Shire Development LLC et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shire LLC, Shire US Inc. and Shire Development LLC
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industires Limited, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticlas USA, Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited
Case Number: 1:2017cv01696
Filed: November 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Referring Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Responsive Expert Report of Steven R. Little, Ph.D.; (2) Expert Report of Mohan Rao, Ph.D.; (3) Responsive Expert Report of David Taft, Ph.D.; and (4) Rebuttal Expert Report of Joel L. Young, M.D. (to Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
September 9, 2019 Filing 195 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Responsive Expert Report of Steven R. Little, Ph.D.; (2) Expert Report of Mohan Rao, Ph.D.; (3) Responsive Expert Report of David Taft, Ph.D.; and (4) Rebuttal Expert Report of Joel L. Young, M.D. (to Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
September 9, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE OF SERVICE of [CONFIDENTIAL] Expert Report of Pankaj B. Desai, Ph.D. and the [CONFIDENTIAL] Expert report of Graham Buckton, Ph.D. filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
July 25, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf for D.I. 193 has been replaced with a corrected version per counsel's request. The new version contains a footnote. The NEF for the filing has been regenerated. (nms)
July 25, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Opening Expert Report of Steven R. Little, Ph.D., (2) Opening Expert Report of David Taft, Ph.D. and (3) Opening Expert Report of Joel L. Young, M.D. as to Impax and as to Actavis filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) (Main Document 193 replaced on 7/25/2019) (nms).
July 24, 2019 Filing 192 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Opening Expert Report of Edmund Elder, Ph.D., R.Ph. and the Expert Report of Arthur B. Straughn, Pharm.D. filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
July 9, 2019 Filing 191 REDACTED VERSION of #187 Letter, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-8)(Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 7/10/2019 (nms).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #189 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/2/2019. (nms)
July 9, 2019 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of a redacted version of DI #187 . (lih)
July 3, 2019 Filing 190 REDACTED VERSION of #188 Letter, by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 7/9/2019 (nms).
July 2, 2019 Filing 189 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time - filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 7/2/2019 (nms).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER- Having been informed by the parties that the pending discovery dispute has been resolved, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery dispute teleconference set in this matter for 7/1/2019 is cancelled. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/28/2019. (lih)
June 27, 2019 Filing 188 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon, from Nathan R. Hoeschen, regarding Shire's request to compel Actavis to produce incomplete data. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 9-13)(Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 6/28/2019 (nms).
June 26, 2019 Filing 187 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Derek J. Fahnestock regarding Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-8)(Fahnestock, Derek)
June 24, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Final Infringement Contentions (Impax) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
June 24, 2019 Filing 185 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Final Infringement Contentions (Actavis) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
June 21, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1.) Defendants Final Invalidity Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 8,846,100 and U.S. Patent No. 9,173,857 filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #183 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call to 302-573-4557. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission due by no later than 2:00 PM on 6/26/2019, Responsive submission due by no later than 2:00 PM on 6/27/2019.) Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/17/2019. (lih)
June 14, 2019 Filing 183 Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Fahnestock, Derek)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #182 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to serve final infringement and invalidity contentions to June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2019. (nms)
June 12, 2019 Filing 182 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to serve final infringement and invalidity contentions to June 21, 2019 - filed by Impax Laboratories LLC. (Bilson, David)
June 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scott A. Cunning, II for Impax Laboratories LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORAL ORDER: The parties have advised that a discovery dispute has arisen requiring judicial attention. This dispute is now REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. The parties shall promptly contact Judge Fallon's Chambers. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2019. (nms)
June 10, 2019 Filing 180 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Supplemental Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories Nos. 1, 2, and 4 filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Keller, Karen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 179 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] Second Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 178 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Shire's First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Impax's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6), (2) Shire's First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Impax's Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 8-18), (3) Shire's First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Actavis's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-4), and (4) Shire's First Supplemental Responses and Objections to Actavis's Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-19) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
June 7, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (No. 2 and 4) filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
June 6, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures to Impax and (2) Plaintiffs' Third Supplemental Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures to Teva filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
May 29, 2019 Filing 175 NOTICE of of Subpoena to Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Impax Laboratories LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bilson, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 174 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Actaviss Responses to Shires Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Actavis (Nos. 7-11) filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Fry, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 173 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 7-9) filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 172 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kapil Gupta on May 29, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
May 24, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Candis Edwards on June 6, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
May 17, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Teva and Actavis's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-42) filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 169 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Shire's Responses and Objections to Impax's Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 8-18); and (2) Shire's Responses and Objections to Impax's Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 58-59) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
May 17, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Shire's Responses and Objections to Actavis's Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-19); and (2) Shire's Responses and Objections to Actavis's Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 59-60) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
May 17, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-40) filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 166 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Adeyinka Abinusawa on June 6, 2019 filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kristie Whitehouse on May 23, 2019 filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
May 10, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Shire's Responses and Objections to Actavis and Impax's Joint Notice of Deposition of Shire Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) and (2) Shire's Responses and Objections to Actavis and Impax's Joint Supplemental Notice of Deposition of Shire Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
May 10, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 6) filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 162 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] First Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Shire's Responses and Objections to Impax's Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 7) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
May 7, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
May 3, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE of Subpoena to Paul Hodgkins, by Impax Laboratories LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bilson, David) Modified on 5/6/2019 (nms).
