Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al v. Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc.
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., Indoco Remedies Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Hetero USA Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Apotex Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Sunshine Lake LLC, Impax Laboratories Inc., Accord Healthcare Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd., Lupin Ltd., Micro Labs Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd., Wockhardt USA LLC, Impax Laboratories LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc., Natco Pharma Ltd., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd., Bionpharma Inc., HEC Pharm USA Inc., Apotex Corp., Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-V, Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Micro Labs USA Inc., InvaGen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Sandoz Inc. and Wockhardt Bio AG
Case Number: 1:2017cv00374
Filed: April 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #496 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve Reply Expert Reports to 5/22/2019 filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/14/19. (ntl)
May 10, 2019 Filing 496 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to serve Reply Expert Reports to 5/22/2019 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #495 Stipulation of Dismissal -- Party Sandoz Inc. terminated. Attorney Dominick T. Gattuso; Tara M. Raghaven; William A. Rakoczy; Katie A. Boda and Kevin P. Burke terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/7/19. (ntl)
May 2, 2019 Filing 495 STIPULATION of Dismissal between Plaintiff and Defendant Sandoz Inc. by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #494 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs and Defendant Sandoz Inc. to serve: (i) Responsive Expert Reports and (i) Reply Expert Reports concerning infringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945 to (i) 4/29/2019 and (ii) 5/28/2019 filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/1/19. (ntl)
April 24, 2019 Filing 494 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs and Defendant Sandoz Inc. to serve: (i) Responsive Expert Reports and (i) Reply Expert Reports concerning infringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945 to (i) 4/29/2019 and (ii) 5/28/2019 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #493 STIPULATION between Plaintiffs and Defendants Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. regarding Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/24/19. (ntl)
April 22, 2019 Filing 493 STIPULATION between Plaintiffs and Defendants Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. regarding Infringement by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #485 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to serve their responsive expert report and Plaintiffs to serve their reply(ies) to Defendants' responsive expert report to April 19, 2019 and May 17, 2019, respectively filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/22/19. (ntl)
April 22, 2019 Filing 492 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Expert Report Of Bart Kahr, Ph.D., Regarding Noninfringement Of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945 [Competitively Sensitive Confidential Information Of Dr. Reddys Subject To Protective Order] filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(Moore, David)
April 18, 2019 Filing 491 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's [COMPETITIVELY SENSITIVE/TRADE SECRET/CONFIDENTIAL] Responsive Report of Robert Schurko, Ph.D.; (2) Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's [COMPETITIVELY SENSITIVE/TRADE SECRET/CONFIDENTIAL] Rebuttal Expert Report of Michael Zaworotko, Ph.D.; and (3) Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's [COMPETITIVELY SENSITIVE/CONFIDENTIAL] Rebuttal Expert Report of David Apperley, Ph.D. filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
April 18, 2019 Filing 490 NOTICE OF SERVICE of [CONFIDENTIAL] Rebuttal Expert Report of Clayton R. Heathcock, Ph.D. filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc., Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
April 18, 2019 Filing 489 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Rebuttal Expert Report of Mark J. Sacchetti, Ph.D., Regarding Noninfringement filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 488 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rebuttal Expert Report of Harry G. Brittain, Ph.D., FAAPS, FRSC filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
April 17, 2019 Filing 487 NOTICE OF SERVICE of [CONFIDENTIAL] Rebuttal Noninfringement Expert Report of Defendant Unichem's Expert Witness Wayne J. Genck, Ph.D. filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 486 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Rebuttal Expert Report of Eric N. Jacobsen, Ph.D.; (ii) Expert Report of Michael E. Tate; (iii) Rebuttal Expert Report of Peter R. Kowey, M.D. Concerning Validity of U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208; (iv) Rebuttal Expert Report of Allan S. Myerson, Ph.D. Regarding the Validity of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945 and U.S. Patent No. 6,697,208; and (v) Rebuttal Expert Report of David W.C. Macmillan, Ph.D., concerning Validity of U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
April 17, 2019 Filing 485 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to serve their responsive expert report and Plaintiffs to serve their reply(ies) to Defendants' responsive expert report to April 19, 2019 and May 17, 2019, respectively - filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.. (Moore, David)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #484 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs and Defendant Sandoz Inc. to serve (i) Responsive Expert Reports concerning infringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945 and (ii) Reply Expert Reports to (i) 4/24/2019 and (ii) 5/22/2019 filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/17/19. (ntl)
April 15, 2019 Filing 484 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs and Defendant Sandoz Inc. to serve (i) Responsive Expert Reports concerning infringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945 and (ii) Reply Expert Reports to (i) 4/24/2019 and (ii) 5/22/2019 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #483 STIPULATION Regarding Infringement between Plaintiffs and Defendant Unichem Laboratories, Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/2/19. (ntl)
March 29, 2019 Filing 483 STIPULATION Regarding Infringement between Plaintiffs and Defendant Unichem Laboratories, Ltd. by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 482 NOTICE of Change of Address by Arthur G. Connolly, III (Connolly, Arthur)
February 19, 2019 Filing 481 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding February 5, 2019 letter - re #474 Letter. (Phillips, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 480 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Opening Expert Report of Peter R. Kowey, M.D. Concerning Aurobindo's Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208; (2) Opening Expert Report of David W.C. Macmillan, Ph.D. Concerning Aurobindo's Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208; (3) Opening Expert Report of Jerry L. Atwood, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement by Aurobindo of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945; (4) Opening Expert Report of Peter R. Kowey, M.D. Concerning Unichem's Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208; (5) Opening Expert Report of David W.C. Macmillan, Ph.D. Concerning Unichem's Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208; (6) Opening Expert Report of Jerry L. Atwood, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement by Defendant Unichem Laboratories, Ltd. of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945; (7) Opening Expert Report of Cory J. Berkland, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement by Defendant Unichem Laboratories, Ltd. of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945; (8) Opening Expert Report of Jerry L. Atwood, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement by Dr. Reddy's Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945; (9) Opening Expert Report of Dr. Eric Munson Regarding Infringement by Defendant Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Limited of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945; (10) Opening Expert Report of Jerry L. Atwood, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement by Sandoz Inc. of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945; (11) Opening Expert Report of Peter R. Kowey, M.D. Concerning Sigmapharm's Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208; (12) Opening Expert Report of David W.C. Macmillan, Ph.D. Concerning Sigmapharm's Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208; (13) Opening Expert Report of Dr. Eric Munson Regarding Infringement by Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945; (14) Opening Expert Report of Jerry L. Atwood, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement by Sigmapharm Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945; (15) Opening Expert Report of Jerry L. Atwood, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement by Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. and HEC Pharm USA Inc. of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945; (16) Opening Expert Report of Peter R. Kowey, M.D. Concerning Zydus's Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208; (17) Opening Expert Report of David W.C. Macmillan, Ph.D. Concerning Zydus's Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208; (18) Opening Expert Report of Jerry L. Atwood, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945; (19) Opening Expert Report of Dr. Eric Munson Regarding Infringement By Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. of U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
February 18, 2019 Filing 479 NOTICE OF SERVICE of [CONFIDENTIAL] Expert Report of Dr. Graham Buckton, BPharm, AKC, C.Dir, PhD, DSc, CChem, FRSC, FAPS, FAAPS, FRPharmS filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 18, 2019 Filing 478 NOTICE OF SERVICE of [CONFIDENTIAL] Opening Expert Report of Walter G. Chambliss, Ph.D. filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 18, 2019 Filing 477 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Opening Expert Report of Salvatore D. Lepore, Ph.D. on Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208 filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 18, 2019 Filing 476 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Clayton H. Heathcock, Ph.D. filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #475 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kendall K. Gurule filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/11/19. (ntl)
February 8, 2019 Filing 475 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kendall K. Gurule - filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd.. (Pascale, Karen)
February 5, 2019 Filing 474 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding request for discovery dispute teleconference. (Phillips, John)
February 1, 2019 Filing 473 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Final Infringement Contentions (Sunshine Lake) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #469 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline for Plaintiffs' Final Infringement Contentions for Sunshine Lake Defendants to 2/1/2019 filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/25/19. (ntl)
January 25, 2019 Filing 472 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions Relating to U.S. Patent No. 6,697,208 filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 471 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Amended Invalidity Contentions Relating to U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945 [Confidential - Subject to Protective Order] filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
January 25, 2019 Filing 470 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc.'s Final Infringement Contentions filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
January 23, 2019 Filing 469 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline for Plaintiffs' Final Infringement Contentions for Sunshine Lake Defendants to 2/1/2019 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
January 4, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 468 has been replaced with the correct version as per request of counsel. (etg)
January 4, 2019 Filing 468 Interim STATUS REPORT by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael) (Main Document 468 replaced on 1/4/2019) (etg).
