Charlevoix et al v. Caterpillar Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn Charlevoix and Stephen Charlevoix
Defendant: VIAD Corporation, Trane US Inc., John Crane Inc., Ford Motor Company, Crane Co., Caterpillar Inc., Fiat Allis North America, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Ingersoll Rand, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, CBS Corporation, FMC Corporation and Warren Pumps, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00726
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Eduardo C Robreno
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Filing 225 JUDGMENT in favor of Caterpillar Inc., Crane Co., Ford Motor Company, VIAD Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC against Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno on 9/27/2017. (nmfn)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #223 granting #150 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #154 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #158 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #160 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #164 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno on 9/26/2017. (nmfn)
August 31, 2017 Filing 223 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #154 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #150 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 9/18/2017. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/31/2017. (lih)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno on 8/28/2017. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(rjb)
July 25, 2017 Case Reassigned to Judge Eduardo C. Robreno of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship). Please include the initials of the Judge (ER) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #218 granting #144 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #162 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/8/2017. (nmfn)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER DENYING #220 Request for Oral Argument filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/27/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
February 24, 2017 Filing 220 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Ford Motor Company re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Singewald, Christian)
February 22, 2017 Filing 219 REPLY BRIEF re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Defendant, Ford Motor Company's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Defendant, Ford Motor Company's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment)(Singewald, Christian)
February 16, 2017 Filing 218 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fiat Allis North America, #144 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Crane Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 3/6/2017. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/16/17. (cak)
February 13, 2017 Filing 217 DECLARATION re #216 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Bridget B. Truxillo in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Summary Judgment by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (deBruin, David)
February 13, 2017 Filing 216 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(deBruin, David)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #215 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set Briefing Schedule: re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Answering Brief due 2/13/2017.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/3/2017. (lih)
January 30, 2017 Filing 215 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs' to file a Response Brief in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Summary Judgment to February 13, 2017 - filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (deBruin, David)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #202 granting #146 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #152 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #156 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting #166 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/19/2017. (nmfn)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #200 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Protective Order Discovery Dispute. The transcript of the discovery dispute teleconference on 1/18/2017 shall serve as the order of the court. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/18/2017. (lih)
January 18, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference held on 1/18/2017. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
January 17, 2017 Filing 213 ANSWER to #198 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)).(Ford, Eileen) Modified on 1/17/2017 (lih).
January 17, 2017 Filing 212 ANSWER to #198 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Caterpillar Inc..(Ford, Eileen) Modified on 1/17/2017 (lih).
January 13, 2017 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #210 . (lih)
January 13, 2017 Filing 211 Letter to Honorable Magistrate Judge Fallon from David W. deBruin, Esq. regarding Plaintiff's submission regarding her discovery dispute with Ford. (deBruin, David)
January 13, 2017 Filing 210 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Christian J. Singewald regarding discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Singewald, Christian) Modified on 1/13/2017 (lih).
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re SO ORDERED entry of 12/28/2016. Pursuant to the joint request of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the order setting the discovery dispute teleconference is amended as follows; plaintiff and defendant Ford Motor Company shall each file a moving submission by no later than 11:00 AM on 1/13/2017 in accordance with the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters. There shall be no responses filed. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/12/2017. (lih)
January 11, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Oral Argument held on 1/11/2017 re #154 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
January 9, 2017 Filing 209 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian D. Ahern - re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #163 Opening Brief in Support. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Peter)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #207 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin J. O'Brien. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/6/2017. (lih)
January 6, 2017 Filing 208 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Jessica L. Tyler, Esquire regarding Oral Argument Schedule for 1/11/17. (Tyler, Jessica)
January 5, 2017 Filing 207 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin J. O'Brien, Esquire - filed by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen)
January 5, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ian P. Cloud for Marilyn Charlevoix added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
January 4, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bridget B. Truxillo for Marilyn Charlevoix added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
January 4, 2017 Filing 206 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Laura M. Cabutto as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with Robins Cloud LLP. (deBruin, David)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #204 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Bridget B. Truxillo, #205 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Ian P. Cloud. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/4/2017. (lih)
January 3, 2017 Filing 205 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ian P. Cloud, Esquire - filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(deBruin, David)
January 3, 2017 Filing 204 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bridget B. Truxillo, Esquire - filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(deBruin, David)
January 3, 2017 Filing 203 ANSWER to #198 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by John Crane Inc..(Parshall, Jonathan) Modified on 1/3/2017 (lih).
