KOM Software Inc. v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Plaintiff: KOM Software Inc.
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company and DreamWorks Animation, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00159
Filed: January 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Gregory M Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to April 6, 2018 filed by Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company, DreamWorks Animation, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: DreamWorks Animation, LLC answer due 4/6/2018; Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company answer due 4/6/2018.. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/20/2018. (mdb)
February 16, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to April 6, 2018 - filed by DreamWorks Animation, LLC, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company. (Dudash, Amy)
February 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Michele Dudash on behalf of DreamWorks Animation, LLC, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company (Dudash, Amy)
February 2, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexander H. Martin,Andrew G. DiNovo,Christopher V. Goodpastor for KOM Software Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00159-GMS, 1:18-cv-00160-GMS(crb)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (4 in 1:18-cv-00158-GMS, 4 in 1:18-cv-00160-GMS, 4 in 1:18-cv-00159-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew G. DiNovo, Christopher V. Goodpastor, and Alexander H. Martin filed by KOM Software Inc.. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00158-GMS, 1:18-cv-00159-GMS, 1:18-cv-00160-GMS(mdb)
February 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KOM Software Inc.. DreamWorks Animation, LLC served on 1/29/2018, answer due 2/20/2018; Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company served on 1/29/2018, answer due 2/20/2018. (Farnan, Brian)
February 1, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew G. DiNovo, Christopher V. Goodpastor, and Alexander H. Martin - filed by KOM Software Inc.. (Farnan, Brian)
January 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00158-GMS, 1:18-cv-00159-GMS, 1:18-cv-00160-GMS (rjb)
January 29, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to DreamWorks Animation, LLC on 1/29/2018; Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company on 1/29/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
January 29, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,438,642 B1; US 7,392,234 B2; US 6,654,864 B2; US 7,076,624 B2; US 7,536,524 B2; US 8,234,477 B2; US 9,361,243 B2. (nmg)
January 29, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
January 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against DreamWorks Animation, LLC, Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2310624.) - filed by KOM Software Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOM Software Inc. v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
Represented By: Amy Michele Dudash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DreamWorks Animation, LLC
Represented By: Amy Michele Dudash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KOM Software Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Christopher V. Goodpastor
Represented By: Andrew G. DiNovo
Represented By: Alexander H. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?