Declaration of Sharon Desh, Volume 2, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 22-28, part 1, #2 Exhibit 28, part 2, #3 Exhibit 28, part 3, #4 Exhibits 28, part 4 - 31, part 1, #5 Exhibit 31, part 2, #6 Exhibits 31, part 3 - 35, part 1, #7 Exhibits 35, part 2 - 37)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 11/3/2016 (nms).
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 REDACTED VERSION of #216 Declaration of Sharon Desh, Volume 1, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6, part 1, #2 Exhibits 6, part 2 - 21)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 11/3/2016 (nms).
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 REDACTED VERSION of #215 Amended Answering Brief in Opposition, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 11/4/2016 (nms).
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Jason J. Rawnsley re #221 Reply Brief, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LL, #2 Exhibit MM, #3 Exhibit NN, #4 Exhibit OO, #5 Exhibit PP, #6 Exhibit QQ, #7 Exhibit RR, #8 Exhibit SS)(Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 11/3/2016 (nms).
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #183 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Alternatively of Invalidity filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Rawnsley, Jason)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Sharon Desh re #218 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6, #2 Exhibits 7-11, #3 Exhibits 12-13, #4 Exhibits 14-18, #5 Exhibits 19-24, #6 Exhibit 25 part 1, #7 Exhibit 25 part 2, #8 Exhibits 26-30)(Moore, David) Modified on 11/1/2016 (nms).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #218 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/17/2016. (Moore, David) Modified on 11/1/2016 (nms).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, David) Modified on 11/1/2016 (nms).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 [SEALED] Amended DECLARATION of Sharon Desh, Volume 2 re #215 Answering Brief in Opposition, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 22-25, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 28, part 1, #5 Exhibit 28, part 2, #6 Exhibit 28, part 3, #7 Exhibit 28, part 4, #8 Exhibit 29, #9 Exhibits 30-31, #10 Exhibits 32-37)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 10/24/2016 (nms).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 [SEALED] Amended DECLARATION of Sharon Desh, Volume 1 re #215 Answering Brief in Opposition, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-8, #2 Exhibits 9-14, #3 Exhibits 15-21)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 10/24/2016 (nms).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 [SEALED] Amended ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #183 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Alternatively of Invalidity filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/3/2016. (Palapura, Bindu)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #214 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Summary Judgment Briefing to on or before October 24, 2016, for DuPont to file its revised Answering Brief and for Unifraxs Reply to be extended until and including November 2, 2016, filed by Unifrax I LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2016. (nms)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Summary Judgment Briefing to on or before October 24, 2016 for DuPont to file its revised Answering Brief and for Unifraxs Reply to be extended until and including November 2, 2016 - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 REDACTED VERSION of #206 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Unifrax I LLC. (Rawnsley, Jason)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME 1) DuPont to file a supplement to its response to Unifrax's motion for summary judgment not to exceed 5 pages, and; 2) Unifrax to file a reply in supportof its motion for summary judgment and not to exceed 12 pages to October 20, 2016 and October 26, 2016, respectively - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 12/9/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/13/16. (cak)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #210 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Defendant Unifrax I LLC's Third Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to October 31, 2016, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/12/2016. (nms)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #184 has been replaced with an amended version. The new version corrects citations to the transcript. (nms)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for Exhibits A-H at D.I. #187 has been replaced with an amended version. The new version corrects transcript citations. (nms)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Defendant Unifrax I LLC's Third Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to October 31, 2016 - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 REDACTED VERSION of #202 Declaration of Sharon Desh, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22-28 part 1, #2 Exhibit 28 part 2, #3 Exhibit 28 part 3, #4 Exhibit 28-31, #5 Exhibit 31 part 2, #6 Exhibit 31-35 part 1, #7 Exhibit 35- 37)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 REDACTED VERSION of #201 Declaration of Sharon Desh, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Exhibit 6- 21)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 10/11/2016 (nms).