December 28, 2018 Filing 467 Redaction of #455 Transcript. Telephone conference held on November 30, 2018 before Chief Judge Stark. Court Reporter, Brian Gaffigan (302) 573-6360. (bpg)
December 21, 2018 Filing 466 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Digesh Patel on 12/28/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
December 20, 2018 Filing 465 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Second Amended and Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories (Nos. 1-17); (2) Plaintiffs' First Amended and Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Joint Interrogatories (Nos. 18-21); (3) Plaintiffs' First Amended and Supplemental Objections and Responses to Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd.'s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories; (4) Plaintiffs' First Amended and Supplemental Objections and Responses to Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-4); and (5) Plaintiffs' First Amended and Supplemental Objections and Responses to Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 5-9) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
December 20, 2018 Filing 464 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shoba Chagam on 1/10/2019 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
December 20, 2018 Filing 463 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Common Interrogatory No. 6 (Competitively Sensitive Confidential Information of Dr. Reddy's - Subject to Protective Order) and Defendants' First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 11-12 and 16) (Competitively Sensitive Confidential Information of Dr. Reddy's - Subject to Protective Order) filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
December 20, 2018 Filing 462 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Second Supplemental Objections and Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 6,7) (designated Confidential - Subject to Protective Order] filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
December 20, 2018 Filing 461 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] First Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Common Interrogatory No. 6 filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
December 20, 2018 Filing 460 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Common Interrogatory Nos. 1-17 filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
December 18, 2018 Filing 459 REDACTED VERSION of #454 MOTION to Redact Transcript (Unopposed) by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibits A-B)(Phillips, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 458 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants HEC Pharm USA Inc.'s and Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.'s Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Vrana, Robert)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORAL ORDER: At the request of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery teleconference scheduled for December 21 is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/13/18. (ntl)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER re #454 MOTION to Redact Transcript (Unopposed) filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/13/18. (ntl)
December 12, 2018 Filing 455 [SEALED] Transcript of Telephone Conference held on November 30, 2018 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. (bpg)
December 11, 2018 Filing 454 [SEALED] MOTION to Redact Transcript (Unopposed) - filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 453 SO ORDERED, re #441 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company -- Party Indoco Remedies Ltd. terminated. Attorney Thomas A. Haag; Jamaica P. Szeliga; Sean M. Brennecke and Dean L. Fanelli terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/18. (ntl)
December 11, 2018 Filing 452 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Request to Cancel December 21, 2018 Hearing - re 451 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Farnan, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for December 21, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than December 12, 2018, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than December 14, 2018, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/10/18. (ntl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 450 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding transcript of November 30, 2018 teleconference. (Phillips, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 449 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Srinivas Gurram on December 20, 2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 448 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Basil Theofanopoulos on 12/18/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 447 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lokanath Lenka on 12/12/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 446 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Disha Patel on 12/11/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 445 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Spiro Spireas on 12/19/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
December 4, 2018 Filing 444 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Weiheng (Kevin) Kong on 12/11/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
December 3, 2018 Filing 443 NOTICE of of Intent to Request Redactions by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC (Phillips, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 442 REDACTED VERSION of #438 Letter by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 11/30/2018. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
November 30, 2018 Filing 441 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Indoco Remedies Ltd.) by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 440 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Request for Discovery Teleconference. (Farnan, Brian)
November 27, 2018 Filing 439 REDACTED VERSION of #427 Letter by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H)(Bilson, David)
November 26, 2018 Filing 438 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Sigmapharm's November 20, 2018 Letter - re #427 Letter. (Farnan, Michael)
November 21, 2018 Filing 437 REDACTED VERSION of #416 Letter, by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7)(Farnan, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 436 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hemant Kumar Sharma on 12/19/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 435 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Arnab Roy on 12/18/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 434 NOTICE to Take Deposition of V. Sumathi Rao on 12/18/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 433 NOTICE to Take Deposition of V.K. Handa on 12/17/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 432 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Prince Kumar Devadas on 12/19/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 431 NOTICE to Take Deposition of K.K.C. Dasarathi on 12/20/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 430 NOTICE to Take Deposition of D. Krishnama Chary on 12/17/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 429 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nilesh Bhandari on 12/18/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 428 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bapuji A.T. on 12/17/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 427 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from David A. Bilson regarding Response to Plaintiffs' November 14, 2018 Discovery Dispute Letter - re #416 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - H)(Bilson, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 426 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Sandoz Inc.'s First Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-57); (2) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s First Set of Individual Requests for Production; (3) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 5-9); (4) Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-15); and (5) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc., and Unichem Laboratories Ltd.'s First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-15) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
November 19, 2018 Filing 425 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (No. 1) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 424 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandoz Inc.'s REsponse to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Sandoz (Designated Confidential - Subjectd to Protective Order and this Notice of Service filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 423 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's Answers and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 422 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 421 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.'s Responses And Objections To Plaintiffs' First Set Of Interrogatories To Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. And Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. (No. 1) [COMPETITIVELY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION OF DR. REDDY'S SUBJECT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER] filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(Moore, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 420 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Second Supplemental Designated Witnesses in Response to Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 419 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Supplemental Designated Witnesses in Response to Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 418 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kumar Singh on 12/12/2018 (Second Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER: Consistent with the Memorandum Opinion and Order entered on 10/18/18, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that C.A. No. 17-379-LPS is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/14/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS, 1:17-cv-00379-LPS (ntl)
November 14, 2018 Filing 416 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute between Plaintiffs and Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Farnan, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 415 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute between Plaintiffs and Unichem Laboratories - re #386 Letter. (Farnan, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #399 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/8/18. (ntl)
November 13, 2018 Filing 414 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.'s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants HEC Pharm USA Inc. and Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
November 13, 2018 Filing 413 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandoz Inc.'s Objections and Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
November 13, 2018 Filing 412 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-30) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 411 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 410 NOTICE OF SERVICE of [CONFIDENTIAL] Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 409 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants HEC Pharm USA Inc.'s and Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.'s Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
November 13, 2018 Filing 408 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-22) [Competitively Sensitive Confidential Information of Dr. Reddy's - Subject to Protective Order] filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(Moore, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 407 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma LTD.S' Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Individual Defendant Aurobindo and Defendants Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma LTD.s' Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendants Aurobindo re #361 Notice of Service,,,, #392 Notice of Service,,,, filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
November 13, 2018 Filing 406 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bijay Padhi. on 11/20/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 13, 2018 Filing 405 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Arjit Das on 11/19/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 12, 2018 Filing 404 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Second Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Interrogatory No. 6 and Supplemental Responses and Objections to Interrogatory No. 7 filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
November 12, 2018 Filing 403 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mangesh Sahane on 11/16/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 9, 2018 Filing 402 Joint STATUS REPORT by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian)
November 8, 2018 Filing 401 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Govind Dagdu Shinde on 12/19/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for November 30, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than November 14, 2018, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than November 16, 2018, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/7/18. (ntl)
November 6, 2018 Filing 399 STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
November 6, 2018 Filing 398 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
October 29, 2018 Filing 397 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vatsal Shah on 11/2/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Filing 396 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vijay Raghavan on 11/2/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David A. Gerasimow for Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #394 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Gerasimow filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/26/18. (ntl)
October 25, 2018 Filing 395 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Request for Discovery Teleconference between Plaintiffs and Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC. (Farnan, Michael)
October 25, 2018 Filing 394 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Gerasimow - filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David A. Gerasimow)(Bilson, David)
October 24, 2018 Filing 393 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Erin M. Forbes by Sandoz Inc. (Gattuso, Dominick)
October 19, 2018 Filing 392 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.; (2) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.; (3) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants HEC Pharm USA Inc. and Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.; (4) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.; (5) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd.; (6) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Indoco Remedies Ltd.; (7) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Sandoz Inc.; (8) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC; and (9) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
October 19, 2018 Filing 391 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Barry Jacobsen on November 14, 2018 filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
October 19, 2018 Filing 390 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd., HEC Pharm USA Inc., and Unichem Laboratories Ltd.'s First Set of Requests for Admissions to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc. filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd., Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
October 19, 2018 Filing 389 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Sandoz Inc.'s First Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-57), and 2) Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s First Set of Individual Requests for Production to Plaintiffs (No. 1) filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
October 19, 2018 Filing 388 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's (1) [CONFIDENTIAL] First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-15); and (2) [CONFIDENTIAL] Second Set of Defendant Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 5-9) filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
October 19, 2018 Filing 387 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Elizabeth Purcell Pastor on 11/9/2018 (Second Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 19, 2018 Filing 386 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Request for Discovery Teleconference. (Farnan, Michael)
October 19, 2018 Filing 385 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kumar Singh on 11/14/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 19, 2018 Filing 384 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Elizabeth Purcell Pastor on 11/6/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER re (382 in 1:17-cv-00374-LPS, 69 in 1:17-cv-00379-LPS) Memorandum Opinion -- (178 in 1:17-cv-00374-LPS) MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS, 1:17-cv-00379-LPS (ntl) (ntl).
