Johansen v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: William J. Johansen
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Atwood & Morrill Co. doing business as Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Crane Co., Flowserve U.S., Inc., FMC Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Allied Signal, Inc., as a successor in interest to The Bendix Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation, Jenkins Bros., Kunkle Industries, Inc., Nash Engineering Holdings LLC, Neles-Jamesbury, Inc., Red-White Valve Corp, The Fairbanks Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Crosby Valve LLC, Anchor/Darling Valve Company and Flowserve Corporation
Cross Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00452
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Referring Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation for Order of Dismissal is ADOPTED. The Complaint against Fairbanks Company is DISMISSED with prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/12/2020. (dlw)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 3/11/2020. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/26/2020. (lih)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 2/25/2020. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/18/2020. (lih)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 SO ORDERED re #213 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party Goulds Pumps, Incorporated terminated. Attorney Kelly A. Costello terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/18/2020. (dlw)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 SO ORDERED re #212 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party ITT Corporation terminated. Attorney Kelly A. Costello terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/18/2020. (dlw)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 3/23/2020 trial is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/18/2020. (dlw)
February 14, 2020 Filing 213 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated. (Costello, Kelly)
February 14, 2020 Filing 212 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ITT Corporation. (Costello, Kelly)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the pretrial conference previously set in this matter for 2/25/2020 and the remaining mediation conferences previously set in this matter for 3/3/2020 are CANCELLED. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/14/2020. (lih)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 SO ORDERED re #210 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party Crane Co. terminated. Attorney Allison L. Texter; Francis C. Gondek and Nicholas E. Skiles terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/13/2020. (dlw)
February 13, 2020 Filing 210 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Crane Co.. (Gondek, Francis)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the mediation conference set in this matter for 3/3/2020 between plaintiff and defendant Crane Co. is CANCELLED. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/13/2020. (lih)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: Mediation Conferences are set for 3/3/2020 at 9:00 AM; 011:00 AM and 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/10/2020. (lih)
February 10, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf (cak)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 SO ORDERED- re #207 Joint PROPOSED Amended Scheduling Order. Set Scheduling Order deadlines: Pretrial conference set for 2/25/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. 10-day Jury trial set to begin on 3/23/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Noreika. (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/15/2019. (lih)
August 15, 2019 Filing 207 Joint PROPOSED Amended Scheduling by Crane Co.. (Gondek, Francis) Modified on 8/15/2019 (lih).
August 15, 2019 Filing 206 Letter to U.S. Magistrate Judge S. R. Fallon from Francis C. Gondek, Esq. as Defense Liaison regarding Joint Proposed Amended Scheduling Order. (Gondek, Francis)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a jury trial before Judge Noreika is scheduled to begin at 9:30 a.m. on March 23, 2020, with the subsequent trial days beginning at 9:00 a.m. Until the case is submitted to the jury for deliberations, the jury will be excused each day at 4:30 p.m. The trial will be timed, as counsel will be allocated a total number of hours in which to present their respective cases. While the Court is setting aside 10 days for this jury trial, the actual number of trial days will be determined closer to trial. Judge Fallon will hold a pretrial conference with counsel on February 25, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 6C. Unless otherwise ordered by the court, pursuant to Local Rules 47.1(a)(2) and 51.1, the parties should file (i) proposed voir dire, (ii) preliminary jury instructions, (iii) final jury instructions, and (iv) special verdict forms three (3) full business days before the final pretrial conference. On or before August 15, 2019, Counsel are to submit an Amended Scheduling Order, which incorporates these deadlines and additional provisions into the Scheduling Order originally entered, D.I. #89 . Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/8/2019. (lih)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 SO ORDERED re #203 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party IMO Industries, Inc. terminated. Attorney Eileen M. Ford terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/8/2019. (dlw)
March 8, 2019 Filing 204 Joint STATUS REPORT by Crane Co.. (Gondek, Francis)
March 8, 2019 Filing 203 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen) Modified on 3/8/2019 (lih).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Whereas, the District Judge has adopted the Reports and Recommendations granting summary judgment (D.I. #185 and #200 ) and has entered judgment as a matter of law in favor of the moving defendants; It is hereby ordered that the Plaintiff and all remaining active Defendants shall submit to the court a joint status report, limited to four pages, on or before March 11, 2019, advising of the status of the case and identifying all Defendants remaining as active participants; advising of the status of further discovery, including expert discovery; advising of an approximate date range for purposes of setting dates (including the number of trial days) for a jury trial and pretrial conference; and advising of any other matters requiring the attention of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/4/2019. (lih)
February 26, 2019 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis C. Gondek on behalf of Crane Co. (Gondek, Francis)