December 30, 2016 Filing 202 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- granting #152 MOTION for Summary Judgment, granting #146 MOTION for Summary Judgment, granting #166 MOTION for Summary Judgment, granting #156 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/17/2017. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/29/2016. (lih)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #199 Stipulation. Set Briefing Schedule: re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Answering Brief due 1/30/2017); re #200 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Protective Order Discovery Dispute. A Telephone Conference is set for 1/18/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the defendant shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 1/12/2017, Responsive submission due by no later than 11:00 AM on 1/13/2017.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/28/2016. (lih)
December 21, 2016 Filing 201 ANSWER to #198 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against CBS Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., Crane Co., FMC Corporation, Fiat Allis North America, Ford Motor Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Ingersoll Rand, John Crane Inc., VIAD Corporation by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 12/27/2016 (lih).
December 21, 2016 Filing 200 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Protective Order Discovery Dispute - filed by Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Singewald, Christian) Modified on 12/27/2016 (lih).
December 21, 2016 Filing 199 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE BRIEF by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian) Modified on 12/27/2016 (lih).
December 20, 2016 Filing 198 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CBS Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., Crane Co., FMC Corporation, Fiat Allis North America, Ford Motor Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Ingersoll Rand, John Crane Inc., VIAD Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC- filed by Marilyn Charlevoix.(lih)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #197 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/20/2016. (lih)
December 14, 2016 Filing 197 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint - filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Blacklined Version of Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Clean Version of Amended Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(deBruin, David) Modified on 12/14/2016 (lih).
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #195 Request for Oral Argument. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall hear argument re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment during the oral argument currently set in this matter for 1/11/2017 at 10:00 AM. The allotted time for argument shall be increased by fifteen minutes and counsel shall collectively have one hour and fifteen minutes to present argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: by no later than close of business on 1/6/2017, counsel shall submit a joint agenda that outlines the following items: division of time amongst the parties; order of presentation; identification of counsel who will be making the arguments. If any other defendant wishes to be heard during the oral argument set for 1/11/2017, they must submit a request for oral argument once their motion for summary judgment is fully briefed. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/8/2016. (lih)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #196 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set Briefing Schedule: re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Answering Brief due 12/23/2016.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/30/2016. (lih)
November 22, 2016 Filing 196 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiffs to File a Response Brief in Opposition to Ford Motor Company's Motion for Summary Judgment to December 23, 2016 - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian)
November 21, 2016 Filing 195 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Warren Pumps, LLC re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Tyler, Jessica)
November 21, 2016 Filing 194 NOTICE of Ford Motor Company's Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Requests for Production by Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
November 14, 2016 Filing 193 REPLY BRIEF re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A in support of Reply Brief to Warren's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B in support of Reply Brief to Warren's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C in support of Reply Brief to Warren's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Tyler, Jessica)
November 14, 2016 Filing 192 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Ryan W. Browning - re #152 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #153 Opening Brief in Support. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Browning, Ryan)
November 10, 2016 Filing 191 PROPOSED ORDER Dismissal re #190 Letter, #146 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CBS Corporation. (Martyniak, Shawn)
November 10, 2016 Filing 190 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Shawn E. Martyniak, Esq. regarding Request for dismissal - re #146 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Martyniak, Shawn)