October 18, 2018 Filing 382 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #178 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS, 1:17-cv-00379-LPS (ntl)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER re #380 Memorandum Opinion re claim construction; #258 MOTION to Strike filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd. is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/18. (ntl)
October 18, 2018 Filing 380 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/18. (ntl)
October 18, 2018 Filing 379 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Mitchell on 11/19/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 18, 2018 Filing 378 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Grant Heinicke on 11/20/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 18, 2018 Filing 377 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bradley Davis on 10/24/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 376 NOTICE to Take Deposition of G. Kesevan on 11/2/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 375 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vimal Kaneria on 10/31/2018 (Amended) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 374 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kavita Inamdar on 11/15/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 373 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Anuj Srivastava on 10/25/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 372 NOTICE to Take Deposition of ERR Chandrasekhar on 11/16/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 371 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sachin Arora on 11/14/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 370 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tijana Ljubin on 11/8/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 369 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Melissa Henry on 11/6/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 368 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mateja Sikovec on 11/19/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 367 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vatsal Shah on 11/20/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 366 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sapna Ramesh on 11/9/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 365 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Adity Sen Pal on 11/8/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 364 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Roopak Sawhney on 11/20/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 363 NOTICE to Take Deposition of V. Naga Prasad on 11/19/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 15, 2018 Filing 362 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-4) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
October 12, 2018 Filing 361 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.; (2) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.; (3) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendants HEC Pharm USA Inc. and Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.; (4) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.; (5) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendants Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Inc. and Dr. Reddys Laboratories, Ltd.; (6) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Indoco Remedies Ltd.; (7) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Sandoz Inc.; (8) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC; and (9) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission to Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
October 12, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wenbo Zhang, Charles T. Cox, Jr, Michael Nelson, and Wenli Gu for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 360 NOTICE of Deposition of Stephanie Koch on October 16-17, 2018 by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. (Connolly, Arthur)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #355 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wenbo Zhang, Charles T. Cox, Jr., Michael Nelson, and Wenli Gu filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/11/2018. (etg)
October 10, 2018 Filing 359 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kumar Singh on 11/14/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 358 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Elizabeth Purcell on 11/6/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 357 NOTICE to Take Deposition of G. Kesevan on 11/2/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 356 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vimal Kaneria on 10/31/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 355 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wenbo Zhang, Charles T. Cox, Jr., Michael Nelson, and Wenli Gu - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
October 9, 2018 Filing 354 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Supplemental Initial Disclosures of Unichem Laboratories, Ltd. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); and (2) Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Interrogatory Nos. 11, 12, 14 and 16 filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
October 8, 2018 Filing 353 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bijay Padhi on 11/20/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 8, 2018 Filing 352 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Arjit Das on 11/19/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 351 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Corrected First Amended Supplemental Objections & Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
October 5, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Katie A. Boda,Kevin P. Burke for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
October 3, 2018 Filing 350 REDACTED VERSION of #324 Letter by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 349 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Srinivas Guram/G. Srinivas on 11/5/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 348 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chintan Dholakia on 11/6/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 347 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pravin Maurya on 10/26/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 346 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mangesh Shahane on 10/25/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 345 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yong (Eddy) Chen on 11/5/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 344 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shoba Chagam on 11/6/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 343 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Privilege Log of Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. and HEC Pharm USA, Inc. filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
October 1, 2018 Filing 342 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Joint Interrogatories filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
October 1, 2018 Filing 341 REDACTED VERSION of #315 Letter by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Phillips, John)
September 28, 2018 Filing 340 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Pavak Mehta on 10/26/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 339 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Digesh Patel on 10/25/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 338 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jinsong You on 11/14/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 337 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Qibiao Huang on 11/13/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 336 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Govind Dagdu Shinde on 10/29/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 335 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Srikant Pimple on 11/5/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 334 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sachin Bali on 11/6/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 333 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Irina Yakobson on 11/2/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 332 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vaibhav Patel on 10/31/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 331 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Basil Theofanopoulos on 10/29/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 330 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nilam Patel on 11/1/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 329 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lokanath Lenka on 10/30/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 328 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Disha Patel on 11/5/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 327 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ruth Wexler on November 16, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 26, 2018 Filing 326 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Knabb on November 9, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 26, 2018 Filing 325 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Anthony Mancini on November 1, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #298 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin P. Burke and Katie A. Boda filed by Sandoz Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/26/18. (ntl)
September 26, 2018 Filing 324 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Defendants' September 24, 2018 letter - re #315 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael)
September 24, 2018 Filing 323 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Designated Witnesses in Response to Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) and Mylan Pharmaceutical Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 24, 2018 Filing 322 NOTICE of Service of Defendant Indoco Remedies Ltd.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc.'s Rule 30(b)(6) Notice and Defendant Indoco Remedies Ltd.'s Designated Witnesses in Response to Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice by Indoco Remedies Ltd. (Brennecke, Sean)
September 24, 2018 Filing 321 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. AND DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 30(b)(6) [COMPETITIVELY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION OF DR. REDDY'S-SUBJECT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER]; and DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD. AND DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, INC.'S DESIGNATED WITNESSES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 30(b)(6) [COMPETITIVELY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION OF DR. REDDY'S-SUBJECT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER] filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
September 24, 2018 Filing 320 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandoz Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) [Competitively Sensitive Confidential Information of Sandoz Inc. - Subject to Protective Order] filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 24, 2018 Filing 319 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.'s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice, and 2) Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.'s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.'s Designation of Witness in Response to Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
September 24, 2018 Filing 318 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6); and (2) Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Designated Witnesses in Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Phillips, John)
September 24, 2018 Filing 317 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #299 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/24/18. (ntl)
September 24, 2018 Filing 316 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Unichem Laboratories Ltd.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6); and (2) Defendant Unichem Laboratories Ltd.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Designated Witness in Response to Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 315 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Supplemental Claim Construction Information. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D)(Phillips, John)
September 21, 2018 Filing 314 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Wei Han on October 26, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 21, 2018 Filing 313 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephanie L. Koch on October 16, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 21, 2018 Filing 312 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patrick Y. S. Lam on November 1, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 21, 2018 Filing 311 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mimi L. Quan on November 15, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 21, 2018 Filing 310 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael J. Orwat on October 17, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 21, 2018 Filing 309 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jennifer X. Qiao on October 23, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 21, 2018 Filing 308 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Donald J. Pinto on October 9, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
September 21, 2018 Filing 307 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Amended Supplemental Objections & Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 306 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc.'s Response to Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.'s Frist Set of Individual Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-5) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 305 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chandra Vemavarapu on October 24, 2018 / Amended Notice filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 21, 2018 Filing 304 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jatin Patel on October 10, 2018 / Amended Notice filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 21, 2018 Filing 303 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jingpin Jia on October 18, 2018 / Amended Notice filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 21, 2018 Filing 302 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Charles Frost on September 27, 2018//Amended Notice filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 19, 2018 Filing 301 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Supplemental Objections and Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 3-5, 7, 9-10) filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 18, 2018 Filing 300 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.'s Responses and Objections to Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice and Plaintiff Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.'s Designated Witnesses in Response to Defendants' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
