Amgen Inc. et al v. Hospira, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amgen Inc. and Amgen Manufacturing, Limited
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00839
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 386 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/27/2018. (nms)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. 196 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gregory K. Bell (D.I. 204 ) is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Randal Heeb, Ph.D. (D.I. 202 ) is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/7/2017. (nms)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying MOTION for Reconsideration of Its Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (D.I. 217 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/23/2017. (nms)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple disputed terms in U.S. Patent No. 5,856,298. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2017. (nms)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple terms in U.S. Patent No. 5,856,298. If there are no remaining disputes, the parties are to submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion within fourteen days. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/30/2016. (nms)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Count I of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2016. (ksr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amgen Inc. et al v. Hospira, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amgen Inc.
Represented By: Amanda K. Antons
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Kevin M. Flowers
Represented By: John R. Labbe
Represented By: Matthew C. Nielsen
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amgen Manufacturing, Limited
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Kevin M. Flowers
Represented By: John R. Labbe
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?