Acosta et al v. Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Ronald Layne Smith, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Reginald J. Belton, Christopher R. Simmons, Terry D. Evans, Andrew Michael Booth, Jacob Whetstone, Angela Vanette Barnes, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr., Johnnie F. Bines, Thomas W. Burns, Erik J. Burch, Mitchell P. Gill, Jody Lee Piercy, Edwin Steele, Michael A. Grochowski, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., John David Fielder, Brian Keith Lloyd, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Chad Robert Read, Terry Salazar, James Robin, Rigo A. Gonzalez, David A. Montgomery, Cory Orlando McGill, Anthony Brett Ogden, Rodney W. Meece, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Michael L. Caldwell, Jason D. Farquharson, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Michael J. Kidder, Michael A. LeBlanc, Edward Leo Ferguson, Charles Raymond Riippi, Kevin L. Woodrum, Everette D. Avery, Jr., Brian David Murphy, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Ernest Richard Roth, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr., Edwin Keith, Sr., Jeffrey S. Church, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Lee Lowe, Timothy Steven Parke, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Wade Jacobson, Michael S. Eddy, Lewis Palmer, Michael L. Songy, Jeffrey A. Meo, Amanda J. Engen, Raphael A. Zamora, Ozane Jackson, Ryan Martin DeLong, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Rowena L. Darvin, Travis M. Bassett, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr., Karl Malinski Gibbs, Brad L. Fruhling, Timothy Donald Fendley, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr., Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr., Andrew E. Coussens, Earnest J. Ellison, Theodore J. Bill, Eric B. McLendon, Howard Leon Slade, Scott H. Stradley, Frederick D. McCollum, Wanda N. Jackson, Jason R. Bills, Brian Earl Easley, William G. Cardwell, Jason Paul Hatfield, Napolean L. Stafford, Franklin O. Snow, David Brian DeLuca, Ryan V. Collamore, Shawn E. Strout, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Philip Lam, Carter Charles Ruff, Tracy L. Asher, Sean M. Ladd, Azariah Smith, Jr., Brandon Christopher Johnston, Robert Wagenaar, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Richard J. Nicholls, Nathan P. Turnock, Bonnie Dunlop, William Magee, Patrick C. Mondragon, John Ernest Carlson, Stephen Randall Keith, James Pollock, Nathan T. Meidl, Richard Alan Hardison, Jesse N. Davidson, John R. Fudala, James R. Bates, Erik D. Upham, Thomas S. Edwards, Charles J. Barnes, Reginald Fleming, Jr., Damian L Smith, Brandy E. Broadbent, David F. Bryden, Aundrea M. Hunt, Shameran Youkhana, Jose C. Roque, Daniel Martin Jasoni, John Albert McDonald, Laura J. Nowlin, Christopher T. Thornhill, Kole Welsh, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Steven C. Zimmerman, James E. Kirk, Wayne Rodriguez, Tom Lee Gallagher, Jesse Baker, Juan Lugo, Michael E. Zundle, Anterian D. Johnson, Cliburn Lane, Jr., Connie G. Conley, Neal Mark Sutherland, Julian K. Jones, Dale Ford, Anthony K. Steward, Kenley Feazell, Brian K. Bower, Joseph Edward Devall, William O. Roark III, Michael W. Carr, Leonard Goodson, III, Travis Adams, Alan Austin Mays, Jason William Smith, Steven Wayne Holley, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Frank Earl Braxton, Brenda M. O'Neal, Richard Michael Clemes, Sami Juma, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr., Calvin Priest, Jason L. Carmen, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, David W. Kirkland, Daniel R. Reyes, Robert Christopher Elesky, Larry Haynes, Tommy L. Fullen, Clyde Richard Holder, Edward B. Weibl, Michael Ray Fields, Francisco Araque, Theta A. Olson, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Michael A. Griley, Jr., Tommy R. Reddick, Omowunmi Martins, Justin M. Faircloth, Michael Christopher Stanco, David P. Staffa, Charles J. Lowery, Craig J. Daniel, Michael P. Gibson, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael Lee Maynard, Ronald Lee Frisby, Thomas K. Oleson, Daniel R. Kearney, Roland David Schulz, Milton M. Reynolds, Michael L. Madigan, Brandi L. Benson, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Thomas K. Jones, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Daniel Maestas, Tai Porter, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Simon Allen Wade, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Daniel Lee Davis, Mary A. Mickens, Gregory D. Parker, Mikel Harper, David Allen Jones, II, James Cuthbert Midgett, Scott Allan Christie, Varita V. Quincy, Gregory J. Pietz, Carl Orlando, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Donald P. Worrell, Craig Belanger, Hanna P. Nissan, Jason B. Martin, Michele A. Pearce, Hobart P. Saunders, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr., Ryan L. Attar, Clifford Yarbrough, Patti J. Anderson, Steven S. Richardson, Jon Harding Mason, Christine Osorio, Larry Baker, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Tee Jay Burr, William Emmett White, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr., Michael A. Cranfill, Malone W. Davis, Samuel Nieves, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric Jaeger, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr., Anthony Trinidad, Gordon Allen Ward, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Arthur Whiteside, Tracy Lemar Smith, James Eric Kelley, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Paul A. Richmond, Marek M. Sipko, Thomas Andersen, Cassandra D. Eusery, Gregory C. Skyles, Suzanne M. Speight, Willie J. Mitchell, Robert William Paxton, George Keys, Jr., Robert L. Williams, Trevor G. Ennis, Anthony L. Arrington, Timothy M. Murray, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Matthew K. Ashworth, William James Heard, Belinda M. Williams, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Milan B. Thakkar, Audrey S. Perry, Ervin L. Walker, Michael Farmer, Kristin Southwell, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Rachael Brown, Jonathan Medina, Christina L. Lee, Rahman A. McKinnon, Fayiz Nalu, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr., Richard P. Hamilton, Alan K. Bridgewater, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Tanya Quincy, James Preston Potter, Jr., Andre Demon Glenn, Bryan L. Stevens, Bruce L. Reges, Michael S. Delborrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Debora J. Pfaff, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Dennis A. Blanchard, Karen M. Gharst, Julio A. Apodaca, Jamar Ham, Kori L. Willis, Michael Leonard Farley, Christopher S. Henrikson, John Alan Bacon, Eric Bradley Gann, Jeremen Sandoval, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Ricky L. Turner, Julio Pipino Walton, Derrick D. Clark, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Shawn K. McLeod, Clarence William Wickham, John G. Duerr, David John Smith, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Allison Mariko Hill, Kenon L. Burns, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Robin Kruskol, Tony L. Wright, Sr., David B. Swaney, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Timothy J. Watson, William Myron Henderson, Kathleen S. Coy, Michael D. Kusek, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Brittany J. Davis, Victor M. Rivera, James Robert Sandefur, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr., Alexander Menkes, Lauren Carol Price, Blain L. Chambers, Paul G. Jones, Michael Charles Lee, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Paul Anthony Jones, Bryan Hamilton, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr., Daniel E. Valentine, James Austin Fisher, Justin Acosta, David M. Swan, Rene L. Wilson, Bruce G. Laureiro, Craig D. Fillingane, Amanda G. Miller, David F. Happle, Tony Williams, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr., Bradley Doyle, Scott D. Bailey, Leon J. Alexander, George L. Watson III, Perry A. Cross, Jr., James Edward Miller, Ronald Perry Sharp, Daniel M. Robshaw, Shawn R. Devaney, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr., Robert A. Dreyfus, Robert Lippolis, Michelle A. Johnson, Stepheny Gupton, Daniel B. Schultz, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Murrill L. McLean, Leonard Ray Cheek, Richard D. Rice, Michael W. Hafke, Leonard Ritums, Micky Doto, Phillip A. Anderson, Michael Daniel Banks, Robert P. Busse, Teddric O'Neal Walker, Blaine S. Child, Dennis H. Budd, Troy Thomas, Jarrod C. Hall, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Mark A. Hill, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, Paul R. Vadney, John L. Henderson, Dennis E. McMullen, David B. Whaling, Richard D. Celia, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Jennifer L. Downes, Bryan Keith Keese, James Corey Ellis, Clint Allen Blankenship, Julie Baron-Mannix, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr., Michael A. Northup, Robin A. Carr, James Hershel Hudson, III, Ronnal Womack, Carrie C. Gallagher, Edwin Todd Turpin, Andrea M. Caston, Keith R. Menzer and Bruce R. Chaplin
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, KBR, Inc., Halliburton Company, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc. and KBR Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv01024
Filed: November 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Gregory M Sleet
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2016 CASE CLOSED (asw)
December 18, 2015 Remark : Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in District of Maryland as case 8:15-cv-03836, filed 12/15/2015. (rwc)
December 15, 2015 Case transferred electronically to the District of Maryland. CASE CLOSED (mdb)
December 15, 2015 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - (CTO-18). Case transferred to the District Court of Maryland re MDL No. 2083. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffrey N. Luthi on 12/15/2015. (mdb)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #8 Stipulation and Proposed Order Staying Case. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/15/2015. (mdb)
December 10, 2015 Filing 8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying Case by Halliburton Company, KBR Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 12/15/2015 (mdb).
