Katz v. Feldman
Plaintiff: Bernard Katz
Defendant: Willie Feldman and Salem Botanicals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00213
Filed: February 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM - Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/22/19. (rwc)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/18/2019. **Copies mailed to pro se plaintiff and pro se defendant 1/18/2019** (dlw)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM ORDER - that Plaintiff shall provide the Court with proof of service of the Third Amended Complaint on Mr. Feldman in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c). If Plaintiff fails to submit such evidence, the Court will dismiss this action for failure to prosecute. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 1/4/2019.). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/6/18. (rwc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katz v. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Botanicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?