Hurst v. Shalk et al
Plaintiff: Jerry A. Hurst
Defendant: Maxwell Wiegard, Marty Harbin, Guy Harbert, Nicholas Skiles, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Colin M. Shalk and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2015cv00360
Filed: May 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/22/2017. (lmm)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM ORDER - (1) The plaintiff is hereby enjoined from filing, without prior authorization of the Court, any filing any complaint, lawsuit, or petition for writ of mandamus, relating to matters that stem from State Farm's denial of an insu rance claim made by Hurst for the April 3, 2001 theft of his customized van. (2) The plaintiff must file a motion for leave to file with any new complaint, lawsuit, or petition for writ of mandamus, that he proposes to file and must attach a copy of this memorandum order to it. The motion shall be filed as a miscellaneous case. (3) No document submitted by the plaintiff shall be filed prior to obtaining leave to file unless the document is specifically identified as a motion for leave to file, a nd unless the document contains an affidavit or sworn declaration as required by this memorandum order, and a copy of this memorandum order. (4) The clerk's office shall not accept any filing fees, cover sheets, applications for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees, summonses, or U.S. Marshals forms, in connection with a motion for leave to file, unless and until leave is granted. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/22/2017. (crb)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM - Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/27/17. (rwc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurst v. Shalk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry A. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxwell Wiegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Harbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Harbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin M. Shalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?