February 11, 2019 Filing 201 JUDGMENT in favor of Ford Motor Company against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/11/2019. (dlw)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER ADOPTING #184 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTING #145 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/11/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 199 JUDGMENT in favor of Red White Valve Corp against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 198 JUDGMENT in favor of The Nash Engineering Company against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 197 JUDGMENT in favor of Atwood & Morrill Company, Inc. against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 196 JUDGMENT in favor of Jenkins Bros. against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 195 JUDGMENT in favor of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc. against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 194 JUDGMENT in favor of Warren Pumps, LLC against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 193 JUDGMENT in favor of Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 192 JUDGMENT in favor of Flowserve U.S., Inc. solely as successor to Edward Vogt Valve Company, Vogt Valve Co., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Edwards Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 191 JUDGMENT in favor of Anchor/Darling Valve Company against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 190 JUDGMENT in favor of FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Northern Pump, Chicago Pump and Peerless Pump businesses against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 189 JUDGMENT in favor of J.R. Clarkson Company LLC, as successor by merger to Kunkle Industries, Inc. against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 188 JUDGMENT in favor of Crosby Valve LLC against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 187 JUDGMENT in favor of Gardner Denver, Inc. against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 186 JUDGMENT in favor of Armstrong International, Inc. against William J. Johansen. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER ADOPTING #183 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTING #138 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #141 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #143 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #147 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #149 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #151 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #154 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #156 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #159 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #161 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #163 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #165 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #167 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING #169 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/7/2019. (dlw)
January 25, 2019 Filing 184 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #145 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/25/2019. (lih)
January 23, 2019 Filing 183 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re #156 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #149 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #163 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #154 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #161 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #165 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #147 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #159 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 2/6/2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/23/2019. (lih)
January 7, 2019 Filing 182 Letter to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Jessica L. Tyler, Esquire regarding Dismissing Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC from case - re #160 Opening Brief in Support, #159 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Tyler, Jessica)
September 17, 2018 Filing 181 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian D. Tome regarding Request for an Order Granting Summary Judgment for Plaintiff's Lack of Opposition to Motion - re #163 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #164 Opening Brief in Support. (Tome, Brian)
September 17, 2018 Filing 180 Letter to Judge Maryellen Noreika from Elizabeth C. Grabey, Esquire regarding No Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment - re #165 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Grabey, Elizabeth)
September 14, 2018 Filing 179 REPLY BRIEF re #145 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2 - Part 3, #5 Exhibit 2 -Part 4, #6 Exhibit 2 - Part 5, #7 Exhibit 4 - 8)(Singewald, Christian)
September 14, 2018 Filing 178 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Ryan T. Costa regarding non-opposition to #156 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #157 Opening Brief in Support. (Costa, Ryan) Modified on 9/14/2018 (lih).
September 13, 2018 Filing 177 Letter to Judge Fallon from Counsel to Defendant, Anchor/Darling Valve Company regarding No response filed to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment - re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #152 Opening Brief in Support. (Primack, David)
September 11, 2018 Filing 176 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Neal Glenn regarding Defendant FMC's request for dismissal based on Plaintiff's failure to timely oppose Motion for Summary Judgment - re #150 Opening Brief in Support, #149 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Glenn, Neal)
September 11, 2018 Filing 175 Letter to Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Willard F. Preston, III, Esq. regarding Defendant Flowserve US Inc.'s Request for Dismissal Based upon Plaintiff's Failure to Timely Oppose Motion for Summary Judgment #154 and Opening Brief #155 . (Preston, Willard)
September 11, 2018 Filing 174 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Brian D. Ahern regarding No Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment - re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #142 Opening Brief in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Donelson, Matthew)
September 11, 2018 Filing 173 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Donald R. Kinsley, Esquire regarding Plaintiff's Failure to Timely Oppose Crosby Valve, LLC and Kunkle Industries, Inc.'s Motions for Summary Judgment - re #144 Opening Brief in Support, #148 Opening Brief in Support, #147 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Bradley, Paul)
September 7, 2018 Filing 172 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #145 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William J. Johansen.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - K, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Medford, Ipek)
September 6, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #169 and #171 . (lih)
August 13, 2018 Filing 171 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Red-White Valve Corp.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2Exhibit A Part 2)(Sherlock, Mary) Modified on 8/13/2018 (lih).