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 REDACTED VERSION of #200 Answering Brief in Opposition, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 [SEALED] THIRD AMENDED ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to #1 Complaint, by Unifrax I LLC. (nms)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting #165 MOTION for Leave to File A Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims, filed by Unifrax I LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2016. (nms)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Pre-Suit Damages (D.I. #203 ), by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Sharon Desh, Volume 2 re #200 Answering Brief in Opposition, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 22-25, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 28 part 1, #5 Exhibit 28 part 2, #6 Exhibit 28 part 3, #7 Exhibit 28 part 4, #8 Exhibit 29, #9 Exhibits 30-31, #10 Exhibits 32-37)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 201 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Sharon Desh, Volume 1 re #200 Answering Brief in Opposition, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-8, #2 Exhibits 9-14, #3 Exhibits 15-21)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 10/4/2016 (nms).
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #183 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Alternatively of Invalidity filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/14/2016. (Palapura, Bindu)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 SO ORDERED, Granting #198 Stipulation and Order Regarding Damages. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/30/2016. (nms)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORAL ORDER: A teleconference has been scheduled for 10/11/16 at 9:30 AM Eastern Time with Judge Thynge to discuss the status of the case. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/30/16. (cak)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Damages, by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 10/3/2016 (nms).
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 SO ORDERED Granting #196 Stipulation and Proposed Order Amending Dates for Pretrial Conference and Trial, filed by Unifrax I LLC (Reset Hearings: A Jury Trial is set for 5/8/2017, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, A Pretrial Conference is set for 4/28/2017, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/28/2016. (nms)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION Amending Dates for Pretrial Conference and Trial, by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 9/28/2016 (nms).
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Status Conference held on 9/23/2016. Appearances: B. Palapura, A. Mortara, T. Stevens for Plaintiff; F. Cottrell, K. Farnan, J. Holdreith, K. Mowery, D. Prange, J. Curatolo, S. Sidoti for Defendant. (Court Reporter Stacey Ingram - Hawkins Reporting Service.) (ksr, )
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 REDACTED VERSION of #188 Declaration of Katharine L. Mowery, Volume II, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits K-KK)(Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 9/26/2016 (nms).
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 REDACTED VERSION of #187 Declaration of Katharine L. Mowery, Volume I, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I, #2 Exhibit J))(Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 9/26/2016 (nms).
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 REDACTED VERSION of #186 Opening Brief in Support, by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 9/26/2016 (nms).
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 REDACTED VERSION of #184 Opening Brief in Support, by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 9/26/2016 (nms).
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bindu A. Palapura, Esquire regarding response to Unifrax's request for reconsideration (D.I. #189 ). (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 9/23/2016 (nms).
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORAL ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a response to the letter filed at D.I. #189 by COB 9/22/2016. A Status Conference is set for 9/23/2016, at 9:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Out of state counsel has the option of appearing in person or participating by phone. The parties shall mutually coordinate the call for all those participating by phone. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/22/2016. (nms)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding reconsideration of request to move the trial date (see D.I. #182 Order). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 9/21/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 [SEALED] Declaration of Katharine L. Mowery, Volume II re #185 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Pre-Suit Damages, and #183 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Alternatively of Invalidity, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits K-P, #2 Exhibit Q, #3 Exhibits R-Z, #4 Exhibits AA-DD, #5 Exhibits EE-FF, #6 Exhibits GG-KK)(Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Katharine L. Mowery, Volume I re #185 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Pre-Suit Damages, and #183 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Alternatively of Invalidity, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J)(Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/12/2016) (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #185 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Pre-Suit Damages, filed by Unifrax I LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/3/2016. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Pre-Suit Damages - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #183 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Alternatively of Invalidity, filed by Unifrax I LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/3/2016. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms). (Main Document 184 replaced on 10/12/2016) (nms).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or Alternatively of Invalidity - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 9/19/2016 (nms).
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Denying Defendant's request for a new trial date (see letters at D.I. #180 and #181 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/13/2016. (nms)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bindu A. Palapura regarding response to Unifrax's letter dated September 8, 2016 - re #180 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Palapura, Bindu)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #180 has been replaced with a corrected version per counsel's request. Dates in the letter have been corrected. (nms)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding upcoming trial dates. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 9/8/2016 (nms). (Main Document 180 replaced on 9/9/2016) (nms).
