Quest Integrity USA LLC v. Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.
Plaintiff: Quest Integrity USA LLC
Defendant: Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01482
Filed: December 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 SO ORDERED Granting (409 in 14-cv-1483-RGA, 296 in 14-cv-1482-RGA) Stipulation of Cokebusters USA, Inc. and Quest Integrity USA, LLC and Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/14/2018. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-RGA, 1:14-cv-01483-RGA(nms)
November 13, 2018 Filing 296 STIPULATION and Proposed Order, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/14/2018 (nms).
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 SO ORDERED, re (407 in 14-cv-1483-RGA, 294 in 14-cv-1482-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file answering briefs in response to Motion to Partially Vacate Court's Order Vacating the Markman Order and Final Judgment or to Reinstate Related Opinions and Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/5/2018. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-RGA, 1:14-cv-01483-RGA(nms)
November 5, 2018 Filing 294 STIPULATION to Extend Time - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 11/5/2018 (nms).
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (406 in 14-cv-1483-RGA, 293 in 14-cv-1482-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Answering Brief to Motion to November 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/22/2018. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-RGA, 1:14-cv-01483-RGA(nms)
October 19, 2018 Filing 293 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Answering Brief in Response to Motion to November 7, 2018 - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
October 16, 2018 Filing 292 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Thomas C. Grimm, regarding vacatur in Clean Harbors case. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/17/2018 (nms).
October 15, 2018 Filing 291 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation and Withdrawal of Appearance. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/15/2018 (nms).
October 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Status Conference held on 10/12/2018. (Court Reporter Taneha Carroll - Hawkins Reporting Services.) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-RGA, 1:14-cv-01483-RGA(ksr, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 290 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Sean T. O'Kelly, Esq., regarding request for permission to attend conference on October 12, 2018 at 2:00 p.m.. (O'Kelly, Sean) Modified on 10/12/2018 (nms).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORAL ORDER: A Status Conference with Local Counsel is now set for 10/12/2018, at 2:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/11/2018. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-RGA, 1:14-cv-01483-RGA(nms)
October 10, 2018 Filing 288 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #287 MOTION to Partially Vacate Court's Order Vacating The Markman Order And Final Judgment Or To Reinstate Related Opinions And Judgment In C.A. No. 14-1482, Or Alternatively, For Leave To Intervene, filed by Cokebusters USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-9)(Moore, David) Modified on 10/11/2018 (nms).
October 10, 2018 Filing 287 MOTION to Partially Vacate Court's Order Vacating The Markman Order And Final Judgment Or To Reinstate Related Opinions And Judgment In C.A. No. 14-1482, Or Alternatively, For Leave To Intervene - filed by Cokebusters USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, David) Modified on 10/11/2018 (nms).
October 10, 2018 Filing 286 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Partially Vacate and of Contempraneous Filing of Revised Motion to Partially Vacate by Cokebusters USA Inc.. (Moore, David) Modified on 10/11/2018 (nms).
October 10, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-RGA, 1:14-cv-01483-RGA (rjb)
October 4, 2018 Filing 285 MANDATE of USCA as to #254 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. USCA Decision: Appeal dismissed. (mdb)
October 4, 2018 Filing 284 Letter to Duty Judge, from Stephanie E. O'Byrne, regarding Motion to Partially Vacate Court's Order Vacating Markman Order and Final Judgement or to Reinstate Related Opinions and Judgment in C.A. No. 14-1482. (O'Byrne, Stephanie) Modified on 10/10/2018 (nms).
October 4, 2018 Filing 283 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #282 MOTION to Partially Vacate Court's Order Vacating Markman Order and Final Judgment or to Reinstate Related Opinions and Judgment in C.A. No. 14-1482, filed by Cokebusters USA Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(O'Byrne, Stephanie) Modified on 10/10/2018 (nms).
October 4, 2018 Filing 282 MOTION to Partially Vacate Court's Order Vacating Markman Order and Final Judgment or to Reinstate Related Opinions and Judgment in C.A. No. 14-1482 - filed by Cokebusters USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Byrne, Stephanie) Modified on 10/10/2018 (nms).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 SO ORDERED - re #279 Proposed Order Granting #278 Joint Motion to Vacate filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/27/2018. (mdb)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER of USCA as to #254 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. Decision of USCA: limited remand. (mdb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 279 PROPOSED ORDER re #278 MOTION to Vacate and Dismiss Based upon Under Rules 41, 60(b), and 62.1, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/11/2018 (nms).
September 26, 2018 Filing 278 MOTION to Vacate and Dismiss Based upon Under Rules 41, 60(b), and 62.1 - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/11/2018 (nms).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 SO ORDERED - re #276 Joint MOTION to Vacate #248 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #247 Memorandum Opinion, #251 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 285 and the Court's Inherent Powers, #249 Judgment, #137 Memoran filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/28/2018. (mdb)
August 27, 2018 Filing 276 Joint MOTION to Vacate #248 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #247 Memorandum Opinion, #251 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 285 and the Court's Inherent Powers, #249 Judgment, #137 Memorandum and Order, #259 Bill of Costs, and Dismiss Under Rule 60(b) and 62.1 - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 8/27/2018 (mdb).
October 13, 2017 Filing 275 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Selena E. Molina by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. (Molina, Selena)
September 22, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The transcript filed at DI #271 has been replaced with its redacted version per the court's order on September 21, 2017. (mdb)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #273 Unopposed Motion to Redact Limited Portions of the January 23, 2017 Summary Judgment Hearing Transcript, filed by Cokebusters USA Inc.. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/21/2017. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01483-GMS, 1:14-cv-01482-GMS(mdb) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
September 20, 2017 Filing 274 REDACTED VERSION of #273 Unopposed Motion to Redact Limited Portions of the January 23, 2017 Summary Judgment Hearing Transcript, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc., Cokebusters USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(O'Byrne, Stephanie) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
September 20, 2017 Case Reassigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-GMS, 1:14-cv-01483-GMS (rjb)
September 18, 2017 Filing 273 [SEALED] MOTION to Redact - filed by Cokebusters USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(O'Byrne, Stephanie) Modified on 10/10/2018 (nms).
June 1, 2017 Filing 272 Official Transcript of pretrial conference held on March 29, 2017 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (vjg)
June 1, 2017 Filing 271 Official Transcript of oral argument held on January 23, 2017 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (vjg) (Main Document 271 replaced on 9/22/2017) (mdb).