August 13, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the opening brief and exhibits previously attached to D.I. #169 due to documents being filed improperly. Counsel is advised to refile the opening brief separately using the appropriate event code. (lih)
August 13, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the motion previously filed as D.I. 170 due to document already being present on the docket at D.I. #169 . Counsel was previously instructed to refile the opening brief in support only. (lih)
August 13, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the duplicate copy of D.I. #171 . (lih)
August 9, 2018 Filing 169 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Red-White Valve Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, #2 Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit A.1)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Sherlock, Mary)
August 8, 2018 Filing 168 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #167 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nash Engineering Holdings LLC(individually and as succesor to The Nash Engineering Company).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Grabey, Elizabeth)
August 8, 2018 Filing 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Nash Engineering Holdings LLC(individually and as succesor to The Nash Engineering Company). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Grabey, Elizabeth)
August 8, 2018 Filing 166 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #165 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Atwood & Morrill Co..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Grabey, Elizabeth)
August 8, 2018 Filing 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Atwood & Morrill Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Grabey, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2018 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. #163 and #164 . Counsel is advised that the courtesy copies must be bound and submitted separately according to their D.I. number and not submitted bound as one joint filing. (lih)
August 3, 2018 NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #156 , #157 , #158 , #163 , and #164 . (lih)
August 2, 2018 Filing 164 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #163 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jenkins Bros..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tome, Brian)
August 2, 2018 Filing 163 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Jenkins Bros.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tome, Brian)
August 2, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the opening brief previously filed as D.I. 153 due to document being filed incorrectly. Counsel is advised that a motion must precede the opening brief. Counsel is advised to re-file the documents separately using their appropriate event codes. (lih)
August 1, 2018 Filing 162 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #161 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(individually and as wholly-owned subsidiary of Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps).Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G-H)(Sullivan, Timothy) Modified on 8/2/2018 (lih).
August 1, 2018 Filing 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(individually and as wholly-owned subsidiary of Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Sullivan, Timothy) Modified on 8/2/2018 (lih).
August 1, 2018 Filing 160 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #159 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Through C)(Tyler, Jessica)
August 1, 2018 Filing 159 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Tyler, Jessica)
August 1, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE of Filing of Bankruptcy and Stay of Proceedings by The Fairbanks Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sullivan, Timothy)
August 1, 2018 Filing 157 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #156 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Costa, Ryan)
August 1, 2018 Filing 156 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Costa, Ryan)
August 1, 2018 Filing 155 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #154 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Flowserve U.S., Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Preston, Willard)
August 1, 2018 Filing 154 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Flowserve U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Preston, Willard)
August 1, 2018 Filing 152 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Anchor/Darling Valve Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2018. (Primack, David)
August 1, 2018 Filing 151 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Anchor/Darling Valve Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Primack, David)
August 1, 2018 Filing 150 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #149 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FMC Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Glenn, Neal)
August 1, 2018 Filing 149 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Glenn, Neal)
August 1, 2018 Filing 148 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #147 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kunkle Industries, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Certificate of Service)(Bradley, Paul)
August 1, 2018 Filing 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Kunkle Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Bradley, Paul)
August 1, 2018 Filing 146 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #145 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ford Motor Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Singewald, Christian)
August 1, 2018 Filing 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Ford Motor Company. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Singewald, Christian)
August 1, 2018 Filing 144 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crosby Valve LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service)(Bradley, Paul)
August 1, 2018 Filing 143 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Crosby Valve LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Bradley, Paul)
August 1, 2018 Filing 142 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gardner Denver, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/15/2018. (Attachment(s): #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Donelson, Matthew)
August 1, 2018 Filing 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Donelson, Matthew)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #140 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Motion for Summary Judgment to August 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/1/2018. (lih)
July 31, 2018 Filing 140 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Motion for Summary Judgment to August 8, 2018 - filed by Atwood & Morrill Co., Nash Engineering Holdings LLC(individually and as succesor to The Nash Engineering Company). (Grabey, Elizabeth)
July 31, 2018 Filing 139 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Armstrong International, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ranieri, Robert) Modified on 7/31/2018 (lih).
