Boston Scientific Corporation et al v. Cook Group Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific Corporation and Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc.
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated and Cook Medical LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00980
Filed: October 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christopher J. Burke
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 OPINION re pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/11/17. (ntl)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding the matter of Claim Construction. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 5/1/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/12/2017. (dlk)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding protective order disputes, (D.I. 94 Joint MOTION for Discovery In-Person Conference (re January 17, 2017 Oral Order) filed by Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC ). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/10/2017. (mlc)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: Claim Construction. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/9/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/22/2016. (dlk)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding D.I. 30 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Protective Order Dispute filed by Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/18/2016. (mlc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston Scientific Corporation et al v. Cook Group Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc.
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?