Shotwell v. State of Delaware
Plaintiff: Mark J. Shotwell
Defendant: State of Delaware
Case Number: 1:2016cv00441
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint (D.I. 110 ) is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. Plaintiff should file a revised TAC consistent with this order. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (D.I. 93 ) is DISMISSED AS MOOT. A new schedule will be set at a scheduling conference after the pleadings are finalized. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/25/2019. (nms)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff's request for counsel is DENIED without prejudice to renew (D.I. 31 ). Plaintiff's motion for a ruling on Defendant's discovery request is DENIED (D.I. 46 ). Defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (D.I. 50 ). Plaintiff shall file responses to discovery on or before May 11, 2018. Plaintiff's motion for access to legal funds or waivers is DENIED (D.I. 52 ). Plaintiff's motion to enforce subpoenas is DISMISSED as premature (D.I. 61 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/16/2018. (nms)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/3/2017. (crb)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/22/2016. (cna)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2016. (nmg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shotwell v. State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark J. Shotwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?