July 31, 2018 Filing 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by Armstrong International, Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Ranieri, Robert) Modified on 7/31/2018 (lih).
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #136 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME, #137 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME All Defendants' Dispositive Motions to August 1. Set Deadlines: ( Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2018.) (PLEASE REFER TO D.I. #137 for further details.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/25/2018. (lih)
July 23, 2018 Filing 137 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME All Defendants' Dispositive Motions to August 1, September 7, and September 25, 2018 - filed by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
July 20, 2018 Filing 136 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Motion for Summary Judgment to August 1, 2018 - filed by Atwood & Morrill Co., Nash Engineering Holdings LLC(individually and as succesor to The Nash Engineering Company). (Grabey, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Johansen on July 11, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. filed by Atwood & Morrill Co., Nash Engineering Holdings LLC(individually and as succesor to The Nash Engineering Company).(Grabey, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Crane Co..(Texter, Allison)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #133 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List to June 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/30/2018. (lih)
May 24, 2018 Filing 133 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List to June 25, 2018 - filed by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
May 22, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re FMC Corporation: Entry of appearance of attorney Neal C. Glenn. Attorney Daniel P. Daly terminated. (Glenn, Neal)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #131 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME All Defendants' Case Dispositive Motion(s). Set Briefing Schedule: (Opening Brief due 7/25/2018., Answering Brief due 8/29/2018., Reply Brief due 9/14/2018.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/17/2018. (lih)
May 16, 2018 Filing 131 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME All Defendants' Case Dispositive Motion(s) to July 25, 2018 - filed by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
May 16, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Ranieri on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Ranieri, Robert)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #129 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Motion for Summary Judgment to May 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/16/2018. (lih)
May 15, 2018 Filing 129 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Motion for Summary Judgment to May 18, 2018 - filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER re #127 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Flowserve Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/10/18. (ntl)
May 7, 2018 Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulation of Dismissal - filed by Flowserve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Phillips, Marc)
May 2, 2018 Filing 126 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Florax, Joelle) Modified on 5/2/2018 (lih).
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #125 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List to May 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/30/2018. (lih)
April 27, 2018 Filing 125 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List to May 25, 2018 - filed by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
April 27, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(individually and as wholly-owned subsidiary of Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps).(Sullivan, Timothy)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #123 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Flowserve Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/27/18. (etg)
April 26, 2018 Filing 123 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Flowserve Corporation. (Reno, Jessica) (Main Document 123 replaced on 4/26/2018) (etg).
