Biogen International GmbH et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC et al.
Plaintiff: Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc.
Defendant: TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Hetero USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Pharmathen S.A., Accord Healthcare Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Torrent Pharma Inc., Slayback Pharma India LLP, S&B Pharma, Inc., Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Shilpa Medicare Limited, Sawai USA Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., Sandoz Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., DBA Puracap Caribe, MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., TWi Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC, Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Puracap International LLC, Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Slayback Pharma LLC, Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Impax Laboratories Inc. and Sun Pharma Global FZE
Case Number: 1:2017cv00823
Filed: June 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Referring Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 411 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #410 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. USCA Case Number 21-1078 (mdb)
October 20, 2020 Notification regarding #410 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Hawkins (mal)
October 20, 2020 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re #410 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (mal)
October 20, 2020 Notification regarding #410 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Gunning (mal)
October 20, 2020 Notification regarding #410 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Gaffigan (mal)
October 20, 2020 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re #410 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number ADEDC-3277144.) (Balick, Steven)
October 20, 2020 Filing 410 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of #408 Judgment,,, . Appeal filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
September 23, 2020 Filing 409 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s). (Attachments: #1 Judgment)(mdb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 408 JUDGMENT in favor of Accord Healthcare Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Pharmathen S.A., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., S&B Pharma, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited, Slayback Pharma India LLP, Slayback Pharma LLC, TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. against Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/22/2020. (dlw)
September 21, 2020 Filing 407 PROPOSED ORDER // Proposed Judgment re 406 Oral Order by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Phillips, John) Modified on 9/22/2020 (dlw).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORAL ORDER re #405 Letter, #404 Proposed Order - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before 9/21/2020, the parties shall submit a single proposed form of judgment that has been discussed by the parties either in person or telephonically. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/18/2020. (dlw)
September 17, 2020 Filing 405 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Steven J. Balick regarding Biogen's Response to Defendants' Proposed Judgment and Accompanying Letter (D.I. 404). (Balick, Steven)
September 17, 2020 Filing 404 PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Judgment by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to Judge Noreika)(Phillips, John)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER re #402 Memorandum Opinion - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the judgment from the Northern District of West Virginia that the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514 are invalid for lack of written description applies in this consolidated action under the principles of collateral estoppel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before September 21, 2020, the parties shall submit a proposed form of judgment. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/16/2020. (dlw)
September 16, 2020 Filing 402 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/16/2020. (dlw)
August 31, 2020 Filing 401 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Mylan Launch. (Phillips, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 400 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Mylan's Launch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Phillips, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 399 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Daniel B. Rath, Esquire on behalf of Defendants Cipla Limited and Cipla USA Inc. regarding Recent Developments Since the August 11, 2020 Hearing on Collateral Estoppel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rath, Daniel)
August 17, 2020 Filing 398 Official Transcript of Teleconference held on 8/11/20 before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Court Reporter Dale C. Hawkins,Email: Dale_Hawkins@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2020. (Triozzi, Heather)
August 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Oral Argument Teleconference regarding collateral estoppel held on 8/11/2020. The court will take this matter under advisement and issue an Order in due course. (Court Reporter: Dale Hawkins.) (asw)
August 5, 2020 Filing 397 Official Transcript of Bench Trial held on 12/13/19 before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Court Reporter Dale C. Hawkins,Email: Dale_Hawkins@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2020. (Triozzi, Heather)
August 5, 2020 Filing 396 Official Transcript of Bench Trial held on 12/12/19 before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Court Reporter Dale C. Hawkins,Email: Dale_Hawkins@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2020. (Triozzi, Heather)
August 5, 2020 Filing 395 Official Transcript of Bench Trial held on 12/11/19 before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Court Reporter Dale C. Hawkins,Email: Dale_Hawkins@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2020. (Triozzi, Heather)
August 5, 2020 Filing 394 Official Transcript of Bench Trial held on 12/9/19 before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Court Reporter Dale C. Hawkins,Email: Dale_Hawkins@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2020. (Triozzi, Heather)
August 5, 2020 Filing 393 Official Transcript of Bench Trial held on 12/6/19 before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Court Reporter Dale C. Hawkins,Email: Dale_Hawkins@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2020. (Triozzi, Heather)
July 30, 2020 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Z. Miller on behalf of Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., Slayback Pharma India LLP, Slayback Pharma LLC (Miller, Jason)
July 29, 2020 Filing 391 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Arun J. Mohan by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA (Farnan, Kelly)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORAL ORDER re 389 Order Setting Teleconference - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants in the stayed actions shall attend the August 11, 2020 telephonic oral argument on the issue of collateral estoppel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent that there are issues unique to the Defendants in the stayed actions with respect to collateral estoppel, the Defendants in those actions shall make all reasonable efforts to coordinate their oral presentation of those unique issues. No additional written submissions will be accepted. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/23/2020. (dlw)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephonic oral argument on the collateral estoppel issue is set for 8/11/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Maryellen Noreika. The Court is setting aside two hours for this argument with the time to be split equally between Plaintiffs and Defendants. Counsel shall provide a dial-in for the teleconference by emailing this Court's judicial administrator. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/20/2020. (dlw)
July 7, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William F. Lee for Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
July 7, 2020 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William F. Lee for Biogen International GmbH,for Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
July 1, 2020 Filing 388 POST TRIAL BRIEF // Defendants' Supplemental Post-Trial Brief on the Invalidity of the '514 Patent by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Phillips, John) Modified on 7/2/2020 (dlw).
July 1, 2020 Filing 387 STATEMENT // Biogen's Submission Regarding Northern District of West Virginia Judgment by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 7/1/2020 (dlw).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #386 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Lee filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/1/2020. (dlw)
July 1, 2020 Filing 386 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Lee - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORAL ORDER re #384 Letter - Having reviewed Alkem's 6/25/2020 letter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Alkem's request that it be allowed to participate in the 5-page supplemental brief to be submitted by defendants is GRANTED. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/25/2020. (dlw)
June 25, 2020 Filing 384 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Bindu A. Palapura, Esquire on behalf of Defendants Alkem Laboratories Ltd. and S&B Pharma, Inc. regarding Supplemental Briefing - re 379 Oral Order, 377 Oral Order, 381 Oral Order, 383 Oral Order,. (Palapura, Bindu)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORAL ORDER re #382 Letter - Having reviewed Amneal's 6/24/2020 letter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Amneal's request that it be allowed to participate in the 5-page supplemental brief to be submitted by defendants is GRANTED. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/25/2020. (dlw)
June 24, 2020 Filing 382 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Anne Shea Gaza on behalf of Defendant Amneal regarding Supplemental Briefing - re 379 Oral Order, 377 Oral Order, 381 Oral Order,. (Gaza, Anne)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORAL ORDER re #380 Letter - Having reviewed Lupin's 6/23/2020 letter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Lupin's request that it be allowed to participate in the 5-page supplemental brief to be submitted by defendants is GRANTED. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/24/2020. (dlw)
June 23, 2020 Filing 380 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Kelly E. Farnan regarding Supplemental Briefing - re 379 Oral Order,. (Farnan, Kelly)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORAL ORDER re #378 Letter - Having reviewed Cipla's 6/22/2020 letter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Cipla's request that it be allowed to participate in the 5-page supplemental brief to be submitted by defendants is GRANTED. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/23/2020. (dlw)
June 22, 2020 Filing 378 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Daniel B. Rath, Esquire on behalf of Defendants Cipla Limited and Cipla USA Inc. regarding clarification of the Courts Oral Order of June 19, 2020 - re 377 Oral Order, #223 Stipulation. (Rath, Daniel)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORAL ORDER re #376 Letter - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before July 1, 2020, each side may submit a supplemental brief of no more than 5 pages double-spaced addressing the impact, if any, of the West Virginia Court's opinion on the issues pending before this Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/19/2020. (dlw)
June 18, 2020 Filing 376 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding Memorandum Opinion and Order in Biogen v. Mylan Pharma, N.D. W.Va. C.A. No. 1:17cv116. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Phillips, John)
May 12, 2020 Filing 375 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove John E. Nappi as co-counsel.. (Mayo, Andrew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 374 Biogen's Sur-Reply Brief on Validity of the '514 Patent re #373 Defendants' Reply to #359 Biogen's Responsive Post Trial Brief on Validity of the '514 Patent by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. (Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 3/17/2020 (dlw).
March 16, 2020 Filing 373 DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO #359 Biogen's Responsive Post Trial Brief on Validity of the '514 Patent by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.(dlw)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #372 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply In Opposition to Biogen's Responsive Post-Trial Brief on Validity of the '514 Patent. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs may file a response of no more than 4 pages on or before 3/17/2020. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/16/2020. (dlw)
March 13, 2020 Filing 372 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply In Opposition to Biogen's Responsive Post-Trial Brief on Validity of the '514 Patent - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John)
March 6, 2020 Filing 371 Letter to the Honorable Maryellen Noreika from David A. Bilson regarding hyperlinked post-trial briefing. (Phillips, John)
March 6, 2020 Filing 370 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Andrew C. Mayo regarding hyperlinked briefing. (Mayo, Andrew)
March 6, 2020 Filing 369 Defendants' Corrected Responsive Proposed Findings of Fact by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Phillips, John) Modified on 3/6/2020 (dlw).
March 6, 2020 Filing 368 DEFENDANTS' CORRECTED RESPONSIVE POST TRIAL BRIEF by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Phillips, John) Modified on 3/6/2020 (dlw).
March 6, 2020 Filing 367 Defendants' Second Corrected Proposed Findings of Fact by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Phillips, John) Modified on 3/6/2020 (dlw).
March 6, 2020 Filing 366 DEFENDANTS' SECOND CORRECTED POST TRIAL BRIEF by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Phillips, John) Modified on 3/6/2020 (dlw).
March 4, 2020 Filing 365 Corrected Proposed Findings of Fact by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Phillips, John) Modified on 3/4/2020 (dlw).
