Johns Hopkins University v. Alcon Laboratories Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Johns Hopkins University
Defendant: Alcon Laboratories Inc. and Alcon Research Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00525
Filed: June 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Mitchell S Goldberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 442 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Second Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report and Disclosure of Julie L. Davis on 2/22/19 and (2) Second Supplemental Expert Report of Edwin Ryan M.D. on 12/21/18 filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 20, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg - Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/20/2019. (nmg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 441 VERDICT SHEET by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 440 Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding jury instructions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 439 Letter to Honorable Mitchel S. Goldberg from Douglas E. McCann regarding enclosing plaintiffs proposals for the preliminary jury instructions,disputed final jury instructions and verdict form. (Attachments: #1 JHU Proposed Final Jury Instructions, #2 JHU Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions, #3 JHU Proposed Verdict Form)(McCann, Douglas)
February 15, 2019 Filing 438 Proposed Jury Instructions by Johns Hopkins University (Joint). (McCann, Douglas)
February 15, 2019 Filing 437 Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding Issues for Pretrial Conference. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 14, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/20/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg. (ceg)
February 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg - Pretrial Conference held on 2/14/2019. (ceg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 436 [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - uncontested facts, #2 Exhibit 2 - JHU contested facts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Alcon contested facts, #4 Exhibit 4 - JHU issues of law, #5 Exhibit 5 - Alcon issues of law, #6 Exhibit 6 - JHU witnesses, #7 Exhibit 7 - Alcon witnesses, #8 Exhibit 8 - JHU list of expert witnesses, #9 Exhibit 9 - Alcon list of expert witnesses, #10 Exhibit 10 - JHU exhibit list, #11 Exhibit 11 - Alcon exhibit list, #12 Exhibit 12 - Joint proposed voir dire)(McCann, Douglas)
February 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher P. Galligan for Alcon Laboratories Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
February 5, 2019 Filing 435 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Expert Report of Julia A. Haller, MD on 1/21/19 and Third Supplemental Expert Report of Brian W. Napper on 2/4/19 filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 434 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 1/30/2019. (nmg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 432 Letter to Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Douglas E. McCann regarding Supplemental Claim Construction. (McCann, Douglas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 431 Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding January 22, 2019 Markman Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 25, 2019 Filing 430 Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing held on 1/22/2019 before The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg. Court Transcriber Michael T. Keating, Telephone number (609) 440-2177. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2019. (nmg)
January 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg - Markman Hearing held on 1/22/2019. Order to follow. (ceg)
January 17, 2019 Filing 429 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 1/8/2019 before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg. Court Transcriber Michael T. Keating, Telephone number (609) 440-2177. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2019. (nmg)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 428 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Oral Argument is set for 1/22/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg at the James A. Byrne U.S. Courthouse, 601 Market Street, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/20/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg at the James A. Byrne U.S. Courthouse, 601 Market Street, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 1/10/2019. (nmg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 427 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chris P. Galligan of Rakoczy Molino Mazzochi Siwik LLP - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #427 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Chris P. Galligan. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/10/2019. (lih)
January 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg - Telephone Conference held on 1/8/2019. (ceg)
January 4, 2019 Filing 426 Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding procedure for settlement negotiations. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER: Upon consideration of correspondence from counsel requesting that the claim construction argument scheduled for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 be rescheduled, and there being no opposition thereto, it is hereby ORDERED that the argument is rescheduled for 3:00 p.m., Tuesday, January 8, 2019. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone conference. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 1/2/2019. (ceg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 424 Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request to reschedule telephonic claim construction argument. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 26, 2018 Filing 423 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff The Johns Hopkins University's Notice of Deposition of Barry Copeland and Subpoena for Testimony filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER Setting Oral argument on the claim construction dispute: Plaintiff to initiate the call and, once all of the parties are on the line, contact chambers at (267) 299-7500. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/9/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 12/17/2018. (nmg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 421 REDACTED VERSION of #419 Letter Brief re Corrective Procedures by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/19/2018 (lih).
November 16, 2018 Filing 420 REDACTED VERSION of #418 Letter by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 11/19/2018 (lih).
November 9, 2018 Filing 419 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding response regarding corrective procedures - re #414 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 9, 2018 Filing 418 [SEALED] Letter to Honorable Mitchel S. Goldberg from Douglas E. McCann regarding Supplemental Claim Construction Response - re #415 Letter,. (McCann, Douglas)
November 2, 2018 Filing 417 REDACTED VERSION of #414 Letter by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 11/5/2018 (lih).
November 2, 2018 Filing 416 REDACTED VERSION of #415 Letter by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-8)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/5/2018 (lih).
October 26, 2018 Filing 415 [SEALED] Letter to the Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding Claim Construction - re #294 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Issues Pleaded by Defendants but Not Pursued or Disclosed in Discovery, #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/29/2018 (lih).
October 26, 2018 Filing 414 [SEALED] Letter to Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Douglas E. McCann regarding JHU Supplemental Claim Construction Brief. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2)(McCann, Douglas)
October 24, 2018 Filing 413 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 412 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/4/2019. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/14/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg in Chambers, Room 7614, United States Courthouse, 601 Market Street, Philadelphia, Pennsylvania. A Jury Trial in Wilmington, Delaware is set for 3/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 10/16/2018. (nmg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 411 Letter to Honorable Mitchell S Goldberg from Douglas E. McCann regarding joint request re trial date, jury questionnaire, claim construction and further discovery. (Attachments: #1 jury questionnaire)(McCann, Douglas)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER, Having considered the parties' Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order (D.I. #288 ) and the status teleconference held on September 20, 2018, it is hereby Ordered that the parties shall submit a joint letter to the court within 10 business days that: a. Identifies three (3) mutually agreeable two-week periods of time in February 2019 to hold trial; b. Attaches a copy of any proposed jury questionnaire and objections; and c. Notifies the court of any claim construction issue that remains and proposed briefing schedule (*see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 9/25/2018. (ceg)
September 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg - Status Telephone Conference held on 9/20/2018. (nmg)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER Setting Teleconference for 9/20/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone conference with Defendants' counsel prior to contacting chambers at 267-299-7500. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 9/17/2018. (nmg)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER designating and assigning the Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg, U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, nunc pro tunc, from August 31, 2018, for such a period as is necessary for the disposition of the above entitled matter. Signed by Judge D. Brooks Smith on 9/14/2018. (gvw)
September 10, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Please include the initials of the Judge (MSG) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER, 1. The plaintiff's motions in limine numbers 1 and 2 are both GRANTED IN PART, as detailed in the memorandum that accompanies this order. Motion in limine numbers 3-8 are DENIED (D.I. 347, 348); 2. The defendant's motion in limine numbers 1-7 and 9 are DENIED (D.I. 349-355, 359). Motions in limine number 8 is GRANTED IN PART (D.I. 356), as detailed in the memorandum that accompanies this order. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 8/29/2018. (ceg)
August 30, 2018 Filing 406 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 8/29/2018. (ceg)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER denying #362 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 8/29/2018. (ceg)
July 31, 2018 Filing 404 Letter to Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Douglas E. McCann regarding pending motions and trial. (McCann, Douglas)
July 30, 2018 Filing 403 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding pending motion. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 5, 2018 Filing 402 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to JHU's letter about setting the trial date - re #401 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 5, 2018 Filing 401 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Douglas E. McCann regarding Request for a Teleconference to Set a Trial Date. (McCann, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Filing 400 REDACTED VERSION of #386 Declaration,, by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M)(McCann, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Filing 399 REDACTED VERSION of #385 Memorandum in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Filing 398 REDACTED VERSION of #384 Memorandum in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Filing 397 REDACTED VERSION of #383 Memorandum in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Filing 396 REDACTED VERSION of #382 Memorandum in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Filing 395 REDACTED VERSION of #381 Memorandum in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Filing 394 REDACTED VERSION of #380 Memorandum in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Filing 393 REDACTED VERSION of #379 Memorandum in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Filing 392 REDACTED VERSION of #378 Memorandum in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Filing 391 REDACTED VERSION of #377 Memorandum in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
June 5, 2018 Filing 390 REDACTED VERSION of #376 Declaration by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 37-60)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 6/6/2018 (lih).
June 5, 2018 Filing 389 REDACTED VERSION of #375 Memorandum in Opposition by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 6/6/2018 (lih).
June 4, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, the pdf at D.I. #375 has been removed and replaced with a corrected version. The substitution was needed to correct formatting issues, nothing substantive has changed. (fms)
May 31, 2018 Filing 388 RESPONSE to Motion re #362 MOTION for Reconsideration re #346 Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion to Stay, filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 29, 2018 Filing 387 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: ALCONMIVS1019926 (Ex. A to Declaration of Douglas E. McCann in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions in Limine 1-9. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Douglas Edward McCann on behalf of Johns Hopkins University (McCann, Douglas)
May 29, 2018 Filing 386 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #378 Memorandum in Opposition, #385 Memorandum in Opposition, #383 Memorandum in Opposition, #381 Memorandum in Opposition, #379 Memorandum in Opposition, #382 Memorandum in Opposition, #380 Memorandum in Opposition, #384 Memorandum in Opposition, #377 Memorandum in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas)
May 29, 2018 Filing 385 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #357 MOTION in Limine filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/30/2018 (lih).