September 18, 2018 Filing 299 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Farnan, Michael)
September 18, 2018 Filing 298 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin P. Burke and Katie A. Boda - filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
September 14, 2018 Filing 297 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] First Set of Defendant Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-4) filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #293 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James Nealon filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/14/18. (ntl)
September 11, 2018 Filing 296 Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing held on September 6, 2018 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2018. (bpg)
September 7, 2018 Filing 295 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding USL Defendants supplemental slides at Markman hearing. (Attachments: #1 Attachments 1-4)(Phillips, John)
September 6, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Markman Hearing held on 9/6/2018. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
September 5, 2018 Filing 294 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Rutter on behalf of InvaGen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Rutter, Jennifer)
September 5, 2018 Filing 293 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James Nealon - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Markman Hearing scheduled for September 6 will begin at 1:00 p.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/5/18. (ntl)
September 4, 2018 Filing 291 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Pursuant to 30(b)(6) filed on behalf of Defendants filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 290 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Second Set of Joint Interrogatories to Plaitniss (18-21) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 30, 2018 Filing 289 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Wei Han on October 17, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 30, 2018 Filing 288 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephanie L. Koch on October 16, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 30, 2018 Filing 287 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Patrick Y. S. Lam on October 25, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 30, 2018 Filing 286 REDACTED VERSION of #260 Notice to Take Deposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 30, 2018 Filing 285 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jatin Patel (Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(1)) on October 24, 2018 filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 29, 2018 Filing 284 REDACTED VERSION of #262 Notice to Take Deposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 29, 2018 Filing 283 REDACTED VERSION of #264 Notice to Take Deposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 28, 2018 Filing 282 Letter to The Hon. Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Motion to Strike - re #258 MOTION to Strike Atwood Artlcle. (Phillips, John)
August 28, 2018 Filing 281 REDACTED VERSION of #266 Notice to Take Deposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 28, 2018 Filing 280 REDACTED VERSION of #265 Notice to Take Deposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 28, 2018 Filing 279 REDACTED VERSION of #263 Notice to Take Deposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 28, 2018 Filing 278 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding reply in support of USL Defendants' Motion to Strike - re #258 MOTION to Strike Atwood Artlcle. (Phillips, John)
August 28, 2018 Filing 277 REDACTED VERSION of #269 Notice to Take Deposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 28, 2018 Filing 276 REDACTED VERSION of #267 Notice to Take Deposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 28, 2018 Filing 275 REDACTED VERSION of #261 Notice to Take Deposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 28, 2018 Filing 274 REDACTED VERSION of #268 Notice to Take Deposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 28, 2018 Filing 273 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Interrogatory Nos. 5 and 6 filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
August 24, 2018 Filing 272 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mylan Pharmaceutical Inc.s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 24, 2018 Filing 271 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike - re #258 MOTION to Strike Atwood Artlcle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Farnan, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 270 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Dr. Reddy's First Set of Individual Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-5) (Contains Competitively Sensitive Confidential Information of Dr. Reddy's - Subject to Protective Order) filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
August 23, 2018 Filing 269 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 268 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Unichem Laboratories, Ltd. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 267 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd., Sunshine Lake LLC, and HEC Pharm USA Inc. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 266 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 265 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sandoz Inc. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 264 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 263 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 262 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Indoco Remedies Ltd. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 261 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Filing 260 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
August 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Annaleigh E. Curtis for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 17, 2018 Filing 259 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding in Support of Motion to Strike Atwood Article - re #258 MOTION to Strike Atwood Artlcle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Phillips, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 258 MOTION to Strike Atwood Artlcle - filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phillips, John)
August 16, 2018 Filing 257 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mimi Quan on September 18, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 16, 2018 Filing 256 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Orwat on September 19, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 16, 2018 Filing 255 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jennifer Qiao on September 24, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 16, 2018 Filing 254 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Donald J. Pinto on September 17, 2018 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 16, 2018 Filing 253 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jingpin Jia on September 27, 2018 filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 16, 2018 Filing 252 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chandra Vemavarapu on September 28, 2018 filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 16, 2018 Filing 251 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Charles Frost on October 1, 2018 filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christa J. Laser for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #249 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christa J. Laser filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, #250 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Annaleigh E. Curtis filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/13/18. (ntl)
August 10, 2018 Filing 250 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Annaleigh E. Curtis - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 10, 2018 Filing 249 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christa J. Laser - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Markman Hearing on September 6, 2018 will begin at 3:00 p.m. and each side will be allocated up to 45 minutes for argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/8/18. (ntl)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #239 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/2/18. (ntl)
August 3, 2018 Filing 247 DECLARATION re #245 Claim Construction Answering Brief Declaration of P. Branko Pejic in Support of Defendants Consolidated Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bilson, David)
August 3, 2018 Filing 246 DECLARATION re #245 Claim Construction Answering Brief Declaration of Dustin L. Taylor in Support of Defendants Consolidated Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H-M)(Bilson, David)
August 3, 2018 Filing 245 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF Defendants Consolidated Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Bilson, David)
August 3, 2018 Filing 244 DECLARATION re #243 Claim Construction Answering Brief of Timothy A. Cook by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O, #2 Exhibit P, #3 Exhibit Q, #4 Exhibit R, #5 Exhibit S, #6 Exhibit T)(Farnan, Brian)
August 3, 2018 Filing 243 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
August 3, 2018 Filing 242 Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Claim Construction Hearing. (Farnan, Brian)
August 3, 2018 Filing 241 REDACTED VERSION of (239 in 1:17-cv-00374-LPS) Stipulation of Dismissal by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
August 2, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jeffrey Hantson as co-counsel.. (Farnan, Michael)
August 1, 2018 Filing 239 [SEALED] STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
August 1, 2018 Filing 238 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc.'s Amended Preliminary Infringement Contentions to Certain Defendants filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
July 31, 2018 Filing 237 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Michael Choi as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer associated with Budd Larner, P.C.. (Ormerod, Eve)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #234 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline for the parties to file Answering Claim Construction Briefs to 8/3/2018 filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/30/18. (ntl)
July 27, 2018 Filing 236 STATEMENT // Defendants' Comments on Plaintiffs' Technology Tutorial [DI 203] by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 11)(Gattuso, Dominick)
July 27, 2018 Filing 235 STATEMENT re #202 Letter Plaintiffs' Comments on Defendants' Technology Tutorial by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Farnan, Brian)
July 26, 2018 Filing 234 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline for the parties to file Answering Claim Construction Briefs to 8/3/2018 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
July 25, 2018 Filing 233 Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2018. (bpg)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #231 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the substantial completion of document production and to file a motion to join other parties to July 30, 2018 and August 10, 2018 filed by Indoco Remedies Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/19/18. (ntl)
July 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Oral Argument held on 7/18/2018. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Markman Hearing scheduled for September 4, 2018 is CANCELLED and is re-scheduled to September 6, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. Each side will have up to 45 minutes for their presentation. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/18/18. (ntl)
July 17, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Katherine P. Kieckhafer for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #230 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine P. Kieckhafer filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/17/18. (ntl)
July 16, 2018 Filing 231 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the substantial completion of document production and to file a motion to join other parties to July 30, 2018 and August 10, 2018 - filed by Indoco Remedies Ltd.. (Brennecke, Sean)
July 16, 2018 Filing 230 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine P. Kieckhafer - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
July 13, 2018 Filing 229 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandoz Inc.'s Second Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery [Confidential - Subject to Protective Order] filed by Sandoz Inc..(Nelson, Aaron)
July 13, 2018 Filing 228 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding the Markman hearing. (Phillips, John)
July 10, 2018 Filing 227 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Wayne J. Genck on July 19, 2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
July 10, 2018 Filing 226 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Edmund J. Elder, Jr. on July 20, 2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
July 10, 2018 Filing 225 REDACTED VERSION of #213 Reply Brief by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
July 6, 2018 Filing 224 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.'s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 11-17) filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
July 3, 2018 Filing 223 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Dr. Reddy's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Defendant Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things (No. 1) (Competitively Sensitive Confidential Information of Dr. Reddy's - Subject to Protective Order) and Dr. Reddy's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 11-17) filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(Moore, David)
July 3, 2018 Filing 222 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove C. Kyle Musgrove, Elizabeth Crompton and Scott Cunning as co-counsel. Reason for request: Impax has been dismissed from case. (Bilson, David)
July 3, 2018 Filing 221 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Indoco Remedies LTD.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc.'s Second Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Indoco Remedies Ltd..(Brennecke, Sean)
July 2, 2018 Filing 220 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of Delawares Default Standard for Discovery and Mylan Pharmaceutical Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Weinblatt, Richard)
July 2, 2018 Filing 219 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things (No. 2); and (2) Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 11-17) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
