Dove v. Boeing Company et al
Plaintiff: Dove, Gus Dove, Elizabeth Alice Dove and Roxane Audrey Huey
Defendant: Boeing Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Borg-Warner Morse TEC, LLC, Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, Ford Motor Company, General Electric Company, Allied Signal, Inc., The Bendix Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Northrop Grumman Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, Lockheed Martin Corp. and Pneumo Abex LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00056
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 SO ORDERED re #192 Stipulation of Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/21/2019. (dlw)
February 21, 2019 Filing 193 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from R. Joseph Hrubiec, Esq. regarding Status of the Case Pursuant to the Court's Oral Order of February 15, 2019. (Hrubiec, R.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 192 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Elizabeth Alice Dove. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hrubiec, R.) Modified on 2/21/2019 (lih).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Whereas, the District Judge has adopted the Reports and Recommendations granting summary judgment (D.I. #186 and #188 ) and has entered judgment as a matter of law in favor of the moving defendants; It is hereby ordered that the Plaintiff and all remaining active Defendants shall submit to the court a joint status report, limited to four pages, on or before February 22, 2019, advising of the status of the case and identifying all Defendants remaining as active participants; advising of the status of further discovery, including expert discovery; advising of an approximate date range for purposes of setting dates (including the number of trial days) for a jury trial and pretrial conference; and advising of any other matters requiring the attention of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/15/2019. (lih)
February 14, 2019 Filing 191 JUDGMENT in favor of Ford Motor Company against Elizabeth Alice Dove, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gus Dove. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/14/2019. (dlw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 190 JUDGMENT in favor of Borg-Warner Morse TEC, LLC as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation against Elizabeth Alice Dove, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gus Dove. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/14/2019. (dlw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 189 JUDGMENT in favor of Pneumo Abex LLC against Elizabeth Alice Dove, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gus Dove. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/14/2019. (dlw)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER ADOPTING #185 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTING #148 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #149 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #155 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #183 Motion to Dismiss. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/14/2019. (dlw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 187 JUDGMENT in favor of Honeywell International, Inc., the successor in interest to Allied Signal, Inc., the successor in interest to Bendix Corporation against Elizabeth Alice Dove, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gus Dove. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/11/2019. (dlw)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER ADOPTING #184 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTING #151 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/11/2019. (dlw)
January 30, 2019 Filing 185 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #147 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #183 MOTION to Dismiss, #149 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #148 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #155 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/29/2019. (lih)
January 25, 2019 Filing 184 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/25/2019. (lih)
January 25, 2019 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #183 . (lih)
January 23, 2019 Filing 183 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon failure to oppose summary judgment motion - filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Naylor, Joseph)
January 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Oral Argument held on 1/14/2019 re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 SO ORDERED re #181 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by IMO Industries, Inc. Party IMO Industries, Inc. terminated. Attorney Eileen M. Ford and Megan Trocki Mantzavinos terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/3/2018. (dlw)
December 3, 2018 Filing 181 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. by IMO Industries, Inc. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 12/3/2018 (dlw).
