Sonos Inc. v. D&M Holdings Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sonos Inc.
Defendant: D&M Holdings Inc., D&M Holdings U.S. Inc. and Denon Electronics (USA) LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv01330
Filed: October 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 497 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 463 MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Motion for Judgment on Absolute Intervening Rights With Respect to The '949 Patent --. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 12/7/2017. (nmfn)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 438 proposed joint pretrial order, the parties' motions in limine, a dispute regarding the election of prior art, and the Court's proposed trial procedures for the bellwether trial scheduled to begin on D ecember 11, 2017. The parties have been directed to meet and confer, and to file with the Court a revised list of deposition designations and exhibits, and objections thereto, by 2:00 p.m. on November 28, 2017. The Court will hold a conference with lead trial counsel for each party on December 5, 2017, beginning at 8:00 a.m. in Washington, D.C., to resolve each remaining objection. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 11/21/2017. (nmfn)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 406 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Motions for Summary Judgment (D.I. 298 , 301 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/24/2017. (nms)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 8,938,637, 9,195,258, 9,202,509, and 9,213,357. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/10/2017. (nms)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (D.I. 116 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2017. (nms)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Answer to Add the Defense of Inequitable Conduct (D.I. 176 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2017. (nms) (Main Document 226 replaced on 2/6/2017) (nms).
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple terms in dispute in U.S. Patent Nos. 7,571,014, 8,588,949, 8,843,224, 8,938,312, 8,938,637, 9,042,556, 9,195,258, 9,202,509, 9,213,357, 9,219,959, and D559,197. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2017. (nms)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER ADOPTING 143 Report and Recommendation. The Motion to Strike (D.I. 111 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth in the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/31/2016. (nms)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 111 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f) filed by Sonos Inc. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consist s solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2016. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/10/16. (cak)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (D.I. 19 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/9/2015. (nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonos Inc. v. D&M Holdings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonos Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Represented By: Philip A. Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&M Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&M Holdings U.S. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denon Electronics (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?