Crystallex International Corp. v. Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Crystallex International Corp.
Defendant: Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A., PDV Holding, Inc. and CITGO Holding, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv01082
Filed: November 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM ORDER setting deadline to file joint status report and cancelling the December 20, 2018 hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/30/18. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01082-LPS, 1:16-cv-00904-LPS, 1:16-cv-01007-LPS, 1:17-cv-00028-LPS (ntl)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 28 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/1/17. (ntl)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 41 REQUEST for Certification of Direct Appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit filed by CITGO Holding, Inc., PDV Holding, Inc., Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. The Court's 09/30/16 Order (D.I. 35 ) is AMENDED. Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report no later than January 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/27/16. (etg)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 8 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/30/16. (ntl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crystallex International Corp. v. Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystallex International Corp.
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Travis Steven Hunter
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDV Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITGO Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?