May 29, 2018 Filing 384 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #356 MOTION in Limine filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/30/2018 (lih).
May 29, 2018 Filing 383 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #355 MOTION in Limine filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/30/2018 (lih).
May 29, 2018 Filing 382 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #354 MOTION in Limine filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/30/2018 (lih).
May 29, 2018 Filing 381 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #353 MOTION in Limine filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/30/2018 (lih).
May 29, 2018 Filing 380 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #352 MOTION in Limine filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/30/2018 (lih).
May 29, 2018 Filing 379 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #351 MOTION in Limine filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/30/2018 (lih).
May 29, 2018 Filing 378 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #350 MOTION in Limine filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/30/2018 (lih).
May 29, 2018 Filing 377 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #349 MOTION in Limine filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/30/2018 (lih).
May 29, 2018 Filing 376 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Erin M. Forbes re #375 Memorandum in Opposition by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 37-60)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/30/2018 (lih).
May 29, 2018 Filing 375 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #348 MEMORANDUM in Support, #347 MOTION in Limine filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/5/2018. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/30/2018 (lih). (Main Document 375 replaced on 6/4/2018) (fms).
May 22, 2018 Filing 374 REDACTED VERSION of #359 Declaration by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11)(McCann, Douglas)
May 22, 2018 Filing 373 REDACTED VERSION of #348 MEMORANDUM in Support, by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
May 22, 2018 Filing 372 REDACTED VERSION of #358 Declaration by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-36)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/22/2018 (lih).
May 22, 2018 Filing 371 REDACTED VERSION of #357 MOTION in Limine by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/22/2018 (lih).
May 22, 2018 Filing 370 REDACTED VERSION of #356 MOTION in Limine by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/22/2018 (lih).
May 22, 2018 Filing 369 REDACTED VERSION of #355 MOTION in Limine by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/22/2018 (lih).
May 22, 2018 Filing 368 REDACTED VERSION of #354 MOTION in Limine by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/22/2018 (lih).
May 22, 2018 Filing 367 REDACTED VERSION of #353 MOTION in Limine by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/22/2018 (lih).
May 22, 2018 Filing 366 REDACTED VERSION of #352 MOTION in Limine by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/22/2018 (lih).
May 22, 2018 Filing 365 REDACTED VERSION of #351 MOTION in Limine by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/22/2018 (lih).
May 22, 2018 Filing 364 REDACTED VERSION of #350 MOTION in Limine by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/22/2018 (lih).
May 22, 2018 Filing 363 REDACTED VERSION of #349 MOTION in Limine by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/22/2018 (lih).
May 18, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #353 MOTION in Limine, #347 MOTION in Limine, #352 MOTION in Limine, #349 MOTION in Limine, #362 MOTION for Reconsideration, #357 MOTION in Limine, #356 MOTION in Limine, #355 MOTION in Limine, #354 MOTION in Limine, #350 MOTION in Limine, #351 MOTION in Limine (lih)
May 17, 2018 Filing 362 MOTION for Reconsideration re #346 Order on Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Stay - filed by Johns Hopkins University. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/18/2018 (lih).
May 17, 2018 Filing 361 REDACTED VERSION of #345 Letter by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 16, 2018 NOTE TO ALL COUNSEL: JUDGE FALLON'S CHAMBERS DOES NOT NEED COPIES OF THE MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (lih)
May 15, 2018 Filing 360 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: native excel file bearing production number RYAN0000104 (Ex. 9 to D.I. 359 Declaration of Todd G. Miller in Support of Plaintiff's Motions In Limine). Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Douglas Edward McCann on behalf of Johns Hopkins University (McCann, Douglas)
May 15, 2018 Filing 359 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #348 MEMORANDUM in Support, by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11, #2 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas)
May 15, 2018 Filing 358 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Erin M. Forbes re #355 MOTION in Limine, #350 MOTION in Limine, #351 MOTION in Limine, #352 MOTION in Limine, #357 MOTION in Limine, #354 MOTION in Limine, #353 MOTION in Limine, #349 MOTION in Limine, #356 MOTION in Limine by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibits 2-24, #3 Exhibits 25-32, #4 Exhibits 33-36)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 15, 2018 Filing 357 [SEALED] MOTION in Limine No. 9 - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 15, 2018 Filing 356 [SEALED] MOTION in Limine No. 8 - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 15, 2018 Filing 355 [SEALED] MOTION in Limine No. 7 - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 15, 2018 Filing 354 [SEALED] MOTION in Limine No. 6- filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 15, 2018 Filing 353 [SEALED] MOTION in Limine No. 5 - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 15, 2018 Filing 352 [SEALED] MOTION in Limine No. 4 - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 15, 2018 Filing 351 [SEALED] MOTION in Limine No. 3 - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 15, 2018 Filing 350 [SEALED] MOTION in Limine No. 2 - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 15, 2018 Filing 349 [SEALED] MOTION in Limine No. 1 - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 15, 2018 Filing 348 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Support re #347 MOTION in Limine filed by Johns Hopkins University.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 15, 2018 Filing 347 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1-8 - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 5/16/2018 (lih).
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER, the plaintiffs' motion for sanctions and for civil contempt (Doc. Nos. #296 , #297 ) is DENIED. Further, the defendants' motion to stay the waiver orders (Doc. No. #263 ) is now MOOT. All 169 documents are privileged under either attorney-client privilege, work product privilege, or both. Therefore, the defendant MAY WITHOLD these 169 documents as privileged. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 5/14/2018. (fms)
May 11, 2018 Filing 345 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding declaration pursuant to Court's May 7, 2018 Order - re #344 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jonathan J. Lamberson for Johns Hopkins University added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER, Defendants' counsel must file a signed affidavit affirming that the defendants have produced evidence to the plaintiff. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 5/7/2018. (crb)
May 4, 2018 Filing 343 Official Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on April 26, 2018 before Judge Lawrence F. Stengel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Connie S. Flores,Telephone number 267-299-7191. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2018. (jcs)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER, Motions in Limine due by 5/15/2018. Responses to Motions in Limine due by 5/29/2018. The trial scheduled for Monday, May 21, 2018 is CANCELLED and will be rescheduled at a later date. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/7/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lawrence F. Stengel. Counsel for the plaintiffs shall initiate the call and include chambers at 267-299-7760. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 5/3/2018. (crb)
May 1, 2018 Filing 341 NOTICE of Lodging of Documents for In Camera Review by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 30, 2018 Filing 340 Letter to Chief Judge Lawrence F. Stengel from Douglas E. McCann regarding In Camera Submission. (McCann, Douglas)
April 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence F. Stengel - Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/26/2018. (Court Reporter Laura Buenzle, ESR.) (crb)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #294 , granting in part and denying in part #196 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting in part and denying in part #199 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting in part and denying in part #218 Motion to Preclude; granting in part and denying in part #225 Motion to Preclude. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 4/25/2018. (nmg)
April 23, 2018 Filing 338 Joint Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel regarding Parties' Pretrial Issues. (McCann, Douglas)
April 20, 2018 Filing 337 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 282 filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 18, 2018 Filing 336 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Expert Report of Brian W. Napper filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
April 18, 2018 Filing 335 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan J. Lamberson - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Certification - Jonathan Lamberson)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(McCann, Douglas)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #335 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan J. Lamberson. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/18/2018. (lih)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER, that the PRETRIAL CONFERENCE presently scheduled for Wednesday, May 2, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. has been RESCHEDULED for Thursday, April 26, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. The pretrial conference will be held in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania in Philadelphia, in Courtroom 14B. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pending Motion for Sanctions will also be discussed at the Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 4/16/2018. (nmg)
April 13, 2018 Filing 333 REDACTED VERSION of #325 Letter by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 4/13/2018 (lih).
April 13, 2018 Filing 332 REDACTED VERSION of #326 MOTION for Leave to File by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply, #2 Polivick Declaration, #3 Exhibits 11 - 15 to Polivick Declaration)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/13/2018 (lih).
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #299 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/12/2018. (lih)
April 10, 2018 Filing 330 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding In Camera Review. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 6, 2018 Filing 329 REDACTED VERSION of #317 MOTION to Seal Document by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 4/9/2018 (lih).
