Guardant Health, Inc. v. Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.

Plaintiff: Guardant Health, Inc.
Defendant: Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01623
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
0 Judge: Christopher J Burke
1 Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2018 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/5/2018. (Clodomir, Gerard)
January 22, 2018 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Clodomir, Gerard)
December 20, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Derek C. Walter,Edward R. Reines for Guardant Health, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
December 19, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move or otherwise respond filed by Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/19/2017. (mlc)
December 15, 2017 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer move or otherwise respond - filed by Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Taylor, James)
November 28, 2017 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guardant Health, Inc.. Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc. served on 11/28/2017, answer due 12/19/2017. (Farnan, Michael)
November 27, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward R. Reines and Derek C. Walter filed by Guardant Health, Inc.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 11/27/17. (mlc)
November 21, 2017 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edward R. Reines and Derek C. Walter - filed by Guardant Health, Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Farnan, Brian)
November 21, 2017 4 Featured Case ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pretrial matters, up to and including the resolution of case-dispositive motions, subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court; all subsequent filings in this action shall include the initials LPS-CJB after the case number. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/21/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01616-LPS, 1:17-cv-01623-LPS (ntl)
November 15, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01616-LPS, 1:17-cv-01623-LPS (rjb)
November 13, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc. on 11/13/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
November 9, 2017 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,598,731 B2. (rwc)
November 9, 2017 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
November 9, 2017 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2264016.) - filed by Guardant Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guardant Health, Inc. v. Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guardant Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Derek C. Walter
Represented By: Edward R. Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard M. Clodomir
Represented By: James Darlington Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?