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 SO ORDERED re #179 MOTION to Dismiss all Cross-claims Based upon Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice filed by Lockheed Martin Corp. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/28/2018. (dlw)
November 28, 2018 Filing 179 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims With Prejudice - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation's Motion to Dismiss All Cross-Claims)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 SO ORDERED re #177 MOTION to Dismiss All Cross-Claims Based upon Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims filed by Ingersoll Rand Company. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/28/2018. (dlw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 177 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims - filed by Ingersoll Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Defendant Ingersoll Rand Company Without Prejudice)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 SO ORDERED re #175 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Lockheed Martin Corp. Party Lockheed Martin Corp. terminated. Attorney Laura P. Yee; Armand J. Della Porta, Jr and Jessica Lee Tyler terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/27/2018. (dlw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 175 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation)(Tyler, Jessica)
November 21, 2018 Filing 174 Letter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Joseph S. Naylor, Esq. regarding Proposed Order of Dismissal - re #147 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Naylor, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Filing 173 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Joelle Florax regarding Request for Oral Argument - re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Florax, Joelle) Modified on 11/21/2018 (lih).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall hear argument re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment on 1/14/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel shall collectively have one hour for argument. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/21/2018. (lih)
November 20, 2018 Filing 172 REPLY BRIEF re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
November 19, 2018 Filing 171 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from C. Scott Reese, Esquire regarding No Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment - re #148 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Reese, C.)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 SO ORDERED re #168 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Boeing Company. Party Boeing Company (as Successor to McDonnell Douglas) terminated. Attorney Whitney L. Frame; Paul Seward; Amaryah K. Bocchino and Jason A. Cincilla terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/19/2018. (dlw)
November 19, 2018 Filing 169 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Matthew P. Donelson, Esquire regarding No Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment - re #149 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Donelson, Matthew)
November 19, 2018 Filing 168 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Boeing Company. (Seward, Paul)
November 16, 2018 Filing 167 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Rochelle Gumapac regarding Request for Order Granting Ford Motor Company's Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment - re #155 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Singewald, Christian)
November 15, 2018 Filing 166 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Jessica L. Tyler, Esquire regarding Request for Order Granting Lockheed Martin Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment - re #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Tyler, Jessica)
November 14, 2018 Filing 165 REDACTED VERSION of #162 Exhibit to a Document by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 11/14/2018 (lih).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #164 Letter. Pursuant to the Oral Order dated 11/9/18, each of defendant Boeing Companys resubmitted Declarations shall be supported by exhibits limited to no more than 200 pages. In other words, defendant Boeing Companys two Declarations, the Leatherman Declaration and the Fogg Declaration, are each limited to no more than 200 pages of supporting exhibits. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/14/2018. (lih)
November 13, 2018 Filing 164 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Paul S. Seward regarding Clarification on Exhibits to Declaration. (Seward, Paul)
November 13, 2018 Filing 163 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Elizabeth Alice Dove.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hrubiec, R.)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting-in-part #158 MOTION to Seal. For the reasons discussed in our teleconference on November 7, 2018, defendant Boeing Company shall resubmit its brief and Declarations on or before 11/21/18. Resubmitted exhibits in support of each Declaration shall be limited to no more than 200 pages. Defendant Boeing Company shall file a redacted version of the Leatherman Declaration, the Fogg Declaration, and corresponding exhibits on or before 11/28/18. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/9/2018. (lih)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #161 MOTION to Seal. For the reasons discussed in our teleconference on November 7, 2018, defendant Lockheed Martin Corp. shall file a redacted version of the Nastase Declaration and corresponding exhibits A through III on or before 11/16/18. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/9/2018. (lih)
November 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 11/7/2018. (Court Reporter S. Vickers (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the court shall conduct a status teleconference on 11/7/2018 at 2:00 PM to discuss the exhibits that defendant Boeing Company seeks to file in support of their motion for summary judgment. Counsel for Boeing Company shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557 once all interested parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/5/2018. (lih)
November 2, 2018 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #155 and #157 . Counsel is also advised that documents must be bound and submitted according to their D.I. number. Failure to properly submit the documents in the correct manner will result in the documents being returned. (lih)
October 31, 2018 Filing 162 [SEALED] EXHIBIT re #161 MOTION to Seal by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Tyler, Jessica)
October 31, 2018 Filing 161 MOTION to Seal - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit , #2 Exhibit JJJ, #3 7.1.1 Statement, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 11/1/2018 (lih).