June 1, 2017 Filing 270 Official Transcript of discovery conference held on September 30, 2016 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (vjg)
June 1, 2017 Filing 269 Official Transcript of status conference held on July 18,2016 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (vjg)
June 1, 2017 Filing 268 Official Transcript of Markman hearing held on June 3, 2016 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (vjg)
June 1, 2017 Filing 267 Official Transcript of discovery conference held on March 17, 2016 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (vjg)
June 1, 2017 Filing 266 Official Transcript of status and scheduling conference held on January 6, 2016 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (vjg)
June 1, 2017 Filing 265 Official Transcript of scheduling conference held on August 27, 2015 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (vjg)
June 1, 2017 Filing 264 Official Transcript of oral argument held on May 5, 2015 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (vjg)
June 1, 2017 Filing 263 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on January 13, 2015 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Hawkins Reporting,Telephone number (302) 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2017. (vjg)
May 25, 2017 Filing 262 MOTION to Strike #259 Bill of Costs - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Grimm, Thomas)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER staying #251 MOTION for Attorney Fees Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 285 and the Court's Inherent Powers filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. pending appeal of the court's summary judgment decisions to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/15/2017. (nmfn)
May 15, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Telephone Conference held on 5/15/2017. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 1:14-cv-01482-SLR(nmfn)
May 12, 2017 Set Hearings: A Telephone Conference is set for 5/15/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson to be coordinated with the already scheduled telephone conference in 14-1483 SLR. (fms)
May 11, 2017 Filing 260 DECLARATION of Robert S. Rigg re #259 Bill of Costs, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B-1)(Molina, Selena) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
May 11, 2017 Filing 259 BILL OF COSTS by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena)
May 9, 2017 Filing 258 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Quest Integrity USA LLC for proceedings held on 01/13/15, 05/5/15, 08/27/15, 01/6/16, 03/17/16, 06/03/16, 07/18/16, 09/30/16, 01/23/17, 03/29/17 before Judge Sue L. Robinson, (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 1, 2017 Filing 257 REDACTED VERSION of (77 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Opening Brief in Support, (92 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Opening Brief in Support, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 27, 2017 Filing 256 REDACTED VERSION of #252 Opening Brief in Support, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Molina, Selena)
April 26, 2017 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI # 252. (fms)
April 25, 2017 Filing 255 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #254 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. USCA Case Number 17-1948 (fms)
April 24, 2017 Filing 254 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #248 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #247 Memorandum Opinion, #249 Judgment, #137 Memorandum and Order . Appeal filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
April 24, 2017 USCA Appeal Fees received: $505, receipt number 0311-2127429 re #254 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas). (dmp, )
April 24, 2017 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #254 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (ceg)
April 19, 2017 Filing 253 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which Quest may file its opposition to Clean Harbors' Motion for Attorneys' Fees to May 16, 2017 - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #253 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which Quest may file its opposition to Clean Harbors' Motion for Attorneys' Fees to May 16, 2017 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC, Set Briefing Schedule: re #251 MOTION for Attorney Fees Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 285 and the Court's Inherent Powers. (Answering Brief due 5/16/2017.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/19/2017. (nmfn)
April 11, 2017 Filing 252 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #251 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses, filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
April 11, 2017 Filing 251 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses - filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 28, 2017 Filing 250 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,542,874 B2. (Attachments: #1 Judgment, #2 Order on Summary Judgment Motions)(nmfn)
March 28, 2017 Filing 249 JUDGMENT in favor of Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. against Quest Integrity USA LLC (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/28/2017. (nmfn)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER denying (179) Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying (183) Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting as to all claims but claim 40 (184) Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting (189) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:14-cv-01482-SLR; denying (285) Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying (289) Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting in part and denying in part (290) Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting as to all claims but claim 40 (293) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:14-cv-01483-SLR. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/28/2017. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
March 28, 2017 Filing 247 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/28/2017. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
March 27, 2017 Filing 246 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Neil Ruegsegger on March 28, 2017 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
March 21, 2017 Filing 245 VERDICT SHEET by Quest Integrity USA LLC . (Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 20, 2017 Filing 244 Proposed Voir Dire by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 20, 2017 Filing 243 Proposed Jury Instructions by Quest Integrity USA LLC . (Tigan, Jeremy)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER, Re-setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: ( The Final Pretrial Conference is rescheduled for 3/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/20/2017. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
March 17, 2017 Filing 241 Proposed Pretrial Order by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 22, 2017 Filing 240 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Cristofer I. Leffler as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer working on case. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 13, 2017 Filing 239 REDACTED VERSION of #226 Reply Brief by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena)
February 6, 2017 Filing 238 REDACTED VERSION of (337 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 230 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 6, 2017 Filing 237 REDACTED VERSION of (229 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 336 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Declaration by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 6, 2017 Filing 236 REDACTED VERSION of (335 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 228 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 6, 2017 Filing 235 REDACTED VERSION of (334 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Sur-Reply Brief, (227 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Sur-Reply Brief by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 6, 2017 Filing 234 REDACTED VERSION of (219 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration, (326 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Declaration by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
February 6, 2017 Filing 233 REDACTED VERSION of #218 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply), by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
January 24, 2017 Filing 232 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Neil Ruegsegger on January 31, 2017 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
January 23, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Oral Argument held on 1/23/2017. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
January 20, 2017 Filing 231 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andrew W. Carter on January 25, 2017 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
January 18, 2017 Filing 230 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (334 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Sur-Reply Brief, (227 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Sur-Reply Brief (Caligiuri, Souri) by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
January 18, 2017 Filing 229 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (334 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Sur-Reply Brief, (227 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Sur-Reply Brief (Bondurant, De Lorenzo) by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
January 18, 2017 Filing 228 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (334 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Sur-Reply Brief, (227 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Sur-Reply Brief (Hepler) by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Grimm, Thomas)
January 18, 2017 Filing 227 [SEALED] SUR-REPLY BRIEF re #183 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Validity) filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
January 18, 2017 Filing 226 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 18, 2017 Filing 225 REDACTED VERSION of #222 Declaration, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Molina, Selena)
January 18, 2017 Filing 224 REDACTED VERSION of #221 Declaration, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena)