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORAL ORDER re 24 Order Setting Teleconference. The teleconference scheduled for 5/3/19 at 9:00 a.m. Eastern Time with Judge Thynge is cancelled. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/2/19. (cak)
May 1, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Notice of Deposition of Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
April 26, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Shire's Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Impax (Nos. 7-9) and (2) Shire's Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Actavis (Nos. 7-11) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 25, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Janet Vaughn on May 10, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 24, 2019 Filing 153 REDACTED VERSION of #149 Notice to Take Deposition by Impax Laboratories LLC. (Bilson, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-40) to Defendant Impax; Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admissions (Nos. 1-42) to Defendant Teva and Actavis filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 17, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Actavis's Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 59-60) (2) Actavis's Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 6-19) filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
April 17, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Impax's Third Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 58-59) and [CONFIDENTIAL] Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 8-18) filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 149 [SEALED] Joint Supplemental NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shire Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6), filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David) Modified on 4/17/2019 (nms).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #148 STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/17/2019. (nms)
April 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew McDonough for Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 148 STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order - filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 4/17/2019 (nms).
April 10, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Shire's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Actavis (No. 6) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 9, 2019 Filing 146 REDACTED VERSION of #126 Notice to Take Deposition, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 4/9/2019 (nms).
April 8, 2019 Filing 145 REDACTED VERSION of #125 Notice to Take Deposition, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 4/8/2019 (nms).
April 8, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Impax's Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 7) filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
April 8, 2019 REDACTION NOTICE: In accordance with section G of the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service by Electronic Means, redacted versions of sealed documents shall be filed electronically within 7 days of the filing of the sealed document. The records of this case do not reflect the filing of redacted versions of DI #125 and #126 . (nms)
April 5, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Shire's Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Impax (No. 6) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Janice van Haeften on May 14, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sibel Ucpinar on May 15, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Parag Shah on May 1, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nilobon Podhipleux on May 2, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Frida Navarro-Iriarte on April 30, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Suparna Mukherjee on April 30, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Marcy Macdonald on May 15, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Felix Lai on May 17, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Arun Katragadda on April 29, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Craig Jones on April 29, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Clifton Hart on May 17, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joyce de los Reyes on May 13, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Zhengjian Chen on May 2, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Francisco Blanco on May 3, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Albine Blanche on May 16, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #127 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew McDonough, filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/1/2019. (nms)
April 1, 2019 Filing 127 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew McDonough - filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
March 28, 2019 Filing 126 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. on mutually agreeable date filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Jacobs, Karen)
March 28, 2019 Filing 125 [SEALED] NOTICE to Take Deposition of Impax Laboratories LLC on mutually agreeable date filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Jacobs, Karen)
March 26, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Zohra Lomri on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tami Martin on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Damment on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephanie Read on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rong-Kun Chang on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard A. Couch on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Paul Hodgkins on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kim Gariepy on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chayla Freeman on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brigitte Robertson on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Beth A. Burnside on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Amir Shojaei on a mutually agreeable date and time filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Shire Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) on [TBD] filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Impax Laboratories LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/6/2019. (nms)
March 5, 2019 Filing 110 PROPOSED Claim Construction Order, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 3/6/2019 (nms).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for multiple terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 6,913,768, 8,846,100, and 9,173,857. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/28/2019. (nms)
February 5, 2019 Filing 108 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Derek F. Fahnestock, regarding Pulsed Release (D.I. #105 ). (Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 2/6/2019 (nms).