October 31, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, the sealed exhibit previously filed as D.I. 156 has been deleted. The document is now present on the docket at D.I. 161. (lih)
October 30, 2018 Filing 160 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #159 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Boeing Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D 1-2, #6 Exhibit D 3.1, #7 Exhibit D 3.2, #8 Exhibit D 3.3, #9 Exhibit D 3.4, #10 Exhibit D 4-25, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit E 1-26, #13 Exhibit E 27, #14 Exhibit E 28-50, #15 Exhibit E 51-59, #16 Exhibit E 60.1, #17 Exhibit E 60.2, #18 Exhibit E 60.3, #19 Exhibit E 60.4, #20 Exhibit E 61-90, #21 Exhibit E 91-93, #22 Exhibit E 94, #23 Exhibit E 95-100, #24 Exhibit F, #25 Exhibit G)(Seward, Paul)
October 30, 2018 Filing 159 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Seward, Paul)
October 30, 2018 Filing 158 MOTION to Seal - filed by Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Seward, Paul)
October 30, 2018 Filing 157 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #155 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of Exhibits 1-19, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of Exhibits 1-19, #3 Exhibit Part 3 of Exhibits 1-19, #4 Exhibit Part 4 of Exhibits 1-19, #5 Exhibit Part 5 of Exhibits 1-19, #6 Exhibit Part 6 of Exhibits 1-19)(Singewald, Christian)
October 30, 2018 Filing 155 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Singewald, Christian)
October 30, 2018 Filing 154 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #153 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A Through III, #2 Exhibit 1 - 4)(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 10/31/2018 (lih).
October 30, 2018 Filing 153 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Lockheed Martin Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
October 30, 2018 Filing 152 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Honeywell International, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Florax, Joelle)
October 30, 2018 Filing 151 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Florax, Joelle)
October 30, 2018 Filing 150 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #149 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Borg-Warner Morse TEC, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/13/2018. (Donelson, Matthew)
October 30, 2018 Filing 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Borg-Warner Morse TEC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Donelson, Matthew)
October 30, 2018 Filing 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Reese, C.)
October 30, 2018 Filing 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Naylor, Joseph)
October 29, 2018 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories filed by Honeywell International, Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 SO ORDERED re #144 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Ingersoll Rand Company (Party Ingersoll Rand Company terminated and Attorney Jessica Lee Tyler terminated for defendant Ingersoll Rand Company only). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/24/2018. (dlw)
October 24, 2018 Filing 144 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ingersoll Rand Company. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 10/24/2018 (lih).
October 23, 2018 Filing 143 ANSWER to #129 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pneumo Abex LLC.(Reese, C.) Modified on 10/23/2018 (lih).
October 23, 2018 Filing 142 ANSWER to #129 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 10/23/2018 (lih).
October 23, 2018 REMINDER TO ALL COUNSEL regarding RULE 5.2. Service.(a) CM/ECF. If all parties to a case are participants in CM/ECF, the Courts Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF), automatically generated for each document filed, shall serve as the certificate of service; i.e., no separate certificate of service shall be filed. (lih)
October 22, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION filed by Boeing Company.(Seward, Paul)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #140 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For Case Dispositive Motions on Product Identification and Nexus to December 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/22/2018. (lih)
October 19, 2018 Filing 140 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For Case Dispositive Motions on Product Identification and Nexus to December 15, 2018 - filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
October 18, 2018 Filing 139 ANSWER to #129 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Borg-Warner Morse TEC, LLC.(Donelson, Matthew) Modified on 10/18/2018 (lih).
October 4, 2018 Filing 138 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bobbie R. Bailey - filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ford, Eileen)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #138 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bobbie R. Bailey. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/4/2018. (lih)
October 3, 2018 Filing 137 ANSWER to #129 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Union Carbide Corporation.(Naylor, Joseph) Modified on 10/3/2018 (lih).
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #136 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deborah M. Parker #135 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Guy P. Glazier. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/28/2018. (lih)
September 27, 2018 Filing 136 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deborah M. Parker, Esquire - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed) Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 9/27/2018 (lih).
September 27, 2018 Filing 135 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Guy P. Glazier, Esquire - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 9/27/2018 (lih).
September 27, 2018 Filing 134 ANSWER to #129 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc..(Florax, Joelle) Modified on 9/27/2018 (lih).
September 26, 2018 Filing 133 ANSWER to #129 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Boeing Company.(Seward, Paul) Modified on 9/27/2018 (lih).
September 25, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lockheed Martin Corp. on October 4-5, 2018 filed by Elizabeth Alice Dove.(Hrubiec, R.)
September 25, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notice of deposition previously filed as D.I. 132 due to document having the wrong case caption. Counsel shall file a revised version of the document with the correct case caption. (lih)
September 24, 2018 Filing 131 ANSWER to #129 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries, Inc..(Ford, Eileen) Modified on 9/24/2018 (lih).
