United States of America v. Energy Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Energy Solutions, Inc., Rockwell Holdco, Inc., Andrews County Holdings, Inc. and Waste Control Specialists LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv01056
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:25
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2017 236 Opinion or Order of the Court REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 229 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/21/2017. (nmfn)
April 21, 2017 207 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding the upcoming bench trial. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/21/2017. (nmfn)
December 21, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/21/2016. (mdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Energy Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bindi R. Bhagat
Represented By: Travis R. Chapman
Represented By: Julie S. Elmer
Represented By: Jennifer Lynne Hall
Represented By: Danielle G. Hauck
Represented By: John D. Lindermuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Holdco, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Scott Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews County Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Hugh M. Hollman
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Joseph A. Ostoyich
Represented By: Donald E. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Control Specialists LLC
Represented By: Hugh M. Hollman
Represented By: William M. Lafferty
Represented By: Joseph A. Ostoyich
Represented By: Donald E. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?