April 6, 2018 Filing 328 REDACTED VERSION of #316 Declaration by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12)(McCann, Douglas)
April 6, 2018 Filing 327 REDACTED VERSION of #315 MOTION Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion for Sanctions Under Rule 37 and for Civil Contempt by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Reply Brief)(McCann, Douglas)
April 6, 2018 Filing 326 [SEALED] MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply re #296 MOTION for Sanctions - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Sur-Reply, #2 Polivick Declaration, #3 Exhibit 11-15)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/6/2018 (lih).
April 6, 2018 Filing 325 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Douglas E. McCann regarding Requesting Finding of Contempt and Requested Rule 37 Sanctions and Order to Compel Against Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McCann, Douglas)
April 5, 2018 Filing 324 REDACTED VERSION of #294 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #225 MOTION to Preclude, and #218 Motion to Preclude (See Order signed 4/5/2018, D.I. #322 ) (ceg) (Main Document 324 replaced on 4/6/2018) (ceg).
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER, upon consideration of the parties' joint request to schedule the pretrial conference for the week of April 30, 2018 (D.I. #301 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the pretrial conference is scheduled for Wednesday, May 2, 2018 at 01:00 p.m., in advance of the 5/21/2018 trial, before Judge Lawrence F. Stengel. The pretrial conference will be held in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania in Philadelphia, in Courtroom 14B. (Pretrial Conference is set for 5/2/2018 at 01:00 PM before Judge Lawrence F. Stengel). Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 4/5/2018. (ceg)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting #317 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Seal and Redact the March 1, 2018 Report and Recommendation. The redacted version of the Report and Recommendation, attached to D.I. 317 as Exhibit B, shall be filed as the public version of the document. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 4/5/2018. (ceg)
April 2, 2018 Filing 321 REDACTED VERSION of #309 Declaration by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits 1-10)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 2, 2018 Filing 320 REDACTED VERSION of #308 Answering Brief in Opposition by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER (3/29/18) of USCA (Federal Circuit)- The motions for leave to file briefs amicus curiae #18 , #27 , #30 , and #41 are granted. The petition for writ of mandamus #2 is denied. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. (bkb)
April 2, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin P. Burke, Gregory A. Duff for Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
March 30, 2018 Filing 318 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Douglas E. McCann regarding Response to Alcon Defendants' March 29, 2018 Letter to the Court - re #313 Letter. (McCann, Douglas)
March 30, 2018 Filing 317 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal #294 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 4/2/2018 (lih).
March 30, 2018 Filing 316 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #315 MOTION for Leave to File by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 4/2/2018 (lih).
March 30, 2018 Filing 315 [SEALED] MOTION for Leave to File a Reply re #296 MOTION for Sanctions - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Reply Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 4/2/2018 (lih).
March 29, 2018 Filing 314 REDACTED VERSION of #307 Response to Objections by Johns Hopkins University. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
March 29, 2018 Filing 313 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding Federal Circuit's Order of Today. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 29, 2018 Filing 312 REPLY BRIEF re #299 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 5-8)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 4/2/2018 (lih).
March 28, 2018 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #306 . (lih)
March 28, 2018 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #299 . Counsel is advised that the second copy submitted on 3/19/2018 was an incomplete version of the document and did not contain the exhibits. (lih)
March 27, 2018 Filing 311 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Patrick C. Kilgore as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 27, 2018 Filing 310 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin P. Burke and Gregory A. Duff - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 27, 2018 NOTE TO COUNSEL: Judge Fallon's chambers does not need courtesy copies of the briefing related to #296 MOTION for Sanctions at this time. (lih)
March 27, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the pro hac motion previously filed as D.I. 310 due to document having the wrong case caption. Counsel is advised to re-file the document with the correct case caption. (lih)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #310 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin P. Burke and Gregory A. Duff. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/27/2018. (lih)
March 26, 2018 Filing 309 [SEALED] DECLARATION of John D. Polivick, Esq. re #308 Answering Brief in Opposition by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/27/2018 (lih).
March 26, 2018 Filing 308 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #296 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/2/2018. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/27/2018 (lih).
March 23, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, the response to objections previously filed as D.I. 305 has been deleted and will be re-filed using the correct event code. (lih)
March 22, 2018 Filing 307 [SEALED] RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Johns Hopkins University re #300 Objection to Report and Recommendations . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 3/23/2018 (lih).
March 22, 2018 Filing 306 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #299 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 3/23/2018 (lih).
March 22, 2018 Filing 304 REDACTED VERSION of #300 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 22, 2018 Filing 303 REDACTED VERSION of #298 Declaration by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 3/23/2018 (lih).
March 22, 2018 Filing 302 REDACTED VERSION of #297 Opening Brief in Support by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 3/23/2018 (lih).
March 22, 2018 Filing 301 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Douglas E. McCann regarding Parties' Request for a Pre-trial Conference. (McCann, Douglas)
March 19, 2018 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #299 . (lih)
March 15, 2018 Filing 300 [SEALED] OBJECTION to #294 Report and Recommendations by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 15, 2018 Filing 299 MOTION for Clarification Regarding re #294 Report and Recommendations - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/19/2018 (lih).
March 14, 2018 Filing 298 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Todd Miller re #297 Opening Brief in Support by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 3/15/2018 (lih).
March 14, 2018 Filing 297 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #296 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37 and for Civil Contempt Due To Alcon's Failure To Obey The Courts Order filed by Johns Hopkins University.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/28/2018. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 3/15/2018 (lih).
March 14, 2018 Filing 296 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37 and for Civil Contempt Due To Alcon's Failure To Obey The Courts Order - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 3/15/2018 (lih).
March 6, 2018 Filing 295 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Barry Copeland's Objections and Responses to the Johns Hopkins University's Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 1, 2018 Filing 294 [SEALED] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #225 MOTION to Preclude, #218 MOTION to Preclude. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/1/2018.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (lih)
February 14, 2018 Filing 293 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel and The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Douglas E. McCann regarding Federal Circuit Decision on Mandamus Petition. (McCann, Douglas)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER of USCA (Federal Circuit) - IT IS ORDERED THAT:(1) The motions for leave to file briefs amicus curiae are granted.(2) The petition for writ of mandamus is denied. Please see order for further details. (bkb)
February 6, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The 1/31/2018 telephone conference minute entry has been deleted from this case per receipt of corrected information from Chambers and counsel that this teleconference was held in a different case. (nmfn)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 291 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Jury Trial is rescheduled for 5/21/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Lawrence F. Stengel. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 2/1/2018. (nmfn)
January 30, 2018 Filing 290 REDACTED VERSION of #288 Proposed Pretrial Order by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance 1-13)(McCann, Douglas)
January 30, 2018 Filing 289 Joint Letter to The Honorable Chief Judge Lawrence F. Stengel from Douglas E. McCann regarding the Court's guidance with respect to trial. (McCann, Douglas)
January 23, 2018 Filing 288 [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13, #2 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas)
January 19, 2018 Filing 287 Redaction of #274 , Official Transcript of Motions Hearing held on November 16, 2017 before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Court Reporter Taneha Carroll of Hawkins Reporting Service, Telephone (302) 658-6697. (bpg)
January 19, 2018 Filing 286 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 19, 2018 Filing 285 REDACTED VERSION of #284 Letter by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/22/2018 (lih).
January 19, 2018 Filing 284 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding Reply re Supplemental Authority - re #281 Letter,. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #280 MOTION to Seal, MOTION to Redact #274 Transcript. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/19/2018. (lih)
January 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence F. Stengel - Telephone Status Conference held on 1/18/2018. (Court Reporter not present.) (nmfn)
January 17, 2018 Filing 283 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Douglas E. McCann regarding Defendants' January 16, 2018 letter citing new authority - re #281 Letter,. (McCann, Douglas)
January 16, 2018 Filing 282 REDACTED VERSION of #280 MOTION to Seal MOTION to Redact #274 Transcript,, , #277 Notice of Intent to Request Transcript Redaction by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 16, 2018 Filing 281 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding Supplemental Authority from the Federal Circuit re #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #225 MOTION to Preclude.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/17/2018 (lih).
January 16, 2018 Filing 280 [SEALED] MOTION to Seal , MOTION to Redact #274 Transcript,, - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for the plaintiffs to initiate the call and include chambers at 267-299-7760. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lawrence F. Stengel. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 1/9/2018. (nmfn)
January 5, 2018 Filing 278 NOTICE of Intent to Redact by Johns Hopkins University re #274 Transcript,, (McCann, Douglas)
January 5, 2018 Filing 277 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Stephen J. Kraftschik re #274 Transcript,, (Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Status Conference is set for 12/21/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lawrence F. Stengel. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call with opposing counsel and with Judge Stengel's chambers at 267-299-7760. Signed by Judge Lawrence F. Stengel on 12/18/2017. (fms)
December 18, 2017 Filing 275 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Douglas E. McCann regarding The Johns Hopkins University's Brief in Opposition to All Motions to File Amicus Briefs was filed on December 15, 2017. (McCann, Douglas)
December 15, 2017 Filing 274 (SEALED) Official Transcript of Motions Hearing held on November 16, 2017 before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Court Reporter Taneha Carroll of Hawkins Reporting Service, Telephone (302) 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2018.(bpg) Modified on 1/22/2018 (lih).