November 8, 2016 Filing 189 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Daniel P. Daly regarding Request for Order Granting Defendant FMC Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment based on non-opposition. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Daly, Daniel)
November 8, 2016 Filing 188 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Jessica L. Tyler, Esquire regarding Deadline To Oppose Motion For Summary Judgment, Enclosing Proposed Order Granting Motion For Summary Judgment - re #166 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Jessica)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #187 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set Briefing Schedule: re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Reply Brief due 11/14/2016.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/8/2016. (lih)
November 4, 2016 Filing 187 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment to November 14, 2016 - filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall hear argument re #154 MOTION for Summary Judgment and #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment on 1/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel shall collectively have one hour to present argument. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/2/2016. (lih)
October 28, 2016 Filing 186 REQUEST for Oral Argument by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)) re #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Ford, Eileen)
October 28, 2016 Filing 185 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Caterpillar Inc. re #154 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Ford, Eileen)
October 27, 2016 Filing 184 REPLY BRIEF re #154 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Ford, Eileen)
October 27, 2016 Filing 183 Letter to The Honorable Judge Sue L. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Eileen M. Ford, Esquire regarding Correction to Citations to Caterpillar Inc.'s Opening Brief to its Motion for Summary Judgment - re #155 Opening Brief in Support,. (Ford, Eileen)
October 27, 2016 Filing 182 DECLARATION of Eileen M. Ford re #181 Reply Brief by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)). (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 10/28/2016 (lih).
October 27, 2016 Filing 181 REPLY BRIEF re #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3), #4 Exhibit A (Part 4), #5 Exhibit A (Part 5), #6 Exhibit A (Part 6), #7 Exhibit A (Part 7), #8 Exhibit A (Part 8), #9 Exhibit B, #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E)(Ford, Eileen)
October 27, 2016 Filing 180 REPLY BRIEF re #150 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Martyniak, Shawn)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #179 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set Briefing Schedule: re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Reply Brief due 11/7/2016.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/26/2016. (lih)
October 25, 2016 Filing 179 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Warren Pumps, LLC's reply brief in support of motion for summary judgment to November 7, 2016 - filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
October 25, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the stipulation formerly filed as D.I. 179 due to document not having a "so order" line. Counsel shall re-file the document with a "so order" line. (lih)
October 20, 2016 Filing 178 DECLARATION of Laura M. Cabutto re #177 Answering Brief in Opposition by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (deBruin, David) Modified on 10/24/2016 (lih).
October 20, 2016 Filing 177 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/31/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 4 Part 3, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12)(deBruin, David)
October 19, 2016 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #172 , #174 and #176 . (lih)
October 17, 2016 Filing 176 DECLARATION of Laura M. Cabutto re #175 Answering Brief in Opposition by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (deBruin, David) Modified on 10/17/2016 (lih).
October 17, 2016 Filing 175 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20 Part 1, #21 Exhibit 20 Part 2, #22 Exhibit 20 Part 3, #23 Exhibit 20 Part 4, #24 Exhibit 20 Part 5, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27)(deBruin, David) Modified on 10/17/2016 (lih).
October 17, 2016 Filing 174 DECLARATION of Laura M. Cabutto re #173 Answering Brief in Opposition by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (deBruin, David) Modified on 10/17/2016 (lih).
October 17, 2016 Filing 173 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #150 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 13 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(deBruin, David) Modified on 10/17/2016 (lih).
October 17, 2016 Filing 172 DECLARATION of Laura M. Cabutto re #171 Answering Brief in Opposition by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (deBruin, David) Modified on 10/17/2016 (lih).
October 17, 2016 Filing 171 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #154 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/27/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29)(deBruin, David) Modified on 10/17/2016 (lih).
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED,- re #170 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set Briefing Schedule: re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Answering Brief due 11/28/2016.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/172016. (lih)
October 14, 2016 Filing 170 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian) Modified on 10/14/2016 (lih).