January 18, 2017 Filing 223 REDACTED VERSION of #220 Reply Brief, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena)
January 11, 2017 Filing 222 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #220 Reply Brief, Declaration of Kimberly Lewis in Support of Defendants' Combined Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Farnan, Kelly)
January 11, 2017 Filing 221 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #220 Reply Brief, Supplemental Declaration of Scott Schaefer, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Combined Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 11, 2017 Filing 220 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #184 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Infringement of '874 Patent) Defendants' Combined Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 11, 2017 Filing 219 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #218 Brief (Combined Answering and Reply), (Caligiuri) by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grimm, Thomas)
January 11, 2017 Filing 218 [SEALED] BRIEF (Combined Answering and Reply) re #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Infringement of '874 Patent) filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/18/2017. (Grimm, Thomas)
January 11, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Exhibits to Defendants' Sealed Joint Opening Brief (D.I. 185 in Civ. No. 14-1482 and D.I. 294 in Civ. No. 14-1483) have been replaced with corrected versions per request of counsel. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
January 6, 2017 Filing 217 REDACTED VERSION of #199 Exhibit to a Document, Volume 2 of 2 Declaration of Selena E. Molina, Esq. in Support of Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Combined Opening Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-I nfringement and Response Brief Opposing Quest's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16-24, #2 Exhibit 25)(Molina, Selena)
January 6, 2017 Filing 216 REDACTED VERSION of #196 Declaration,, Volume 1 of 2 Declaration of Selena E. Molina, Esq. in Support of Defendnat Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Combined Opening Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Response Brief Opposing Quest's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15)(Molina, Selena)
January 6, 2017 Filing 215 REDACTED VERSION of #194 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering),, Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Combined Opening Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Response Brief Opposing Quest's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena)
January 6, 2017 Filing 214 REDACTED VERSION of (203 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 312 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Declaration, of Neil Ruegsegger by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 6, 2017 Filing 213 REDACTED VERSION of (311 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 202 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration, of Robert De Lorenzo and Phil Bondurant by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 6, 2017 Filing 212 REDACTED VERSION of (310 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 201 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration, of Phil Bondurant by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 6, 2017 Filing 211 REDACTED VERSION of (309 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 200 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration, of Robert De Lorenzo by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 6, 2017 Filing 210 REDACTED VERSION of (308 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 198 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration, of Madeline Hepler by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 6, 2017 Filing 209 REDACTED VERSION of (197 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 307 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Declaration, of Robert Caligiuri, Ph.D., PE. FASM. and Shukri J. Souri, Ph.D. by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 6, 2017 Filing 208 REDACTED VERSION of (195 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), (306 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 6, 2017 Filing 207 REDACTED VERSION of #182 Declaration by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 6, 2017 Filing 206 REDACTED VERSION of #181 Declaration by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, C-D)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 6, 2017 Filing 205 REDACTED VERSION of #180 Opening Brief in Support by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (313 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 204 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Madeline D. Hepler filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/3/2017. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(fms)
December 29, 2016 Filing 204 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Madeline D. Hepler - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 28, 2016 Filing 203 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (195 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), (306 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), - Declaration of Neil Ruegsegger by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grimm, Thomas)
December 28, 2016 Filing 202 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (195 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), (306 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), - Declaration of Robert De Lorenzo and Phil Bondurant by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
December 28, 2016 Filing 201 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (195 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), (306 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), - Declaration of Phil Bondurant by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
December 28, 2016 Filing 200 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (195 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), (306 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), - Declaration of Robert De Lorenzo by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
December 28, 2016 Filing 199 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #196 Declaration,, Volume 2 of 2 Declaration of Selena E. Molina, Esq. in Support of Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Combined Opening Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Response Brief Opposing Quest's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16-25)(Molina, Selena)
December 28, 2016 Filing 198 [SEALED] DECLARATION re (195 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), (306 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Brief (Combined Opening and Answering), - Declaration of Madeline Helper by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-M)(Grimm, Thomas)
December 28, 2016 Filing 197 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Robert Caligiuri, Ph.D., PE. FASM. and Shukri J. Souri, Ph.D. re #195 Combined Opening and Answering Brief, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 28, 2016 Filing 196 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #194 Brief (Combined Opening and Answering),, Volume 1 of 2 Declaration of Selena E. Molina, Esq. in Support of Defendnat Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc's Combined Opening Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Response Brief Opposing Quest's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-7, #3 Exhibit 8-15)(Molina, Selena)
December 28, 2016 Filing 195 [SEALED] BRIEF (Combined Opening and Answering) re #184 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, #183 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Validity) filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/11/2017. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/4/2017. (Grimm, Thomas)
December 28, 2016 Filing 194 [SEALED] BRIEF (Combined Opening and Answering) of Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc. re #189 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Infringement of '874 Patent) filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/11/2017. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/4/2017. (Molina, Selena)
December 22, 2016 Filing 193 REDACTED VERSION of #188 Exhibit to a Document, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena)
December 22, 2016 Filing 192 REDACTED VERSION of #187 Declaration, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena)
December 21, 2016 Filing 191 REDACTED VERSION of #186 Declaration, Declaration of Marie Loonam in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Molina, Selena)
December 21, 2016 Filing 190 REDACTED VERSION of #185 Opening Brief in Support, Defendants' Opening Brief in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Molina, Selena)
December 14, 2016 Filing 189 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement - filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena)
December 14, 2016 Filing 188 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #187 Declaration, #185 Opening Brief in Support, #184 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Scott Schaefer, Ph.D. and Jerry Rau -- Volume 2 of 2) by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21-23, #2 Exhibit 24-26, #3 Exhibit 27-30, #4 Exhibit 31-36, #5 Exhibit 37-39, #6 Exhibit 40-48)(Molina, Selena)
December 14, 2016 Filing 187 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #185 Opening Brief in Support, #184 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Scott Schaefer, Ph.D. and Jerry Rau -- Volume 1 of 2) by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9, #2 Exhibit 10-13, #3 Exhibit 14-20)(Molina, Selena)
December 14, 2016 Filing 186 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #185 Opening Brief in Support, #184 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Declaration of Marie Loonam) by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Molina, Selena)
December 14, 2016 Filing 185 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #184 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/28/2016. (Molina, Selena) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2017: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (nmfn, ). Modified on 1/11/2017 (nmfn).
