Peterson v. McDonald
Plaintiff: Terrance Peterson
Defendant: Robert A. McDonald
Case Number: 1:2016cv00160
Filed: March 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/26/2020. (kmd)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/11/2019. (ceg)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/14/2018. (ceg)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/13/17. (rwc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?