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alexander B. Morgan, Ph.D. on September 1, 2016 filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard A. Haber, Ph.D. on September 13, 2016 filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Moore, David)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Carl G. Degen on September 9, 2016 filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Moore, David)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Thomas J. Nosker, Ph.D. on September 7, 2016 filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Moore, David)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gary L. Gutzler on August 25, 2016 filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 REDACTED VERSION of #171 Reply, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits G-K)(Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 8/15/2016 (nms).
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Infringement Reply Report of Alexander B. Morgan, Ph.D. (Contains Highly Confidential Material) and Reply Expert Report of Gary L. Gutzler (Highly Confidential) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Unifrax I LLC's: (1) Reply Expert Report of Richard A. Haber, Ph.D.; and (2) Reply Expert Report of Thomas J. Nosker, Ph.D. filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 [SEALED] REPLY re #165 MOTION for Leave to File A Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims, filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits G-K)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 8/9/2016 (nms).
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 REDACTED VERSION of #169 Response to Motion, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-21)(Palapura, Bindu)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 [SEALED] RESPONSE to #165 MOTION for Leave to File A Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibits 7-21)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 7/26/2016 (nms).
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Invalidity Rebuttal Report of Alexander B. Morgan, Ph.D. [Contains Highly Confidential Material] filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Unifrax I LLC's: (1) Expert Report of Carl G. Degen; (2) Rebuttal Expert Report of Richard A. Haber, Ph.D.; and (3) Rebuttal Expert Report of Thomas J. Nosker, Ph.D. filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REDACTED VERSION of #165 MOTION for Leave to File A Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 7/18/2016 (nms).
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 166 has been removed from the docket. The proposed order and 7.1.1. Statement filed at that entry have been added to the motion filed at D.I. #165 . (nms)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re #165 MOTION for Leave to File A Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/25/2016. (nms)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 [SEALED] MOTION for Leave to File A Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 7/11/2016 (nms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2016: #7 Proposed Order and 7.1.1. Statement) (nms).
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unifrax I LLC's Amended Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff DuPont's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unifrax filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's Third Set of Interrogatories (Highly Confidential) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 REDACTED VERSION of #156 Letter by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Palapura, Bindu)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Unifrax I LLC's Expert Report of Richard A. Haber, Ph.D. and Expert Report of Thomas J. Nosker, Ph.D. filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Gary L. Gutzler (Highly Confidential) and Expert Report of Alexander B. Morgan, Ph.D. (Highly Confidential) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 REDACTED VERSION of #155 Letter by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Mowery, Katharine)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unifrax I LLC's Third Set of Interrogatories filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: Unifrax may claw back the privileged document inadvertently produced by Lamart, and DuPont's waiver argument is rejected. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/14/2016. (nms)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bindu A. Palapura, Esquire regarding response to Unifrax's letter dated June 10, 2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 6/14/2016 (nms).
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding common-interest privilege - re #149 Transcript,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Cottrell, Frederick)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Supplemental Infringement Contentions (with Exhibit) [Contains References To Materials Marked Highly Confidential By Unifrax]; and Plaintiff DuPont's Sixth Amended Responses To Defendant Unifrax's First Set Of Interrogatories [Contains References To Materials Marked Highly Confidential By Unifrax] filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 REDACTED VERSION of #147 Letter by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7-13)(Palapura, Bindu)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 REDACTED VERSION of #148 Letter by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REDACTED VERSION of #145 Letter by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Palapura, Bindu)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 REDACTED VERSION of #144 Letter, by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F-I, #3 Exhibit J-L, #4 Certificate of Service)(Mowery, Katharine)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute held on 06-01-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2016. (lad)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Discovery Conference held on 6/1/2016. Appearances: Palapura, Laudgraff, Stevens for Plaintiff; Farnan, Mowery, Cottrell for Defendant. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kelly E. Farnan regarding response to Plaintiff's May 27, 2016 letter - re #145 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Kelly)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bindu A. Palapura regarding discovery dispute response - re #144 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7-13)(Palapura, Bindu)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Unifrax I LLC's Supplemental Initial Disclosures; (2) Defendant Unifrax I LLC's Supplemental Invalidity Contentions with Exhibits A, H-J; and (3) Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff DuPont's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unifrax with Certificate of Service filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Bindu A. Palapura regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Palapura, Bindu)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kelly E. Farnan regarding discovery dispute - re 134 Oral Order,, Set Hearings,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F-I, #3 Exhibit J-L, #4 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Kelly)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Amended NOTICE of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition by Unifrax I LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mowery, Katharine)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Supoena to Testify at a Deposition by Unifrax I LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mowery, Katharine)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. #140 has been replaced with an amended version per counsel's request. The discovery responses have been designated as "highly confidential." (nms)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories (Highly Confidential) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Fifth Amended Responses to Defendant Unifrax's First Set of Interrogatories (Highly Confidential), filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu) (Main Document 140 replaced on 5/23/2016) (nms). Modified on 5/23/2016 (nms).