December 14, 2016 Filing 184 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity - filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molina, Selena)
December 14, 2016 Filing 183 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Validity) - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
December 14, 2016 Filing 182 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Robert Caligiuri, Ph.D., PE. FASM. and Shukri J. Souri, Ph.D. re #180 Opening Brief in Support, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 14, 2016 Filing 181 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Tigan re #180 Opening Brief in Support, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A, C-D)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 14, 2016 Filing 180 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Infringement of '874 Patent, filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/28/2016. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 14, 2016 Filing 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Infringement of '874 Patent - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
November 21, 2016 Filing 178 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Caligiuri, Ph.D., FASM on November 30, 2016 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
November 21, 2016 Filing 177 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shukri J. Souri, Ph.D. on November 29, 2016 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
November 14, 2016 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Reply Expert Report of Robert Caligiuri, Ph.D., PE, FASM, and Shukri J. Souri, Ph.D.; and (2) Reply Expert Report of Andrew W. Carter filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
November 11, 2016 Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of the Reply Expert Report of Dr. Scott Schaefer and Jerry Ray filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
November 11, 2016 Filing 174 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Scott Schaefer on December 2, 2016 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 11, 2016 Filing 173 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jerry Rau on December 1, 2016 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 11, 2016 Filing 172 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeffrey A. Compton on November 17, 2016 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 7, 2016 Filing 171 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Rebuttal Expert Report of Robert Caligiuri, Ph.D., PE, FASM, and Shukri J. Souri, Ph.D. Regarding Validity of United States Patent No. 7,542,874; (2) Declaration of Neil Ruegsegger; and (3) Declaration of Andrew W. Carter Regarding Commercial Success of U.S. Patent No. 7,542,874 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 4, 2016 Filing 170 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Declaration of Jeffrey Alan Compton filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting (152 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaim filed by Cokebusters USA Inc., denying (202 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 147 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. SEE MEMORANDUM ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/1/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
October 27, 2016 Filing 168 NOTICE OF SERVICE of updated version of Exhibit 157 to the Expert Report of Dr. Scott Schaefer and Jerry Rau filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
October 24, 2016 Filing 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of Andrew W. Carter and (2) Opening Expert Report of Robert Caligiuri, Ph.D., PE, FASM, and Shukri J. Souri, Ph.D., Regarding Infringement of United States Patent No. 7,542,874 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 21, 2016 Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Dr. Scott Schaefer and Jerry Rau filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
October 13, 2016 Filing 165 REDACTED VERSION of #164 Declaration, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
October 13, 2016 Filing 164 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Ronald Maurier by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 5, 2016 Filing 163 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's Amended 30(b)(6) Notice to Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc. filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (246 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 162 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Stipulation filed by Cokebusters USA Inc. Setting Deadlines: ( Opening Expert Reports due by 10/21/2016.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/5/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(fms)
October 4, 2016 Filing 162 STIPULATION to Amend Case Schedule by Cokebusters USA Inc.. (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
September 30, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Discovery Conference held on 9/30/2016. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
September 29, 2016 Filing 161 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Stephanie E. O'Byrne, Esquire regarding Defendants' Proposed Agenda for the September 30, 2016 In-Person Discovery Conference. (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
September 29, 2016 Filing 160 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas C. Grimm regarding issues for discovery conference. (Grimm, Thomas)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (234 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cristofer I. Leffler filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC, (159 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cristofer I. Leffler filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/28/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(fms)
September 27, 2016 Filing 159 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cristofer I. Leffler - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 27, 2016 Filing 158 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Clean Harbors USA Inc. (AMENDED) on October 6, 2016 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 27, 2016 Filing 157 REDACTED VERSION of (222 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Declaration, (152 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration by Cokebusters USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, D)(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
September 27, 2016 Filing 156 REDACTED VERSION of (221 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Declaration, (153 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration by Cokebusters USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, C, E-G)(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
September 26, 2016 Filing 155 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Identification of Prior Art References filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
September 26, 2016 Filing 154 REDACTED VERSION of #148 Declaration by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 26, 2016 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #148 . (fms)
September 23, 2016 Set Hearings: A Discovery Conference is set for 9/30/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (219 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 150 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for rebuttal and reply expert reports and close of expert discovery to November 4, 2016; November 11, 2016; and December 2, 2016, respectively filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC, Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: ( Expert Discovery due by 12/2/2016.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/20/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
September 19, 2016 Filing 153 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #151 Response to Motion, (Declaration of Thomas M. Fulkerson) by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, C, E-G)(Molina, Selena)
September 19, 2016 Filing 152 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #151 Response to Motion, (Declaration of Selena E. Molina, Esq.) by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, D)(Molina, Selena)
September 19, 2016 Filing 151 Joint RESPONSE to Motion re #147 MOTION for Reconsideration re (145 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 145 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 194 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 194 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Order,,, Scheduling Order,, filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena)
September 19, 2016 Filing 150 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for rebuttal and reply expert reports and close of expert discovery to November 4, 2016; November 11, 2016; and December 2, 2016, respectively - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 7, 2016 Filing 149 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Clean Harbors USA Inc. on September 19, 2016 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 7, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket texts of D.I. Nos. 148 (14-1482-SLR) and 206 (14-1483-SLR) have been corrected to reflect Quest Integrity USA LLC as the filer. The pdf of the declaration has been replaced with a version that has a cover page with both case captions. The docket text of D.I. 203 (14-1483-SLR) has been changed to reflect Jeremy Tigan, Esq. as the filer. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(fms)
September 6, 2016 Filing 148 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Douglas A. Grady by Quest Integrity USA, LLC (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 9/7/2016 (fms). (Main Document 148 replaced on 9/7/2016) (fms).