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #169 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/14/2016. (lih)
October 13, 2016 Filing 169 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(deBruin, David)
October 7, 2016 SECOND NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #164 and #166 . (lih)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #168 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/7/2016. (fms)
October 7, 2016 SECOND NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #162 and #163 . (lih)
October 6, 2016 Filing 168 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
October 6, 2016 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #164 and #166 . (lih)
October 4, 2016 Filing 167 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #166 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ingersoll Rand.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Tyler, Jessica)
October 4, 2016 Filing 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Ingersoll Rand. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
October 4, 2016 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #154 , #155 , #158 , #159 , #162 and #163 . (lih)
October 4, 2016 Filing 165 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Tyler, Jessica)
October 4, 2016 Filing 164 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
October 4, 2016 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #156 and #157 . (lih)
September 30, 2016 Filing 163 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #162 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fiat Allis North America.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Murphy, Peter)
September 30, 2016 Filing 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Fiat Allis North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Murphy, Peter)
September 30, 2016 Filing 161 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #160 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Singewald, Christian)
September 30, 2016 Filing 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Singewald, Christian)
September 30, 2016 Filing 159 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #158 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J-1, #11 Exhibit J-2, #12 Exhibit J-3, #13 Exhibit K-1, #14 Exhibit K-2, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S)(Ford, Eileen)
September 30, 2016 Filing 158 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen)
September 30, 2016 Filing 157 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #156 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FMC Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Daly, Daniel)
September 30, 2016 Filing 156 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Daly, Daniel)
September 30, 2016 Filing 155 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #154 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Caterpillar Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Ford, Eileen)
September 30, 2016 Filing 154 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen)
September 30, 2016 Filing 153 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #152 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2016. (Browning, Ryan)
September 30, 2016 Filing 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Browning, Ryan)
September 30, 2016 Filing 151 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #150 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Co..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Martyniak, Shawn)
September 30, 2016 Filing 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Martyniak, Shawn)
September 30, 2016 Filing 149 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #148 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Valocchi, Beth)
September 30, 2016 Filing 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
September 30, 2016 Filing 147 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #146 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Valocchi, Beth)
September 30, 2016 Filing 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Valocchi, Beth)
September 28, 2016 Filing 145 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #144 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Crane Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Parshall, Jonathan) Modified on 9/29/2016 (lih).
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #143 STIPULATION to Extend Time For Ingersoll Rand Company and Warren Pumps, LLC to file dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/28/2016. (lih)
September 28, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the opening brief and exhibits formerly attached to D.I. #144 due to documents being filed incorrectly. Counsel is advised to re-file the opening brief separately using the appropriate event code. (lih)
September 28, 2016 Filing 144 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by John Crane Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Opening Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Opening Brief, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Opening Brief, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Opening Brief, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Opening Brief, #6 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Parshall, Jonathan)
September 28, 2016 Filing 143 STIPULATION Extend Time For Ingersoll Rand Company and Warren Pumps, LLC to file dispositive motions by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 9/28/2016 (lih).
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #140 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Dismissal of Cross-Claims filed by Trane US Inc., Party Trane US Inc. (f/k/a American Standard Companies successor in interest to American Blower Company) terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/26/2016. (nmfn)
September 27, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: Upon further review of the motion for protective order, previously filed as D.I. 142, the court has determined that the matter should be handled as a discovery dispute. Counsel is advised to review the courts discovery dispute procedures. (lih)
September 26, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, the motion for protective order has been deleted and will be re-filed. (lih)
September 16, 2016 Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Discovery Requests filed by Fiat Allis North America.(Murphy, Peter)
September 7, 2016 Filing 140 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Dismissal of Cross-Claims - filed by Trane US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Compliance)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #139 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Trane US Inc., Party Trane US Inc. (f/k/a American Standard Companies successor in interest to American Blower Company) terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/2/2016. (nmfn)
August 30, 2016 Filing 139 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Trane US Inc.. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 8/30/2016 (lih).
