Total Control Sports, Inc. v. Rukket, LLC

Plaintiff: Total Control Sports, Inc.
Defendant: Rukket, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv01731
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Gregory M Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/29/2018. (asw)
January 29, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stuart E. Pollack filed by Rukket, LLC. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/29/2018. (mdb)
January 26, 2018 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stuart E. Pollack - filed by Rukket, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Counsel)(Kraft, Denise)
January 26, 2018 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Rukket, LLC. (Kraft, Denise)
January 26, 2018 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Rukket, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kraft, Denise)
January 26, 2018 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in part, the Complaint filed by Rukket, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/9/2018. (Kraft, Denise) Modified on 1/26/2018 (mdb).
January 26, 2018 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in part, the Complaint - filed by Rukket, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kraft, Denise) Modified on 1/26/2018 (mdb).
December 27, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney R. Eric Gaum for Total Control Sports, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
December 14, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re #8 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time filed by Rukket, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Rukket, LLC answer due 1/26/2018.. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/14/2017. (mdb)
December 13, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher R. Butler for Total Control Sports, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
December 12, 2017 8 STIPULATION Stipulation and Order for Extension re #1 Complaint, by Rukket, LLC. (Kraft, Denise)
December 7, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED - re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Eric Gaum filed by Total Control Sports, Inc., #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Butler filed by Total Control Sports, Inc.. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/7/2017. (mdb)
December 6, 2017 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney R. Eric Gaum - filed by Total Control Sports, Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
December 6, 2017 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Butler - filed by Total Control Sports, Inc.. (Kraman, Pilar)
December 6, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 4, 2017 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Total Control Sports, Inc.. Rukket, LLC served on 12/1/2017, answer due 12/22/2017. (Kraman, Pilar)
December 4, 2017 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Rukket, LLC. (ceg)
December 1, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Rukket, LLC on 12/1/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lmm)
December 1, 2017 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Total Control Sports, Inc. (lmm) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/1/2017) (sar).
December 1, 2017 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,702,542; 9,186,564. (lmm)
December 1, 2017 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lmm)
December 1, 2017 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Rukket, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2275728.) - filed by Total Control Sports, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 7, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Control Sports, Inc. v. Rukket, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rukket, LLC
Represented By: Denise Seastone Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Control Sports, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: R. Eric Gaum
Represented By: Christopher R. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?