March 4, 2020 Filing 364 POST TRIAL BRIEF // Defendants' Corrected Post-Trial Brief by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Phillips, John) Modified on 3/4/2020 (dlw).
March 4, 2020 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 364 - 368 have been deleted from the docket at the request of counsel. The correct documents will be refiled. (dlw)
March 3, 2020 Filing 363 First Revised Proposed Findings of Fact on Secondary Considerations of Nonobviousness and Injunctive Relief by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. (Mayo, Andrew) Modified on 3/4/2020 (dlw).
March 3, 2020 Filing 362 POST TRIAL BRIEF // First Revised Opening Brief on Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness and Injunctive Relief by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 3/4/2020 (dlw).
March 2, 2020 Filing 361 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Sanya Sukduang as co-counsel.. (Mayo, Andrew)
February 28, 2020 Filing 360 Proposed Findings of Fact on Validity by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 3/2/2020 (dlw).
February 28, 2020 Filing 359 POST TRIAL BRIEF // Biogen's Responsive Brief on Validity of the '514 Patent by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 3/2/2020 (dlw).
February 28, 2020 Filing 358 Defendants' Responsive Findings of Fact by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Phillips, John) Modified on 3/2/2020 (dlw).
February 28, 2020 Filing 357 POST TRIAL BRIEF // Defendants' Responsive Post-Trial Brief by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Phillips, John) Modified on 3/2/2020 (dlw).
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #355 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the submission of all opening papers with hyperlinks to cases and evidence in connection with the parties' post-trial briefing to March 6, 2020 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/10/2020. (mdb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 356 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Jennifer L. Cree. Attorney James S. Green Jr. terminated. (Cree, Jennifer)
February 7, 2020 Filing 355 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the submission of all opening papers with hyperlinks to cases and evidence in connection with the parties' post-trial briefing to March 6, 2020 - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
February 6, 2020 Filing 354 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Steven J. Balick regarding Decision by the Patent Trial & Appeal Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Balick, Steven)
January 31, 2020 Filing 353 Biogen's Proposed Findings of Fact on Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness and Injunctive Relief by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 2/3/2020 (dlw).
January 31, 2020 Filing 352 POST TRIAL BRIEF // Biogen's Opening Brief on Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness and Injunctive Relief by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 2/3/2020 (dlw).
January 31, 2020 Filing 351 Proposed Findings of Fact by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Phillips, John)
January 31, 2020 Filing 350 POST TRIAL BRIEF // Defendants' Post-Trial Brief by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. (Phillips, John) Modified on 2/3/2020 (dlw).
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 SO ORDERED re #348 Stipulation Regarding Post-Trial Briefing Schedule (Set Briefing Schedule: Briefs due 1/31/2020 and 2/28/2020. Hyperlinked versions due 2/7/2020 and 3/6/2020). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/8/2020. (dlw)
January 7, 2020 Filing 348 STIPULATION Regarding Post-Trial Briefing, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
December 16, 2019 Filing 347 REDACTED VERSION of #335 Proposed Pretrial Order by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15, #2 Exhibit 16-20, #3 Exhibit 21-24, #4 Exhibit A1, #5 Exhibit A2)(Mayo, Andrew)
December 13, 2019 Filing 346 JOINT AO 187 Exhibit and Witness List. (mdb)
December 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Bench Trial Day 5 completed on 12/13/2019. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins & Val Gunning.) (mdb)
December 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Bench Trial Day 4 held on 12/12/2019. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins & Val Gunning.) (mdb)
December 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Bench Trial Day Three held on 12/11/2019. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (mdb)
December 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Megan L. Meyers for Biogen International GmbH,Megan L. Meyers for Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
December 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Bench Trial Day Two held on 12/9/2019. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins & Stacey Ingraham.) (mdb)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #345 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan L. Meyers filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Ordered by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/9/2019. (asw)
December 9, 2019 Filing 345 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan L. Meyers - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
December 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Bench Trial Day One held on 12/6/2019. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins & Stacey Ingraham.) (mdb)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #344 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maureen L. Rurka filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/5/2019. (dlw)
December 5, 2019 Filing 344 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Maureen L. Rurka - filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Bilson, David)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER AFTER PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Proposed Pretrial Order #335 is ADOPTED as modified by any discussion at the Pretrial Conference. Each side is given fifteen (15) hours for its opening and closing arguments, its direct and cross-examination of witnesses and argument of evidentiary issues. Plaintiffs' Motions in limine 1 through 3 are DENIED as stated at the Pretrial Conference. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/26/2019. (dlw)
November 26, 2019 Filing 342 Official Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on 11/25/2019 before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dale C. Hawkins,Email: Dale_Hawkins@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2020. (dh)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 SO ORDERED re #340 Stipulation of Dismissal. Party Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC terminated. Attorney James E. Nealon; Stephanie S. Riley; Arthur G. Connolly, III and Steven J. Moore terminated as to the Aurobindo Defendants ONLY. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/26/2019. (dlw)
November 25, 2019 Filing 340 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of the Aurobindo Action) by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Balick, Steven) Modified on 11/26/2019 (dlw).
November 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/25/2019. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (mdb)
November 22, 2019 Filing 339 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from John C. Phillips, Jr. regarding expert testimony of Dr. Wee Yong. (Phillips, John)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 SO ORDERED re #337 Stipulation of Dismissal of the Glenmark Action. Party Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA terminated. Attorney John R. McNair; John C. Phillips, Jr; Kevin E. Warner; David A. Bilson and George C. Lombardi terminated as to the Glenmark Defendants ONLY. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/22/2019. (dlw)
November 22, 2019 Filing 337 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of the Glenmark Action) by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 11/22/2019 (dlw).
November 20, 2019 Filing 336 REDACTED VERSION of #328 Stipulation by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
November 19, 2019 Filing 335 [SEALED] Proposed Pretrial Order by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15, #2 Exhibit 16-20, #3 Exhibit 21-24, #4 Exhibit A1, #5 Exhibit A2)(Mayo, Andrew)
November 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter M. Kohlhepp for Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORAL ORDER re #333 Letter - Having considered the parties' 11/15/2019 joint letter #333 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties will have thirty (30) hours for trial on validity and any remaining infringement issues. The time allocated shall be split equally between Plaintiffs and Defendants and shall include opening statements, presentation of evidence, evidentiary disputes, and closing arguments. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will hear opening statements at 12:00 PM on 12/6/2019. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the remainder of the trial will take place on 12/9/2019 from 8:30 AM to 6:00 PM and from 12/11/2019 through 12/13/2019 from 8:30 AM to 6:00 PM. (Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Opening arguments set for 12/6/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. A Bench Trial is set for 12/9/2019 and 12/11/2019 through 12/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/18/2019. (dlw)
November 15, 2019 Filing 333 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Steven J. Balick regarding the parties' joint submission in response to the Court's November 13, 2019 oral order concerning trial issues (D.I. 329). (Balick, Steven)
November 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Laura P. Masurovsky and John E. Nappi for Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 [SEALED] SO ORDERED re #330 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of the Sawai Action (17-875). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/14/2019. This order has been emailed to local counsel. (dlw)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 [SEALED] SO ORDERED re #328 Stipulation and Order of Partial Dismissal in the Sawai Action (17-875). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/14/2019. This order has been emailed to local counsel. (dlw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 330 [SEALED] STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of the Sawai Action) by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. (Balick, Steven) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dlw).
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 11/26/2019 Pretrial Conference is RESCHEDULED for 11/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 11/15/2019 the parties shall file a joint submission setting for the issues that remain for trial, the amount of time the parties believe is necessary for trial, and the parties' availability to begin trial during the week of 12/2/2019. (Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: A Pretrial Conference is set for 11/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/13/2019. (dlw)
November 13, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-MN through 1:17-cv-00825-MN, 1:17-cv-00828-MN, 1:17-cv-00845-MN through 1:17-cv-00847-MN, 1:17-cv-00849-MN through 1:17-cv-00857-MN, 1:17-cv-00872-MN, 1:17-cv-00874-MN, 1:17-cv-00875-MN, 1:17-cv-00954-MN, 1:18-cv-00337-MN, 1:18-cv-00623-MN, 1:18-cv-01361-MN, 1:19-cv-00303-MN, and 1:19-cv-00333-MN (rjb)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #326 Stipulation of Infringement by Zydus filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/13/19. (ntl)
November 11, 2019 Filing 328 [SEALED] STIPULATION (Stipulation and Order of Partial Dismissal in the Sawai Action), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
November 8, 2019 Filing 327 NOTICE of Defendants' Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited (Brauerman, Stephen)
November 8, 2019 Filing 326 STIPULATION of Infringement by Zydus by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
November 5, 2019 Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Riley on behalf of Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC (Riley, Stephanie)
November 5, 2019 Filing 324 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Dominick T. Gattuso regarding enclosing an updated DVD containing Defendants' tutorial on the technology - re #313 Stipulation, #322 Letter, #22 Scheduling Order,,,. (Gattuso, Dominick)
November 4, 2019 Filing 323 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven J. Balick regarding Biogen's Technology Tutorial. (Balick, Steven)
November 4, 2019 Filing 322 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Dominick T. Gattuso regarding Submission of Defendants' DVD containing their tutorial pursuant to Paragraph 11 of the Schedule Order - re SO ORDERED, #313 Stipulation, #22 Scheduling Order,,,. (Gattuso, Dominick)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #319 STIPULATION of Infringement by Sandoz and Prinston filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/4/19. (ntl)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #321 Stipulation of Infringement by Sawai filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/4/19. (ntl)
November 1, 2019 Filing 321 STIPULATION of Infringement by the Sawai Defendants by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #314 STIPULATION seeking to extend deadlines for Daubert Briefing Schedule filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/28/19. (ntl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 320 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Shailendra Maheshwari as co-counsel.. (Kraman, Pilar)
October 28, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. 319 per request of counsel. (ntl)
October 25, 2019 Filing 319 STIPULATION of Infringement by Sandoz and Prinston - by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Main Document 319 replaced on 10/28/2019) (ntl).