November 19, 2015 Filing 7 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Pollock, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, William Myron Henderson, Brandy E. Broadbent, William Magee, Michael S. Eddy, Robin A. Carr, James Robert Sandefur, Lauren Carol Price, Thomas W. Burns, Gordon Allen Ward, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr, Justin M. Faircloth, Juan Lugo, Cory Orlando McGill, Rigo A. Gonzalez, Bradley Doyle, Hanna P. Nissan, Jon Harding Mason, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr, Ervin L. Walker, Ronald Perry Sharp, Patti J. Anderson, Thomas S. Edwards, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Julio Pipino Walton, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Daniel Martin Jasoni, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Jason L. Carmen, Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr, Earnest J. Ellison, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Neal Mark Sutherland, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Anthony Brett Ogden, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Jason William Smith, Howard Leon Slade, Philip Lam, Clint Allen Blankenship, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Tanya Quincy, Michael Ray Fields, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr, James Cuthbert Midgett, James Eric Kelley, Bruce L. Reges, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Bryan L. Stevens, Kristin Southwell, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr, Larry Haynes, Jimmy Dwayne Williams, Shawn K. McLeod, Jason D. Farquharson, Nathan P. Turnock, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Rahman A. McKinnon, Tommy L. Fullen, Bonnie Dunlop, Rowena L. Darvin, Joseph Edward Devall, Tony L. Wright, Sr., Michael S. Delborrell, Anthony L. Arrington, Aundrea M. Hunt, Scott Allan Christie, Kevin L. Woodrum, Tee Jay Burr, Richard D. Celia, Stephen Randall Keith, Michael Leonard Farley, Steven S. Richardson, Connie G. Conley, Clarence William Wickham, Dennis H. Budd, Debora J. Pfaff, Nathan T. Meidl, Ricky L. Turner, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr, Calvin Priest, Jody Lee Piercy, Julian K. Jones, Simon Allen Wade, Erik J. Burch, David M. Swan, Richard Alan Hardison, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Jeffrey A. Meo, Leon J. Alexander, George Keys, Jr, Stepheny Gupton, Shawn E. Strout, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Wanda N. Jackson, Daniel R. Reyes, Laura J. Nowlin, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Ryan Martin DeLong, Charles Raymond Riippi, Reginald Fleming, Jr, Michael A. Cranfill, Clifford Yarbrough, Michael Lee Lowe, Dennis A. Blanchard, John David Fielder, Ronald Lee Frisby, Steven C. Zimmerman, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Arthur Whiteside, Kole Welsh, Trevor G. Ennis, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Victor M. Rivera, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Charles Lee, Bruce G. Laureiro, Ryan V. Collamore, Jose C. Roque, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Michelle A. Johnson, Bryan Hamilton, Carl Orlando, Murrill L. McLean, Alexander Menkes, Daniel Lee Davis, James Corey Ellis, Timothy Steven Parke, James Preston Potter, Jr., Reginald J. Belton, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr, Napolean L. Stafford, Julie Baron-Mannix, William Emmett White, David B. Swaney, Raphael A. Zamora, Donald P. Worrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Fayiz Nalu, Michael D. Kusek, Leonard Goodson, III, Varita V. Quincy, Rene L. Wilson, Kenley Feazell, Brian David Murphy, Ronnal Womack, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Theodore J. Bill, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Marek M. Sipko, George L. Watson III, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Justin Acosta, Michael W. Carr, Blaine S. Child, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr, Kenon L. Burns, Carter Charles Ruff, Gregory C. Skyles, Edward B. Weibl, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr, Andrea M. Caston, Daniel R. Kearney, Chad Robert Read, Karl Malinski Gibbs, Scott H. Stradley, Thomas K. Jones, Edward Leo Ferguson, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr, Hobart P. Saunders, Clyde Richard Holder, David F. Happle, Francisco Araque, Larry Baker, Kathleen S. Coy, Damian L Smith, Michael Daniel Banks, David W. Kirkland, Michael Farmer, Troy Thomas, Daniel B. Schultz, John Alan Bacon, Willie J. Mitchell, David F. Bryden, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael L. Madigan, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Brandon Christopher Johnston, Jamar Ham, Daniel M. Robshaw, Cliburn Lane, Jr, Leonard Ray Cheek, James Edward Miller, Christine Osorio, Sean M. Ladd, Jason B. Martin, John G. Duerr, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Micky Doto, Jason Paul Hatfield, Jacob Whetstone, Daniel E. Valentine, David B. Whaling, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Cassandra D. Eusery, James Austin Fisher, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Thomas K. Oleson, Derrick D. Clark, Gregory J. Pietz, Robert Wagenaar, Anthony Trinidad, Ozane Jackson, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Andrew Michael Booth, Daniel Maestas, Jonathan Medina, Anterian D. Johnson, James E. Kirk, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Tony Williams, Edwin Steele, Robert P. Busse, John L. Henderson, Samuel Nieves, Michael A. Griley, Jr, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr, James Robin, Craig Belanger, Teddric O'Neal Walker, David P. Staffa, Frederick D. McCollum, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Frank Earl Braxton, James Hershel Hudson, III, Brad L. Fruhling, Tracy Lemar Smith, Paul G. Jones, Michael A. Northup, Brian Earl Easley, Wade Jacobson, Julio A. Apodaca, Charles J. Lowery, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Brian Keith Lloyd, Shawn R. Devaney, Edwin Todd Turpin, William G. Cardwell, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr, Azariah Smith, Jr., Robert L. Williams, Erik D. Upham, Amanda J. Engen, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., Theta A. Olson, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, John Ernest Carlson, Suzanne M. Speight, Paul A. Richmond, Robert William Paxton, Brittany J. Davis, Milton M. Reynolds, David John Smith, Belinda M. Williams, Steven Wayne Holley, Michael A. Grochowski, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Robert Christopher Elesky, Mary A. Mickens, Blain L. Chambers, Timothy Donald Fendley, Tom Lee Gallagher, Christopher R. Simmons, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Paul Anthony Jones, Karen M. Gharst, Tai Porter, Mark A. Hill, Malone W. Davis, Keith R. Menzer, Mitchell P. Gill, Jesse N. Davidson, Michael L. Songy, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Michael Lee Maynard, Leonard Ritums, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Brian K. Bower, Tracy L. Asher, Alan Austin Mays, Johnnie F. Bines, Christopher T. Thornhill, Bryan Keith Keese, Michael P. Gibson, Jarrod C. Hall, Brenda M. O'Neal, David Brian DeLuca, Anthony K. Steward, Michael L. Caldwell, William O. Roark III, Christopher S. Henrikson, Rachael Brown, Terry D. Evans, Rodney W. Meece, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr, Roland David Schulz, Michael W. Hafke, Angela Vanette Barnes, Timothy M. Murray, Michael Christopher Stanco, Milan B. Thakkar, Wayne Rodriguez, Michael A. LeBlanc, Eric Jaeger, Richard J. Nicholls, Richard D. Rice, Charles J. Barnes, Paul R. Vadney, Michele A. Pearce, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Kori L. Willis, James R. Bates, Michael J. Kidder, Patrick C. Mondragon, Brandi L. Benson, Omowunmi Martins, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, Franklin O. Snow, Travis M. Bassett, William James Heard, David Allen Jones, II, Audrey S. Perry, Jason R. Bills, Eric B. McLendon, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Craig J. Daniel, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Alan K. Bridgewater, Sami Juma, Ryan L. Attar, Ronald Layne Smith, Michael E. Zundle, Bruce R. Chaplin, Robin Kruskol, Eric Bradley Gann, Matthew K. Ashworth, Andrew E. Coussens, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Jesse Baker, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Terry Salazar, Jennifer L. Downes, Carrie C. Gallagher, Ernest Richard Roth, Christina L. Lee, David A. Montgomery, Allison Mariko Hill, Richard Michael Clemes, Mikel Harper, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr, Edwin Keith, Sr, Dale Ford, Jeremen Sandoval, Gregory D. Parker, Richard P. Hamilton, Amanda G. Miller, John Albert McDonald, Tommy R. Reddick, Phillip A. Anderson, Andre Demon Glenn, Dennis E. McMullen, Shameran Youkhana, Travis Adams, John R. Fudala, Jeffrey S. Church, Thomas Andersen, Robert Lippolis, Scott D. Bailey, Everette D. Avery, Jr, Timothy J. Watson, Perry A. Cross, Jr, Lewis Palmer, Robert A. Dreyfus, Craig D. Fillingane. Halliburton Company served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/10/2015. (Keener, Carmella)