February 5, 2019 Filing 107 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Nathan R. Hoeschen, regarding response to Shire's Letter (D.I. #106 ). (Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 2/6/2019 (nms).
February 1, 2019 Filing 106 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Derek J. Fahnestock regarding Claim Construction. (Fahnestock, Derek)
February 1, 2019 Filing 105 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Nathan R. Hoeschen regarding Defendants proposed lexicographic definition of the term pulsed release - re #104 Transcript,,. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 104 Official Transcript of Markman Hearing held on 1/23/19 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather M. Triozzi,Telephone number 302-573-6195. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2019. (Triozzi, Heather)
January 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery completed by 5/17/2019. A Bench Trial is set for 12/9/2019, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 11/15/2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. (nms)
January 29, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The case is reopened as it was closed in error. (nms)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SO ORDERED Granting #102 Stipulated Dismissal, Consent Decree, Final Judgment and Order of Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/28/2019. (nms) Modified on 1/29/2019 (nms).
January 28, 2019 Filing 102 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to SpecGX by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
January 23, 2019 Filing 101 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited for Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc. filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 1/24/2019 (nms).
January 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Markman Hearing held on 1/23/2019. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi) (crb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Lodging of Deposition Transcripts for Dr. Steven Little and Dr. Leon Shargel, by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 1/23/2019 (nms).
January 22, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Lodging of U.S. Patent No. 6,605,300, by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 1/23/2019 (nms).
January 18, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Shire's Responses and Objections to Actavis's Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 5) and (2) Shire's Responses and Objections to Actavis's Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 51-58) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
January 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jonathan Herstoff, Camille Y. Turner, and Anna N. Lukacher for Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, and Shire US Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #97 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan A. Herstoff, Camille Y. Turner and Anna N. Lukacher of Haug Partners LLP, filed by Shire LLC, Shire US Inc., Shire Development LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/10/2019. (nms)
January 10, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan A. Herstoff, Camille Y. Turner and Anna N. Lukacher of Haug Partners LLP - filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
January 10, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Kevin J. Georgek of Haug Partners LLP as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with the firm. (Fahnestock, Derek)
January 9, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery (to Impax), 2) Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Fed. R. Civ P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (to Impax); and 1) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery (to Teva); 2) Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Fed. R. Civ. P 26(a)(1) (to Teva) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
January 4, 2019 Filing 94 REDACTED VERSION of #91 Appendix, 2 of 2, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 4-30, #2 Exhibits 31-50)(Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 1/4/2019 (nms).
January 4, 2019 Filing 93 REDACTED VERSION of #90 Appendix, Volume 1 of 2, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Little, #2 Declaration of L. Shargel, #3 Declaration of S. Little, #4 Declaration of L. Shargel)(Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 1/4/2019 (nms).
January 4, 2019 Filing 92 REDACTED VERSION of #89 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 1/4/2019 (nms).
January 2, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibits attached to the filing at D.I. #89 have been removed per counsel's request. (nms)
December 28, 2018 Filing 91 [SEALED] Joint Appendix, Volume 2 of 2 re #89 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 4-30, #2 Exhibits 31-50)(Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 1/2/2019 (nms).
December 28, 2018 Filing 90 [SEALED] Joint Appendix, Volume 1 of 2 re #89 Joint Claim Construction Brief, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven R. Little, #2 Declaration of Leon Shargel, #3 Declaration of Steven R. Little , #4Declaration of Leon Shargel)(Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 1/2/2019 (nms).
December 28, 2018 Filing 89 [SEALED] Joint Claim Construction Brief, filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 1/2/2019 (nms).