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena on Lamart Corporation by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Palapura, Bindu)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tomas Perez on May 24, 2016 filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ley Richardson on May 20, 2016 filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dariusz Kawka on May 26, 2016 filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bill Pardo on May 19, 2016 filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. The Court will hold a discovery conference on 6/1/2016, at 9:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews to take up this issue. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Scheduling Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/10/2016. (nms)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Unifrax I LLC on May 12, 2016 filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DuPont's Objections and Responses to Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ken Miller on May 11, 2016 filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena on Evan Chu by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Palapura, Bindu)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Unifrax I LLC's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff DuPont's Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 14-16) filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Unifrax I LLC's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff DuPont's First Set of Interrogatories filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DuPont's Fourth Amended Responses to Unifrax's First Set of Interrogatories (Highly Confidential) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Unifrax I LLC's Amended Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Notice of Videotaped Deposition filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SO ORDERED Granting #124 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of Defendant's Counterclaim III Without Prejudice, filed by Unifrax I LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/22/2016. (nms)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal of Counterclaim III Without Prejudice, by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 4/22/2016 (nms).
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Plaintiff DuPont's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 14-16) filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Service filed on 4/21/2016, at D.I. 120 has been removed from the docket per counsel's request. Counsel will refile the correct document. (nms)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joseph Fernando on May 4, 2016 filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Moore, David)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Olchawski on May 3, 2016 filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Moore, David)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unifrax I LLC's Objections and Responses to E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company's Notice of Videotaped Deposition filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE to Take Deposition of E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) on a time and location mutually agreeable to the parties filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(Mowery, Katharine)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Rioux on April 28, 2016 filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 NOTICE to Take Deposition of George Danker on April 27, 2016 filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Defendant Unifrax I LLC on a date and at a time mutually agreeable to the parties filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Notices of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company re #113 Notice to Take Deposition, #82 Notice to Take Deposition (Palapura, Bindu)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Unifrax I LLC on a day and at a time mutually agreeable to the parties filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories (Highly Confidential), and Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 51-81) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #109 Stipulation and Order to Amend Scheduling Order: Fact Discovery to be completed by 5/27/2016, Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 9/16/2016 (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/28/2016. (nms)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION and Order to Amend Scheduling Order, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 3/29/2016 (nms).