November 19, 2015 Filing 6 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Pollock, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, William Myron Henderson, Brandy E. Broadbent, William Magee, Michael S. Eddy, Robin A. Carr, James Robert Sandefur, Lauren Carol Price, Thomas W. Burns, Gordon Allen Ward, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr, Justin M. Faircloth, Juan Lugo, Cory Orlando McGill, Rigo A. Gonzalez, Bradley Doyle, Hanna P. Nissan, Jon Harding Mason, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr, Ervin L. Walker, Ronald Perry Sharp, Patti J. Anderson, Thomas S. Edwards, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Julio Pipino Walton, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Daniel Martin Jasoni, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Jason L. Carmen, Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr, Earnest J. Ellison, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Neal Mark Sutherland, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Anthony Brett Ogden, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Jason William Smith, Howard Leon Slade, Philip Lam, Clint Allen Blankenship, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Tanya Quincy, Michael Ray Fields, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr, James Cuthbert Midgett, James Eric Kelley, Bruce L. Reges, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Bryan L. Stevens, Kristin Southwell, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr, Larry Haynes, Jimmy Dwayne Williams, Shawn K. McLeod, Jason D. Farquharson, Nathan P. Turnock, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Rahman A. McKinnon, Tommy L. Fullen, Bonnie Dunlop, Rowena L. Darvin, Joseph Edward Devall, Tony L. Wright, Sr., Michael S. Delborrell, Anthony L. Arrington, Aundrea M. Hunt, Scott Allan Christie, Kevin L. Woodrum, Tee Jay Burr, Richard D. Celia, Stephen Randall Keith, Michael Leonard Farley, Steven S. Richardson, Connie G. Conley, Clarence William Wickham, Dennis H. Budd, Debora J. Pfaff, Nathan T. Meidl, Ricky L. Turner, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr, Calvin Priest, Jody Lee Piercy, Julian K. Jones, Simon Allen Wade, Erik J. Burch, David M. Swan, Richard Alan Hardison, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Jeffrey A. Meo, Leon J. Alexander, George Keys, Jr, Stepheny Gupton, Shawn E. Strout, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Wanda N. Jackson, Daniel R. Reyes, Laura J. Nowlin, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Ryan Martin DeLong, Charles Raymond Riippi, Reginald Fleming, Jr, Michael A. Cranfill, Clifford Yarbrough, Michael Lee Lowe, Dennis A. Blanchard, John David Fielder, Ronald Lee Frisby, Steven C. Zimmerman, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Arthur Whiteside, Kole Welsh, Trevor G. Ennis, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Victor M. Rivera, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Charles Lee, Bruce G. Laureiro, Ryan V. Collamore, Jose C. Roque, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Michelle A. Johnson, Bryan Hamilton, Carl Orlando, Murrill L. McLean, Alexander Menkes, Daniel Lee Davis, James Corey Ellis, Timothy Steven Parke, James Preston Potter, Jr., Reginald J. Belton, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr, Napolean L. Stafford, Julie Baron-Mannix, William Emmett White, David B. Swaney, Raphael A. Zamora, Donald P. Worrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Fayiz Nalu, Michael D. Kusek, Leonard Goodson, III, Varita V. Quincy, Rene L. Wilson, Kenley Feazell, Brian David Murphy, Ronnal Womack, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Theodore J. Bill, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Marek M. Sipko, George L. Watson III, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Justin Acosta, Michael W. Carr, Blaine S. Child, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr, Kenon L. Burns, Carter Charles Ruff, Gregory C. Skyles, Edward B. Weibl, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr, Andrea M. Caston, Daniel R. Kearney, Chad Robert Read, Karl Malinski Gibbs, Scott H. Stradley, Thomas K. Jones, Edward Leo Ferguson, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr, Hobart P. Saunders, Clyde Richard Holder, David F. Happle, Francisco Araque, Larry Baker, Kathleen S. Coy, Damian L Smith, Michael Daniel Banks, David W. Kirkland, Michael Farmer, Troy Thomas, Daniel B. Schultz, John Alan Bacon, Willie J. Mitchell, David F. Bryden, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael L. Madigan, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Brandon Christopher Johnston, Jamar Ham, Daniel M. Robshaw, Cliburn Lane, Jr, Leonard Ray Cheek, James Edward Miller, Christine Osorio, Sean M. Ladd, Jason B. Martin, John G. Duerr, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Micky Doto, Jason Paul Hatfield, Jacob Whetstone, Daniel E. Valentine, David B. Whaling, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Cassandra D. Eusery, James Austin Fisher, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Thomas K. Oleson, Derrick D. Clark, Gregory J. Pietz, Robert Wagenaar, Anthony Trinidad, Ozane Jackson, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Andrew Michael Booth, Daniel Maestas, Jonathan Medina, Anterian D. Johnson, James E. Kirk, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Tony Williams, Edwin Steele, Robert P. Busse, John L. Henderson, Samuel Nieves, Michael A. Griley, Jr, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr, James Robin, Craig Belanger, Teddric O'Neal Walker, David P. Staffa, Frederick D. McCollum, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Frank Earl Braxton, James Hershel Hudson, III, Brad L. Fruhling, Tracy Lemar Smith, Paul G. Jones, Michael A. Northup, Brian Earl Easley, Wade Jacobson, Julio A. Apodaca, Charles J. Lowery, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Brian Keith Lloyd, Shawn R. Devaney, Edwin Todd Turpin, William G. Cardwell, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr, Azariah Smith, Jr., Robert L. Williams, Erik D. Upham, Amanda J. Engen, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., Theta A. Olson, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, John Ernest Carlson, Suzanne M. Speight, Paul A. Richmond, Robert William Paxton, Brittany J. Davis, Milton M. Reynolds, David John Smith, Belinda M. Williams, Steven Wayne Holley, Michael A. Grochowski, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Robert Christopher Elesky, Mary A. Mickens, Blain L. Chambers, Timothy Donald Fendley, Tom Lee Gallagher, Christopher R. Simmons, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Paul Anthony Jones, Karen M. Gharst, Tai Porter, Mark A. Hill, Malone W. Davis, Keith R. Menzer, Mitchell P. Gill, Jesse N. Davidson, Michael L. Songy, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Michael Lee Maynard, Leonard Ritums, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Brian K. Bower, Tracy L. Asher, Alan Austin Mays, Johnnie F. Bines, Christopher T. Thornhill, Bryan Keith Keese, Michael P. Gibson, Jarrod C. Hall, Brenda M. O'Neal, David Brian DeLuca, Anthony K. Steward, Michael L. Caldwell, William O. Roark III, Christopher S. Henrikson, Rachael Brown, Terry D. Evans, Rodney W. Meece, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr, Roland David Schulz, Michael W. Hafke, Angela Vanette Barnes, Timothy M. Murray, Michael Christopher Stanco, Milan B. Thakkar, Wayne Rodriguez, Michael A. LeBlanc, Eric Jaeger, Richard J. Nicholls, Richard D. Rice, Charles J. Barnes, Paul R. Vadney, Michele A. Pearce, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Kori L. Willis, James R. Bates, Michael J. Kidder, Patrick C. Mondragon, Brandi L. Benson, Omowunmi Martins, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, Franklin O. Snow, Travis M. Bassett, William James Heard, David Allen Jones, II, Audrey S. Perry, Jason R. Bills, Eric B. McLendon, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Craig J. Daniel, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Alan K. Bridgewater, Sami Juma, Ryan L. Attar, Ronald Layne Smith, Michael E. Zundle, Bruce R. Chaplin, Robin Kruskol, Eric Bradley Gann, Matthew K. Ashworth, Andrew E. Coussens, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Jesse Baker, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Terry Salazar, Jennifer L. Downes, Carrie C. Gallagher, Ernest Richard Roth, Christina L. Lee, David A. Montgomery, Allison Mariko Hill, Richard Michael Clemes, Mikel Harper, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr, Edwin Keith, Sr, Dale Ford, Jeremen Sandoval, Gregory D. Parker, Richard P. Hamilton, Amanda G. Miller, John Albert McDonald, Tommy R. Reddick, Phillip A. Anderson, Andre Demon Glenn, Dennis E. McMullen, Shameran Youkhana, Travis Adams, John R. Fudala, Jeffrey S. Church, Thomas Andersen, Robert Lippolis, Scott D. Bailey, Everette D. Avery, Jr, Timothy J. Watson, Perry A. Cross, Jr, Lewis Palmer, Robert A. Dreyfus, Craig D. Fillingane. Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc. served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/10/2015. (Keener, Carmella)