September 2, 2016 Filing 147 MOTION for Reconsideration re (145 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 145 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 194 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 194 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Order,,, Scheduling Order,, - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
August 29, 2016 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for the Production of Documents to Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc. filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER re: outstanding discovery disputes and proposed schedules. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Fact Discovery completed by 9/19/2016., Expert Discovery due by 11/30/2016., Dispositive Motions due by 12/14/2016., An Oral Argument is set for 1/23/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/23/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Jury Trial is set for 4/17/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/19/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
July 29, 2016 Filing 144 REDACTED VERSION of (186 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 140 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Letter by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc., Cokebusters USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
July 28, 2016 Filing 143 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Requests for the Production of Documents to Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc. filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Grimm, Thomas)
July 22, 2016 Filing 142 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas C. Grimm regarding Trial Schedule - re (184 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Letter, Markman Hearing, (52 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grimm, Thomas)
July 22, 2016 Filing 141 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Kelly E. Farnan regarding remaining discovery disputes - re Status Conference. (Farnan, Kelly)
July 22, 2016 Filing 140 [SEALED] Joint Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Stephanie E. O'Byrne, Esquire regarding remaining discovery disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
July 18, 2016 Filing 139 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas C. Grimm regarding Quest's agenda items for today's in-person status conference. (Grimm, Thomas)
July 18, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - In-Person Status Conference held on 7/18/2016. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
July 14, 2016 Filing 138 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Stephanie E. O'Byrne, Esquire regarding in-person conference - re SO ORDERED,,,, Scheduling Order,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: claim construction. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/28/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
June 3, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Markman Hearing held on 6/3/2016. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
June 2, 2016 Filing 136 Joint APPENDIX of Intrinsic Evidence (Amended) by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4, #5 Part 5)(Tigan, Jeremy)
June 2, 2016 Filing 135 CLAIM Construction Chart by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER, Re-Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines ( The Markman Hearing is rescheduled for 6/3/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/27/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
May 26, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of Attachment 3 (Exhibits F-I) of D.I. #127 and the pdf of D.I. #131 have been replaced with corrected versions per request of counsel. (nmfn)
April 19, 2016 Filing 133 REDACTED VERSION of #131 Claim Construction Answering Brief, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit M)(Molina, Selena) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
April 13, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, a certificate of service has been attached to D.I. #131 . (fms)
April 12, 2016 Filing 132 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re #127 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
April 12, 2016 Filing 131 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re #128 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit M)(Molina, Selena) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2016: #5 Certificate of Service) (fms). (Main Document 131 replaced on 5/26/2016) (nmfn, ).
April 4, 2016 Filing 130 REDACTED VERSION of (160 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (128 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Claim Construction Opening Brief by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 4, 2016 Filing 129 REDACTED VERSION of #127 Claim Construction Opening Brief Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief (PUBLIC VERSION) by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibits D-E, #3 Exhibits F-I)(Farnan, Kelly)
March 28, 2016 Filing 128 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 28, 2016 Filing 127 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-E, #3 Exhibit F-I)(Farnan, Kelly) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/26/2016) (nmfn, ).
March 28, 2016 Filing 126 Joint APPENDIX of Intrinsic Evidence by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4)(Grimm, Thomas)
March 17, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Discovery Conference held on 3/17/2016. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
March 11, 2016 Reset Hearings: The Discovery Conference is rescheduled for 3/17/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson per unopposed request of counsel. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
February 26, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Phillip D. Bondurant on March 4, 2016 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER, Rescheduling Hearings (The Discovery Conference is rescheduled for 3/17/2016 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/25/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
February 8, 2016 Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and (2) Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc. filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (145 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 122 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER: ( A Discovery Conference is set for 3/17/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson, Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 3/28/2016., Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 4/12/2016., A Markman Hearing is set for 6/3/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/19/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Jury Trial is set for 1/9/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/26/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
January 22, 2016 Filing 122 Joint PROPOSED ORDER - [Proposed] Supplemental Scheduling Order re Status Conference, (129 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 112 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Proposed Order by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 T.Grimm letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Grimm, Thomas)
January 8, 2016 Filing 121 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Quest Integrity USA, LLC on January 12, 2016 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Molina, Selena)
January 6, 2016 Reset Hearings: The In-Person Status Conference is rescheduled for 1/6/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
January 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - In-Person Status and Scheduling Conference held on 1/6/2016. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Counsel to submit the final proposed scheduling order to the court. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
January 5, 2016 Filing 120 Joint Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas C. Grimm regarding agenda letter - re (133 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 133 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 133 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 116 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 116 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 116 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Hearings,. (Grimm, Thomas)
December 22, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of Exhibit A to the Claim Construction Chart has been replaced with a corrected version per request of filer. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
December 18, 2015 Filing 119 CLAIM Construction Chart by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc., Cokebusters USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/22/2015) (nmfn, ).
December 11, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Supplemental List of Claim Terms for Construction and Proposed Constructions filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
December 11, 2015 Filing 117 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.; and (2) Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc. filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re (132 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 115 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Stipulation to Amend Case Scheduling Order, ORDER, Setting Deadlines/Hearings (The parties will file their Joint Claim Construction Statement on or before 12/18/2015. The In-Person Status Conference is re-set for 1/6/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/27/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
October 23, 2015 Filing 115 STIPULATION to Amend Case Scheduling Order, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
October 9, 2015 Filing 114 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Initial List of Proposed Terms for Claim Construction and Initial Proposed Construction of Claim Terms and (2) Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
September 25, 2015 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Infringement Contentions filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (129 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 112 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. (An In-Person Status Conference is set for 10/29/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson, A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/19/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Jury Trial is set for 1/9/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/22/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
September 21, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of the proposed scheduling order has been replaced with a corrected version. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
September 17, 2015 Filing 112 PROPOSED ORDER // SCHEDULING ORDER by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Main Document 112 replaced on 9/21/2015) (nmfn, ).