December 15, 2017 Filing 273 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding copies of writ of mandamus pleadings. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 12, 2017 Filing 272 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Douglas E. McCann regarding The Johns Hopkins University's Response to the Defendants' Petition for Writ of Mandamus was filed on December 11, 2017. (McCann, Douglas)
December 5, 2017 Filing 271 USCA (Federal Circuit) NOTICE OF DOCKETING - a petition for writ of mandamus has been filed; Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 12/01/2017. Fee/IFP due on 12/18/2017. Entry of Appearance due 12/18/2017. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/18/2017 (Please see PDF for further details). (bkb)
December 4, 2017 Filing 270 REPLY BRIEF re #263 MOTION to Stay the Waiver Orders filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 12/5/2017 (lih).
December 4, 2017 Filing 269 REDACTED VERSION of #264 Answering Brief in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 12/5/2017 (lih).
December 1, 2017 Filing 268 REDACTED VERSION of #267 Appendix by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 1, 2017 Filing 267 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #266 Letter by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 12/4/2017 (lih).
December 1, 2017 Filing 266 Letter to The Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding petition for a writ of mandamus. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Mandamus)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 30, 2017 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #264 . (lih)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER - DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Lawrence F. Stengel of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Chief Judge D. Brooks Smith of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 11/27/2017. (rjb)
November 29, 2017 Case Reassigned to Judge Lawrence F. Stengel of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Please include the initials of the Judge (LS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 27, 2017 Filing 264 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #263 MOTION to Stay the Waiver Orders filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/4/2017. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 11/28/2017 (lih).
November 21, 2017 Motion No Longer Referred: #263 MOTION to Stay the Waiver Orders. (ntl)
November 20, 2017 Filing 263 MOTION to Stay the Waiver Orders - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/21/2017 (lih).
November 20, 2017 Filing 262 NOTICE OF SERVICE of JHU's Rebuttal Disclosure of Witnesses Expected to Give Fact Testimony filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
November 20, 2017 Filing 261 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Rebuttal Fact Witness List filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 16, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Oral Argument held on 11/16/2017 re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #225 MOTION to Preclude, #218 MOTION to Preclude. (Court Reporter T. Carroll ( Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
November 14, 2017 Filing 260 REDACTED VERSION of #246 Declaration by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 37-41)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/14/2017 (lih).
November 14, 2017 Filing 259 REDACTED VERSION of #245 Reply Brief by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/14/2017 (lih).
November 13, 2017 Filing 258 REDACTED VERSION of #244 Declaration by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29-33)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 11/14/2017 (lih).
November 13, 2017 Filing 257 REDACTED VERSION of #243 Reply Brief by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 11/14/2017 (lih).
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: counsel shall collectively have four hours to present argument on 11/16/2017. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/13/2017. (lih)
November 13, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibits added to D.I. #254 per request of counsel. (ntl)
November 9, 2017 Filing 256 REDACTED VERSION of #240 Appendix by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits J1-J9)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/13/2017 (lih).
November 9, 2017 Filing 255 REDACTED VERSION of #239 Reply Brief by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/13/2017 (lih).
November 9, 2017 Filing 254 REDACTED VERSION of #238 Declaration by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2017: #1 Exhibits) (ntl).
November 9, 2017 Filing 253 REDACTED VERSION of #237 Reply Brief by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
November 8, 2017 Filing 252 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding Corrected Exhibit G17 - re #212 Appendix. (Attachments: #1 CORRECTED Exhibit G17)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #185 MOTION for Reargument and, in the alternative, Motion for Certification Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. is DENIED; #190 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Its Motion for Reargument filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/8/17. (ntl)
November 7, 2017 Filing 250 REDACTED VERSION of #234 Declaration by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 11/7/2017 (lih).
November 7, 2017 Filing 249 REDACTED VERSION of #233 Answering Brief in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 11/7/2017 (lih).
November 7, 2017 Filing 248 REDACTED VERSION of #236 Declaration by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 17-36)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 7, 2017 Filing 247 REDACTED VERSION of #235 Answering Brief in Opposition by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/7/2017 (lih).
November 6, 2017 Filing 246 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Erin M. Forbes re #245 Reply Brief by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 37-41)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/7/2017 (lih).
November 6, 2017 Filing 245 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #225 MOTION to Preclude filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/7/2017 (lih).
November 6, 2017 Filing 244 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Douglas E. McCann re #243 Reply Brief by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29-33, #2 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 11/7/2017 (lih).
November 6, 2017 Filing 243 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #218 MOTION to Preclude filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 11/7/2017 (lih).
November 6, 2017 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #240 . (lih)
November 3, 2017 Filing 242 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. in the form of a CD Rom. Filing related to #241 Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (lih)
November 2, 2017 Filing 241 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Exhibit J5 to the Appendix to Alcon's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Stephen J. Kraftschik on behalf of Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 2, 2017 Filing 240 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #239 Reply Brief by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J1 - J9)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 2, 2017 Filing 239 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/3/2017 (lih).
November 2, 2017 Filing 238 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Douglas E. McCann re #237 Reply Brief by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15-22, #2 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 11/3/2017 (lih).
November 2, 2017 Filing 237 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 11/3/2017 (lih).
October 31, 2017 Filing 236 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #235 Answering Brief in Opposition by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 17-36)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/1/2017 (lih).
October 31, 2017 Filing 235 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #218 MOTION to Preclude filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/7/2017. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/1/2017 (lih).
October 31, 2017 Filing 234 [SEALED] DECLARATION OF DOUGLAS E. MCCANN re #233 Answering Brief in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, #2 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 10/31/2017 (lih).
October 31, 2017 Filing 233 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #225 MOTION to Preclude filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 10/31/2017 (lih).
October 27, 2017 Filing 232 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Fourth Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-19) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 27, 2017 Filing 231 REDACTED VERSION of #223 Declaration, #220 Declaration, #222 Exhibit to a Document, #224 Exhibit to a Document, #221 Exhibit to a Document by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3 to Declaration Vol. I of V, #2 Exhibit 4-6 to Declaration Vol. I of V, #3 Exhibit to Declaration Vol. I of V, #4 Exhibit 9-28 to Declaration Vols. II, III, IV and V of V)(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 10/30/2017 (lih).
October 27, 2017 Filing 230 REDACTED VERSION of #227 Declaration by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-16)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/27/2017 (lih).
October 27, 2017 Filing 229 REDACTED VERSION of #226 Opening Brief in Support by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/27/2017 (lih).
October 27, 2017 Filing 228 REDACTED VERSION of #219 Opening Brief in Support by Johns Hopkins University. (Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 10/27/2017 (lih).
October 24, 2017 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #225 . (lih)
October 24, 2017 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #227 . (lih)
October 20, 2017 Filing 227 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Erin M. Forbes re #225 MOTION to Preclude by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-16)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/23/2017 (lih).
October 20, 2017 Filing 226 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #225 MOTION to Preclude filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/3/2017. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/23/2017 (lih).
October 20, 2017 Filing 225 MOTION to Preclude - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/23/2017 (lih).
October 20, 2017 Filing 224 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #220 Declaration Vol. V of V by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18, #2 Exhibit 19, #3 Exhibit 20, #4 Exhibit 21, #5 Exhibit 22, #6 Exhibit 23, #7 Exhibit 24, #8 Exhibit 25, #9 Exhibit 26, #10 Exhibit 27, #11 Exhibit 28)(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 10/23/2017 (lih).
October 20, 2017 Filing 223 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #220 Declaration Vol. IV of V by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15 - Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit 15- Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit 15 - Part 3 of 3, #4 Exhibit 16 - Part 1 of 3, #5 Exhibit 16 - Part 2 of 3, #6 Exhibit 16 - Part 3 of 3, #7 Exhibit 17)(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 10/23/2017 (lih).
October 20, 2017 Filing 222 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #220 Declaration Vol. III of V by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 - Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit 12 - Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit 13 - Part 1 of 2, #4 Exhibit 13 - Part 2 of 2, #5 Exhibit 14 - Part 1 of 3, #6 Exhibit 14 - Part 2 of 3, #7 Exhibit 14 - Part 3 of 3)(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 10/23/2017 (lih).
October 20, 2017 Filing 221 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #220 Declaration Vol. II of V by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9 - Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit 9 - Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit 10 - Part 1 of 2, #4 Exhibit 10 - Part 2 of 2, #5 Exhibit 11 - Part 1 of 2, #6 Exhibit 11 - Part 2 of 2)(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 10/23/2017 (lih).
