Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. WideOpenWest, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Defendant: WideOpenWest, Inc., WideOpenWest Networks, Inc. and WideOpenWest Finance, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00361
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amy E. Bergeron for WideOpenWest, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney B. Trent Webb,Aaron E Hankel,Ryan D. Dykal,Robert H. Reckers for Sprint Communications Company L.P. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00363-RGA, 1:18-cv-00361-RGA, 1:18-cv-00362-RGA, 1:18-cv-00536-RGA(crb)
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie for WideOpenWest, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
April 30, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robinson Vu for WideOpenWest Finance, LLC, WideOpenWest Networks, Inc., WideOpenWest, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Reckers of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP, filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Aaron E. Hankel, and Ryan D. Dykal of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP, filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., and #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robinson Vu, Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie, and Amy E. Bergeron, filed by WideOpenWest, Inc., WideOpenWest Networks, Inc., WideOpenWest Finance, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/30/2018. (nms)
April 30, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robinson Vu, Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie, and Amy E. Bergeron - filed by WideOpenWest Finance, LLC, WideOpenWest Networks, Inc., WideOpenWest, Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Aaron E. Hankel, and Ryan D. Dykal of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Katona, Shanti)
April 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Reckers of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Katona, Shanti)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to June 15, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: WideOpenWest Finance, LLC answer due 6/15/2018; WideOpenWest Networks, Inc. answer due 6/15/2018; WideOpenWest, Inc. answer due 6/15/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2018. (nms)
April 25, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to June 15, 2018 - filed by WideOpenWest Finance, LLC, WideOpenWest Networks, Inc., WideOpenWest, Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. WideOpenWest Networks, Inc. served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. WideOpenWest Finance, LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. WideOpenWest, Inc. served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Summons returned executed at D.I. 5 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile the returned summons each at there own docket item entries, thereby allowing the service date to be included and an answering due date to be set. (nms)
April 12, 2018 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: (nms)
March 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00361-RGA, 1:18-cv-00362-RGA, 1:18-cv-00363-RGA (rjb)
March 8, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to WideOpenWest Finance, LLC on 3/8/2018; WideOpenWest Networks, Inc. on 3/8/2018; WideOpenWest, Inc. on 3/8/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb)
March 7, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation, Corporate Parent Sprint Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent SoftBank Corp. for Sprint Communications Company L.P. filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (crb)
March 7, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) See Attachment. (crb)
March 7, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
March 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against WideOpenWest Finance, LLC, WideOpenWest Networks, Inc., WideOpenWest, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2336563.) - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. WideOpenWest, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WideOpenWest, Inc.
Represented By: Robinson Vu
Represented By: Amy E. Bergeron
Represented By: Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WideOpenWest Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Robinson Vu
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WideOpenWest Finance, LLC
Represented By: Robinson Vu
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Represented By: Shanti Mulpuru Katona
Represented By: Robert H. Reckers
Represented By: Aaron E Hankel
Represented By: B. Trent Webb
Represented By: Ryan D. Dykal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?