November 19, 2015 Filing 5 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Pollock, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, William Myron Henderson, Brandy E. Broadbent, William Magee, Michael S. Eddy, Robin A. Carr, James Robert Sandefur, Lauren Carol Price, Thomas W. Burns, Gordon Allen Ward, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr, Justin M. Faircloth, Juan Lugo, Cory Orlando McGill, Rigo A. Gonzalez, Bradley Doyle, Hanna P. Nissan, Jon Harding Mason, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr, Ervin L. Walker, Ronald Perry Sharp, Patti J. Anderson, Thomas S. Edwards, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Julio Pipino Walton, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Daniel Martin Jasoni, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Jason L. Carmen, Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr, Earnest J. Ellison, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Neal Mark Sutherland, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Anthony Brett Ogden, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Jason William Smith, Howard Leon Slade, Philip Lam, Clint Allen Blankenship, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Tanya Quincy, Michael Ray Fields, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr, James Cuthbert Midgett, James Eric Kelley, Bruce L. Reges, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Bryan L. Stevens, Kristin Southwell, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr, Larry Haynes, Jimmy Dwayne Williams, Shawn K. McLeod, Jason D. Farquharson, Nathan P. Turnock, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Rahman A. McKinnon, Tommy L. Fullen, Bonnie Dunlop, Rowena L. Darvin, Joseph Edward Devall, Tony L. Wright, Sr., Michael S. Delborrell, Anthony L. Arrington, Aundrea M. Hunt, Scott Allan Christie, Kevin L. Woodrum, Tee Jay Burr, Richard D. Celia, Stephen Randall Keith, Michael Leonard Farley, Steven S. Richardson, Connie G. Conley, Clarence William Wickham, Dennis H. Budd, Debora J. Pfaff, Nathan T. Meidl, Ricky L. Turner, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr, Calvin Priest, Jody Lee Piercy, Julian K. Jones, Simon Allen Wade, Erik J. Burch, David M. Swan, Richard Alan Hardison, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Jeffrey A. Meo, Leon J. Alexander, George Keys, Jr, Stepheny Gupton, Shawn E. Strout, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Wanda N. Jackson, Daniel R. Reyes, Laura J. Nowlin, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Ryan Martin DeLong, Charles Raymond Riippi, Reginald Fleming, Jr, Michael A. Cranfill, Clifford Yarbrough, Michael Lee Lowe, Dennis A. Blanchard, John David Fielder, Ronald Lee Frisby, Steven C. Zimmerman, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Arthur Whiteside, Kole Welsh, Trevor G. Ennis, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Victor M. Rivera, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Charles Lee, Bruce G. Laureiro, Ryan V. Collamore, Jose C. Roque, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Michelle A. Johnson, Bryan Hamilton, Carl Orlando, Murrill L. McLean, Alexander Menkes, Daniel Lee Davis, James Corey Ellis, Timothy Steven Parke, James Preston Potter, Jr., Reginald J. Belton, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr, Napolean L. Stafford, Julie Baron-Mannix, William Emmett White, David B. Swaney, Raphael A. Zamora, Donald P. Worrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Fayiz Nalu, Michael D. Kusek, Leonard Goodson, III, Varita V. Quincy, Rene L. Wilson, Kenley Feazell, Brian David Murphy, Ronnal Womack, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Theodore J. Bill, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Marek M. Sipko, George L. Watson III, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Justin Acosta, Michael W. Carr, Blaine S. Child, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr, Kenon L. Burns, Carter Charles Ruff, Gregory C. Skyles, Edward B. Weibl, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr, Andrea M. Caston, Daniel R. Kearney, Chad Robert Read, Karl Malinski Gibbs, Scott H. Stradley, Thomas K. Jones, Edward Leo Ferguson, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr, Hobart P. Saunders, Clyde Richard Holder, David F. Happle, Francisco Araque, Larry Baker, Kathleen S. Coy, Damian L Smith, Michael Daniel Banks, David W. Kirkland, Michael Farmer, Troy Thomas, Daniel B. Schultz, John Alan Bacon, Willie J. Mitchell, David F. Bryden, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael L. Madigan, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Brandon Christopher Johnston, Jamar Ham, Daniel M. Robshaw, Cliburn Lane, Jr, Leonard Ray Cheek, James Edward Miller, Christine Osorio, Sean M. Ladd, Jason B. Martin, John G. Duerr, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Micky Doto, Jason Paul Hatfield, Jacob Whetstone, Daniel E. Valentine, David B. Whaling, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Cassandra D. Eusery, James Austin Fisher, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Thomas K. Oleson, Derrick D. Clark, Gregory J. Pietz, Robert Wagenaar, Anthony Trinidad, Ozane Jackson, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Andrew Michael Booth, Daniel Maestas, Jonathan Medina, Anterian D. Johnson, James E. Kirk, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Tony Williams, Edwin Steele, Robert P. Busse, John L. Henderson, Samuel Nieves, Michael A. Griley, Jr, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr, James Robin, Craig Belanger, Teddric O'Neal Walker, David P. Staffa, Frederick D. McCollum, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Frank Earl Braxton, James Hershel Hudson, III, Brad L. Fruhling, Tracy Lemar Smith, Paul G. Jones, Michael A. Northup, Brian Earl Easley, Wade Jacobson, Julio A. Apodaca, Charles J. Lowery, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Brian Keith Lloyd, Shawn R. Devaney, Edwin Todd Turpin, William G. Cardwell, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr, Azariah Smith, Jr., Robert L. Williams, Erik D. Upham, Amanda J. Engen, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., Theta A. Olson, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, John Ernest Carlson, Suzanne M. Speight, Paul A. Richmond, Robert William Paxton, Brittany J. Davis, Milton M. Reynolds, David John Smith, Belinda M. Williams, Steven Wayne Holley, Michael A. Grochowski, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Robert Christopher Elesky, Mary A. Mickens, Blain L. Chambers, Timothy Donald Fendley, Tom Lee Gallagher, Christopher R. Simmons, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Paul Anthony Jones, Karen M. Gharst, Tai Porter, Mark A. Hill, Malone W. Davis, Keith R. Menzer, Mitchell P. Gill, Jesse N. Davidson, Michael L. Songy, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Michael Lee Maynard, Leonard Ritums, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Brian K. Bower, Tracy L. Asher, Alan Austin Mays, Johnnie F. Bines, Christopher T. Thornhill, Bryan Keith Keese, Michael P. Gibson, Jarrod C. Hall, Brenda M. O'Neal, David Brian DeLuca, Anthony K. Steward, Michael L. Caldwell, William O. Roark III, Christopher S. Henrikson, Rachael Brown, Terry D. Evans, Rodney W. Meece, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr, Roland David Schulz, Michael W. Hafke, Angela Vanette Barnes, Timothy M. Murray, Michael Christopher Stanco, Milan B. Thakkar, Wayne Rodriguez, Michael A. LeBlanc, Eric Jaeger, Richard J. Nicholls, Richard D. Rice, Charles J. Barnes, Paul R. Vadney, Michele A. Pearce, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Kori L. Willis, James R. Bates, Michael J. Kidder, Patrick C. Mondragon, Brandi L. Benson, Omowunmi Martins, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, Franklin O. Snow, Travis M. Bassett, William James Heard, David Allen Jones, II, Audrey S. Perry, Jason R. Bills, Eric B. McLendon, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Craig J. Daniel, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Alan K. Bridgewater, Sami Juma, Ryan L. Attar, Ronald Layne Smith, Michael E. Zundle, Bruce R. Chaplin, Robin Kruskol, Eric Bradley Gann, Matthew K. Ashworth, Andrew E. Coussens, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Jesse Baker, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Terry Salazar, Jennifer L. Downes, Carrie C. Gallagher, Ernest Richard Roth, Christina L. Lee, David A. Montgomery, Allison Mariko Hill, Richard Michael Clemes, Mikel Harper, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr, Edwin Keith, Sr, Dale Ford, Jeremen Sandoval, Gregory D. Parker, Richard P. Hamilton, Amanda G. Miller, John Albert McDonald, Tommy R. Reddick, Phillip A. Anderson, Andre Demon Glenn, Dennis E. McMullen, Shameran Youkhana, Travis Adams, John R. Fudala, Jeffrey S. Church, Thomas Andersen, Robert Lippolis, Scott D. Bailey, Everette D. Avery, Jr, Timothy J. Watson, Perry A. Cross, Jr, Lewis Palmer, Robert A. Dreyfus, Craig D. Fillingane. KBR, Inc. served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/10/2015. (Keener, Carmella)