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #137 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2016.) PLEASE REFER TO STIPULATION FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/30/2016. (lih)
August 29, 2016 Filing 138 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of service of Ingersoll Rand Company Responses to both sets of Plaintiff's Discovery Requests filed by Ingersoll Rand.(Tyler, Jessica)
August 23, 2016 Filing 137 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Case Dispositive Motions and to complete Depositions of all Defense Fact Witnesses to 9/30/2016 - filed by Crane Co.. (Martyniak, Shawn)
August 23, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, the stipulation filed on 8/23/2016 has been removed from the docket and will be re-filed shortly. (fms)
August 22, 2016 Filing 136 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Crane Co.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
August 22, 2016 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Warren Pumps, LLC's First Set of Requests for Production filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
August 22, 2016 Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Viad Corp.s First Set of Requests for Production filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
August 22, 2016 Filing 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Ingersoll Rand Companys First Set of Requests for Production filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
August 22, 2016 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Caterpillar Inc.s First Set of Requests for Production filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #126 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/18/2016. (lih)
August 17, 2016 Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery re #102 Notice of Service filed by John Crane Inc..(Parshall, Jonathan)
August 17, 2016 Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Viad Corp's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production re #104 Notice of Service, filed by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)).(Ford, Eileen)
August 17, 2016 Filing 129 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's first set of discovery re #94 Notice of Service, filed by CBS Corporation.(Martyniak, Shawn)
August 17, 2016 Filing 128 NOTICE of Service of Objections and Response to Plaintiffs Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Browning, Ryan)
August 17, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production re #93 Notice of Service filed by Caterpillar Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
August 16, 2016 Filing 126 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery to September 17, 2016 - filed by Fiat Allis North America. (Murphy, Peter)
August 16, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Production of Military Records filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
August 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Status Telephone Conference held on 8/15/2016. (Court Reporter T. Carroll ( Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
August 15, 2016 Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Ford Motor Company's Bankruptcy Trust-Related Requests for Admission, Plaintiffs' Responses to Ford Motor Company's Bankruptcy Trust-Related Requests for Production of Documents and Plaintiffs' Responses to Ford Motor Company's Bankruptcy Trust-Related Interrogatories filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
August 15, 2016 Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's first set of discovery re #99 Notice of Service filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Martyniak, Shawn)
August 12, 2016 Filing 122 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Warren Pumps, LLC's Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
August 5, 2016 Filing 121 Joint STATUS REPORT by Crane Co.. (Martyniak, Shawn)
August 5, 2016 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's first set of discovery re #94 Notice of Service, filed by CBS Corporation.(Martyniak, Shawn)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #118 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery to August 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/2/2016. (lih)
August 1, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE of Service of Objections and Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Browning, Ryan)
August 1, 2016 Filing 118 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery to August 8, 2016 - filed by CBS Corporation. (Martyniak, Shawn)
August 1, 2016 Filing 117 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Objections and Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents re #73 Notice of Service filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Martyniak, Shawn)
August 1, 2016 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Objections and Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents re #71 Notice of Service filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
July 29, 2016 Filing 115 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiffs' First Set of Request for Production filed by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
July 29, 2016 Filing 114 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant VIAD Corp's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production re #77 Notice of Service, filed by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)).(Ford, Eileen)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #111 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME, #110 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME, #112 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/29/2016. (lih) Modified on 7/29/2016 (lih).
