Adams v. Carney
Plaintiff: James R. Adams
Defendant: John Carney
Case Number: 1:2017cv00181
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2017)
Presiding Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM ORDER IT IS ORDERED that defendant's Motion to Stay 63 is GRANTED. The court's judgment Order 39 62 is hereby STAYED pending appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/25/18. (cak)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION Clarifying the Court's Opinion Issued December 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/23/18. (cak) (Main Document 61 replaced on 5/23/2018) (cak).
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 31 and denying defendant's motion for summary judgment 28 . Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/6/17. (cak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Adams
Represented By: David L. Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carney
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Connell
Represented By: Roopa Sabesan
Represented By: Christian D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?