October 20, 2017 Filing 220 [SEALED] of Kelly Del Dotto DECLARATION (Vol. I of V) re #219 Opening Brief in Support by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 10/23/2017 (lih).
October 20, 2017 Filing 219 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #218 MOTION to Preclude filed by Johns Hopkins University.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 10/23/2017 (lih).
October 20, 2017 Filing 218 MOTION to Preclude - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 10/23/2017 (lih).
October 19, 2017 Filing 217 REDACTED VERSION of #213 Declaration by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-52)(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 10/20/2017 (lih).
October 19, 2017 Filing 216 REDACTED VERSION of #210 Answering Brief in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 10/20/2017 (lih).
October 19, 2017 Filing 215 REDACTED VERSION of #212 Appendix by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits G-I)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 19, 2017 Filing 214 REDACTED VERSION of #211 Answering Brief in Opposition by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/20/2017 (lih).
October 16, 2017 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #213 . (lih)
October 12, 2017 Filing 213 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #210 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9, #2 Exhibit 10-30, #3 Exhibit 31-37, #4 Exhibit 38-42, #5 Exhibit 43-52)(McCann, Douglas)
October 12, 2017 Filing 212 [SEALED] APPENDIX re #211 Answering Brief in Opposition by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits G-I)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/13/2017 (lih). Modified on 10/13/2017 (ntl).
October 12, 2017 Filing 211 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/19/2017. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/13/2017 (lih).
October 12, 2017 Filing 210 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Johns Hopkins University.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/19/2017. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 10/13/2017 (lih).
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #209 STIPULATION Parties' Daubert Motion Practice Schedule. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/4/2017. (lih)
October 3, 2017 Filing 209 STIPULATION Parties' Daubert Motion Practice Schedule by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
September 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Expert Discovery Hearing held on 9/28/2017. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
September 28, 2017 Filing 208 REDACTED VERSION of #201 Appendix, by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, Part 1, #2 Exhibit F, Part 2, #3 Exhibit F, Part 3)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 28, 2017 Filing 207 REDACTED VERSION of #198 Appendix, by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 28, 2017 Filing 206 REDACTED VERSION of #197 Opening Brief in Support by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 28, 2017 Filing 205 REDACTED VERSION of #202 Declaration by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14)(Hufnal, AnnaMartina) Modified on 9/29/2017 (lih).
September 28, 2017 Filing 204 REDACTED VERSION of #200 Opening Brief in Support by Johns Hopkins University. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina) Modified on 9/29/2017 (lih).
September 25, 2017 Filing 203 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick C. Kilgore - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 25, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick C. Kilgore for Alcon Laboratories Inc.,Patrick C. Kilgore for Alcon Research Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #203 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick C. Kilgore. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/25/2017. (lih)
September 25, 2017 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #202 . (lih)
September 22, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: Correct proposed order added to D.I. 199 per request of counsel. (ntl)
September 21, 2017 Filing 202 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #200 Opening Brief in Support, by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14)(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
September 21, 2017 Filing 201 [SEALED] APPENDIX Volume II of II re #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, Part 1, #2 Exhibit F, Part 2, #3 Exhibit F, Part 3)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/22/2017 (lih).
September 21, 2017 Filing 200 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #199 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Johns Hopkins University.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2017. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina) Modified on 9/22/2017 (lih).
September 21, 2017 Filing 199 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Issues Pleaded by Defendants but Not Pursued or Disclosed in Discovery - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Hufnal, AnnaMartina) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/22/2017) (ntl). Modified on 9/22/2017 (lih).
September 21, 2017 Filing 198 [SEALED] APPENDIX Volume I of II re #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2, #3 Exhibits B-E)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/22/2017 (lih).
September 21, 2017 Filing 197 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #196 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/5/2017. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/22/2017 (lih).
September 21, 2017 Filing 196 MOTION for Summary Judgment for US Patent No. 7,077,848 - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 9/22/2017 (lih).
September 8, 2017 Filing 195 NOTICE of Withdrawal of re #194 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. (Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 9/8/2017 (lih).
August 29, 2017 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #194 . (lih)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- The MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement previously filed as D.I. 193 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall file all motions for non-infringement on 9/21/2017 per the scheduling order. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/28/2017. (lih)
August 25, 2017 Filing 194 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to Why Defendants Should Not be Held in Contempt of Court for Violation of Court Order - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 8/28/2017 (lih).
August 23, 2017 Filing 192 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Report of Edwin Ryan, M.D. filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 21, 2017 Filing 191 RESPONSE to Motion re #190 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Its Motion for Reargument filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 8/21/2017 (lih).
August 18, 2017 Filing 190 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Its Motion for Reargument - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Reply)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 8/21/2017 (lih).
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the oral argument set in this matter for 11/17/2017 is RESCHEDULED to 11/16/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. The court will set a time limit for argument once the dispositive motions are fully briefed. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/18/2017. (lih)
August 17, 2017 Filing 189 REDACTED VERSION of #188 Answering Brief in Opposition by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 8/17/2017 (lih).
August 11, 2017 Filing 188 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #185 MOTION for Reargument re #184 Memorandum and Order filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 8/14/2017 (lih).
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #187 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to September 18, 2017 to Complete Specified Expert Depositions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: the Expert Discovery Hearing previously set in this matter for 8/10/2017 is RESCHEDULED to 9/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/7/2017. (lih)
August 4, 2017 Filing 187 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to September 18, 2017 to Complete Specified Expert Depositions and Parties' Joint Request to Move the August 10, 2017 4:30 P.M. In-Person Expert Discovery Status Conference to After September 18, 2017 - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, with the exception of the currently pending Motion for Reargument (D.I. 185), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. Judge Stark will preside at the pretrial conference and at trial. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 15-525-LPS-SRF. Ordered by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/1/2017. (etg)
July 31, 2017 Case Reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 28, 2017 Motions No Longer Referred: #185 MOTION for Reargument re #184 Memorandum and Order and Alternative Motion for Certification Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) (fms)
July 28, 2017 Filing 185 MOTION for Reargument re #184 Memorandum and Order and Alternative Motion for Certification Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 7/31/2017 (fms). Modified on 8/1/2017 (lih).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #171 Memorandum and Order, #173 Objections filed by Johns Hopkins University, #178 Response to Objections filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/14/2017. (nmfn)
July 14, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Corrin N. Drakulich for Johns Hopkins University added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
July 14, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christina Brown-Marshall for Johns Hopkins University added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #179 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Corrin N. Drakulich, #183 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina Brown-Marshall. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/11/2017. (lih)
July 10, 2017 Filing 183 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christina Brown-Marshall - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Certification)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
July 10, 2017 Filing 182 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum on Stanley Chang, M.D.; Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action with Attachment A filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
July 10, 2017 Filing 181 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Amended Response to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-19) filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
July 10, 2017 Filing 180 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Donald J. D'Amico, M.D.'s Objections and Responses to The John Hopkins University's Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action; (2) Edwin H. Ryan, M.D.'s Objections and Responses to The John Hopkins University's Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
July 7, 2017 Filing 179 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Corrin N. Drakulich - filed by Johns Hopkins University. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(McCann, Douglas)
July 5, 2017 Filing 178 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. re #173 Objections . (Kraftschik, Stephen)
July 5, 2017 Remark: D.I. #173 has been unsealed per D.I. #175 . (lih)
June 30, 2017 Filing 177 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Reports: 1) Julia A. Haller, M.D.; 2) Dr. Carl Awh; and 3) Charles Colby Regarding Dr. Ryan's Reliance on Survey Data filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
June 30, 2017 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Report of Brian W. Napper filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
June 28, 2017 Filing 175 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Douglas E. McCann regarding Parties' Joint Request to the Court to Unseal D.I. 173. (McCann, Douglas)
June 26, 2017 Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum and Subpoena Duces Tecum on Edwin Ryan MD and Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum and Subpoena Duces Tecum to Donald D'Amico, MD filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
June 20, 2017 Filing 173 OBJECTIONS by Johns Hopkins University to #171 Memorandum and Order Regarding Attorney-Client Privilege Waiver. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hufnal, AnnaMartina) Modified on 6/21/2017 (lih). Modified on 7/5/2017 (lih).
