Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Actavis Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Mallinckrodt LLC
Defendant: Actavis Inc. and Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv01381
Filed: November 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 TRIAL OPINION: Defendants failed to prove by clear and convincing evidence that claims 1-6 of the '779 patent are invalid. Plaintiffs should submit an agreed upon form of final judgment within two weeks. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/30/2017. (nms)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Motions to Dismiss (D.I. 147 and D.I. 149 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/8/2017. (nms)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Adopting 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Motion to Dismiss Counts I, III, and IV of Plaintiffs' Complaint (D.I. 11 ) is Granted. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/17/2015. (nms)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, III and IV of Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Actavis Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of C ivil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 10/13/2015. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/23/15. (cak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Actavis Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Julia Heaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Julia Heaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?