Integra LifeSciences Corp. et al v. HyperBranch Medical Technology, Inc
Plaintiff: Integra LifeSciences Corp., Integra LifeSciences Sales LLC, Confluent Surgical, Inc. and Incept LLC
Defendant: HyperBranch Medical Technology, Inc
Case Number: 1:2015cv00819
Filed: September 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Christopher J. Burke
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 736 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 704 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is REJECTED to the extent described herein and 399 MOTION for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/24/18. (ntl)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 723 MEMORANDUM ORDER re the Court's rulings on the parties' motions in limine and other pretrial disputes; the Pretrial Conference on May 15 will begin at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/11/18. (ntl)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 691 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 555 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED -- 399 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 393 MOTION for Summary Judgment are DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/10/18. (ntl)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 680 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 512 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED and 393 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HyperBranch Medical Technology, Inc. is DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/6/18. (ntl)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 554 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 384 Memorandum Order is ADOPTED; the portion of Defendant's motion to strike (D.I. 345 ) related to price erosion is DENIED, and the portion related to market share apportionment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/13/18. (ntl)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 483 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding preambles of asserted claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,535,705 and 7,009,034. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (n o longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/30/2018. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/16/2018. (mlc)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding claim construction. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 9/18/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/30/2017. (mlc)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding claim construction. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 9/5/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/18/2017. (mlc)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 310 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding claim construction. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 8/21/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/4/2017. (mlc)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING D.I. 226 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, 224 Letter, filed by Incept LLC, Confluent Surgical, Inc., Integra LifeSciences Sales LLC, Integra LifeSciences Corp. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/16/2017. (mlc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integra LifeSciences Corp. et al v. HyperBranch Medical Technology, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integra LifeSciences Corp.
Represented By: Robert F. Altherr, Jr.
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: John Iwanicki
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Represented By: Christopher Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integra LifeSciences Sales LLC
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confluent Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Incept LLC
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HyperBranch Medical Technology, Inc
Represented By: Jonathan G. Graves
Represented By: Thomas C. Grimm
Represented By: Kevin A. Lake
Represented By: Adam Pivovar
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?