Shivers Jr. v. Sussex Correctional Institution et al
Plaintiff: Dwight L. Shivers Jr.
Defendant: Sussex Correctional Institution and Connections
Case Number: 1:2017cv00964
Filed: July 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/10/2020. (nms)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The motion for reconsideration (D.I. 86 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/11/2019. (nms)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff's requests for counsel (D.I. 50 , 78 ) are DENIED without prejudice to renew (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/2/2019. (nms)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/11/19. (sar)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/14/2017. (fms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shivers Jr. v. Sussex Correctional Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight L. Shivers Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sussex Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?