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 SO ORDERED, re #316 STIPULATION seeking to extend deadline for submission of joint pretrial order to November 19, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/24/19. (ntl)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #317 Stipulation of Infringement by MSN filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/25/19. (ntl)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #315 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of One of the Component Cases against the Hetero defendants (Biogen International GmbH v. Hetero USA Inc., et al., C.A. No. 19-211-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/24/19. (ntl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 317 STIPULATION of Infringement by MSN, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
October 17, 2019 Filing 316 STIPULATION seeking to extend deadline for submission of joint pretrial order to November 19, 2019 by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 315 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of One of the Component Cases against the Hetero defendants (Biogen International GmbH v. Hetero USA Inc., et al., C.A. No. 19-211-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
October 11, 2019 Filing 314 STIPULATION seeking to extend deadlines for Daubert Briefing Schedule by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #313 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Parties' Deadline for Submission of Technology Tutorials and Responsive Written Comments. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/7/2019. (etg)
October 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James E. Nealon for Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #312 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James E. Nealon filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC, Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/2/19. (ntl)
October 1, 2019 Filing 313 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Parties' Deadline for Submission of Technology Tutorials and Responsive Written Comments, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
October 1, 2019 Filing 312 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James E. Nealon - filed by Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC. (Connolly, Arthur)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #310 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter M. Kohlhepp filed by Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Shilpa Medicare Limited. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/20/19. (ntl)
September 18, 2019 Filing 311 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Stephen R. Byrn by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc. on September 25, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Gattuso, Dominick)
September 17, 2019 Filing 310 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter M. Kohlhepp - filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Peter M. Kohlhepp)(Brauerman, Stephen)
September 17, 2019 Filing 309 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John W. Lindsey on September 20, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
September 12, 2019 Filing 308 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ivan T. Hofmann on September 18, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #307 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Martin S. Masar III, PhD filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/12/19. (ntl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 307 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Martin S. Masar III, PhD - filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc.. (Gattuso, Dominick)
September 10, 2019 Filing 306 NOTICE to Take Deposition of V. Wee Yong on September 13, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 305 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gary A. Stobbe, M.D. on September 11, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #300 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Daubert Briefing Schedule to See Stipulation filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Sandoz Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/3/19. (ntl)
September 3, 2019 Filing 304 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Martin Duddy, M.D. on October 7, 2019 filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC, Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Pharmathen S.A., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., S&B Pharma, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited, Slayback Pharma India LLP, Slayback Pharma LLC, TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Phillips, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 303 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daniel Wynn, M.D. on September 23, 2019 filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC, Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Pharmathen S.A., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., S&B Pharma, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited, Slayback Pharma India LLP, Slayback Pharma LLC, TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Phillips, John)
September 3, 2019 Filing 302 NOTICE to Take Deposition of John C. Jarosz on October 1, 2019 filed by Accord Healthcare Inc., Alkem Laboratories Ltd., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC, Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Pharmathen S.A., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., S&B Pharma, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited, Slayback Pharma India LLP, Slayback Pharma LLC, TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Phillips, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 301 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chris D. Platsoucas, Ph.D., D.Sc. (H.C.) on September 6, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 300 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Daubert Briefing Schedule to See Stipulation - filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Bilson, David)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (11 in 1:19-cv-00333-LPS, 299 in 1:17-cv-00823-LPS) STIPULATION Concerning Consolidation, a Stay, Dismissal of Certain Claims, Infringement of Certain Claims, and Agreement to be Bound. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/26/19. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 1:19-cv-00333-LPS (ntl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 299 STIPULATION Concerning Consolidation, a Stay, Dismissal of Certain Claims, Infringement of Certain Claims, and Agreement to be Bound, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
August 22, 2019 Filing 298 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Sur Reply Expert Report of John C. Jarosz; (2) Sur Reply Expert Report of Stephen R. Byrn, Ph.D.; (3) Sur Reply Expert Report of Daniel Wynn, M.D.; (4) Sur Reply Expert Report of Robert Samuel Langer, Sc.D.; and (5) Sur Reply Expert Report of Martin Duddy, M.D.; filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 297 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Robert Samuel Langer by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc. (Gattuso, Dominick)
August 9, 2019 Filing 296 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Expert Report of Dr. Chris D. Platsoucas, Ph.D., D.Sc. (H.C.) and Appendices A [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
August 9, 2019 Filing 295 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Reply Expert Report of Dr. John William Lindsey, M.D.; (2) [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Reply Expert Report of Gary A. Stobbe, M.D.; (3) [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Reply Expert Report of Dr. V. Wee Yong, Ph.D.; and (4) Reply Expert Report of Ivan T. Hofmann filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 294 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Rebuttal Expert Report of Daniel R. Wynn, M.D.; (2) Rebuttal Expert Report of Stephen R. Byrn, Ph.D.; (3) Expert Report of John C. Jarosz; (4) Rebuttal Expert Report of Robert Samuel Langer, Sc.D.; and (5) Rebuttal Expert Report of Martin Duddy, M.D.; filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #293 Stipulated Order filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/1/19. (ntl)
June 24, 2019 Filing 293 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend Certain Deadlines, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #286 Stipulation of Infringement by Shilpa filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/20/19. (ntl)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #287 Stipulation of Infringement by Hetero filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/20/19. (ntl)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #288 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Initial Expert Reports regarding Infringment in connection with Hetero and Shilpa Actions to May 23, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/20/19. (ntl)
May 17, 2019 Filing 292 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Opening Expert Report of Daniel R. Wynn, M.D. regarding Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Infringement of U.S.Patent No. 8,399,514; (2) Opening Expert Report of Robert O. Williams, III. Ph.D. regarding Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514; (3) Opening Expert Report of Daniel R. Wynn, M.D. regarding MSN Laboratories Private Ltd. and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514; (4) Opening Expert Report of Robert O. Williams, III. Ph.D. regarding MSN Laboratories Private Ltd. and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514; (5) Opening Expert Report of Daniel R. Wynn, M.D. regarding Sawai USA, Inc. and Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.'s Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514; (6) Opening Expert Report of Robert O. Williams, III. Ph.D. regarding Sawai USA, Inc. and Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.'s Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514; (7) Opening Expert Report of Daniel R. Wynn, M.D. regarding Aurobindo Pharma Limited's Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514; (8) Opening Expert Report of Robert O. Williams, III. Ph.D. regarding Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC.'s Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514; (9) Opening Expert Report of Daniel R. Wynn, M.D. regarding Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514; (10) Opening Expert Report of Robert O. Williams, III. Ph.D. regarding Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514; (11) Opening Expert Report of Daniel R. Wynn, M.D. regarding Sandoz Inc.'s Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514; (12) Opening Expert Report of Robert O. Williams, III. Ph.D. regarding Sandoz Inc.'s Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,399,514 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 291 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sawai Defendants' Expert Report of Dr. Chris D. Platsoucas, PH.D., D.Sc. (H.C.) and Appendices A-B [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
May 17, 2019 Filing 290 NOTICE OF SERVICE of [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Expert Report of Gary A. Stobbe, M.D.; [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Expert Report of Dr. V. Wee Yong, Ph.D.; and [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Expert Report of Dr. John William Lindsey, M.D. filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
May 17, 2019 Filing 289 NOTICE OF SERVICE of [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Expert Report of Ivan T. Hofmann filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
May 15, 2019 Filing 288 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Serve Initial Expert Reports regarding Infringment in connection with Hetero and Shilpa Actions to May 23, 2019 - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
May 15, 2019 Filing 287 STIPULATION of Infringement by Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, and Hetero Labs Limited by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
May 15, 2019 Filing 286 STIPULATION of Infringement by Defendant Shilpa Medicare Limited by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
May 6, 2019 Filing 285 REDACTED VERSION of #283 Stipulation by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #283 Stipulation and Order Staying 17-855-LPS filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/1/19. (ntl)
April 29, 2019 Filing 284 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objection to the Disclosure of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information under the Stipulated Protective Order (D.I. 63) to Dr. Timothy L. Vollmer, M.D. filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
April 28, 2019 Filing 283 [SEALED] STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Pharmathen Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Pharmathen S.A., C.A. No. 17-855-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
April 26, 2019 Filing 282 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, LLC Objection to Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC.(Connolly, Arthur)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #280 Stipulation and Order to Amend Scheduling Order (D.I. 22). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/22/19. (ntl)
April 20, 2019 Filing 281 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vijay Raghavan on May 1, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
April 19, 2019 Filing 280 STIPULATION and [Proposed Order] to Amend Scheduling Order by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.. (Phillips, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 279 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Christopher M. Bruno as co-counsel.. (Farnan, Kelly)
April 15, 2019 Filing 278 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation - Frank D. Rodriguez and James P. Barabas by Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., Slayback Pharma India LLP, Slayback Pharma LLC (Ormerod, Eve)
April 12, 2019 Filing 277 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven J. Balick regarding the Parties' Joint Interim Status Report. (Balick, Steven)
April 11, 2019 Filing 276 ANSWER to #249 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Balick, Steven)
April 8, 2019 Filing 275 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lesley Zhu on April 11, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 274 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Toshihiro Yanagi on April 11, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 273 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Yoshiki Ozawa on April 9, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
April 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric J. Fues for Biogen International GmbH added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02054-LPS, 1:17-cv-00823-LPS(ceg)
April 2, 2019 Filing 272 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vijay Nasare on April 5, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (271 in 1:17-cv-00823-LPS)(25 in 1:18-cv-02054-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Fues filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/1/19. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 1:18-cv-02054-LPS (ntl)
April 1, 2019 Filing 271 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric J. Fues - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
March 29, 2019 Filing 270 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Fourth Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and Defendants' Second Supplemental Joint Noninfringement Contentions filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited.(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 29, 2019 Filing 269 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Biogen's Notice of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
March 29, 2019 Filing 268 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Biogen's Objections and Responses to Pharmathen's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
March 29, 2019 Filing 267 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Biogen's Objections and Responses to Sandoz's First Set of Requests for Admissions (Nos. 1-15) filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
March 29, 2019 Filing 266 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Biogen's Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Requests for Admissions (Nos. 1-23) filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
