Tenaha Licensing LLC v. Simplisafe, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tenaha Licensing LLC
Defendant: Simplisafe, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01603
Filed: November 7, 2017
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #9 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 29, 2018 filed by Simplisafe, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Simplisafe, Inc. answer due 1/29/2018. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/27/2017. (asw)
December 22, 2017 9 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to January 29, 2018 - filed by Simplisafe, Inc.. (Dudash, Amy)
December 20, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re (8 in 1:17-cv-01603-GMS, 8 in 1:17-cv-01602-GMS, 9 in 1:17-cv-01604-GMS, 8 in 1:17-cv-01600-GMS, 8 in 1:17-cv-01601-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alberto T. Montequin filed by Tenaha Licensing LLC. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/20/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01600-GMS, 1:17-cv-01601-GMS, 1:17-cv-01602-GMS, 1:17-cv-01603-GMS, 1:17-cv-01604-GMS(mdb)
December 11, 2017 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alberto T. Montequin - filed by Tenaha Licensing LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 5, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Coleman W. Watson for Tenaha Licensing LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01600-GMS, 1:17-cv-01603-GMS, 1:17-cv-01604-GMS(crb)
December 1, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re (6 in 1:17-cv-01600-GMS, 7 in 1:17-cv-01603-GMS, 8 in 1:17-cv-01604-GMS, 7 in 1:17-cv-01602-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Coleman W. Watson filed by Tenaha Licensing LLC. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/1/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01600-GMS, 1:17-cv-01602-GMS, 1:17-cv-01603-GMS, 1:17-cv-01604-GMS(mdb)
November 29, 2017 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Coleman W. Watson - filed by Tenaha Licensing LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 17, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to December 30, 2017 filed by Simplisafe, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Simplisafe, Inc. answer due 12/30/2017. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/17/2017. (mdb)
November 16, 2017 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to December 30, 2017 - filed by Simplisafe, Inc.. (Connolly, Colm)
November 15, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01600-GMS, 1:17-cv-01601-GMS, 1:17-cv-01602-GMS, 1:17-cv-01603-GMS, 1:17-cv-01604-GMS (rjb)
November 10, 2017 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tenaha Licensing LLC. Simplisafe, Inc. served on 11/9/2017, answer due 11/30/2017. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 7, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Simplisafe, Inc. on 11/8/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lmm)
November 7, 2017 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Tenaha Licensing LLC. (lmm)
November 7, 2017 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,238,869 B2. (lmm)
November 7, 2017 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lmm)
November 7, 2017 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Simplisafe, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2262109.) - filed by Tenaha Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenaha Licensing LLC v. Simplisafe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplisafe, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Michele Dudash
Represented By: Colm F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenaha Licensing LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Represented By: Coleman W. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?