September 12, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant Lockheed Martin Corp.'s Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Elizabeth Alice Dove.(Hrubiec, R.)
September 12, 2018 Filing 129 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Elizabeth Alice Dove.(Hrubiec, R.)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #124 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/12/2018. (lih)
September 10, 2018 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #124 . (lih)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #128 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For Filing Case Dispositive Motions on Product Identification and Nexus from October 9, 2018 to October 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/7/2018. (lih)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #127 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott Kossoudji. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/6/2018. (lih)
September 6, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 5, 2018 Filing 128 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For Filing Case Dispositive Motions on Product Identification and Nexus to October 30, 2018 - filed by Ingersoll Rand Company, Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 9/6/2018 (lih).
August 31, 2018 Filing 127 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Scott Kossoudji, Esquire - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification By Counsel To be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
August 27, 2018 Filing 126 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Daugherty, Sally) Modified on 9/6/2018 (lih).
August 27, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally J. Daugherty on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Daugherty, Sally)
August 24, 2018 Filing 124 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint - filed by Elizabeth Alice Dove. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Second Amended Complaint, #3 Second Amended Complaint (Redline), #4 Certificate of Compliance, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Hrubiec, R.) Modified on 9/6/2018 (lih).
August 24, 2018 Filing 123 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from R. Joseph Hrubiec, Esq. regarding Status of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hrubiec, R.)
August 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Status Conference held on 8/13/2018. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- The transcript of the 8/13/2018 status teleconference shall serve as the order of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/13/2018. (lih)
August 9, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lockheed Martin Corp. on October 4-5, 2018 filed by Elizabeth Alice Dove.(Hrubiec, R.)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #120 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/8/2018. (lih)
August 8, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Military Records from National Personnel Center filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
August 8, 2018 Filing 120 Stipulated Protective Order re #119 Letter by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 8/8/2018 (lih).
August 8, 2018 Filing 119 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Jessica L. Tyler, Esq. regarding Parties' Proposed Protective Order to Govern Discovery in this Matter. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 8/8/2018 (lih). (Main Document 119 replaced on 8/8/2018) (lih).
August 8, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the stipulated protective order previously attached to D.I. #119 due to document being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to re-file the protective order separately using the appropriate event code. (lih)
August 8, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I. #119 has been replaced with a revised version of the document to correct the case caption. (lih)
July 24, 2018 Filing 118 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Deadline for Deposition of 30(b)(6) Representative for Lockheed Martin Corporation From July 27, 2018 to To be Determined - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Tyler, Jessica)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #118 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Deadline for Deposition of 30(b)(6) Representative for Lockheed Martin Corporation From July 27, 2018 to To be Determined. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: counsel shall inform the court of the rescheduled date on or before the status teleconference on 8/13/2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/24/2018. (lih)
July 24, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the stipulation to extend time previously filed as D.I. number 116 due to document having the wrong case caption. Counsel is advised to file a revised version of the document with the correct case caption. (lih)
July 20, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Vacation of the Deposition of Lockheed Martin Corp. on July 27, 2018 by Elizabeth Alice Dove (Hrubiec, R.)
July 18, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lockheed Martin Corp. on July 27, 2018 filed by Elizabeth Alice Dove.(Hrubiec, R.)
July 18, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notice of service previously filed as D.I. 115 due to document having the wrong case caption. Counsel is advised to re-file the document with the correct case caption. (lih)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #114 STIPULATION to Establish Substantive Law. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/18/2018. (lih)
July 16, 2018 Filing 114 STIPULATION Set Briefing to Establish Substantive Law by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Tyler, Jessica)
July 16, 2018 Filing 113 Interim STATUS REPORT by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Tyler, Jessica)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #112 Letter Request for an extension of time. Counsel shall submit a joint letter concerning choice of law on or before 7/16/2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/10/2018. (lih)
July 9, 2018 Filing 112 Letter to Judge Fallon from Jessica L. Tyler regarding Extension of time for notification of choice of substantive law. (Tyler, Jessica)
July 2, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant Lockheed Martin Corp.'s Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents re #104 Notice of Service filed by Elizabeth Alice Dove.(Hrubiec, R.)