July 28, 2016 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Production of Bankruptcy Claim Forms filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 28, 2016 Filing 112 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Warren Pumps, LLC's response to Plaintiff's discovery requests to August 12, 2016 - filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
July 28, 2016 Filing 111 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Ingersoll Rand Company's Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to August 12, 2016 - filed by Ingersoll Rand. (Tyler, Jessica)
July 28, 2016 Filing 110 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Trane U.S. Inc's responses to plaintiff's discovery requests to August 12, 2016 - filed by Trane US Inc.. (Tyler, Jessica)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the status teleconference set in this matter for 8/15/2016 at 10:00 AM is RESCHEDULED to 04:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/27/2016. (lih)
July 26, 2016 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of service of Ingersoll Rand Company and Warren Pumps, LLC's Request for production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by Ingersoll Rand.(Tyler, Jessica)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #106 Joint STIPULATION AND ORDER AS TO SUBSTANTIVE LAW. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/26/2016. (lih)
July 22, 2016 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant, VIAD CORP's First Set of Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs filed by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)).(Ford, Eileen)
July 22, 2016 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant, Caterpillar Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiffs filed by Caterpillar Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
July 22, 2016 Filing 106 Joint STIPULATION AND ORDER AS TO SUBSTANTIVE LAW by Crane Co.. (Martyniak, Shawn)
July 18, 2016 Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Warren Pumps filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 104 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Viad Corporation f/k/a The Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company) filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Trane US, Inc. f/k/a American Standard Companies Successor in Interest to American Blower Company filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 102 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant John Crane, Inc. filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Ingersoll Rand with Regard to Terry Turbines filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 100 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant FMC Corporation as a Successor to Northern Pumps filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Fiat Allis North America filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Crane Co. filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 94 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc. (sued as a successor-by-merger to CBS f/k/a Westinghouse Corporation and also as a Successor in Interest to BF Sturtevant) filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 18, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Caterpillar Inc. filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
July 14, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Company's Bankruptcy Trust-Related Interrogatories to Plaintiffs, Ford Motor Company's Bankruptcy Trust-Related Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs and Ford Motor Company's Bankruptcy Trust-Related Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs filed by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
July 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, D.I. 90 has been removed from the docket as it was refiled correctly at D.I. #91 . (fms)
July 11, 2016 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Fiat Allis North America.(Murphy, Peter)
July 11, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service of Ingersoll Rand Company, Warren Pumps, LLC and Trane US Inc.'s Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
July 8, 2016 Filing 88 NOTICE of Service of Initial Witness & Exhibit List by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Browning, Ryan)
July 8, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List filed by CBS Corporation.(Martyniak, Shawn)
July 8, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Martyniak, Shawn)
July 8, 2016 Filing 85 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
July 8, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE of OF SERVICE OF WITNESS AND EXHIBITS LIST by Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
July 8, 2016 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by John Crane Inc..(Parshall, Jonathan)
July 8, 2016 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
July 8, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant VIAD Corp's Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)).(Ford, Eileen)
July 8, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Caterpillar Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
July 1, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Amended Work History Sheet filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Warren Pumps filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Viad Corporation f/k/a The Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company) filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Trane US, Inc. f/k/a American Standard Companies Successor in Interest to American Blower Company filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Ingersoll Rand with Regard to Terry Turbines filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant FMC Corporation as a Successor to Northern Pumps filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant Crane Co. filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
June 30, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Defendant CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc. (sued as a successor-by-merger to CBS f/k/a Westinghouse Corporation and also as a Successor in Interest to BF Sturtevant) filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #69 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael T. Hamilton. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/24/2016. (lih)
May 24, 2016 Filing 69 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael T. Hamilton, Esquire - filed by Caterpillar Inc., VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)). (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen)
May 19, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pat Mulligan on 5/26/16 filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
May 18, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE to Take Deposition of James Kimble on 5/24/16 filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
April 22, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS JOINT WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
March 16, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Richard L. Kradin, M.D., D.T.M. & H. filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
March 16, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Exhibit List as to Defendant Griscom-Russell Company (Viad) filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
March 11, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibit List filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
March 11, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Fact, Medical and Expert Witness List filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
March 11, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Production of Bankruptcy Claim Forms filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
March 10, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Medical Records, Billing Records Pathology Records, Pathology Reports, and letter regarding Pathology Materials filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
January 18, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ford Motor Company's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
December 18, 2015 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura M. Cabutto for Marilyn Charlevoix, and Stephen Charlevoix added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexa Newton, Esquire. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/15/2015. (lih)
December 14, 2015 Filing 58 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexa Newton, Esquire - filed by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification By Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen)
December 11, 2015 Filing 57 AMENDED Notice to Take Deposition re #55 Notice to Take Deposition by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (deBruin, David) Modified on 12/14/2015 (lih).