April 26, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 123 has been replaced with the corrected version as per counsel's request. (etg)
March 29, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Red-White Valve Corp.(Sherlock, Mary)
March 29, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #115 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List to April 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/29/2018. (lih)
March 28, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of The J.R. Clarkson Company LLC as Successor to Kunkle Indistries, Inc.'s Initial Designation and Disclosure of Lay and Expert Witnesses and Exhibit List filed by Kunkle Industries, Inc..(Bradley, Paul)
March 28, 2018 Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Crosby Valve, LLC's Master Designation and Disclosure of Lay and Expert Witnesses and Exhibit List filed by Crosby Valve LLC.(Bradley, Paul)
March 28, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Flowserve US Inc., Solely as Successor to Edward Vogt Valve Company, Vogt Valve Co., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Edward Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company's Initial Indiviudal Witness and Exhibit List filed by Flowserve U.S., Inc.(individually and solely as successor to Durco, Duriron, Anchor Darling, Superior Group, Edward Vogt, Vogt Valves, Nordstrom Valves, Edward Valve, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company).(Preston, Willard)
March 28, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.'s Witness and Exhibit List filed by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc..(Costa, Ryan)
March 28, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness & Exhibit List filed by Anchor/Darling Valve Company.(Primack, David)
March 28, 2018 Filing 115 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant's Initial Individual Witness and Exhibit List to April 27, 2018 - filed by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
March 28, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Honeywell International, Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
March 28, 2018 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by The Fairbanks Company.(Sullivan, Timothy)
March 28, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANT JENKINS BROS.' MASTER DESIGNATION AND DISCLOSURE OF LAY AND EXPERT WITNESSES AND EXHIBIT LIST filed by Jenkins Bros..(Tome, Brian)
March 28, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service of Defendant, Nash Engineering's Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Nash Engineering Holdings LLC.(Grabey, Elizabeth)
March 28, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.'s Initial Witness & Exhibit Lists filed by IMO Industries, Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
March 28, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service of Defendant's Atwood & Morrill's Initial Witness and Exhibit List filed by Atwood & Morrill Co..(Grabey, Elizabeth)
March 28, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of SERVICE OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S INITIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS by Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
March 28, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness & Exhibit List filed by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Donelson, Matthew)
March 28, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notice previously filed as D.I. 119 due to the document having the wrong case caption. Counsel is advised to re-file the document with the correct case caption. (lih)
March 28, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notices previously filed as D.I. numbers 117 and 118 due to documents having the wrong case caption. Counsel is advised to re-file the documents with the correct case caption. (lih)
March 27, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #105 Joint PROPOSED ORDER to Establish Applicable Substantive Law. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/22/2018. (lih)
March 16, 2018 Filing 105 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Establish Applicable Substantive Law by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- re #104 Status Report. Having reviewed the joint status report and determining that there are no issues requiring action by the court, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the status teleconference set in this matter for 4/3/2018 is CANCELLED. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/21/2018. (lih)
February 20, 2018 Filing 104 Joint STATUS REPORT by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
February 14, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Joint Witness and Exhibit List filed by Crane Co..(Texter, Allison)
February 5, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jennifer D. Donnelly as co-counsel. Reason for request: she has left the firm of Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin. (Della Porta, Armand)
January 22, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Nash Engineering Holdings LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Elizabeth Grabey. Attorney Paul D. Sunshine terminated. (Grabey, Elizabeth)
January 22, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Atwood & Morrill Co.: Entry of appearance of attorney Elizabeth Grabey. Attorney Paul D. Sunshine terminated. (Grabey, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Dr. Gary Stone filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
December 8, 2017 Filing 98 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Ryan T. Costa. Attorney Lindsay B. Orr terminated. (Costa, Ryan)
December 8, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notice of substitution of counsel previously filed as D.I. 98 due to document having the wrong case caption. Counsel is advised to file a revised version of the document with the correct case caption. (lih)
December 5, 2017 Filing 97 Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Ipek K. Medford regarding Status Report as to Defendant Red-White Valve Corp.. (Medford, Ipek)
November 28, 2017 Filing 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Proof of Claims Documents filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER - re #90 REQUEST for Default as to Red-White Valve Corp. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/21/2017. (lih)
November 16, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdfs of D.I. #94 have been replaced with revised versions of the documents to correct the case caption. (lih)
November 15, 2017 Filing 94 ANSWER to #43 Amended Complaint by Red-White Valve Corp. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service)(Sherlock, Mary) Modified on 11/16/2017 (lih). (Main Document 94 replaced on 11/16/2017) (lih). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/16/2017) (lih).
November 13, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Anchor/Darling Valve Company.(Primack, David)
November 13, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Nash Engineering Holdings LLC.(Sunshine, Paul)
November 13, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Atwood & Morrill Co..(Sunshine, Paul)
November 9, 2017 Filing 90 REQUEST for Default as to Red-White Valve Corp - filed by William J. Johansen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Medford, Ipek)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SO ORDERED- re #88 Proposed Scheduling Order. Set SCHEDULING ORDER deadlines: Status Report due by 2/20/2018., A Status Conference is set for 4/3/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon, Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2018. (PLEASE REFER TO SCHEDULING ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/7/2017. (lih)
November 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Telephone Conference held on 11/7/2017. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (lih)
November 2, 2017 Filing 88 Joint PROPOSED Scheduling ORDER by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison) Modified on 11/2/2017 (lih). Modified on 11/2/2017 (lih).