March 28, 2019 Filing 265 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Third Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and Defendants' First Supplemental Joint Noninfringement Contentions filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited.(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 28, 2019 Filing 264 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, and Hetero Labs Limited's First Supplemental Noninfringement Contentions filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 27, 2019 Filing 263 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Shilpa Medicare Limited's Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories (NOS. 1-12) filed by Shilpa Medicare Limited.(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 27, 2019 Filing 262 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, and Hetero Labs Limited's Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories (NOS. 1-12) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 27, 2019 Filing 261 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-12) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 260 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant MSN Laboratories Private Ltd. and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Response to Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-12); (2) Defendant Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Response to Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-12); and (3) Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Response to Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-12) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 259 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pharmathen S.A.s Objections and Responses to Biogens First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-12) filed by Pharmathen S.A..(Kraman, Pilar)
March 27, 2019 Filing 258 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sawai Defendants' Responses and Objections to Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-12) [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL Pursuant to Protective Order - Contains Sawai Defendants' Highly Confidential Information] filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
March 27, 2019 Filing 257 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pharmathen S.A.s Privilege Log filed by Pharmathen S.A..(Kraman, Pilar)
March 26, 2019 Filing 256 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kondal Reddy Bairy on March 28, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 255 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vatsal Shah on March 28, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
March 25, 2019 Filing 254 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pharmathen S.A.s Objections and Responses to Biogens Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Pharmathen S.A..(Kraman, Pilar)
March 22, 2019 Filing 253 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Shilpa Medicare Limited's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Shilpa Medicare Limited.(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 22, 2019 Filing 252 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, and Hetero Labs Limited's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 22, 2019 Filing 251 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures of Plaintiffs; (2) Biogen Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery; (3) Biogen Initial Discovery in Patent Litigation Pursuant Paragraph 4(a) of the Default Standard for Discovery; and (4) Plaintiffs Initial Infringement Contentions filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
March 21, 2019 Filing 250 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, and Hetero Labs Limited's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and Defendants Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, and Hetero Labs Limited's Initial Disclosures Under Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 249 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. by Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero USA Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 19, 2019 Filing 248 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gregory Seitz on March 28, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #244 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura P. Masurovsky, John E. Nappi, and Aaron G. Clay filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/19/19. (ntl)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #243 Stipulated Order filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/18/19. (ntl)
March 19, 2019 Filing 247 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vatsal Shah on March 28, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
March 17, 2019 Filing 246 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Scott McGuinness on March 19, 2019 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Balick, Steven)
March 15, 2019 Filing 245 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sawai Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition of Defendant Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
March 15, 2019 Filing 244 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura P. Masurovsky, John E. Nappi, and Aaron G. Clay - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
March 15, 2019 Filing 243 STIPULATION Seeking Leave to Take Certain Depositions of the Sawai Defendants after the Close of Fact Discovery, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
March 14, 2019 Filing 242 REDACTED VERSION of #239 Stipulation of Dismissal by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
March 11, 2019 Filing 241 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Biogen's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (No. 72) and Biogen's Objections and Responses to Defendants' Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 15) filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #239 Stipulation of Dismissal -- Party Sun Pharma Global FZE terminated. Attorney Samuel Sherry; Samantha G. Wilson; Huiya Wu; Naomi L. Birbach and Anne Shea Gaza terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/8/19. (ntl)
March 8, 2019 Filing 240 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant MSN Laboratories Private Ltd. and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Bilson, David)
March 7, 2019 Filing 239 [SEALED] STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Dismissal of Biogen MA Inc. v. Sun Pharma Global FZE, C.A. No. 17-848-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
March 7, 2019 Filing 238 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition; and (2) Defendant Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER re #236 Memorandum Opinion regarding claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/7/19. (ntl)
March 7, 2019 Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/7/19. (ntl)
March 7, 2019 Filing 235 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories to Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.; (2) Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories to Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III and Hetero Labs Limited; (3) Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories to Shilpa Medicare Limited; (4) Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories to Sun Pharma Global FZE; (5) Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories to Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc. and Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC; (6) Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories to Sawai USA, Inc. and Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.; (7) Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories to Pharmathen S.A.; (8) Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories to MSN Laboratories Private Ltd and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.; (9) Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories to Sandoz, Inc.; (10) Biogen's First Set of Interrogatories to Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.; and (11) Biogen's Second Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' Interrogatory Nos. 8, 9 and 11 and Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' Interrogatory Nos. 1-2, 13 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 234 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 28, 2019 Filing 233 NOTICE of Change of Address by Arthur G. Connolly, III (Connolly, Arthur)
February 28, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 229 (Notice of Service) was removed from the docket per request of counsel. (ntl)
February 28, 2019 Filing 232 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pharmathen S.A.s First Set of Individualized Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) to Plaintiffs Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc. filed by Pharmathen S.A..(Kraman, Pilar)
February 27, 2019 Filing 231 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs Biogen International GMBH and Biogen MA Inc. filed by Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 27, 2019 Filing 230 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc. filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
February 25, 2019 Filing 228 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notices of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) of Defendants Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero Labs Limited, Shilpa Medicare Limited, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC, Sawai USA, Inc., Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Pharmathen S.A., MSN Laboratories Private Ltd, MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. and Sandoz, Inc. filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
February 15, 2019 Filing 227 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Party Subpoena filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brauerman, Stephen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 226 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Party Subpoena filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brauerman, Stephen)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #224 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dismissal of Biogen MA Inc. v. Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd., et al., C.A. No. 18-121-LPS) -- Party Puracap International LLC, Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd. and DBA Puracap Caribe terminated. Attorney Eve H. Ormerod; Alan Tenenbaum; Jing Xia; Neal C. Belgam and Philip Y. Braginsky terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/11/19. (ntl)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #223 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Cipla Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Cipla Ltd., et al.., C.A. No. 17-851-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/11/19. (ntl)
February 8, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc.; and (2) Defendants' Third Set of Common Requests for Documents and Things to Plaintiffs Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc. (Request No. 72) filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 224 [SEALED] STIPULATION of Dismissal (Dismissal of Biogen MA Inc. v. Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd., et al., C.A. No. 18-121-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
February 7, 2019 Filing 223 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Cipla Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Cipla Ltd., et al.., C.A. No. 17-851-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
January 28, 2019 Filing 222 Official Transcript of Claim Construction Hearing held on January 9, 2019 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2019.(bpg)
January 24, 2019 Filing 221 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stamatios Stamoulis (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 23, 2019 Filing 220 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vicky Brown on February 8, 2019 [Second Deposition] filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
January 23, 2019 Filing 219 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tracey Dawson on January 30, 2019 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
January 23, 2019 Filing 218 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Matvey Lukashev on January 24, 2019 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
January 23, 2019 Filing 217 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gilmore O'Neill on February 4, 2019 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
January 23, 2019 Filing 216 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hans-Peter Strebel on January 29, 2019 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
January 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Markman Hearing held on 1/9/2019. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) (ntl)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #214 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Macleods Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Macleods Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., et al., C.A. No. 17-857-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/8/19. (ntl)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #213 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Alkem/S&B Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Alkem Laboratories Ltd., et al., C.A. No. 17-850-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/8/19. (ntl)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Markman Hearing on January 9 will begin at 5:00 PM and each side will be allocated 20 minutes for argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/7/19. (ntl)
January 4, 2019 Filing 214 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Macleods Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Macleods Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., et al., C.A. No. 17-857-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
January 4, 2019 Filing 213 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Alkem/S&B Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Alkem Laboratories Ltd., et al., C.A. No. 17-850-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
January 2, 2019 Filing 212 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pharmathen S.A.s First Supplemental Noninfringement Contentions filed by Pharmathen S.A..(Kraman, Pilar)
December 17, 2018 Filing 211 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Katherine Dawson, M.D. on December 20, 2018 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Markman Hearing scheduled for January 8 is RESCHEDULED for January 9, 2019 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 6B. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/14/18. (ntl)
December 13, 2018 Filing 209 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Vicky Brown on December 14, 2018 filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc..(Green, James)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Markman hearing is RESCHEDULED for January 8, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. Each side will be allocated 45 minutes for argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/11/18. (ntl)
December 6, 2018 Filing 207 REDACTED VERSION of #202 Claim Construction Answering Brief by Pharmathen S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H through N)(Kraman, Pilar)
December 3, 2018 Filing 206 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tammy Sarnelli on December 5, 2018 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
December 3, 2018 Filing 205 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Carmen Bozic on December 10, 2018 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
November 30, 2018 Filing 204 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Andrew C. Mayo regarding Claim Construction Hearing. (Mayo, Andrew)
November 30, 2018 Filing 203 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF re #194 Claim Construction Opening Brief filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-D)(Mayo, Andrew)
November 30, 2018 Filing 202 [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ANSWERING BRIEF filed by Pharmathen S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H through N)(Kraman, Pilar)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #201 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Sun Pharma Global FZE (Sun) to substantially complete its document production to December 19, 2018 and (ii) for Plaintiff Biogen MA Inc. to substantially complete its document production to Sun to December 19, 2018 filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/30/18. (ntl)
November 28, 2018 Filing 201 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Sun Pharma Global FZE (Sun) to substantially complete its document production to December 19, 2018 and (ii) for Plaintiff Biogen MA Inc. to substantially complete its document production to Sun to December 19, 2018 - filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE. (Wilson, Samantha)
November 28, 2018 Filing 200 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiffs Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) on January 24, 2019 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 199 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of William A. Rakoczy, Rachel P. Waldron, Erin M. Forbes, Thomas H. Ehrich and Christopher P. Galligan by Sandoz Inc. (Phillips, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 198 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Cara Lansden on November 14, 2018 filed by MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