December 27, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Shire's Objections and Responses to SpecGX LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-3) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
December 19, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Actavis's Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 51-57) and 2) Actavis's Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 5) filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc..(Keller, Karen)
December 17, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Shire's Responses and Objections to Impax's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 8-57) and 2) Shire's Responses and Objections to SpecGx LLC's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-32) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
December 17, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Leon Shargel, Ph.D. on January 8, 2019 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
December 7, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Shire's Reply Claim Construction Brief and (2 Declaration of Steven R. Little, Ph.D. in Support Shire's Reply Claim Construction Brief with Exhibits 37-49 filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
November 27, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SpecGx LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs filed by SpecGx LLC.(Gattuso, Dominick)
November 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura A. Chubb for Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, and Shire US Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
November 20, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew S. Roper for Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, and Shire US Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura A. Chubb, filed by Shire LLC, Shire US Inc., Shire Development LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/19/2018. (nms)
November 19, 2018 Filing 82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura A. Chubb - filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
November 16, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Impax's Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 8-57) filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
November 16, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SpecGx LLC's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things directed to Plaintiffs filed by SpecGx LLC.(Gattuso, Dominick)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SO ORDERED (as modified) re #78 Stipulation and Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/15/2018. (nms)
November 14, 2018 Filing 78 STIPULATION and Proposed Order, by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 11/15/2018 (nms).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #77 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Roper, filed by Shire LLC, Shire US Inc., Shire Development LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/13/2018. (nms)
November 12, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew S. Roper - filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
October 25, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Steven R. Little, Ph.D. on November 9, 2018 at 9:00 a.m filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
October 22, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Randal S. Alexander for SpecGx LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Shire's Opening Claim Construction Brief and (2) Declaration of Steven R. Little, Ph.D. filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
October 3, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf at D.I. #70 has been replaced with an amended version per the parties request. (nms)
October 2, 2018 Filing 74 APPENDIX, Volume 2 of 2 re #70 Claim Construction Chart, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 5O-5Y, #2 Exhibits 6A-6K)(Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 10/3/2018 (nms).
October 2, 2018 Filing 73 APPENDIX, Volume 1 of 2 re #70 Claim Construction Chart, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4Q, #2 Exhibits 5A-5N)(Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 10/3/2018 (nms).
October 1, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories; and (2) Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's [CONFIDENTIAL] Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
October 1, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) SpecGx LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things; and 2) SpecGx LLC's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) filed by SpecGx LLC.(Gattuso, Dominick)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #69 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Joint Appendix Regarding Claim Construction to October 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/1/2018. (nms)
September 28, 2018 Filing 70 Joint Claim Construction Chart, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 10/1/2018 (nms). (Main Document 70 replaced on 10/3/2018) (nms).
September 28, 2018 Filing 69 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Joint Appendix Regarding Claim Construction to October 2, 2018 - filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
September 27, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-5) and 2) Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-63) filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
September 25, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Shire's Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
September 25, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #65 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to extend deadline for exchange of proposed claim constructions to September 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/25/2018. (nms)
September 24, 2018 Filing 65 STIPULATION and Proposed Order - filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 9/25/2018 (nms).
September 18, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Identification of Proposed Terms for Construction filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen)
September 18, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Proposed Terms for Construction filed by SpecGx LLC.(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 13, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Shire's Responses and Objections to Impax's First Set Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
September 13, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Shire's Responses and Objections to Impax's First Set of Requests forthe Production of Documents and Things (Nos.1-7) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
September 13, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of SpecGx LLCs Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by SpecGx LLC.(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SO ORDERED Granting #56 Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/6/2018. (nms)
September 5, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Initial Disclosures of SpecGx LLC; and 2) Paragraph 3 Disclosures of Defendant SpecGx LLC filed by SpecGx LLC.(Gattuso, Dominick)
September 5, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery to SpecGx and (2) Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) Initial Disclosures to SpecGx filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
September 5, 2018 Filing 56 PROPOSED Protective Order, by SpecGx LLC. (Gattuso, Dominick) Modified on 9/6/2018 (nms).