November 2, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Proof of Claims Documents filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Pursuant to the unopposed request of counsel for the plaintiff, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the status and scheduling teleconference set in this matter for 11/7/2017 at 10:30 AM is RESCHEDULED to 01:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 11/2/2017. (lih)
October 30, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Sunshine on behalf of Nash Engineering Holdings LLC (Sunshine, Paul)
October 30, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Sunshine on behalf of Atwood & Morrill Co. (Sunshine, Paul)
October 27, 2017 Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
October 27, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Medical Records from University of Alabama Hospital filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING STATUS & RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE- re #75 Status Report. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A status and scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on Tuesday, November 7, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall organize and initiate the teleconference to the Chambers of Sherry R. Fallon at 302-573-4557. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than November 2, 2017. The Court's form asbestos scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 10/27/2017. (lih)
October 26, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
October 24, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Dr. Ginsburg filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
October 24, 2017 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pathology Report filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
October 24, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Authorizations filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
October 24, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Military Records filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
October 13, 2017 Filing 77 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by FMC Corporation. (Daly, Daniel)
October 13, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
October 10, 2017 Filing 75 Joint STATUS REPORT by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
October 10, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pathology Materials re #66 Notice of Service filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
October 2, 2017 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc..(Orr, Lindsay)
October 2, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: Docket clerk has deleted the notice of service previously filed on the docket as D.I. 73 by defendant Nele-Jamesbury due to document having the wrong case caption. Counsel is advised to refile the document with a correct and complete case caption. (lih)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 10/10/2017, the parties shall file a joint status report, no more than four pages in length, informing the court: (1) the parties' progress in the schedule with respect to product identification discovery; (2) the substantive law to be applied to Plaintiff's claims; and (3) anticipated summary judgment motions on product identification and causation. After the court receives this joint status report, a status conference will be scheduled. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/29/2017. (lih)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORAL ORDER: The Court having determined that all asbestos cases shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon to manage pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, and in the interests of ensuring that the this case is managed consistently with this policy, IT IS ORDERED that the case is referred to Judge Fallon for purposes of exploring ADR and to manage all pretrial proceedings up to and including the pretrial conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/28/17. (ntl)
September 25, 2017 Case Reassigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 22, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant IMO Industries Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by IMO Industries, Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
September 22, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Honeywell International, Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
September 21, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Flowserve U.S., Inc..(Preston, Willard)
September 20, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Crane Co..(Texter, Allison)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #61 Revised Proposed Scheduling Order - The parties' proposed schedule is ADOPTED, with the following additions: The Final Pretrial Conference is set for Wednesday, January 16, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, and a 10-day Jury Trial is set for Monday, January 28, 2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4A. This case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for exploring ADR. The plaintiff shall file a scheduling order incorporating the full case schedule by Friday, September 22, 2017. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/15/2017. (mdb)
September 12, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Gardner Denver, Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Matthew P. Donelson. Attorney Krista R. Samis terminated. (Donelson, Matthew)
September 12, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Radiology Materials filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
August 31, 2017 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Flowserve U.S., Inc. by Flowserve U.S., Inc..(Reno, Jessica)
August 31, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Reno on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reno, Jessica)
August 8, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 (a)(1) filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
July 27, 2017 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Social Security Records filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek)
July 20, 2017 Filing 61 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Revised Scheduling Order by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
July 20, 2017 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William J. Johansen. Kunkle Industries, Inc. served on 6/29/2017, answer due 9/13/2017. (Medford, Ipek)
July 17, 2017 Filing 59 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Jenkins Bros.. (Tome, Brian)
July 17, 2017 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Jenkins Bros.. (Tome, Brian)
July 14, 2017 Filing 57 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #43 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Kunkle Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bradley, Paul)
July 13, 2017 Filing 56 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #43 Amended Complaint with TRIAL BY JURY OF TWELVE DEMANDED , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
July 12, 2017 Filing 55 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #43 Amended Complaint with Jury Trial of Twelve Demanded , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Anchor/Darling Valve Company.(Primack, David)
July 5, 2017 Filing 54 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #43 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation.(Daly, Daniel)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER re #34 Joint Status Report - The parties shall meet and confer and refile the joint status report to include a proposed schedule that: 1. Reflects the scheduling events of the schedule entered in C.A. No. 17-167 (GMS) and 2. Does not include dates certain for the Final Pretrial Conference and Trial events. The revised joint status report is due within 21 days from this order. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/29/2017. (mdb)
June 28, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Tome on behalf of Jenkins Bros. (Tome, Brian)
June 27, 2017 Filing 52 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #43 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc..(Orr, Lindsay)
June 26, 2017 Filing 51 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #43 Amended Complaint with Jury Trial Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaim against all Defendants by Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Preston, Willard) Modified on 6/27/2017 (mdb).