November 6, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert O. Williams, III, Ph.D. on November 16, 2018, beginning at 9:00 a.m. filed by Pharmathen S.A..(Kraman, Pilar)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #193 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff Biogen MA Inc. and Defendant Sun Pharma Global FZE to substantially complete document production to November 28, 2018 filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/5/18. (ntl)
October 31, 2018 Filing 196 DECLARATION re #195 Claim Construction Opening Brief (Declaration of Robert O. Williams, III, Ph.D.) by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
October 31, 2018 Filing 195 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Mayo, Andrew)
October 31, 2018 Filing 194 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Pharmathen S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through G, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kraman, Pilar)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #192 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for i) Defendants Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd. dba Puracap Caribe and Puracap International LLC ("Puracap") to substantially complete its document production to November 8, 2018 and (ii) for Plaintiff Biogen M filed by Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd., DBA Puracap Caribe, Puracap International LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/30/18. (ntl)
October 29, 2018 Filing 193 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff Biogen MA Inc. and Defendant Sun Pharma Global FZE to substantially complete document production to November 28, 2018 - filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE. (Wilson, Samantha)
October 29, 2018 Filing 192 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for i) Defendants Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd. dba Puracap Caribe and Puracap International LLC ("Puracap") to substantially complete its document production to November 8, 2018 and (ii) for Plaintiff Biogen MA Inc. to substantially complete its document production to Puracap to November 8, 2018 - filed by Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd., DBA Puracap Caribe, Puracap International LLC. (Ormerod, Eve)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #191 Stipulated Order Seeking to Extend the Claim Construction Opening Brief and Technology Tutorial Deadlines filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/24/18. (ntl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 191 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Claim Construction Opening Brief and Technology Tutorial Deadlines, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #190 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi, Kevin E. Warner, John R. McNair, Dan H. Hoang and Katherine D. Hundt filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/18/18. (ntl)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #188 Stipulated Order re claim construction dates filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/18. (ntl)
October 17, 2018 Filing 190 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi, Kevin E. Warner, John R. McNair, Dan H. Hoang and Katherine D. Hundt - filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of George C. Lombardi, #2 Certification of Kevin E. Warner, #3 Certification of John R. McNair, #4 Certification of Dan H. Hoang, #5 Certification of Katherine D. Hundt)(Bilson, David)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #189 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for substantial completion of document production to October 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/17/18. (ntl)
October 12, 2018 Filing 189 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for i) Defendants Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd. dba Puracap Caribe and Puracap International LLC ("Puracap") to substantially complete its document production to October 29, 2018 and (ii) for Plaintiff Biogen MA Inc. to substantially complete its document production to Puracap to October 29, 2018 - filed by Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd., DBA Puracap Caribe, Puracap International LLC. (Ormerod, Eve)
October 11, 2018 Filing 188 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend Certain Claim Construction and Technology Tutorial Deadlines, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #184 Stipulated Order filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/4/18. (ntl)
October 3, 2018 Filing 187 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited.(Brauerman, Stephen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 186 REDACTED VERSION of #180 Stipulation [Stipulated Order Joining Party in Interest] by Sandoz Inc.. (Bilson, David)
October 2, 2018 Filing 185 CLAIM Construction Chart by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Joint Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Joint Exhibits 1-9, #3 Plaintiffs' Exhibits 1-2, #4 Defendants' Exhibits 1-17)(Mayo, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #183 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for i) Defendant Sun Pharma Global FZE (Sun) to substantially complete its document production to October 29, 2018 and (ii) for Plaintiff Biogen MA Inc. to substantially complete its document production to Sun to October 29, filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE, #182 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Substantial Completion of Document Production to October 12, 2018 filed by Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd., DBA Puracap Caribe, Puracap International LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/2/18. (ntl)
October 1, 2018 Filing 184 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Deadline by which the Parties Must File Their Joint Claim Construction Chart, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
September 28, 2018 Filing 183 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for i) Defendant Sun Pharma Global FZE (Sun) to substantially complete its document production to October 29, 2018 and (ii) for Plaintiff Biogen MA Inc. to substantially complete its document production to Sun to October 29, 2018 - filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE. (Wilson, Samantha)
September 28, 2018 Filing 182 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Substantial Completion of Document Production to October 12, 2018 - filed by Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd., DBA Puracap Caribe, Puracap International LLC. (Ormerod, Eve)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (22 in 1:17-cv-00874-LPS, 180 in 1:17-cv-00823-LPS) STIPULATION Regarding Joinder filed by Sandoz Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/27/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 1:17-cv-00874-LPS (ntl)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #181 Stipulated Order filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/27/18. (ntl)
September 26, 2018 Filing 181 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Deadline by which the Parties Must File Their Joint Claim Construction Chart, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
September 26, 2018 Filing 180 [SEALED] STIPULATION Regarding Joinder by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc.. (Phillips, John)
September 24, 2018 Filing 179 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Emily N. Winfield, Patrick C. Gallagher and Vincent L. Capuano as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer affiliated with the case. (Phillips, John)
September 24, 2018 Filing 178 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney John C. Phillips, Jr. Attorney Richard L. Renck terminated. (Phillips, John)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #177 Stipulated Order filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/24/18. (ntl)
September 21, 2018 Filing 177 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Deadline by which the Parties Must File Their Joint Claim Construction Chart, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (174 in 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 5 in 1:18-cv-01361-LPS) STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Windlas Actions (Biogen MA Inc. v. Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd., C.A. No. 17-849-LPS; Biogen International GmbH v. Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd., C.A. No. 18-1361-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/17/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 1:18-cv-01361-LPS (ntl)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (175 in 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-01361-LPS) Stipulated Order filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/18/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 1:18-cv-01361-LPS (ntl)
September 14, 2018 Filing 176 REDACTED VERSION of #172 Stipulation of Dismissal by Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
September 14, 2018 Filing 175 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Deadline by Which the Parties Must File Their Joint Claim Construction Chart, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #172 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Component Case Against Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. (Biogen MA Inc. v. Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., C.A. No. 17-827-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/11/18. (ntl)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #171 Joint STIPULATION and Order Staying Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/10/18. (ntl)
September 11, 2018 Filing 174 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Windlas Actions (Biogen MA Inc. v. Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd., C.A. No. 17-849-LPS; Biogen International GmbH v. Windlas Healthcare, Pvt. Ltd., C.A. No. 18-1361-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
September 10, 2018 Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Biogen's Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' Interrogatory Nos. 8-12 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 172 [SEALED] STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Component Case Against Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. (Biogen MA Inc. v. Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., C.A. No. 17-827-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
September 7, 2018 Filing 171 Joint STIPULATION and Order Staying Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Gaza, Anne)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #169 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Torrent Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., et al., C.A. No. 17-854-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/6/18. (ntl)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #163 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Accord Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Accord Healthcare Inc., C.A. No. 17-872-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/18. (ntl)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #162 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the TWi Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. TWi Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al., C.A. No. 17-856-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/18. (ntl)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #160 STIPULATION and Order Staying Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., et al. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/18. (ntl)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' recent letters (D.I. 151, 164, 165, 167, 168), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' request to require Plaintiff "to identify the patent to which it will apply the PTE" (D.I. 167 at 1) is DENIED. Instead, the Court agrees with Plaintiff that it is most appropriate to "allow the PTO to complete its review." (D.I. 168 at 1) After the PTO completes its review, Plaintiff shall, as it indicates it will (see id.) "promptly identify the patent it will elect for PTE pursuant to the Patent Office's procedures for doing so." The Court is not persuaded that discovery in this matter is being materially or prejudicially impacted by Plaintiff's approach. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the teleconference scheduled for tomorrow, September 7, is CANCELLED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/6/18. (ntl)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #166 Stipulation and Order Regarding Voluntary Dismissal of Impax Laboratories Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/4/18. (ntl)
September 5, 2018 Filing 169 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Torrent Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd., et al., C.A. No. 17-854-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
August 31, 2018 Filing 168 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven J. Balick regarding Plaintiffs' Answering Letter-Brief on the Issue of Patent Term Extension - re #165 Letter,. (Balick, Steven)
August 31, 2018 Filing 167 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman regarding Responsive Letter Pursuant to the Court's August 23, 2018 Order - re 157 Order Setting Teleconference,,,. (Brauerman, Stephen)
August 31, 2018 Filing 166 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Two Component Cases Against Impax Laboratories, Inc. (Biogen MA Inc. v. Impax Laboratories, Inc., C.A. No. 17-826-LPS and Biogen International GmbH v. Impax Laboratories, Inc., C.A. No. 18-350-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
August 29, 2018 Filing 165 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman regarding Court's August 23, 2018 Order - re 157 Order Setting Teleconference,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Brauerman, Stephen)
August 29, 2018 Filing 164 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven J. Balick regarding Plaintiffs' Opening Letter-Brief on the Issue of Patent Term Extension, in Response to the Court's August 23, 2018 Oral Order (D.I. 157). (Balick, Steven)
August 29, 2018 Filing 163 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Accord Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Accord Healthcare Inc., C.A. No. 17-872-LPS) by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
August 28, 2018 Filing 162 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the TWi Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. TWi Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al., C.A. No. 17-856-LPS) by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 9/17/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/28/2018. (dlb)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #156 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Graviti Action (Biogen MA Inc. v. Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., et al., C.A. No. 17-846-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/24/18. (ntl)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #155 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Slayback Action (Biogen MA Inc. v. Slayback Pharma LLC, et al., C.A. No. 17-828-LPS). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/24/18. (ntl)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION and Order Staying Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., et al. by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. (Bilson, David)
August 23, 2018 Filing 159 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Preliminary List of Proposed Claim Term Constructions filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen)
August 23, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd. dba Puracap Caribe and Puracap International LLC's Disclosure of Additional Claim Term for Construction filed by Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd., DBA Puracap Caribe, Puracap International LLC.(Ormerod, Eve)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' recent letters (D.I. 151, 152), the Court agrees with Defendants that it is appropriate at this time for the parties to file letter briefs, each not to exceed three (3) pages, to provide the Court more detail on their dispute as to patent term extension and its impact, if any, on discovery and case management generally. Accordingly, each side may file letters, not to exceed three (3) pages, on August 29, and responsive letters, not to exceed two (2) pages, on August 31. The Court will discuss the subject(s) of the letters with the parties during a teleconference on September 7 at 1:30 p.m., unless it determines after review of the letters that such a discussion is unnecessary, in which event it will cancel the call. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the call to (302) 573-4571. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/23/18. (ntl)
August 22, 2018 Filing 156 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Graviti Action (Biogen MA Inc. v. Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., et al., C.A. No. 17-846-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
August 22, 2018 Filing 155 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Slayback Action (Biogen MA Inc. v. Slayback Pharma LLC, et al., C.A. No. 17-828-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
August 21, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Macleods Pharmaceuticals, LTD and Macleods Pharma USA, Inc.s Objections and Responses to Diogens First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