July 2, 2018 Filing 218 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Objections and Answers to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 11-17) [Confidential - Subject to Protective Order] filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
July 2, 2018 Filing 217 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 11-17); and (2) Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
July 2, 2018 Filing 216 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Responses to 2nd Common Interrogatories (11-17) filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
July 2, 2018 Filing 215 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Objections And Responses To Plaintiffs Second Set Of Common Interrogatories filed by InvaGen Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
July 2, 2018 Filing 214 DECLARATION re #213 Reply Brief of Brandon M. White by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18, #2 Exhibit 19, #3 Exhibit 20)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
July 2, 2018 Filing 213 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #178 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #211 Stipulation of Dismissal of Impax Laboratories, LLC filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/2/18. (ntl)
July 2, 2018 Filing 212 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's [COMPETITIVELY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION OF SIGMAPHARM LABORATORIES, LLC - SUBJECT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER](1) Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 11-17); and (2) Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
June 28, 2018 Filing 211 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Impax Laboratories, LLC by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
June 25, 2018 Filing 210 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc. in the form of a disc. Filing related to #203 Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (ntl)
June 22, 2018 Filing 209 DECLARATION re #206 Claim Construction Opening Brief of Timothy A. Cook by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Farnan, Michael)
June 22, 2018 Filing 208 DECLARATION re #204 Claim Construction Opening Brief Declaration of Philip D. Segrest, Jr. in Support of Defendants' Consolidated Opening Claim Construction Brief by Impax Laboratories LLC, Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Phillips, John)
June 22, 2018 Filing 207 DECLARATION re #204 Claim Construction Opening Brief Declaration of Wayne J. Genck, Ph.D by Impax Laboratories LLC, Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Phillips, John)
June 22, 2018 Filing 206 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
June 22, 2018 Filing 205 DECLARATION re #204 Claim Construction Opening Brief Declaration of Edmund J. Elder, Jr. in Support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief by Impax Laboratories LLC, Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachments 1-2)(Phillips, John)
June 22, 2018 Filing 204 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF Defendants' Consolidated Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Impax Laboratories LLC, Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC, Unichem Laboratories, Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Phillips, John)
June 22, 2018 Filing 203 NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: two discs containing Plaintiffs' Technology Tutorial. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Michael J. Farnan on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc. (Farnan, Michael)
June 22, 2018 Filing 202 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Dominick T. Gattuso regarding // Enclosing USB drive containing defendants' tutorial on the technology at issue. (Gattuso, Dominick)
June 22, 2018 Filing 201 REDACTED VERSION of #193 Declaration,, of Timothy A. Cook by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-24)(Farnan, Michael)
June 22, 2018 Filing 200 REDACTED VERSION of #192 Answering Brief in Opposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Oral Argument scheduled for July 12, 2018 is CANCELLED and RESCHEDULED for July 18, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 6B. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/21/18. (ntl)
June 20, 2018 Filing 198 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. and HEC Pharm USA Inc. filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
June 20, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Maegan A. Fuller as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with the Lerner David Firm. (Pascale, Karen)
June 19, 2018 Filing 196 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding July 12, 2018 Hearing. (Farnan, Michael)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #194 STIPULATION to Extend Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefs filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/18/18. (ntl)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Defendant Mylan Pharmaceutical Inc.'s motion to dismiss for improper venue (D.I. #178 ) and associated briefing (D.I. 179, 192), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on Mylan's motion on July 12, 2018 at 11:00 am. Each side will have 1 hour. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/15/18. (ntl)
June 15, 2018 Filing 194 STIPULATION to Extend Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefs by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Farnan, Brian)
June 14, 2018 Filing 193 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #192 Answering Brief in Opposition of Timothy A. Cook by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Farnan, Michael)
June 14, 2018 Filing 192 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #178 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/21/2018. (Farnan, Michael)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #191 Joint STIPULATION Seeking Modification of Certain Dates re #19 Scheduling Order filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/13/18. (ntl)
June 12, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Erin M. Forbes for Sandoz Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
June 12, 2018 Filing 191 Joint STIPULATION Seeking Modification of Certain Dates re #19 Scheduling Order,,, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 12, 2018 Filing 190 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC for Impax Laboratories LLC filed by Impax Laboratories LLC. (Bilson, David)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #189 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Reflect Name Change by Impax Laboratories Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/11/18. (ntl)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #188 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin M. Forbes filed by Sandoz Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/8/18. (ntl)
June 7, 2018 Filing 189 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Reflect Name Change by Impax Laboratories Inc.. (Bilson, David)
June 6, 2018 Filing 188 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erin M. Forbes - filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
June 6, 2018 Filing 187 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Sandoz Inc. (Gattuso, Dominick)
June 4, 2018 Filing 186 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd.'s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
May 31, 2018 Filing 185 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Interrogatories; (ii) Plaintiffs' First Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.; (iii) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC; (iv) Plaintiffs' First Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd., Sunshine Lake LLC, and HEC Pharm USA Inc.; (v) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Unichem Laboratories Ltd.; and (vi) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
May 24, 2018 Filing 184 REDACTED VERSION of #180 Declaration, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 24, 2018 Filing 183 REDACTED VERSION of #179 Opening Brief in Support by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 18, 2018 Filing 182 CLAIM Construction Chart by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 - Part 1 of 2, #9 Exhibit 7 - Part 2 of 2, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13)(Farnan, Brian)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #181 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to file their Opposition to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Renewed Motion to Dismiss or Transfer to 6/14/2018 filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/18/18. (ntl)
May 18, 2018 Filing 181 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to file their Opposition to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Renewed Motion to Dismiss or Transfer to 6/14/2018 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
May 17, 2018 Filing 180 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #179 Opening Brief in Support of Brandon M. White by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 17, 2018 Filing 179 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #178 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/31/2018. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 17, 2018 Filing 178 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 16, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Mylan Pharmaceutical Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs Second Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things and (2) Mylan Pharmaceutical Inc.s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 16, 2018 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1); and (2) Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (No. 25) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
May 16, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things; and (2) Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (No. 25) filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
May 16, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sigmapharm's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC; and (2) Sigmapharm's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
May 16, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.; and (2) Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Impax Laboratories Inc..(Bilson, David)
May 16, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (No. 25) filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
May 16, 2018 Filing 171 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.'s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents (No. 25) filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
May 16, 2018 Filing 170 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Responses to 1st Defendant-Specific Requests for Production and Aurobindo's Responses to 2nd Common Requests for Production filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
May 16, 2018 Filing 169 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Joint Requests for Documents and Things; (ii) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendant Indoco Remedies Ltd.'s First Set of Requests for Documents and Things; and (iii) Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC's First Set of Individual Requests for Documents and Things filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
May 16, 2018 Filing 168 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things (No. 1), and 2) Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (No. 25) filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
May 16, 2018 Filing 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indoco Remedies LTD.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc.s Second Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Indoco Remedies Ltd..(Brennecke, Sean)
May 16, 2018 Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things and (2) Defendant InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by InvaGen Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
May 15, 2018 Filing 165 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Impax Laboratories Inc. filed by Impax Laboratories Inc.. (Bilson, David)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #159 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal -- Party Wockhardt Bio AG and Wockhardt USA LLC terminated. Attorney Adam Wyatt Poff; Erin R. Conway and Joseph E. Cwik terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/14/18. (ntl)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters regarding deposition discovery (see D.I. 157, 158, 161, 162) and related materials, including the parties' competing proposals (see D.I. 157-1, D.I. 158-1), the teleconference scheduled for tomorrow is CANCELLED. The Court has today docketed a Discovery Deposition Order, which modifies paragraph 8(g) of the Scheduling Order (D.I. 19). The Discovery Deposition Order attempts to balance, in a reasonable and appropriate manner, the parties' competing interests in this multi-faceted set of complex, related cases, involving at present two asserted patents, 11 ANDA filers, and issues including infringement and invalidity, involving some (but not wholesale) overlap. The Court is closer to Defendants' position on the number of deposition hours and depositions, but has reduced Defendants' proposed totals to amounts the Court believes are more proportional to the needs of the case. The Court will not impose caps on the total number of witnesses. Defendants' request for inventor depositions to last up to 10 hours is reasonable. Absent an agreement to the contrary and/or good cause, all depositions of parties and their representatives, including current and former employees, will take place in Delaware, as this default most reasonably balances the costs and other potential prejudice to all parties and should allow the parties to efficiently negotiate reasonable alternatives for witnesses for whom such is warranted. The Court has not adopted most of Plaintiffs' proposed default rules because, although they appear to be helpful and appropriate, Defendants contend their rights are somehow threatened by them, so the Court will not micro-manage these particulars. The Court recognizes that the Mylan Defendants have challenged and continue to challenge whether venue is proper in this District, and has factored into its decisions the prejudice to Mylan. However, the burden is on Mylan to persuade the Court that venue is improper, which has not yet been done, and much (if not all) of the deposition discovery that will be conducted pursuant to the Court's order will be required no matter where the Mylan case is ultimately venued. In all issues relating to depositions, notwithstanding the Court's order, the parties are obligated to act reasonably, and to meet and confer in good faith to resolve disputes. Should such efforts fail, any party may bring a further, concrete dispute to the Courts attention through the Discovery Matters procedures. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/14/18. (ntl)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 DISCOVERY DEPOSITION ORDER re Addendum to #19 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/14/18. (ntl)
May 11, 2018 Filing 162 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendants' May 10, 2018 Letter - re 155 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Farnan, Brian)