June 7, 2017 Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Carl C. Awh, M.D. Regarding Issues of Validity Raised in the Report of Dr. Stanley Chang filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re #123 and #124 . Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/7/17. This order has been emailed to local counsel. (cak)
June 6, 2017 Filing 170 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of Edwin H. Ryan, M.D.; (2) Expert Report of Donald J. D'Amico, M.D.; (3) Rebuttal Expert Report and Disclosure of Julie L. Davis filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
June 1, 2017 Filing 169 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Theodore J. Chiacchio as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #168 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of Certain Expert Discovery Deadlines to (see Stipulation) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/31/2017. (fms)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED,- re #167 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Specified Fact Depositions to July 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/30/2017. (lih)
May 26, 2017 Filing 168 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of Certain Expert Discovery Deadlines to (see Stipulation) - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 26, 2017 Filing 167 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Specified Fact Depositions to July 3, 2017 - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
May 17, 2017 Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Expert Report of Brian W. Napper and a Redline of the Amended Expert Report of Brian W. Napper filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
May 3, 2017 Filing 165 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Julia A. Haller, M.D. Regarding Infringement; Expert Report of Dr. Carl Awh; and Expert Report of Brian Napper filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
May 3, 2017 Filing 164 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Opening Expert Report of Stanley Chang, M.D. filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #163 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Certain Expert Discovery Deadlines to Multiple Dates filed by Johns Hopkins University. See stipulation for details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/27/2017. (fms)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #162 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Fact Discovery Deadline to June 2, 2017 filed by Johns Hopkins University. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/27/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
April 26, 2017 Filing 163 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Certain Expert Discovery Deadlines to Multiple Dates - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
April 26, 2017 Filing 162 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Fact Discovery Deadline to June 2, 2017 - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
April 18, 2017 Filing 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Notice of Subpoena Directed at Charles Hess and Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #160 Proposed Order filed by Johns Hopkins University. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/13/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #160 Proposed Order filed by Johns Hopkins University. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/12/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
April 4, 2017 Filing 160 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Modified Protective Order by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
March 31, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Final Invalidity Contentions filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 29, 2017 Filing 158 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Complete Specified Fact Depositions to April 27, 2017 - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #158 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Complete Specified Fact Depositions to April 27, 2017 filed by Johns Hopkins University. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/29/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
March 17, 2017 Filing 157 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Fourth Supplemental Response to Alcon's First Set of Interrogatories No. 2 filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
March 17, 2017 Filing 156 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) The Johns Hopkins University's Final Identification of Accused Products; and 2) Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions with Attachments A-C filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
March 16, 2017 Filing 155 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s List of Invalidity References filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Status Conference held on 3/9/2017. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #153 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Specified Fact Depositions to March 31, 2017 filed by Johns Hopkins University. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/24/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
February 23, 2017 Filing 154 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Alcon Laboratories, Inc and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-19) and (2) Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Fourth Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 22, 2017 Filing 153 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Specified Fact Depositions to March 31, 2017 - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
February 22, 2017 Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Response to Defendants' Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research Ltd.'s Second Set of Requests for Admissions (Nos. 20-316) filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER re: claim construction. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/22/2017. (nmfn)
February 17, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Third Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 13, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Objections and Responses to Alcon's Second Notice of the Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Deposition of JHU filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
February 1, 2017 Filing 148 REDACTED VERSION of #143 Claim Construction Surreply Brief by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Del Dotto, Kelly)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER, Rescheduling Hearings( The Status Conference is rescheduled for 3/9/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/30/2017. (nmfn)
January 27, 2017 Filing 146 REDACTED VERSION of #140 Claim Construction Surreply Brief by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM ORDER re #97 Letter. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/26/2017.This order is available for pickup ONLY at Clerks Office by local counsel. (lih)
January 24, 2017 Filing 144 REDACTED VERSION of #133 Letter by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas) Modified on 1/25/2017 (lih).
January 24, 2017 Filing 143 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SURREPLY BRIEF re #140 Claim Construction Surreply Brief filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McCann, Douglas)
January 23, 2017 Filing 142 REDACTED VERSION of #132 Letter by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 1/24/2017 (lih).
January 23, 2017 Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Second Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff The Johns Hopkins University (Nos. 20-316) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 20, 2017 Filing 140 [SEALED] Supplemental CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SURREPLY BRIEF filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 19, 2017 Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Fourth Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 116-132) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 19, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Neil Veloso on February 10, 2017 filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 19, 2017 Filing 137 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christy Wyskiel on February 15, 2017 filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 18, 2017 Filing 136 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey A. Marx - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #136 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey A. Marx. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/18/2017. (lih)
January 17, 2017 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Supplemental Response to Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd's Third Set of Requests for Production Nos 113-115 filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
January 17, 2017 Filing 134 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Russ Finlay on February 1, 2017 filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
January 17, 2017 Filing 133 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Douglas E. McCann regarding supplement to January 4, 2017 letter - re #123 Letter. (McCann, Douglas)
January 17, 2017 Filing 132 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding supplement to January 4, 2017 letter - re #124 Letter. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 17, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Second Notice of Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Deposition of Plaintiff The Johns Hopkins University and (2) Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Objections to The Johns Hopkins University's Subpoena to Jones Day to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action and Associated Requests for Production filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 13, 2017 Filing 130 REDACTED VERSION of #123 Letter by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 22)(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 1/17/2017 (lih).
January 13, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Markman Hearing held on 1/13/2017. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmfn)
January 13, 2017 SECOND REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #123 . (lih)
January 12, 2017 Filing 129 REDACTED VERSION of #126 Letter by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 12, 2017 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #123 . (lih)
January 11, 2017 Filing 128 REDACTED VERSION of #124 Letter by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 6)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 9, 2017 Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon Laboratories, Inc's and Alcon Research Ltd.'s Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-12) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 1/9/2017. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #113 Joint MOTION for Discovery Hearing. The transcript of the discovery dispute hearing on 1/9/2017 shall serve as the order of the court. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/9/2017. (lih)
January 5, 2017 Filing 126 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding response to JHU's letter of January 4, 2017 - re #123 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 5, 2017 Filing 125 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Douglas E. McCann regarding discovery dispute - re #124 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(McCann, Douglas)
January 4, 2017 Filing 124 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 6)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
January 4, 2017 Filing 123 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Douglas E. McCann regarding discovery disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15, #2 Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit 17-22)(McCann, Douglas)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #123 Letter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the defendants shall have until 4:00 pm on 1/5/2017 to file a response. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/4/2017. (lih)
January 3, 2017 Filing 122 Joint Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kelly Allenspach Del Dotto regarding discovery disputes. (Del Dotto, Kelly)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER, Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: (The Markman Hearing is rescheduled for 1/13/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/3/2017. (nmfn)
January 3, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, the declaration at D.I. #93 has been removed and replaced with a version that contains graphics on pages 4, 5, and 25. (fms)
December 30, 2016 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Fifth Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 183-206) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
December 28, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena and Subpoena with Attachments A-C on Mark Forchette, David Booth, David Lancaster and Dyson Hickingbotham filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
December 13, 2016 Filing 118 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Notice of Deposition of Terry H. Shelley Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(1) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 13, 2016 Filing 117 NOTICE of Subpoenas by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 13, 2016 Filing 116 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Neil M. Bressler on January 16, 2017 filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 13, 2016 Filing 115 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Leigh Penfield on January 26, 2017 filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 8, 2016 Filing 114 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's First Set of Requests for Admission to Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd. (Nos. 1-12) filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
December 8, 2016 Filing 113 Joint MOTION for Discovery Dispute Hearing - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 12/8/2016 (lih).
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #113 Joint MOTION for Discovery Dispute Hearing. A Discovery Dispute Hearing is set for 1/9/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. By no later than noon on 1/3/2017, counsel shall submit a joint letter advising the court if there are any additional issues outside of those mentioned to the court in the email dated 11/30/2016. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 1/4/2017., Responsive submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 1/5/2017.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/8/2016. (lih)
December 6, 2016 Filing 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
December 2, 2016 Filing 111 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Second Notice of Deposition of Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd. filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
December 1, 2016 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Fifth Set of Requests for Production to Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd. (Nos. 183-206) filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
December 1, 2016 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff The Johns Hopkins University's Objections and Responses to Alcon's First Notice of the Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Deposition of JHU filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
December 1, 2016 Filing 108 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SURREPLY BRIEF filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 17, 2016 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena to Craig Vlaanderen; Subpoena to Testify to Craig Vlaanderen; Notice of Subpoena of Bruno Dacquay; and Subpoena to Testify to Bruno Dacquay filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
November 10, 2016 Filing 106 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF filed by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
November 8, 2016 Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s First Notice of Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Deposition of Plaintiff The Johns Hopkins University filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 7, 2016 Filing 104 Joint Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Douglas E. McCann and Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding discovery dispute - re #98 Letter, #97 Letter,. (McCann, Douglas)
November 2, 2016 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Objections to the Johns Hopkins University's Request for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena Directed to Johns Hopkins Health System filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 31, 2016 Filing 102 REDACTED VERSION of #97 Letter by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-11)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 11/1/2016 (lih).