August 20, 2018 Filing 153 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd. dba Puracap Caribe and Puracap International LLC's (1) [CONFIDENTIAL] Initial Invalidity Contentions and (2) [CONFIDENTIAL] Initial Joint Noninfringement Contentions filed by Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd., DBA Puracap Caribe, Puracap International LLC.(Ormerod, Eve)
August 20, 2018 Filing 152 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven J. Balick regarding Biogen's Response to Defendants' August 17, 2018 Letter - re #151 Letter. (Balick, Steven)
August 17, 2018 Filing 151 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman regarding Discovery Dispute over Patent Term Extension. (Brauerman, Stephen)
August 7, 2018 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13); (2) Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s First Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and (3) Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s First Amended Disclosures Under Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Sandoz Inc..(Phillips, John)
August 7, 2018 Filing 149 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Alison M. Hill as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer at the firm of Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, LLP. (Green, James)
August 7, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Shailendra K. Maheshwari,Yun Wei for Pharmathen S.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 6, 2018 Filing 148 ANSWER to #126 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Answer to Pharmathen S.A.'s Amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Balick, Steven)
August 6, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Alkem and S&B's Responses and Objections to Biogen's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd., S&B Pharma, Inc..(Moore, David)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #144 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shailendra Maheshwari and Yun Wei filed by Pharmathen S.A. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/6/18. (ntl)
August 2, 2018 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Claim Terms for Construction filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
August 2, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Preliminary List of Proposed Claim Terms filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited.(Brauerman, Stephen)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #143 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Lupin Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, C.A. No. 17-853-LPS) filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/1/18. (ntl)
August 1, 2018 Filing 144 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shailendra Maheshwari and Yun Wei - filed by Pharmathen S.A.. (Kraman, Pilar)
July 31, 2018 Filing 143 STIPULATION Seeking a Stay of the Lupin Action (Biogen International GmbH, et al. v. Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, C.A. No. 17-853-LPS), by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
July 31, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sun Pharma Global FZE's Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE.(Wilson, Samantha)
July 31, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC's Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Wilson, Samantha)
July 30, 2018 Filing 140 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM to DI 1 in 17-853-LPS against Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA.(Farnan, Kelly)
July 30, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Requests to Defendants for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
July 30, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Torrent Pharma Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
July 30, 2018 Filing 137 STIPULATION To Amend Answer And Counterclaims by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA. (Attachments: #1 Lupin Atlantis Holdings SAs Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims)(Farnan, Kelly)
July 30, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, and Hetero Labs Limited's Responses to Biogen's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc..(Bussiere, Sara)
July 30, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Twi Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s and Twi Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Bilson, David)
July 30, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant MSN Laboratories Private Ltd. and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13); and (2) Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Bilson, David)
July 30, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Shilpa Medicare Limited's Responses to Biogen's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Shilpa Medicare Limited.(Bussiere, Sara)
July 30, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sawai Defendants' Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
July 30, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PRIOR TO 6PM on 7.30.18 - Defendant Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.s Objections and Responses to Biogens First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Renck, Richard)
July 30, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Slayback Pharma LLC and Slayback Pharma India LLP's Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents Nos. 1-13 filed by Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd., Slayback Pharma India LLP, Slayback Pharma LLC.(Ormerod, Eve)
July 30, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Objections and Responses to Biogen's 1st Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC.(Connolly, Arthur)
July 30, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PRIOR TO 6PM ON Friday, July 27, 2018 - Defendant Windlas Healthcare, PVT. Ltd.s Objections and Responses to Biogens First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd..(Renck, Richard)
July 27, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Biogen's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) re #120 Notice of Service, filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc..(Green, James)
July 23, 2018 Filing 126 AMENDED ANSWER to, Amended COUNTERCLAIM to D.I. 1 in 17-cv-855-LPS against All Plaintiffs by Pharmathen S.A.. (Kraman, Pilar)
July 23, 2018 Filing 125 STIPULATION to Amend Answer and Counterclaims by Pharmathen S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kraman, Pilar)
July 19, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pharmathen S.A.s Objections and Responses to Biogens First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Pharmathen S.A..(Poff, Adam)
July 13, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Loni L. Morrow for Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #123 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Loni L. Morrow filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/13/18. (ntl)
July 12, 2018 Filing 123 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Loni L. Morrow - filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification By Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Green, James)
July 11, 2018 Filing 122 ANSWER to #116 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
July 10, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Zydus's [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL-OUTSIDE COUNSEL ONLY] Noninfringement Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,509,376; and (2) Zydus's Initial Invalidity Contentions Regarding U.S. Patent 6,509,376 filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
July 10, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Biogen's Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-69), Biogen's Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-7) and Biogen's First Set of Requests to Defendants for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-13) filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
July 9, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul W. Browning for Biogen International GmbH added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
July 3, 2018 Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Infringement Contentions filed by Biogen International GmbH.(Mayo, Andrew)
June 29, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc.; and (2) Defendants' Second Set of Common Requests for Documents and Things to Plaintiffs Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc. (Request Nos. 70-71) filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Impax Laboratories LLC, MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #117 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul W. Browning filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/29/18. (ntl)
June 28, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul W. Browning - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
June 28, 2018 Filing 116 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA.(Phillips, John)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #115 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendants Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/27/18. (ntl)
June 27, 2018 Filing 115 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendants Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Phillips, John)
June 22, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Sandoz Inc. and Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.'s [CONFIDENTIAL] Initial Noninfringement Contentions and (2) Defendants Sandoz Inc. and Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David)
June 14, 2018 Filing 113 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC for Impax Laboratories LLC filed by Impax Laboratories LLC. (Bilson, David)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #112 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Reflect Name Change by Impax Laboratories Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/13/18. (ntl)
June 11, 2018 Filing 112 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Reflect Name Change by Impax Laboratories Inc.. (Phillips, John)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #105 Stipulated Order filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc., #104 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Sandoz Inc. to produce its initial invalidity contentions and initial non-infringement contentions to June 22, 2018 filed by Sandoz Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/11/18. (ntl)
June 11, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pharmathen S.A.'s Initial Noninfringement Contentions filed by Pharmathen S.A..(Kraman, Pilar)
June 8, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Noninfringement Contentions filed by Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
June 8, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Torrent Defendants' Initial Noninfringement Contentions filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
June 8, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL - OUTSIDE COUNSEL ONLY] Initial Noninfringement Contentions filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
June 8, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' [CONFIDENTIAL] Initial Joint Noninfringement Contentions and Defendants' Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
June 8, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, and Hetero Labs Limited's Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen)
June 8, 2018 Filing 105 STIPULATION Extending the Deadline by Which Defendant Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. Must Serve its Initial Invalidity and Non-Infringment Contentions, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
June 8, 2018 Filing 104 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Sandoz Inc. to produce its initial invalidity contentions and initial non-infringement contentions to June 22, 2018 - filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Phillips, John)
June 6, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Contentions filed by Biogen International GmbH.(Mayo, Andrew)
May 22, 2018 Filing 102 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Corporate Parent APHC Holdings, LLC for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Gaza, Anne)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #99 Stipulation of Dismissal -- Party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. terminated. Attorney Samuel Sherry; Samantha G. Wilson; Huiya Wu; Naomi L. Birbach and Anne Shea Gaza terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/16/18. (ntl)
May 15, 2018 Filing 101 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Impax Laboratories Inc. filed by Impax Laboratories Inc.. (Bilson, David)
May 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Todd S. Werner for Shilpa Medicare Limited, Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero Labs Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (fms)
May 14, 2018 Filing 100 REDACTED VERSION of #99 Stipulation of Dismissal by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
May 11, 2018 Filing 99 [SEALED] STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Gaza, Anne)
May 8, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' First Set of Common Requests for Documents and Things to Plaintiffs Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc. (Request Nos. 1-69); and (2) Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs Biogen International GmbH and Biogen MA Inc. filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Impax Laboratories Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #97 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for certain disclosures and production deadlines as set forth in the Stipulation to May 11, 2018 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/2/18. (ntl)
April 30, 2018 Filing 97 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for certain disclosures and production deadlines as set forth in the Stipulation to May 11, 2018 - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #95 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to produce their New Drug Application to June 11, 2018 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/13/18. (ntl)
April 12, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Contentions filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #94 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd S. Werner filed by Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited, Shilpa Medicare Limited. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/11/18. (ntl)
April 10, 2018 Filing 95 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to produce their New Drug Application to June 11, 2018 - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 10, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd S. Werner - filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited. (Attachments: #1 (Certification of Todd S. Werner))(Brauerman, Stephen)
April 10, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jeffer Ali as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer at the law Firm, Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh, Lindquist & Schuman, P.A.. (Brauerman, Stephen)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #92 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Various Deadlines to various dates - see Stipulation for Details filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/5/18. (ntl)
March 30, 2018 Filing 92 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Various Deadlines to various dates - see Stipulation for Details - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
March 30, 2018 Filing 91 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Scott Feder as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer affiliated with Locke Lord LLP. (Phillips, John)
March 29, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gary Ji for Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 1:17-cv-00854-LPS(nmg)
March 23, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney George C. Lombardi for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi filed by Impax Laboratories Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Sandoz Inc., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/20/18. (ntl)
March 19, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George C. Lombardi - filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Impax Laboratories Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of George C. Lombardi)(Bilson, David)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #89 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for certain disclosures and production deadlines as set forth in the Stipulation to March 30, 2018 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/5/18. (ntl)
March 5, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, the docket text of D.I. #89 has been corrected to reflect that the stipulation was filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. (fms)
March 2, 2018 Filing 89 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for certain disclosures and production deadlines as set forth in the Stipulation to March 30, 2018 - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. (Wilson, Samantha) Modified on 3/5/2018 (fms).