September 9, 2015 Filing 111 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Quest's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
September 9, 2015 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures in Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
September 4, 2015 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Quests's Identification of Accused Products, Asserted Claims, Damages Model and Prosecution File History filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
August 27, 2015 Filing 108 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Thomas C. Grimm regarding request that the Court disregard Defendants' letter filed August 26, 2015 - re (124 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 107 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Letter. (Grimm, Thomas)
August 27, 2015 Reset Hearings: The Scheduling Conference is rescheduled for 8/27/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
August 27, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Scheduling Conference held on 8/27/2015. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Counsel to submit the final proposed scheduling order to the court. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
August 26, 2015 Filing 107 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Defendants regarding proposed Scheduling Order - re (106 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 123 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Proposed Order. (Moore, David)
August 26, 2015 Filing 106 PROPOSED ORDER // SCHEDULING ORDER by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Table of Dates)(Grimm, Thomas)
August 26, 2015 Filing 105 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove John R. Nelson as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer involved in the case. (Grimm, Thomas)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting (62) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-01482-SLR; denying (78) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:14-cv-01483-SLR. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/22/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
July 22, 2015 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/22/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order Setting In-Person Patent Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/27/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/20/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying (25 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR), (25 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/8/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
July 8, 2015 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/8/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying (7 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC, (7 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/12/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(fms)
May 18, 2015 Filing 98 REPLY BRIEF re #76 MOTION to Preclude - Quest Integrity USA, LLC's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Leonard Bond filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
May 8, 2015 Filing 97 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #76 MOTION to Preclude - Quest Integrity USA, LLC's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Leonard Bond filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2015. (Molina, Selena)
May 5, 2015 Filing 96 REDACTED VERSION of #89 Declaration, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3-6, #5 Exhibit 7-10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12-13)(Molina, Selena)
May 5, 2015 Filing 95 REDACTED VERSION of #88 Sur-Reply Brief by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena)
May 5, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Oral Argument held on 5/5/2015. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(fms)
April 29, 2015 Filing 94 REDACTED VERSION of (96 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Declaration, (82 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration, Supplemental and Rebuttal Declaration of Robert Caligiuri, Ph.D., PE, FASM, and Srinivasan Jagannathan, Ph.D., M.B.A. in Support of Quest Integrity USA, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 4/29/2015 (fms).
April 29, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, D.I. No. 93 in 14-1482 SLR and D.I. 108 in 14-1483 SLR have been removed and replaced. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(fms)
April 28, 2015 Filing 93 REDACTED VERSION of (95 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Declaration, (81 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration re (93 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR), (78 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Reply Brief - Supplemental Declaration of Andrew W. Carter by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Main Document 93 replaced on 4/29/2015) (fms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2015: #1 Part 2) (fms).
April 28, 2015 Filing 92 REDACTED VERSION of (94 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Declaration, (80 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Declaration re (93 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR), (78 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) Reply Brief - Supplemental Declaration of Richard Roberts in Support of Quest Integrity USA, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 28, 2015 Filing 91 REDACTED VERSION of #79 Declaration re #78 Reply Brief - Declaration of Douglas Grady in Support of Quest Integrity USA, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 28, 2015 Filing 90 REDACTED VERSION of #78 Reply Brief re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy)
April 28, 2015 Filing 89 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #88 Sur-Reply Brief of Dr. Leonard J. Bond by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Farnan, Kelly)
April 28, 2015 Filing 88 [SEALED] SUR-REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
April 27, 2015 Filing 87 REDACTED VERSION of #75 Declaration,, Volume 3 to Amended Declaration of Dr. Leonard J. Bond by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24-26, #2 Exhibit 27 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 27 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 27 Part 3, #5 Exhibit 27 Part 4, #6 Exhibit 27 Part 5, #7 Exhibit 27 Part 6, #8 Exhibit 28-32, #9 Exhibit 33-36, #10 Exhibit 37-42, #11 Exhibit 43, #12 Exhibit 44-45, #13 Exhibit 46-49)(Molina, Selena)
April 27, 2015 Filing 86 REDACTED VERSION of #74 Declaration,, Volume 2 to Amended Declaration of Dr. Leonard J. Bond by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, 9a, 10, 11, 12a, 12b, 13-17, 18, 18A, 18B, 19, and 20, #2 Exhibit 21 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 21 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 21 Part 3, #5 Exhibit 22 and 23)(Molina, Selena)
April 27, 2015 Filing 85 REDACTED VERSION of #73 Declaration, Volume 1 to Amended Declaration of Dr. Leonard J. Bond by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 Part 3, #6 Exhibit 4a, 4b, 5, 6, 7, and 8)(Molina, Selena)
April 27, 2015 Filing 84 REPLY BRIEF re #62 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Renewed Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss and Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Allegations filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
April 24, 2015 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Selena E. Molina on behalf of Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. (Molina, Selena)
April 21, 2015 Filing 82 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #78 Reply Brief - Supplemental and Rebuttal Declaration of Robert Caligiuri, Ph.D., PE, FASM, and Srinivasan Jagannathan, Ph.D., M.B.A. in Support of Quest Integrity USA, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Grimm, Thomas)
April 21, 2015 Filing 81 [SEALED] Supplemental DECLARATION of Andrew W. Carter re #78 Reply Brief, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
April 21, 2015 Filing 80 [SEALED] Supplemental DECLARATION of Richard Roberts re #78 Reply Brief, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
April 21, 2015 Filing 79 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Douglas Grady re #78 Reply Brief, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
April 21, 2015 Filing 78 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
April 21, 2015 Filing 77 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #76 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Leonard Bond, filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
April 21, 2015 Filing 76 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Leonard Bond - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
April 20, 2015 Filing 75 [SEALED] Amended DECLARATION Dr. Leonard Bond, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26, #4 Exhibit 27, #5 Exhibit 28, #6 Exhibit 29, #7 Exhibit 30, #8 Exhibit 31, #9 Exhibit 32, #10 Exhibit 33, #11 Exhibit 34, #12 Exhibit 35, #13 Exhibit 36, #14 Exhibit 37, #15 Exhibit 38, #16 Exhibit 39, #17 Exhibit 40, #18 Exhibit 41, #19 Exhibit 42, #20 Exhibit 43, #21 Exhibit 44, #22 Exhibit 45, #23 Exhibit 46, #24 Exhibit 47, #25 Exhibit 48, #26 Exhibit 49)(Molina, Selena) Modified on 4/21/2015 (fms). Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
April 20, 2015 Filing 74 [SEALED] Amended DECLARATION of Dr. Leonard Bond, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 9a, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12a, #6 Exhibit 12b, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 18, #13 Exhibit 18a, #14 Exhibit 18b, #15 Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit 20, #17 Exhibit 21 Part 1, #18 Exhibit 21 Part 2, #19 Exhibit 21 Part 3, #20 Exhibit 21 Part 4, #21 Exhibit 21 Part 5, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Molina, Selena) Modified on 4/21/2015 (fms). Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
April 20, 2015 Filing 73 [SEALED] Amended DECLARATION of Dr. Leonard Bond, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 Part 3, #6 Exhibit 3 Part 4, #7 Exhibit 3 Part 5, #8 Exhibit 4a, #9 Exhibit 4b, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8)(Molina, Selena) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 31, 2015 Filing 72 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven Morrison on April 9, 2015 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2015 Filing 71 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Leonard Bond on April 6, 2015 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2015 Filing 70 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Phipps on April 10, 2015 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2015 Filing 69 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeffrey Compton on April 13, 2015 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gregory Colson on April 1, 2015 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2015 Filing 67 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Thewsey on April 14, 2015 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2015 Filing 66 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Donald Savage on April 2, 2015 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2015 Filing 65 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chris Boase on April 8, 2015 filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
March 31, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, attachment 9 (Exhibits 4a, 4b, 5 and 6) to D.I. #52 have been removed and replaced to attach new exhibits 5 and 6 that are smaller in volume because they are only including the relevant pages of the transcript. (fms) Modified on 4/6/2015 (fms).