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #101 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Thornburgh. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/31/2016. (lih)
October 28, 2016 Filing 101 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John W. Thornburgh - filed by Johns Hopkins University. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(McCann, Douglas)
October 28, 2016 Filing 100 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Objections to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena Directed to Bascom Palmer Eye Institute; (2) Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Objections to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, Or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena Directed to Florida Hospital; (3) Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Objections to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena Directed to University of Pittsburgh Medical Center; and (4) Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Objections to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena Directed to Weil Cornell Medicine filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- The transcript of the discovery dispute hearing on 10/27/2016 shall serve as the order of the court. By no later than close of business on 11/7/2016, counsel shall submit a joint status letter to the court advising whether or not the dispute has been resolved. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/27/2016. (lih)
October 27, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 10/27/2016. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
October 27, 2016 Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Jovin Lim's Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena; (2) Janet Burk's Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena; (3) Jay Stark's Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena; (4) Michael Papac's Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena; (5) Josh Anderson's Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena; (6) James Chon's Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena; (7) Craig Vlaanderen's Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena; (8) Bruno Dacquay's Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena; (9) Amanda Lewis's Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena; and (10) Paul Hallen's Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action and Associated Requests for Documents, Electronically Stored Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 25, 2016 Filing 98 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Douglas E. McCann regarding discovery dispute - re #97 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10)(McCann, Douglas)
October 25, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The request for courtesy copies filed on 10/24/2016 has been deleted. (lih)
October 24, 2016 Filing 97 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 3 and Part 1 of Exhibit A to Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit Part 2 - Exhibit A to Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit Part 3 - Exhibit A to Exhibit 3 and Exhibit B to Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit C & E to Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit D to Exhibit 3 and Exhibits 4 - 11)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 21, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas on University, Bascom Palmer Eye Institute and Weill Cornell Medicine filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
October 20, 2016 Filing 95 Joint APPENDIX re #94 Claim Construction Opening Brief by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Tab 1 JA000001-25, #2 Tab 2-Part 1 of 4 JA000026-191, #3 Tab 2-Part 2 of 4 JA000192-348, #4 Tab 2-Part 3 of 4 JA000349-485, #5 Tab 2-Part 4 of 4 JA000486-566)(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
October 20, 2016 Filing 94 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF (CORRECTED D.I. 76) filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina) Modified on 10/24/2016 (lih).
October 20, 2016 Filing 93 DECLARATION of Dr. Donald D'Amico, M.D. re #92 Claim Construction Answering Brief by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Exhibit C (Part 1), #3 Exhibit C (Part 2), #4 Exhibits D-F, #5 Exhibits G-H)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/24/2016 (lih). (Main Document 93 replaced on 1/3/2017) (fms).
October 20, 2016 Filing 92 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re #76 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 20, 2016 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 177-182) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 19, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena and Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises Directed at Johns Hopkins Health System filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
October 19, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena and Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises with Attachments A-C on Florida Hospital filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the discovery dispute hearing set in this matter for 10/27/2016 at 11:00 AM has been RESCHEDULED to 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/14/2016. (lih)
October 11, 2016 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Notice of Subpoena Directed at Steve Charles, M.D. and related Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #85 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Defendants to inform Plaintiff that they intend to rely on an opinion of counsel to November 1, 2016. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/7/2016. (lih)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #84 Joint MOTION for a Conference to Resolve Discovery Disputes. A Discovery Dispute Hearing is set for 10/27/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 10/24/2016., Responsive submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 10/25/2016.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/7/2016. (lih)
October 6, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena Directed at Paul Hallen; Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition (with Attachments A-C) filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
October 6, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum; Subpoena to Produce Documents with Exs A-C for Craig Vlaanderen; Jay Stark; Michael Papac; Jovin Lim; Amanda Lewis; Burno Dacquay; James Chon; Janet Burk; and Josh Anderson filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
October 6, 2016 Filing 85 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Defendants to inform Plaintiff that they intend to rely on an opinion of counsel to November 1, 2016 - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 5, 2016 Filing 84 Joint MOTION for a Conference to Resolve Discovery Disputes - filed by Johns Hopkins University. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(McCann, Douglas) Modified on 10/6/2016 (lih).
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #82 Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Information and Documents Produced by Third Party Bausch & Lomb Incorporated. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/5/2016. (lih)
October 3, 2016 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Response to Defendant's Third Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 113-115) filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
October 3, 2016 Filing 82 Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Information and Documents Produced by Third Party Bausch & Lomb Incorporated by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 10/4/2016 (lih).
September 29, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon's Objections and Responses to JHU's First Notice of Deposition of Alcon filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 16, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Fourth Set of Requests for Production to Defendants; and The Johns Hopkins University's First Notice of Deposition of Defendants filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
September 16, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-19); (2) Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s First Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); and (3) Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Third Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #78 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/13/2016. (lih)
September 8, 2016 Filing 78 Joint STIPULATION re Number of Depositions Permitted in this Case re #24 Proposed Order by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
September 8, 2016 Filing 77 DECLARATION of Martina Tyreus Hufnal re #76 Claim Construction Opening Brief by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 Part 1 of 3, #3 Exhibit 2 Part 2 of 3, #4 Exhibit 2 Part 3 of 3, #5 Exhibit 3 Part 1 of 2, #6 Exhibit 3 Part 2 of 2, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7 Part 1 of 2, #11 Exhibit 7 Part 2 of 2, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12)(Hufnal, AnnaMartina) Modified on 9/9/2016 (lih).
September 8, 2016 Filing 76 (THIS HAS BEEN CORRECTED - SEE D.I. #94 ) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina) Modified on 10/21/2016 (fms).
September 8, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Defendants Requests for Documents and Other Information Pursuant to Subpoena by Aaron Barnes, Dr. Eugene De Juan, and Patrick Jensen filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
September 2, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Third Set of Requests for Productions (Nos. 113-115) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 24, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Patrick S. Jensen by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 24, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Eugene de Juan, Jr. by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 24, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Arron C. Barnes by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 11, 2016 Filing 70 CLAIM Construction Chart by Johns Hopkins University. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
July 29, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of JHU's Statement of Claim Terms Requiring Construction and Proposed Construction Thereof filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
July 28, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Preliminary Proposed Claim Terms and Constructions filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM ORDER re #35 Joint MOTION for FOR A CONFERENCE TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/18/2016.This order is available for pickup ONLY at Clerks Office by local counsel. (lih)
July 18, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of HCB Health's Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 8, 2016 Filing 65 REDACTED VERSION of #62 Letter by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 7, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-19); (2) Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5); (3) First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 71-149); (2) Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-70) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 7, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-19) and (2) Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 71-149) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 1, 2016 Filing 62 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to JHU's June 30, 2016 Letter - re #61 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 30, 2016 Filing 61 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kelly A. Del Dotto regarding The Johns Hopkins University Status Regarding Temporal Limitation Discovery Issue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Del Dotto, Kelly)
June 28, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum and Subpoena regarding HCB Health filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
June 20, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 95-112) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
June 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 6/16/2016. (Court Reporter S. Ingram ( Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Per the transcript of the 6/16/2016, the transcript of the 6/16/2016 discovery dispute teleconference shall serve as the order of the court for the issues identified on the record during the hearing. The court will reserve judgment on the remaining issues. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/21/2016. (lih) Modified on 6/21/2016 (lih).
June 6, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to The Johns Hopkins University's Third Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 150-176) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 31, 2016 Filing 57 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding Discovery Dispute - re #50 Letter. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 31, 2016 Filing 56 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kelly A. Del Dotto regarding discovery dispute - re #52 Letter. (Del Dotto, Kelly)
May 24, 2016 Filing 55 REDACTED VERSION of #51 Exhibit to a Document by Johns Hopkins University. (Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 5/24/2016 (lih).
May 23, 2016 Filing 54 REDACTED VERSION of #52 Letter by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit 3 (Part 2), #4 Exhibits 4-5)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/24/2016 (lih).
May 17, 2016 Filing 53 PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery Dispute re #52 Letter by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 5/18/2016 (lih). (Main Document 53 replaced on 5/19/2016) (lih).
May 17, 2016 Filing 52 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit 3 (Part 2), #4 Exhibits 4-5)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 17, 2016 Filing 51 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #50 Letter by Johns Hopkins University. (Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 5/18/2016 (lih).
May 17, 2016 Filing 50 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Kelly Allenspach Del Dotto regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 5/18/2016 (lih).
May 17, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Steve Charles M.D.'s Objections and Responses to The Johns Hopkins University's Requests for Documents, Information, or Objects Under Third Party Subpoena filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 11, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections to Defendants' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Third-Party Bausch & Lomb Incorporated filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
May 5, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Third Set of Requests for Production to Alcon (Nos. 150-176) filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
May 4, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum on Steve Charles, MD filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
May 4, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to First Set of Requests for Admissions [Nos. 1-19] and Response to Second Set of Interrogatories to Alcon [No. 12] filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
May 4, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 5/4/2016. (Court Reporter S. Vickers (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: counsel shall submit supplemental briefing, limited to no more than five pages, re #35 Joint MOTION for A CONFERENCE TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Set Briefing Schedule: Opening Brief due 5/17/2016., Answering Brief due 5/31/2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: the court shall hear argument on 6/16/2016 at 3:00 PM in courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/4/2016. (lih)
May 3, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE of Subpoena on Bausch & Lomb Incorporated by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen)
May 2, 2016 Filing 43 REDACTED VERSION of #41 Status Report, by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED EXHIBITS A-H)(Del Dotto, Kelly)
April 28, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 25, 2016 Filing 41 [SEALED] Joint STATUS REPORT by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 4/26/2016 (lih).