November 19, 2015 Filing 4 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Pollock, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, William Myron Henderson, Brandy E. Broadbent, William Magee, Michael S. Eddy, Robin A. Carr, James Robert Sandefur, Lauren Carol Price, Thomas W. Burns, Gordon Allen Ward, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr, Justin M. Faircloth, Juan Lugo, Cory Orlando McGill, Rigo A. Gonzalez, Bradley Doyle, Hanna P. Nissan, Jon Harding Mason, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr, Ervin L. Walker, Ronald Perry Sharp, Patti J. Anderson, Thomas S. Edwards, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Julio Pipino Walton, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Daniel Martin Jasoni, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Jason L. Carmen, Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr, Earnest J. Ellison, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Neal Mark Sutherland, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Anthony Brett Ogden, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Jason William Smith, Howard Leon Slade, Philip Lam, Clint Allen Blankenship, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Tanya Quincy, Michael Ray Fields, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr, James Cuthbert Midgett, James Eric Kelley, Bruce L. Reges, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Bryan L. Stevens, Kristin Southwell, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr, Larry Haynes, Jimmy Dwayne Williams, Shawn K. McLeod, Jason D. Farquharson, Nathan P. Turnock, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Rahman A. McKinnon, Tommy L. Fullen, Bonnie Dunlop, Rowena L. Darvin, Joseph Edward Devall, Tony L. Wright, Sr., Michael S. Delborrell, Anthony L. Arrington, Aundrea M. Hunt, Scott Allan Christie, Kevin L. Woodrum, Tee Jay Burr, Richard D. Celia, Stephen Randall Keith, Michael Leonard Farley, Steven S. Richardson, Connie G. Conley, Clarence William Wickham, Dennis H. Budd, Debora J. Pfaff, Nathan T. Meidl, Ricky L. Turner, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr, Calvin Priest, Jody Lee Piercy, Julian K. Jones, Simon Allen Wade, Erik J. Burch, David M. Swan, Richard Alan Hardison, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Jeffrey A. Meo, Leon J. Alexander, George Keys, Jr, Stepheny Gupton, Shawn E. Strout, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Wanda N. Jackson, Daniel R. Reyes, Laura J. Nowlin, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Ryan Martin DeLong, Charles Raymond Riippi, Reginald Fleming, Jr, Michael A. Cranfill, Clifford Yarbrough, Michael Lee Lowe, Dennis A. Blanchard, John David Fielder, Ronald Lee Frisby, Steven C. Zimmerman, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Arthur Whiteside, Kole Welsh, Trevor G. Ennis, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Victor M. Rivera, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Charles Lee, Bruce G. Laureiro, Ryan V. Collamore, Jose C. Roque, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Michelle A. Johnson, Bryan Hamilton, Carl Orlando, Murrill L. McLean, Alexander Menkes, Daniel Lee Davis, James Corey Ellis, Timothy Steven Parke, James Preston Potter, Jr., Reginald J. Belton, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr, Napolean L. Stafford, Julie Baron-Mannix, William Emmett White, David B. Swaney, Raphael A. Zamora, Donald P. Worrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Fayiz Nalu, Michael D. Kusek, Leonard Goodson, III, Varita V. Quincy, Rene L. Wilson, Kenley Feazell, Brian David Murphy, Ronnal Womack, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Theodore J. Bill, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Marek M. Sipko, George L. Watson III, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Justin Acosta, Michael W. Carr, Blaine S. Child, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr, Kenon L. Burns, Carter Charles Ruff, Gregory C. Skyles, Edward B. Weibl, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr, Andrea M. Caston, Daniel R. Kearney, Chad Robert Read, Karl Malinski Gibbs, Scott H. Stradley, Thomas K. Jones, Edward Leo Ferguson, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr, Hobart P. Saunders, Clyde Richard Holder, David F. Happle, Francisco Araque, Larry Baker, Kathleen S. Coy, Damian L Smith, Michael Daniel Banks, David W. Kirkland, Michael Farmer, Troy Thomas, Daniel B. Schultz, John Alan Bacon, Willie J. Mitchell, David F. Bryden, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael L. Madigan, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Brandon Christopher Johnston, Jamar Ham, Daniel M. Robshaw, Cliburn Lane, Jr, Leonard Ray Cheek, James Edward Miller, Christine Osorio, Sean M. Ladd, Jason B. Martin, John G. Duerr, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Micky Doto, Jason Paul Hatfield, Jacob Whetstone, Daniel E. Valentine, David B. Whaling, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Cassandra D. Eusery, James Austin Fisher, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Thomas K. Oleson, Derrick D. Clark, Gregory J. Pietz, Robert Wagenaar, Anthony Trinidad, Ozane Jackson, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Andrew Michael Booth, Daniel Maestas, Jonathan Medina, Anterian D. Johnson, James E. Kirk, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Tony Williams, Edwin Steele, Robert P. Busse, John L. Henderson, Samuel Nieves, Michael A. Griley, Jr, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr, James Robin, Craig Belanger, Teddric O'Neal Walker, David P. Staffa, Frederick D. McCollum, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Frank Earl Braxton, James Hershel Hudson, III, Brad L. Fruhling, Tracy Lemar Smith, Paul G. Jones, Michael A. Northup, Brian Earl Easley, Wade Jacobson, Julio A. Apodaca, Charles J. Lowery, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Brian Keith Lloyd, Shawn R. Devaney, Edwin Todd Turpin, William G. Cardwell, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr, Azariah Smith, Jr., Robert L. Williams, Erik D. Upham, Amanda J. Engen, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., Theta A. Olson, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, John Ernest Carlson, Suzanne M. Speight, Paul A. Richmond, Robert William Paxton, Brittany J. Davis, Milton M. Reynolds, David John Smith, Belinda M. Williams, Steven Wayne Holley, Michael A. Grochowski, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Robert Christopher Elesky, Mary A. Mickens, Blain L. Chambers, Timothy Donald Fendley, Tom Lee Gallagher, Christopher R. Simmons, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Paul Anthony Jones, Karen M. Gharst, Tai Porter, Mark A. Hill, Malone W. Davis, Keith R. Menzer, Mitchell P. Gill, Jesse N. Davidson, Michael L. Songy, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Michael Lee Maynard, Leonard Ritums, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Brian K. Bower, Tracy L. Asher, Alan Austin Mays, Johnnie F. Bines, Christopher T. Thornhill, Bryan Keith Keese, Michael P. Gibson, Jarrod C. Hall, Brenda M. O'Neal, David Brian DeLuca, Anthony K. Steward, Michael L. Caldwell, William O. Roark III, Christopher S. Henrikson, Rachael Brown, Terry D. Evans, Rodney W. Meece, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr, Roland David Schulz, Michael W. Hafke, Angela Vanette Barnes, Timothy M. Murray, Michael Christopher Stanco, Milan B. Thakkar, Wayne Rodriguez, Michael A. LeBlanc, Eric Jaeger, Richard J. Nicholls, Richard D. Rice, Charles J. Barnes, Paul R. Vadney, Michele A. Pearce, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Kori L. Willis, James R. Bates, Michael J. Kidder, Patrick C. Mondragon, Brandi L. Benson, Omowunmi Martins, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, Franklin O. Snow, Travis M. Bassett, William James Heard, David Allen Jones, II, Audrey S. Perry, Jason R. Bills, Eric B. McLendon, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Craig J. Daniel, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Alan K. Bridgewater, Sami Juma, Ryan L. Attar, Ronald Layne Smith, Michael E. Zundle, Bruce R. Chaplin, Robin Kruskol, Eric Bradley Gann, Matthew K. Ashworth, Andrew E. Coussens, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Jesse Baker, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Terry Salazar, Jennifer L. Downes, Carrie C. Gallagher, Ernest Richard Roth, Christina L. Lee, David A. Montgomery, Allison Mariko Hill, Richard Michael Clemes, Mikel Harper, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr, Edwin Keith, Sr, Dale Ford, Jeremen Sandoval, Gregory D. Parker, Richard P. Hamilton, Amanda G. Miller, John Albert McDonald, Tommy R. Reddick, Phillip A. Anderson, Andre Demon Glenn, Dennis E. McMullen, Shameran Youkhana, Travis Adams, John R. Fudala, Jeffrey S. Church, Thomas Andersen, Robert Lippolis, Scott D. Bailey, Everette D. Avery, Jr, Timothy J. Watson, Perry A. Cross, Jr, Lewis Palmer, Robert A. Dreyfus, Craig D. Fillingane. Kellogg Brown & Root LLC served on 11/19/2015, answer due 12/10/2015. (Keener, Carmella)
November 18, 2015 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Halliburton Company, KBR Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc. (rwc)