August 31, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Paragraph 4(c) Initial Claim Chart filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
August 30, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of on Impax: (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (Nos. 1-5) and (2) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-63) and on SpecGx: (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (Nos. 1-6) and (2) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-63) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
August 28, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-5); and (2) Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-63) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
August 23, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Shire's Responses and Objections to Actavis's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-4) and (2) Shire's Responses and Objections to Actavis's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-50) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
August 21, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Enes Ovcina,John P. Snow,Mark T. Deming for SpecGx LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
August 14, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Impax's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6); and (2) Impax's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-7) filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
August 14, 2018 Filing 50 ANSWER to SpecGx's Amended Counterclaims (filed in 18cv800-RGA, D.I. 15), by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 8/15/2018 (nms).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #49 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary E. Hood, Mark T. Deming, John P. Snow, Enes Ovcina, Helena Berezowskyj and Randal S. Alexander, filed by SpecGx LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2018. (nms)
August 7, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gary E. Hood, Mark T. Deming, John P. Snow, Enes Ovcina, Helena Berezowskyj and Randal S. Alexander - filed by SpecGx LLC. (Gattuso, Dominick)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2018. Fact Discovery completed by 5/17/2019. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 12/28/2018. A Markman Hearing is set for 1/23/2019, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 11/15/2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 4 day Bench Trial is set to start 12/9/2019, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/6/2018. (nms)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SO ORDERED Granting (D.I. 45 in 17-cv-1696-RGA, D.I. 16 in 18-cv-800-RGA) Proposed Stipulated Consolidation Order. All filings shall be made exclusively in 17cv1696-RGA. Civil Action 18-800-RGA shall be administratively closed (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/6/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01696-RGA, 1:18-cv-00800-RGA(nms)
August 6, 2018 Filing 46 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 8/6/2018 (nms).
August 6, 2018 Filing 45 Proposed STIPULATED Consolidation Order, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 8/6/2018 (nms).
July 27, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Paragraph 4(c) Initial Claim Charts filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire US Inc..(Jacobs, Karen)
July 27, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's Initial Disclosures Under Paragraph 3 of the District of Delaware's Default Standard for Discovery filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
July 27, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery (to Impax Laboratories, LLC) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Jacobs, Karen)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SO ORDERED Granting #39 Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/24/2018. (nms)
July 24, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Actavis's First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-50) (2) Actavis's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-4) filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
July 16, 2018 Filing 39 Proposed Protective Order, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek) Modified on 7/17/2018 (nms).
July 16, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures and (2) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Initial Disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
July 2, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
July 2, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David)
July 2, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Impax Laboratories, LLC's [Confidential] production of core technical documents, filed by Impax Laboratories LLC.(Bilson, David) Modified on 7/3/2018 (nms).
June 29, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Identification of Accused Products and Asserted Patents filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Fahnestock, Derek)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 12/14/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2018, Fact Discovery completed by 5/17/2019, Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 12/19/2018, a Markman Hearing is set for 1/23/2019, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A, a Pretrial Conference is set for 11/15/2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A, a Bench Trial is set for 12/9/2019, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/27/2018. (nms)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SO ORDERED Granting (31 in 17-cv-1696-RGA, 19 in 18-cv-549-RGA) Stipulated Consolidation Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/27/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01696-RGA, 1:18-cv-00549-RGA(nms)
June 26, 2018 Filing 31 Stipulated Consolidation Order, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 6/27/2018 (nms).
June 26, 2018 Filing 30 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 letter)(Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 6/27/2018 (nms).
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SO ORDERED Granting #28 Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/23/2018. (nms)
May 22, 2018 Filing 28 PROPOSED Protective Order, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 5/23/2018 (nms).
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file a Proposed Protective Order to May 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/14/2018. (nms)
May 9, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to file a Proposed Protective Order to May 23, 2018 - filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 5/9/2018 (nms).
May 7, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.'s Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
May 7, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery; and (2) Plaintiffs Identification of Accused Products and Asserted Patents Pursuant to Paragraph 4(a) of the Default Standard for Discovery filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Jacobs, Karen)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Defense counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/3/2019 at 9:00 AM Eastern Time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss the status of the case. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/27/18. (cak)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file a Proposed Protective Order to May 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2018. (nms)
April 25, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file a Proposed Protective Order to May 9, 2018 - filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) Modified on 4/25/2018 (nms).
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 4/27/2018 at 1:30 PM Eastern Time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/4/18. (cak)
April 3, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
April 2, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan)
April 2, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Jacobs, Karen)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORAL ORDER: The R16(b) Conference scheduled for 4/6/2018, is CANCELLED per the entry of D.I. #18 . Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2018. (nms)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 10/12/2018. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 12/19/2018. A Markman Hearing is set for 1/23/2019, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/27/2019, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 3 day Bench Trial is set to start 10/7/2019, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2018. (nms)
March 23, 2018 Filing 17 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 3/26/2018 (nms).
