Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc. v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 313
Plaintiff: Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc.
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 313
Case Number: 1:2016cv00190
Filed: March 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Gerald A. McHugh on 10/5/2018. (nmg)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Gerald A. McHugh on 12/15/2017. (fms)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/11/2017. (nmfn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc. v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 313
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jones Lang Lasalle Americas Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 313
Represented By: Claiborne S. Newlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?