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Cabutto. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/11/2015. (lih)
December 10, 2015 Filing 56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Cabutto - filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(deBruin, David)
December 10, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Charlevoix on December 15, 2015 filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
December 9, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Charlevoix on 12/15/15 filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
December 7, 2015 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian)
November 23, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure of filed by Fiat Allis North America.(Murphy, Peter)
November 23, 2015 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by CBS Corporation.(Martyniak, Shawn)
November 23, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Martyniak, Shawn)
November 23, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Crane Co..(Martyniak, Shawn)
November 23, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant VIAD Corp's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by VIAD Corporation(f/k/a the Dial Corporation (sued individually and as successor in interest to Griscom-Russell Company)).(Ford, Eileen)
November 23, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Sarah A. Fruehauf as co-counsel. Reason for request: left the firm. (Della Porta, Armand)
November 23, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by Caterpillar Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
November 23, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Larson, William)
November 23, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 (a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by John Crane Inc..(Parshall, Jonathan)
November 20, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) (1) Initial Disclosures of Defendant, Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
November 20, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures of Defendant, Trane U.S. Inc. filed by Trane US Inc..(Tyler, Jessica)
November 20, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Ingersoll Rand.(Tyler, Jessica)
November 19, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #38 PROPOSED ORDER Joint Scheduling Order. Set SCHEDULING ORDER deadlines: ( Joinder of Parties due by 1/22/2016., Amended Pleadings due by 1/22/2016., Discovery due by 9/30/2016., Status Report due by 8/5/2016., A Status Conference is set for 8/15/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon, Dispositive Motions due by 8/26/2016.). Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/16/2015. (lih)
November 16, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 11/16/2015. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
November 12, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J. Singewald on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
November 10, 2015 Filing 38 PROPOSED ORDER Joint Scheduling Order re #37 Letter by Crane Co.. (Martyniak, Shawn)
November 10, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to the request of counsel, the proposed order formerly filed as D.I. 38 has been deleted and will be re-filed at a later time. (lih)
November 10, 2015 Filing 37 Letter to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Shawn E. Martyniak, Esq. regarding Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. (Martyniak, Shawn)
November 5, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Additional Authorizations filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
October 9, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Stephen Charlevoix's Objections and Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production Directed to Plaintiff Alleging Exposure by All Defendants filed by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix.(deBruin, David)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on Monday, November 16, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than November 10, 2015. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/5/2015. (lih)
September 30, 2015 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ingersoll Rand. (Tyler, Jessica)
September 30, 2015 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fiat Allis North America. (Murphy, Peter)
September 30, 2015 Filing 32 STATEMENT re #29 Order by Marilyn Charlevoix, Stephen Charlevoix. (deBruin, David) Modified on 9/30/2015 (lih).
September 28, 2015 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Trane US Inc. filed by Trane US Inc.. (Tyler, Jessica)
September 28, 2015 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES against All Defendants by Trane US Inc.. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 9/28/2015 (lih).
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER- Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order: (1) Plaintiff(s) shall submit a statement to the Court that: (a) identifies those Defendants who have not yet been served with the Complaint; (b) identifies those Defendants who have been served with the Complaint but have not yet filed an Answer; (c) provides any reason why a Rule 16 conference should not occur within 30 days of the date of its submission; and (d) notes any other pending matters which require judicial action. Set deadline: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 9/30/2015.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/16/2015. (lih)
September 10, 2015 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
September 9, 2015 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation. (Daly, Daniel)
September 8, 2015 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM Past, Present or Future against All Defendants by VIAD Corporation. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 9/8/2015 (lih).