May 11, 2018 Filing 161 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Limitations on Deposition Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B and C)(Phillips, John)
May 11, 2018 Filing 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandoz Inc.'s Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery [CONFIDENTIAL - SUBJECT TO PROTECTIVE ORDER] filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
May 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin S. Prussia for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
May 10, 2018 Filing 159 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Wockhardt Bio AG and Wockhardt USA LLC by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
May 10, 2018 Filing 158 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Limitations on Deposition Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phillips, John)
May 10, 2018 Filing 157 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Farnan, Michael)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #156 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin S. Prussia filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/10/18. (ntl)
May 9, 2018 Filing 156 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin S. Prussia - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for May 15, 2018 at 4:15 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than May 10, 2018, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than May 11, 2018, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/9/18. (ntl)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #149 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of Lupin Ltd. -- Party Lupin Ltd. terminated. Attorney Stephen B. Brauerman and Arun John Mohan terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/8/18. (ntl)
May 7, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Unichem's Preliminary Proposed Claim Terms and Constructions filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
May 4, 2018 Filing 153 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary Proposed Claim Terms for Construction filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
May 4, 2018 Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Claim Construction Disclosure filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
May 4, 2018 Filing 151 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Request for Discovery Teleconference. (Farnan, Michael)
May 4, 2018 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
May 4, 2018 Filing 149 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Lupin Ltd. by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
May 2, 2018 Filing 148 NOTICE of Withdrawal (Thomas R. Burns) by Sandoz Inc. (Gattuso, Dominick)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #146 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to produce to the Plaintiffs initial invalidity contentions, as well as the related invalidating references to May 10, 2018 filed by Wockhardt USA LLC, Wockhardt Bio AG. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/2/18. (ntl)
May 1, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE of Change of Firm by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
May 1, 2018 Filing 146 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to produce to the Plaintiffs initial invalidity contentions, as well as the related invalidating references to May 10, 2018 - filed by Wockhardt Bio AG, Wockhardt USA LLC. (Poff, Adam)
April 21, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary Invalidity Contentions Relating to U.S. Patent No. 9,326,945 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 21, 2018 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Preliminary Invalidity Contentions Relating to U.S. Patent No. 6,967,208 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 20, 2018 Filing 143 NOTICE of Indoco Remedies Ltd.'s Invalidity Contentions by Indoco Remedies Ltd. (Brennecke, Sean)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #142 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which Defendants shall produce to the Plaintiffs its initial invalidity contentions to April 30, 2018 filed by Wockhardt USA LLC, Wockhardt Bio AG. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/20/18. (ntl)
April 19, 2018 Filing 142 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which Defendants shall produce to the Plaintiffs its initial invalidity contentions to April 30, 2018 - filed by Wockhardt Bio AG, Wockhardt USA LLC. (Poff, Adam)
April 18, 2018 Filing 141 REDACTED VERSION of #133 Stipulation by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
April 17, 2018 Filing 140 Redaction of #119 Transcript. Telephone conference before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan (302) 573-6360. (bpg)
April 17, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (a) Aurobindo's First Set of Requests for Documents and Things (Nos. 1-35), and, (b) Notice of Joinder to Defendants' Second Set of Joint Requests for Documents and Things to Plaintiffs, dated April 16, 2018 filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
April 16, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Second Set of Joint Requests for Documents and Things to Plaintiffs filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 16, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Defendant-Specific Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
April 16, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
April 16, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sigmapharm's First Set of Individual Requests for Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-8) filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
April 16, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indoco Remedies LTD.s First Set of Individual Requests for Documents and Things to Plaintiffs filed by Indoco Remedies Ltd..(Brennecke, Sean)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #133 STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/13/18. (ntl)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #132 MOTION and Order for Redactions (Unopposed) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/13/18. (ntl)
April 12, 2018 Filing 133 [SEALED] STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
April 9, 2018 Filing 132 MOTION and Order for Redactions (Unopposed) - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
April 9, 2018 Filing 131 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.. (Connolly, Arthur)
April 9, 2018 Filing 130 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #124 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
April 6, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery; and Defendants' Amended Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(Moore, David)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal as to Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. (ntl)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #126 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the First Amended Complaint to April 9, 2018 filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/5/18. (ntl)
March 28, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' Objections & Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Interrogatories and (ii) Plaintiffs' Objections & Responses to Defendants' First Set of Joint Requests for Documents and Things filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
March 28, 2018 Filing 126 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the First Amended Complaint to April 9, 2018 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 27, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.s First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 3, 4, and 5); and Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.s Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 2, 4, 5, and 10) filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
March 19, 2018 Filing 124 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.- filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Michael)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #123 STIPULATION to Amend the Complaint to Add Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. as a Defendant filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/19/18. (ntl)
March 15, 2018 Filing 123 STIPULATION to Amend the Complaint to Add Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. as a Defendant by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Michael)
March 15, 2018 Filing 122 REDACTED VERSION of #115 Letter, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 15, 2018 Filing 121 REDACTED VERSION of #114 Letter by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael)
March 15, 2018 Filing 120 REDACTED VERSION of #113 Letter, by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-L)(Farnan, Michael)
March 15, 2018 Filing 119 [SEALED] Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on March 9, 2018 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. (bpg) Modified on 4/13/2018 (ntl).
March 14, 2018 Filing 118 REDACTED VERSION of #112 Letter, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #117 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James E. Nealon of Withers Bergman LLP filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/12/18. (ntl)
March 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 3/9/2018. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #111 Stipulation of Dismissal -- Party Bionpharma Inc. and Natco Pharma Ltd. terminated. Attorney Kenneth Laurence Dorsney terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/8/18. (ntl)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #116 STIPULATION concerning Venue-Related Discovery Protective Order filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/9/18. (ntl)
March 9, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James E. Nealon of Withers Bergman LLP - filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
March 8, 2018 Filing 116 STIPULATION concerning Venue-Related Discovery Protective Order re #91 Proposed Order by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
March 7, 2018 Filing 115 [SEALED] Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Defendants' Reply Position on Discovery Dispute - re 110 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 7, 2018 Filing 114 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Mylan's March 6, 2018 Letter - re #112 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael)
March 6, 2018 Filing 113 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute on Venue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Farnan, Michael)
March 6, 2018 Filing 112 [SEALED] Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding Defendants' Position on Discovery Dispute - re 110 Order Setting Teleconference,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
March 6, 2018 Filing 111 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Bionpharma Inc. and Natco Pharma Ltd. by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #109 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Infringement Contentions to March 16, 2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/5/18. (ntl)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for March 9, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than March 6, 2018, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than March 7, 2018, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/2/18. (ntl)
March 1, 2018 Filing 109 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Infringement Contentions to March 16, 2018 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Farnan, Michael)
February 23, 2018 Filing 108 ANSWER to #103 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Farnan, Michael)
February 22, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of of Change of Address by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (19 in 1:17-cv-00400-LPS, 106 in 1:17-cv-00374-LPS) STIPULATION to Amend the Complaint to Add Natco Pharma Ltd. as a Defendant in the Bionpharma Inc. matter filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/21/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00400-LPS, 1:17-cv-00374-LPS (ntl)
February 20, 2018 Filing 106 STIPULATION to Amend the Complaint to Add Natco Pharma Ltd. as a Defendant in the Bionpharma Inc. Matter by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Michael)
February 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas A. Haag and Jamaica P. Szeliga for Indoco Remedies Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #102 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Initial Infringement Contentions in Bionpharma Case to March 2, 2018 filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/20/18. (ntl)
February 16, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc.'s Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Brian)
February 16, 2018 Filing 104 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Mylan Discovery Dispute. (Farnan, Michael)
February 14, 2018 Filing 103 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
February 14, 2018 Filing 102 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Initial Infringement Contentions in Bionpharma Case to March 2, 2018 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #101 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Discovery Dispute to 2/19/2018 filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/1/18. (ntl)
January 30, 2018 Filing 101 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Discovery Dispute to 2/19/2018 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #100 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Discovery Dispute to January 30, 2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/29/18. (ntl)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #98 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal -- Party Micro Labs Ltd. and Micro Labs USA Inc. terminated. Attorney Kenneth Laurence Dorsney terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/26/18. (ntl)
January 26, 2018 Filing 100 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Discovery Dispute to January 30, 2018 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Farnan, Brian)
January 25, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 24, 2018 Filing 98 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Micro Labs USA Inc. and Micro Labs, Ltd. by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #94 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal -- Party Apotex Corp. and Apotex Inc. terminated. Attorney Kenneth Laurence Dorsney terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/22/18. (ntl)
January 22, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dean L. Fanelli for Indoco Remedies Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
January 19, 2018 Filing 97 [SEALED] Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on January 5, 2018 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2018. (bpg)
January 17, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Sri K. Sankaran and Devan V. Padmanabhan as co-counsel.. (Brennecke, Sean)