June 23, 2017 Filing 50 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #43 Amended Complaint by Crane Co..(Texter, Allison)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #49 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EFFECTUATE Service of Process to September 13, 2017 filed by William J. Johansen. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Kunkle Industries, Inc. answer due 9/13/2017. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/23/2017. (mdb)
June 22, 2017 Filing 49 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EFFECTUATE Service of Process to September 13, 2017 - filed by William J. Johansen. (Medford, Ipek)
June 21, 2017 Filing 48 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #43 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle)
June 19, 2017 Filing 47 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #43 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crosby Valve LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bradley, Paul)
June 19, 2017 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued re #44 Stipulation to EXTEND Time. This request does not meet Judge Sleet's requirements for such requests. The parties shall refer to Judge Sleet's requirements for filing requests to extend time on the court's website. After reviewing the procedure, the parties may RE-FILE the stipulation/motion. (mdb)
June 16, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint Including Exhibits Filed With Removal Upon Defendant Kunkle Industries, Inc. filed by William J. Johansen.(Medford, Ipek) Modified on 6/19/2017 (mdb).
June 16, 2017 Filing 45 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #43 Amended Complaint with Trial By Jury of Twelve Demanded , CROSSCLAIM Past, Present and Future against All Defendants by IMO Industries, Inc..(Ford, Eileen) Modified on 6/19/2017 (mdb).
June 15, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Kunkle Industries, Inc. on 6/15/2017. (lmm)
June 14, 2017 Filing 44 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EFFECTUATE Service of Process to September 13, 2017 - filed by William J. Johansen. (Medford, Ipek)
June 13, 2017 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by William J. Johansen. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Medford, Ipek)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #40 MOTION to Amend Complaint. The plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint separately upon entry of this order. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/13/2017. (mdb)
June 9, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Gardner Denver, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Samis, Krista)
June 9, 2017 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Samis, Krista)
June 9, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION to Amend Complaint - filed by William J. Johansen. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Amended Complaint BLACKLINED, #4 Amended Complaint CLEAN, #5 RULE 7.1.1 STATEMENT)(Medford, Ipek) Modified on 6/9/2017 (mdb).
May 31, 2017 Filing 39 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by The Fairbanks Company. (Sullivan, Timothy)
May 31, 2017 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Ampco Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(individually and as wholly-owned subsidiary of Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps). (Sullivan, Timothy)
May 31, 2017 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(individually and as wholly-owned subsidiary of Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps). (Sullivan, Timothy)
May 31, 2017 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Fairbanks Company. (Sullivan, Timothy)
May 26, 2017 Filing 35 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
May 26, 2017 Filing 34 Joint STATUS REPORT by Crane Co.. (Texter, Allison)
May 25, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Rochelle Libid Gumapac on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Gumapac, Rochelle)
May 25, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian J. Singewald on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Singewald, Christian)
May 12, 2017 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve U.S., Inc. filed by Flowserve U.S., Inc.. (Preston, Willard)
May 12, 2017 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Trial Demanded with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution and Indemnification against All Defendants by Flowserve U.S., Inc..(Preston, Willard) Modified on 6/7/2017 (mdb).