June 28, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of medical records filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
June 19, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation's Objections and Responses to Plantiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
June 19, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
June 19, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Admissions filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
June 18, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission filed by Boeing Company.(Seward, Paul)
June 15, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admission filed by Honeywell International, Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Due to a conflict with the courts calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the status teleconference set in this matter for 7/23/2018 is RESCHEDULED to 8/13/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/13/2018. (lih)
May 30, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
May 30, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
May 30, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notices of service previously filed as D.I. numbers 103 and 104 due to documents having the wrong case caption. Counsel is advised to refile the documents using the correct case caption. (lih)
May 24, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
May 24, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura P. Yee for Lockheed Martin Corp. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
May 23, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Tyler, Jessica)
May 23, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
May 21, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Pneumo Abex LLC.(Reese, C.)
May 21, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List filed by Borg-Warner Morse TEC, LLC.(Donelson, Matthew)
May 21, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notices of service previously filed as D.I. numbers 98-100 due to the documents having the wrong case caption again. Counsel is advised to file revised versions of the documents with the correct case caption. (lih)
May 21, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notices of service previously filed as D.I. numbers 98-100 due to documents having the wrong case caption. Counsel is advised to file revised versions of the documents with the correct case caption. (lih) Modified on 5/21/2018 (lih).
May 18, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness & Exhibit Lists filed by Boeing Company.(Seward, Paul)
May 18, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Honeywell International, Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
May 18, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.'s Initial Witness & Exhibit Lists filed by IMO Industries, Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
May 18, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Seward on behalf of Boeing Company (Seward, Paul)
May 18, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE of Service of Ford Motor Company's Expert Witness Disclosures and Exhibit Lists by Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
May 18, 2018 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List filed by Union Carbide Corporation.(Naylor, Joseph)
May 18, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The notice of service previously filed as D.I. 93 has been deleted to due having the wrong case caption. Counsel is advised to file a revised version of the document with the correct case caption. (lih)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re #89 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Resolve all cross-claims asserted against Goodyear Tire -- The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company terminated. Attorney Jason A. Cincilla; Ann Marie Kashishian; Paul Seward; Amaryah K. Bocchino and Ryan William Browning terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/16/18. (ntl)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #88 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/16/18. (ntl)
May 15, 2018 Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Resolve all cross-claims asserted against Goodyear Tire - filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Seward, Paul)
May 15, 2018 Filing 88 STIPULATION of Dismissal by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Seward, Paul)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #87 Stipulation of Dismissal as to General Electric Company -- Party General Electric Company terminated. Attorney Allison L. Texter and Beth E. Valocchi terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/14/18. (ntl)
May 10, 2018 Filing 87 STIPULATION of Dismissal by General Electric Company. (Texter, Allison)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #86 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC -- Party Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC terminated. Attorney Beth E. Valocchi terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/9/18. (ntl)
May 9, 2018 Filing 86 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC. (Valocchi, Beth)
March 16, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Witness & Exhibit List filed by Elizabeth Alice Dove.(Hrubiec, R.)
February 5, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Seward on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Seward, Paul)
February 5, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notice of appearance previously filed as D.I. 84 due to document having the wrong case caption. Counsel is advised to file a revised version of the document with the correct case caption. (lih)
February 2, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jennifer D. Donnelly as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin. (Della Porta, Armand)
January 31, 2018 Filing 82 Letter to The Honorable Judge Sherry R. Fallon from R. Joseph Hrubiec regarding whether the docket reflects all stipulations and/or agreements to dismiss reached to date. (Hrubiec, R.)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SO ORDERED- re #80 Proposed SCHEDULING ORDER. Set SCHEDULING ORDER deadlines: ( Discovery due by 7/27/2018., Status Report due by 7/16/2018., A Status Conference is set for 7/23/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon, Dispositive Motions due by 10/9/2018.) (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/31/2018. (lih)
January 31, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Scheduling Conference held on 1/31/2018. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (lih)
January 26, 2018 Filing 80 PROPOSED Amended Scheduling Order by Ingersoll Rand Company, Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 1/29/2018 (lih).