January 16, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections & Responses to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s First Set of Individual Requests for Documents and Things filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #92 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal -- Party Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd. terminated. Attorney Douglas R. Weider; David Jay and Gregory Erich Stuhlman terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/16/18. (ntl)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #93 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal -- Party Sun Pharma Global FZE and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc. terminated. Attorney David A. Bilson; Matthew M. Holub; John C. Phillips, Jr; Kimberly A. Beis and Stephen P. Benson terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/16/18. (ntl)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #91 Venue-Related Discovery Protective Order filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/16/18. (ntl)
January 16, 2018 Filing 94 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Apotex Inc. and Apotex Corp. by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
January 15, 2018 Filing 93 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc. and Sun Pharma Global FZE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
January 15, 2018 Filing 92 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd. by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
January 12, 2018 Filing 91 PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order for Mylan Venue Discovery by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #89 Stipulation of Dismissal -- Party Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd. terminated. Attorney Manish K. Mehta; Zaiba Baig and Kevin M. Capuzzi terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/9/18. (ntl)
January 9, 2018 Filing 90 REDACTED VERSION of #84 Letter by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Farnan, Michael)
January 8, 2018 Filing 89 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd. by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
January 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 1/5/2018. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
January 5, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.'s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-24), and 2) Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.'s and HEC Pharm USA Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
January 5, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Wockhardt Bio AG and Wockhardt USA LLCs Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1 10); and 2) Wockhardt Bio AG and Wockhardt USA LLCs Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Document and Things filed by Wockhardt Bio AG, Wockhardt USA LLC.(Poff, Adam)
January 5, 2018 Filing 86 REDACTED VERSION Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #85 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shannon M. Bloodworth filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/5/18. (ntl)
January 3, 2018 Filing 85 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shannon M. Bloodworth - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 2, 2018 Filing 84 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Mylan's December 29, 2017 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Michael)
January 2, 2018 Filing 83 REDACTED VERSION of #68 Notice to Take Deposition by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
December 29, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-24) filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
December 29, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) DEFENDANT LUPIN LTD.'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF COMMON INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-10) and (2) DEFENDANT LUPIN LTD.'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST SET OF COMMON REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS filed by Lupin Ltd..(Brauerman, Stephen)
December 29, 2017 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories and (2) Defendant InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by InvaGen Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
December 29, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10); and (2) Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-24) filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Phillips, John)
December 29, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant Sandoz Inc.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-24); and 2) Defendant Sandoz Inc.s Objections and Answers to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
December 29, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Renck, Richard)
December 29, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Apotexs Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories; (2) Apotex's Response and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things; (3) Bionpharma's Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories; (4) Bionpharma's Response and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things; (5) Micro Labs' Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Interrogatories and (6) Micro Lab's Response and Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Bionpharma Inc., Micro Labs Ltd., Micro Labs USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 29, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10); and (2) Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-24) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Phillips, John)
December 29, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s Response and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10); and (2) Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-24) filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Phillips, John)
December 29, 2017 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories; and (2) Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Impax Laboratories Inc..(Phillips, John)
December 29, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mylan Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs' Written Discovery filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 29, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Indoco Remedies LTD.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc.s First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things; and Defendant Indoco Remedies LTD.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc.s First Set of Common Interrogatories, filed by Indoco Remedies Ltd..(Brennecke, Sean)
December 28, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DRL's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-24) and DRL's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10) filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
December 22, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' Venue-Related Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and (ii) Plaintiffs' Venue-Related Interrogatories to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
December 22, 2017 Filing 68 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 3/7/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
December 22, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Keith Meckstroth on 3/6/2018 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #62 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. terminated. Attorney Carolyn A. Blessing; Michael J. Gaertner; Keith D. Parr; John C. Phillips, Jr; Nina Vachhani; David B. Abramowitz and David A. Bilson terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/20/17. (ntl)
December 18, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandoz Inc.'s Production of Core Technical Documents bearing Bates numbers SANDOZ-APIX-00000001 through SANDOZ-APIX-00012428 filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
December 18, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven J. Moore for Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
December 18, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Prior to 6:00 p.m. on Friday, December 15, 2017--Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.s Core Technical Documents, Production Bates Range PRIN-APIX_0000001 PRIN-APIX_0013511 filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Renck, Richard)
December 18, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Dr. Reddy's Core Technical Documents filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(Moore, David)
December 18, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard of Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") filed by InvaGen Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
December 18, 2017 Filing 62 STIPULATION of Dismissal between Plaintiffs and Defendant Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jamaica P. Szeliga, Dean L. Fanelli and Thomas A. Haag filed by Indoco Remedies Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/18/17. (ntl)
December 18, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Wockhardt Bio AGs and Wockhardt USA LLCs Core Technical Documents filed by Wockhardt Bio AG, Wockhardt USA LLC.(Poff, Adam)
December 18, 2017 Filing 60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jamaica P. Szeliga, Dean L. Fanelli and Thomas A. Haag - filed by Indoco Remedies Ltd.. (Brennecke, Sean)
December 15, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Core Technical Documents filed by Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Stuhlman, Gregory)
December 15, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE of Notice of Service of Defendant Indoco Remedies LTD's Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4.b. of the Default Standard for Discovery by Indoco Remedies Ltd. (Brennecke, Sean)
December 15, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Lupin LTD.'s Production of Core Technical Documents, Bearing Bates Numbers LUPINAPIX0000001-LUPINAPIX0021033 filed by Lupin Ltd..(Brauerman, Stephen)
December 15, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, Inc.'s Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Phillips, John)
December 15, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd. and HEC Pharm USA's core technical document production pursuant to the Scheduling Order and Paragraph 4.b. of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
December 15, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Impax Laboratories Inc..(Phillips, John)
December 15, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of ESI Rule 4.b Disclosure of Core Technical Documents filed by Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Capuzzi, Kevin)
December 15, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Phillips, John)
December 15, 2017 Filing 51 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on December 11, 2017 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2018. (bpg)
December 15, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Apotex's Paragraph 4(b) Disclosures; (2) Bionpharma's Paragraph 4(b) Disclosures; and (3) Micro Labs' Paragraph 4(b) Disclosures filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Bionpharma Inc., Micro Labs Ltd., Micro Labs USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
December 15, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Core Technical Documents filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #48 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Protective Order by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/15/17. (etg)
December 13, 2017 Filing 48 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Protective Order by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
December 11, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 12/11/2017. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
December 6, 2017 Filing 47 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Defendants' December 4, 2017 Letter - re #46 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Michael)
December 4, 2017 Filing 46 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Protective Order Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2)(Phillips, John)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #45 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Ltd. and Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-V terminated. Attorney A. Neal Seth; Rachel K. Hunnicutt and John M. Seaman terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/3/17. (ntl)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (44 in 1:17-cv-00374-LPS, 19 in 1:17-cv-00380-LPS) Stipulation of Dismissal as to Sunshine Lake LLC -- Party Sunshine Lake LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/4/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS, 1:17-cv-00380-LPS (ntl)
December 1, 2017 Filing 45 STIPULATION of Dismissal between Plaintiffs and Defendants Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Ltd., and Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-V by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
November 29, 2017 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Sunshine Lake LLC and Amending Caption in the Action to Reflect Same by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake LLC, Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.. (Pascale, Karen)
November 29, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Bilson, David)
November 29, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Initial Disclosures of Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. and Sun Pharma Global FZE Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc..(Bilson, David)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM ORDER re dispute regarding venue-related discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/28/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS, 1:17-cv-00379-LPS (ntl)
November 22, 2017 Filing 40 Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on November 15, 2017 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2018.(bpg)
November 22, 2017 Filing 39 STATUS REPORT regarding Mylan Venue Discovery by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for December 11, 2017 at 4:30 p.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than December 4, 2017, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than December 6, 2017, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/20/17. (ntl)
November 17, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Arun John Mohan on behalf of Lupin Ltd. (Mohan, Arun)
November 17, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sandoz Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery [CONFIDENTIAL Pursuant to D. Del Local Rule 26.2] filed by Sandoz Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
November 17, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Lupin LTD.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Lupin Ltd..(Brauerman, Stephen)
November 17, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Section 3 Initial Disclosures filed by InvaGen Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ormerod, Eve)