November 18, 2015 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Halliburton Company, Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc., KBR, Inc.- filed by James Pollock, Dustin Jeffrey Auer, William Myron Henderson, Brandy E. Broadbent, William Magee, Michael S. Eddy, Robin A. Carr, James Robert Sandefur, Lauren Carol Price, Thomas W. Burns, Gordon Allen Ward, Willie Antonio Boykin, Sr, Justin M. Faircloth, Juan Lugo, Cory Orlando McGill, Rigo A. Gonzalez, Bradley Doyle, Hanna P. Nissan, Jon Harding Mason, Douglas Hamilton Kinard, Jr, Ervin L. Walker, Ronald Perry Sharp, Patti J. Anderson, Thomas S. Edwards, Andrea Michele Neutzling, Julio Pipino Walton, William Westley Westburg, Jr., Daniel Martin Jasoni, Lawrence J. Jankowski, Jason L. Carmen, Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr, Earnest J. Ellison, Jericho N. Beauchamp, Neal Mark Sutherland, Dominick Thomas Andrews, Anthony Brett Ogden, Franklin Gerald Lowe, Jason William Smith, Howard Leon Slade, Philip Lam, Clint Allen Blankenship, Judy-Ann Bellefleur, Tanya Quincy, Michael Ray Fields, Nicholas R. Dudek, Jr, James Cuthbert Midgett, James Eric Kelley, Bruce L. Reges, Lori Lynn Mitchell, Eric G. Waters, Sr., Bryan L. Stevens, Kristin Southwell, Richard Carl Hogan, Jr, Larry Haynes, Jimmy Dwayne Williams, Shawn K. McLeod, Jason D. Farquharson, Nathan P. Turnock, Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr., Rahman A. McKinnon, Tommy L. Fullen, Bonnie Dunlop, Rowena L. Darvin, Joseph Edward Devall, Tony L. Wright, Sr., Michael S. Delborrell, Anthony L. Arrington, Aundrea M. Hunt, Scott Allan Christie, Kevin L. Woodrum, Tee Jay Burr, Richard D. Celia, Stephen Randall Keith, Michael Leonard Farley, Steven S. Richardson, Connie G. Conley, Clarence William Wickham, Dennis H. Budd, Debora J. Pfaff, Nathan T. Meidl, Ricky L. Turner, Christopher Lynn Nanney, Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr, Calvin Priest, Jody Lee Piercy, Julian K. Jones, Simon Allen Wade, Erik J. Burch, David M. Swan, Richard Alan Hardison, Tyrone Anthony Timms, Jeffrey A. Meo, Leon J. Alexander, George Keys, Jr, Stepheny Gupton, Shawn E. Strout, Christopher Sean Nyberg, Rickey Treymane Waiters, Wanda N. Jackson, Daniel R. Reyes, Laura J. Nowlin, Rhonda Sue Matchett, Ryan Martin DeLong, Charles Raymond Riippi, Reginald Fleming, Jr, Michael A. Cranfill, Clifford Yarbrough, Michael Lee Lowe, Dennis A. Blanchard, John David Fielder, Ronald Lee Frisby, Steven C. Zimmerman, Aubrey Danyelle Tapley, Arthur Whiteside, Kole Welsh, Trevor G. Ennis, Stanley K. Kaina, Jr, Donald Edmundo Martinez, Victor M. Rivera, Kelly Jean Karl-Forst, Michael Charles Lee, Bruce G. Laureiro, Ryan V. Collamore, Jose C. Roque, Ryan C. Rasmussen, Michelle A. Johnson, Bryan Hamilton, Carl Orlando, Murrill L. McLean, Alexander Menkes, Daniel Lee Davis, James Corey Ellis, Timothy Steven Parke, James Preston Potter, Jr., Reginald J. Belton, Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr, Napolean L. Stafford, Julie Baron-Mannix, William Emmett White, David B. Swaney, Raphael A. Zamora, Donald P. Worrell, Gary Lee Ennis, Fayiz Nalu, Michael D. Kusek, Leonard Goodson, III, Varita V. Quincy, Rene L. Wilson, Kenley Feazell, Brian David Murphy, Ronnal Womack, Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr., Theodore J. Bill, Frederick A. Devonshire, II, Marek M. Sipko, George L. Watson III, Cedric Eugene Price, Sr., Justin Acosta, Michael W. Carr, Blaine S. Child, Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr, Kenon L. Burns, Carter Charles Ruff, Gregory C. Skyles, Edward B. Weibl, Matthew Calvin Hurt, Jr, Andrea M. Caston, Daniel R. Kearney, Chad Robert Read, Karl Malinski Gibbs, Scott H. Stradley, Thomas K. Jones, Edward Leo Ferguson, Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr, Hobart P. Saunders, Clyde Richard Holder, David F. Happle, Francisco Araque, Larry Baker, Kathleen S. Coy, Damian L Smith, Michael Daniel Banks, David W. Kirkland, Michael Farmer, Troy Thomas, Daniel B. Schultz, John Alan Bacon, Willie J. Mitchell, David F. Bryden, Katrina LeAnn White, Michael L. Madigan, Kryste Swanzetta Smith, Brandon Christopher Johnston, Jamar Ham, Daniel M. Robshaw, Cliburn Lane, Jr, Leonard Ray Cheek, James Edward Miller, Christine Osorio, Sean M. Ladd, Jason B. Martin, John G. Duerr, Patrick Michael O'Connell, Steven LeRoy Bakken, Micky Doto, Jason Paul Hatfield, Jacob Whetstone, Daniel E. Valentine, David B. Whaling, Rosie Marie Applewhite, Cassandra D. Eusery, James Austin Fisher, Joshua Nathan Perusse, Thomas K. Oleson, Derrick D. Clark, Gregory J. Pietz, Robert Wagenaar, Anthony Trinidad, Ozane Jackson, Alberto Joseph Walrath, Andrew Michael Booth, Daniel Maestas, Jonathan Medina, Anterian D. Johnson, James E. Kirk, Pierre O'Dell Larkin, Tony Williams, Edwin Steele, Robert P. Busse, John L. Henderson, Samuel Nieves, Michael A. Griley, Jr, Kenneth Roger Christensen, Sr, James Robin, Craig Belanger, Teddric O'Neal Walker, David P. Staffa, Frederick D. McCollum, Carlos J. Martir Sandoval, Frank Earl Braxton, James Hershel Hudson, III, Brad L. Fruhling, Tracy Lemar Smith, Paul G. Jones, Michael A. Northup, Brian Earl Easley, Wade Jacobson, Julio A. Apodaca, Charles J. Lowery, Gerald Kenneth Krein, Brian Keith Lloyd, Shawn R. Devaney, Edwin Todd Turpin, William G. Cardwell, Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr, Azariah Smith, Jr., Robert L. Williams, Erik D. Upham, Amanda J. Engen, Daniel Edward Rice, Jr., Theta A. Olson, Jimmy Lynn Hampton, John Ernest Carlson, Suzanne M. Speight, Paul A. Richmond, Robert William Paxton, Brittany J. Davis, Milton M. Reynolds, David John Smith, Belinda M. Williams, Steven Wayne Holley, Michael A. Grochowski, Michael Adam Tumlinson, Robert Christopher Elesky, Mary A. Mickens, Blain L. Chambers, Timothy Donald Fendley, Tom Lee Gallagher, Christopher R. Simmons, George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr., Paul Anthony Jones, Karen M. Gharst, Tai Porter, Mark A. Hill, Malone W. Davis, Keith R. Menzer, Mitchell P. Gill, Jesse N. Davidson, Michael L. Songy, Michael DeVincent Amicy, Michael Lee Maynard, Leonard Ritums, Scott A. Elsenheimer, Brian K. Bower, Tracy L. Asher, Alan Austin Mays, Johnnie F. Bines, Christopher T. Thornhill, Bryan Keith Keese, Michael P. Gibson, Jarrod C. Hall, Brenda M. O'Neal, David Brian DeLuca, Anthony K. Steward, Michael L. Caldwell, William O. Roark III, Christopher S. Henrikson, Rachael Brown, Terry D. Evans, Rodney W. Meece, Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr, Roland David Schulz, Michael W. Hafke, Angela Vanette Barnes, Timothy M. Murray, Michael Christopher Stanco, Milan B. Thakkar, Wayne Rodriguez, Michael A. LeBlanc, Eric Jaeger, Richard J. Nicholls, Richard D. Rice, Charles J. Barnes, Paul R. Vadney, Michele A. Pearce, Ronald Eyrl Eisman, Sandi Christine Golden-Vest, Kori L. Willis, James R. Bates, Michael J. Kidder, Patrick C. Mondragon, Brandi L. Benson, Omowunmi Martins, Ralph Benjamen Jenkins, Franklin O. Snow, Travis M. Bassett, William James Heard, David Allen Jones, II, Audrey S. Perry, Jason R. Bills, Eric B. McLendon, Carl Thomas Sullivan, Craig J. Daniel, Robert F. Ramos, Jr., Alan K. Bridgewater, Sami Juma, Ryan L. Attar, Ronald Layne Smith, Michael E. Zundle, Bruce R. Chaplin, Robin Kruskol, Eric Bradley Gann, Matthew K. Ashworth, Andrew E. Coussens, Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte, Jesse Baker, Marco Alexander Horsewood, Terry Salazar, Jennifer L. Downes, Carrie C. Gallagher, Ernest Richard Roth, Christina L. Lee, David A. Montgomery, Allison Mariko Hill, Richard Michael Clemes, Mikel Harper, Daniel C. Chavez, Sr, Edwin Keith, Sr, Dale Ford, Jeremen Sandoval, Gregory D. Parker, Richard P. Hamilton, Amanda G. Miller, John Albert McDonald, Tommy R. Reddick, Phillip A. Anderson, Andre Demon Glenn, Dennis E. McMullen, Shameran Youkhana, Travis Adams, John R. Fudala, Jeffrey S. Church, Thomas Andersen, Robert Lippolis, Scott D. Bailey, Everette D. Avery, Jr, Timothy J. Watson, Perry A. Cross, Jr, Lewis Palmer, Robert A. Dreyfus, Craig D. Fillingane.(Keener, Carmella)
November 13, 2015 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to KBR Inc.. (sec)
November 13, 2015 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Halliburton Company on 11/13/2015; KBR Inc. on 11/13/2015; Kellogg Brown & Root LLC on 11/13/2015; Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc. on 11/13/2015. (sec)
November 12, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 5, 2015 No Summons Issued. (klc)
November 5, 2015 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (klc)
November 5, 2015 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Halliburton Company, KBR Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1822213) - filed by Justin Acosta et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta et al v. Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Layne Smith
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan C. Rasmussen
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald J. Belton
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher R. Simmons
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry D. Evans
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Michael Booth
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Whetstone
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Vanette Barnes
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel C. Chavez, Sr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie F. Bines
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Burns
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik J. Burch
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell P. Gill
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Lee Piercy
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Steele
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Grochowski
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Edward Rice, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Fielder
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Keith Lloyd
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Sue Matchett
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Robert Read