May 12, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Willard F. Preston, III on behalf of Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Preston, Willard)
May 5, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Crosby Valve LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bradley, Paul)
May 5, 2017 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate The J.R. Clarkson Company LLC for Crosby Valve LLC filed by Crosby Valve LLC. (Bradley, Paul)
May 5, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Robert Kinsley on behalf of Crosby Valve LLC (Kinsley, Donald)
May 5, 2017 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle)
May 5, 2017 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Honeywell International, Inc. filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Florax, Joelle)
May 5, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Florax, Joelle)
May 4, 2017 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Anchor/Darling Valve Company. (Primack, David)
May 4, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by David Phillip Primack on behalf of Anchor/Darling Valve Company (Primack, David)
April 28, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Crosby Valve LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Paul A. Bradley. Attorney Kelly A. Costello, Esq. terminated. (Bradley, Paul)
April 28, 2017 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc. filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
April 28, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/28/2017. (asw)
April 28, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Sullivan, III on behalf of The Fairbanks Company (Sullivan, Timothy)
April 28, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Sullivan, III on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Sullivan, Timothy)
April 27, 2017 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Metso Oy, Corporate Parent Metso USA, Inc. for Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. filed by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.. (Orr, Lindsay)
April 27, 2017 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Neles-Jamesbury, Inc..(Orr, Lindsay) Modified on 4/27/2017 (mdb).
April 27, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay B. Orr on behalf of Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. (Orr, Lindsay)
April 27, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Schoell on behalf of Neles-Jamesbury, Inc. (Schoell, Joseph)
April 26, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 24, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of ITT Corporation (Costello, Kelly)
April 24, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Incorporated (Costello, Kelly)
April 24, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Costello on behalf of Crosby Valve LLC (Costello, Kelly)
April 24, 2017 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with TRIAL BY JURY OF TWELVE DEMANDED , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Tyler, Jessica)
April 24, 2017 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Corporation, Other Affiliate IMO Industries, Inc. for Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Tyler, Jessica)
April 24, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Tyler on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Tyler, Jessica)
April 24, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Partick Daly on behalf of FMC Corporation (Daly, Daniel)
April 20, 2017 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Crane Co. (crb)
April 20, 2017 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
April 20, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior CT, Case Number N17C-02-140 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2125893)- filed by Crane Co. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 3B, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 4A, #8 Exhibit 4B, #9 Exhibit 4C, #10 Exhibit 4D, #11 Exhibit 4G, #12 Exhibit 4H, #13 Exhibit 4J, #14 Exhibit 4L, #15 Exhibit 4N, #16 Exhibit 4O, #17 Exhibit 4P, #18 Exhibit 4R, #19 Exhibit 4T, #20 Exhibit 4U, #21 Exhibit 5, #22 Exhibit 5A, #23 Exhibit 5B, #24 Exhibit 6, #25 Exhibit 7, #26 Exhibit 16, #27 Exhibit 19, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johansen v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Alexander Ranieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co. doing business as Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Grabey
Represented By: Paul D. Sunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Francis C. Gondek
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Allison L. Texter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Willard F. Preston, III
Represented By: Jessica L. Reno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Glenn
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Represented By: Rochelle Libid Gumapac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Signal, Inc., as a successor in interest to The Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Bros.
Represented By: Brian Tome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kunkle Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Engineering Holdings LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Grabey
Represented By: Paul D. Sunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Schoell
Represented By: Lindsay B. Orr
Represented By: Ryan T. Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red-White Valve Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fairbanks Company
Represented By: Timothy A. Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Lee Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve LLC
Represented By: Kelly A. Costello
Represented By: Donald Robert Kinsley
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor/Darling Valve Company
Represented By: David Phillip Primack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Marc J. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Johansen
Represented By: Bartholomew J. Dalton
Represented By: Adam Balick
Represented By: Andrew C Dalton
Represented By: Ipek Kurul Medford
Represented By: Michael Collins Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co.
Represented By: Elizabeth Grabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?