International Business Machines Corporation v. Priceline Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
International Business Machines Corporation |
Defendant: |
Priceline Group Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, OpenTable Inc. and Priceline.com LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00137 |
Filed: |
February 9, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Delaware |
Office: |
Wilmington Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher J. Burke |
Presiding Judge: |
Leonard P. Stark |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. ยง 271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 10, 2017 |
Filing
498
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Granting-in-Part D.I. 120 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Plaintiff IBM's Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims and Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses Directed to Inequitable Conduct] filed by International Business Machines Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 4/27/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/10/2017. (dlk)
|
October 28, 2016 |
Filing
234
MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/28/16. (ntl)
|
September 29, 2016 |
Filing
209
MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding Plaintiff's source-code related discovery disputes relating to D.I. 180 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Kayak Software Corporation, Priceline.com LLC, OpenTable Inc., Priceline Group Inc. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 9/29/2016. (mlc) (Main Document 209 replaced on 9/29/2016) (dlk).
|
March 30, 2016 |
Filing
73
MEMORANDUM ORDER re 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED in all respects; 18 MOTION to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to renew in the form of a summary judgment motion. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/30/16. (ntl)
|
February 16, 2016 |
Filing
60
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denial of D.I. 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kayak Software Corporation, Priceline.com LLC, OpenTable Inc., Priceline Group Inc. and denying D.I. 32 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by International Business Machines Corporation. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing c onsists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/16/2016. (mlc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?