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Salazar
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robin
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigo A. Gonzalez
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Montgomery
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Orlando McGill
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Brett Ogden
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney W. Meece
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy-Ann Bellefleur
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Caldwell
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason D. Farquharson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jericho N. Beauchamp
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Kidder
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. LeBlanc
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Leo Ferguson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Raymond Riippi
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin L. Woodrum
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everette D. Avery, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian David Murphy
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Thomas Sullivan
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Richard Roth
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie E. Cavazos, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Keith, Sr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Church
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Jean Karl-Forst
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Lowe
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Steven Parke
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Marie Applewhite
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Jacobson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Eddy
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Palmer
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Songy
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Meo
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda J. Engen
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raphael A. Zamora
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozane Jackson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Martin DeLong
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence J. Jankowski
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowena L. Darvin
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis M. Bassett
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus R. Lawrence, Sr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Malinski Gibbs
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad L. Fruhling
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Donald Fendley
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Donald Crabbe, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dempsey Lovett Logue, Sr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew E. Coussens
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest J. Ellison
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore J. Bill
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric B. McLendon
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Leon Slade
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott H. Stradley
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick D. McCollum
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda N. Jackson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason R. Bills
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Earl Easley
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G. Cardwell
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Paul Hatfield
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Napolean L. Stafford
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin O. Snow
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brian DeLuca
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan V. Collamore
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn E. Strout
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Richard Rapciewicz, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Lam
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Charles Ruff
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy L. Asher
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean M. Ladd
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azariah Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Christopher Johnston
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Wagenaar
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos J. Martir Sandoval
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Nicholls
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan P. Turnock
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Dunlop
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Magee
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick C. Mondragon
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ernest Carlson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Randall Keith
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pollock
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan T. Meidl
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Alan Hardison
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse N. Davidson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Fudala
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Bates
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik D. Upham
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas S. Edwards
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Barnes
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Fleming, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian L Smith
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy E. Broadbent
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David F. Bryden
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aundrea M. Hunt
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameran Youkhana
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose C. Roque
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Martin Jasoni
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Albert McDonald
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura J. Nowlin
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher T. Thornhill
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kole Welsh
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Jeffrey Auer
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Gerald Lowe
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven C. Zimmerman
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Kirk
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Rodriguez
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Lee Gallagher
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Baker
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Lugo
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Zundle
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anterian D. Johnson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliburn Lane, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie G. Conley
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Mark Sutherland
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian K. Jones
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Ford
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony K. Steward
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenley Feazell
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. Bower
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Edward Devall
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William O. Roark III
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Carr
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Goodson, III
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Adams
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Austin Mays
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason William Smith
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Holley
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Michele Neutzling
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Earl Braxton
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda M. O'Neal
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Michael Clemes
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sami Juma
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Douglas Bowers, Sr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Priest
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason L. Carmen
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Benjamen Jenkins
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Kirkland
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Reyes
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Christopher Elesky
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Haynes
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy L. Fullen
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Richard Holder
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward B. Weibl
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Fields
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Araque
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theta A. Olson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Colleen Chiaramonte