March 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sandra Kuzmich for Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
March 13, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian T. Drummond, Emily L. Rapalino, Daryl L. Wiesen, and Sarah J Fischer for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daryl L. Wiesen, Emily L. Rapalino, Brian T. Drummond, and Sarah J. Fischer, filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2018. (nms)
March 12, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daryl L. Wiesen, Emily L. Rapalino, Brian T. Drummond, and Sarah J. Fischer - filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
March 9, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edgar H. Haug for Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
March 9, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc..(Jacobs, Karen)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/6/2018, at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/22/2018. (nms)
February 16, 2018 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. filed by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
February 16, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc. by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 2/21/2018 (nms).
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SO ORDERED Granting #10 Stipulation of Dismissal of Complaint as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. and Amendment of Caption (*Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/5/2018. (nms)
February 2, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., by Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 2/5/2018 (nms).
December 15, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI#10 was deleted. The order was docketed in the wrong case. (kjk)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 19, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. answer due 2/19/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited answer due 2/19/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. answer due 2/19/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/13/2017. (nms)
December 12, 2017 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 19, 2017; includes waiver of service as to Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Limited - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
December 1, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Nicholas F. Giove, Kevin J. Georgek for Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edgar H. Haug, Sandra Kuzmich, Ph.D., Nicholas F. Giove, and Kevin J. Georgek, filed by Shire LLC, Shire US Inc., Shire Development LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/29/2017. (nms)
November 29, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 29, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edgar H. Haug, Sandra Kuzmich, Ph.D., Nicholas F. Giove, and Kevin J. Georgek - filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
November 29, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shire LLC, Shire Development LLC, Shire US Inc.. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 11/28/2017, answer due 12/19/2017. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 11/29/2017 (lmm).
November 29, 2017 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Mailing as to service on Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 11/29/2017 (nms).
November 22, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. on 11/22/2017; Teva Pharmaceuticals Industires Limited on 11/22/2017; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 11/22/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lmm) Modified on 11/29/2017 (lmm).
November 22, 2017 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Shire plc for Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc. filed by Shire Development LLC, Shire LLC, Shire US Inc.. (lmm)
November 22, 2017 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,913,768 B2; 8,846,100 B2; 9,173,857 B2. (lmm)
November 22, 2017 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 10/12/2017. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ATTACHED .Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 4/12/2020. (lmm)
November 22, 2017 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lmm)
November 22, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industires Limited, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2270919.) - filed by Shire LLC, Shire Development LLC, Shire US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) Modified on 11/29/2017 (lmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shire Development LLC et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shire LLC
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Nicholas F. Giove
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Andrew S. Roper
Represented By: Edgar H. Haug
Represented By: Sandra Kuzmich
Represented By: Laura A. Chubb
Represented By: Kevin J. Georgek
Represented By: Camille Y. Turner
Represented By: Jonathan Herstoff
Represented By: Anna N. Lukacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shire US Inc.
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Nicholas F. Giove
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Andrew S. Roper
Represented By: Edgar H. Haug
Represented By: Sandra Kuzmich
Represented By: Laura A. Chubb
Represented By: Kevin J. Georgek
Represented By: Camille Y. Turner
Represented By: Jonathan Herstoff
Represented By: Anna N. Lukacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shire Development LLC
Represented By: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Nicholas F. Giove
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Andrew S. Roper
Represented By: Edgar H. Haug
Represented By: Sandra Kuzmich
Represented By: Laura A. Chubb
Represented By: Kevin J. Georgek
Represented By: Camille Y. Turner
Represented By: Jonathan Herstoff
Represented By: Anna N. Lukacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industires Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Andrew McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticlas USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Crompton
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: C. Kyle Musgrove
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Scott A. Cunning, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Represented By: Enes Ovcina
Represented By: Randal S. Alexander
Represented By: John P. Snow
Represented By: Mark T. Deming
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Brian T. Drummond
Represented By: Sarah J Fischer
Represented By: Daryl L. Wiesen
Represented By: Emily L. Rapalino
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Represented By: Andrew McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?