Harding et al v. A.O. Smith Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael R. Harding and Sally Harding
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Burnham LLC, Carrier Corporation, CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Crosby Valve LLC, DAP Products, Inc., Dominion Generation Corporation, Dominion Nuclear Connecticut, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Excelon Corporation, FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific LLC, IMO Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation, National Grid Generation LLC, Peerless industries, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Sequoia Ventures, Inc., Slant/Fin Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc, Warren Pumps, LLC and Marley-Wylain Company
Cross_claimant: FMC Corporation, Sequoia Ventures, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc and Warren Pumps, LLC
Cross_defendant: FMC Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Burnham LLC, CBS Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Crane Co., Crosby Valve LLC, DAP Products, Inc., Dominion Generation Corporation, Dominion Nuclear Connecticut, Inc., ECR International, Inc., Excelon Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific LLC, IMO Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation, Marley-Wylain Company, National Grid Generation LLC, Peerless industries, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Sequoia Ventures, Inc., Slant/Fin Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc and Warren Pumps, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00251
Filed: March 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2017)
Presiding Judge: Sherry R. Fallon
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER ADOPTING 242 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/6/2020. (dlw)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for Order of Dismissal. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/10/2019. (lih)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER ADOPTING 213 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; GRANTING-IN-PART and DENYING-IN-PART 168 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment of no punitive damages is GRANTED. Summary judgment with respect to all other claims is DENIED. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/6/2019. (dlw)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re 168 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/5/2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/22/2019. (lih)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- granting 60 MOTION to Dismiss. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2017. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/14/2017. (lih)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harding et al v. A.O. Smith Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Harding
Represented By: Adam Balick
Represented By: Andrew Caulfield Dalton
Represented By: Bartholomew J. Dalton
Represented By: Ipek Kurul Medford
Represented By: Michael Collins Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Harding
Represented By: Adam Balick
Represented By: Andrew Caulfield Dalton
Represented By: Bartholomew J. Dalton
Represented By: Ipek Kurul Medford
Represented By: Michael Collins Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Generation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Nuclear Connecticut, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECR International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excelon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Whitney L. Frame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Grid Generation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slant/Fin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Antoinette D. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Boiler Works, Inc
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marley-Wylain Company
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Sequoia Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Superior Boiler Works, Inc
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Burnham LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Goldman
Represented By: Robert S. Goldman
Represented By: Robert S. Goldman
Represented By: Robert S. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crosby Valve LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: DAP Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Dominion Generation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Dominion Nuclear Connecticut, Inc.
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: ECR International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Excelon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Whitney L. Frame
Represented By: Whitney L. Frame
Represented By: Whitney L. Frame
Represented By: Whitney L. Frame
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Marley-Wylain Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: National Grid Generation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Peerless industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall
Represented By: Jonathan L. Parshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Sequoia Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Represented By: Daniel Partick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Slant/Fin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Antoinette D. Hubbard
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Antoinette D. Hubbard
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Antoinette D. Hubbard
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Antoinette D. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Superior Boiler Works, Inc
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?