March 1, 2018 Filing 88 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc. for Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC filed by Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC. (Connolly, Arthur)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: In light of the District Court's ADR referral in this case, and the number of parties involved in this matter and related cases, the Court orders as follows: Plaintiff(s) counsel shall contact counsel for each defendant to discuss whether both sides believe that the Court's assistance with settlement discussions would be helpful at some point in the case. If both plaintiff(s) and an individual defendant believe that the case has reached a stage whereby the Court's assistance is needed with regard to settlement, plaintiff(s) counsel shall contact the Court to schedule an ADR Teleconference for plaintiff and that individual defendant. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/26/2018. (dlb)
February 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeanette M. Roorda for Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeanette M. Roorda filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/20/18. (ntl)
February 19, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Torrent Pharma Inc. and Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s Core Technical Documents pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 16, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures of Plaintiffs filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
February 15, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE OF SERVICE of MACLEODS PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD. AND MACLEODS PHARMA USA, INC.s DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO DISTRICT OF DELAWARE DEFAULT STANDARD PARAGRAPH 3 filed by Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
February 15, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeanette M. Roorda - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
February 15, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Under Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 15, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Biogen's Initial Disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
February 15, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lupin's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA.(Farnan, Kelly)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #63 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/15/18. (ntl)
February 14, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sun Pharma Global FZE's Core Technical Documents pursuant to Paragraph 2 of the Scheduling Order (D.I.22) and Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE.(Wilson, Samantha)
February 14, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC's Core Technical Documents pursuant to Paragraph 2 of the Scheduling Order (D.I.22) and Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Wilson, Samantha)
February 14, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Macleods Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. and Macleods Pharma USA, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
February 14, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE of ON 2.13.18 - Windlas' Core Technical Document Production Bates Range WINDLAS0000001-WINDLAS0014585 re #22 Scheduling Order,,, filed by Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd..(Renck, Richard)
February 14, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ciplas Core Technical Documents bearing production numbers CIPLA0000001-CIPLA0022731 re #22 Scheduling Order,,, filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc..(Green, James)
February 14, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Alkem Laboratories Ltd. and S&B Pharma, Inc.'s Core Technical Document Production (Highly Confidential Outside Counsel Eyes Only) filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd., S&B Pharma, Inc..(Palapura, Bindu)
February 13, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Shilpa Medicare Limited's Rule 4(b) Disclosures and Defendants Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, and Hetero Labs Limited's Rule 4(b) Disclosures filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc., Shilpa Medicare Limited.(Brauerman, Stephen)
February 13, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Sawai USA, Inc. and Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.'s Core Technical Documents pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery (Bates range SAW-DIM 0000001 - SAW-DIM 0026200) [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
February 13, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Prior to 6PM on 2.13.18--Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.s Core Technical Documents, Production Bates Range PRN_TECF0000001 - PRN_TECF0000221 re #22 Scheduling Order,,, filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Renck, Richard)
February 13, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants TWi Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and TWi Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL - OUTSIDE COUNSEL ONLY] Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Phillips, John)
February 13, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Lupin Atlantis Holdings SAs Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard of Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA.(Farnan, Kelly)
February 13, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd. and Graviti Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard of Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
February 13, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Slayback Pharma Limited Liability Company and Slayback Pharma India LLP's Core Technical Documents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(b) of the Default Standard of Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Slayback Pharma India LLP, Slayback Pharma LLC.(Ormerod, Eve)
February 13, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Core Technical Documents filed by Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC.(Connolly, Arthur)
February 13, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery re #22 Scheduling Order,,, filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc..(Green, James)
February 12, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Biogen's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
February 9, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC.(Connolly, Arthur)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #53 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for 1) Plaintiffs and Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to exchange disclosures required by Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Electronically Stored Information (ESI) and 2) for Defendant Teva to produce its core technical documents by 3/2/18 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/9/18. (ntl)
February 8, 2018 Filing 63 PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
February 8, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sun Pharma Global FZE's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE.(Wilson, Samantha)
February 8, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC's Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Wilson, Samantha)
February 8, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Windlas Healthcare PVT. LTD.s Default Standard Paragraph 3 Initial Disclosures filed by Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd..(Renck, Richard)
February 8, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Biogen's Initial Discovery in Patent Litigation Pursuant to Paragraph 4(a) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
February 8, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial E-Discovery Disclosures of Defendant Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Renck, Richard)
February 8, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Biogen's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
February 8, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Zydus's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 8, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Paragraph 3 Disclosures of Sawai USA, Inc. and Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
February 8, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Under Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery; (2) Defendants Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Initial Disclosures Under Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery; and (3) Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Under Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Hetero USA Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 8, 2018 Filing 53 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for 1) Plaintiffs and Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to exchange disclosures required by Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Electronically Stored Information (ESI) and 2) for Defendant Teva to produce its core technical documents to March 2, 2018 - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
February 8, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s and Torrent Pharma Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Court's ESI Default Standard for Discovery filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 8, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Accord Healthcare Inc.'s ESI Paragraph 3 Disclosures filed by Accord Healthcare Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 8, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd. and Graviti Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
February 8, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Slayback Pharma Limited Liability Company and Slayback Pharma India LLP's Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Slayback Pharma India LLP, Slayback Pharma LLC.(Ormerod, Eve)
February 8, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Aurobindo's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraphs 3(a)-(c) of the Default Discovery Standard filed by Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC.(Connolly, Arthur)
February 8, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pharmathen S.A.s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Pharmathen S.A..(Kraman, Pilar)
February 8, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery of Defendants TWi Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and TWi Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 8, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Alkem Laboratories Ltd. and S&B Pharma, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to ESI Rule 3 filed by Alkem Laboratories Ltd., S&B Pharma, Inc..(Moore, David)
February 7, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Shilpa Medicare Limited's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and (2) this Notice of Service filed by Shilpa Medicare Limited.(Brauerman, Stephen)
February 7, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, and Hetero Labs Limited's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery and (2) this Notice of Service filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen)
February 6, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Wilson, Samantha)
February 6, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Defendant Sun Pharma Global FZE filed by Sun Pharma Global FZE.(Wilson, Samantha)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which the Plaintiffs and Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. will exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(6)(1) to March 2, 2018 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/6/18. (ntl)
February 5, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Macleods Pharma USA, Inc., Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
February 5, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) re #22 Scheduling Order,,, filed by Cipla Limited, Cipla USA Inc..(Green, James)
February 5, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Pharmathen S.A.s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Pharmathen S.A..(Poff, Adam)
February 2, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Burke for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (dlb)
February 2, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
February 2, 2018 Filing 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which the Plaintiffs and Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. will exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(6)(1) to March 2, 2018 - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Wilson, Samantha)
February 2, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA.(Farnan, Kelly)
February 2, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Impax Laboratories, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; (2) Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; (3) Defendants Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures; and (4) Defendants MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, Impax Laboratories Inc., MSN Laboratories Private Ltd., MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 2, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Accord Healthcare Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Accord Healthcare Inc..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 2, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd.'s and Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc., Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd..(Ormerod, Eve)
February 2, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Slayback Pharma Limited Liability Company's and Slayback Pharma India LLP's Initial Disclosures Pursuant To Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Slayback Pharma India LLP, Slayback Pharma LLC.(Ormerod, Eve)
February 2, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.'s and Torrent Pharma Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Torrent Pharma Inc., Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd..(Schladweiler, Benjamin)
February 2, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Sawai USA, Inc. and Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. filed by Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Sawai USA Inc..(Gattuso, Dominick)
February 2, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of of Initial Disclosures of Defendant Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc..(Renck, Richard)
February 2, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Shilpa Medicare Limited's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and (2) this Notice of Service filed by Shilpa Medicare Limited.(Brauerman, Stephen)
February 2, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service for Defendant Windlas Healthcare PVT. LTD.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) filed by Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd..(Renck, Richard)
February 2, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants Hetero USA Inc., Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, and Hetero Labs Limited's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and (2) this Notice of Service filed by Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III, Hetero USA Inc..(Brauerman, Stephen)
February 2, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures of Defendants TWi Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and TWi Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc., TWi Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 2, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.'s Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc..(Bilson, David)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. These cases are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of discovery and trial and all papers shall be filed in Civil Action No. 17-823-LPS. Discovery due by 9/13/2019. Status Report due by 4/12/2019. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 10/12/2018. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 11/16/2018. A Markman Hearing is set for 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/15/2019. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/26/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A 10-day Bench Trial is set for 12/9/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/2/18. (ntl)
January 31, 2018 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER (Proposed Scheduling Order) by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
January 31, 2018 Filing 20 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven J. Balick regarding the Parties' Proposed Scheduling Order. (Balick, Steven)
