Indivior Inc. et al v. Mylan Technologies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Indivior Inc., Indivior UK Limited and MonoSol Rx LLC
Defendant: Mylan Technologies Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Mylan N.V.
Case Number: 1:2015cv01016
Filed: November 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2020. (nms)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Plaintiffs have not proven by a preponderance of the evidence that Alvogen infringes the asserted claims of the '497 and '514 patents. Plaintiffs should submit an agreed up form of final judgment with two weeks. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/22/2018. (nms)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 175 MOTION to Strike New Infringement Theory Offered By Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Robert Prud'Homme In His Reply Report. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/22/2017. (nms)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying request to renew motion to dismiss (D.I. 154 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/28/2017. (nms)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple terms in dispute in U.S. Patent Nos. 8,603,514, 8,475,832, 8,017,150, and 8,900,497. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2017. (nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indivior Inc. et al v. Mylan Technologies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Mary W. Bourke
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indivior UK Limited
Represented By: Mary W. Bourke
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MonoSol Rx LLC
Represented By: Mary W. Bourke
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies Inc.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?