Amgen Inc. v. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Amgen Inc.
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00853
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 10/14/2020. (nmg)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 485 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 9/18/2019. (lak)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 375 OPINION. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 7/26/2018. (crb)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 4/19/2018. (crb)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MEMORANDUM re 294 . Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 2/27/18. (gvw)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Construing the Terms of U.S. Patent No. 9,375,405. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/19/2017. (mdb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amgen Inc. v. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amgen Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?