Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Livewatch Security, LLC

Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Defendant: Livewatch Security, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv01630
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jay B. Johnson for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
January 12, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaints (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Livewatch Security, LLC answer due 1/26/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/12/2018. (nms)
January 11, 2018 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaints to January 26, 2018 - filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 11, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jay Johnson, filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/11/2018. (nms)
January 10, 2018 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jay Johnson - filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
December 4, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to January 12, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Livewatch Security, LLC answer due 1/12/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/4/2017. (nms)
December 1, 2017 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to January 12, 2018 - filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 15, 2017 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Livewatch Security, LLC served on 11/14/2017, answer due 12/5/2017. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 15, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01626-RGA, 1:17-cv-01627-RGA, 1:17-cv-01628-RGA, 1:17-cv-01629-RGA, 1:17-cv-01630-RGA (rjb)
November 13, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Livewatch Security, LLC on 11/13/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
November 9, 2017 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (nmg)
November 9, 2017 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 8,856,221 B2. (nmg)
November 9, 2017 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
November 9, 2017 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Livewatch Security, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2264043.) - filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Livewatch Security, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livewatch Security, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?