Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd. v. Lupin Limited et al

Plaintiff: Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd.
Defendant: Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Inc., Lupin Limited and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01637
Filed: November 13, 2017
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Mitchell S Goldberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER granting #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael K. Nutter. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 1/22/2018. (nmfn)
January 17, 2018 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael K. Nutter - filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael K. Nutter)(Bilson, David)
January 11, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George F. Pappas, Michael N. Kennedy, Chanson Chang, Hwa Young Jin and Yiye Fu of COVINGTON & BURLING LLP. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 1/11/2018. (nmfn)
January 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Claire A. Fundakowski for Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA,Lupin Inc.,Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
January 9, 2018 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney George F. Pappas, Michael N. Kennedy, Chanson Chang, Hwa Young Jin and Yiye Fu of COVINGTON & BURLING LLP - filed by Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd.. (Dellinger, Megan)
January 9, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship). Please include the initials of the Judge (MSG) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01614-MSG, 1:17-cv-01637-MSG (rjb)
January 9, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kurt A. Mathas for Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA,Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
January 9, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED- re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kurt A. Mathas and Claire A. Fundakowski. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 1/9/2018. (lih)
January 8, 2018 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kurt A. Mathas and Claire A. Fundakowski - filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kurt A. Mathas, #2 Certification of Claire A. Fundakowski)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Bilson, David)
January 5, 2018 14 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,958,161 B2; 8,715,724 B2; . (Phillips, John)
January 5, 2018 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Limited for Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
January 5, 2018 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Phillips, John) Modified on 1/9/2018 (lih).
January 2, 2018 11 Featured Case STIPULATION and Order Dismissing Lupin Limited and Lupin Inc. (without prejudice) by Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd.. (Dellinger, Megan)
December 1, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED- re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA answer due 1/5/2018; Lupin Inc. answer due 1/5/2018; Lupin Limited answer due 1/5/2018; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/1/2017. (lih)
November 30, 2017 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Within Which Defendants Shall Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 5, 2018 - filed by Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Inc., Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
November 16, 2017 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd.. Lupin Limited served on 11/16/2017, answer due 12/7/2017. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 15, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01614-VAC-SRF, 1:17-cv-01637-VAC-SRF (rjb)
November 15, 2017 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01614-VAC, 1:17-cv-01637-VAC (rjb)
November 14, 2017 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd.. Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA served on 11/14/2017, answer due 12/5/2017. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 14, 2017 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd.. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/14/2017, answer due 12/5/2017. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 14, 2017 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd.. Lupin Inc. served on 11/14/2017, answer due 12/5/2017. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 13, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA on 11/13/2017; Lupin Inc. on 11/13/2017; Lupin Limited on 11/13/2017; Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 11/13/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar)
November 13, 2017 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Mayne Pharma Group Limited for Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd. filed by Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd.. (sar)
November 13, 2017 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,295,652 B1; 9,446,057 B2; 9,511,031 B2;. (sar)
November 13, 2017 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: On or about 10/9/2017. Date of Expiration of Patent: **See Below**.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 4/9/2020. (sar)
November 13, 2017 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
November 13, 2017 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA, Lupin Inc., Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2263384.) - filed by Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd. v. Lupin Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayne Pharma International Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Atlantis Holdings SA
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Kurt A. Mathas
Represented By: Claire A. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Kurt A. Mathas
Represented By: Claire A. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Limited
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Kurt A. Mathas
Represented By: Claire A. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?