January 23, 2018 Filing 19 Official Transcript of Scheduling Telephone Conference held on January 17, 2018 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone No. (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2018.(bpg)
January 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard P. Stark - Telephone Conference held on 1/17/2018. (Court Reporter B. Gaffigan.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS et al. (ntl)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for January 17, 2018 at 9:30 AM. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. No further submissions are necessary. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/28/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS et al.(etg)
December 20, 2017 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER (Proposed Scheduling Order) by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
December 20, 2017 Filing 16 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven J. Balick regarding the Parties' Proposed Scheduling Order. (Balick, Steven)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (15 in 1:17-cv-00824-LPS, 14 in 1:17-cv-00856-LPS, 14 in 1:17-cv-00872-LPS, 14 in 1:17-cv-00848-LPS, 14 in 1:17-cv-00849-LPS, 17 in 1:17-cv-00845-LPS, 16 in 1:17-cv-00846-LPS, 12 in 1:17-cv-00847-LPS, 15 in 1:17-cv-00851-LPS, 15 in 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 15 in 1:17-cv-00852-LPS, 16 in 1:17-cv-00857-LPS, 16 in 1:17-cv-00828-LPS, 17 in 1:17-cv-00875-LPS, 13 in 1:17-cv-01361-LPS, 19 in 1:17-cv-00825-LPS, 15 in 1:17-cv-00829-LPS, 15 in 1:17-cv-00855-LPS, 17 in 1:17-cv-00827-LPS, 17 in 1:17-cv-00853-LPS, 16 in 1:17-cv-00826-LPS, 15 in 1:17-cv-00874-LPS, 12 in 1:17-cv-00954-LPS, 14 in 1:17-cv-00854-LPS, 17 in 1:17-cv-00850-LPS) STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Deadline by Which the Parties Must Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/20/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS et al.(etg)
December 15, 2017 Filing 15 STIPULATION Seeking to Extend the Deadline by Which the Parties Must Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order, by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Balick, Steven)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than December 15, 2017. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, New Patent Procedures). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/29/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS et al. (ntl)
October 20, 2017 Filing 13 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Counterclaims to October 20, 2017 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/22/17. (ntl)
September 21, 2017 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Counterclaims to October 20, 2017 - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
August 29, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sanya Sukduang for Biogen International GmbH, and for Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
August 29, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James B. Monroe for Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
August 29, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Li Feng for Biogen International GmbH, and for Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
August 29, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew E. Renison for Biogen International GmbH, for Biogen MA Inc., and for Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
August 29, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew E. Renison for Biogen International GmbH added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
August 29, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James B. Monroe for Biogen International GmbH added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
August 29, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Li Feng for Biogen International GmbH,Li Feng for Biogen International GmbH added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00872-LPS et al.(lmm)
August 18, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Naomi l. Birbach for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.,Naomi l. Birbach for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC,Naomi l. Birbach for Sun Pharma Global FZE added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00829-LPS, 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 1:17-cv-00848-LPS(crb)
August 15, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Samuel Sherry for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Counterclaims to September 22, 2017 filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/7/17. (ntl)
August 7, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Huiya Wu for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 4, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sanya Sukduang for Biogen International GmbH,Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS et al.(crb)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:17-cv-00848-LPS, 11 in 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 9 in 1:17-cv-00829-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth J. Holland, Attorney Huiya Wu, Attorney Samuel Sherry, Attorney Todd Marabella and Attorney Naomi L. Birbach filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/4/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 1:17-cv-00829-LPS, 1:17-cv-00848-LPS (ntl)
August 3, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth J. Holland, Attorney Huiya Wu, Attorney Samuel Sherry, Attorney Todd Marabella and Attorney Naomi L. Birbach - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE. (Wilson, Samantha)
August 3, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney James B. Monroe for Biogen International GmbH and for Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS et al.(lmm)
August 3, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew E. Renison for Biogen International GmbH, and for Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS et al.(lmm)
August 3, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Li Feng for Biogen MA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS et al.(lmm)
August 2, 2017 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Counterclaims to September 22, 2017 - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (11 in 1:17-cv-00825-LPS, 11 in 1:17-cv-00857-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00824-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00853-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00851-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00829-LPS, 7 in 1:17-cv-00875-LPS, 7 in 1:17-cv-00872-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00873-LPS, 6 in 1:17-cv-00954-LPS, 9 in 1:17-cv-00823-LPS, 9 in 1:17-cv-00856-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00854-LPS, 6 in 1:17-cv-00874-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00852-LPS, 6 in 1:17-cv-00855-LPS, 8 in 1:17-cv-00850-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Monroe, Sanya Sukduang, Li Feng, and Andrew E. Renison filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/26/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS et al. (ntl)
July 24, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James B. Monroe, Sanya Sukduang, Li Feng, and Andrew E. Renison - filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
July 21, 2017 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Biogen Inc. for Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. filed by Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
July 18, 2017 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Amneal Pharmaceuticals Holding Company LLC, Corporate Parent Amneal Holdings, LLC for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Gaza, Anne)
July 18, 2017 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Biogen International GmbH, Biogen MA Inc. by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Gaza, Anne)
June 28, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00823-LPS through 1:17-cv-00829-LPS (rjb)
June 27, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Biogen MA Inc., Biogen International GmbH. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Balick, Steven)
June 27, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC on 6/27/2017. (ceg)
June 26, 2017 No Summons Issued. (nmg)
June 26, 2017 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,399,514; 6,509,376; 7,320,999; 7,619,001; 7,803,840. (nmg)
June 26, 2017 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 6/12/2017. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached. (nmg)
June 26, 2017 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
June 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2171347.) - filed by Biogen MA Inc., Biogen International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biogen International GmbH et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWi Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Dustin L. Taylor
Represented By: Philip D. Segrest
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Don J. Mizerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Huiya Wu
Represented By: Samuel Sherry
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Naomi L. Birbach
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawai Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc.
Represented By: Sara E. Bussiere
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Saukshmya Trichi
Represented By: Todd S. Werner
Represented By: Jeffer Ali
Represented By: Peter M. Kohlhepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Huiya Wu
Represented By: Samuel Sherry
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Naomi L. Birbach
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cipla Limited
Represented By: Joseph M. Reisman
Represented By: James S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Rubinshtein
Represented By: William R. Zimmerman
Represented By: Loni L. Morrow
Represented By: Thomas P. Krzeminski
Represented By: Alison M. Hill
Represented By: Jennifer L. Cree
Represented By: Daniel Bartley Rath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cipla USA Inc.
Represented By: James S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Loni L. Morrow
Represented By: Jennifer L. Cree
Represented By: Daniel Bartley Rath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: Gary Ji
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmathen S.A.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Shailendra K. Maheshwari
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: Yun Wei
Represented By: Michelle A. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Alejandro Menchaca
Represented By: Rajendra A. Chiplunkar
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Represented By: Aaron F. Barkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited Unit-III
Represented By: Sara E. Bussiere
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Saukshmya Trichi
Represented By: Todd S. Werner
Represented By: Jeffer Ali
Represented By: Peter M. Kohlhepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Christopher M. Bruno
Represented By: Imron T. Aly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrent Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Gary Ji
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slayback Pharma India LLP
Represented By: Frank D. Rodriguez
Represented By: James P. Barabas
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Jason Z. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&B Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribe Holdings (Cayman) Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Philip Y. Braginsky
Represented By: Jing Xia
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Alan Tenenbaum
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graviti Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Jason Z. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited
Represented By: Sara E. Bussiere
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Saukshmya Trichi
Represented By: Todd S. Werner
Represented By: Jeffer Ali
Represented By: Peter M. Kohlhepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited
Represented By: George C. Lombardi
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: John R. McNair
Represented By: Kevin E. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shilpa Medicare Limited
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Saukshmya Trichi
Represented By: Todd S. Werner
Represented By: Jeffer Ali
Represented By: Peter M. Kohlhepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawai USA Inc.
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Brian Sodikoff
Represented By: Christopher B. Ferenc
Represented By: Matthew M. Holub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Scott B. Feder
Represented By: Timothy F. Peterson
Represented By: Michael J. Gaertner
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan B. Turpin
Represented By: Andy J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graviti Pharmaceuticals Pvt. Ltd.
Represented By: Frank D. Rodriguez
Represented By: James P. Barabas
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Jason Z. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Rachel P. Waldron
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: John R. McNair
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Represented By: Kevin E. Warner
Represented By: Erin M. Forbes
Represented By: Thomas H. Ehrich
Represented By: Christopher P. Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories LLC
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: John R. McNair
Represented By: Kevin E. Warner
Represented By: Jovial Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc. USA
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Steven J. Moore
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: James E. Nealon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBA Puracap Caribe
Represented By: Philip Y. Braginsky
Represented By: Jing Xia
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Alan Tenenbaum
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Laboratories Private Ltd.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: John R. McNair
Represented By: Jovial Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWi Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSN Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA LLC
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windlas Healthcare Pvt. Ltd.
Represented By: Kenton M. Walker
Represented By: Frederick R. Ball
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Represented By: Emily N. Winfield
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Patrick C. Gallagher
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Vincent L. Capuano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alkem Laboratories Ltd.
Represented By: George J. Barry, III
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Timothy H. Kratz
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puracap International LLC
Represented By: Philip Y. Braginsky
Represented By: Jing Xia
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Alan Tenenbaum
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macleods Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slayback Pharma LLC
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Eve H. Ormerod
Represented By: Jason Z. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macleods Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Erin R. Conway
Represented By: Joseph E. Cwik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: John R. McNair
Represented By: Kevin E. Warner
Represented By: Jovial Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Represented By: Huiya Wu
Represented By: Samuel Sherry
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Naomi L. Birbach
Represented By: Samantha G. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biogen International GmbH
Represented By: Andrew E. Renison
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: James B. Monroe
Represented By: Jeanette M. Roorda
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Paul W. Browning
Represented By: Li Feng
Represented By: Sanya Sukduang
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Megan L. Meyers
Represented By: Eric J. Fues
Represented By: Laura P. Masurovsky
Represented By: John E. Nappi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biogen MA Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E. Renison
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Represented By: James B. Monroe
Represented By: Jeanette M. Roorda
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Li Feng
Represented By: Sanya Sukduang
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Megan L. Meyers
Represented By: Laura P. Masurovsky
Represented By: John E. Nappi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?