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alyssa N. Lawson for Unifrax I LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cna)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REDACTED VERSION of #102 Notice of Subpoena on Triumph Insulation Systems LLC, by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 3/21/2016 (nms).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REDACTED VERSION of #101 Notice of Subpoena on The Triumph Group Operations, Inc., by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine) Modified on 3/21/2016 (nms).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 14-16) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alyssa N. Lawson - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #105 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alyssa N. Lawson filed by Unifrax I LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/17/2016. (nms)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 SO ORDERED Granting #103 Stipulation to Amend Protective Order (see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/16/2016. (nms)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION to Amend Protective Order by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena on Triumph Insulation Systems LLC by Unifrax I LLC (Mowery, Katharine)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 [SEALED] NOTICE of Subpoena to The Triumph Group Operations, Inc. by Unifrax I LLC (Mowery, Katharine)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Unifrax I LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Unifrax I LLC's Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 51-81) filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Second Amended Initial Disclosures, Second Amended Initial ESI Disclosures and Third Amended Responses to Defendant Unifrax's First Set of Interrogatories (Highly Confidential) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Moore, David)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff DuPont's Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 10-13) filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff DuPonts Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 57-74) filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Farnan, Kelly)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney David A. Prange for Unifrax I LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Prange - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jake M. Holdreith for Unifrax I LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #96 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Prange filed by Unifrax I LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2016. (nms)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jake M. Holdreith - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #95 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jake M. Holdreith filed by Unifrax I LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2016. (nms)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SO ORDERED re #93 Stipulation and Order to Amend Protective Order, filed by Unifrax I LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/26/2016. (nms)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION and Order to Amend Protective Order by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unifrax I LLC's Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff DuPont's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 21-14) filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher R. Hagale for E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2016. (nms)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David E. Moore regarding proposed claim construction orders. (Attachments: #1 DuPont's Proposed Claim Construction Order, #2 Unifrax's Proposed Claim Construction Order)(Moore, David) Modified on 1/20/2016 (nms).
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Hagale of Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 10-13) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #89 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Hagale of Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/19/2016. (nms)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unifrax I LLC's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-24) filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Mowery, Katharine)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for several terms in U.S. Patent No. 8,607,926. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion and suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/13/2016. (nms)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REDACTED VERSION of #84 Answer to Counterclaim, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 1/13/2016 (nms).
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 [SEALED] ANSWER to #79 Second Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 1/8/2016 (nms).
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 57-74) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Unifrax I LLC on a date to be determined [Notice of Videotaped Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6)] filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REDACTED VERSION of #79 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Unifrax I LLC. (Mowery, Katharine)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims (D.I. 79) to January 8, 2016 - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #80 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims (D.I. #79 ) to January 8, 2016, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2015. (nms)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 [SEALED] Second Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, and COUNTERCLAIM against E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company by Unifrax I LLC.(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 12/16/2015 (nms).
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 12-07-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2016. (lad)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Merriam Webster definition. (Cottrell, Frederick)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from David E. Moore regarding additional dictionary definitions for laminate. (Moore, David)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kelly E. Farnan regarding additional dictionary definitions for laminate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 12/9/2015 (nms).
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Joint Claim Construction Brief, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 11/17/2015 (nms).
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORAL ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict the Markman Hearing set for 12/7/2015, will now commence at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/16/2015. (nms)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SO ORDERED, re #71 Stipulation To Amend Protective Order, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2015. (nms)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION to Amend Protective Order by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REVISED Joint Claim Construction Chart, by Unifrax I LLC. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 9/30/2015 (nms).
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and Order to Amend Schedulng Order, by Unifrax I LLC. (Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 8/31/2015 (nms).
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #69 Stipulation and Order To Amend Scheduling Order, filed by Unifrax I LLC (Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 4/29/2016, Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2016)(see Stipulation for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/31/2015. (nms)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #68 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Amended Answer and Counterclaims to September 2, 2015, filed by Unifrax I LLC (Reset Answer Deadlines: Unifrax I LLC answer due 9/2/2015). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/26/2015. (nms)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Amended Answer and Counterclaims to September 2, 2015 - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #67 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Unifrax to file its amended answer and counterclaims to August 26, 2015, filed by Unifrax I LLC (Reset Answer Deadlines: Unifrax I LLC answer due 8/26/2015). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/19/2015. (nms)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Unifrax to file its amended answer and counterclaims to August 26, 2015 - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Joint Claim Construction Chart, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 part 1, #4 Exhibit 2 part 2, #5 Exhibits 3-6, #6 Exhibits 7-8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibits 12-14, #11 Exhibits 15-16, #12 Exhibits 17-18, #13 Exhibits 19-20, #14 Exhibit 21 part 1, #15 Exhibit 21 part 2, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23 part 1, #18 Exhibit 23 part 2)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 8/17/2015 (nms).