April 22, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 19, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-70) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
April 1, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 12); and (2) Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff The Johns Hopkins University (Nos. 1-19) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #35 Joint MOTION FOR A CONFERENCE TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a status teleconference on 5/4/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: on or before 4/25/2016, counsel shall submit a joint status report to the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/30/2016. (lih)
March 29, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute and Discovery Review Hearing held on 3/29/2016. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #35 Joint MOTION FOR A CONFERENCE TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTES. The transcript of the 3/29/2016 discovery dispute hearing shall serve as the order of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/29/2016. (lih)
March 24, 2016 Filing 37 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding discovery dispute - re #36 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 3/28/2016 (lih).
March 23, 2016 Filing 36 Letter to Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Kelly Allenspach Del Dotto regarding Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 3/23/2016 (lih).
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #35 Joint MOTION FOR A CONFERENCE TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTES. The discovery dispute shall be heard during the discovery review hearing set in this matter for 3/29/2016 at 3:00 PM in courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 3:00 PM on 3/23/2016., Responsive submission due by no later than 3:00 PM on 3/24/2016.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/16/2016. (lih)
March 14, 2016 Filing 35 Joint MOTION FOR A CONFERENCE TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTES - filed by Johns Hopkins University. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Winter, Christopher) Modified on 3/15/2016 (lih).
March 9, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of THE JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' 1ST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-11) and THE JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY'S 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' 1ST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (NOS. 1-94) filed by Johns Hopkins University.(Del Dotto, Kelly)
March 2, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Katie A. Boda for Alcon Laboratories Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the discovery review hearing set in this matter for 3/8/2016 is RESCHEDULED to 3/29/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/26/2016. (lih)
February 22, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katie A. Boda - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Kraftschik, Stephen)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #33 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katie A. Boda filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/22/2016. (fms)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Pursuant to the joint request of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the Discovery Review Hearing set in this matter for 3/1/2016 is RESCHEDULED to 3/8/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/8/2016. (lih)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #32 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order filed by Johns Hopkins University. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/4/2016. (fms)
February 3, 2016 Filing 32 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order by Johns Hopkins University. (Del Dotto, Kelly) Modified on 2/4/2016 (lih).
January 7, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Supplemental Response to Defendants' Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 11) filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
November 30, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of JHU's Identification of Accused Products, Asserted Patent, Damages Model, and Prosecution File History filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
November 25, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alcon Laboratories, Inc.'s and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 23, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5); and (2) Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-70) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 16, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The Johns Hopkins University's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
November 13, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER- A Discovery Review Hearing is set for 3/1/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/4/2015. (lih)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for discovery and all motions to dismiss, amend, transfer and any discovery motions permitted by the Magistrate Judge.( Joinder of Parties due by 10/27/2016., Amended Pleadings due by 10/27/2016., Fact Discovery completed by 2/22/2017., Expert Discovery due by 7/27/2017., A Status Conference is set for 3/9/2017 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson, Dispositive Motions due by 8/24/2017., An Oral Argument is set for 11/17/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 9/8/2016., Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 10/20/2016., Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 11/10/2016., Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 12/1/2016., A Markman Hearing is set for 1/13/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Status Conference re: Expert Discovery is set for 8/10/2017 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/30/2018 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson., A Jury Trial is set for 2/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.) Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/3/2015. (nmfn)
October 29, 2015 Filing 24 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Case Scheduling Order by Johns Hopkins University. (Del Dotto, Kelly)
October 26, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-11); and (2) Defendant Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Research, Ltd.'s First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-94) filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
October 26, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Scheduling Conference held on 10/26/2015. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Counsel to submit the final proposed scheduling order to the court. (nmfn)
October 23, 2015 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
October 23, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of THE JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO ALCON LABORATORIES, INC. AND ALCON RESEARCH, LTD (NOS. 1-70); and THE JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-5) TO ALCON LABORATORIES, INC. AND ALCON RESEARCH, LTD. filed by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
October 22, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Lee Halkowski on behalf of Johns Hopkins University (Halkowski, Thomas)
September 30, 2015 Filing 19 ANSWER to #17 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Johns Hopkins University.(McCann, Douglas)
September 25, 2015 Reset Hearings: The In-Person Scheduling Conference is rescheduled per unopposed request of counsel for 10/26/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. (nmfn)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Setting In-Person Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/14/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/22/2015. (nmfn)
September 17, 2015 Filing 17 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #13 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Johns Hopkins University by Alcon Research Ltd., Alcon Laboratories Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 17, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Frank E. Scherkenbach for Johns Hopkins University added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cna)
September 16, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Todd G. Miller for Johns Hopkins University added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
September 16, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kenton W. Freeman for Johns Hopkins University added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
September 1, 2015 Filing 16 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Johns Hopkins University in the form of a DVD with Exhibits L, M & N to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Filing related to #13 Amended Complaint, #14 Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials,. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (fms)
August 31, 2015 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) -- filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Del Dotto, Kelly)
August 31, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Exhibits L, M & N to Amended Complaint (DI 13). Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Kelly A Del Dotto on behalf of Johns Hopkins University (Del Dotto, Kelly)
August 31, 2015 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Del Dotto, Kelly)
August 31, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A Del Dotto on behalf of Johns Hopkins University (Del Dotto, Kelly)
August 13, 2015 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 13, 2015 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) -- filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/31/2015. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
August 13, 2015 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) -- - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Kraftschik, Stephen)
July 24, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank E. Scherkenbach, Todd Miller, and Kenton William Freeman, Jr. - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (McCann, Douglas)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank E. Scherkenbach, Todd Miller, and Kenton William Freeman, Jr. filed by Johns Hopkins University. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/24/2015. (fms)
July 15, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Theodore J. Chiacchio, Erin M. Forbes, John D. Polivick, Deanne M. Mazzochi, Rachel L. Pernic Waldron, Paul J. Molino, William A. Rakoczy for Alcon Laboratories Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William A. Rakoczy, Paul J. Molino, John D. Polivick, Deanne M. Mazzochi, Rachel L. Pernic Waldron, Theodore J. Chiacchio, and Erin M. Forbes filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/9/2015. (fms)
July 8, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William A. Rakoczy, Paul J. Molino, John D. Polivick, Deanne M. Mazzochi, Rachel L. Pernic Waldron, Theodore J. Chiacchio, and Erin M. Forbes - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 8, 2015 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 13, 2015 - filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 13, 2015 filed by Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Alcon Laboratories Inc. answer due 8/13/2015; Alcon Research Ltd. answer due 8/13/2015. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/8/2015. (fms)
June 24, 2015 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johns Hopkins University. Alcon Laboratories Inc. served on 6/23/2015, answer due 7/14/2015; Alcon Research Ltd. served on 6/23/2015, answer due 7/14/2015. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned on Alcon Research, Ltd.)(McCann, Douglas)
June 24, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 23, 2015 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Johns Hopkins University. (dmp, )
June 23, 2015 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,077,848 B1;. (dmp, )
June 23, 2015 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (dmp, )
June 23, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Alcon Laboratories Inc., Alcon Research Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-1744062.) - filed by Johns Hopkins University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, )
June 23, 2015 No Summons Issued. (dmp, )
June 23, 2015 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Alcon Laboratories Inc. on 6/23/2015; Alcon Research Ltd. on 6/23/2015. (sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johns Hopkins University v. Alcon Laboratories Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johns Hopkins University
Represented By: Thomas Lee Halkowski
Represented By: Frank E. Scherkenbach
Represented By: Kenton W. Freeman
Represented By: AnnaMartina Tyreus Hufnal
Represented By: Corrin N. Drakulich
Represented By: Christina Brown-Marshall
Represented By: Kelly A Del Dotto
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Represented By: Christopher A. Winter
Represented By: Todd G. Miller
Represented By: Jonathan J. Lamberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcon Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Molino
Represented By: Kevin P. Burke
Represented By: Theodore J. Chiacchio
Represented By: Rachel L. Pernic Waldron
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Stephen J. Kraftschik
Represented By: John D. Polivick
Represented By: Gregory A. Duff
Represented By: Erin M. Forbes
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Represented By: Deanne M. Mazzochi
Represented By: Katie A. Boda
Represented By: Christopher P. Galligan
Represented By: Patrick C. Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcon Research Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin P. Burke
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Stephen J. Kraftschik
Represented By: Gregory A. Duff
Represented By: Patrick C. Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?