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)and STATUS CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on January 31, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than January 26, 2018. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on12/14/2017. (lih)
December 12, 2017 Filing 79 Letter to The Honorable Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Ana Marina McCann regarding case status. (McCann, Ana) Modified on 12/12/2017 (lih).
December 4, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re All Plaintiffs : Entry of appearance of attorney R. Joseph Hrubiec. Attorney James D. Heisman terminated. (Hrubiec, R.)
November 20, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jennifer L. Cree as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer with Firm. (Cree, Jennifer)
November 20, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney L. Frame on behalf of Boeing Company (Frame, Whitney)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the status teleconference set in this matter for 11/13/2017 is CANCELLED and shall be rescheduled at the convenience of the court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: on or before 12/12/2017, counsel shall submit a joint status report that provides a suggested time frame to hold a status and scheduling conference in 2018. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/8/2017. (lih)
November 6, 2017 Filing 75 Joint STATUS REPORT by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Tyler, Jessica)
October 17, 2017 Filing 74 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 10/18/2017 (lih).
October 13, 2017 Filing 73 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pneumo Abex LLC.(Reese, C.) Modified on 10/13/2017 (lih).
October 6, 2017 Filing 72 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Naylor, Joseph) Modified on 10/6/2017 (lih).
October 5, 2017 Filing 71 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint by General Electric Company.(Texter, Allison) Modified on 10/5/2017 (lih).
October 5, 2017 Filing 70 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint by Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC.(Valocchi, Beth) Modified on 10/5/2017 (lih).
September 27, 2017 Filing 69 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle) Modified on 9/29/2017 (lih).
September 26, 2017 Filing 68 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 9/29/2017 (lih).
September 26, 2017 Filing 67 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint by Boeing Company.(Cree, Jennifer) Modified on 9/29/2017 (lih).
September 26, 2017 Filing 66 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Kashishian, Ann) Modified on 9/29/2017 (lih).
September 26, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the answer to amended complaint previously filed as D.I. 66 due to document having the wrong case caption. Counsel shall refile the document with the correct case caption. (lih)
September 25, 2017 Case Reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 18, 2017 Filing 65 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Borg-Warner Morse TEC, LLC.(Donelson, Matthew) Modified on 9/19/2017 (lih).
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER- Status Report and proposed scheduling order due by 11/6/2017. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/14/2017. (lih)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re #58 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Northrop Grumman Corporation. Northrop Grumman Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno on 9/13/2017. (fms)
September 12, 2017 Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boeing Company, Borg-Warner Morse TEC, LLC, Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, Ford Motor Company, General Electric Company, Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, Lockheed Martin Corp., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Northrop Grumman Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Union Carbide Corporation- filed by Elizabeth Alice Dove, Roxane Audrey Huey.(lih)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #59 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/12/2017. (lih)
September 12, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to conversation with counsel, the letters previously filed as D.I. numbers 61 and 62 have been deleted. A revised version of the letter will be re-filed at a later time. (lih)
September 11, 2017 Filing 61 Letter to Hon. Sherry R. Fallon from James D. Heisman regarding Status of Stay. (Heisman, James) Modified on 9/12/2017 (lih). Modified on 9/12/2017 (lih).
September 11, 2017 REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #59 . (lih)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Eduardo C. Robreno on 8/28/2017. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(rjb)
August 8, 2017 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint - filed by Gus Dove. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 First Amended Complaint (Clean Version), #4 First Amended Complaint (Redlined), #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1, #7 Certificate of Service)(Heisman, James) Modified on 9/11/2017 (lih).