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff DuPont's Second Set Set of RFP of Documents and Things to Deft. Unifrax (Nos. 55-56) filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Lester, Katharine)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting #16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III-V of First Amended Counterclaims. Defendant has two weeks from the date of this Memorandum Order to file an amended answer. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2015. (nms)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DuPont's Second Supplemental Responses to Unifrax's First Set of Interrogatories filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unifrax LLC's Proposed Constructions filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DuPont's Proposed Claim Constructions filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DuPont's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Unifrax (Nos. 55-56) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff DuPont's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 7 and 8), filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 7/9/2015 (nms).
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Responses to Plaintiff DuPont's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 1-54) filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Supplemental Responses To Defendant Unifrax's First Set Of Interrogatories [Highly Confidential]; and Plaintiff DuPont's Supplemental Responses To Defendant Unifrax's First Set Of Requests For Production filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DuPont's Amended Initial Disclosures and DuPont's Amended Initial ESI Disclosures filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unifrax I LLC's list of claim terms/phrases for construction re #21 Scheduling Order,, filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Claim Terms for Construction filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Unifrax I LLC's Responses to Plaintiff DuPont's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unifrax (No. 9) filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Unifrax I LLC's Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Infringement Contentions [Contains References to Materials Marked Highly Confidential by Unifrax] and Plaintiff DuPont's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unifrax (No. 9) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Moore, David)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/23/2015. (nms)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Richard L. Horwitz, Esq. regarding protective order disputes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 3/17/2015 (nms).
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding dispute regarding protective order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 3/17/2015 (nms).
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Responses to Defendant Unifrax's First Set of Interrogatories [Confidential-Pursuant to D. Del. LR 26.2]; and Plaintiff DuPont's Responses to Defendant Unifrax's First Set of Requests for Production filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unifrax I LLC's Responses to Plaintiff Dupont's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 1-8) and Responses to Plaintiff Dupont's First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendant UInifrax (Nos. 1-54), filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason) Modified on 3/10/2015 (nms).
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Initial ESI Disclosures (Pursuant To Paragraph 3 Of The Court's Default Standard For Discovery) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SO ORDERED re #43 Stipulation regarding Protocol for Discovery and Use of Electronically Stored Information, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/9/2015. (nms)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION regarding Protocol for Discovery and Use of Electronically Stored Information by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unifrax I LLC's Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Response to #39 Letter, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 3/6/2015 (nms).
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Responses to Defendant Unifrax's Notice to Inspect filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Moore, David)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding subsequent authority in support of Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 3/3/2015 (nms).
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena upon Orcon Corporation by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company (Palapura, Bindu)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties' to file the Protective Order and serve disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery to March 5, 2015 - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties' to file the Protective Order and serve disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery to March 5, 2015, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/23/2015. (nms)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Accused Products List and U.S. Patent No. 8,607,926 File History filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY BRIEF re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III-V of First Amended Counterclaims filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena upon Triumph Group, Inc. by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company (Palapura, Bindu)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unifrax I LLC's Initial Disclosures filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's Initial Disclosures filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Moore, David)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Katharine A. Roin of Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer working on case. (Palapura, Bindu)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Unifrax Holding Co., Corporate Parent Unifrax Holding II Corp., Corporate Parent Unifrax Holding I Corp., Corporate Parent ASP Unifrax Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ASP Unifrax Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ASP Unifrax Investco LP for Unifrax I LLC filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III-V of First Amended Counterclaims filed by Unifrax I LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Cottrell, Frederick)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendant Unifrax I LLC's Notice to Inspect; (ii) Defendant Unifrax I LLC's First Set of Interrogatories; and (iii) Defendant Unifrax I LLC's First Set of Requests for Production filed by Unifrax I LLC.(Rawnsley, Jason)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Telephone Conference is set for 4/28/2015 at 10:00 AM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. A Mediation Conference is tentatively set for 5/28/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/28/15. (cak)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena on Lamart Corporation, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Palapura, Bindu) Modified on 1/28/2015 (nms).