March 30, 2015 Filing 64 ANSWER to #45 Answer to Complaint, and Counterclaims, by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 30, 2015 Filing 63 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #62 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Renewed Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss and Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Allegations filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grimm, Thomas)
March 30, 2015 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs' Renewed Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss and Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Allegations - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
March 27, 2015 Filing 61 REDACTED VERSION of #51 Declaration of Jeffrey Allan Compton, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3a, #4 Exhibit 3b, #5 Exhibit 3c, #6 Exhibit 3d, #7 Exhibit 4a, #8 Exhibit 4b, #9 Exhibit 4c, #10 Exhibit 4d, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 5a, #13 Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibits 9-14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18-19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22-26, #24 Exhibit 27, #25 Exhibit 28-39)(Molina, Selena) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 27, 2015 Filing 60 REDACTED VERSION of #54 Declaration of Dr. Leonard J. Bond, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26, #4 Exhibit 27 part 1, #5 Exhibit 27 part 2, #6 Exhibit 27 part 3, #7 Exhibit 27 part 4, #8 Exhibit 27 part 5, #9 Exhibit 27 part 6, #10 Exhibit 28, #11 Exhibit 29, #12 Exhibit 30, #13 Exhibit 31, #14 Exhibit 32, #15 Exhibit 33, #16 Exhibit 34, #17 Exhibit 35, #18 Exhibit 36)(Molina, Selena) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 27, 2015 Filing 59 REDACTED VERSION of #53 Declaration of Dr. Leonard J. Bond, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 9a, #3 Exhibit 10-11, #4 Exhibit 12a-12b, #5 Exhibit 13-15, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 17, #8 Exhibit 18, #9 Exhibit 18a -18b, #10 Exhibit 19, #11 Exhibit 20, #12 Exhibit 21 part 1, #13 Exhibit 21 part 2, #14 Exhibit 21 part 3, #15 Exhibit 22, #16 Exhibit 23)(Molina, Selena) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 27, 2015 Filing 58 REDACTED VERSION of #52 Declaration of Dr. Leonard J. Bond, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 part 3, #6 Exhibit 3 part 4, #7 Exhibit 4a, #8 Exhibit 4b, #9 Exhibit 5-6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8)(Molina, Selena) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 27, 2015 Filing 57 REDACTED VERSION of #50 Declaration of Chris Boase, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Molina, Selena) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 27, 2015 Filing 56 REDACTED VERSION of #49 Declaration of Donald Savage, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 27, 2015 Filing 55 REDACTED VERSION of #48 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Molina, Selena) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 20, 2015 Filing 54 (THIS HAS BEEN AMENDED - SEE D.I. NOS. 73, 74, 75) [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #52 Declaration, (Declaration of Dr. Leonard J. Bond - Volume 3) by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24 - 26, #2 Exhibit 27, Part 1, #3 Exhibit 27, Part 2, #4 Exhibit 28, #5 Exhibit 29 - 30, #6 Exhibit 31 - 32, #7 Exhibit 33, #8 Exhibit 34 - 36)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 4/21/2015 (fms).
March 20, 2015 Filing 53 (THIS HAS BEEN AMENDED - SEE D.I. NOS. 73, 74, 75)[SEALED] EXHIBIT re #52 Declaration, (Declaration of Dr. Leonard J. Bond - Volume 2) by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9 - 10, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12a, #4 Exhibit 12b, #5 Exhibit 13 - 14, #6 Exhibit 15 - 17, #7 Exhibit 18, 18a, 18b, #8 Exhibit 19-20, #9 Exhibit 21, Part 1, #10 Exhibit 21, Part 2, #11 Exhibit 21, Part 3, #12 Exhibit 21, Part 4, #13 Exhibit 21, Part 5, #14 Exhibit 21, Part 6, #15 Exhibit 22 - 23)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 4/21/2015 (fms).
March 20, 2015 Filing 52 (THIS HAS BEEN AMENDED - SEE D.I. NOS. 73, 74, 75) [SEALED] DECLARATION of Dr. Leonard J. Bond, Volume 1 re #48 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3, Part 1, #3 Exhibit 3, Part 2, #4 Exhibit 3, Part 3, #5 Exhibit 3, Part 4, #6 Exhibit 3, Part 5, #7 Exhibit 3, Part 6, #8 Exhibit 3, Part 7, #9 Exhibit 4a, 4b, 5-6, #10 Exhibit 7 - 8)(Farnan, Kelly) (Attachment 9 replaced on 3/31/2015) (fms). Modified on 4/21/2015 (fms). Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 20, 2015 Filing 51 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Jeffrey Alan Compton re #48 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5, #2 Exhibits 6-10, #3 Exhibits 11-15, #4 Exhibit 16, #5 Exhibit 17, Part 1, #6 Exhibit 17, Part 2, #7 Exhibit 17, Part 3, #8 Exhibit 17, Part 4, #9 Exhibit 17, Part 5, #10 Exhibit 17, Part 6, #11 Exhibit 17, Part 7, #12 Exhibits 18-39)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 20, 2015 Filing 50 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Chris Boase re #48 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 20, 2015 Filing 49 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Donald Savage re #48 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 20, 2015 Filing 48 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/30/2015. (Farnan, Kelly)
March 20, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: The proposed protective order filed on 3/19/2015 has been removed and replaced with a version that contains a so ordered line. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(fms)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (46 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 52 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) Proposed Order filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/20/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(fms)
March 19, 2015 Filing 47 REDACTED VERSION of #45 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Molina, Selena)
March 19, 2015 Filing 46 PROPOSED ORDER -- Protective Order -- by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Main Document 46 replaced on 3/20/2015) (fms).