August 7, 2017 Filing 58 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Rappaport, Nancy)
July 25, 2017 Case Reassigned to Judge Eduardo C. Robreno of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship). Please include the initials of the Judge (ER) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #57 Letter; #56 Stipulation. The parties are to file a status report, limited to no more than four (4) pages, addressing the stay and entry of an amended scheduling order, upon substitution of the proper party plaintiff or upon expiration of the 90 day period in F.R.C.P. 25(a)(1), expiring on 9/11/2017. The Notice of Suggestion of Death of Gus Dove was filed on 6/13/17 re D.I. #54 . Set Deadlines: ( Status Report due by 9/11/2017.) Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/19/2017. (lih)
July 17, 2017 Filing 57 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Jessica L. Tyler regarding Request to Modify Court's 7-14-17 Oral Order. (Tyler, Jessica) Modified on 7/18/2017 (lih).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- granting #56 Joint STIPULATION to Stay the Case and Withdraw Discovery. The parties shall file a status report, limited to no more than four (4) pages, addressing the stay and entry of an amended scheduling order, upon substitution of the proper party plaintiff or upon expiration of the 90 day period in F.R.C.P. 25(a)(1), expiring on 10/16/2017. Set Deadlines: ( Status Report due by 10/16/2017.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/14/2017. (lih)
July 14, 2017 Case Stayed (lih)
July 13, 2017 Filing 56 Joint STIPULATION to Stay the Case and Withdraw Discovery Directed to The Boeing Company and Lockheed Martin Corporation by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Tyler, Jessica)
July 13, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The stipulation previously filed as D.I. 56 has been deleted per the request of counsel. (lih)
June 26, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Tyler, Jessica)
June 13, 2017 Filing 54 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Gus Dove by Ingersoll Rand Company, Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Tyler, Jessica)
May 15, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
May 15, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Borg-Warner Morse TEC, LLC.(Donelson, Matthew)
May 15, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notice of service previously filed as D.I. 52 due to document being captioned with the case information for CA 16-1119. (lih)
April 17, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of D.I. #51 has been modified to reflect the entry of appearance of Ann Marie Kashishian for defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Polito, Rebecca)
April 14, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Marie Kashishian on behalf of Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Kashishian, Ann) Modified on 4/17/2017 (Polito, Rebecca).
April 11, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Browning, Ryan)
April 11, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Boeing Company.(Cree, Jennifer)
April 11, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Northrop Grumman Corporation filed by Northrop Grumman Corporation.(Rappaport, Nancy)
April 10, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by General Electric Company.(Texter, Allison)
April 10, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Union Carbide Corporation.(Naylor, Joseph)
April 10, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC.(Valocchi, Beth)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Patricia Yee filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/7/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
April 5, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Patricia Yee - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Della Porta, Armand)
April 4, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE of PLAINTIFFS CROSS NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE ORAL & VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF GUS DOVE FOR USE AT by Gus Dove (Heisman, James)
April 3, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gus Dove on April 6, 2017 filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
March 31, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Bryan P. Smith as co-counsel. Reason for request: Attorney no longer with firm. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cree, Jennifer)
March 30, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Cree on behalf of Boeing Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cree, Jennifer)
March 30, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
March 29, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Tyler, Jessica)
March 28, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Honeywell International, Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #33 Proposed Order filed by Ingersoll Rand Company, SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2017., Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2017., Status Report due by 11/6/2017., A Status Conference is set for 11/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon, Dispositive Motions due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/28/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
March 27, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of filed by Gus Dove. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS RULE 26(A)(l) INITIAL DISCLOSURES)(Heisman, James)
March 27, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Service of Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Pneumo Abex LLC (Reese, C.)
March 20, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant IMO Industries Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by IMO Industries, Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Spence Packer filed by Gus Dove. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/15/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
March 13, 2017 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling by Ingersoll Rand Company. (Tyler, Jessica)
March 10, 2017 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Henkel Corporation, Other Affiliate Henkel AG & Co. KGaA, Other Affiliate Henkel of America, Inc.,, Other Affiliate Henkel of America I LLC for Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC filed by Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC. (Valocchi, Beth)
March 10, 2017 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC. (Valocchi, Beth)
March 6, 2017 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Rappaport, Nancy)
March 6, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Spence Packer - filed by Gus Dove. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Heisman, James)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #27 Letter - The parties shall submit a revised proposed scheduling order on or before March 13, 2017. The parties shall file the revised scheduling order using the "Proposed Order" event code. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/6/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
March 6, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 3/6/2017. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (Polito, Rebecca)
March 3, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gus Dove on April 6, 2017 filed by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Tyler, Jessica)
March 2, 2017 Filing 27 Letter to The Honorable Sherry F. Fallon from Jessica L. Tyler, Esquire regarding Enclosing Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Tyler, Jessica) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/2/2017) (Polito, Rebecca). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/2/2017) (Polito, Rebecca).