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Griley, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy R. Reddick
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omowunmi Martins
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin M. Faircloth
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Christopher Stanco
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David P. Staffa
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Lowery
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig J. Daniel
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael P. Gibson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina LeAnn White
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Maynard
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Frisby
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas K. Oleson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Kearney
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland David Schulz
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton M. Reynolds
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Madigan
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi L. Benson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Lavanta Williams, Sr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas K. Jones
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Joseph Walrath
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Maestas
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tai Porter
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lynn Nanney
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Alexander Horsewood
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Allen Wade
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie C. Sanders, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Davis
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary A. Mickens
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory D. Parker
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikel Harper
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Jones, II
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cuthbert Midgett
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Allan Christie
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varita V. Quincy
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory J. Pietz
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Orlando
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael DeVincent Amicy
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Treymane Waiters
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald P. Worrell
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Belanger
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanna P. Nissan
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason B. Martin
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele A. Pearce
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hobart P. Saunders
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Charles Chumbley, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan L. Attar
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Yarbrough
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti J. Anderson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven S. Richardson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Harding Mason
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Osorio
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Baker
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Westley Westburg, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tee Jay Burr
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Emmett White
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Carl Hogan, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Cranfill
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malone W. Davis
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Nieves
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Lynn Mitchell
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Jaeger
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley K. Kaina, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Trinidad
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Allen Ward
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Adam Tumlinson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Whiteside
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lemar Smith
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Eric Kelley
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Danyelle Tapley
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Richmond
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marek M. Sipko
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Andersen
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra D. Eusery
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Skyles
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne M. Speight
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie J. Mitchell
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert William Paxton
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Keys, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Williams
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor G. Ennis
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Arrington
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy M. Murray
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandi Christine Golden-Vest
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew K. Ashworth
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William James Heard
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda M. Williams
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Edmundo Martinez
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milan B. Thakkar
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey S. Perry
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin L. Walker
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Farmer
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Southwell
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Michael O'Connell
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Brown
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Medina
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina L. Lee
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahman A. McKinnon
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fayiz Nalu
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc J. Chubbuck, Sr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard P. Hamilton
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan K. Bridgewater
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kryste Swanzetta Smith
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Quincy
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Preston Potter, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Demon Glenn
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan L. Stevens
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce L. Reges
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Delborrell
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lee Ennis
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora J. Pfaff
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre O'Dell Larkin
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis A. Blanchard
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M. Gharst
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio A. Apodaca
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar Ham
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kori L. Willis
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Leonard Farley
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher S. Henrikson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alan Bacon
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bradley Gann
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremen Sandoval
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Nathan Perusse
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky L. Turner
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Pipino Walton
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick D. Clark
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A. Elsenheimer
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F. Ramos, Jr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn K. McLeod
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence William Wickham
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John G. Duerr
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David John Smith
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Eyrl Eisman
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Mariko Hill
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenon L. Burns
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sean Nyberg
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Kruskol
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony L. Wright, Sr.
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Swaney
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Anthony Timms
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Watson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Myron Henderson
Represented By: Carmella P. Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Le