November 17, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and Pfizer Inc.'s Disclosure Pursuant to Paragraph 3 and 4a of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
November 17, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Wockhardt Bio AG and Wockhardt USA LLC's Disclosures Pursuant to District of Delaware Default Standard Paragraph 3 filed by Wockhardt Bio AG, Wockhardt USA LLC.(Poff, Adam)
November 17, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Stuhlman, Gregory)
November 17, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
November 17, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.'s Disclosures Pursuant to District Court of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery Paragraph 3 filed by Unichem Laboratories, Ltd..(Bilson, David)
November 17, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures under Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware's Default Standard for Discovery filed by Impax Laboratories Inc..(Bilson, David)
November 17, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sigmapharm Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
November 17, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Indoco Remedies LTD.'s ESI Rule 3 Initial Disclosures filed by Indoco Remedies Ltd..(Brennecke, Sean)
November 17, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
November 17, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Hetero USA, Inc., Hetero Labs Ltd., and Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-V's Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Hetero Labs Ltd., Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc..(Seaman, John)
November 17, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
November 17, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sunshine Lake Pharma Co., Ltd.'s and HEC Pharm USA's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Section 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by HEC Pharm USA Inc., Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd..(Pascale, Karen)
November 17, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Apotex's Paragraph 3 Disclosures; (2) Bionpharma's Paragraph 3 Disclosures; and (3) Micro Labs' Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Apotex Corp., Apotex Inc., Bionpharma Inc., Micro Labs Ltd., Micro Labs USA Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
November 15, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Discovery Teleconference held on 11/15/2017. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00379-LPS, 1:17-cv-00374-LPS (ntl)
November 13, 2017 Filing 20 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Brian E. Farnan regarding Request for Discovery Teleconference. (Farnan, Brian)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: In light of the District Court's ADR referral in this case, and the number of parties involved in this matter and related cases, the Court orders as follows: Plaintiff(s) counsel shall contact counsel for each defendant to discuss whether both sides believe that the Court's assistance with settlement discussions would be helpful at some point in the case. If both plaintiff(s) and an individual defendant believe that the case has reached a stage whereby the Court's assistance is needed with regard to settlement, plaintiff(s) counsel shall contact the Court to schedule an ADR Teleconference for plaintiff and that individual defendant. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/3/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS et al.(dlb)
November 3, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Burke for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS et al.(dlb)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. These actions are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of discovery and all papers shall be filed in Civil Action No. 17-374-LPS. Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Status Report due by 11/30/2018. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 6/22/2018. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 7/27/2018. A Markman Hearing is set for 9/4/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/20/2019. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/27/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Bench Trial (at least 5 days) is set for 10/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/2/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS et al. (ntl)
October 30, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Requests for Production of Documents and Things and (ii) Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 27, 2017 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc..(Farnan, Michael)
October 27, 2017 Filing 16 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
September 22, 2017 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Farnan, Michael)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than September 22, 2017. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, New Patent Procedures). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/31/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS et al. (ntl)
June 21, 2017 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
June 15, 2017 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc..(Connolly, Arthur)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint to June 15, 2017 filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/30/17. (ntl)
May 25, 2017 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint to June 15, 2017 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 19, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew J. Danford for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00412-LPS et al.(crb)
May 11, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey T. Hantson for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS et al.(crb)
May 11, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kevin M. Yurkerwich for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
May 11, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy Cook for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
May 11, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Heather M. Petruzzi for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
May 10, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tracey C. Allen for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
May 10, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amy K. Wigmore for Bristol-Myers Squibb Company added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00375-LPS et al.(crb)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven J. Moore filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/9/17. (ntl)
May 8, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven J. Moore - filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Connolly, Arthur)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to 6/1/2017 filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/5/17. (ntl)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:17-cv-00408-LPS, 9 in 1:17-cv-00374-LPS, 7 in 1:17-cv-00378-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00412-LPS, 9 in 1:17-cv-00409-LPS, 9 in 1:17-cv-00404-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00382-LPS, 9 in 1:17-cv-00403-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00376-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00381-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00407-LPS, 10 in 1:17-cv-00411-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00380-LPS, 7 in 1:17-cv-00405-LPS, 10 in 1:17-cv-00410-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00398-LPS, 7 in 1:17-cv-00399-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00400-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00426-LPS, 7 in 1:17-cv-00375-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00406-LPS, 10 in 1:17-cv-00377-LPS, 9 in 1:17-cv-00379-LPS, 9 in 1:17-cv-00401-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00402-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy K. Wigmore, Gregory H. Lantier, Tracey C. Allen, Heather M. Petruzzi, Andrew J. Danford, Jeffrey T. Hantson, Timothy A. Cook, and Kevin M. Yurkerwich filed by Pfizer Inc., Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/5/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS et al. (ntl)
May 4, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy K. Wigmore, Gregory H. Lantier, Tracey C. Allen, Heather M. Petruzzi, Andrew J. Danford, Jeffrey T. Hantson, Timothy A. Cook, and Kevin M. Yurkerwich - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
May 3, 2017 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to 6/1/2017 - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Farnan, Michael)
April 18, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. served on 4/7/2017, answer due 4/28/2017. (Farnan, Michael)
April 12, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00374-LPS through 1:17-cv-00382-LPS and 1:17-cv-00398-LPS through 1:17-cv-00412-LPS (rjb)
April 5, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. on 4/6/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
April 5, 2017 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Pfizer Inc. (nmg)
April 5, 2017 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (nmg)
April 5, 2017 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,967,208 B2; US 9,326,945 B2. (nmg)
April 5, 2017 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 2/28/2017. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 6/28/2020. (nmg)
April 5, 2017 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
April 5, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2116712.) - filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al v. Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Steven J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indoco Remedies Ltd.
Represented By: Sri K. Sankaran
Represented By: Dean L. Fanelli
Represented By: Sean M. Brennecke
Represented By: Jamaica P. Szeliga
Represented By: Thomas A. Haag
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc.
Represented By: Rachel K. Hunnicutt
Represented By: A. Neal Seth
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Karen L. Carroll
Represented By: Micheal L. Binns
Represented By: Robert L. Florence
Represented By: Brandon M. White
Represented By: Sharad K. Bijanki
Represented By: Melanie B. Dubis
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: Keith D. Parr
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Carolyn A. Blessing
Represented By: David B. Abramowitz
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Nina Vachhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unichem Laboratories, Ltd.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Paul A. Braier
Represented By: Michael J. Fink
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jill M. Browning
Represented By: P. Branko Pejic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Lake LLC
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: C. Kyle Musgrove
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Crompton
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Cunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin M. Capuzzi
Represented By: Zaiba Baig
Represented By: Manish K. Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Ltd.
Represented By: Rachel K. Hunnicutt
Represented By: A. Neal Seth
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Arun John Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micro Labs Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Lake Pharma Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Represented By: Maegan A. Fuller
Represented By: Paul H. Kochanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt USA LLC
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories LLC
Represented By: C. Kyle Musgrove
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Crompton
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Cunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Stephen P. Benson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly A. Beis
Represented By: Matthew M. Holub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natco Pharma Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: Keith D. Parr
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Carolyn A. Blessing
Represented By: David B. Abramowitz
Represented By: Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Represented By: Nina Vachhani
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bionpharma Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEC Pharm USA Inc.
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Ltd. Unit-V
Represented By: Rachel K. Hunnicutt
Represented By: A. Neal Seth
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigmapharm Laboratories LLC
Represented By: Dustin L. Taylor
Represented By: Philip D. Segrest
Represented By: David A. Gerasimow
Represented By: Marc R. Wezowski
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Don J. Mizerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Carolyn A. Alenci
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Represented By: Vincent L. Capuano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emcure Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: David Jay
Represented By: Douglas R. Weider
Represented By: Gregory Erich Stuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micro Labs USA Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InvaGen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael Choi
Represented By: Jennifer M. Rutter
Represented By: Stuart D. Sender
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Andrew J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: Keith D. Parr
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Carolyn A. Blessing
Represented By: David B. Abramowitz
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Nina Vachhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Burns
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Elena Endrukaite
Represented By: Kevin P. Burke
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Represented By: Tara M. Raghaven
Represented By: Erin M. Forbes
Represented By: Katie A. Boda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wockhardt Bio AG
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Erin R. Conway
Represented By: Joseph E. Cwik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Charles T. Cox, Jr.
Represented By: Tracey C. Allen
Represented By: Christa J. Laser
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin M. Yurkerwich
Represented By: Michael Nelson
Represented By: Timothy Cook
Represented By: Andrew J. Danford
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Hantson
Represented By: Katherine P. Kieckhafer
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Kevin S. Prussia
Represented By: Amy K. Wigmore
Represented By: Wenli Gu
Represented By: Annaleigh E. Curtis
Represented By: Wenbo Zhang
Represented By: Heather M. Petruzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Charles T. Cox, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Nelson
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Wenli Gu
Represented By: Annaleigh E. Curtis
Represented By: Wenbo Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?