March 2, 2017 Remark - The pdf file at Attachment 1 of D.I. #27 has been replaced per the request of the filer. (Polito, Rebecca)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Oral Order Setting Rule 16(b) Telephonic Scheduling Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) A Scheduling Teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 3/6/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than March 2, 2017. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/24/2017. (Polito, Rebecca)
February 23, 2017 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian)
February 23, 2017 Filing 25 STATEMENT PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT TO THE COURT by Gus Dove. (Heisman, James)
February 17, 2017 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ford Motor Company. (Singewald, Christian)
February 10, 2017 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury of 12 Demanded , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ingersoll Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Entry of Appearance of Armand J. Della Porta, Esquire, Ana Marina McCann, Esquire, Jessica L. Tyler, Esquire and Jennifer D. SMith, Esquire on behalf of Ingersoll Rand Company, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant, Ingersoll Rand Company)(Tyler, Jessica)
February 9, 2017 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Browning, Ryan)
February 9, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan William Browning on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Browning, Ryan)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/9/17. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (kjk) Modified on 2/10/2017 (cak).
February 7, 2017 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc. filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
February 3, 2017 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle)
February 3, 2017 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Honeywell International, Inc. filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
February 2, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Donelson on behalf of Borg-Warner Morse TEC, LLC (Donelson, Matthew)
February 2, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notice of appearance for Rochelle Gumapac due to the attorney having been added to the docket per D.I. #15 . Counsel is advised that when filing a notice of appearance on behalf of multiple attorneys from the same firm, only one notice of appearance should be filed and the remaining attorneys will be added to the docket by the docket clerk. (lih)
February 1, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J. Singewald on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
January 31, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
January 27, 2017 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Naylor, Joseph)
January 27, 2017 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate General Electric Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate GE Capital, Other Affiliate NBC Universal Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate General Electric Capital Services, Inc., Other Affiliate ValueVision Media, Inc., Other Affiliate Universal City Development Partners, Ltd., Other Affiliate NBC Universal Media, LLC (a/k/a NBC Universal) for General Electric Company filed by General Electric Company. (Valocchi, Beth)
January 27, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Edward Martyniak on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Martyniak, Shawn)
January 27, 2017 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Boeing Company. (Smith, Bryan)
January 27, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Florax, Joelle)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/26/2017. (nmfn)
January 25, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00056-SLR, 1:17-cv-00057-SLR (rjb)
January 24, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Reese on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Reese, C.)
January 20, 2017 Filing 6 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 filed by Northrop Grumman Corporation.(Rappaport, Nancy)
January 20, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation's Joinder of Removal and Independent Notice of Removal by Northrop Grumman Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rappaport, Nancy)
January 20, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Defendant The Boeing Company's Joinder of Removal and Independent Notice of Removal by Boeing Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Bryan)
January 20, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: Removed NOTICE of Defendant The Boeing Company's Notice of Removal by Boeing Company per request of filer (Filed in error). (rwc)
January 20, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: Put documents in entry for case # 17 cv 57 by accident, swapped documents to reflect in the right case. (sar)
January 19, 2017 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (sar)
January 19, 2017 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
January 19, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior CT, Case Number N16C-12-00082 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2068349)- filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dove v. Boeing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Whitney L. Frame
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Smith
Represented By: Jennifer L. Cree
Represented By: Paul Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Smith
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse TEC, LLC
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Represented By: Rochelle Libid Gumapac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Signal, Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sally J. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Nancy Shane Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Ann Marie Kashishian
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Paul Seward
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Joseph S. Naylor
Represented By: Shawn Edward Martyniak
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corp.
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Laura P. Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: C. Scott Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gus Dove
Represented By: James D. Heisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Alice Dove
Represented By: James D. Heisman
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxane Audrey Huey
Represented By: James D. Heisman
Represented By: R. Joseph Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?