March 12, 2015 Filing 45 [SEALED] First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against Quest Integrity USA LLC by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 9, 2015 Filing 44 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Transfer - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
March 3, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert S. Rigg for Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mas, )
February 23, 2015 Filing 43 ANSWER to #28 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Grimm, Thomas)
February 23, 2015 Filing 42 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #41 Motion to Dismiss and Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Allegations, filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/12/2015. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
February 23, 2015 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Allegations - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
February 23, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andy Carter on March 3, 2015 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
February 20, 2015 Filing 39 Joinder in Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(A) - filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 2/23/2015 (fms). Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
February 13, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-8) filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
February 13, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rich Roberts on February 24, 2015 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
February 13, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bob DeLorenzo on February 26, 2015 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
February 13, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Todd Katz on February 27, 2015 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
February 13, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andy Carter on March 6, 2015 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Molina, Selena)
February 13, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Quest Integrity USA, LLC's Responses to Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.'s Request for Production of Documents filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
February 9, 2015 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Richard Roberts re #30 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
February 9, 2015 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Douglas Grady re #30 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
February 9, 2015 Filing 30 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #25 Joinder in Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(A), filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/20/2015. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
January 30, 2015 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Clean Harbors, Inc. for Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 30, 2015 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Quest Integrity USA LLC by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (27 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 29 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) STIPULATION regarding deadlines governing briefing and discovery related to the preliminary injunction motions, ORDER setting briefing schedule re(7 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (7 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (Answering Brief due 3/20/2015., Reply Brief due 4/21/2015.), ORDER, Setting Hearings( An Oral Argument is set for 5/5/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/29/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
January 27, 2015 Filing 27 STIPULATION regarding deadlines governing briefing and discovery related to the preliminary injunction motions re (7 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , (7 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
January 23, 2015 Filing 26 DECLARATION re #25 Joinder in Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(A), by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
January 23, 2015 Filing 25 Joinder in Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(A) - filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
January 20, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc. filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.(Tigan, Jeremy)
January 20, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Clean Harbors Industrial Services, Inc.s Request for Production of Documents filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
January 15, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert S. Rigg of Vedder Price - filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert S. Rigg of Vedder Price filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/15/2015. (fms)
January 13, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Telephone Conference held on 1/13/2015. (Court Reporter Hawkins Reporting, 658-6697.) Counsel to submit a final proposed scheduling order to the court. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01481-SLR, 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
January 8, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Turgeon for Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint and to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injuction to through and including January 16, 2015 filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. answer due 1/16/2015., Set Briefing Schedule: re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Answering Brief due 1/16/2015.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/8/2015. (fms)
January 7, 2015 Filing 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint and to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injuction to through and including January 16, 2015 - filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Turgeon of Vedder Price filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/7/2015. (fms)
January 6, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Turgeon of Vedder Price - filed by Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 6, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Douglas A. Grady for Quest Integrity USA LLC,Douglas A. Grady for Quest Integrity USA LLC,Douglas A. Grady for Quest Integrity USA LLC, added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01481-SLR, 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(rbe)
January 5, 2015 Reset Hearings: The Telephone Conference is rescheduled for 1/13/2015 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01481-SLR, 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
January 5, 2015 The telephone conference originally scheduled for today, 1/5/2015 at 2:00 p.m. has been postponed. It will be rescheduled soon. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01481-SLR, 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
December 29, 2014 Filing 19 REDACTED VERSION of #12 Declaration of Neil C. Ruegsegger, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 29, 2014 Filing 18 REDACTED VERSION of #11 Declaration of Richard D. Roberts, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-P)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 29, 2014 Filing 17 REDACTED VERSION of #10 Declaration of Robert D. Caligiuri and Srinivasan Jagannathan, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G, #2 Exhibits H-I, #3 Exhibits J-K, #4 Exhibits L-N)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 29, 2014 Filing 16 REDACTED VERSION of #9 Declaration of Andrew W. Carter, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-23, #2 Exhibits 24-53, #3 Exhibits 54-80)(Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 29, 2014 Filing 15 REDACTED VERSION of #8 Opening Brief in Support, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Tigan, Jeremy) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 29, 2014 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. served on 12/19/2014, answer due 1/9/2015. (Grimm, Thomas)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for plaintiff to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/5/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for plaintiff shall provide notice of this order to defendants. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/22/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01481-SLR, 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(nmfn)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 Motion for Permission to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/22/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01481-SLR, 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(fms) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (5 in 1:14-cv-01483-SLR, 5 in 1:14-cv-01481-SLR, 5 in 1:14-cv-01482-SLR) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Douglas A. Grady, John R. Nelson, Richard T. Black, Emily R. Kelly, and Benjamin Hodges filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/22/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01481-SLR, 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR(fms)
December 18, 2014 Filing 12 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Neil C. Ruegsegger re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I)(Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 18, 2014 Filing 11 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Richard D. Roberts re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-P)(Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 18, 2014 Filing 10 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Robert D. Caligiuri and Srinivasan Jagannathan re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I, #2 Exhibits J-N)(Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 18, 2014 Filing 9 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Andrew W. Carter re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-29, #2 Exhibits 30-57, #3 Exhibits 58-80)(Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 18, 2014 Filing 8 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/8/2015. (Grimm, Thomas)
December 18, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
December 18, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION for Permission to File Under Seal - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/29/2018 (nms).
December 18, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Douglas A. Grady, John R. Nelson, Richard T. Black, Emily R. Kelly, and Benjamin Hodges - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Grimm, Thomas)
December 17, 2014 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-01481-SLR, 1:14-cv-01482-SLR, 1:14-cv-01483-SLR (rjb)
December 16, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. on 12/16/2014. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (els)
December 15, 2014 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate TQ Acquisition Inc., Other Affiliate Team Inc. for Quest Integrity USA LLC filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (els)
December 15, 2014 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,542,874 B2;. (els)
December 15, 2014 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1641556.) - filed by Quest Integrity USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(els)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quest Integrity USA LLC v. Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quest Integrity USA LLC
Represented By: Douglas A. Grady
Represented By: Stephen J. Kraftschik
Represented By: Thomas C. Grimm
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors Industrial Services Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Turgeon
Represented By: Robert S. Rigg
Represented By: Selena E. Molina
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?