Talley, D.O. v. Christiana Care Health System et al
Plaintiff: Lynn E. Talley, D.O.
Defendant: Christiana Care Health System, Matthew K. Hoffman, MD and Kenneth L. Silverstein, MD
Case Number: 1:2017cv00926
Filed: July 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2017)
Presiding Judge: Christopher J. Burke
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/9/2019.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (dlb) Modified on 10/11/2019 (dlb). Unsealed 10/11/2019.
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying D.I. 106 MOTION for Reconsideration re 101 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State Claim filed by Lynn E. Talley, D.O. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/25/2019. (dlb)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION re Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 70 ). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/19/2019. (dlb)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION re D.I. 22 Motion to Dismss. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/17/2018. (dlb)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING D.I. 22 Motion to Dismiss with respect to Count I.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/11/2018. (mlc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talley, D.O. v. Christiana Care Health System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn E. Talley, D.O.
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Represented By: Caitlyn E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Care Health System
Represented By: Barak A. Bassman
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Represented By: James Harry Stone Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew K. Hoffman, MD
Represented By: Barak A. Bassman
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Represented By: James Harry Stone Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Silverstein, MD
Represented By: Barak A. Bassman
Represented By: Joanna J. Cline
Represented By: James Harry Stone Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?