September 8, 2015 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM Past, Present or Future against All Defendants by Caterpillar Inc.. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 9/8/2015 (lih).
September 3, 2015 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent CNH Industrial N.V. for Fiat Allis North America filed by Fiat Allis North America. (Murphy, Peter)
September 3, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Murphy on behalf of Fiat Allis North America (Murphy, Peter)
September 1, 2015 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
September 1, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
September 1, 2015 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by VIAD Corporation. (Ford, Eileen)
September 1, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of VIAD Corporation (Ford, Eileen)
August 31, 2015 Filing 18 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CBS Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
August 31, 2015 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Larson, William) Modified on 8/31/2015 (lih).
August 31, 2015 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Larson, William)
August 31, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bruce Larson, Jr on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Larson, William)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/28/2015. (nmfn)
August 27, 2015 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries, Inc. for Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
August 27, 2015 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PC for Trane US Inc. filed by Trane US Inc.. (Tyler, Jessica)
August 27, 2015 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler AG, Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler Ltd., Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler AG (Switzerland), Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler Ltd. (Bermuda), Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Foster Wheeler Holdings Ltd. (Bermuda) for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Valocchi, Beth)
August 26, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 25, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Partick Daly on behalf of FMC Corporation (Daly, Daniel)
August 25, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Trane US Inc. (Della Porta, Armand)
August 25, 2015 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate Viacom Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation filed by CBS Corporation. (Martyniak, Shawn)
August 25, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Valocchi, Beth)
August 24, 2015 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group PLC for John Crane Inc. filed by John Crane Inc.. (Parshall, Jonathan)
August 24, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Parshall on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Parshall, Jonathan)
August 24, 2015 CORRECTING ENTRY: Replaced DI# 4 main document with corrected copy (Civil Action number corrected). (rwc)
August 21, 2015 Filing 4 JOINDER - filed by VIAD Corporation - joining in #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit A-B, #3 Exhibit C - Part 1, #4 Exhibit C - Part 2, #5 Exhibit C - Part 3, #6 Exhibit C - Part 4, #7 Exhibit C - Part 5, #8 Exhibit C - Part 6, #9 Exhibit C - Part 7, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Certificate of Service)(rwc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/24/2015) (rwc).
August 21, 2015 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crane Co. (rwc)
August 21, 2015 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
August 21, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Ct, Case Number N 15C-07-091 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-1774041)- filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 3B, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 4A, #7 Exhibit 4 A-1, #8 Exhibit 4 B-C, #9 Exhibit 4 D-F, #10 Exhibit 4 G, #11 Exhibit 4 H-I, #12 Exhibit 4 J-K, #13 Exhibit 4 L-M, #14 Exhibit 4 N, #15 Exhibit 4 O, #16 Exhibit 4 P-Q, #17 Exhibit 4 R-S, #18 Exhibit 4 T, #19 Exhibit 4 U, #20 Exhibit 5, #21 Exhibit 5 A, #22 Exhibit 5 A-5, #23 Exhibit 5 A-7, #24 Exhibit 5 A - 16, #25 Exhibit 5 A -19, #26 Exhibit 5 A - 24, #27 Exhibit 5 A - 26, #28 Exhibit 5 A - 27)(rwc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2015: #29 Certificate of Service, #30 Civil Cover Sheet) (rwc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charlevoix et al v. Caterpillar Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD Corporation
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Fruehauf
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer D. Donnelly
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Shawn Edward Martyniak
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiat Allis North America
Represented By: Peter S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Whitney L. Frame
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Shawn Edward Martyniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Represented By: Brian Tome
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Anne Fruehauf
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer D. Donnelly
Represented By: Ana Marina McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Charlevoix
Represented By: Laura M. Cabutto
Represented By: Bridget B. Truxillo
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Represented By: Ian P. Cloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Charlevoix
Represented By: Laura M. Cabutto
Represented By: David W. deBruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?