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff DuPont's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 1-8) and Plaintiff DuPont's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Unifrax (Nos. 1-54) filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.(Palapura, Bindu)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to file and serve its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss to February 2, 2015, filed by Unifrax I LLC (Reset Briefing Schedule: re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III-V of First Amended Counterclaims. Answering Brief due 2/2/2015). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/22/2015. (nms)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to file and serve its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss to February 2, 2015 - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 01-20-15 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2015. (lad)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/26/2015 at 12:00 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/21/15. (cak)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 12/4/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2015. Fact Discovery due by 2/19/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 8/5/2016. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 11/16/2015. A Markman Hearing is set for 12/7/2015, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 1/13/2017, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 5 day Jury Trial is set for 1/23/2017, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2015. (nms)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 1/20/2015. (Court Reporter Leonard Dibbs.) (ksr, )
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Farnan on behalf of Unifrax I LLC (Farnan, Kelly)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Richard L. Horwitz, Esquire regarding the parties' Proposed Scheduling Order - re #18 Proposed Order. (Horwitz, Richard)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Horwitz, Richard) Modified on 1/15/2015 (nms).
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III-V of First Amended Counterclaim, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/26/2015. (Moore, David) Modified on 1/9/2015 (nms).
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III-V of First Amended Counterclaims - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, David) Modified on 1/9/2015 (nms).
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sharon R. Desh for E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sharon Desh - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sharon Desh filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2015. (nms)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Amended ANSWER and Counterclaims to #1 Complaint, by Unifrax I LLC.(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 12/19/2014 (nms). Modified on 12/22/2014 (nms).
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher D. Landgraff for E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (rbe)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher D. Landgraff - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Moore, David)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to amend its Answer and Counterclaim (D.I. 9) to December 19, 2014, and the time for Plaintiff to answer, move or otherwise respond to Defendant's amended pleading to January 9, 2015 - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher D. Landgraff filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2014. (nms)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to amend its Answer and Counterclaim to December 19, 2014, and the time for Plaintiff to answer, move or otherwise respond to Defendant's amended pleading to January 9, 2015, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2014. (nms)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/20/2015, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/2/2014. (nms)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to answer, move or otherwise respond to Counterclaims to December 22, 2014, filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company (Reset Answer Deadlines: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company answer due 12/22/2014). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/25/2014. (nms)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to answer, move or otherwise respond to Counterclaims to December 22, 2014 - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Horwitz, Richard)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company by Unifrax I LLC.(Cottrell, Frederick)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph G. Curatolo for Unifrax I LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (els)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Salvatore A. Sidoti for Unifrax I LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (els)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Salvatore A. Sidoti and Joseph G. Curatolo - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel Salvatore A. Sidoti, #2 Certification of Counsel Joseph G. Curatolo)(Rawnsley, Jason)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For Defendant to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 21, 2014, filed by Unifrax I LLC (Reset Answer Deadlines: Unifrax I LLC answer due 11/21/2014). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2014. (nms)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Salvatore A. Sidoti and Joseph G. Curatolo filed by Unifrax I LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2014. (nms)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For Defendant to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 21, 2014 - filed by Unifrax I LLC. (Cottrell, Frederick)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adam K. Mortara,Katharine A. Roin for E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam K. Mortara and Katharine A. Roin of Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/8/2014. (nms)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam K. Mortara and Katharine A. Roin of Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Palapura, Bindu)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Unifrax I LLC served on 10/1/2014, answer due 10/22/2014. (Moore, David)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (dmp, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,607,926;. (dmp, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Unifrax I LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1599026.) - filed by E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Unifrax I LLC on 10/1/2014. (dmp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company v. Unifrax I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Represented By: Sharon Desh
Represented By: Adam K. Mortara
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: Christopher R. Hagale
Represented By: Christopher D. Landgraff
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Katharine A. Roin
Represented By: Mark L. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifrax I LLC
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Joseph G. Curatolo
Represented By: Alyssa N. Lawson
Represented By: Brenda L. Joly
Represented By: David A. Prange
Represented By: Emily E. Niles
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: George Ashenmacher
Represented By: Jake M. Holdreith
Represented By: Katharine Lester Mowery
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Salvatore A. Sidoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?